Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 396 Today
» 854 Yesterday
» 5365 Week
» 17878 Month
» 106070 Year
» 990451 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GNR/LNER Gresley "O3" Class 2-8-0


Class GNR LNER (1924 Tmp) LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR BR (Tmp) Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
O3 456   3456 3475 63475   12/1913 NWE
HSY
NWE
MEX
DON
FRO
DON
36E
W
New England
Hornsey
New England
Mexborough
Doncaster
Frodingham
Doncaster
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Withdrawn
12/1913
23/06/1930
26/02/1931
31/05/1937
04/01/1938
07/04/1946
17/01/1948
27/08/1950
24/07/1951
24/07/1951
O3 457   3457 3476 63476   12/1913 NWE
MEX
DON
GRA
DON
FRO
DON
36E
W
New England
Mexborough
Doncaster
Grantham
Doncaster
Frodingham
Doncaster
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Withdrawn
12/1913
31/05/1937
18/01/1938
06/05/1945
25/06/1945
04/05/1946
18/01/1948
25/02/1951
17/03/1952
17/03/1952
O3 458   3458 3477 63477   01/1914 NWE
DON
FRO
DON
36E
W
New England
Doncaster
Frodingham
Doncaster
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Withdrawn
01/1914
26/08/1939
25/04/1946
17/01/1948
18/03/1951
08/10/1951
08/10/1951
O3 459   3459 3478 63478   01/1914 NWE
CLK
NWE
DON
FRO
DON
36E
W
New England
Colwick
New England
Doncaster
Frodingham
Doncaster
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Withdrawn
01/1914
27/11/1925
19/08/1935
07/10/1939
07/04/1946
18/01/1948
03/12/1950
15/10/1951
15/10/1951
O3 460 460 3460 3479 63479 3479 02/1914 NWE
HSY
NWE
GRA
NWE
GRA
DON
FRO
DON
IMM
36A
36E
W
New England
Hornsey
New England
Grantham
New England
Grantham
Doncaster
Frodingham
Doncaster
Immingham
Doncaster
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Withdrawn
02/1914
23/06/1930
01/10/1930
20/11/1942
12/03/1944
30/09/1944
25/06/1945
07/04/1946
18/01/1948
30/05/1948
25/06/1950
18/03/1951
16/05/1951
16/05/1951
O3 462   3462 3480 63480   04/1919 DON
NWE
GRA
DON
FRO
DON
IMM
36E
W
Doncaster
New England
Grantham
Doncaster
Frodingham
Doncaster
Immingham
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Withdrawn
25/06/1900
04/1919
13/11/1942
25/06/1945
07/04/1946
18/01/1948
30/05/1948
18/03/1951
26/03/1951
26/03/1951
O3 463 463 3463 3481 63481   04/1919 NWE
GRA
DON
FRO
DON
W
New England
Grantham
Doncaster
Frodingham
Doncaster
Withdrawn
04/1919
21/11/1942
25/06/1945
07/04/1946
18/01/1948
02/04/1951
02/04/1951
O3 464   3464 3482 63482   05/1919 CLK
NWE
GRA
DON
FRO
DON
IMM
36A
36E
W
Colwick
New England
Grantham
Doncaster
Frodingham
Doncaster
Immingham
Doncaster
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Withdrawn
05/1919
17/03/1925
20/11/1942
25/06/1945
07/04/1946
18/01/1948
30/05/1948
25/06/1950
27/08/1950
21/01/1952
21/01/1952
O3 465   3465 3483 63483   05/1919 NWE
DON
FRO
DON
W
New England
Doncaster
Frodingham
Doncaster
Withdrawn
05/1919
17/01/1936
07/04/1946
18/01/1948
02/04/1951
02/04/1951
O3 466   3466 3484 63484   05/1919 NWE
DON
FRO
DON
36E
36A
W
New England
Doncaster
Frodingham
Doncaster
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Doncaster
Withdrawn
05/1919
14/12/1937
07/04/1946
18/01/1948
25/02/1951
17/08/1952
16/12/1952
16/12/1952
O3 467   3467 3485 63485   06/1919 NWE
GRA
NWE
GRA
DON
FRO
DON
W
New England
Grantham
New England
Grantham
Doncaster
Frodingham
Doncaster
Withdrawn
06/1919
20/11/1942
12/03/1944
30/09/1944
25/06/1945
07/04/1946
18/01/1948
26/09/1951
26/09/1951
O3 468   3468 3486 63486   06/1919 NWE
CLK
NWE
GRA
DON
FRO
DON
W
New England
Colwick
New England
Grantham
Doncaster
Frodingham
Doncaster
Withdrawn
06/1919
28/11/1925
12/07/1929
19/11/1942
25/06/1945
07/04/1946
18/01/1948
05/02/1951
05/02/1951
O3 469   3469 3487     06/1919 CLK
NWE
CLK
NWE
CLK
NWE
GRA
DON
W
Colwick
New England
Colwick
New England
Colwick
New England
Grantham
Doncaster
Withdrawn
06/1919
13/03/1925
27/11/1925
09/08/1934
09/10/1934
08/11/1934
14/11/1942
25/06/1945
04/07/1947
04/07/1947
O3 470   3470 3488 63488   06/1919 CLK
NWE
GRA
DON
FRO
DON
36E
W
Colwick
New England
Grantham
Doncaster
Frodingham
Doncaster
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Withdrawn
06/1919
17/03/1925
21/11/1942
25/06/1945
07/04/1946
18/01/1948
03/12/1950
22/02/1952
22/02/1952
O3 471   3471 3489 63489   06/1919 CLK
NWE
DON
GRA
NWE
GRA
DON
FRO
DON
W
Colwick
New England
Doncaster
Grantham
New England
Grantham
Doncaster
Frodingham
Doncaster
Withdrawn
06/1919
16/03/1925
23/11/1940
21/11/1942
22/09/1944
30/09/1944
25/06/1945
07/04/1946
18/01/1948
22/07/1948
22/07/1948
O3 472   3472 3490     10/1919 NWE
GRA
DON
FRO
W
New England
Grantham
Doncaster
Frodingham
Withdrawn
10/1919
21/11/1942
01/08/1945
07/04/1946
19/06/1947
19/06/1947
O3 473   3473 3491 63491   10/1919 NWE
GRA
DON
FRO
DON
W
New England
Grantham
Doncaster
Frodingham
Doncaster
Withdrawn
10/1919
21/11/1942
25/06/1945
07/04/1946
18/01/1948
18/12/1950
18/12/1950
O3 474   3474 3492     10/1919 NWE
DON
GRA
DON
FRO
W
New England
Doncaster
Grantham
Doncaster
Frodingham
Withdrawn
10/1919
22/01/1938
06/05/1945
25/06/1945
07/04/1946
10/05/1947
10/05/1947
O3 475   3475 3493 63493   10/1919 NWE
CLK
NWE
CLK
NWE
DON
FRO
DON
W
New England
Colwick
New England
Colwick
New England
Doncaster
Frodingham
Doncaster
Withdrawn
10/1919
27/11/1925
09/08/1934
08/10/1934
08/11/1934
23/11/1940
07/04/1946
18/01/1948
19/02/1951
19/02/1951
O3 476   3476 3494 63494   10/1919 NWE
DON
FRO
DON
W
New England
Doncaster
Frodingham
Doncaster
Withdrawn
10/1919
12/07/1939
07/04/1946
18/01/1948
05/03/1948
05/03/1948