GCR/LNER Robinson "O4" Class 2-8-0
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
15/01/1912 | Reallocation | 334 | GOR | Gorton | |||
08/07/1912 | Reallocation | 1183 | GOR | Gorton | |||
08/1912 | To Service | 352 | NEW | GOR | Gorton | ||
08/1912 | To Service | 1205 | NEW | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
08/1912 | To Service | 1209 | NEW | MEX | Mexborough | ||
13/08/1912 | Reallocation | 1183 | GOR | Gorton | MEX | Mexborough | |
13/08/1912 | Reallocation | 1184 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
13/08/1912 | Reallocation | 1185 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
15/08/1912 | Reallocation | 1186 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
15/08/1912 | Reallocation | 1187 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
16/08/1912 | Reallocation | 1188 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
20/08/1912 | Reallocation | 1189 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
20/08/1912 | Reallocation | 1190 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
24/08/1912 | Reallocation | 1191 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
27/08/1912 | Reallocation | 1203 | IMM | Immingham | |||
01/09/1912 | Reallocation | 1192 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
07/09/1912 | Reallocation | 1206 | GRI | Grimsby | |||
13/09/1912 | Reallocation | 1207 | GRI | Grimsby | |||
14/09/1912 | Reallocation | 1212 | ANN | Annesley | |||
16/09/1912 | Reallocation | 1213 | ANN | Annesley | |||
18/09/1912 | Reallocation | 1193 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
18/09/1912 | Reallocation | 1194 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
19/09/1912 | Reallocation | 1196 | GOR | Gorton | |||
20/09/1912 | Reallocation | 1208 | GRI | Grimsby | |||
23/09/1912 | Reallocation | 1214 | ANN | Annesley | |||
23/09/1912 | Reallocation | 1215 | ANN | Annesley | |||
24/09/1912 | Reallocation | 1195 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
25/09/1912 | Reallocation | 1216 | ANN | Annesley | |||
26/09/1912 | Reallocation | 1196 | GOR | Gorton | MEX | Mexborough | |
29/09/1912 | Reallocation | 1217 | ANN | Annesley | |||
29/09/1912 | Reallocation | 1218 | ANN | Annesley | |||
10/1912 | To Service | 1223 | NEW | ANN | Annesley | ||
10/1912 | To Service | 1224 | NEW | ANN | Annesley | ||
21/10/1912 | Reallocation | 1198 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
23/10/1912 | Reallocation | 354 | GOR | Gorton | |||
24/10/1912 | Reallocation | 1199 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
24/10/1912 | Reallocation | 1200 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
11/1912 | Reallocation | 1220 | ANN | Annesley | |||
11/1912 | Reallocation | 1221 | ANN | Annesley | |||
11/1912 | To Service | 1225 | NEW | ANN | Annesley | ||
11/1912 | To Service | 1226 | NEW | ANN | Annesley | ||
11/1912 | To Service | 1227 | NEW | ANN | Annesley | ||
11/1912 | To Service | 1229 | NEW | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
11/1912 | To Service | 1230 | NEW | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
11/1912 | To Service | 1231 | NEW | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
11/1912 | To Service | 1233 | NEW | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
01/11/1912 | Reallocation | 1201 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
03/11/1912 | Reallocation | 1228 | ANN | Annesley | |||
13/11/1912 | Reallocation | 1219 | ANN | Annesley | |||
12/1912 | To Service | 1239 | NEW | GOR | Gorton | ||
12/1912 | To Service | 1242 | NEW | IMM | Immingham | ||
12/1912 | To Service | 1245 | NEW | IMM | Immingham | ||
12/1912 | To Service | 1246 | NEW | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
12/1912 | To Service | 1247 | NEW | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
03/1914 | To Service | 391 | NEW | MEX | Mexborough | ||
03/1914 | To Service | 392 | NEW | MEX | Mexborough | ||
03/1914 | To Service | 393 | NEW | GOR | Gorton | ||
14/03/1914 | Reallocation | 385 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |||
05/1914 | To Service | 398 | NEW | MEX | Mexborough | ||
01/11/1914 | Reallocation | 1237 | IMM | Immingham | |||
17/03/1915 | Reallocation | 1238 | ANN | Annesley | |||
18/03/1915 | Reallocation | 351 | ANN | Annesley | |||
03/04/1915 | Reallocation | 1202 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
24/07/1915 | Reallocation | 375 | ANN | Annesley | |||
09/10/1915 | Reallocation | 1211 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | |||
02/03/1916 | Reallocation | 382 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |||
10/06/1916 | Reallocation | 347 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
08/08/1916 | Reallocation | 381 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |||
30/09/1916 | Reallocation | 407 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
01/12/1916 | Reallocation | 399 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |||
19/01/1917 | Reallocation | 133 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
19/01/1917 | Reallocation | 1207 | GRI | Grimsby | MEX | Mexborough | |
17/02/1917 | Reallocation | 1243 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
17/03/1917 | Reallocation | 405 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
17/03/1917 | Reallocation | 1241 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
30/03/1917 | Reallocation | 331 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
30/03/1917 | Reallocation | 348 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
30/03/1917 | Reallocation | 386 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
27/04/1917 | Reallocation | 403 | IMM | Immingham | |||
11/05/1917 | Reallocation | 406 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
11/05/1917 | Reallocation | 388 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
11/05/1917 | Reallocation | 397 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
10/08/1917 | Reallocation | 395 | GOR | Gorton | |||
07/09/1917 | Reallocation | 387 | ANN | Annesley | |||
23/11/1917 | Reallocation | 380 | ANN | Annesley | |||
07/09/1918 | Reallocation | 389 | ANN | Annesley | |||
02/11/1918 | Reallocation | 271 | ANN | Annesley | |||
06/12/1918 | Reallocation | 69 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
05/04/1919 | Reallocation | 376 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
07/06/1919 | Reallocation | 349 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
07/06/1919 | Reallocation | 350 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
04/07/1919 | Reallocation | 1197 | GOR | Gorton | |||
18/07/1919 | Reallocation | 402 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
24/07/1919 | Reallocation | 333 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
24/07/1919 | Reallocation | 400 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
24/07/1919 | Reallocation | 384 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
20/09/1919 | Reallocation | 346 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
20/09/1919 | Reallocation | 1216 | ANN | Annesley | MEX | Mexborough | |
20/09/1919 | Reallocation | 1222 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
20/09/1919 | Reallocation | 1224 | ANN | Annesley | MEX | Mexborough | |
20/09/1919 | Reallocation | 390 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
17/10/1919 | Reallocation | 1210 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
15/11/1919 | Reallocation | 335 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
15/11/1919 | Reallocation | 404 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
15/11/1919 | Reallocation | 1208 | GRI | Grimsby | MEX | Mexborough | |
15/11/1919 | Reallocation | 1235 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | |||
15/11/1919 | Reallocation | 1236 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | |||
1920 | Reallocation | 1206 | GRI | Grimsby | KEA | Keadby | |
06/02/1920 | Reallocation | 1244 | IMM | Immingham | |||
01/05/1920 | Reallocation | 1197 | GOR | Gorton | MEX | Mexborough | |
14/05/1920 | Reallocation | 396 | GOR | Gorton | |||
13/11/1920 | Reallocation | 383 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |||
22/07/1921 | Reallocation | 1234 | GOR | Gorton | |||
28/07/1921 | Reallocation | 408 | ANN | Annesley | |||
05/08/1921 | Reallocation | 355 | GOR | Gorton | |||
05/08/1921 | Reallocation | 1 | GOR | Gorton | |||
17/08/1921 | Reallocation | 378 | GOR | Gorton | |||
29/09/1921 | Reallocation | 102 | GOR | Gorton | |||
14/10/1921 | Reallocation | 966 | GOR | Gorton | |||
18/11/1921 | Reallocation | 377 | GOR | Gorton | |||
18/11/1921 | Reallocation | 379 | GOR | Gorton | |||
15/12/1921 | Reallocation | 93 | GOR | Gorton | |||
17/03/1922 | Reallocation | 5 | GOR | Gorton | |||
24/03/1922 | Reallocation | 353 | GOR | Gorton | |||
16/06/1922 | Reallocation | 26 | GOR | Gorton | |||
16/06/1922 | Reallocation | 8 | GOR | Gorton | |||
01/07/1922 | Reallocation | 412 | GOR | Gorton | |||
01/07/1922 | Reallocation | 413 | GOR | Gorton | |||
07/07/1922 | Reallocation | 394 | GOR | Gorton | |||
29/09/1922 | Reallocation | 155 | GOR | Gorton | |||
06/10/1922 | Reallocation | 1232 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | |||
20/10/1922 | Reallocation | 1204 | IMM | Immingham | |||
20/10/1922 | Reallocation | 1240 | IMM | Immingham | |||
20/10/1922 | Reallocation | 1243 | MEX | Mexborough | IMM | Immingham | |
20/10/1922 | Reallocation | 1251 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | |||
17/11/1922 | Reallocation | 1248 | IMM | Immingham | |||
17/11/1922 | Reallocation | 1249 | IMM | Immingham | |||
17/11/1922 | Reallocation | 1250 | IMM | Immingham | |||
17/11/1922 | Reallocation | 1252 | IMM | Immingham | |||
1923 | Reallocation | 332 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
1923 | Reallocation | 1240 | IMM | Immingham | KEA | Keadby | |
02/02/1923 | Reallocation | 1252 | IMM | Immingham | MEX | Mexborough | |
02/02/1923 | Reallocation | 271 | ANN | Annesley | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | |
06/06/1923 | Reallocation | 1185 | MEX | Mexborough | THJ | Thornton Junction | |
02/11/1923 | Reallocation | 1185 | THJ | Thornton Junction | MEX | Mexborough | |
20/12/1923 | Reallocation | 2836 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
28/12/1923 | Reallocation | 1841 | GOR | Gorton | |||
28/12/1923 | Reallocation | 1306 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
28/12/1923 | Reallocation | 1741 | GOR | Gorton | |||
02/01/1924 | Reallocation | 2917 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
02/01/1924 | Reallocation | 1292 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
05/01/1924 | Reallocation | 1355 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
06/01/1924 | Reallocation | 334 | GOR | Gorton | IMM | Immingham | |
06/01/1924 | Reallocation | 352 | GOR | Gorton | IMM | Immingham | |
06/01/1924 | Reallocation | 353 | GOR | Gorton | KEA | Keadby | |
06/01/1924 | Reallocation | 377 | GOR | Gorton | KEA | Keadby | |
06/01/1924 | Reallocation | 379 | GOR | Gorton | IMM | Immingham | |
06/01/1924 | Reallocation | 393 | GOR | Gorton | IMM | Immingham | |
06/01/1924 | Reallocation | 394 | GOR | Gorton | KEA | Keadby | |
06/01/1924 | Reallocation | 395 | GOR | Gorton | IMM | Immingham | |
06/01/1924 | Reallocation | 396 | GOR | Gorton | KEA | Keadby | |
08/01/1924 | Reallocation | 1300 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
09/01/1924 | Reallocation | 1831 | GOR | Gorton | |||
12/01/1924 | Reallocation | 1258 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
16/01/1924 | Reallocation | 1325 | GOR | Gorton | |||
16/01/1924 | Reallocation | 1272 | GOR | Gorton | |||
17/01/1924 | Reallocation | 1878 | GOR | Gorton | |||
19/01/1924 | Reallocation | 2903 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
29/01/1924 | Reallocation | 93 | GOR | Gorton | MEX | Mexborough | |
30/01/1924 | Reallocation | 26 | GOR | Gorton | MEX | Mexborough | |
30/01/1924 | Reallocation | 102 | GOR | Gorton | MEX | Mexborough | |
30/01/1924 | Reallocation | 155 | GOR | Gorton | MEX | Mexborough | |
30/01/1924 | Reallocation | 354 | GOR | Gorton | MEX | Mexborough | |
31/01/1924 | Reallocation | 1283 | GOR | Gorton | |||
31/01/1924 | Reallocation | 1 | GOR | Gorton | MEX | Mexborough | |
01/02/1924 | Reallocation | 1282 | GOR | Gorton | |||
01/02/1924 | Reallocation | 6274 | GOR | Gorton | |||
01/02/1924 | Reallocation | 8 | GOR | Gorton | MEX | Mexborough | |
02/02/1924 | Reallocation | 1234 | GOR | Gorton | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | |
02/02/1924 | Reallocation | 6359 | GOR | Gorton | |||
02/02/1924 | Reallocation | 1259 | GOR | Gorton | |||
02/02/1924 | Reallocation | 6257 | GOR | Gorton | |||
02/02/1924 | Reallocation | 5 | GOR | Gorton | MEX | Mexborough | |
05/02/1924 | Reallocation | 6366 | GOR | Gorton | |||
05/02/1924 | Reallocation | 6262 | GOR | Gorton | |||
06/02/1924 | Reallocation | 6276 | GOR | Gorton | |||
07/02/1924 | Reallocation | 1910 | GOR | Gorton | |||
09/02/1924 | Reallocation | 355 | GOR | Gorton | MEX | Mexborough | |
09/02/1924 | Reallocation | 378 | GOR | Gorton | IMM | Immingham | |
09/02/1924 | Reallocation | 6367 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
09/02/1924 | Reallocation | 412 | GOR | Gorton | MEX | Mexborough | |
09/02/1924 | Reallocation | 413 | GOR | Gorton | MEX | Mexborough | |
13/02/1924 | Reallocation | 6319 | GOR | Gorton | |||
14/02/1924 | Reallocation | 6359 | GOR | Gorton | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
14/02/1924 | Reallocation | 1259 | GOR | Gorton | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
15/02/1924 | Reallocation | 6364 | GOR | Gorton | |||
15/02/1924 | Reallocation | 6266 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |||
15/02/1924 | Reallocation | 6263 | GOR | Gorton | |||
16/02/1924 | Reallocation | 6239 | GOR | Gorton | ANN | Annesley | |
16/02/1924 | Reallocation | 6263 | GOR | Gorton | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
16/02/1924 | Reallocation | 6264 | GOR | Gorton | |||
21/02/1924 | Reallocation | 6267 | GOR | Gorton | |||
21/02/1924 | Reallocation | 6307 | GOR | Gorton | |||
22/02/1924 | Reallocation | 6345 | ROD | IMM | Immingham | ||
22/02/1924 | Reallocation | 6364 | GOR | Gorton | IMM | Immingham | |
22/02/1924 | Reallocation | 6320 | GOR | Gorton | |||
23/02/1924 | Reallocation | 6376 | GOR | Gorton | |||
23/02/1924 | Reallocation | 6304 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
23/02/1924 | Reallocation | 6312 | GOR | Gorton | |||
24/02/1924 | Reallocation | 1247 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | IMM | Immingham | |
25/02/1924 | Reallocation | 1631 | GOR | Gorton | |||
28/02/1924 | Reallocation | 6358 | GOR | Gorton | |||
29/02/1924 | Reallocation | 6360 | GOR | Gorton | |||
01/03/1924 | Reallocation | 6336 | GOR | Gorton | |||
01/03/1924 | Reallocation | 6275 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |||
01/03/1924 | Reallocation | 6304 | GOR | Gorton | IMM | Immingham | |
03/03/1924 | Reallocation | 6254 | GOR | Gorton | |||
04/03/1924 | Reallocation | 6342 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
05/03/1924 | Reallocation | 6377 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |||
05/03/1924 | Reallocation | 6323 | GOR | Gorton | |||
07/03/1924 | Reallocation | 6285 | MAR | March | |||
08/03/1924 | Reallocation | 6358 | GOR | Gorton | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
08/03/1924 | Reallocation | 6265 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |||
10/03/1924 | Reallocation | 6261 | GOR | Gorton | |||
11/03/1924 | Reallocation | 381 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ANN | Annesley | |
11/03/1924 | Reallocation | 6363 | GOR | Gorton | |||
13/03/1924 | Reallocation | 382 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ANN | Annesley | |
13/03/1924 | Reallocation | 399 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | MEX | Mexborough | |
13/03/1924 | Reallocation | 6281 | GOR | Gorton | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
14/03/1924 | Reallocation | 6342 | GOR | Gorton | MAR | March | |
14/03/1924 | Reallocation | 6279 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |||
14/03/1924 | Reallocation | 6317 | GOR | Gorton | |||
14/03/1924 | Reallocation | 6254 | GOR | Gorton | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
15/03/1924 | Reallocation | 6365 | GOR | Gorton | |||
15/03/1924 | Reallocation | 6261 | GOR | Gorton | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
15/03/1924 | Reallocation | 6299 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
16/03/1924 | Reallocation | 6363 | GOR | Gorton | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
17/03/1924 | Reallocation | 6343 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
20/03/1924 | Reallocation | 6357 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |||
20/03/1924 | Reallocation | 6317 | GOR | Gorton | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
21/03/1924 | Reallocation | 6294 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
21/03/1924 | Reallocation | 6308 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |||
22/03/1924 | Reallocation | 6284 | GOR | Gorton | |||
22/03/1924 | Reallocation | 6324 | GOR | Gorton | |||
22/03/1924 | Reallocation | 6270 | GOR | Gorton | |||
22/03/1924 | Reallocation | 6280 | GOR | Gorton | |||
22/03/1924 | Reallocation | 6260 | GOR | Gorton | |||
24/03/1924 | Reallocation | 6285 | MAR | March | DON | Doncaster | |
24/03/1924 | Reallocation | 6343 | GOR | Gorton | DON | Doncaster | |
24/03/1924 | Reallocation | 6342 | MAR | March | DON | Doncaster | |
24/03/1924 | Reallocation | 6336 | GOR | Gorton | DON | Doncaster | |
24/03/1924 | Reallocation | 6294 | GOR | Gorton | DON | Doncaster | |
24/03/1924 | Reallocation | 6299 | GOR | Gorton | DON | Doncaster | |
25/03/1924 | Reallocation | 6271 | DON | Doncaster | |||
26/03/1924 | Reallocation | 1246 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | IMM | Immingham | |
26/03/1924 | Reallocation | 6324 | GOR | Gorton | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
27/03/1924 | Reallocation | 383 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ANN | Annesley | |
27/03/1924 | Reallocation | 6314 | GOR | Gorton | |||
27/03/1924 | Reallocation | 1699 | GOR | Gorton | |||
29/03/1924 | Reallocation | 385 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ANN | Annesley | |
29/03/1924 | Reallocation | 6360 | GOR | Gorton | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
29/03/1924 | Reallocation | 6362 | GOR | Gorton | |||
29/03/1924 | Reallocation | 6340 | GOR | Gorton | |||
29/03/1924 | Reallocation | 6321 | GOR | Gorton | |||
29/03/1924 | Reallocation | 6329 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
31/03/1924 | Reallocation | 383 | ANN | Annesley | CLK | Colwick | |
31/03/1924 | Reallocation | 1282 | GOR | Gorton | ANN | Annesley | |
01/04/1924 | Reallocation | 6267 | GOR | Gorton | ANN | Annesley | |
02/04/1924 | Reallocation | 6356 | GOR | Gorton | DON | Doncaster | |
04/04/1924 | Reallocation | 6323 | GOR | Gorton | ANN | Annesley | |
04/04/1924 | Reallocation | 6264 | GOR | Gorton | ANN | Annesley | |
04/04/1924 | Reallocation | 6289 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
05/04/1924 | Reallocation | 380 | ANN | Annesley | CLK | Colwick | |
05/04/1924 | Reallocation | 381 | ANN | Annesley | CLK | Colwick | |
05/04/1924 | Reallocation | 382 | ANN | Annesley | CLK | Colwick | |
05/04/1924 | Reallocation | 385 | ANN | Annesley | CLK | Colwick | |
05/04/1924 | Reallocation | 387 | ANN | Annesley | CLK | Colwick | |
05/04/1924 | Reallocation | 6375 | GOR | Gorton | |||
05/04/1924 | Reallocation | 6321 | GOR | Gorton | CLK | Colwick | |
05/04/1924 | Reallocation | 6273 | GOR | Gorton | |||
05/04/1924 | Reallocation | 6268 | GOR | Gorton | |||
05/04/1924 | Reallocation | 6277 | GOR | Gorton | |||
05/04/1924 | Reallocation | 6310 | GOR | Gorton | |||
05/04/1924 | Reallocation | 6314 | GOR | Gorton | CLK | Colwick | |
05/04/1924 | Reallocation | 6313 | GOR | Gorton | CLK | Colwick | |
07/04/1924 | Reallocation | 6289 | GOR | Gorton | DON | Doncaster | |
08/04/1924 | Reallocation | 6347 | GOR | Gorton | |||
08/04/1924 | Reallocation | 6340 | GOR | Gorton | IMM | Immingham | |
10/04/1924 | Reallocation | 1619 | GOR | Gorton | |||
10/04/1924 | Reallocation | 6322 | GOR | Gorton | |||
10/04/1924 | Reallocation | 1694 | GOR | Gorton | |||
10/04/1924 | Reallocation | 6315 | GOR | Gorton | |||
10/04/1924 | Reallocation | 6305 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
10/04/1924 | Reallocation | 1643 | GOR | Gorton | |||
10/04/1924 | Reallocation | 6298 | GOR | Gorton | |||
10/04/1924 | Reallocation | 2961 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
12/04/1924 | Reallocation | 6347 | GOR | Gorton | DON | Doncaster | |
12/04/1924 | Reallocation | 6329 | GOR | Gorton | IMM | Immingham | |
14/04/1924 | Reallocation | 2914 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
15/04/1924 | Reallocation | 6318 | GOR | Gorton | |||
16/04/1924 | Reallocation | 6253 | GOR | Gorton | |||
21/04/1924 | Reallocation | 6320 | GOR | Gorton | ANN | Annesley | |
21/04/1924 | Reallocation | 6262 | GOR | Gorton | ANN | Annesley | |
21/04/1924 | Reallocation | 6305 | GOR | Gorton | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
21/04/1924 | Reallocation | 6298 | GOR | Gorton | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
21/04/1924 | Reallocation | 6307 | GOR | Gorton | ANN | Annesley | |
24/04/1924 | Reallocation | 1206 | KEA | Keadby | IMM | Immingham | |
25/04/1924 | Reallocation | 2908 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
25/04/1924 | Reallocation | 2842 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
01/05/1924 | Reallocation | 2906 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
03/05/1924 | Reallocation | 6348 | GOR | Gorton | IMM | Immingham | |
03/05/1924 | Reallocation | 6339 | GOR | Gorton | IMM | Immingham | |
03/05/1924 | Reallocation | 6334 | GOR | Gorton | IMM | Immingham | |
03/05/1924 | Reallocation | 6297 | GOR | Gorton | IMM | Immingham | |
06/05/1924 | Reallocation | 2852 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
08/05/1924 | Reallocation | 2870 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
10/05/1924 | Reallocation | 6368 | GOR | Gorton | ANN | Annesley | |
14/05/1924 | Reallocation | 2909 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
14/05/1924 | Reallocation | 6326 | GOR | Gorton | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
15/05/1924 | Reallocation | 6353 | GOR | Gorton | ANN | Annesley | |
15/05/1924 | Reallocation | 6309 | GOR | Gorton | ANN | Annesley | |
16/05/1924 | Reallocation | 6361 | GOR | Gorton | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
16/05/1924 | Reallocation | 6256 | GOR | Gorton | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
17/05/1924 | Reallocation | 6374 | GOR | Gorton | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
20/05/1924 | Reallocation | 2875 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
22/05/1924 | Reallocation | 6344 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
23/05/1924 | Reallocation | 6258 | GOR | Gorton | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
24/05/1924 | Reallocation | 6301 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
29/05/1924 | Reallocation | 2900 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
29/05/1924 | Reallocation | 2971 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
29/05/1924 | Reallocation | 2978 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
31/05/1924 | Reallocation | 6369 | GOR | Gorton | |||
05/06/1924 | Reallocation | 2858 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
07/06/1924 | Reallocation | 6350 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
07/06/1924 | Reallocation | 6302 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
07/06/1924 | Reallocation | 6327 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
09/06/1924 | Reallocation | 1240 | KEA | Keadby | IMM | Immingham | |
