GNR/LNER Gresley "O2" Class 2-8-0
Class | GNR | LNER (1924 Tmp) | LNER (1924) | LNER (1946) | BR | BR (BR Tmp) | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
O2/3 | 461 | 461 | 3461 | 3921 | 63921 | 05/1918 | NWE DON CLK NWE CLK DON LNG W |
New England Doncaster Colwick New England Colwick Doncaster Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
05/1918 11/05/1943 23/01/1944 24/12/1944 25/06/1945 02/12/1945 27/10/1946 21/05/1948 |
21/05/1948 | |
O2/1 | 477 | 3477 | 3922 | 63922 | 04/1921 | NWE DON CLK NWE CLK DON FRO 36A 34F W |
New England Doncaster Colwick New England Colwick Doncaster Frodingham Doncaster Grantham Withdrawn |
04/1921 14/05/1943 23/01/1944 24/12/1944 25/06/1945 09/12/1945 20/10/1947 13/06/1954 29/07/1962 05/11/1962 |
05/11/1962 | ||
O2/1 | 478 | 3478 | 3923 | 63923 | 04/1921 | NWE DON CLK NWE CLK DON LNG 35B 35B 35A 35B 35B W |
New England Doncaster Colwick New England Colwick Doncaster Langwith Junction Grantham Grantham New England Grantham Grantham Withdrawn |
04/1921 12/05/1943 23/01/1944 24/12/1944 25/06/1945 09/12/1945 27/10/1946 18/06/1950 30/06/1950 20/08/1950 11/03/1951 31/03/1951 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 | ||
O2/4 | 479 | 3479 | 3924 | 63924 | 06/1921 | NWE DON CLK NWE CLK DON LNG 36B 36B 36E 36E W |
New England Doncaster Colwick New England Colwick Doncaster Langwith Junction Mexborough Mexborough Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
06/1921 13/05/1943 23/01/1944 21/09/1944 25/06/1945 09/12/1945 27/10/1946 18/06/1950 30/06/1950 14/09/1952 04/10/1952 03/11/1963 |
03/11/1963 | ||
O2/1 | 480 | 480 | 3480 | 3925 | 63925 | 06/1921 | NWE DON CLK NWE CLK DON LNG 36A 36A 36E 36E W |
New England Doncaster Colwick New England Colwick Doncaster Langwith Junction Doncaster Doncaster Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
06/1921 15/05/1943 23/01/1944 21/12/1944 25/06/1945 05/12/1945 27/10/1946 25/06/1950 30/06/1950 03/02/1952 23/02/1952 08/09/1963 |
08/09/1963 | |
O2/4 | 481 | 481 | 3481 | 3926 | 63926 | 06/1921 | NWE DON CLK NWE CLK DON LNG 36A 36A 36E 36E W |
New England Doncaster Colwick New England Colwick Doncaster Langwith Junction Doncaster Doncaster Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
06/1921 13/06/1943 19/02/1944 17/01/1945 25/06/1945 05/12/1945 27/10/1946 25/06/1950 30/06/1950 03/02/1952 23/02/1952 22/09/1963 |
22/09/1963 | |
O2/1 | 482 | 3482 | 3927 | 63927 | 06/1921 | NWE DON CLK NWE CLK DON LNG 36B 36A 36E 36E W |
New England Doncaster Colwick New England Colwick Doncaster Langwith Junction Mexborough Doncaster Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
06/1921 13/06/1943 19/02/1944 17/01/1945 25/06/1945 05/12/1945 27/10/1946 02/07/1950 25/02/1951 17/02/1952 23/02/1952 22/09/1963 |
22/09/1963 | ||
O2/1 | 483 | 483 | 3483 | 3928 | 63928 | 07/1921 | NWE DON CLK NWE CLK DON LNG 36A 36A 34F W |
New England Doncaster Colwick New England Colwick Doncaster Langwith Junction Doncaster Doncaster Grantham Withdrawn |
07/1921 06/09/1943 23/01/1944 17/01/1945 25/06/1945 09/12/1945 24/11/1946 25/06/1950 30/06/1950 26/11/1961 08/09/1963 |
08/09/1963 | |
O2/1 | 484 | 484 | 3484 | 3929 | 63929 | 07/1921 | NWE DON CLK NWE GRA W |
New England Doncaster Colwick New England Grantham Withdrawn |
07/1921 06/09/1943 23/01/1944 17/01/1945 25/06/1945 09/07/1962 |
09/07/1962 | |
