Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 300 Today
» 1182 Yesterday
» 4937 Week
» 16230 Month
» 280863 Year
» 1502428 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GNR/LNER Gresley "O3" Class 2-8-0


Old Number Company Old Num Type New Number Company Subtype New Num Type Date
463 GNR Pre Grouping 463N LNER 1924 Tmp Big Four   15/10/1923
460 GNR Pre Grouping 460N LNER 1924 Tmp Big Four m/e 12/1923
458 GNR Pre Grouping 3458 LNER 1924 Big Four   11/02/1924
466 GNR Pre Grouping 3466 LNER 1924 Big Four   10/05/1924
462 GNR Pre Grouping 3462 LNER 1924 Big Four   21/06/1924
471 GNR Pre Grouping 3471 LNER 1924 Big Four   09/08/1924
467 GNR Pre Grouping 3467 LNER 1924 Big Four   30/08/1924
470 GNR Pre Grouping 3470 LNER 1924 Big Four   18/10/1924
464 GNR Pre Grouping 3464 LNER 1924 Big Four   25/10/1924
473 GNR Pre Grouping 3473 LNER 1924 Big Four   22/11/1924
474 GNR Pre Grouping 3474 LNER 1924 Big Four   29/11/1924
476 GNR Pre Grouping 3476 LNER 1924 Big Four   05/12/1924
456 GNR Pre Grouping 3456 LNER 1924 Big Four   12/12/1924
472 GNR Pre Grouping 3472 LNER 1924 Big Four   14/02/1925
465 GNR Pre Grouping 3465 LNER 1924 Big Four   21/02/1925
468 GNR Pre Grouping 3468 LNER 1924 Big Four   27/02/1925
459 GNR Pre Grouping 3459 LNER 1924 Big Four   11/04/1925
475 GNR Pre Grouping 3475 LNER 1924 Big Four   11/04/1925
469 GNR Pre Grouping 3469 LNER 1924 Big Four   25/06/1925
463N LNER Big Four 3463 LNER 1924 Big Four   18/03/1926
460N LNER Big Four 3460 LNER 1924 Big Four   30/03/1926
457 GNR Pre Grouping 3457 LNER 1924 Big Four   10/04/1926
3464 LNER Big Four 3482 LNER 1946 Big Four   19/05/1946
3471 LNER Big Four 3489 LNER 1946 Big Four   10/09/1946
3460 LNER Big Four 3479 LNER 1946 Big Four   11/09/1946
3470 LNER Big Four 3488 LNER 1946 Big Four   23/09/1946
3469 LNER Big Four 3487 LNER 1946 Big Four   28/09/1946
3465 LNER Big Four 3483 LNER 1946 Big Four   20/10/1946
3466 LNER Big Four 3484 LNER 1946 Big Four   20/10/1946
3458 LNER Big Four 3477 LNER 1946 Big Four   27/10/1946
3462 LNER Big Four 3480 LNER 1946 Big Four   27/10/1946
3463 LNER Big Four 3481 LNER 1946 Big Four   27/10/1946
3476 LNER Big Four 3494 LNER 1946 Big Four   27/10/1946
3459 LNER Big Four 3478 LNER 1946 Big Four   05/11/1946
3457 LNER Big Four 3476 LNER 1946 Big Four   10/11/1946
3467 LNER Big Four 3485 LNER 1946 Big Four   10/11/1946
3468 LNER Big Four 3486 LNER 1946 Big Four   17/11/1946
3472 LNER Big Four 3490 LNER 1946 Big Four   17/11/1946
3473 LNER Big Four 3491 LNER 1946 Big Four   17/11/1946
3474 LNER Big Four 3492 LNER 1946 Big Four   17/11/1946
3475 LNER Big Four 3493 LNER 1946 Big Four   15/12/1946
3456 LNER Big Four 3475 LNER 1946 Big Four   22/12/1946
3479 LNER Big Four E3479 BR BR Tmp British Rail   27/02/1948
3476 LNER Big Four 63476 BR   British Rail w/e 27/03/1948
3483 LNER Big Four 63483 BR   British Rail w/e 17/04/1948
3478 LNER Big Four 63478 BR   British Rail w/e 05/06/1948
3477 LNER Big Four 63477 BR   British Rail w/e 17/07/1948
3493 LNER Big Four 63493 BR   British Rail w/e 24/07/1948
3488 LNER Big Four 63488 BR   British Rail w/e 31/07/1948
3485 LNER Big Four 63485 BR   British Rail w/e 21/08/1948
3486 LNER Big Four 63486 BR   British Rail w/e 18/09/1948
3484 LNER Big Four 63484 BR   British Rail w/e 02/10/1948
E3479 BR British Rail 63479 BR   British Rail w/e 09/10/1948
3491 LNER Big Four 63491 BR   British Rail w/e 04/12/1948
3481 LNER Big Four 63481 BR   British Rail w/e 29/01/1949
3480 LNER Big Four 63480 BR   British Rail w/e 23/04/1949
3475 LNER Big Four 63475 BR   British Rail w/e 05/11/1949
3482 LNER Big Four 63482 BR   British Rail w/e 17/06/1950