12/06/1924 | Reallocation | 2905 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
12/06/1924 | Reallocation | 2972 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
12/06/1924 | Reallocation | 2898 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
21/06/1924 | Reallocation | 6295 | ROD | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
24/06/1924 | Reallocation | 2901 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
24/06/1924 | Reallocation | 2915 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
26/06/1924 | Reallocation | 2916 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
01/07/1924 | Reallocation | 6335 | GOR | Gorton | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
03/07/1924 | Reallocation | 1638 | GOR | Gorton | |||
05/07/1924 | Reallocation | 5966 | GOR | Gorton | IMM | Immingham | |
05/07/1924 | Reallocation | 6371 | GOR | Gorton | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
08/07/1924 | Reallocation | 2973 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
08/07/1924 | Reallocation | 2840 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
11/07/1924 | Reallocation | 6349 | GOR | Gorton | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
18/07/1924 | Reallocation | 6346 | ROD | THJ | Thornton Junction | ||
18/07/1924 | Reallocation | 6288 | THJ | Thornton Junction | |||
21/07/1924 | Reallocation | 402 | MEX | Mexborough | DON | Doncaster | |
21/07/1924 | Reallocation | 405 | MEX | Mexborough | DON | Doncaster | |
21/07/1924 | Reallocation | 406 | MEX | Mexborough | DON | Doncaster | |
21/07/1924 | Reallocation | 407 | MEX | Mexborough | DON | Doncaster | |
09/08/1924 | Reallocation | 6352 | ROD | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
13/08/1924 | Reallocation | 6328 | ROD | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
14/08/1924 | Reallocation | 6291 | ROD | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
19/08/1924 | Reallocation | 6351 | ROD | 29B | Stirling | ||
19/08/1924 | Reallocation | 6286 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | |||
20/08/1924 | Reallocation | 6370 | ROD | 29B | Stirling | ||
22/08/1924 | Reallocation | 6352 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | THJ | Thornton Junction | |
22/08/1924 | Reallocation | 6290 | ROD | THJ | Thornton Junction | ||
23/08/1924 | Reallocation | 402 | DON | Doncaster | MEX | Mexborough | |
30/08/1924 | Reallocation | 6372 | ROD | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
13/09/1924 | Reallocation | 6272 | GOR | Gorton | ARD | Ardsley | |
13/09/1924 | Reallocation | 6270 | GOR | Gorton | ARD | Ardsley | |
09/10/1924 | Reallocation | 6273 | GOR | Gorton | ARD | Ardsley | |
09/10/1924 | Reallocation | 6274 | GOR | Gorton | ARD | Ardsley | |
22/10/1924 | Reallocation | 6316 | GOR | Gorton | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
23/10/1924 | Reallocation | 6311 | GOR | Gorton | DON | Doncaster | |
11/11/1924 | Reallocation | 6359 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | DON | Doncaster | |
12/11/1924 | Reallocation | 6318 | GOR | Gorton | DON | Doncaster | |
22/11/1924 | Reallocation | 6360 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | DON | Doncaster | |
29/11/1924 | Reallocation | 6277 | GOR | Gorton | DON | Doncaster | |
13/12/1924 | Reallocation | 6362 | GOR | Gorton | DON | Doncaster | |
13/12/1924 | Reallocation | 6322 | GOR | Gorton | CLK | Colwick | |
20/12/1924 | Reallocation | 6284 | GOR | Gorton | DON | Doncaster | |
23/12/1924 | Reallocation | 6280 | GOR | Gorton | DON | Doncaster | |
23/12/1924 | Reallocation | 6254 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | GOR | Gorton | |
16/01/1925 | Reallocation | 6377 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | DON | Doncaster | |
16/01/1925 | Reallocation | 6374 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | DON | Doncaster | |
17/01/1925 | Reallocation | 6371 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | DON | Doncaster | |
17/01/1925 | Reallocation | 6263 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | DON | Doncaster | |
17/01/1925 | Reallocation | 6253 | GOR | Gorton | DON | Doncaster | |
21/01/1925 | Reallocation | 6324 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | CLK | Colwick | |
24/01/1925 | Reallocation | 6361 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | CLK | Colwick | |
30/01/1925 | Reallocation | 6264 | ANN | Annesley | NWE | New England | |
31/01/1925 | Reallocation | 6363 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ARD | Ardsley | |
02/02/1925 | Reallocation | 6279 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ARD | Ardsley | |
02/02/1925 | Reallocation | 6266 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ARD | Ardsley | |
04/02/1925 | Reallocation | 6308 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ARD | Ardsley | |
05/02/1925 | Reallocation | 6358 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ARD | Ardsley | |
05/02/1925 | Reallocation | 6357 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ARD | Ardsley | |
05/02/1925 | Reallocation | 6349 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ARD | Ardsley | |
20/02/1925 | Reallocation | 6308 | ARD | Ardsley | NWE | New England | |
23/02/1925 | Reallocation | 6266 | ARD | Ardsley | NWE | New England | |
24/02/1925 | Reallocation | 6270 | ARD | Ardsley | NWE | New England | |
26/02/1925 | Reallocation | 6254 | GOR | Gorton | DON | Doncaster | |
02/03/1925 | Reallocation | 6279 | ARD | Ardsley | NWE | New England | |
14/03/1925 | Reallocation | 6363 | ARD | Ardsley | CLK | Colwick | |
16/03/1925 | Reallocation | 6279 | NWE | New England | CLK | Colwick | |
16/03/1925 | Reallocation | 6270 | NWE | New England | CLK | Colwick | |
16/03/1925 | Reallocation | 6308 | NWE | New England | CLK | Colwick | |
18/03/1925 | Reallocation | 6266 | NWE | New England | CLK | Colwick | |
02/06/1925 | Reallocation | 1907 | GOR | Gorton | |||
18/06/1925 | Reallocation | 2073 | GOR | Gorton | |||
19/06/1925 | Reallocation | 1971 | GOR | Gorton | |||
19/06/1925 | Reallocation | 1747 | GOR | Gorton | |||
19/06/1925 | Reallocation | 1748 | GOR | Gorton | |||
02/07/1925 | Reallocation | 1668 | GOR | Gorton | |||
02/07/1925 | Reallocation | 1879 | GOR | Gorton | |||
02/07/1925 | Reallocation | 2074 | GOR | Gorton | |||
03/07/1925 | Reallocation | 6266 | CLK | Colwick | MAR | March | |
04/07/1925 | Reallocation | 6246 | IMM | Immingham | MAR | March | |
04/07/1925 | Reallocation | 6340 | IMM | Immingham | MAR | March | |
09/07/1925 | Reallocation | 6246 | MAR | March | IMM | Immingham | |
09/07/1925 | Reallocation | 6340 | MAR | March | IMM | Immingham | |
09/07/1925 | Reallocation | 6498 | GOR | Gorton | |||
09/07/1925 | Reallocation | 6501 | GOR | Gorton | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
09/07/1925 | Reallocation | 6502 | GOR | Gorton | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
10/07/1925 | Reallocation | 6506 | GOR | Gorton | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
10/07/1925 | Reallocation | 6266 | MAR | March | DON | Doncaster | |
11/07/1925 | Reallocation | 6511 | GOR | Gorton | DON | Doncaster | |
11/07/1925 | Reallocation | 6531 | GOR | Gorton | DON | Doncaster | |
13/07/1925 | Reallocation | 6533 | GOR | Gorton | DON | Doncaster | |
17/07/1925 | Reallocation | 6495 | GOR | Gorton | DON | Doncaster | |
21/07/1925 | Reallocation | 6498 | GOR | Gorton | DON | Doncaster | |
28/07/1925 | Reallocation | 1876 | GOR | Gorton | |||
30/07/1925 | Reallocation | 6510 | GOR | Gorton | |||
01/08/1925 | Reallocation | 6539 | GOR | Gorton | |||
01/08/1925 | Reallocation | 6540 | GOR | Gorton | |||
04/08/1925 | Reallocation | 2076 | GOR | Gorton | |||
06/08/1925 | Reallocation | 1953 | GOR | Gorton | |||
06/08/1925 | Reallocation | 2075 | GOR | Gorton | |||
13/08/1925 | Reallocation | 6505 | GOR | Gorton | DON | Doncaster | |
14/08/1925 | Reallocation | 6535 | GOR | Gorton | DON | Doncaster | |
15/08/1925 | Reallocation | 6510 | GOR | Gorton | CLK | Colwick | |
15/08/1925 | Reallocation | 6508 | GOR | Gorton | DON | Doncaster | |
17/08/1925 | Reallocation | 6534 | GOR | Gorton | DON | Doncaster | |
18/08/1925 | Reallocation | 6539 | GOR | Gorton | CLK | Colwick | |
18/08/1925 | Reallocation | 6540 | GOR | Gorton | CLK | Colwick | |
18/08/1925 | Reallocation | 6266 | DON | Doncaster | ANN | Annesley | |
20/08/1925 | Reallocation | 1626 | GOR | Gorton | |||
20/08/1925 | Reallocation | 1873 | GOR | Gorton | |||
20/08/1925 | Reallocation | 1954 | GOR | Gorton | |||
02/09/1925 | Reallocation | 6541 | GOR | Gorton | NWE | New England | |
02/09/1925 | Reallocation | 6504 | GOR | Gorton | NWE | New England | |
02/09/1925 | Reallocation | 6509 | GOR | Gorton | DON | Doncaster | |
19/09/1925 | Reallocation | 6496 | GOR | Gorton | |||
25/09/1925 | Reallocation | 6496 | GOR | Gorton | NWE | New England | |
25/09/1925 | Reallocation | 1881 | GOR | Gorton | |||
01/10/1925 | Reallocation | 1913 | GOR | Gorton | |||
06/10/1925 | Reallocation | 1729 | GOR | Gorton | |||
07/10/1925 | Reallocation | 6507 | GOR | Gorton | NWE | New England | |
07/10/1925 | Reallocation | 6512 | GOR | Gorton | IMM | Immingham | |
13/10/1925 | Reallocation | 2894 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
15/10/1925 | Reallocation | 6538 | GOR | Gorton | IMM | Immingham | |
15/10/1925 | Reallocation | 6500 | GOR | Gorton | |||
20/10/1925 | Reallocation | 2975 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
22/10/1925 | Reallocation | 1628 | GOR | Gorton | |||
22/10/1925 | Reallocation | 1687 | GOR | Gorton | |||
22/10/1925 | Reallocation | 6515 | GOR | Gorton | IMM | Immingham | |
24/10/1925 | Reallocation | 6500 | GOR | Gorton | IMM | Immingham | |
29/10/1925 | Reallocation | 1719 | GOR | Gorton | |||
29/10/1925 | Reallocation | 2869 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
29/10/1925 | Reallocation | 2871 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
29/10/1925 | Reallocation | 2888 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
04/11/1925 | Reallocation | 6499 | GOR | Gorton | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
05/11/1925 | Reallocation | 6536 | GOR | Gorton | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
05/11/1925 | Reallocation | 6542 | GOR | Gorton | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
05/11/1925 | Reallocation | 1861 | GOR | Gorton | |||
07/11/1925 | Reallocation | 6517 | GOR | Gorton | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
07/11/1925 | Reallocation | 6521 | GOR | Gorton | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
10/11/1925 | Reallocation | 2845 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
12/11/1925 | Reallocation | 1683 | GOR | Gorton | |||
13/11/1925 | Reallocation | 6537 | GOR | Gorton | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
13/11/1925 | Reallocation | 6518 | GOR | Gorton | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
21/11/1925 | Reallocation | 6513 | GOR | Gorton | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
27/11/1925 | Reallocation | 6321 | CLK | Colwick | NWE | New England | |
27/11/1925 | Reallocation | 6314 | CLK | Colwick | NWE | New England | |
27/11/1925 | Reallocation | 6313 | CLK | Colwick | NWE | New England | |
04/12/1925 | Reallocation | 2857 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
05/12/1925 | Reallocation | 6527 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
31/12/1925 | Reallocation | 6524 | GOR | Gorton | |||
01/01/1926 | Reallocation | 378 | IMM | Immingham | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
08/01/1926 | Reallocation | 6495 | DON | Doncaster | NWE | New England | |
08/01/1926 | Reallocation | 6497 | GOR | Gorton | CLK | Colwick | |
09/01/1926 | Reallocation | 6509 | DON | Doncaster | NWE | New England | |
09/01/1926 | Reallocation | 6525 | GOR | Gorton | CLK | Colwick | |
09/01/1926 | Reallocation | 6528 | GOR | Gorton | CLK | Colwick | |
11/01/1926 | Reallocation | 6498 | DON | Doncaster | NWE | New England | |
12/01/1926 | Reallocation | 2850 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
14/01/1926 | Reallocation | 6261 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
15/01/1926 | Reallocation | 6203 | IMM | Immingham | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
15/01/1926 | Reallocation | 6377 | DON | Doncaster | NWE | New England | |
15/01/1926 | Reallocation | 6373 | GOR | Gorton | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
16/01/1926 | Reallocation | 6526 | GOR | Gorton | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
19/01/1926 | Reallocation | 6311 | DON | Doncaster | NWE | New England | |
21/01/1926 | Reallocation | 2893 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
27/01/1926 | Reallocation | 6329 | IMM | Immingham | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
29/01/1926 | Reallocation | 6203 | LNG | Langwith Junction | IMM | Immingham | |
30/01/1926 | Reallocation | 6523 | GOR | Gorton | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
03/02/1926 | Reallocation | 6338 | GOR | Gorton | CLK | Colwick | |
03/02/1926 | Reallocation | 6296 | GOR | Gorton | CLK | Colwick | |
04/02/1926 | Reallocation | 6521 | WFD | Woodford Halse | CLK | Colwick | |
06/02/1926 | Reallocation | 6329 | LNG | Langwith Junction | IMM | Immingham | |
16/02/1926 | Reallocation | 2841 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
18/02/1926 | Reallocation | 2892 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
25/02/1926 | Reallocation | 2885 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
02/03/1926 | Reallocation | 2853 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
02/03/1926 | Reallocation | 6530 | GOR | Gorton | CLK | Colwick | |
05/03/1926 | Reallocation | 6522 | GOR | Gorton | CLK | Colwick | |
06/03/1926 | Reallocation | 6519 | GOR | Gorton | CLK | Colwick | |
13/03/1926 | Reallocation | 6520 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
15/03/1926 | Reallocation | 6529 | GOR | Gorton | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
18/03/1926 | Reallocation | 2889 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
18/03/1926 | Reallocation | 6532 | GOR | Gorton | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
20/03/1926 | Reallocation | 6503 | GOR | Gorton | |||
22/03/1926 | Reallocation | 6520 | GOR | Gorton | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
23/03/1926 | Reallocation | 6503 | GOR | Gorton | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
27/03/1926 | Reallocation | 6514 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
28/03/1926 | Reallocation | 6516 | GOR | Gorton | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
06/04/1926 | Reallocation | 6514 | GOR | Gorton | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
24/04/1926 | Reallocation | 6519 | CLK | Colwick | DON | Doncaster | |
09/08/1926 | Reallocation | 6273 | ARD | Ardsley | MEX | Mexborough | |
10/08/1926 | Reallocation | 6349 | ARD | Ardsley | MEX | Mexborough | |
11/08/1926 | Reallocation | 6209 | MEX | Mexborough | ARD | Ardsley | |
11/08/1926 | Reallocation | 5397 | MEX | Mexborough | ARD | Ardsley | |
11/08/1926 | Reallocation | 5398 | MEX | Mexborough | ARD | Ardsley | |
11/08/1926 | Reallocation | 5399 | MEX | Mexborough | ARD | Ardsley | |
12/08/1926 | Reallocation | 5271 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ARD | Ardsley | |
13/08/1926 | Reallocation | 6251 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ARD | Ardsley | |
13/08/1926 | Reallocation | 6274 | ARD | Ardsley | MEX | Mexborough | |
17/08/1926 | Reallocation | 6358 | ARD | Ardsley | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
30/08/1926 | Reallocation | 6357 | ARD | Ardsley | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
30/08/1926 | Reallocation | 6272 | ARD | Ardsley | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
20/10/1926 | Reallocation | 5026 | MEX | Mexborough | IMM | Immingham | |
20/10/1926 | Reallocation | 5069 | MEX | Mexborough | IMM | Immingham | |
20/10/1926 | Reallocation | 5005 | MEX | Mexborough | IMM | Immingham | |
22/10/1926 | Reallocation | 6257 | GOR | Gorton | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
26/10/1926 | Reallocation | 5133 | MEX | Mexborough | IMM | Immingham | |
08/12/1926 | Reallocation | 6506 | WFD | Woodford Halse | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
15/12/1926 | Reallocation | 6297 | IMM | Immingham | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
18/12/1926 | Reallocation | 5966 | IMM | Immingham | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
24/12/1926 | Reallocation | 5026 | IMM | Immingham | MEX | Mexborough | |
24/12/1926 | Reallocation | 5069 | IMM | Immingham | MEX | Mexborough | |
24/12/1926 | Reallocation | 5005 | IMM | Immingham | DON | Doncaster | |
29/12/1926 | Reallocation | 5133 | IMM | Immingham | MEX | Mexborough | |
1927 | Reallocation | 6355 | GOR | Gorton | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
02/1927 | Reallocation | 6211 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | CLK | Colwick | |
21/02/1927 | Reallocation | 6366 | GOR | Gorton | CLK | Colwick | |
03/03/1927 | Reallocation | 6278 | GOR | Gorton | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
03/03/1927 | Reallocation | 6312 | GOR | Gorton | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
04/03/1927 | Reallocation | 6312 | LNG | Langwith Junction | CLK | Colwick | |
12/03/1927 | Reallocation | 5396 | KEA | Keadby | DON | Doncaster | |
14/03/1927 | Reallocation | 6312 | CLK | Colwick | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
05/04/1927 | Reallocation | 6366 | CLK | Colwick | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
06/04/1927 | Reallocation | 6623 | WFD | Woodford Halse | |||
07/04/1927 | Reallocation | 6278 | LNG | Langwith Junction | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
07/04/1927 | Reallocation | 6312 | LNG | Langwith Junction | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
19/04/1927 | Reallocation | 6575 | GOR | Gorton | |||
19/04/1927 | Reallocation | 6625 | GOR | Gorton | |||
22/04/1927 | Reallocation | 2135 | GOR | Gorton | |||
29/04/1927 | Reallocation | 2087 | GOR | Gorton | |||
10/05/1927 | Reallocation | 6555 | DON | Doncaster | |||
12/05/1927 | Reallocation | 1824 | ARD | Ardsley | |||
12/05/1927 | Reallocation | 2136 | CAM | Cambridge | |||
17/05/1927 | Reallocation | 2084 | GOR | Gorton | |||
19/05/1927 | Reallocation | 1812 | DON | Doncaster | |||
24/05/1927 | Reallocation | 6633 | GOR | Gorton | |||
03/06/1927 | Reallocation | 1817 | IMM | Immingham | |||
04/06/1927 | Reallocation | 6638 | CAM | Cambridge | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
07/06/1927 | Reallocation | 2165 | WFD | Woodford Halse | |||
16/06/1927 | Reallocation | 2082 | WFD | Woodford Halse | |||
16/06/1927 | Reallocation | 6640 | WFD | Woodford Halse | |||
23/06/1927 | Reallocation | 1816 | IMM | Immingham | |||
23/06/1927 | Reallocation | 1701 | DON | Doncaster | |||
27/06/1927 | Reallocation | 6546 | DON | Doncaster | |||
30/06/1927 | Reallocation | 6619 | NWE | New England | |||
05/07/1927 | Reallocation | 6588 | LNG | Langwith Junction | |||
23/07/1927 | Reallocation | 6597 | ROD | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
25/07/1927 | Reallocation | 6571 | ROD | IMM | Immingham | ||
26/07/1927 | Reallocation | 1911 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |||
02/08/1927 | Reallocation | 6602 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |||
02/08/1927 | Reallocation | 6636 | DON | Doncaster | |||
11/08/1927 | Reallocation | 2879 | ROD | IMM | Immingham | ||
12/08/1927 | Reallocation | 1689 | DON | Doncaster | |||
18/08/1927 | Reallocation | 2162 | WFD | Woodford Halse | |||
25/08/1927 | Reallocation | 6606 | NWE | New England | |||
31/08/1927 | Reallocation | 1728 | NWE | New England | |||
02/09/1927 | Reallocation | 2922 | ROD | DON | Doncaster | ||
06/09/1927 | Reallocation | 5381 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
10/09/1927 | Reallocation | 6572 | ARD | Ardsley | IMM | Immingham | |
16/09/1927 | Reallocation | 1833 | IMM | Immingham | |||
16/09/1927 | Reallocation | 6539 | CLK | Colwick | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
16/09/1927 | Reallocation | 6296 | CLK | Colwick | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
20/09/1927 | Reallocation | 6595 | ROD | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
29/09/1927 | Reallocation | 6621 | IMM | Immingham | |||
30/09/1927 | Reallocation | 1886 | IMM | Immingham | |||
30/09/1927 | Reallocation | 6598 | CLK | Colwick | |||
07/10/1927 | Reallocation | 1621 | DON | Doncaster | |||
11/10/1927 | Reallocation | 1939 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |||
14/10/1927 | Reallocation | 5380 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
19/10/1927 | Reallocation | 6622 | IMM | Immingham | |||
22/10/1927 | Reallocation | 6585 | LNG | Langwith Junction | |||
25/10/1927 | Reallocation | 6562 | DON | Doncaster | |||
26/10/1927 | Reallocation | 5394 | KEA | Keadby | CLK | Colwick | |
27/10/1927 | Reallocation | 6246 | IMM | Immingham | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
27/10/1927 | Reallocation | 1976 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |||
29/10/1927 | Reallocation | 6616 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |||
31/10/1927 | Reallocation | 6598 | CLK | Colwick | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
01/11/1927 | Reallocation | 6249 | IMM | Immingham | CLK | Colwick | |
03/11/1927 | Reallocation | 5394 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
07/11/1927 | Reallocation | 6587 | NWE | New England | |||
09/11/1927 | Reallocation | 6639 | ROD | IMM | Immingham | ||
11/11/1927 | Reallocation | 6620 | DON | Doncaster | |||
14/11/1927 | Reallocation | 6553 | WFD | Woodford Halse | |||
21/11/1927 | Reallocation | 6249 | CLK | Colwick | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
24/11/1927 | Reallocation | 6629 | IMM | Immingham | |||
25/11/1927 | Reallocation | 6620 | DON | Doncaster | MEX | Mexborough | |
30/11/1927 | Reallocation | 1962 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |||
04/12/1927 | Reallocation | 5377 | KEA | Keadby | LIN | Lincoln | |
07/12/1927 | Reallocation | 5353 | KEA | Keadby | LIN | Lincoln | |
19/12/1927 | Reallocation | 6565 | ROD | NWE | New England | ||
31/12/1927 | Reallocation | 6586 | CLK | Colwick | |||
1928 | Reallocation | 6272 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | |
1928 | Reallocation | 6506 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | |
1928 | Reallocation | 6304 | IMM | Immingham | LIN | Lincoln | |
1928 | Reallocation | 6532 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
1928 | Reallocation | 6527 | GOR | Gorton | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
06/01/1928 | Reallocation | 6590 | ROD | NWE | New England | ||
09/01/1928 | Reallocation | 5271 | ARD | Ardsley | MEX | Mexborough | |
17/01/1928 | Reallocation | 1927 | LNG | Langwith Junction | |||
18/01/1928 | Reallocation | 6209 | ARD | Ardsley | MEX | Mexborough | |
21/01/1928 | Reallocation | 6578 | ROD | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
21/01/1928 | Reallocation | 1921 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |||
24/01/1928 | Reallocation | 1862 | DON | Doncaster | |||
28/01/1928 | Reallocation | 6583 | DON | Doncaster | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
10/02/1928 | Reallocation | 1902 | DON | Doncaster | |||
11/02/1928 | Reallocation | 6615 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |||
16/02/1928 | Reallocation | 2896 | ROD | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
17/02/1928 | Reallocation | 2921 | ROD | DON | Doncaster | ||
10/03/1928 | Reallocation | 6618 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |||
10/03/1928 | Reallocation | 6630 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |||
15/03/1928 | Reallocation | 6601 | ROD | CLK | Colwick | ||
17/03/1928 | Reallocation | 6632 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |||