O2/1 | 485 | 485 | 3485 | 3930 | 63930 | 07/1921 | NWE DON CLK NWE GRA W |
New England Doncaster Colwick New England Grantham Withdrawn |
07/1921 05/09/1943 23/01/1944 17/01/1945 25/06/1945 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 | |
O2/1 | 486 | 486 | 3486 | 3931 | 63931 | 07/1921 | NWE DON CLK NWE GRA 36A W |
New England Doncaster Colwick New England Grantham Doncaster Withdrawn |
07/1921 05/09/1943 23/01/1944 29/03/1944 25/06/1945 08/09/1963 22/09/1963 |
22/09/1963 | |
O2/2 | 487 | 3487 | 3932 | 63932 | 01/11/1923 | NWE DON CLK NWE GRA 36A W |
New England Doncaster Colwick New England Grantham Doncaster Withdrawn |
01/11/1923 09/09/1943 23/01/1944 17/01/1945 25/06/1945 08/09/1963 22/09/1963 |
22/09/1963 | ||
O2/2 | 488 | 3488 | 3933 | 63933 | 03/11/1923 | NWE DON CLK NWE GRA 35A 35B 35A 35A 35B 35B W |
New England Doncaster Colwick New England Grantham New England Grantham New England New England Grantham Grantham Withdrawn |
03/11/1923 07/09/1943 23/01/1944 17/01/1945 25/06/1945 09/07/1950 29/10/1950 16/09/1951 22/09/1951 28/10/1951 03/11/1951 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 | ||
O2/2 | 489 | 3489 | 3934 | 63934 | 14/11/1923 | NWE DON CLK NWE GRA FRO 36A 36E W |
New England Doncaster Colwick New England Grantham Frodingham Doncaster Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
14/11/1923 06/09/1943 23/01/1944 21/09/1944 25/06/1945 09/02/1947 13/06/1954 16/10/1960 16/07/1962 |
16/07/1962 | ||
O2/4 | 490 | 3490 | 3935 | 63935 | 30/11/1923 | NWE MEX NWE DON CLK NWE GRA 35A 35B 36B 36B 36A 36A 34F W |
New England Mexborough New England Doncaster Colwick New England Grantham New England Grantham Mexborough Mexborough Doncaster Doncaster Grantham Withdrawn |
30/11/1923 07/03/1928 20/04/1928 06/09/1943 23/01/1944 24/09/1944 17/05/1945 20/08/1950 29/10/1950 28/10/1951 03/11/1951 16/11/1952 29/11/1952 30/12/1962 08/09/1963 |
08/09/1963 | ||
O2/2 | 491 | 3491 | 3936 | 63936 | 05/12/1923 | NWE GRA 36E W |
New England Grantham Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
05/12/1923 25/06/1945 11/06/1961 22/09/1963 |
22/09/1963 | ||
O2/2 | 492 | 3492 | 3937 | 63937 | 15/12/1923 | NWE DON CLK NWE GRA FRO 36E W |
New England Doncaster Colwick New England Grantham Frodingham Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
15/12/1923 11/12/1943 23/01/1944 21/09/1944 25/06/1945 09/02/1947 18/10/1953 08/09/1963 |
08/09/1963 | ||
O2/2 | 493 | 3493 | 3938 | 63938 | 22/12/1923 | NWE DON CLK NWE GRA W |
New England Doncaster Colwick New England Grantham Withdrawn |
22/12/1923 10/12/1943 23/01/1944 24/09/1944 25/06/1945 08/09/1963 |
08/09/1963 | ||
O2/2 | 494 | 3494 | 3939 | 63939 | 29/12/1923 | NWE DON CLK NWE GRA FRO 36A 36E W |
New England Doncaster Colwick New England Grantham Frodingham Doncaster Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
29/12/1923 10/12/1943 23/01/1944 17/01/1945 25/06/1945 09/02/1947 29/08/1954 31/01/1960 22/09/1963 |
22/09/1963 | ||
O2/2 | 495 | 3495 | 3940 | 63940 | 06/02/1924 | NWE DON CLK NWE GRA 36A W |
New England Doncaster Colwick New England Grantham Doncaster Withdrawn |
06/02/1924 10/12/1943 23/01/1944 17/01/1945 25/06/1945 08/09/1963 22/09/1963 |
22/09/1963 | ||
O2/2 | 3496 | 3941 | 63941 | 23/02/1924 | DON NWE GRA FRO 40E 40E 36A 36A 34F W |