20/03/1928 | Reallocation | 2043 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |||
24/03/1928 | Reallocation | 6584 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |||
31/03/1928 | Reallocation | 6577 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |||
10/04/1928 | Reallocation | 6560 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
21/04/1928 | Reallocation | 6576 | ROD | YK | York (North) | ||
24/04/1928 | Reallocation | 6573 | ROD | CLK | Colwick | ||
03/05/1928 | Reallocation | 6558 | DON | Doncaster | |||
05/05/1928 | Reallocation | 6617 | ROD | YK | York (North) | ||
08/05/1928 | Reallocation | 6557 | DON | Doncaster | |||
12/05/1928 | Reallocation | 6579 | ROD | YK | York (North) | ||
19/05/1928 | Reallocation | 6580 | ROD | YK | York (North) | ||
26/05/1928 | Reallocation | 6581 | ROD | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
26/05/1928 | Reallocation | 6631 | ROD | YK | York (North) | ||
07/06/1928 | Reallocation | 2940 | ROD | DON | Doncaster | ||
15/06/1928 | Reallocation | 6610 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | YK | York (North) | |
15/06/1928 | Reallocation | 6611 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | YK | York (North) | |
30/06/1928 | Reallocation | 5398 | ARD | Ardsley | DON | Doncaster | |
30/06/1928 | Reallocation | 6608 | ROD | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
30/06/1928 | Reallocation | 6613 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |||
03/07/1928 | Reallocation | 1713 | DON | Doncaster | |||
10/07/1928 | Reallocation | 5398 | DON | Doncaster | MEX | Mexborough | |
16/07/1928 | Reallocation | 6513 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
21/07/1928 | Reallocation | 6593 | ROD | NWE | New England | ||
24/07/1928 | Reallocation | 6634 | NWE | New England | |||
11/08/1928 | Reallocation | 6612 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |||
14/08/1928 | Reallocation | 6591 | DON | Doncaster | |||
16/08/1928 | Reallocation | 2079 | CLK | Colwick | |||
21/08/1928 | Reallocation | 6604 | NWE | New England | |||
07/09/1928 | Reallocation | 5397 | ARD | Ardsley | DON | Doncaster | |
22/09/1928 | Reallocation | 6609 | ROD | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
24/09/1928 | Reallocation | 6553 | WFD | Woodford Halse | DON | Doncaster | |
24/09/1928 | Reallocation | 6626 | WFD | Woodford Halse | DON | Doncaster | |
24/09/1928 | Reallocation | 6501 | WFD | Woodford Halse | DON | Doncaster | |
25/09/1928 | Reallocation | 6537 | WFD | Woodford Halse | DON | Doncaster | |
25/09/1928 | Reallocation | 6635 | NWE | New England | |||
25/09/1928 | Reallocation | 6642 | WFD | Woodford Halse | DON | Doncaster | |
28/09/1928 | Reallocation | 6333 | GOR | Gorton | DON | Doncaster | |
28/09/1928 | Reallocation | 6641 | WFD | Woodford Halse | DON | Doncaster | |
01/10/1928 | Reallocation | 6626 | DON | Doncaster | MEX | Mexborough | |
09/10/1928 | Reallocation | 5399 | ARD | Ardsley | DON | Doncaster | |
18/10/1928 | Reallocation | 5392 | MEX | Mexborough | NWE | New England | |
18/10/1928 | Reallocation | 6507 | NWE | New England | MEX | Mexborough | |
22/10/1928 | Reallocation | 6553 | DON | Doncaster | MEX | Mexborough | |
25/10/1928 | Reallocation | 6567 | ROD | GOR | Gorton | ||
27/10/1928 | Reallocation | 6348 | IMM | Immingham | TUX | Tuxford | |
03/11/1928 | Reallocation | 6548 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | |||
07/11/1928 | Reallocation | 6634 | NWE | New England | GRA | Grantham | |
16/11/1928 | Reallocation | 6553 | MEX | Mexborough | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
19/11/1928 | Reallocation | 6626 | MEX | Mexborough | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
26/11/1928 | Reallocation | 6501 | DON | Doncaster | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
28/11/1928 | Reallocation | 6642 | DON | Doncaster | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
29/11/1928 | Reallocation | 6537 | DON | Doncaster | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
01/12/1928 | Reallocation | 6251 | ARD | Ardsley | DON | Doncaster | |
01/12/1928 | Reallocation | 6551 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | |||
02/12/1928 | Reallocation | 6550 | THJ | Thornton Junction | |||
04/12/1928 | Reallocation | 6641 | DON | Doncaster | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
18/12/1928 | Reallocation | 6542 | WFD | Woodford Halse | NEA | Neasden | |
19/12/1928 | Reallocation | 6544 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | |||
15/01/1929 | Reallocation | 6582 | ROD | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
18/01/1929 | Reallocation | 6240 | IMM | Immingham | TUX | Tuxford | |
19/01/1929 | Reallocation | 6289 | DON | Doncaster | LIN | Lincoln | |
02/02/1929 | Reallocation | 6240 | TUX | Tuxford | IMM | Immingham | |
02/02/1929 | Reallocation | 6289 | LIN | Lincoln | TUX | Tuxford | |
05/02/1929 | Reallocation | 6344 | GOR | Gorton | CLK | Colwick | |
18/02/1929 | Reallocation | 6274 | MEX | Mexborough | ANN | Annesley | |
21/02/1929 | Reallocation | 6349 | MEX | Mexborough | ANN | Annesley | |
23/02/1929 | Reallocation | 6560 | MEX | Mexborough | ANN | Annesley | |
23/02/1929 | Reallocation | 6620 | MEX | Mexborough | ANN | Annesley | |
28/02/1929 | Reallocation | 6332 | GOR | Gorton | MAR | March | |
28/02/1929 | Reallocation | 6272 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
01/03/1929 | Reallocation | 6206 | IMM | Immingham | MAR | March | |
01/03/1929 | Reallocation | 6498 | NWE | New England | MAR | March | |
01/03/1929 | Reallocation | 6520 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | MAR | March | |
02/03/1929 | Reallocation | 6207 | MEX | Mexborough | MAR | March | |
02/03/1929 | Reallocation | 6251 | DON | Doncaster | MAR | March | |
02/03/1929 | Reallocation | 6355 | LNG | Langwith Junction | MAR | March | |
02/03/1929 | Reallocation | 6345 | IMM | Immingham | MAR | March | |
02/03/1929 | Reallocation | 6506 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | MAR | March | |
02/03/1929 | Reallocation | 6532 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | MAR | March | |
02/03/1929 | Reallocation | 6527 | LNG | Langwith Junction | MAR | March | |
05/03/1929 | Reallocation | 6204 | IMM | Immingham | MAR | March | |
08/03/1929 | Reallocation | 6295 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | MAR | March | |
09/03/1929 | Reallocation | 6227 | ANN | Annesley | MAR | March | |
14/03/1929 | Reallocation | 6299 | DON | Doncaster | ANN | Annesley | |
15/03/1929 | Reallocation | 6576 | YK | York (North) | TDK | Tyne Dock | |
23/03/1929 | Reallocation | 6543 | THJ | Thornton Junction | |||
30/03/1929 | Reallocation | 6549 | YK | York (North) | |||
18/04/1929 | Reallocation | 6559 | DON | Doncaster | |||
30/04/1929 | Reallocation | 1914 | CLK | Colwick | |||
01/05/1929 | Reallocation | 6559 | DON | Doncaster | MEX | Mexborough | |
03/05/1929 | Reallocation | 1609 | CLK | Colwick | |||
07/05/1929 | Reallocation | 6202 | MEX | Mexborough | GOR | Gorton | |
13/05/1929 | Reallocation | 6576 | TDK | Tyne Dock | YK | York (North) | |
20/05/1929 | Reallocation | 6273 | MEX | Mexborough | GOR | Gorton | |
30/05/1929 | Reallocation | 6374 | DON | Doncaster | IMM | Immingham | |
04/06/1929 | Reallocation | 6215 | ANN | Annesley | IMM | Immingham | |
06/06/1929 | Reallocation | 6223 | ANN | Annesley | IMM | Immingham | |
02/07/1929 | Reallocation | 6635 | NWE | New England | BOS | Boston | |
05/07/1929 | Reallocation | 5333 | MEX | Mexborough | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
08/07/1929 | Reallocation | 5404 | MEX | Mexborough | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
16/07/1929 | Reallocation | 6590 | NWE | New England | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
21/08/1929 | Reallocation | 6635 | BOS | Boston | NWE | New England | |
03/09/1929 | Reallocation | 6517 | WFD | Woodford Halse | IMM | Immingham | |
07/09/1929 | Reallocation | 6638 | LNG | Langwith Junction | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
14/09/1929 | Reallocation | 6278 | WFD | Woodford Halse | IMM | Immingham | |
27/09/1929 | Reallocation | 6278 | IMM | Immingham | KEA | Keadby | |
27/09/1929 | Reallocation | 6581 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
27/09/1929 | Reallocation | 6613 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
05/10/1929 | Reallocation | 6576 | YK | York (North) | CUD | Cudworth | |
05/10/1929 | Reallocation | 6580 | YK | York (North) | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
10/10/1929 | Reallocation | 5404 | WFD | Woodford Halse | KEA | Keadby | |
10/10/1929 | Reallocation | 6518 | WFD | Woodford Halse | KEA | Keadby | |
17/10/1929 | Reallocation | 6247 | IMM | Immingham | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
23/10/1929 | Reallocation | 6612 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
23/10/1929 | Reallocation | 6614 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
25/10/1929 | Reallocation | 6366 | WFD | Woodford Halse | IMM | Immingham | |
29/10/1929 | Reallocation | 6611 | YK | York (North) | BUL | Bullcroft Junction | |
04/11/1929 | Reallocation | 6610 | YK | York (North) | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
05/11/1929 | Reallocation | 5405 | DON | Doncaster | NWE | New England | |
05/11/1929 | Reallocation | 6570 | IMM | Immingham | NEA | Neasden | |
05/11/1929 | Reallocation | 6504 | NWE | New England | DON | Doncaster | |
15/11/1929 | Reallocation | 6243 | IMM | Immingham | KEA | Keadby | |
18/11/1929 | Reallocation | 6577 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
18/11/1929 | Reallocation | 6578 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
18/11/1929 | Reallocation | 6584 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
18/11/1929 | Reallocation | 6609 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
18/11/1929 | Reallocation | 6615 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
18/11/1929 | Reallocation | 6618 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
07/12/1929 | Reallocation | 6362 | DON | Doncaster | IMM | Immingham | |
1930 | Reallocation | 5001 | MEX | Mexborough | DON | Doncaster | |
02/01/1930 | Reallocation | 6607 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
02/01/1930 | Reallocation | 6608 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
05/01/1930 | Reallocation | 6297 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
21/01/1930 | Reallocation | 6622 | IMM | Immingham | TUX | Tuxford | |
06/02/1930 | Reallocation | 6549 | YK | York (North) | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
06/02/1930 | Reallocation | 6617 | YK | York (North) | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
07/02/1930 | Reallocation | 6577 | HLS | Hull Springhead | CUD | Cudworth | |
07/02/1930 | Reallocation | 6578 | HLS | Hull Springhead | CUD | Cudworth | |
07/02/1930 | Reallocation | 6549 | HLS | Hull Springhead | CUD | Cudworth | |
20/02/1930 | Reallocation | 6595 | LNG | Langwith Junction | DON | Doncaster | |
20/02/1930 | Reallocation | 6642 | WFD | Woodford Halse | IMM | Immingham | |
24/02/1930 | Reallocation | 6561 | NWE | New England | DON | Doncaster | |
24/02/1930 | Reallocation | 6642 | IMM | Immingham | TUX | Tuxford | |
27/02/1930 | Reallocation | 6568 | IMM | Immingham | KEA | Keadby | |
27/02/1930 | Reallocation | 6572 | IMM | Immingham | KEA | Keadby | |
24/03/1930 | Reallocation | 6583 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
24/03/1930 | Reallocation | 6616 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
26/03/1930 | Reallocation | 6348 | TUX | Tuxford | IMM | Immingham | |
07/04/1930 | Reallocation | 6630 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
07/04/1930 | Reallocation | 6632 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
10/04/1930 | Reallocation | 6538 | IMM | Immingham | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
17/04/1930 | Reallocation | 6364 | IMM | Immingham | MAR | March | |
07/05/1930 | Reallocation | 6526 | LNG | Langwith Junction | MEX | Mexborough | |
15/05/1930 | Reallocation | 6262 | ANN | Annesley | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
24/05/1930 | Reallocation | 6261 | LNG | Langwith Junction | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
05/06/1930 | Reallocation | 6339 | IMM | Immingham | CLK | Colwick | |
23/06/1930 | Reallocation | 6344 | CLK | Colwick | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
23/06/1930 | Reallocation | 6525 | CLK | Colwick | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
25/06/1930 | Reallocation | 6339 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
14/08/1930 | Reallocation | 6527 | MAR | March | LIN | Lincoln | |
15/08/1930 | Reallocation | 6506 | MAR | March | DON | Doncaster | |
15/08/1930 | Reallocation | 6295 | MAR | March | LIN | Lincoln | |
21/08/1930 | Reallocation | 6579 | YK | York (North) | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
21/08/1930 | Reallocation | 6631 | YK | York (North) | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
27/09/1930 | Reallocation | 6537 | WFD | Woodford Halse | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
27/09/1930 | Reallocation | 6506 | DON | Doncaster | MAR | March | |
27/09/1930 | Reallocation | 6538 | WFD | Woodford Halse | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
27/09/1930 | Reallocation | 6527 | LIN | Lincoln | MAR | March | |
07/10/1930 | Reallocation | 6582 | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
14/10/1930 | Reallocation | 6295 | LIN | Lincoln | MAR | March | |
01/11/1930 | Reallocation | 5404 | KEA | Keadby | IMM | Immingham | |
04/11/1930 | Reallocation | 5352 | IMM | Immingham | KEA | Keadby | |
06/11/1930 | Reallocation | 6242 | IMM | Immingham | KEA | Keadby | |
06/11/1930 | Reallocation | 6248 | IMM | Immingham | KEA | Keadby | |
09/12/1930 | Reallocation | 6244 | IMM | Immingham | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
09/12/1930 | Reallocation | 6245 | IMM | Immingham | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
14/12/1930 | Reallocation | 6244 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
14/12/1930 | Reallocation | 6245 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
19/12/1930 | Reallocation | 6336 | DON | Doncaster | CLK | Colwick | |
02/01/1931 | Reallocation | 6192 | MEX | Mexborough | CLK | Colwick | |
06/01/1931 | Reallocation | 5355 | MEX | Mexborough | DON | Doncaster | |
07/01/1931 | Reallocation | 6569 | IMM | Immingham | KEA | Keadby | |
09/01/1931 | Reallocation | 5335 | MEX | Mexborough | DON | Doncaster | |
09/01/1931 | Reallocation | 5354 | MEX | Mexborough | DON | Doncaster | |
19/01/1931 | Reallocation | 6604 | NWE | New England | GRA | Grantham | |
19/01/1931 | Reallocation | 6634 | GRA | Grantham | NWE | New England | |
13/02/1931 | Reallocation | 6570 | NEA | Neasden | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
28/02/1931 | Reallocation | 6203 | IMM | Immingham | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
04/03/1931 | Reallocation | 5404 | IMM | Immingham | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
05/03/1931 | Reallocation | 5406 | DON | Doncaster | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
12/03/1931 | Reallocation | 6291 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
12/03/1931 | Reallocation | 6286 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
23/04/1931 | Reallocation | 6356 | DON | Doncaster | CLK | Colwick | |
28/04/1931 | Reallocation | 5384 | MEX | Mexborough | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
14/05/1931 | Reallocation | 6634 | NWE | New England | CLK | Colwick | |
15/05/1931 | Reallocation | 6356 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
18/05/1931 | Reallocation | 6634 | CLK | Colwick | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
16/06/1931 | Reallocation | 6223 | IMM | Immingham | KEA | Keadby | |
29/06/1931 | Reallocation | 6278 | KEA | Keadby | IMM | Immingham | |
23/07/1931 | Reallocation | 6215 | IMM | Immingham | KEA | Keadby | |
12/08/1931 | Reallocation | 6250 | IMM | Immingham | KEA | Keadby | |
09/1931 | Reallocation | 6286 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | |
06/10/1931 | Reallocation | 6267 | ANN | Annesley | MAR | March | |
24/10/1931 | Reallocation | 6360 | DON | Doncaster | MAR | March | |
25/10/1931 | Reallocation | 6498 | MAR | March | CAM | Cambridge | |
25/10/1931 | Reallocation | 6506 | MAR | March | CAM | Cambridge | |
25/10/1931 | Reallocation | 6520 | MAR | March | CAM | Cambridge | |
25/10/1931 | Reallocation | 6527 | MAR | March | CAM | Cambridge | |
12/11/1931 | Reallocation | 6253 | DON | Doncaster | GOR | Gorton | |
13/11/1931 | Reallocation | 6625 | GOR | Gorton | DON | Doncaster | |
04/12/1931 | Reallocation | 6625 | DON | Doncaster | GOR | Gorton | |
04/12/1931 | Reallocation | 6253 | GOR | Gorton | DON | Doncaster | |
05/12/1931 | Reallocation | 6611 | BUL | Bullcroft Junction | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
22/12/1931 | Reallocation | 6237 | IMM | Immingham | KEA | Keadby | |
24/12/1931 | Reallocation | 6360 | MAR | March | DON | Doncaster | |
26/01/1932 | Reallocation | 6503 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | |
14/03/1932 | Reallocation | 6313 | NWE | New England | MAR | March | |
15/03/1932 | Reallocation | 6593 | NWE | New England | MAR | March | |
17/03/1932 | Reallocation | 6568 | KEA | Keadby | IMM | Immingham | |
17/03/1932 | Reallocation | 6362 | IMM | Immingham | KEA | Keadby | |
24/03/1932 | Reallocation | 6282 | ANN | Annesley | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | |
30/03/1932 | Reallocation | 6525 | LNG | Langwith Junction | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | |
31/03/1932 | Reallocation | 6267 | MAR | March | MEX | Mexborough | |
01/04/1932 | Reallocation | 6227 | MAR | March | MEX | Mexborough | |
09/04/1932 | Reallocation | 6518 | KEA | Keadby | IMM | Immingham | |
14/04/1932 | Reallocation | 6366 | IMM | Immingham | KEA | Keadby | |
09/06/1932 | Reallocation | 6204 | MAR | March | CAM | Cambridge | |
09/06/1932 | Reallocation | 6593 | MAR | March | CAM | Cambridge | |
11/06/1932 | Reallocation | 6568 | IMM | Immingham | FRO | Frodingham | |
11/06/1932 | Reallocation | 6515 | IMM | Immingham | KEA | Keadby | |
11/06/1932 | Reallocation | 6518 | IMM | Immingham | FRO | Frodingham | |
12/06/1932 | Reallocation | 5352 | KEA | Keadby | FRO | Frodingham | |
12/06/1932 | Reallocation | 6215 | KEA | Keadby | FRO | Frodingham | |
12/06/1932 | Reallocation | 6223 | KEA | Keadby | FRO | Frodingham | |
12/06/1932 | Reallocation | 6237 | KEA | Keadby | FRO | Frodingham | |
12/06/1932 | Reallocation | 6242 | KEA | Keadby | FRO | Frodingham | |
12/06/1932 | Reallocation | 6243 | KEA | Keadby | FRO | Frodingham | |
12/06/1932 | Reallocation | 6248 | KEA | Keadby | FRO | Frodingham | |
12/06/1932 | Reallocation | 6250 | KEA | Keadby | FRO | Frodingham | |
12/06/1932 | Reallocation | 6569 | KEA | Keadby | FRO | Frodingham | |
12/06/1932 | Reallocation | 6572 | KEA | Keadby | FRO | Frodingham | |
12/06/1932 | Reallocation | 6366 | KEA | Keadby | FRO | Frodingham | |
12/06/1932 | Reallocation | 6362 | KEA | Keadby | FRO | Frodingham | |
12/06/1932 | Reallocation | 6515 | KEA | Keadby | FRO | Frodingham | |
18/06/1932 | Reallocation | 6304 | LIN | Lincoln | MEX | Mexborough | |
29/06/1932 | Reallocation | 6191 | MEX | Mexborough | LIN | Lincoln | |
09/08/1932 | Reallocation | 6587 | NWE | New England | CLK | Colwick | |
11/08/1932 | Reallocation | 6284 | DON | Doncaster | CAM | Cambridge | |
12/08/1932 | Reallocation | 6360 | DON | Doncaster | CAM | Cambridge | |
28/08/1932 | Reallocation | 6284 | CAM | Cambridge | DON | Doncaster | |
29/08/1932 | Reallocation | 6565 | NWE | New England | CLK | Colwick | |
29/08/1932 | Reallocation | 6360 | CAM | Cambridge | DON | Doncaster | |
19/10/1932 | Reallocation | 6541 | NWE | New England | CLK | Colwick | |
20/12/1932 | Reallocation | 6240 | IMM | Immingham | TUX | Tuxford | |
25/01/1933 | Reallocation | 6495 | NWE | New England | ANN | Annesley | |
26/01/1933 | Reallocation | 6496 | NWE | New England | ANN | Annesley | |
06/02/1933 | Reallocation | 6535 | DON | Doncaster | GRA | Grantham | |
21/02/1933 | Reallocation | 6264 | NWE | New England | GRA | Grantham | |
07/04/1933 | Reallocation | 6547 | DON | Doncaster | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
07/04/1933 | Reallocation | 6508 | DON | Doncaster | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
20/05/1933 | Reallocation | 6264 | GRA | Grantham | NWE | New England | |
28/06/1933 | Reallocation | 6262 | HLS | Hull Springhead | GOR | Gorton | |
28/06/1933 | Reallocation | 6261 | HLS | Hull Springhead | DON | Doncaster | |
11/07/1933 | Reallocation | 6580 | HLS | Hull Springhead | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
11/07/1933 | Reallocation | 6614 | HLS | Hull Springhead | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
11/07/1933 | Reallocation | 6615 | HLS | Hull Springhead | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
25/07/1933 | Reallocation | 6332 | MAR | March | DON | Doncaster | |
15/08/1933 | Reallocation | 6318 | DON | Doncaster | MAR | March | |
19/08/1933 | Reallocation | 6191 | LIN | Lincoln | FRO | Frodingham | |
24/08/1933 | Reallocation | 5399 | DON | Doncaster | MAR | March | |
19/09/1933 | Reallocation | 6558 | DON | Doncaster | IMM | Immingham | |
22/09/1933 | Reallocation | 6562 | DON | Doncaster | IMM | Immingham | |
22/09/1933 | Reallocation | 6563 | DON | Doncaster | IMM | Immingham | |
18/10/1933 | Reallocation | 5008 | MEX | Mexborough | NWE | New England | |
19/10/1933 | Reallocation | 5397 | DON | Doncaster | NWE | New England | |
27/10/1933 | Reallocation | 5407 | DON | Doncaster | CLK | Colwick | |
03/11/1933 | Reallocation | 6637 | GOR | Gorton | LIV | Brunswick | |
08/11/1933 | Reallocation | 6505 | DON | Doncaster | CLK | Colwick | |
11/11/1933 | Reallocation | 6311 | NWE | New England | CLK | Colwick | |
14/11/1933 | Reallocation | 6619 | NWE | New England | CLK | Colwick | |
17/11/1933 | Reallocation | 5400 | MEX | Mexborough | MAR | March | |
17/11/1933 | Reallocation | 5398 | MEX | Mexborough | MAR | March | |
24/11/1933 | Reallocation | 5001 | DON | Doncaster | CLK | Colwick | |
30/11/1933 | Reallocation | 6642 | TUX | Tuxford | FRO | Frodingham | |
02/12/1933 | Reallocation | 5353 | LIN | Lincoln | FRO | Frodingham | |
08/12/1933 | Reallocation | 6321 | NWE | New England | GRA | Grantham | |
09/12/1933 | Reallocation | 6345 | MAR | March | DON | Doncaster | |
16/12/1933 | Reallocation | 6202 | GOR | Gorton | CLK | Colwick | |
16/12/1933 | Reallocation | 6354 | GOR | Gorton | CLK | Colwick | |
16/12/1933 | Reallocation | 6262 | GOR | Gorton | CLK | Colwick | |
29/12/1933 | Reallocation | 5400 | MAR | March | CLK | Colwick | |
29/12/1933 | Reallocation | 6321 | GRA | Grantham | NWE | New England | |
1934 | Reallocation | 6262 | CLK | Colwick | DON | Doncaster | |
1934 | Reallocation | 6524 | GOR | Gorton | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
03/01/1934 | Reallocation | 5398 | MAR | March | CLK | Colwick | |
11/01/1934 | Reallocation | 6251 | MAR | March | CLK | Colwick | |
12/01/1934 | Reallocation | 6579 | HLS | Hull Springhead | CUD | Cudworth | |
12/01/1934 | Reallocation | 6611 | HLS | Hull Springhead | CUD | Cudworth | |
12/01/1934 | Reallocation | 6532 | MAR | March | CLK | Colwick | |
19/01/1934 | Reallocation | 6599 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | |
23/01/1934 | Reallocation | 6230 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
23/01/1934 | Reallocation | 6638 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | |
24/01/1934 | Reallocation | 6236 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
26/01/1934 | Reallocation | 6229 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
26/01/1934 | Reallocation | 6234 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
29/01/1934 | Reallocation | 6235 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
30/01/1934 | Reallocation | 6281 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | |
31/01/1934 | Reallocation | 6602 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | |
01/02/1934 | Reallocation | 6233 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
01/02/1934 | Reallocation | 6244 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
01/02/1934 | Reallocation | 6335 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | |
05/02/1934 | Reallocation | 6207 | MAR | March | CLK | Colwick | |
05/02/1934 | Reallocation | 5005 | DON | Doncaster | FRO | Frodingham | |
07/02/1934 | Reallocation | 6629 | IMM | Immingham | TUX | Tuxford | |
08/02/1934 | Reallocation | 6232 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
09/02/1934 | Reallocation | 6603 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | |
10/02/1934 | Reallocation | 6354 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
15/02/1934 | Reallocation | 6202 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
15/02/1934 | Reallocation | 6368 | ANN | Annesley | CLK | Colwick | |
16/02/1934 | Reallocation | 6218 | ANN | Annesley | CLK | Colwick | |
17/02/1934 | Reallocation | 5377 | LIN | Lincoln | FRO | Frodingham | |
17/02/1934 | Reallocation | 6529 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
19/02/1934 | Reallocation | 6206 | MAR | March | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
19/02/1934 | Reallocation | 6233 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
20/02/1934 | Reallocation | 5407 | CLK | Colwick | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
21/02/1934 | Reallocation | 5400 | CLK | Colwick | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
21/02/1934 | Reallocation | 5398 | CLK | Colwick | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
24/02/1934 | Reallocation | 6589 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
20/03/1934 | Reallocation | 6590 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
23/03/1934 | Reallocation | 6245 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
07/05/1934 | Reallocation | 6629 | TUX | Tuxford | IMM | Immingham | |
01/09/1934 | Reallocation | 6571 | IMM | Immingham | FRO | Frodingham | |
04/09/1934 | Reallocation | 5334 | IMM | Immingham | FRO | Frodingham | |
08/11/1934 | Reallocation | 5397 | NWE | New England | DON | Doncaster | |
08/11/1934 | Reallocation | 6314 | NWE | New England | DON | Doncaster | |
01/01/1935 | Reallocation | 6358 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | |
01/01/1935 | Reallocation | 6357 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | |
01/01/1935 | Reallocation | 6367 | GOR | Gorton | IMM | Immingham | |
21/02/1935 | Reallocation | 6260 | GOR | Gorton | FRO | Frodingham | |
22/02/1935 | Reallocation | 6532 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
25/02/1935 | Reallocation | 6246 | LNG | Langwith Junction | CLK | Colwick | |
25/02/1935 | Reallocation | 6522 | CLK | Colwick | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
21/03/1935 | Reallocation | 6225 | ANN | Annesley | CLK | Colwick | |
08/05/1935 | Reallocation | 6364 | MAR | March | CAM | Cambridge | |
31/05/1935 | Reallocation | 6606 | NWE | New England | GRA | Grantham | |
15/07/1935 | Reallocation | 6264 | NWE | New England | CLK | Colwick | |
15/07/1935 | Reallocation | 6632 | HLS | Hull Springhead | CUD | Cudworth | |
02/08/1935 | Reallocation | 6364 | CAM | Cambridge | MAR | March | |
10/09/1935 | Reallocation | 6606 | GRA | Grantham | CLK | Colwick | |
14/09/1935 | Reallocation | 6509 | NWE | New England | GRA | Grantham | |
12/10/1935 | Reallocation | 5392 | NWE | New England | MAR | March | |
14/10/1935 | Reallocation | 5405 | NWE | New England | CLK | Colwick | |
16/10/1935 | Reallocation | 6369 | GOR | Gorton | MAR | March | |
17/10/1935 | Reallocation | 6327 | GOR | Gorton | MAR | March | |
19/10/1935 | Reallocation | 6321 | NWE | New England | MAR | March | |
24/10/1935 | Reallocation | 6377 | NWE | New England | CLK | Colwick | |
11/1935 | Reallocation | 6509 | GRA | Grantham | CLK | Colwick | |
11/1935 | Reallocation | 6627 | GOR | Gorton | LIV | Brunswick | |
11/1935 | Reallocation | 6635 | NWE | New England | CLK | Colwick | |
11/1935 | Reallocation | 6637 | LIV | Brunswick | GOR | Gorton | |
04/11/1935 | Reallocation | 6230 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
04/11/1935 | Reallocation | 6589 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
15/11/1935 | Reallocation | 5008 | NWE | New England | CLK | Colwick | |
29/11/1935 | Reallocation | 6509 | CLK | Colwick | NWE | New England | |
29/11/1935 | Reallocation | 6627 | LIV | Brunswick | LIV | Brunswick | |
29/11/1935 | Reallocation | 6637 | GOR | Gorton | GOR | Gorton | |
12/1935 | Reallocation | 6542 | NEA | Neasden | MEX | Mexborough | |
12/1935 | Reallocation | 6321 | MAR | March | ANN | Annesley | |
12/1935 | Reallocation | 6635 | CLK | Colwick | GRA | Grantham | |
04/12/1935 | Reallocation | 6614 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | CUD | Cudworth | |
18/12/1935 | Reallocation | 6509 | NWE | New England | CLK | Colwick | |
18/12/1935 | Reallocation | 6635 | GRA | Grantham | CLK | Colwick | |
21/12/1935 | Reallocation | 6321 | ANN | Annesley | ANN | Annesley | |
28/12/1935 | Reallocation | 6635 | CLK | Colwick | GRA | Grantham | |
01/1936 | Reallocation | 5399 | MAR | March | CLK | Colwick | |
01/1936 | Reallocation | 6576 | CUD | Cudworth | CUD | Cudworth | |
01/1936 | Reallocation | 6577 | CUD | Cudworth | CUD | Cudworth | |
01/1936 | Reallocation | 6578 | CUD | Cudworth | CUD | Cudworth | |
01/1936 | Reallocation | 6549 | CUD | Cudworth | CUD | Cudworth | |
01/1936 | Reallocation | 6579 | CUD | Cudworth | CUD | Cudworth | |
01/1936 | Reallocation | 6580 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
01/1936 | Reallocation | 6581 | HLS | Hull Springhead | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
01/1936 | Reallocation | 6583 | HLS | Hull Springhead | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
01/1936 | Reallocation | 6584 | HLS | Hull Springhead | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
01/1936 | Reallocation | 6607 | HLS | Hull Springhead | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
01/1936 | Reallocation | 6608 | HLS | Hull Springhead | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
01/1936 | Reallocation | 6609 | HLS | Hull Springhead | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
01/1936 | Reallocation | 6610 | HLS | Hull Springhead | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
01/1936 | Reallocation | 6611 | CUD | Cudworth | CUD | Cudworth | |
01/1936 | Reallocation | 6612 | HLS | Hull Springhead | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
01/1936 | Reallocation | 6613 | HLS | Hull Springhead | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
01/1936 | Reallocation | 6614 | CUD | Cudworth | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
01/1936 | Reallocation | 6615 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
01/1936 | Reallocation | 6616 | HLS | Hull Springhead | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
01/1936 | Reallocation | 6617 | HLS | Hull Springhead | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
01/1936 | Reallocation | 6618 | HLS | Hull Springhead | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
01/1936 | Reallocation | 6630 | HLS | Hull Springhead | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
01/1936 | Reallocation | 6631 | HLS | Hull Springhead | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
01/1936 | Reallocation | 6632 | CUD | Cudworth | CUD | Cudworth | |
01/1936 | Reallocation | 6295 | MAR | March | CLK | Colwick | |
13/01/1936 | Reallocation | 6542 | MEX | Mexborough | MEX | Mexborough | |
30/01/1936 | Reallocation | 5399 | CLK | Colwick | CLK | Colwick | |
30/01/1936 | Reallocation | 6295 | CLK | Colwick | CLK | Colwick | |
14/04/1936 | Reallocation | 6593 | CAM | Cambridge | DON | Doncaster | |
26/10/1936 | Reallocation | 6315 | GOR | Gorton | LIV | Brunswick | |
28/10/1936 | Reallocation | 6277 | DON | Doncaster | MEX | Mexborough | |
30/10/1936 | Reallocation | 6580 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | CUD | Cudworth | |
14/11/1936 | Reallocation | 6627 | LIV | Brunswick | GOR | Gorton | |
20/11/1936 | Reallocation | 6522 | LNG | Langwith Junction | MAR | March | |
23/11/1936 | Reallocation | 6636 | DON | Doncaster | MEX | Mexborough | |
25/11/1936 | Reallocation | 6588 | LNG | Langwith Junction | MAR | March | |
27/11/1936 | Reallocation | 5400 | LNG | Langwith Junction | MAR | March | |
01/12/1936 | Reallocation | 6271 | DON | Doncaster | MEX | Mexborough | |
05/12/1936 | Reallocation | 6520 | CAM | Cambridge | MAR | March | |
05/12/1936 | Reallocation | 6527 | CAM | Cambridge | MAR | March | |
06/12/1936 | Reallocation | 6523 | LNG | Langwith Junction | GOR | Gorton | |
04/01/1937 | Reallocation | 6207 | CLK | Colwick | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
04/01/1937 | Reallocation | 6249 | LNG | Langwith Junction | CLK | Colwick | |
04/01/1937 | Reallocation | 6505 | CLK | Colwick | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
04/01/1937 | Reallocation | 6257 | LNG | Langwith Junction | CLK | Colwick | |
22/02/1937 | Reallocation | 6599 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ANN | Annesley | |
14/03/1937 | Reallocation | 6225 | CLK | Colwick | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
02/05/1937 | Reallocation | 6627 | GOR | Gorton | GRA | Grantham | |
04/05/1937 | Reallocation | 6628 | GOR | Gorton | GRA | Grantham | |
06/05/1937 | Reallocation | 6277 | MEX | Mexborough | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
11/05/1937 | Reallocation | 6636 | MEX | Mexborough | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
20/05/1937 | Reallocation | 6240 | TUX | Tuxford | LIN | Lincoln | |
20/05/1937 | Reallocation | 5379 | IMM | Immingham | TUX | Tuxford | |
04/06/1937 | Reallocation | 6271 | MEX | Mexborough | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
07/06/1937 | Reallocation | 5011 | MEX | Mexborough | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
09/06/1937 | Reallocation | 5022 | MEX | Mexborough | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
19/06/1937 | Reallocation | 6641 | WFD | Woodford Halse | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | |
02/08/1937 | Reallocation | 6615 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | CUD | Cudworth | |
03/08/1937 | Reallocation | 6291 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | |
02/10/1937 | Reallocation | 5335 | DON | Doncaster | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
06/10/1937 | Reallocation | 6575 | GOR | Gorton | ANN | Annesley | |
06/10/1937 | Reallocation | 6273 | GOR | Gorton | ANN | Annesley | |
05/11/1937 | Reallocation | 6294 | DON | Doncaster | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | |
14/12/1937 | Reallocation | 5355 | DON | Doncaster | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | |
08/01/1938 | Reallocation | 6315 | LIV | Brunswick | GOR | Gorton | |
08/01/1938 | Reallocation | 6633 | GOR | Gorton | DON | Doncaster | |
17/01/1938 | Reallocation | 6633 | DON | Doncaster | IMM | Immingham | |
29/04/1938 | Reallocation | 6615 | CUD | Cudworth | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
23/05/1938 | Reallocation | 6356 | ANN | Annesley | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
23/05/1938 | Reallocation | 6266 | ANN | Annesley | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
29/07/1938 | Reallocation | 6589 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | |
19/11/1938 | Reallocation | 6523 | GOR | Gorton | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
20/11/1938 | Reallocation | 6354 | ANN | Annesley | CLK | Colwick | |
20/11/1938 | Reallocation | 6353 | ANN | Annesley | CLK | Colwick | |
22/11/1938 | Reallocation | 6523 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
30/12/1938 | Reallocation | 5001 | CLK | Colwick | IMM | Immingham | |
11/01/1939 | Reallocation | 6558 | IMM | Immingham | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
11/01/1939 | Reallocation | 6373 | LNG | Langwith Junction | DON | Doncaster | |
11/01/1939 | Reallocation | 5022 | LNG | Langwith Junction | DON | Doncaster | |
22/01/1939 | Reallocation | 6242 | FRO | Frodingham | ANN | Annesley | |
12/02/1939 | Reallocation | 6226 | ANN | Annesley | FRO | Frodingham | |
03/03/1939 | Reallocation | 6523 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | FRO | Frodingham | |
03/03/1939 | Reallocation | 6534 | DON | Doncaster | FRO | Frodingham | |
11/03/1939 | Reallocation | 6192 | CLK | Colwick | BRN | Barnsley | |
12/03/1939 | Reallocation | 6538 | LNG | Langwith Junction | FRO | Frodingham | |
12/03/1939 | Reallocation | 6636 | LNG | Langwith Junction | FRO | Frodingham | |
17/03/1939 | Reallocation | 6525 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | FRO | Frodingham | |
18/03/1939 | Reallocation | 6255 | GOR | Gorton | FRO | Frodingham | |
17/04/1939 | Reallocation | 6301 | GOR | Gorton | ARD | Ardsley | |
03/05/1939 | Reallocation | 6261 | DON | Doncaster | BRN | Barnsley | |
30/05/1939 | Reallocation | 6242 | ANN | Annesley | ARD | Ardsley | |
09/06/1939 | Reallocation | 6516 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | FRO | Frodingham | |
10/06/1939 | Reallocation | 6517 | IMM | Immingham | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
21/06/1939 | Reallocation | 5011 | LNG | Langwith Junction | BRN | Barnsley | |
01/07/1939 | Reallocation | 6242 | ARD | Ardsley | GOR | Gorton | |
06/07/1939 | Reallocation | 6301 | ARD | Ardsley | LIN | Lincoln | |
10/07/1939 | Reallocation | 6634 | LNG | Langwith Junction | TUX | Tuxford | |
04/08/1939 | Reallocation | 6596 | DON | Doncaster | TUX | Tuxford | |
23/08/1939 | Reallocation | 5019 | MEX | Mexborough | FRO | Frodingham | |
05/09/1939 | Reallocation | 6263 | DON | Doncaster | FRO | Frodingham | |
13/09/1939 | Reallocation | 6561 | DON | Doncaster | FRO | Frodingham | |
27/09/1939 | Reallocation | 6244 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | GRA | Grantham | |
27/09/1939 | Reallocation | 6533 | DON | Doncaster | GRA | Grantham | |
28/09/1939 | Reallocation | 6239 | ANN | Annesley | FRO | Frodingham | |
28/09/1939 | Reallocation | 6323 | ANN | Annesley | FRO | Frodingham | |
05/10/1939 | Reallocation | 6275 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
27/10/1939 | Reallocation | 6370 | 29B | Stirling | CAR | Carlisle Canal | |
02/11/1939 | Reallocation | 6370 | CAR | Carlisle Canal | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | |
02/12/1939 | Reallocation | 6275 | LNG | Langwith Junction | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
08/12/1939 | Reallocation | 5102 | MEX | Mexborough | BRN | Barnsley | |
06/01/1940 | Reallocation | 6607 | HLS | Hull Springhead | DAR | Darlington | |
06/01/1940 | Reallocation | 6609 | HLS | Hull Springhead | DAR | Darlington | |
06/01/1940 | Reallocation | 6613 | HLS | Hull Springhead | DAR | Darlington | |
06/01/1940 | Reallocation | 6618 | HLS | Hull Springhead | DAR | Darlington | |
08/01/1940 | Reallocation | 6577 | CUD | Cudworth | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
08/01/1940 | Reallocation | 6578 | CUD | Cudworth | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
20/02/1940 | Reallocation | 6607 | DAR | Darlington | HTN | Heaton | |
24/02/1940 | Reallocation | 6577 | HLS | Hull Springhead | HTN | Heaton | |
24/02/1940 | Reallocation | 6583 | HLS | Hull Springhead | HTN | Heaton | |
24/02/1940 | Reallocation | 6609 | DAR | Darlington | HTN | Heaton | |
24/02/1940 | Reallocation | 6610 | HLS | Hull Springhead | HTN | Heaton | |
24/02/1940 | Reallocation | 6613 | DAR | Darlington | HTN | Heaton | |
24/02/1940 | Reallocation | 6618 | DAR | Darlington | HTN | Heaton | |
28/02/1940 | Reallocation | 6367 | IMM | Immingham | HTN | Heaton | |
28/02/1940 | Reallocation | 6301 | LIN | Lincoln | HTN | Heaton | |
01/04/1940 | Reallocation | 6580 | CUD | Cudworth | HTN | Heaton | |
20/04/1940 | Reallocation | 6509 | CLK | Colwick | GRA | Grantham | |
07/05/1940 | Reallocation | 6631 | HLS | Hull Springhead | WHL | West Hartlepool | |
08/05/1940 | Reallocation | 6615 | HLS | Hull Springhead | WHL | West Hartlepool | |
09/05/1940 | Reallocation | 6581 | HLS | Hull Springhead | WHL | West Hartlepool | |
10/05/1940 | Reallocation | 6616 | HLS | Hull Springhead | WHL | West Hartlepool | |
11/05/1940 | Reallocation | 6612 | HLS | Hull Springhead | WHL | West Hartlepool | |
17/05/1940 | Reallocation | 6608 | HLS | Hull Springhead | WHL | West Hartlepool | |
18/05/1940 | Reallocation | 6578 | HLS | Hull Springhead | WHL | West Hartlepool | |
12/06/1940 | Reallocation | 6611 | CUD | Cudworth | HTN | Heaton | |
14/06/1940 | Reallocation | 6549 | CUD | Cudworth | WHL | West Hartlepool | |
06/07/1940 | Reallocation | 6630 | HLS | Hull Springhead | HTN | Heaton | |
17/07/1940 | Reallocation | 6350 | GOR | Gorton | 19D | Heaton Mersey | |
20/07/1940 | Reallocation | 6300 | GOR | Gorton | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | |
01/08/1940 | Reallocation | 6350 | 19D | Heaton Mersey | GOR | Gorton | |
04/08/1940 | Reallocation | 5397 | DON | Doncaster | MEX | Mexborough | |
06/08/1940 | Reallocation | 6300 | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | GOR | Gorton | |
30/08/1940 | Reallocation | 5395 | IMM | Immingham | GOR | Gorton | |
30/08/1940 | Reallocation | 6574 | IMM | Immingham | GOR | Gorton | |
31/08/1940 | Reallocation | 6514 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | YK | York (North) | |
11/09/1940 | Reallocation | 6574 | GOR | Gorton | YK | York (North) | |
16/09/1940 | Reallocation | 5395 | GOR | Gorton | YK | York (North) | |
16/09/1940 | Reallocation | 6324 | CLK | Colwick | GRA | Grantham | |
16/09/1940 | Reallocation | 6377 | CLK | Colwick | GRA | Grantham | |
19/09/1940 | Reallocation | 5378 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | YK | York (North) | |
02/10/1940 | Reallocation | 6617 | HLS | Hull Springhead | YK | York (North) | |
02/10/1940 | Reallocation | 6632 | CUD | Cudworth | YK | York (North) | |
13/10/1940 | Reallocation | 6214 | ANN | Annesley | CLK | Colwick | |
13/10/1940 | Reallocation | 6575 | ANN | Annesley | CLK | Colwick | |
13/10/1940 | Reallocation | 6626 | WFD | Woodford Halse | CLK | Colwick | |
21/10/1940 | Reallocation | 6592 | IMM | Immingham | DON | Doncaster | |
21/10/1940 | Reallocation | 6500 | IMM | Immingham | DON | Doncaster | |
26/10/1940 | Reallocation | 6306 | GOR | Gorton | 19D | Heaton Mersey | |
26/10/1940 | Reallocation | 6292 | GOR | Gorton | 19D | Heaton Mersey | |
26/10/1940 | Reallocation | 6287 | GOR | Gorton | 19D | Heaton Mersey | |
26/10/1940 | Reallocation | 6300 | GOR | Gorton | 19D | Heaton Mersey | |
21/11/1940 | Reallocation | 6566 | DON | Doncaster | DON | To Western Region / GWR | |
21/11/1940 | Reallocation | 6524 | LNG | Langwith Junction | LNG | To Western Region / GWR | |
22/11/1940 | Reallocation | 6350 | GOR | Gorton | GOR | To Western Region / GWR | |
22/11/1940 | Reallocation | 6365 | GOR | Gorton | GOR | To Western Region / GWR | |
22/11/1940 | Reallocation | 6586 | CLK | Colwick | CLK | To Western Region / GWR | |
22/11/1940 | Reallocation | 6629 | IMM | Immingham | IMM | To Western Region / GWR | |
22/11/1940 | Reallocation | 6639 | IMM | Immingham | IMM | To Western Region / GWR | |
22/11/1940 | Reallocation | 6295 | CLK | Colwick | CLK | To Western Region / GWR | |
23/11/1940 | Reallocation | 6205 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | SHF | To Western Region / GWR | |
23/11/1940 | Reallocation | 6231 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | STV | To Western Region / GWR | |
23/11/1940 | Reallocation | 6232 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | SHF | To Western Region / GWR | |
23/11/1940 | Reallocation | 6236 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | SHF | To Western Region / GWR | |
23/11/1940 | Reallocation | 6245 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | SHF | To Western Region / GWR | |
23/11/1940 | Reallocation | 5393 | IMM | Immingham | IMM | To Western Region / GWR | |
23/11/1940 | Reallocation | 6562 | IMM | Immingham | IMM | To Western Region / GWR | |
23/11/1940 | Reallocation | 6258 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | SHF | To Western Region / GWR | |
23/11/1940 | Reallocation | 6540 | CLK | Colwick | CLK | To Western Region / GWR | |
23/11/1940 | Reallocation | 6595 | DON | Doncaster | DON | To Western Region / GWR | |
23/11/1940 | Reallocation | 6275 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | SHF | To Western Region / GWR | |
23/11/1940 | Reallocation | 6265 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | SHF | To Western Region / GWR | |
23/11/1940 | Reallocation | 6633 | IMM | Immingham | IMM | To Western Region / GWR | |
24/11/1940 | Reallocation | 6209 | MEX | Mexborough | MEX | To Western Region / GWR | |
24/11/1940 | Reallocation | 6220 | ANN | Annesley | ANN | To Western Region / GWR | |
24/11/1940 | Reallocation | 5391 | MEX | Mexborough | MEX | To Western Region / GWR | |
24/11/1940 | Reallocation | 6336 | CLK | Colwick | CLK | To Western Region / GWR | |
24/11/1940 | Reallocation | 6594 | DON | Doncaster | DON | To Western Region / GWR | |
24/11/1940 | Reallocation | 6277 | LNG | Langwith Junction | LNG | To Western Region / GWR | |
25/11/1940 | Reallocation | 6321 | ANN | Annesley | ANN | To Western Region / GWR | |
25/11/1940 | Reallocation | 6621 | IMM | Immingham | IMM | To Western Region / GWR | |
25/11/1940 | Reallocation | 6309 | ANN | Annesley | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
28/11/1940 | Reallocation | 6573 | CLK | Colwick | CLK | To Western Region / GWR | |
01/12/1940 | Reallocation | 6619 | CLK | Colwick | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
01/12/1940 | Reallocation | 6300 | 19D | Heaton Mersey | GOR | Gorton | |
02/12/1940 | Reallocation | 6306 | 19D | Heaton Mersey | GOR | Gorton | |
02/12/1940 | Reallocation | 6287 | 19D | Heaton Mersey | GOR | Gorton | |
04/12/1940 | Reallocation | 6292 | 19D | Heaton Mersey | GOR | Gorton | |
13/12/1940 | Reallocation | 5102 | BRN | Barnsley | MEX | Mexborough | |
07/04/1941 | Reallocation | 5966 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | DON | Doncaster | |
16/04/1941 | Reallocation | 6203 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | DON | Doncaster | |
17/04/1941 | Reallocation | 6229 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | DON | Doncaster | |
30/04/1941 | Reallocation | 6232 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
30/04/1941 | Reallocation | 6236 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |
07/05/1941 | Reallocation | 6512 | IMM | Immingham | GRA | Grantham | |
07/05/1941 | Reallocation | 5001 | IMM | Immingham | GRA | Grantham | |
10/05/1941 | Reallocation | 6584 | HLS | Hull Springhead | WHL | West Hartlepool | |
09/09/1941 | Condemned | 709 | CLK | Colwick | COND | ||
09/09/1941 | Condemned | 720 | MAR | March | COND | ||
09/09/1941 | Condemned | 723 | MAR | March | COND | ||
10/09/1941 | Condemned | 724 | DON | Doncaster | COND | ||
10/09/1941 | Condemned | 714 | MEX | Mexborough | COND | ||
10/09/1941 | Condemned | 6212 | ANN | Annesley | COND | ||
10/09/1941 | Condemned | 763 | MEX | Mexborough | COND | ||
10/09/1941 | Condemned | 713 | CLK | Colwick | COND | ||
10/09/1941 | Condemned | 711 | CLK | Colwick | COND | ||
12/09/1941 | Condemned | 701 | MEX | Mexborough | COND | ||
13/09/1941 | Condemned | 702 | DON | Doncaster | COND | ||
13/09/1941 | Condemned | 715 | CLK | Colwick | COND | ||
13/09/1941 | Condemned | 706 | CLK | Colwick | COND | ||
13/09/1941 | Condemned | 712 | WFD | Woodford Halse | COND | ||
13/09/1941 | Condemned | 703 | CLK | Colwick | COND | ||
13/09/1941 | Condemned | 745 | DON | Doncaster | COND | ||
13/09/1941 | Condemned | 707 | LNG | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
13/09/1941 | Condemned | 704 | GRA | Grantham | COND | ||
13/09/1941 | Condemned | 708 | ANN | Annesley | COND | ||
13/09/1941 | Condemned | 716 | WFD | Woodford Halse | COND | ||