Doncaster New England Grantham Frodingham Langwith Junction Langwith Junction Doncaster Doncaster Grantham Withdrawn |
23/02/1924 01/01/1925 25/06/1945 09/02/1947 12/03/1950 18/03/1950 25/06/1950 30/06/1950 26/11/1961 03/09/1963 |
03/09/1963 | |||
O2/2 | 3497 | 3942 | 63942 | 22/03/1924 | NWE DON CLK NWE DON LNG 36A 36A 36E 34F W |
New England Doncaster Colwick New England Doncaster Langwith Junction Doncaster Doncaster Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Grantham Withdrawn |
22/03/1924 10/02/1943 23/01/1944 24/09/1944 30/11/1945 27/10/1946 25/06/1950 30/06/1950 31/01/1960 26/11/1961 08/09/1963 |
08/09/1963 | |||
O2/2 | 3498 | 3943 | 63943 | 29/03/1924 | NWE DON CLK NWE DON LNG 36A 36A 34F 36E 34F 36A W |
New England Doncaster Colwick New England Doncaster Langwith Junction Doncaster Doncaster Grantham Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Grantham Doncaster Withdrawn |
29/03/1924 12/12/1943 23/01/1944 24/09/1944 20/11/1945 27/10/1946 25/06/1950 30/06/1950 27/11/1960 11/06/1961 16/07/1961 08/09/1963 22/09/1963 |
22/09/1963 | |||
O2/2 | 3499 | 3944 | 63944 | 26/04/1924 | NWE DON FRO 36A 36E W |
New England Doncaster Frodingham Doncaster Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
26/04/1924 30/11/1945 20/10/1947 13/06/1954 10/02/1957 03/04/1961 |
03/04/1961 | |||
O2/4 | 500 | 3945 | 63945 | 22/05/1924 | NWE DON LNG 36A 36A 36C 36E W |
New England Doncaster Langwith Junction Doncaster Doncaster Frodingham Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
22/05/1924 30/11/1945 15/12/1946 25/06/1950 30/06/1950 12/04/1953 03/01/1954 22/09/1963 |
22/09/1963 | |||
O2/2 | 3501 | 3946 | 63946 | 3946 | 07/06/1924 | NPT NWE DON LNG 36A 36A 35B 36E W |
Newport (Teeside) New England Doncaster Langwith Junction Doncaster Doncaster Grantham Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
07/06/1924 28/02/1925 11/12/1945 27/10/1946 25/06/1950 30/06/1950 05/04/1953 16/07/1961 07/04/1963 |
07/04/1963 | ||
O2/4 | 2954 | 3947 | 63947 | 23/04/1932 | MAR 36A 36A 36E W |
March Doncaster Doncaster Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
23/04/1932 25/06/1950 30/06/1950 23/02/1958 28/04/1961 |
28/04/1961 | |||
O2/4 | 2955 | 3948 | 63948 | 19/05/1932 | MAR 35B 35A 35B 35B W |
March Grantham New England Grantham Grantham Withdrawn |
19/05/1932 14/05/1950 09/07/1950 14/01/1951 31/01/1951 16/10/1962 |
16/10/1962 | |||
O2/4 | 2956 | 3949 | 63949 | 28/05/1932 | MAR 35B 35B 35A 35A 36B 36B 36E 36E 34F W |
March Grantham Grantham New England New England Mexborough Mexborough Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Grantham Withdrawn |
28/05/1932 04/06/1950 30/06/1950 16/09/1951 22/09/1951 28/10/1951 03/11/1951 17/08/1952 06/09/1952 26/11/1961 08/09/1963 |
08/09/1963 | |||
O2 | 2957 | 3950 | 63950 | 23/06/1932 | MAR 35B 35A 35A 35B 35B W |
March Grantham New England New England Grantham Grantham Withdrawn |
23/06/1932 14/05/1950 16/09/1951 22/09/1951 28/10/1951 03/11/1951 08/11/1960 |
08/11/1960 | |||
O2/4 | 2958 | 3951 | 63951 | 07/07/1932 | MAR 36A 36E W |
March Doncaster Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
07/07/1932 21/05/1950 16/10/1960 25/06/1962 |
25/06/1962 | |||
O2/4 | 2959 | 3952 | 63952 | 11/07/1932 | MAR 36A W |
March Doncaster Withdrawn |
11/07/1932 21/05/1950 27/04/1961 |
27/04/1961 | |||
O2/4 | 2960 | 3953 | 63953 | 29/07/1932 | MAR 36A W |
March Doncaster Withdrawn |
29/07/1932 21/05/1950 08/11/1960 |
08/11/1960 | |||
O2/4 | 2961 | 3954 | 63954 | 17/08/1932 | MAR 36A 36E W |
March Doncaster Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
17/08/1932 21/05/1950 31/01/1960 14/03/1961 |
14/03/1961 | |||
O2/4 | 2430 | 3955 | 63955 | 29/11/1933 | MAR 36A 36E W |
March Doncaster Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
29/11/1933 21/05/1950 16/10/1960 07/05/1962 |
07/05/1962 | |||
O2/4 | 2431 | 3956 | 63956 | 08/12/1933 | MAR 36A 34F W |
March Doncaster Grantham Withdrawn |
08/12/1933 21/05/1950 27/11/1960 08/09/1963 |
08/09/1963 | |||
O2/4 | 2432 | 3957 | 63957 | 15/12/1933 | MAR 36A 34F W |
March Doncaster Grantham Withdrawn |
15/12/1933 21/05/1950 14/06/1959 04/07/1961 |
04/07/1961 | |||
O2/4 | 2433 | 3958 | 63958 | 28/12/1933 | MAR 36A 36A W |
March Doncaster Doncaster Withdrawn |
28/12/1933 25/06/1950 30/06/1950 04/05/1961 |
04/05/1961 | |||
O2/4 | 2434 | 3959 | 63959 | 20/01/1934 | MAR 36A 36A 36E W |
March Doncaster Doncaster Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
20/01/1934 25/06/1950 30/06/1950 23/02/1958 19/10/1960 |
19/10/1960 | |||
O2/4 | 2435 | 3960 | 63960 | 27/01/1934 | MAR GRA W |
March Grantham Withdrawn |
27/01/1934 21/05/1949 08/09/1963 |
08/09/1963 | |||
O2/4 | 2436 | 3961 | 63961 | 20/02/1934 | MAR 36A 36A 36C 36E W |
March Doncaster Doncaster Frodingham Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
20/02/1934 25/06/1950 30/06/1950 12/04/1953 03/01/1954 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 | |||
O2/4 | 2437 | 3962 | 63962 | 15/03/1934 | MAR NWE MAR 36A 36A 36E 34F 36A W |
March New England March Doncaster Doncaster Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Grantham Doncaster Withdrawn |
15/03/1934 27/12/1935 04/01/1936 25/06/1950 30/06/1950 16/09/1962 30/12/1962 08/09/1963 22/09/1963 |
22/09/1963 | |||
O2/4 | 3833 | 3963 | 63963 | 22/05/1942 | DON CLK NWE DON FRO 36A 34F W |
Doncaster Colwick New England Doncaster Frodingham Doncaster Grantham Withdrawn |
22/05/1942 23/01/1944 17/01/1945 11/12/1945 20/10/1947 13/06/1954 14/06/1959 08/09/1963 |
08/09/1963 | |||
O2/4 | 3834 | 3964 | 63964 | 10/06/1942 | DON CLK DON LNG 36A 36A 36E W |
Doncaster Colwick Doncaster Langwith Junction Doncaster Doncaster Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
10/06/1942 23/01/1944 09/12/1945 27/10/1946 25/06/1950 30/06/1950 31/01/1960 22/09/1963 |
22/09/1963 | |||
O2/4 | 3835 | 3965 | 63965 | 26/06/1942 | DON CLK LNG 35B 35B 36B 36B 36E 36E W |
Doncaster Colwick Langwith Junction Grantham Grantham Mexborough Mexborough Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
26/06/1942 23/01/1944 05/10/1947 18/06/1950 30/06/1950 28/10/1951 03/11/1951 17/02/1952 23/02/1952 10/10/1962 |
10/10/1962 | |||
O2/4 | 3836 | 3966 | 63966 | 31/07/1942 | DON CLK LNG 35B 35B 36E W |
Doncaster Colwick Langwith Junction Grantham Grantham Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
31/07/1942 23/01/1944 28/10/1946 18/06/1950 30/06/1950 11/06/1961 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 | |||
O2/4 | 3837 | 3967 | 63967 | 21/08/1942 | DON CLK LNG 36A 36A W |
Doncaster Colwick Langwith Junction Doncaster Doncaster Withdrawn |
21/08/1942 23/01/1944 20/10/1946 25/06/1950 30/06/1950 26/11/1962 |
26/11/1962 | |||
O2/4 | 3838 | 3968 | 63968 | 02/09/1942 | DON CLK LNG 36A 36A 36E 34F 36A W |