13/09/1941 | Condemned | 727 | CLK | Colwick | COND | ||
14/09/1941 | Condemned | 730 | MEX | Mexborough | COND | ||
14/09/1941 | Condemned | 6225 | LNG | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
14/09/1941 | Condemned | 731 | DON | Doncaster | COND | ||
14/09/1941 | Condemned | 717 | ANN | Annesley | COND | ||
14/09/1941 | Condemned | 728 | CLK | Colwick | COND | ||
14/09/1941 | Condemned | 718 | CLK | Colwick | COND | ||
14/09/1941 | Condemned | 733 | MAR | March | COND | ||
14/09/1941 | Condemned | 721 | FRO | Frodingham | COND | ||
19/09/1941 | Condemned | 739 | ANN | Annesley | COND | ||
19/09/1941 | Condemned | 6204 | CAM | Cambridge | COND | ||
19/09/1941 | Condemned | 6217 | ANN | Annesley | COND | ||
19/09/1941 | Condemned | 747 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | COND | ||
19/09/1941 | Condemned | 761 | ANN | Annesley | COND | ||
19/09/1941 | Condemned | 746 | MAR | March | COND | ||
19/09/1941 | Condemned | 760 | WFD | Woodford Halse | COND | ||
19/09/1941 | Condemned | 755 | DON | Doncaster | COND | ||
19/09/1941 | Condemned | 762 | GRA | Grantham | COND | ||
19/09/1941 | Condemned | 748 | LNG | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
19/09/1941 | Condemned | 743 | MAR | March | COND | ||
19/09/1941 | Condemned | 751 | CLK | Colwick | COND | ||
19/09/1941 | Condemned | 752 | CLK | Colwick | COND | ||
19/09/1941 | Condemned | 758 | LNG | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
19/09/1941 | Condemned | 735 | DON | Doncaster | COND | ||
19/09/1941 | Condemned | 734 | ANN | Annesley | COND | ||
19/09/1941 | Condemned | 764 | LNG | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
19/09/1941 | Condemned | 740 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | COND | ||
19/09/1941 | Condemned | 759 | GOR | Gorton | COND | ||
19/09/1941 | Condemned | 749 | HTN | Heaton | COND | ||
19/09/1941 | Condemned | 744 | GOR | Gorton | COND | ||
20/09/1941 | Condemned | 700 | WHL | West Hartlepool | COND | ||
20/09/1941 | Condemned | 741 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | COND | ||
20/09/1941 | Condemned | 765 | HTN | Heaton | COND | ||
20/09/1941 | Condemned | 725 | YK | York (North) | COND | ||
20/09/1941 | Condemned | 722 | HTN | Heaton | COND | ||
20/09/1941 | Condemned | 729 | HTN | Heaton | COND | ||
20/09/1941 | Condemned | 710 | HTN | Heaton | COND | ||
21/09/1941 | Condemned | 705 | FRO | Frodingham | COND | ||
21/09/1941 | Condemned | 742 | FRO | Frodingham | COND | ||
27/09/1941 | Condemned | 757 | THJ | Thornton Junction | COND | ||
04/10/1941 | Condemned | 767 | MEX | Mexborough | COND | ||
04/10/1941 | Condemned | 771 | MEX | Mexborough | COND | ||
04/10/1941 | Condemned | 773 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | COND | ||
04/10/1941 | Condemned | 774 | WFD | Woodford Halse | COND | ||
04/10/1941 | Condemned | 782 | CLK | Colwick | COND | ||
04/10/1941 | Condemned | 780 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | COND | ||
04/10/1941 | Condemned | 777 | LNG | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
05/10/1941 | Condemned | 756 | MEX | Mexborough | COND | ||
05/10/1941 | Condemned | 753 | IMM | Immingham | COND | ||
05/10/1941 | Condemned | 738 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | COND | ||
05/10/1941 | Condemned | 754 | IMM | Immingham | COND | ||
05/10/1941 | Condemned | 726 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | COND | ||
05/10/1941 | Condemned | 750 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | COND | ||
07/10/1941 | Reallocation | 6240 | LIN | Lincoln | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
11/10/1941 | Condemned | 768 | ANN | Annesley | COND | ||
11/10/1941 | Condemned | 776 | ANN | Annesley | COND | ||
11/10/1941 | Condemned | 778 | WFD | Woodford Halse | COND | ||
11/10/1941 | Condemned | 781 | MAR | March | COND | ||
13/10/1941 | Condemned | 775 | FRO | Frodingham | COND | ||
16/10/1941 | Reallocation | 6374 | IMM | Immingham | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
18/10/1941 | Condemned | 772 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | COND | ||
18/10/1941 | Condemned | 783 | IMM | Immingham | COND | ||
18/10/1941 | Condemned | 779 | FRO | Frodingham | COND | ||
18/10/1941 | Reallocation | 6506 | CAM | Cambridge | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
18/10/1941 | Condemned | 789 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | COND | ||
18/10/1941 | Condemned | 784 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | COND | ||
18/10/1941 | Condemned | 786 | GRA | Grantham | COND | ||
18/10/1941 | Condemned | 791 | MAR | March | COND | ||
18/10/1941 | Condemned | 785 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | COND | ||
18/10/1941 | Condemned | 788 | MAR | March | COND | ||
18/10/1941 | Condemned | 766 | MEX | Mexborough | COND | ||
22/10/1941 | Reallocation | 6364 | MAR | March | BRN | Barnsley | |
25/10/1941 | Condemned | 790 | DON | Doncaster | COND | ||
25/10/1941 | Condemned | 787 | MEX | Mexborough | COND | ||
26/10/1941 | Condemned | 769 | MEX | Mexborough | COND | ||
02/11/1941 | Reallocation | 5414 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | MAR | March | |
02/11/1941 | Reallocation | 5011 | BRN | Barnsley | MAR | March | |
08/11/1941 | Condemned | 770 | MEX | Mexborough | COND | ||
16/03/1942 | Reallocation | 6498 | CAM | Cambridge | MAR | March | |
18/07/1942 | Reallocation | 6205 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
18/07/1942 | Reallocation | 5391 | MEX | Mexborough | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
20/07/1942 | Reallocation | 6621 | IMM | Immingham | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
20/07/1942 | Reallocation | 6639 | IMM | Immingham | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
21/07/1942 | Reallocation | 6629 | IMM | Immingham | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
23/07/1942 | Reallocation | 6258 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
23/07/1942 | Reallocation | 6573 | CLK | Colwick | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
24/07/1942 | Reallocation | 6586 | CLK | Colwick | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
30/07/1942 | Reallocation | 6540 | CLK | Colwick | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
06/08/1942 | Reallocation | 6209 | MEX | Mexborough | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
02/09/1942 | Reallocation | 5404 | WFD | Woodford Halse | WHL | West Hartlepool | |
03/09/1942 | Reallocation | 6211 | CLK | Colwick | WHL | West Hartlepool | |
03/09/1942 | Reallocation | 5391 | WFD | Woodford Halse | CLK | Colwick | |
03/09/1942 | Reallocation | 5008 | CLK | Colwick | WHL | West Hartlepool | |
03/09/1942 | Reallocation | 6501 | WFD | Woodford Halse | WHL | West Hartlepool | |
04/09/1942 | Reallocation | 6586 | WFD | Woodford Halse | CLK | Colwick | |
21/11/1942 | Reallocation | 6244 | GRA | Grantham | DON | Doncaster | |
21/11/1942 | Reallocation | 6324 | GRA | Grantham | DON | Doncaster | |
21/11/1942 | Reallocation | 6512 | GRA | Grantham | DON | Doncaster | |
21/11/1942 | Reallocation | 6604 | GRA | Grantham | DON | Doncaster | |
21/11/1942 | Reallocation | 5001 | GRA | Grantham | MEX | Mexborough | |
21/11/1942 | Reallocation | 6533 | GRA | Grantham | DON | Doncaster | |
21/11/1942 | Reallocation | 6535 | GRA | Grantham | DON | Doncaster | |
21/11/1942 | Reallocation | 6627 | GRA | Grantham | MEX | Mexborough | |
21/11/1942 | Reallocation | 6635 | GRA | Grantham | MEX | Mexborough | |
12/01/1943 | Reallocation | 6524 | LNG | Langwith Junction | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
12/01/1943 | Reallocation | 6633 | IMM | Immingham | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
21/01/1943 | Reallocation | 6562 | IMM | Immingham | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
25/01/1943 | Reallocation | 6524 | WFD | Woodford Halse | THJ | Thornton Junction | |
25/01/1943 | Reallocation | 6633 | WFD | Woodford Halse | THJ | Thornton Junction | |
28/01/1943 | Reallocation | 6231 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
28/01/1943 | Reallocation | 6275 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
29/01/1943 | Reallocation | 6566 | DON | Doncaster | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
30/01/1943 | Reallocation | 6365 | GOR | Gorton | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
30/01/1943 | Reallocation | 6265 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
30/01/1943 | Reallocation | 6295 | CLK | Colwick | GOR | Gorton | |
31/01/1943 | Reallocation | 5393 | IMM | Immingham | GOR | Gorton | |
31/01/1943 | Reallocation | 6321 | ANN | Annesley | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
01/02/1943 | Reallocation | 6336 | CLK | Colwick | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
03/02/1943 | Reallocation | 6220 | ANN | Annesley | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
03/02/1943 | Reallocation | 6245 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
03/02/1943 | Reallocation | 6350 | GOR | Gorton | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
03/02/1943 | Reallocation | 5022 | DON | Doncaster | GOR | Gorton | |
04/02/1943 | Reallocation | 6594 | DON | Doncaster | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
04/02/1943 | Reallocation | 6595 | DON | Doncaster | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
04/02/1943 | Reallocation | 6500 | DON | Doncaster | GOR | Gorton | |
07/02/1943 | Reallocation | 6244 | DON | Doncaster | GOR | Gorton | |
07/02/1943 | Reallocation | 6556 | DON | Doncaster | GOR | Gorton | |
07/02/1943 | Reallocation | 6277 | LNG | Langwith Junction | GOR | Gorton | |
10/02/1943 | Reallocation | 6220 | WFD | Woodford Halse | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | |
10/02/1943 | Reallocation | 5393 | GOR | Gorton | THJ | Thornton Junction | |
10/02/1943 | Reallocation | 6365 | WFD | Woodford Halse | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | |
08/03/1943 | Reallocation | 6265 | WFD | Woodford Halse | WHL | West Hartlepool | |
10/03/1943 | Reallocation | 6231 | WFD | Woodford Halse | GOR | Gorton | |
10/03/1943 | Reallocation | 6245 | WFD | Woodford Halse | GOR | Gorton | |
10/03/1943 | Reallocation | 6562 | WFD | Woodford Halse | GOR | Gorton | |
10/03/1943 | Reallocation | 6321 | WFD | Woodford Halse | GOR | Gorton | |
10/03/1943 | Reallocation | 6594 | WFD | Woodford Halse | GOR | Gorton | |
10/03/1943 | Reallocation | 6595 | WFD | Woodford Halse | GOR | Gorton | |
20/03/1943 | Reallocation | 6566 | WFD | Woodford Halse | WHL | West Hartlepool | |
20/03/1943 | Reallocation | 6594 | GOR | Gorton | WHL | West Hartlepool | |
20/03/1943 | Reallocation | 6595 | GOR | Gorton | WHL | West Hartlepool | |
20/03/1943 | Reallocation | 6295 | GOR | Gorton | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
21/03/1943 | Reallocation | 6350 | WFD | Woodford Halse | WHL | West Hartlepool | |
21/03/1943 | Reallocation | 6336 | WFD | Woodford Halse | CLK | Colwick | |
21/03/1943 | Reallocation | 6275 | WFD | Woodford Halse | CLK | Colwick | |
28/03/1943 | Reallocation | 5378 | YK | York (North) | HTN | Heaton | |
28/03/1943 | Reallocation | 5395 | YK | York (North) | HTN | Heaton | |
28/03/1943 | Reallocation | 6574 | YK | York (North) | HTN | Heaton | |
28/03/1943 | Reallocation | 6576 | CUD | Cudworth | HTN | Heaton | |
28/03/1943 | Reallocation | 6579 | CUD | Cudworth | HTN | Heaton | |
28/03/1943 | Reallocation | 6614 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | HTN | Heaton | |
28/03/1943 | Reallocation | 6617 | YK | York (North) | HTN | Heaton | |
28/03/1943 | Reallocation | 6632 | YK | York (North) | HTN | Heaton | |
03/04/1943 | Reallocation | 6277 | GOR | Gorton | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
11/04/1943 | Reallocation | 6232 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
11/04/1943 | Reallocation | 6234 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
11/04/1943 | Reallocation | 6236 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
11/04/1943 | Reallocation | 6316 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
11/04/1943 | Reallocation | 6256 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
14/05/1943 | Reallocation | 6591 | DON | Doncaster | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
14/05/1943 | Reallocation | 6511 | DON | Doncaster | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
14/05/1943 | Reallocation | 6512 | DON | Doncaster | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
14/05/1943 | Reallocation | 6519 | DON | Doncaster | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
13/06/1943 | Reallocation | 6371 | DON | Doncaster | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
20/06/1943 | Reallocation | 6285 | DON | Doncaster | MEX | Mexborough | |
20/06/1943 | Reallocation | 6555 | DON | Doncaster | MEX | Mexborough | |
14/07/1943 | Reallocation | 6220 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | IMM | Immingham | |
15/07/1943 | Reallocation | 6372 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | |
16/07/1943 | Reallocation | 6370 | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | IMM | Immingham | |
22/07/1943 | Reallocation | 6351 | 29B | Stirling | IMM | Immingham | |
22/07/1943 | Reallocation | 6286 | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | IMM | Immingham | |
24/07/1943 | Reallocation | 6291 | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | IMM | Immingham | |
24/07/1943 | Reallocation | 6328 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
25/07/1943 | Reallocation | 5966 | DON | Doncaster | FRO | Frodingham | |
25/07/1943 | Reallocation | 5396 | DON | Doncaster | MEX | Mexborough | |
25/07/1943 | Reallocation | 6564 | DON | Doncaster | MEX | Mexborough | |
25/07/1943 | Reallocation | 6284 | DON | Doncaster | FRO | Frodingham | |
25/07/1943 | Reallocation | 6554 | DON | Doncaster | MEX | Mexborough | |
25/07/1943 | Reallocation | 6592 | DON | Doncaster | FRO | Frodingham | |
25/07/1943 | Reallocation | 6280 | DON | Doncaster | FRO | Frodingham | |
25/07/1943 | Reallocation | 6552 | DON | Doncaster | MEX | Mexborough | |
25/07/1943 | Reallocation | 6333 | DON | Doncaster | MEX | Mexborough | |
25/07/1943 | Reallocation | 6314 | DON | Doncaster | MEX | Mexborough | |
27/07/1943 | Reallocation | 6544 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
28/07/1943 | Reallocation | 6290 | THJ | Thornton Junction | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
29/07/1943 | Reallocation | 6582 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | |
29/07/1943 | Reallocation | 6288 | THJ | Thornton Junction | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | |
03/08/1943 | Reallocation | 5406 | WFD | Woodford Halse | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
03/08/1943 | Reallocation | 6205 | WFD | Woodford Halse | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
03/08/1943 | Reallocation | 6573 | WFD | Woodford Halse | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
03/08/1943 | Reallocation | 6553 | WFD | Woodford Halse | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
13/08/1943 | Reallocation | 6192 | BRN | Barnsley | FRO | Frodingham | |
29/08/1943 | Reallocation | 6364 | BRN | Barnsley | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | |
29/08/1943 | Reallocation | 6261 | BRN | Barnsley | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | |
05/09/1943 | Reallocation | 6546 | DON | Doncaster | CLK | Colwick | |
05/09/1943 | Reallocation | 6320 | ANN | Annesley | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
05/09/1943 | Reallocation | 6307 | ANN | Annesley | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
06/09/1943 | Reallocation | 6229 | DON | Doncaster | CLK | Colwick | |
06/09/1943 | Reallocation | 6604 | DON | Doncaster | CLK | Colwick | |
06/09/1943 | Reallocation | 6533 | DON | Doncaster | CLK | Colwick | |
07/09/1943 | Reallocation | 6531 | DON | Doncaster | CLK | Colwick | |
07/09/1943 | Reallocation | 6535 | DON | Doncaster | CLK | Colwick | |
07/09/1943 | Reallocation | 6254 | DON | Doncaster | CLK | Colwick | |
07/09/1943 | Reallocation | 6253 | DON | Doncaster | CLK | Colwick | |
12/09/1943 | Reallocation | 6550 | THJ | Thornton Junction | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
29/09/1943 | Reallocation | 6365 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | FRO | Frodingham | |
30/09/1943 | Reallocation | 6372 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | MEX | Mexborough | |
30/09/1943 | Reallocation | 6582 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | DON | Doncaster | |
01/10/1943 | Reallocation | 6352 | THJ | Thornton Junction | GOR | Gorton | |
01/10/1943 | Reallocation | 6524 | THJ | Thornton Junction | MEX | Mexborough | |
01/10/1943 | Reallocation | 6288 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ANN | Annesley | |
02/10/1943 | Reallocation | 5393 | THJ | Thornton Junction | ANN | Annesley | |
02/10/1943 | Reallocation | 6633 | THJ | Thornton Junction | DON | Doncaster | |
03/10/1943 | Reallocation | 6543 | THJ | Thornton Junction | MEX | Mexborough | |
06/10/1943 | Reallocation | 6548 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | MEX | Mexborough | |
12/12/1943 | Reallocation | 6203 | DON | Doncaster | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
12/12/1943 | Reallocation | 6324 | DON | Doncaster | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
12/12/1943 | Reallocation | 6343 | DON | Doncaster | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
12/12/1943 | Reallocation | 6359 | DON | Doncaster | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
12/12/1943 | Reallocation | 6342 | DON | Doncaster | LIN | Lincoln | |
12/12/1943 | Reallocation | 6262 | DON | Doncaster | LIN | Lincoln | |
09/01/1944 | Reallocation | 6220 | IMM | Immingham | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
09/01/1944 | Reallocation | 6278 | IMM | Immingham | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
09/01/1944 | Reallocation | 6291 | IMM | Immingham | TUX | Tuxford | |
20/01/1944 | Reallocation | 6594 | WHL | West Hartlepool | CLK | Colwick | |
20/01/1944 | Reallocation | 6606 | CLK | Colwick | WHL | West Hartlepool | |
23/01/1944 | Reallocation | 5405 | CLK | Colwick | DON | Doncaster | |
23/01/1944 | Reallocation | 6214 | CLK | Colwick | DON | Doncaster | |
23/01/1944 | Reallocation | 6218 | CLK | Colwick | DON | Doncaster | |
23/01/1944 | Reallocation | 6229 | CLK | Colwick | DON | Doncaster | |
23/01/1944 | Reallocation | 6246 | CLK | Colwick | DON | Doncaster | |
23/01/1944 | Reallocation | 6249 | CLK | Colwick | DON | Doncaster | |
23/01/1944 | Reallocation | 5385 | CLK | Colwick | DON | Doncaster | |
23/01/1944 | Reallocation | 5387 | CLK | Colwick | DON | Doncaster | |
23/01/1944 | Reallocation | 5391 | CLK | Colwick | DON | Doncaster | |
23/01/1944 | Reallocation | 5399 | CLK | Colwick | DON | Doncaster | |
23/01/1944 | Reallocation | 6575 | CLK | Colwick | DON | Doncaster | |
23/01/1944 | Reallocation | 6354 | CLK | Colwick | DON | Doncaster | |
23/01/1944 | Reallocation | 6353 | CLK | Colwick | DON | Doncaster | |
23/01/1944 | Reallocation | 6545 | CLK | Colwick | DON | Doncaster | |
23/01/1944 | Reallocation | 6363 | CLK | Colwick | DON | Doncaster | |
23/01/1944 | Reallocation | 6546 | CLK | Colwick | DON | Doncaster | |
23/01/1944 | Reallocation | 6361 | CLK | Colwick | DON | Doncaster | |
23/01/1944 | Reallocation | 6338 | CLK | Colwick | DON | Doncaster | |
23/01/1944 | Reallocation | 6336 | CLK | Colwick | DON | Doncaster | |
23/01/1944 | Reallocation | 6270 | CLK | Colwick | DON | Doncaster | |
23/01/1944 | Reallocation | 6586 | CLK | Colwick | DON | Doncaster | |
23/01/1944 | Reallocation | 6594 | CLK | Colwick | DON | Doncaster | |
23/01/1944 | Reallocation | 6510 | CLK | Colwick | DON | Doncaster | |
23/01/1944 | Reallocation | 6275 | CLK | Colwick | DON | Doncaster | |
23/01/1944 | Reallocation | 6601 | CLK | Colwick | DON | Doncaster | |
23/01/1944 | Reallocation | 6604 | CLK | Colwick | DON | Doncaster | |
23/01/1944 | Reallocation | 6264 | CLK | Colwick | DON | Doncaster | |
23/01/1944 | Reallocation | 6521 | CLK | Colwick | DON | Doncaster | |
23/01/1944 | Reallocation | 6531 | CLK | Colwick | DON | Doncaster | |
23/01/1944 | Reallocation | 6257 | CLK | Colwick | DON | Doncaster | |
23/01/1944 | Reallocation | 6311 | CLK | Colwick | DON | Doncaster | |
23/01/1944 | Reallocation | 6533 | CLK | Colwick | DON | Doncaster | |
23/01/1944 | Reallocation | 6535 | CLK | Colwick | DON | Doncaster | |
23/01/1944 | Reallocation | 6624 | CLK | Colwick | DON | Doncaster | |
23/01/1944 | Reallocation | 6626 | CLK | Colwick | DON | Doncaster | |
23/01/1944 | Reallocation | 6528 | CLK | Colwick | DON | Doncaster | |
23/01/1944 | Reallocation | 6254 | CLK | Colwick | DON | Doncaster | |
23/01/1944 | Reallocation | 6253 | CLK | Colwick | DON | Doncaster | |
12/02/1944 | Reallocation | 6308 | CLK | Colwick | DON | Doncaster | |
12/03/1944 | Reallocation | 6218 | DON | Doncaster | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
12/03/1944 | Reallocation | 6249 | DON | Doncaster | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
12/03/1944 | Reallocation | 5387 | DON | Doncaster | MEX | Mexborough | |
12/03/1944 | Reallocation | 6275 | DON | Doncaster | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
12/03/1944 | Reallocation | 6311 | DON | Doncaster | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | |
12/03/1944 | Reallocation | 6535 | DON | Doncaster | MEX | Mexborough | |
13/03/1944 | Reallocation | 6352 | GOR | Gorton | WHL | West Hartlepool | |
03/04/1944 | Reallocation | 6629 | WFD | Woodford Halse | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | |
03/04/1944 | Reallocation | 6639 | WFD | Woodford Halse | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | |
07/05/1944 | Reallocation | 6209 | WFD | Woodford Halse | ANN | Annesley | |
07/05/1944 | Reallocation | 6258 | WFD | Woodford Halse | ANN | Annesley | |
07/05/1944 | Reallocation | 6495 | ANN | Annesley | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
07/05/1944 | Reallocation | 6536 | WFD | Woodford Halse | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | |
07/05/1944 | Reallocation | 6358 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
07/05/1944 | Reallocation | 6496 | ANN | Annesley | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
07/05/1944 | Reallocation | 6640 | WFD | Woodford Halse | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | |
07/05/1944 | Reallocation | 6641 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
21/05/1944 | Reallocation | 6281 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | GOR | Gorton | |
11/06/1944 | Reallocation | 6229 | DON | Doncaster | ARD | Ardsley | |
11/06/1944 | Reallocation | 6336 | DON | Doncaster | ARD | Ardsley | |
11/06/1944 | Reallocation | 6631 | WHL | West Hartlepool | IMM | Immingham | |
11/06/1944 | Reallocation | 6633 | DON | Doncaster | ARD | Ardsley | |
10/08/1944 | Reallocation | 5391 | DON | Doncaster | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
10/08/1944 | Reallocation | 6364 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
10/08/1944 | Reallocation | 6357 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
10/08/1944 | Reallocation | 6308 | DON | Doncaster | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
11/08/1944 | Reallocation | 5355 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
11/08/1944 | Reallocation | 5381 | ANN | Annesley | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
11/08/1944 | Reallocation | 6589 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
11/08/1944 | Reallocation | 6299 | ANN | Annesley | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
20/08/1944 | Reallocation | 6500 | GOR | Gorton | MEX | Mexborough | |
27/08/1944 | Reallocation | 6535 | MEX | Mexborough | DON | Doncaster | |
27/08/1944 | Reallocation | 6627 | MEX | Mexborough | DON | Doncaster | |
06/09/1944 | Reallocation | 6276 | GOR | Gorton | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