Doncaster Colwick Langwith Junction Doncaster Doncaster Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Grantham Doncaster Withdrawn |
02/09/1942 23/01/1944 05/10/1947 25/06/1950 30/06/1950 09/12/1962 30/12/1962 08/09/1963 22/09/1963 |
22/09/1963 | |||
O2/4 | 3839 | 3969 | 63969 | 12/09/1942 | DON CLK LNG 36B 36A 36A 36E W |
Doncaster Colwick Langwith Junction Mexborough Doncaster Doncaster Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
12/09/1942 23/01/1944 20/10/1946 02/07/1950 18/03/1951 31/03/1951 31/01/1960 03/11/1963 |
03/11/1963 | |||
O2/4 | 3840 | 3970 | 63970 | 3970 | 21/09/1942 | DON CLK LNG ANN ANN LNG LNG 36B 36E 36E W |
Doncaster Colwick Langwith Junction Annesley Annesley Langwith Junction Langwith Junction Mexborough Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
21/09/1942 23/01/1944 20/10/1946 20/02/1948 21/02/1948 07/03/1948 13/03/1948 02/07/1950 05/08/1951 11/08/1951 09/05/1960 |
09/05/1960 | ||
O2/4 | 3841 | 3971 | 63971 | 05/10/1942 | DON CLK LNG 36B 36A 36A 36E W |
Doncaster Colwick Langwith Junction Mexborough Doncaster Doncaster Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
05/10/1942 23/01/1944 20/10/1946 02/07/1950 18/03/1951 31/03/1951 27/04/1958 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 | |||
O2/4 | 3842 | 3972 | 63972 | 10/10/1942 | DON CLK LNG 36B 36E 36E W |
Doncaster Colwick Langwith Junction Mexborough Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
10/10/1942 23/01/1944 20/10/1946 02/07/1950 05/08/1951 11/08/1951 04/05/1963 |
04/05/1963 | |||
O2/4 | 3843 | 3973 | 63973 | 23/10/1942 | DON CLK LNG 36B 36A 36E W |
Doncaster Colwick Langwith Junction Mexborough Doncaster Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
23/10/1942 23/01/1944 20/10/1946 02/07/1950 27/08/1950 16/10/1960 22/09/1963 |
22/09/1963 | |||
O2/4 | 3844 | 3974 | 63974 | 03/11/1942 | DON CLK LNG 36B 36B 36A 34F 36A W |
Doncaster Colwick Langwith Junction Mexborough Mexborough Doncaster Grantham Doncaster Withdrawn |
03/11/1942 23/01/1944 20/10/1946 18/06/1950 30/06/1950 27/08/1950 28/10/1962 08/09/1963 22/09/1963 |
22/09/1963 | |||
O2/4 | 3845 | 3975 | 63975 | 06/11/1942 | DON NWE DON FRO 40E 40E 36B 36A 36A 36E W |
Doncaster New England Doncaster Frodingham Langwith Junction Langwith Junction Mexborough Doncaster Doncaster Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
06/11/1942 21/11/1942 11/12/1945 20/10/1947 12/03/1950 18/03/1950 02/07/1950 18/03/1951 31/03/1951 16/10/1960 03/11/1963 |
03/11/1963 | |||
O2/3 | 3846 | 3976 | 63976 | 18/11/1942 | DON NWE DON LNG 36B 36E 36E W |
Doncaster New England Doncaster Langwith Junction Mexborough Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
18/11/1942 21/11/1942 28/12/1945 27/10/1946 16/07/1950 11/08/1951 05/08/1957 22/09/1963 |
22/09/1963 | |||
O2/4 | 3847 | 3977 | 63977 | 21/11/1942 | DON 36B 36A W |
Doncaster Mexborough Doncaster Withdrawn |
21/11/1942 02/07/1950 31/03/1951 22/09/1963 |
22/09/1963 | |||
O2/4 | 3848 | 3978 | 63978 | 28/11/1942 | DON CLK LNG 36B 36A 36A 36E W |
Doncaster Colwick Langwith Junction Mexborough Doncaster Doncaster Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
28/11/1942 23/01/1944 20/10/1946 02/07/1950 18/03/1951 31/03/1951 16/09/1962 07/05/1963 |
07/05/1963 | |||
O2/4 | 3849 | 3979 | 63979 | 3979 | 04/12/1942 | DON CLK LNG 36B 36A 36A 36E 36E W |