07/09/1944 | Reallocation | 5155 | MEX | Mexborough | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
07/09/1944 | Reallocation | 6347 | DON | Doncaster | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
07/09/1944 | Reallocation | 6370 | IMM | Immingham | MAR | March | |
07/09/1944 | Reallocation | 6338 | DON | Doncaster | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
07/09/1944 | Reallocation | 6320 | LNG | Langwith Junction | MAR | March | |
07/09/1944 | Reallocation | 6521 | DON | Doncaster | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
07/09/1944 | Reallocation | 6305 | LNG | Langwith Junction | MAR | March | |
07/09/1944 | Reallocation | 6286 | IMM | Immingham | MAR | March | |
07/09/1944 | Reallocation | 6635 | MEX | Mexborough | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
07/09/1944 | Reallocation | 6253 | DON | Doncaster | MAR | March | |
07/09/1944 | Reallocation | 6326 | LNG | Langwith Junction | MAR | March | |
08/09/1944 | Reallocation | 6550 | LNG | Langwith Junction | MAR | March | |
08/09/1944 | Reallocation | 6254 | DON | Doncaster | MAR | March | |
08/09/1944 | Reallocation | 6329 | IMM | Immingham | MAR | March | |
11/09/1944 | Reallocation | 6571 | FRO | Frodingham | CLK | Colwick | |
11/09/1944 | Reallocation | 6255 | FRO | Frodingham | CLK | Colwick | |
12/09/1944 | Reallocation | 6192 | FRO | Frodingham | CLK | Colwick | |
12/09/1944 | Reallocation | 6568 | FRO | Frodingham | CLK | Colwick | |
18/09/1944 | Reallocation | 6252 | MEX | Mexborough | CLK | Colwick | |
18/09/1944 | Reallocation | 6526 | MEX | Mexborough | CLK | Colwick | |
18/09/1944 | Reallocation | 5010 | MEX | Mexborough | CLK | Colwick | |
19/09/1944 | Reallocation | 5069 | MEX | Mexborough | CLK | Colwick | |
19/09/1944 | Reallocation | 5093 | MEX | Mexborough | CLK | Colwick | |
19/09/1944 | Reallocation | 6224 | MEX | Mexborough | CLK | Colwick | |
19/09/1944 | Reallocation | 6227 | MEX | Mexborough | CLK | Colwick | |
19/09/1944 | Reallocation | 6344 | LNG | Langwith Junction | CLK | Colwick | |
19/09/1944 | Reallocation | 6591 | LNG | Langwith Junction | CLK | Colwick | |
20/09/1944 | Reallocation | 6512 | LNG | Langwith Junction | CLK | Colwick | |
30/09/1944 | Reallocation | 6192 | CLK | Colwick | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | |
30/09/1944 | Reallocation | 6213 | ANN | Annesley | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | |
30/09/1944 | Reallocation | 5010 | CLK | Colwick | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | |
05/10/1944 | Reallocation | 5404 | WHL | West Hartlepool | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | |
05/10/1944 | Reallocation | 6352 | WHL | West Hartlepool | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | |
05/10/1944 | Reallocation | 6606 | WHL | West Hartlepool | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | |
05/10/1944 | Reallocation | 5008 | WHL | West Hartlepool | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | |
05/10/1944 | Reallocation | 6616 | WHL | West Hartlepool | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | |
15/10/1944 | Reallocation | 6291 | TUX | Tuxford | IMM | Immingham | |
18/10/1944 | Reallocation | 5404 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | WHL | West Hartlepool | |
18/10/1944 | Reallocation | 6352 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | WHL | West Hartlepool | |
18/10/1944 | Reallocation | 6606 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | WHL | West Hartlepool | |
18/10/1944 | Reallocation | 5008 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | WHL | West Hartlepool | |
18/10/1944 | Reallocation | 6616 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | WHL | West Hartlepool | |
24/10/1944 | Reallocation | 6319 | GOR | Gorton | MEX | Mexborough | |
24/11/1944 | Reallocation | 6245 | GOR | Gorton | CLK | Colwick | |
03/12/1944 | Reallocation | 6292 | GOR | Gorton | ANN | Annesley | |
06/12/1944 | Reallocation | 5022 | GOR | Gorton | FRO | Frodingham | |
10/12/1944 | Reallocation | 6287 | GOR | Gorton | DON | Doncaster | |
22/12/1944 | Reallocation | 6226 | FRO | Frodingham | CLK | Colwick | |
24/12/1944 | Reallocation | 6231 | GOR | Gorton | CLK | Colwick | |
24/12/1944 | Reallocation | 6242 | GOR | Gorton | CLK | Colwick | |
24/12/1944 | Reallocation | 6263 | FRO | Frodingham | CLK | Colwick | |
24/12/1944 | Reallocation | 6561 | FRO | Frodingham | CLK | Colwick | |
02/01/1945 | Reallocation | 5404 | WHL | West Hartlepool | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
05/01/1945 | Reallocation | 6615 | WHL | West Hartlepool | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
06/01/1945 | Reallocation | 6211 | WHL | West Hartlepool | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
07/01/1945 | Reallocation | 6281 | GOR | Gorton | FRO | Frodingham | |
07/01/1945 | Reallocation | 6300 | GOR | Gorton | ANN | Annesley | |
10/01/1945 | Reallocation | 6616 | WHL | West Hartlepool | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
11/01/1945 | Reallocation | 6352 | WHL | West Hartlepool | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
12/01/1945 | Reallocation | 6606 | WHL | West Hartlepool | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
12/01/1945 | Reallocation | 5008 | WHL | West Hartlepool | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
12/01/1945 | Reallocation | 6501 | WHL | West Hartlepool | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
13/01/1945 | Reallocation | 6581 | WHL | West Hartlepool | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
17/01/1945 | Reallocation | 6375 | GOR | Gorton | CLK | Colwick | |
17/01/1945 | Reallocation | 6310 | GOR | Gorton | CLK | Colwick | |
17/01/1945 | Reallocation | 6306 | GOR | Gorton | CLK | Colwick | |
28/01/1945 | Reallocation | 6210 | MEX | Mexborough | CLK | Colwick | |
28/01/1945 | Reallocation | 6222 | MEX | Mexborough | CLK | Colwick | |
28/01/1945 | Reallocation | 5388 | MEX | Mexborough | CLK | Colwick | |
28/01/1945 | Reallocation | 6285 | MEX | Mexborough | CLK | Colwick | |
28/01/1945 | Reallocation | 6559 | MEX | Mexborough | CLK | Colwick | |
25/02/1945 | Reallocation | 6337 | GOR | Gorton | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
05/03/1945 | Reallocation | 6566 | WHL | West Hartlepool | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
05/03/1945 | Reallocation | 6584 | WHL | West Hartlepool | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
05/03/1945 | Reallocation | 6265 | WHL | West Hartlepool | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
05/03/1945 | Reallocation | 6608 | WHL | West Hartlepool | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
05/03/1945 | Reallocation | 6612 | WHL | West Hartlepool | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
01/04/1945 | Reallocation | 6562 | GOR | Gorton | ANN | Annesley | |
15/04/1945 | Reallocation | 6293 | GOR | Gorton | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
22/04/1945 | Reallocation | 6556 | GOR | Gorton | CLK | Colwick | |
22/04/1945 | Reallocation | 6302 | GOR | Gorton | CLK | Colwick | |
29/04/1945 | Reallocation | 6303 | GOR | Gorton | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
22/05/1945 | Reallocation | 6321 | GOR | Gorton | DON | Doncaster | |
27/05/1945 | Reallocation | 6268 | GOR | Gorton | DON | Doncaster | |
03/06/1945 | Reallocation | 6325 | GOR | Gorton | DON | Doncaster | |
03/06/1945 | Reallocation | 6331 | GOR | Gorton | CLK | Colwick | |
17/06/1945 | Reallocation | 6376 | GOR | Gorton | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
25/06/1945 | Reallocation | 6214 | DON | Doncaster | GOR | Gorton | |
25/06/1945 | Reallocation | 6575 | DON | Doncaster | ARD | Ardsley | |
25/06/1945 | Reallocation | 6363 | DON | Doncaster | GOR | Gorton | |
25/06/1945 | Reallocation | 6321 | DON | Doncaster | GOR | Gorton | |
25/06/1945 | Reallocation | 6582 | DON | Doncaster | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
25/06/1945 | Reallocation | 6270 | DON | Doncaster | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
25/06/1945 | Reallocation | 6268 | DON | Doncaster | GOR | Gorton | |
25/06/1945 | Reallocation | 6586 | DON | Doncaster | GOR | Gorton | |
25/06/1945 | Reallocation | 6594 | DON | Doncaster | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
25/06/1945 | Reallocation | 6528 | DON | Doncaster | GOR | Gorton | |
25/06/1945 | Reallocation | 6287 | DON | Doncaster | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
01/07/1945 | Reallocation | 6554 | MEX | Mexborough | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
08/07/1945 | Reallocation | 6268 | GOR | Gorton | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
08/07/1945 | Reallocation | 6586 | GOR | Gorton | MEX | Mexborough | |
23/07/1945 | Reallocation | 5378 | HTN | Heaton | TDK | Tyne Dock | |
23/07/1945 | Reallocation | 5395 | HTN | Heaton | TDK | Tyne Dock | |
23/07/1945 | Reallocation | 6574 | HTN | Heaton | TDK | Tyne Dock | |
23/07/1945 | Reallocation | 6576 | HTN | Heaton | TDK | Tyne Dock | |
23/07/1945 | Reallocation | 6577 | HTN | Heaton | TDK | Tyne Dock | |
23/07/1945 | Reallocation | 6367 | HTN | Heaton | TDK | Tyne Dock | |
23/07/1945 | Reallocation | 6579 | HTN | Heaton | TDK | Tyne Dock | |
23/07/1945 | Reallocation | 6583 | HTN | Heaton | TDK | Tyne Dock | |
23/07/1945 | Reallocation | 6609 | HTN | Heaton | TDK | Tyne Dock | |
23/07/1945 | Reallocation | 6611 | HTN | Heaton | TDK | Tyne Dock | |
23/07/1945 | Reallocation | 6614 | HTN | Heaton | TDK | Tyne Dock | |
23/07/1945 | Reallocation | 6617 | HTN | Heaton | TDK | Tyne Dock | |
23/07/1945 | Reallocation | 6618 | HTN | Heaton | TDK | Tyne Dock | |
23/07/1945 | Reallocation | 6632 | HTN | Heaton | TDK | Tyne Dock | |
09/09/1945 | Reallocation | 6214 | GOR | Gorton | DON | Doncaster | |
16/09/1945 | Reallocation | 5102 | MEX | Mexborough | IMM | Immingham | |
16/09/1945 | Reallocation | 5133 | MEX | Mexborough | IMM | Immingham | |
16/09/1945 | Reallocation | 6190 | MEX | Mexborough | FRO | Frodingham | |
16/09/1945 | Reallocation | 6548 | MEX | Mexborough | FRO | Frodingham | |
16/09/1945 | Reallocation | 6543 | MEX | Mexborough | FRO | Frodingham | |
16/09/1945 | Reallocation | 6319 | MEX | Mexborough | IMM | Immingham | |
16/09/1945 | Reallocation | 6304 | MEX | Mexborough | IMM | Immingham | |
16/09/1945 | Reallocation | 5001 | MEX | Mexborough | IMM | Immingham | |
16/09/1945 | Reallocation | 6500 | MEX | Mexborough | IMM | Immingham | |
23/09/1945 | Reallocation | 5349 | MEX | Mexborough | ARD | Ardsley | |
23/09/1945 | Reallocation | 6528 | GOR | Gorton | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
21/10/1945 | Reallocation | 6269 | GOR | Gorton | CLK | Colwick | |
04/11/1945 | Reallocation | 6321 | GOR | Gorton | FRO | Frodingham | |
25/11/1945 | Reallocation | 6637 | GOR | Gorton | ARD | Ardsley | |
02/12/1945 | Reallocation | 5399 | DON | Doncaster | FRO | Frodingham | |
02/12/1945 | Reallocation | 6354 | DON | Doncaster | FRO | Frodingham | |
02/12/1945 | Reallocation | 6361 | DON | Doncaster | FRO | Frodingham | |
02/12/1945 | Reallocation | 6604 | DON | Doncaster | FRO | Frodingham | |
09/12/1945 | Reallocation | 5405 | DON | Doncaster | IMM | Immingham | |
09/12/1945 | Reallocation | 6353 | DON | Doncaster | IMM | Immingham | |
09/12/1945 | Reallocation | 6325 | DON | Doncaster | IMM | Immingham | |
09/12/1945 | Reallocation | 6264 | DON | Doncaster | IMM | Immingham | |
16/12/1945 | Reallocation | 6586 | MEX | Mexborough | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
23/12/1945 | Reallocation | 6188 | MEX | Mexborough | IMM | Immingham | |
23/12/1945 | Reallocation | 6200 | MEX | Mexborough | IMM | Immingham | |
06/01/1946 | Reallocation | 6347 | WFD | Woodford Halse | ANN | Annesley | |
06/01/1946 | Reallocation | 6299 | WFD | Woodford Halse | ANN | Annesley | |
13/01/1946 | Reallocation | 5333 | WFD | Woodford Halse | DON | Doncaster | |
13/01/1946 | Reallocation | 6199 | MEX | Mexborough | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
13/01/1946 | Reallocation | 5012 | MEX | Mexborough | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
27/01/1946 | Reallocation | 6567 | GOR | Gorton | MEX | Mexborough | |
03/02/1946 | Reallocation | 3511 | WFD | Woodford Halse | DON | Doncaster | |
03/02/1946 | Reallocation | 5355 | WFD | Woodford Halse | DON | Doncaster | |
03/02/1946 | Reallocation | 5391 | WFD | Woodford Halse | DON | Doncaster | |
03/02/1946 | Reallocation | 6540 | WFD | Woodford Halse | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
03/02/1946 | Reallocation | 6276 | WFD | Woodford Halse | DON | Doncaster | |
03/02/1946 | Reallocation | 6589 | WFD | Woodford Halse | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
03/02/1946 | Reallocation | 6521 | WFD | Woodford Halse | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
03/02/1946 | Reallocation | 6621 | WFD | Woodford Halse | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
03/02/1946 | Reallocation | 6308 | WFD | Woodford Halse | DON | Doncaster | |
03/02/1946 | Reallocation | 6502 | WFD | Woodford Halse | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
17/02/1946 | Reallocation | 6363 | GOR | Gorton | DON | Doncaster | |
14/03/1946 | Reallocation | 6495 | WFD | Woodford Halse | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
07/04/1946 | Reallocation | 5966 | FRO | Frodingham | DON | Doncaster | |
07/04/1946 | Reallocation | 3507 | FRO | Frodingham | DON | Doncaster | |
07/04/1946 | Reallocation | 5353 | FRO | Frodingham | DON | Doncaster | |
07/04/1946 | Reallocation | 6190 | FRO | Frodingham | DON | Doncaster | |
07/04/1946 | Reallocation | 6191 | FRO | Frodingham | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
07/04/1946 | Reallocation | 6250 | FRO | Frodingham | DON | Doncaster | |
07/04/1946 | Reallocation | 5399 | FRO | Frodingham | DON | Doncaster | |
07/04/1946 | Reallocation | 6572 | FRO | Frodingham | DON | Doncaster | |
07/04/1946 | Reallocation | 6354 | FRO | Frodingham | DON | Doncaster | |
07/04/1946 | Reallocation | 6548 | FRO | Frodingham | DON | Doncaster | |
07/04/1946 | Reallocation | 6543 | FRO | Frodingham | DON | Doncaster | |
07/04/1946 | Reallocation | 6364 | WFD | Woodford Halse | FRO | Frodingham | |
07/04/1946 | Reallocation | 6358 | WFD | Woodford Halse | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
07/04/1946 | Reallocation | 6357 | WFD | Woodford Halse | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
07/04/1946 | Reallocation | 6361 | FRO | Frodingham | DON | Doncaster | |
07/04/1946 | Reallocation | 6496 | WFD | Woodford Halse | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
07/04/1946 | Reallocation | 6338 | WFD | Woodford Halse | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
07/04/1946 | Reallocation | 6518 | FRO | Frodingham | DON | Doncaster | |
07/04/1946 | Reallocation | 6604 | FRO | Frodingham | DON | Doncaster | |
07/04/1946 | Reallocation | 6523 | FRO | Frodingham | DON | Doncaster | |
07/04/1946 | Reallocation | 5005 | FRO | Frodingham | DON | Doncaster | |
07/04/1946 | Reallocation | 6534 | FRO | Frodingham | DON | Doncaster | |
07/04/1946 | Reallocation | 6641 | WFD | Woodford Halse | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
14/04/1946 | Reallocation | 3702 | FRO | Frodingham | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | |
28/04/1946 | Reallocation | 5381 | WFD | Woodford Halse | FRO | Frodingham | |
29/04/1946 | Reallocation | 5404 | HLS | Hull Springhead | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
29/04/1946 | Reallocation | 6211 | HLS | Hull Springhead | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
29/04/1946 | Reallocation | 6581 | HLS | Hull Springhead | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
29/04/1946 | Reallocation | 6606 | HLS | Hull Springhead | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
29/04/1946 | Reallocation | 5008 | HLS | Hull Springhead | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
05/05/1946 | Reallocation | 6223 | FRO | Frodingham | TUX | Tuxford | |
12/05/1946 | Reallocation | 5403 | IMM | Immingham | GOR | Gorton | |
12/05/1946 | Reallocation | 5405 | IMM | Immingham | GOR | Gorton | |
12/05/1946 | Reallocation | 6188 | IMM | Immingham | FRO | Frodingham | |
12/05/1946 | Reallocation | 6200 | IMM | Immingham | GOR | Gorton | |
12/05/1946 | Reallocation | 6351 | IMM | Immingham | GOR | Gorton | |
12/05/1946 | Reallocation | 6353 | IMM | Immingham | GOR | Gorton | |
12/05/1946 | Reallocation | 6319 | IMM | Immingham | GOR | Gorton | |
12/05/1946 | Reallocation | 6264 | IMM | Immingham | FRO | Frodingham | |
12/05/1946 | Reallocation | 6304 | IMM | Immingham | GOR | Gorton | |
12/05/1946 | Reallocation | 5001 | IMM | Immingham | FRO | Frodingham | |
12/05/1946 | Reallocation | 6291 | IMM | Immingham | GOR | Gorton | |
12/05/1946 | Reallocation | 6500 | IMM | Immingham | FRO | Frodingham | |
26/05/1946 | Reallocation | 5405 | GOR | Gorton | FRO | Frodingham | |
16/06/1946 | Reallocation | 6291 | GOR | Gorton | CLK | Colwick | |
07/07/1946 | Reallocation | 3509 | IMM | Immingham | MEX | Mexborough | |
07/07/1946 | Reallocation | 3510 | IMM | Immingham | MEX | Mexborough | |
14/07/1946 | Reallocation | 6353 | GOR | Gorton | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | |
22/07/1946 | Reallocation | 5378 | TDK | Tyne Dock | HTN | Heaton | |
22/07/1946 | Reallocation | 6576 | TDK | Tyne Dock | HTN | Heaton | |
22/07/1946 | Reallocation | 6577 | TDK | Tyne Dock | HTN | Heaton | |
22/07/1946 | Reallocation | 6367 | TDK | Tyne Dock | HTN | Heaton | |
22/07/1946 | Reallocation | 6614 | TDK | Tyne Dock | HTN | Heaton | |
22/07/1946 | Reallocation | 6617 | TDK | Tyne Dock | HTN | Heaton | |
22/07/1946 | Reallocation | 6618 | TDK | Tyne Dock | HTN | Heaton | |
22/07/1946 | Reallocation | 6632 | TDK | Tyne Dock | HTN | Heaton | |
11/08/1946 | Reallocation | 5403 | GOR | Gorton | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
18/08/1946 | Reallocation | 3505 | MEX | Mexborough | DON | Doncaster | |
18/08/1946 | Reallocation | 3510 | MEX | Mexborough | DON | Doncaster | |
18/08/1946 | Reallocation | 5349 | ARD | Ardsley | MEX | Mexborough | |
18/08/1946 | Reallocation | 6198 | MEX | Mexborough | DON | Doncaster | |
18/08/1946 | Reallocation | 6200 | GOR | Gorton | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
18/08/1946 | Reallocation | 6208 | MEX | Mexborough | DON | Doncaster | |
18/08/1946 | Reallocation | 6229 | ARD | Ardsley | MEX | Mexborough | |
18/08/1946 | Reallocation | 5396 | MEX | Mexborough | DON | Doncaster | |
18/08/1946 | Reallocation | 5399 | DON | Doncaster | MEX | Mexborough | |
18/08/1946 | Reallocation | 3741 | MEX | Mexborough | DON | Doncaster | |
18/08/1946 | Reallocation | 6351 | GOR | Gorton | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
18/08/1946 | Reallocation | 6363 | DON | Doncaster | MEX | Mexborough | |
18/08/1946 | Reallocation | 6546 | DON | Doncaster | MEX | Mexborough | |
18/08/1946 | Reallocation | 6360 | DON | Doncaster | MEX | Mexborough | |
18/08/1946 | Reallocation | 6336 | ARD | Ardsley | MEX | Mexborough | |
18/08/1946 | Reallocation | 3706 | GOR | Gorton | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
18/08/1946 | Reallocation | 3791 | DON | Doncaster | MEX | Mexborough | |
18/08/1946 | Reallocation | 3807 | DON | Doncaster | MEX | Mexborough | |
18/08/1946 | Reallocation | 6304 | GOR | Gorton | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
18/08/1946 | Reallocation | 6531 | DON | Doncaster | MEX | Mexborough | |
18/08/1946 | Reallocation | 6257 | DON | Doncaster | MEX | Mexborough | |
18/08/1946 | Reallocation | 6633 | ARD | Ardsley | MEX | Mexborough | |
18/08/1946 | Reallocation | 6637 | ARD | Ardsley | MEX | Mexborough | |
18/08/1946 | Reallocation | 5422 | MEX | Mexborough | DON | Doncaster | |
18/08/1946 | Reallocation | 5013 | MEX | Mexborough | DON | Doncaster | |
25/08/1946 | Reallocation | 6354 | DON | Doncaster | MEX | Mexborough | |
25/08/1946 | Reallocation | 6604 | DON | Doncaster | MEX | Mexborough | |
25/08/1946 | Reallocation | 3870 | DON | Doncaster | MEX | Mexborough | |
08/09/1946 | Reallocation | 5378 | HTN | Heaton | TDK | Tyne Dock | |
08/09/1946 | Reallocation | 3747 | DON | Doncaster | MEX | Mexborough | |
08/09/1946 | Reallocation | 3753 | HTN | Heaton | TDK | Tyne Dock | |
08/09/1946 | Reallocation | 6577 | HTN | Heaton | TDK | Tyne Dock | |
08/09/1946 | Reallocation | 6543 | DON | Doncaster | MEX | Mexborough | |
08/09/1946 | Reallocation | 3667 | HTN | Heaton | TDK | Tyne Dock | |
08/09/1946 | Reallocation | 6614 | HTN | Heaton | TDK | Tyne Dock | |
08/09/1946 | Reallocation | 6617 | HTN | Heaton | TDK | Tyne Dock | |
08/09/1946 | Reallocation | 3857 | HTN | Heaton | TDK | Tyne Dock | |
08/09/1946 | Reallocation | 3881 | HTN | Heaton | TDK | Tyne Dock | |
17/09/1946 | Reallocation | 6250 | DON | Doncaster | MEX | Mexborough | |
29/09/1946 | Reallocation | 6616 | HLS | Hull Springhead | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
27/10/1946 | Reallocation | 3508 | LNG | Langwith Junction | DON | Doncaster | |
27/10/1946 | Reallocation | 3524 | LNG | Langwith Junction | DON | Doncaster | |
27/10/1946 | Reallocation | 3527 | LNG | Langwith Junction | DON | Doncaster | |
27/10/1946 | Reallocation | 3538 | LNG | Langwith Junction | DON | Doncaster | |
27/10/1946 | Reallocation | 3546 | LNG | Langwith Junction | CLK | Colwick | |
27/10/1946 | Reallocation | 6205 | LNG | Langwith Junction | DON | Doncaster | |
27/10/1946 | Reallocation | 6206 | LNG | Langwith Junction | CLK | Colwick | |
27/10/1946 | Reallocation | 6207 | LNG | Langwith Junction | DON | Doncaster | |
27/10/1946 | Reallocation | 6218 | LNG | Langwith Junction | CLK | Colwick | |
27/10/1946 | Reallocation | 6249 | LNG | Langwith Junction | CLK | Colwick | |
27/10/1946 | Reallocation | 3609 | LNG | Langwith Junction | CLK | Colwick | |
27/10/1946 | Reallocation | 5398 | LNG | Langwith Junction | DON | Doncaster | |
27/10/1946 | Reallocation | 3749 | LNG | Langwith Junction | CLK | Colwick | |
27/10/1946 | Reallocation | 3750 | LNG | Langwith Junction | CLK | Colwick | |
27/10/1946 | Reallocation | 6376 | LNG | Langwith Junction | CLK | Colwick | |
27/10/1946 | Reallocation | 6544 | LNG | Langwith Junction | DON | Doncaster | |
27/10/1946 | Reallocation | 6358 | LNG | Langwith Junction | CLK | Colwick | |
27/10/1946 | Reallocation | 3695 | LNG | Langwith Junction | CLK | Colwick | |
27/10/1946 | Reallocation | 3697 | LNG | Langwith Junction | DON | Doncaster | |
27/10/1946 | Reallocation | 3699 | LNG | Langwith Junction | CLK | Colwick | |
27/10/1946 | Reallocation | 3765 | LNG | Langwith Junction | DON | Doncaster | |
27/10/1946 | Reallocation | 3794 | LNG | Langwith Junction | CLK | Colwick | |
27/10/1946 | Reallocation | 3798 | LNG | Langwith Junction | CLK | Colwick | |
27/10/1946 | Reallocation | 3800 | LNG | Langwith Junction | DON | Doncaster | |
27/10/1946 | Reallocation | 3801 | LNG | Langwith Junction | CLK | Colwick | |
27/10/1946 | Reallocation | 3713 | LNG | Langwith Junction | CLK | Colwick | |
27/10/1946 | Reallocation | 3832 | LNG | Langwith Junction | DON | Doncaster | |
27/10/1946 | Reallocation | 6290 | LNG | Langwith Junction | DON | Doncaster | |
27/10/1946 | Reallocation | 3858 | LNG | Langwith Junction | CLK | Colwick | |
27/10/1946 | Reallocation | 3876 | LNG | Langwith Junction | CLK | Colwick | |
27/10/1946 | Reallocation | 3891 | LNG | Langwith Junction | DON | Doncaster | |
27/10/1946 | Reallocation | 3893 | LNG | Langwith Junction | CLK | Colwick | |
27/10/1946 | Reallocation | 3895 | LNG | Langwith Junction | CLK | Colwick | |
27/10/1946 | Reallocation | 3900 | LNG | Langwith Junction | DON | Doncaster | |
27/10/1946 | Reallocation | 3729 | LNG | Langwith Junction | CLK | Colwick | |
24/11/1946 | Reallocation | 3721 | CLK | Colwick | DON | Doncaster | |
24/11/1946 | Reallocation | 3731 | LNG | Langwith Junction | DON | Doncaster | |
01/12/1946 | Reallocation | 3721 | DON | Doncaster | CLK | Colwick | |
08/12/1946 | Reallocation | 3883 | LNG | Langwith Junction | DON | Doncaster | |
29/12/1946 | Reallocation | 3509 | MEX | Mexborough | DON | Doncaster | |
29/12/1946 | Reallocation | 3837 | DON | Doncaster | MEX | Mexborough | |
12/01/1947 | Reallocation | 3587 | LNG | Langwith Junction | DON | Doncaster | |
30/03/1947 | Reallocation | 3762 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
30/03/1947 | Reallocation | 3613 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
30/03/1947 | Reallocation | 3756 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
30/03/1947 | Reallocation | 3636 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
30/03/1947 | Reallocation | 3876 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
27/04/1947 | Reallocation | 3634 | MEX | Mexborough | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
27/04/1947 | Reallocation | 3680 | MEX | Mexborough | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
27/04/1947 | Reallocation | 3692 | MEX | Mexborough | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
27/04/1947 | Reallocation | 3710 | MEX | Mexborough | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
27/04/1947 | Reallocation | 3588 | MEX | Mexborough | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
27/04/1947 | Reallocation | 3622 | MEX | Mexborough | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
27/04/1947 | Reallocation | 3737 | MEX | Mexborough | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
27/04/1947 | Reallocation | 3888 | MEX | Mexborough | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
27/04/1947 | Reallocation | 3902 | MEX | Mexborough | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
27/04/1947 | Reallocation | 3917 | MEX | Mexborough | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
29/06/1947 | Reallocation | 3635 | ANN | Annesley | CLK | Colwick | |
29/06/1947 | Reallocation | 3761 | ANN | Annesley | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
29/06/1947 | Reallocation | 3605 | ANN | Annesley | CLK | Colwick | |
29/06/1947 | Reallocation | 3613 | ANN | Annesley | CLK | Colwick | |
29/06/1947 | Reallocation | 3614 | ANN | Annesley | CLK | Colwick | |
29/06/1947 | Reallocation | 3735 | ANN | Annesley | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
29/06/1947 | Reallocation | 3681 | ANN | Annesley | CLK | Colwick | |
29/06/1947 | Reallocation | 3636 | ANN | Annesley | CLK | Colwick | |
29/06/1947 | Reallocation | 3694 | ANN | Annesley | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
29/06/1947 | Reallocation | 3853 | ANN | Annesley | WFD | Woodford Halse | |
05/09/1947 | Reallocation | 3654 | DON | Doncaster | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
05/09/1947 | Reallocation | 3597 | MEX | Mexborough | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
05/09/1947 | Reallocation | 3644 | MEX | Mexborough | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
04/10/1947 | Reallocation | 3634 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | IMM | Immingham | |
04/10/1947 | Reallocation | 3692 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | IMM | Immingham | |
04/10/1947 | Reallocation | 3902 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | IMM | Immingham | |
04/10/1947 | Reallocation | 3917 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | IMM | Immingham | |
05/10/1947 | Reallocation | 3608 | DON | Doncaster | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
05/10/1947 | Reallocation | 3615 | MEX | Mexborough | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
05/10/1947 | Reallocation | 3837 | MEX | Mexborough | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
12/10/1947 | Reallocation | 3580 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
12/10/1947 | Reallocation | 3582 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
12/10/1947 | Reallocation | 3635 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
12/10/1947 | Reallocation | 3700 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ANN | Annesley | |
12/10/1947 | Reallocation | 3722 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
12/10/1947 | Reallocation | 3723 | WFD | Woodford Halse | ANN | Annesley | |
12/10/1947 | Reallocation | 3743 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
12/10/1947 | Reallocation | 3761 | WFD | Woodford Halse | ANN | Annesley | |
12/10/1947 | Reallocation | 3809 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
12/10/1947 | Reallocation | 3571 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
12/10/1947 | Reallocation | 3589 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
12/10/1947 | Reallocation | 3596 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
12/10/1947 | Reallocation | 3614 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
12/10/1947 | Reallocation | 3735 | WFD | Woodford Halse | ANN | Annesley | |
12/10/1947 | Reallocation | 3742 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
12/10/1947 | Reallocation | 3674 | WFD | Woodford Halse | ANN | Annesley | |
12/10/1947 | Reallocation | 3681 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
12/10/1947 | Reallocation | 3631 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
12/10/1947 | Reallocation | 3633 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ANN | Annesley | |
12/10/1947 | Reallocation | 3638 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
12/10/1947 | Reallocation | 3662 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
12/10/1947 | Reallocation | 3694 | WFD | Woodford Halse | ANN | Annesley | |
12/10/1947 | Reallocation | 3699 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
12/10/1947 | Reallocation | 3706 | WFD | Woodford Halse | ANN | Annesley | |
12/10/1947 | Reallocation | 3759 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ANN | Annesley | |
12/10/1947 | Reallocation | 3794 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
12/10/1947 | Reallocation | 3801 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
12/10/1947 | Reallocation | 3804 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
12/10/1947 | Reallocation | 3716 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
12/10/1947 | Reallocation | 3829 | WFD | Woodford Halse | ANN | Annesley | |
12/10/1947 | Reallocation | 3841 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
12/10/1947 | Reallocation | 3720 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ANN | Annesley | |
12/10/1947 | Reallocation | 3853 | WFD | Woodford Halse | ANN | Annesley | |
12/10/1947 | Reallocation | 3873 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ANN | Annesley | |
12/10/1947 | Reallocation | 3893 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
12/10/1947 | Reallocation | 3899 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ANN | Annesley | |
12/10/1947 | Reallocation | 3912 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ANN | Annesley | |
20/10/1947 | Reallocation | 3617 | MEX | Mexborough | DON | Doncaster | |
20/10/1947 | Reallocation | 3684 | MEX | Mexborough | DON | Doncaster | |
20/10/1947 | Reallocation | 3624 | MEX | Mexborough | DON | Doncaster | |
20/10/1947 | Reallocation | 3657 | MEX | Mexborough | DON | Doncaster | |
20/10/1947 | Reallocation | 3659 | MEX | Mexborough | DON | Doncaster | |
20/10/1947 | Reallocation | 3884 | MEX | Mexborough | DON | Doncaster | |
26/10/1947 | Reallocation | 3739 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
26/10/1947 | Reallocation | 3685 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
09/11/1947 | Reallocation | 3609 | CLK | Colwick | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | |
09/11/1947 | Reallocation | 3613 | CLK | Colwick | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | |
09/11/1947 | Reallocation | 3746 | CLK | Colwick | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | |
09/11/1947 | Reallocation | 3749 | CLK | Colwick | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | |
14/12/1947 | Reallocation | 3691 | LIN | Lincoln | TUX | Tuxford | |
14/12/1947 | Reallocation | 3819 | LIN | Lincoln | TUX | Tuxford | |
22/12/1947 | Reallocation | 3704 | MAR | March | CAM | Cambridge | |
22/12/1947 | Reallocation | 3705 | MAR | March | CAM | Cambridge | |
22/12/1947 | Reallocation | 3708 | MAR | March | CAM | Cambridge | |
22/12/1947 | Reallocation | 3779 | MAR | March | CAM | Cambridge | |
22/12/1947 | Reallocation | 3718 | MAR | March | CAM | Cambridge | |
22/12/1947 | Reallocation | 3836 | MAR | March | CAM | Cambridge | |
22/12/1947 | Reallocation | 3839 | MAR | March | CAM | Cambridge | |
22/12/1947 | Reallocation | 3880 | MAR | March | CAM | Cambridge | |
22/12/1947 | Reallocation | 3897 | MAR | March | CAM | Cambridge | |
22/12/1947 | Reallocation | 3898 | MAR | March | CAM | Cambridge | |
22/12/1947 | Reallocation | 3724 | MAR | March | CAM | Cambridge | |
22/12/1947 | Reallocation | 3730 | MAR | March | CAM | Cambridge | |
22/12/1947 | Reallocation | 3904 | MAR | March | CAM | Cambridge | |
22/12/1947 | Reallocation | 3913 | MAR | March | CAM | Cambridge | |
28/12/1947 | Reallocation | 3683 | MEX | Mexborough | ARD | Ardsley | |
03/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3683 | ARD | Ardsley | ARD | Ardsley | |
08/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3851 | ANN | Annesley | CLK | Colwick | |
18/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3572 | DON | Doncaster | FRO | Frodingham | |
18/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3601 | DON | Doncaster | FRO | Frodingham | |
18/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3660 | DON | Doncaster | FRO | Frodingham | |
18/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3671 | DON | Doncaster | FRO | Frodingham | |
18/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3617 | DON | Doncaster | FRO | Frodingham | |
18/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3643 | DON | Doncaster | FRO | Frodingham | |
18/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3684 | DON | Doncaster | FRO | Frodingham | |
18/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3745 | DON | Doncaster | FRO | Frodingham | |
18/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3587 | DON | Doncaster | FRO | Frodingham | |
18/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3659 | DON | Doncaster | FRO | Frodingham | |
18/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3668 | DON | Doncaster | FRO | Frodingham | |
18/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3832 | DON | Doncaster | FRO | Frodingham | |
18/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3847 | DON | Doncaster | FRO | Frodingham | |
18/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3728 | DON | Doncaster | FRO | Frodingham | |
18/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3731 | DON | Doncaster | FRO | Frodingham | |
18/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3911 | DON | Doncaster | FRO | Frodingham | |
24/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3572 | FRO | Frodingham | FRO | Frodingham | |
24/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3601 | FRO | Frodingham | FRO | Frodingham | |
24/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3660 | FRO | Frodingham | FRO | Frodingham | |
24/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3671 | FRO | Frodingham | FRO | Frodingham | |
24/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3617 | FRO | Frodingham | FRO | Frodingham | |
24/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3643 | FRO | Frodingham | FRO | Frodingham | |
24/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3684 | FRO | Frodingham | FRO | Frodingham | |
24/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3745 | FRO | Frodingham | FRO | Frodingham | |
24/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3587 | FRO | Frodingham | FRO | Frodingham | |
24/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3659 | FRO | Frodingham | FRO | Frodingham | |
24/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3668 | FRO | Frodingham | FRO | Frodingham | |
24/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3832 | FRO | Frodingham | FRO | Frodingham | |
24/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3847 | FRO | Frodingham | FRO | Frodingham | |
24/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3728 | FRO | Frodingham | FRO | Frodingham | |
24/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3731 | FRO | Frodingham | FRO | Frodingham | |
24/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3911 | FRO | Frodingham | FRO | Frodingham | |
01/02/1948 | Reallocation | 3631 | ANN | Annesley | CLK | Colwick | |
01/02/1948 | Reallocation | 3829 | ANN | Annesley | CLK | Colwick | |
01/02/1948 | Reallocation | 3899 | ANN | Annesley | CLK | Colwick | |
02/02/1948 | Reallocation | 3668 | FRO | Frodingham | MEX | Mexborough | |
07/02/1948 | Reallocation | 3631 | CLK | Colwick | CLK | Colwick | |
07/02/1948 | Reallocation | 3829 | CLK | Colwick | CLK | Colwick | |
07/02/1948 | Reallocation | 3899 | CLK | Colwick | CLK | Colwick | |
08/02/1948 | Reallocation | 3700 | ANN | Annesley | CLK | Colwick | |
08/02/1948 | Reallocation | 3638 | ANN | Annesley | CLK | Colwick | |
08/02/1948 | Reallocation | 3662 | ANN | Annesley | CLK | Colwick | |
08/02/1948 | Reallocation | 3801 | ANN | Annesley | CLK | Colwick | |
08/02/1948 | Reallocation | 3720 | ANN | Annesley | CLK | Colwick | |
08/02/1948 | Reallocation | 3897 | CAM | Cambridge | MAR | March | |
14/02/1948 | Reallocation | 3700 | CLK | Colwick | CLK | Colwick | |
14/02/1948 | Reallocation | 3638 | CLK | Colwick | CLK | Colwick | |
14/02/1948 | Reallocation | 3662 | CLK | Colwick | CLK | Colwick | |
14/02/1948 | Reallocation | 3801 | CLK | Colwick | CLK | Colwick | |
14/02/1948 | Reallocation | 3720 | CLK | Colwick | CLK | Colwick | |
14/02/1948 | Reallocation | 3851 | CLK | Colwick | CLK | Colwick | |
14/02/1948 | Reallocation | 3897 | MAR | March | MAR | March | |
19/02/1948 | Reallocation | 3805 | ANN | Annesley | GOR | Gorton | |
20/02/1948 | Reallocation | 3809 | ANN | Annesley | GOR | Gorton | |
20/02/1948 | Reallocation | 3589 | ANN | Annesley | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
20/02/1948 | Reallocation | 3706 | ANN | Annesley | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
21/02/1948 | Reallocation | 3805 | GOR | Gorton | GOR | Gorton | |
21/02/1948 | Reallocation | 3809 | GOR | Gorton | GOR | Gorton | |
21/02/1948 | Reallocation | 3589 | LNG | Langwith Junction | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
21/02/1948 | Reallocation | 3706 | LNG | Langwith Junction | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
22/02/1948 | Reallocation | 3683 | ARD | Ardsley | MEX | Mexborough | |
28/02/1948 | Reallocation | 3683 | MEX | Mexborough | MEX | Mexborough | |
28/02/1948 | Reallocation | 3668 | MEX | Mexborough | MEX | Mexborough | |
07/03/1948 | Reallocation | 3805 | GOR | Gorton | ANN | Annesley | |
07/03/1948 | Reallocation | 3809 | GOR | Gorton | ANN | Annesley | |
07/03/1948 | Reallocation | 3706 | LNG | Langwith Junction | ANN | Annesley | |
13/03/1948 | Reallocation | 3805 | ANN | Annesley | ANN | Annesley | |
13/03/1948 | Reallocation | 3809 | ANN | Annesley | ANN | Annesley | |
13/03/1948 | Reallocation | 3589 | LNG | Langwith Junction | ANN | Annesley | |
13/03/1948 | Reallocation | 3706 | ANN | Annesley | ANN | Annesley | |
28/03/1948 | Reallocation | 3762 | ANN | Annesley | CLK | Colwick | |
28/03/1948 | Reallocation | 3750 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
28/03/1948 | Reallocation | 3694 | ANN | Annesley | CLK | Colwick | |
28/03/1948 | Reallocation | 3895 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
29/03/1948 | Reallocation | 3704 | CAM | Cambridge | MAR | March | |
29/03/1948 | Reallocation | 3705 | CAM | Cambridge | MAR | March | |
29/03/1948 | Reallocation | 3718 | CAM | Cambridge | MAR | March | |
29/03/1948 | Reallocation | 3724 | CAM | Cambridge | MAR | March | |
29/03/1948 | Reallocation | 3730 | CAM | Cambridge | MAR | March | |
31/03/1948 | Reallocation | 3575 | ANN | Annesley | SDN | Swindon | |
03/04/1948 | Reallocation | 3762 | CLK | Colwick | CLK | Colwick | |
03/04/1948 | Reallocation | 3750 | ANN | Annesley | ANN | Annesley | |
03/04/1948 | Reallocation | 3694 | CLK | Colwick | CLK | Colwick | |
03/04/1948 | Reallocation | 3704 | MAR | March | MAR | March | |
03/04/1948 | Reallocation | 3705 | MAR | March | MAR | March | |
03/04/1948 | Reallocation | 3718 | MAR | March | MAR | March | |
03/04/1948 | Reallocation | 3895 | ANN | Annesley | ANN | Annesley | |
03/04/1948 | Reallocation | 3724 | MAR | March | MAR | March | |
03/04/1948 | Reallocation | 3730 | MAR | March | MAR | March | |
11/04/1948 | Reallocation | 3599 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
11/04/1948 | Reallocation | 3713 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
17/04/1948 | Reallocation | 3599 | ANN | Annesley | ANN | Annesley | |
17/04/1948 | Reallocation | 3713 | ANN | Annesley | ANN | Annesley | |
18/04/1948 | Reallocation | 3573 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
18/04/1948 | Reallocation | 3781 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
24/04/1948 | Reallocation | 3573 | ANN | Annesley | ANN | Annesley | |
24/04/1948 | Reallocation | 3781 | ANN | Annesley | ANN | Annesley | |
09/05/1948 | Reallocation | 63605 | CLK | Colwick | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
09/05/1948 | Reallocation | 3685 | ANN | Annesley | CLK | Colwick | |
09/05/1948 | Reallocation | 63686 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ANN | Annesley | |
15/05/1948 | Reallocation | 63605 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
15/05/1948 | Reallocation | 3685 | CLK | Colwick | CLK | Colwick | |
15/05/1948 | Reallocation | 63686 | ANN | Annesley | ANN | Annesley | |
23/05/1948 | Reallocation | 3827 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
23/05/1948 | Reallocation | 3721 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
23/05/1948 | Reallocation | 3641 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
23/05/1948 | Reallocation | 3848 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
29/05/1948 | Reallocation | 3639 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
29/05/1948 | Reallocation | 3827 | ANN | Annesley | ANN | Annesley | |
29/05/1948 | Reallocation | 3721 | ANN | Annesley | ANN | Annesley | |
29/05/1948 | Reallocation | 3641 | ANN | Annesley | ANN | Annesley | |
29/05/1948 | Reallocation | 3848 | ANN | Annesley | ANN | Annesley | |
30/05/1948 | Reallocation | 3639 | ANN | Annesley | ANN | Annesley | |
06/06/1948 | Reallocation | 3797 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
06/06/1948 | Reallocation | 63662 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
06/06/1948 | Reallocation | 3798 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
06/06/1948 | Reallocation | 3899 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
12/06/1948 | Reallocation | 3797 | ANN | Annesley | ANN | Annesley | |
12/06/1948 | Reallocation | 63662 | ANN | Annesley | ANN | Annesley | |
12/06/1948 | Reallocation | 3798 | ANN | Annesley | ANN | Annesley | |
12/06/1948 | Reallocation | 3899 | ANN | Annesley | ANN | Annesley | |
13/06/1948 | Reallocation | 3720 | CLK | Colwick | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | |
19/06/1948 | Reallocation | 3720 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | |
04/07/1948 | Reallocation | 3756 | ANN | Annesley | CLK | Colwick | |
04/07/1948 | Reallocation | 63695 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
10/07/1948 | Reallocation | 3756 | CLK | Colwick | CLK | Colwick | |
10/07/1948 | Reallocation | 63695 | ANN | Annesley | ANN | Annesley | |
19/09/1948 | Reallocation | 63762 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
19/09/1948 | Reallocation | 63829 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
19/09/1948 | Reallocation | 3721 | ANN | Annesley | CLK | Colwick | |
19/09/1948 | Reallocation | 3894 | ANN | Annesley | CLK | Colwick | |
25/09/1948 | Reallocation | 63762 | ANN | Annesley | ANN | Annesley | |
25/09/1948 | Reallocation | 63829 | ANN | Annesley | ANN | Annesley | |
25/09/1948 | Reallocation | 3721 | CLK | Colwick | CLK | Colwick | |
25/09/1948 | Reallocation | 3894 | CLK | Colwick | CLK | Colwick | |
07/11/1948 | Reallocation | 3620 | TDK | Tyne Dock | CUD | Cudworth | |
07/11/1948 | Reallocation | 3751 | TDK | Tyne Dock | CUD | Cudworth | |
07/11/1948 | Reallocation | 3667 | TDK | Tyne Dock | CUD | Cudworth | |
13/11/1948 | Reallocation | 3620 | CUD | Cudworth | CUD | Cudworth | |
13/11/1948 | Reallocation | 3751 | CUD | Cudworth | CUD | Cudworth | |
13/11/1948 | Reallocation | 3667 | CUD | Cudworth | CUD | Cudworth | |
14/11/1948 | Reallocation | 63638 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
14/11/1948 | Reallocation | 63801 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
20/11/1948 | Reallocation | 63638 | ANN | Annesley | ANN | Annesley | |
20/11/1948 | Reallocation | 63801 | ANN | Annesley | ANN | Annesley | |
28/11/1948 | Reallocation | 63894 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
04/12/1948 | Reallocation | 63894 | ANN | Annesley | ANN | Annesley | |
05/12/1948 | Reallocation | 3805 | ANN | Annesley | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | |
11/12/1948 | Reallocation | 3805 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | |
26/12/1948 | Reallocation | 3573 | ANN | Annesley | CLK | Colwick | |
26/12/1948 | Reallocation | 63851 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
01/01/1949 | Reallocation | 3573 | CLK | Colwick | CLK | Colwick | |
01/01/1949 | Reallocation | 63851 | ANN | Annesley | ANN | Annesley | |
16/01/1949 | Reallocation | 3797 | ANN | Annesley | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
16/01/1949 | Reallocation | 3750 | ANN | Annesley | MEX | Mexborough | |
22/01/1949 | Reallocation | 3797 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
22/01/1949 | Reallocation | 3750 | MEX | Mexborough | MEX | Mexborough | |
23/01/1949 | Reallocation | 63700 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
23/01/1949 | Reallocation | 63575 | SDN | Swindon | CLK | Colwick | |
29/01/1949 | Reallocation | 63700 | ANN | Annesley | ANN | Annesley | |
29/01/1949 | Reallocation | 63575 | CLK | Colwick | CLK | Colwick | |
30/01/1949 | Reallocation | 63694 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
30/01/1949 | Reallocation | 3713 | ANN | Annesley | CLK | Colwick | |
31/01/1949 | Reallocation | 3809 | ANN | Annesley | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
05/02/1949 | Reallocation | 3809 | LNG | Langwith Junction | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
05/02/1949 | Reallocation | 63694 | ANN | Annesley | ANN | Annesley | |
05/02/1949 | Reallocation | 3713 | CLK | Colwick | CLK | Colwick | |
06/02/1949 | Reallocation | 63580 | ANN | Annesley | CLK | Colwick | |
06/02/1949 | Reallocation | 63603 | TDK | Tyne Dock | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
06/02/1949 | Reallocation | 3609 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
06/02/1949 | Reallocation | 3753 | TDK | Tyne Dock | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
06/02/1949 | Reallocation | 3754 | TDK | Tyne Dock | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
06/02/1949 | Reallocation | 3769 | TDK | Tyne Dock | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
06/02/1949 | Reallocation | 63828 | TDK | Tyne Dock | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
06/02/1949 | Reallocation | 63835 | TDK | Tyne Dock | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
06/02/1949 | Reallocation | 3845 | TDK | Tyne Dock | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
06/02/1949 | Reallocation | 3850 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
06/02/1949 | Reallocation | 3857 | TDK | Tyne Dock | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
06/02/1949 | Reallocation | 63858 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
06/02/1949 | Reallocation | 63881 | TDK | Tyne Dock | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
06/02/1949 | Reallocation | 3889 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