Doncaster Colwick Langwith Junction Mexborough Doncaster Doncaster Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
04/12/1942 25/01/1944 05/10/1947 02/07/1950 18/03/1951 31/03/1951 17/08/1952 06/09/1952 10/09/1962 |
10/09/1962 | ||
O2/4 | 3850 | 3980 | 63980 | 11/12/1942 | DON CLK LNG 36B 36A 36E 36E W |
Doncaster Colwick Langwith Junction Mexborough Doncaster Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
11/12/1942 23/01/1944 20/10/1946 02/07/1950 25/02/1951 17/08/1952 06/09/1952 22/09/1963 |
22/09/1963 | |||
O2/4 | 3851 | 3981 | 63981 | 17/12/1942 | DON CLK LNG 36B 36A 36A 34F 36E W |
Doncaster Colwick Langwith Junction Mexborough Doncaster Doncaster Grantham Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
17/12/1942 23/01/1944 20/10/1946 02/07/1950 14/09/1952 04/10/1952 28/10/1962 08/09/1963 03/11/1963 |
03/11/1963 | |||
O2/4 | 3852 | 3982 | 63982 | 21/12/1942 | DON CLK LNG 36B 36E 36E 34F W |
Doncaster Colwick Langwith Junction Mexborough Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Grantham Withdrawn |
21/12/1942 23/01/1944 05/10/1947 02/07/1950 05/08/1951 11/08/1951 20/11/1960 09/12/1962 |
09/12/1962 | |||
O2/4 | 3853 | 3983 | 63983 | 26/12/1942 | DON CLK LNG 36B 36C 36C 36A 36E W |
Doncaster Colwick Langwith Junction Mexborough Frodingham Frodingham Doncaster Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
26/12/1942 23/01/1944 20/10/1946 02/07/1950 17/08/1952 06/09/1952 13/06/1954 16/10/1960 02/07/1963 |
02/07/1963 | |||
O2/4 | 3854 | 3984 | 63984 | 31/12/1942 | DON CLK NWE DON LNG 36B 36C 36C 36A 36E 34F 36E W |
Doncaster Colwick New England Doncaster Langwith Junction Mexborough Frodingham Frodingham Doncaster Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Grantham Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
31/12/1942 23/01/1944 29/03/1944 18/11/1945 27/10/1946 02/07/1950 17/08/1952 06/09/1952 29/08/1954 16/09/1962 30/12/1962 08/09/1963 03/11/1963 |
03/11/1963 | |||
O2/4 | 3855 | 3985 | 63985 | 02/01/1943 | DON CLK DON LNG 36B 36C 36C 36A 36E 34F 36E W |
Doncaster Colwick Doncaster Langwith Junction Mexborough Frodingham Frodingham Doncaster Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Grantham Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
02/01/1943 23/01/1944 09/12/1945 27/10/1946 02/07/1950 17/08/1952 06/09/1952 13/06/1954 16/09/1962 30/12/1962 08/09/1963 22/09/1963 |
22/09/1963 | |||
O2/4 | 3856 | 3986 | 63986 | 07/01/1943 | DON CLK NWE DON LNG 36B 36A 36E 36E W |
Doncaster Colwick New England Doncaster Langwith Junction Mexborough Doncaster Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
07/01/1943 23/01/1944 29/03/1944 18/12/1945 27/10/1946 02/07/1950 27/08/1950 17/08/1952 06/09/1952 07/06/1963 |
07/06/1963 | |||
O2/4 | 3857 | 3987 | 63987 | 21/01/1943 | DON CLK NWE DON LNG ANN ANN LNG LNG 36B 36B 36A 36E 36E 34F 36E W |
Doncaster Colwick New England Doncaster Langwith Junction Annesley Annesley Langwith Junction Langwith Junction Mexborough Mexborough Doncaster Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Grantham Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
21/01/1943 23/01/1944 29/03/1944 18/12/1945 27/10/1946 20/02/1948 21/02/1948 07/03/1948 13/03/1948 07/02/1950 02/07/1950 27/08/1950 17/08/1952 06/09/1952 30/12/1962 08/09/1963 22/09/1963 |
22/09/1963 |