12/02/1949 | Reallocation | 63580 | CLK | Colwick | CLK | Colwick | |
12/02/1949 | Reallocation | 63603 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
12/02/1949 | Reallocation | 3609 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
12/02/1949 | Reallocation | 3754 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
12/02/1949 | Reallocation | 3769 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
12/02/1949 | Reallocation | 63828 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
12/02/1949 | Reallocation | 63835 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
12/02/1949 | Reallocation | 3845 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
12/02/1949 | Reallocation | 3850 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
12/02/1949 | Reallocation | 3856 | TDK | Tyne Dock | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
12/02/1949 | Reallocation | 3857 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
12/02/1949 | Reallocation | 63858 | ANN | Annesley | ANN | Annesley | |
12/02/1949 | Reallocation | 63881 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
12/02/1949 | Reallocation | 3889 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
23/02/1949 | Reallocation | 63759 | ANN | Annesley | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
26/02/1949 | Reallocation | 63759 | LNG | Langwith Junction | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
27/02/1949 | Reallocation | 63685 | CLK | Colwick | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
05/03/1949 | Reallocation | 63685 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
06/03/1949 | Reallocation | 63588 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | TUX | Tuxford | |
06/03/1949 | Reallocation | 63604 | TUX | Tuxford | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
06/03/1949 | Reallocation | 63783 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | CLK | Colwick | |
12/03/1949 | Reallocation | 63588 | TUX | Tuxford | TUX | Tuxford | |
12/03/1949 | Reallocation | 63604 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
12/03/1949 | Reallocation | 63783 | CLK | Colwick | CLK | Colwick | |
15/05/1949 | Reallocation | 63674 | ANN | Annesley | CLK | Colwick | |
15/05/1949 | Reallocation | 63781 | ANN | Annesley | CLK | Colwick | |
21/05/1949 | Reallocation | 63674 | CLK | Colwick | CLK | Colwick | |
21/05/1949 | Reallocation | 63781 | CLK | Colwick | CLK | Colwick | |
22/05/1949 | Reallocation | 3904 | CAM | Cambridge | MEX | Mexborough | |
22/05/1949 | Reallocation | 3913 | CAM | Cambridge | MEX | Mexborough | |
28/05/1949 | Reallocation | 3904 | MEX | Mexborough | MEX | Mexborough | |
28/05/1949 | Reallocation | 3913 | MEX | Mexborough | MEX | Mexborough | |
16/06/1949 | Reallocation | 63859 | ANN | Annesley | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | |
25/06/1949 | Reallocation | 63859 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | |
10/07/1949 | Reallocation | 63762 | ANN | Annesley | CLK | Colwick | |
16/07/1949 | Reallocation | 63762 | CLK | Colwick | CLK | Colwick | |
07/08/1949 | Reallocation | 63574 | CLK | Colwick | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
07/08/1949 | Reallocation | 3576 | MEX | Mexborough | FRO | Frodingham | |
07/08/1949 | Reallocation | 3750 | MEX | Mexborough | DON | Doncaster | |
07/08/1949 | Reallocation | 63675 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
07/08/1949 | Reallocation | 63783 | CLK | Colwick | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
07/08/1949 | Reallocation | 63734 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
13/08/1949 | Reallocation | 63574 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
13/08/1949 | Reallocation | 3576 | FRO | Frodingham | FRO | Frodingham | |
13/08/1949 | Reallocation | 3750 | DON | Doncaster | DON | Doncaster | |
13/08/1949 | Reallocation | 63675 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
13/08/1949 | Reallocation | 63783 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
13/08/1949 | Reallocation | 63734 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |
21/08/1949 | Reallocation | 3904 | MEX | Mexborough | BRN | Barnsley | |
21/08/1949 | Reallocation | 3913 | MEX | Mexborough | BRN | Barnsley | |
27/08/1949 | Reallocation | 3904 | BRN | Barnsley | BRN | Barnsley | |
27/08/1949 | Reallocation | 3913 | BRN | Barnsley | BRN | Barnsley | |
11/09/1949 | Reallocation | 63735 | ANN | Annesley | CLK | Colwick | |
11/09/1949 | Reallocation | 63673 | HLS | Hull Springhead | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
11/09/1949 | Reallocation | 63801 | ANN | Annesley | CLK | Colwick | |
11/09/1949 | Reallocation | 63849 | HLS | Hull Springhead | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
11/09/1949 | Reallocation | 63732 | HLS | Hull Springhead | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
17/09/1949 | Reallocation | 63735 | CLK | Colwick | CLK | Colwick | |
17/09/1949 | Reallocation | 63673 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
17/09/1949 | Reallocation | 63801 | CLK | Colwick | CLK | Colwick | |
17/09/1949 | Reallocation | 63849 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
17/09/1949 | Reallocation | 63732 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
17/09/1949 | Reallocation | 3913 | BRN | Barnsley | 20F | Skipton | |
16/10/1949 | Reallocation | 63849 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | CUD | Cudworth | |
22/10/1949 | Reallocation | 63849 | CUD | Cudworth | CUD | Cudworth | |
20/11/1949 | Reallocation | 63876 | ANN | Annesley | CLK | Colwick | |
26/11/1949 | Reallocation | 63876 | CLK | Colwick | CLK | Colwick | |
27/11/1949 | Reallocation | 63623 | DON | Doncaster | BRN | Barnsley | |
27/11/1949 | Reallocation | 63708 | CAM | Cambridge | ARD | Ardsley | |
27/11/1949 | Reallocation | 63839 | CAM | Cambridge | ARD | Ardsley | |
01/12/1949 | Reallocation | 63836 | CAM | Cambridge | DON | Doncaster | |
03/12/1949 | Reallocation | 63623 | BRN | Barnsley | BRN | Barnsley | |
03/12/1949 | Reallocation | 63708 | ARD | Ardsley | ARD | Ardsley | |
03/12/1949 | Reallocation | 63836 | DON | Doncaster | DON | Doncaster | |
03/12/1949 | Reallocation | 63839 | ARD | Ardsley | ARD | Ardsley | |
04/12/1949 | Reallocation | 63754 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
04/12/1949 | Reallocation | 63673 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
04/12/1949 | Reallocation | 63631 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
04/12/1949 | Reallocation | 63721 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
04/12/1949 | Reallocation | 63732 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
10/12/1949 | Reallocation | 63754 | HLS | Hull Springhead | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
10/12/1949 | Reallocation | 63673 | HLS | Hull Springhead | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
10/12/1949 | Reallocation | 63631 | ANN | Annesley | ANN | Annesley | |
10/12/1949 | Reallocation | 63721 | ANN | Annesley | ANN | Annesley | |
10/12/1949 | Reallocation | 63732 | HLS | Hull Springhead | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
10/12/1949 | Reallocation | 63917 | IMM | Immingham | FRO | Frodingham | |
18/12/1949 | Reallocation | 63580 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
18/12/1949 | Reallocation | 63634 | IMM | Immingham | TUX | Tuxford | |
18/12/1949 | Reallocation | 63692 | IMM | Immingham | DON | Doncaster | |
18/12/1949 | Reallocation | 63738 | DON | Doncaster | IMM | Immingham | |
18/12/1949 | Reallocation | 63674 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
18/12/1949 | Reallocation | 3679 | IMM | Immingham | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
18/12/1949 | Reallocation | 63638 | ANN | Annesley | CLK | Colwick | |
18/12/1949 | Reallocation | 63651 | LNG | Langwith Junction | IMM | Immingham | |
18/12/1949 | Reallocation | 63787 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
18/12/1949 | Reallocation | 63802 | FRO | Frodingham | IMM | Immingham | |
18/12/1949 | Reallocation | 63819 | TUX | Tuxford | IMM | Immingham | |
18/12/1949 | Reallocation | 63829 | ANN | Annesley | CLK | Colwick | |
18/12/1949 | Reallocation | 63836 | DON | Doncaster | IMM | Immingham | |
18/12/1949 | Reallocation | 63880 | CAM | Cambridge | ARD | Ardsley | |
18/12/1949 | Reallocation | 63894 | ANN | Annesley | CLK | Colwick | |
18/12/1949 | Reallocation | 63902 | IMM | Immingham | DON | Doncaster | |
24/12/1949 | Reallocation | 63580 | ANN | Annesley | ANN | Annesley | |
24/12/1949 | Reallocation | 63634 | TUX | Tuxford | TUX | Tuxford | |
24/12/1949 | Reallocation | 63692 | DON | Doncaster | DON | Doncaster | |
24/12/1949 | Reallocation | 63738 | IMM | Immingham | IMM | Immingham | |
24/12/1949 | Reallocation | 63674 | ANN | Annesley | ANN | Annesley | |
24/12/1949 | Reallocation | 3679 | LNG | Langwith Junction | LNG | Langwith Junction | |
24/12/1949 | Reallocation | 63638 | CLK | Colwick | CLK | Colwick | |
24/12/1949 | Reallocation | 63651 | IMM | Immingham | IMM | Immingham | |
24/12/1949 | Reallocation | 63787 | ANN | Annesley | ANN | Annesley | |
24/12/1949 | Reallocation | 63802 | IMM | Immingham | IMM | Immingham | |
24/12/1949 | Reallocation | 63819 | IMM | Immingham | IMM | Immingham | |
24/12/1949 | Reallocation | 63829 | CLK | Colwick | CLK | Colwick | |
24/12/1949 | Reallocation | 63836 | IMM | Immingham | IMM | Immingham | |
24/12/1949 | Reallocation | 63880 | ARD | Ardsley | ARD | Ardsley | |
24/12/1949 | Reallocation | 63894 | CLK | Colwick | CLK | Colwick | |
24/12/1949 | Reallocation | 63902 | DON | Doncaster | DON | Doncaster | |
24/12/1949 | Reallocation | 63917 | FRO | Frodingham | FRO | Frodingham | |
25/12/1949 | Reallocation | 63747 | MEX | Mexborough | FRO | Frodingham | |
25/12/1949 | Reallocation | 3906 | MEX | Mexborough | FRO | Frodingham | |
31/12/1949 | Reallocation | 63747 | FRO | Frodingham | FRO | Frodingham | |
31/12/1949 | Reallocation | 3906 | FRO | Frodingham | FRO | Frodingham | |
08/01/1950 | Reallocation | 63599 | ANN | Annesley | CLK | Colwick | |
08/01/1950 | Reallocation | 63697 | DON | Doncaster | BRN | Barnsley | |
08/01/1950 | Reallocation | 63787 | ANN | Annesley | CLK | Colwick | |
08/01/1950 | Reallocation | 63829 | CLK | Colwick | ANN | Annesley | |
08/01/1950 | Reallocation | 63851 | ANN | Annesley | CLK | Colwick | |
11/01/1950 | Reallocation | 63779 | CAM | Cambridge | MEX | Mexborough | |
13/01/1950 | Reallocation | 63898 | CAM | Cambridge | MEX | Mexborough | |
14/01/1950 | Reallocation | 63697 | BRN | Barnsley | BRN | Barnsley | |
14/01/1950 | Reallocation | 63779 | MEX | Mexborough | MEX | Mexborough | |
14/01/1950 | Reallocation | 63829 | ANN | Annesley | ANN | Annesley | |
14/01/1950 | Reallocation | 63898 | MEX | Mexborough | MEX | Mexborough | |
22/01/1950 | Reallocation | 63582 | ANN | Annesley | CLK | Colwick | |
22/01/1950 | Reallocation | 63761 | ANN | Annesley | CLK | Colwick | |
28/01/1950 | Reallocation | 63582 | CLK | Colwick | CLK | Colwick | |
28/01/1950 | Reallocation | 63761 | CLK | Colwick | CLK | Colwick | |
05/02/1950 | Reallocation | 63805 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | 38B | Annesley | |
05/02/1950 | Reallocation | 63575 | CLK | Colwick | 38B | Annesley | |
05/02/1950 | Reallocation | 63694 | ANN | Annesley | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | |
05/02/1950 | Reallocation | 63804 | ANN | Annesley | 38A | Colwick | |
05/02/1950 | Reallocation | 63713 | CLK | Colwick | 38B | Annesley | |
05/02/1950 | Reallocation | 63899 | ANN | Annesley | 38A | Colwick | |
11/02/1950 | Reallocation | 63805 | 38B | Annesley | 38B | Annesley | |
11/02/1950 | Reallocation | 63575 | 38B | Annesley | 38B | Annesley | |
11/02/1950 | Reallocation | 63694 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | |
11/02/1950 | Reallocation | 63804 | 38A | Colwick | 38A | Colwick | |
11/02/1950 | Reallocation | 63713 | 38B | Annesley | 38B | Annesley | |
11/02/1950 | Reallocation | 63899 | 38A | Colwick | 38A | Colwick | |
12/02/1950 | Reallocation | 63658 | MAR | March | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
12/02/1950 | Reallocation | 63724 | MAR | March | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
18/02/1950 | Reallocation | 63658 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
18/02/1950 | Reallocation | 63724 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
26/02/1950 | Reallocation | 63727 | MEX | Mexborough | 36D | Barnsley | |
26/02/1950 | Reallocation | 63883 | DON | Doncaster | 36D | Barnsley | |
04/03/1950 | Reallocation | 63727 | 36D | Barnsley | 36D | Barnsley | |
04/03/1950 | Reallocation | 63883 | 36D | Barnsley | 36D | Barnsley | |
26/03/1950 | Reallocation | 63653 | MAR | March | 36C | Frodingham | |
26/03/1950 | Reallocation | 63718 | MAR | March | 36C | Frodingham | |
01/04/1950 | Reallocation | 63653 | 36C | Frodingham | 36C | Frodingham | |
01/04/1950 | Reallocation | 63718 | 36C | Frodingham | 36C | Frodingham | |
02/04/1950 | Reallocation | 63633 | ANN | Annesley | 39A | Gorton | |
02/04/1950 | Reallocation | 63638 | CLK | Colwick | 39A | Gorton | |
08/04/1950 | Reallocation | 63633 | 39A | Gorton | 39A | Gorton | |
08/04/1950 | Reallocation | 63638 | 39A | Gorton | 39A | Gorton | |
23/04/1950 | Reallocation | 63599 | CLX | 39A | Gorton | ||
23/04/1950 | Reallocation | 63829 | ANN | Annesley | 38A | Colwick | |
23/04/1950 | Reallocation | 63848 | ANN | Annesley | 39A | Gorton | |
30/04/1950 | Reallocation | 63705 | MAR | March | 36A | Doncaster | |
21/05/1950 | Reallocation | 63598 | DON | Doncaster | 39A | Gorton | |
21/05/1950 | Reallocation | 63600 | DON | Doncaster | 39A | Gorton | |
21/05/1950 | Reallocation | 63582 | CLK | Colwick | 39A | Gorton | |
21/05/1950 | Reallocation | 3719 | DON | Doncaster | 39A | Gorton | |
21/05/1950 | Reallocation | 63754 | HLS | Hull Springhead | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | |
21/05/1950 | Reallocation | 63673 | HLS | Hull Springhead | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | |
21/05/1950 | Reallocation | 63705 | 36A | Doncaster | 39A | Gorton | |
21/05/1950 | Reallocation | 63864 | DON | Doncaster | 39A | Gorton | |
21/05/1950 | Reallocation | 63876 | CLK | Colwick | 39A | Gorton | |
21/05/1950 | Reallocation | 63891 | DON | Doncaster | 39A | Gorton | |
21/05/1950 | Reallocation | 63899 | 38A | Colwick | 39A | Gorton | |
21/05/1950 | Reallocation | 63732 | HLS | Hull Springhead | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | |
21/05/1950 | Reallocation | 63915 | DON | Doncaster | 39A | Gorton | |
31/05/1950 | Reallocation | 63915 | 39A | Gorton | 39A | Gorton | |
11/06/1950 | Reallocation | 63708 | ARD | Ardsley | 39A | Gorton | |
11/06/1950 | Reallocation | 63839 | ARD | Ardsley | 39A | Gorton | |
11/06/1950 | Reallocation | 63880 | ARD | Ardsley | 39A | Gorton | |
25/06/1950 | Reallocation | 3586 | DON | Doncaster | 40B | Immingham | |
25/06/1950 | Reallocation | 63607 | DON | Doncaster | 40B | Immingham | |
25/06/1950 | Reallocation | 63692 | DON | Doncaster | 40B | Immingham | |
25/06/1950 | Reallocation | 3693 | DON | Doncaster | 40B | Immingham | |
25/06/1950 | Reallocation | 63698 | DON | Doncaster | 40B | Immingham | |
25/06/1950 | Reallocation | 63757 | DON | Doncaster | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
25/06/1950 | Reallocation | 63593 | DON | Doncaster | 40B | Immingham | |
25/06/1950 | Reallocation | 3616 | DON | Doncaster | 40B | Immingham | |
25/06/1950 | Reallocation | 63621 | DON | Doncaster | 40B | Immingham | |
25/06/1950 | Reallocation | 3624 | DON | Doncaster | 40B | Immingham | |
25/06/1950 | Reallocation | 63741 | DON | Doncaster | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
25/06/1950 | Reallocation | 63750 | DON | Doncaster | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
25/06/1950 | Reallocation | 3647 | DON | Doncaster | 40B | Immingham | |
25/06/1950 | Reallocation | 3657 | DON | Doncaster | 40B | Immingham | |
25/06/1950 | Reallocation | 63758 | DON | Doncaster | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
25/06/1950 | Reallocation | 63765 | DON | Doncaster | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
25/06/1950 | Reallocation | 63800 | DON | Doncaster | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
25/06/1950 | Reallocation | 63884 | DON | Doncaster | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
25/06/1950 | Reallocation | 63900 | DON | Doncaster | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
25/06/1950 | Reallocation | 63902 | DON | Doncaster | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
30/06/1950 | Reallocation | 3586 | 40B | Immingham | 40B | Immingham | |
30/06/1950 | Reallocation | 63607 | 40B | Immingham | 40B | Immingham | |
30/06/1950 | Reallocation | 63692 | 40B | Immingham | 40B | Immingham | |
30/06/1950 | Reallocation | 63698 | 40B | Immingham | 40B | Immingham | |
30/06/1950 | Reallocation | 63757 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
30/06/1950 | Reallocation | 63593 | 40B | Immingham | 40B | Immingham | |
30/06/1950 | Reallocation | 3616 | 40B | Immingham | 40B | Immingham | |
30/06/1950 | Reallocation | 63621 | 40B | Immingham | 40B | Immingham | |
30/06/1950 | Reallocation | 63741 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
30/06/1950 | Reallocation | 63750 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
30/06/1950 | Reallocation | 63708 | 39A | Gorton | 39A | Gorton | |
30/06/1950 | Reallocation | 63758 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
30/06/1950 | Reallocation | 63765 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
30/06/1950 | Reallocation | 63800 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
30/06/1950 | Reallocation | 63839 | 39A | Gorton | 39A | Gorton | |
30/06/1950 | Reallocation | 63880 | 39A | Gorton | 39A | Gorton | |
30/06/1950 | Reallocation | 63884 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
30/06/1950 | Reallocation | 63902 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
02/07/1950 | Reallocation | 3585 | MEX | Mexborough | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
02/07/1950 | Reallocation | 63577 | MEX | Mexborough | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
02/07/1950 | Reallocation | 63625 | MEX | Mexborough | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
02/07/1950 | Reallocation | 3632 | MEX | Mexborough | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
02/07/1950 | Reallocation | 3683 | MEX | Mexborough | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
02/07/1950 | Reallocation | 3540 | MEX | Mexborough | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
02/07/1950 | Reallocation | 63805 | 38B | Annesley | 39A | Gorton | |
02/07/1950 | Reallocation | 63686 | ANN | Annesley | 39A | Gorton | |
02/07/1950 | Reallocation | 3648 | MEX | Mexborough | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
02/07/1950 | Reallocation | 63656 | MEX | Mexborough | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
02/07/1950 | Reallocation | 63666 | MEX | Mexborough | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
02/07/1950 | Reallocation | 63695 | ANN | Annesley | 39A | Gorton | |
02/07/1950 | Reallocation | 3703 | MEX | Mexborough | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
02/07/1950 | Reallocation | 3776 | MEX | Mexborough | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
02/07/1950 | Reallocation | 3807 | MEX | Mexborough | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
02/07/1950 | Reallocation | 3709 | MEX | Mexborough | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
02/07/1950 | Reallocation | 63713 | 38B | Annesley | 39A | Gorton | |
02/07/1950 | Reallocation | 63715 | MEX | Mexborough | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
02/07/1950 | Reallocation | 63717 | MEX | Mexborough | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
02/07/1950 | Reallocation | 63833 | MEX | Mexborough | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
02/07/1950 | Reallocation | 3840 | MEX | Mexborough | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
02/07/1950 | Reallocation | 3842 | MEX | Mexborough | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
02/07/1950 | Reallocation | 63862 | ANN | Annesley | 39A | Gorton | |
02/07/1950 | Reallocation | 3870 | MEX | Mexborough | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
16/07/1950 | Reallocation | 63575 | 38B | Annesley | 39A | Gorton | |
16/07/1950 | Reallocation | 63631 | ANN | Annesley | 39A | Gorton | |
16/07/1950 | Reallocation | 63794 | ANN | Annesley | 39A | Gorton | |
16/07/1950 | Reallocation | 63641 | ANN | Annesley | 39A | Gorton | |
16/07/1950 | Reallocation | 63895 | ANN | Annesley | 39A | Gorton | |
20/08/1950 | Reallocation | 63843 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | 53E | Cudworth | |
27/08/1950 | Reallocation | 63682 | DON | Doncaster | 36B | Mexborough | |
27/08/1950 | Reallocation | 63774 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 36B | Mexborough | |
27/08/1950 | Reallocation | 63775 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 36B | Mexborough | |
27/08/1950 | Reallocation | 63627 | DON | Doncaster | 36B | Mexborough | |
10/09/1950 | Reallocation | 63625 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
10/09/1950 | Reallocation | 63643 | FRO | Frodingham | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
10/09/1950 | Reallocation | 63757 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 36B | Mexborough | |
10/09/1950 | Reallocation | 63741 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 36C | Frodingham | |
10/09/1950 | Reallocation | 63682 | 36B | Mexborough | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
10/09/1950 | Reallocation | 63656 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
10/09/1950 | Reallocation | 63666 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 36B | Mexborough | |
10/09/1950 | Reallocation | 63627 | 36B | Mexborough | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
10/09/1950 | Reallocation | 63877 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
10/09/1950 | Reallocation | 63908 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
17/09/1950 | Reallocation | 63573 | CLK | Colwick | 38B | Annesley | |
17/09/1950 | Reallocation | 63781 | CLK | Colwick | 38B | Annesley | |
17/09/1950 | Reallocation | 63827 | ANN | Annesley | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | |
17/09/1950 | Reallocation | 63859 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | 38B | Annesley | |
24/09/1950 | Reallocation | 63677 | LNG | Langwith Junction | 40D | Tuxford | |
08/10/1950 | Reallocation | 63723 | ANN | Annesley | 38A | Colwick | |
08/10/1950 | Reallocation | 63761 | CLK | Colwick | 38B | Annesley | |
08/10/1950 | Reallocation | 63618 | ANN | Annesley | 38A | Colwick | |
08/10/1950 | Reallocation | 63699 | ANN | Annesley | 38A | Colwick | |
08/10/1950 | Reallocation | 63702 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | 38B | Annesley | |
08/10/1950 | Reallocation | 63767 | ANN | Annesley | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | |
08/10/1950 | Reallocation | 63787 | CLX | 38B | Annesley | ||
08/10/1950 | Reallocation | 63829 | 38A | Colwick | 38B | Annesley | |
08/10/1950 | Reallocation | 63851 | CLX | 38B | Annesley | ||
08/10/1950 | Reallocation | 63893 | ANN | Annesley | 38A | Colwick | |
20/10/1950 | Reallocation | 63743 | ANN | Annesley | 39A | Gorton | |
20/10/1950 | Reallocation | 63799 | ANN | Annesley | 39A | Gorton | |
20/10/1950 | Reallocation | 63739 | ANN | Annesley | 39A | Gorton | |
20/10/1950 | Reallocation | 63742 | ANN | Annesley | 39A | Gorton | |
22/10/1950 | Reallocation | 63721 | ANN | Annesley | 39A | Gorton | |
28/10/1950 | Reallocation | 63743 | 39A | Gorton | 39A | Gorton | |
28/10/1950 | Reallocation | 63799 | 39A | Gorton | 39A | Gorton | |
28/10/1950 | Reallocation | 63739 | 39A | Gorton | 39A | Gorton | |
28/10/1950 | Reallocation | 63742 | 39A | Gorton | 39A | Gorton | |
28/10/1950 | Reallocation | 63721 | 39A | Gorton | 39A | Gorton | |
12/11/1950 | Reallocation | 63754 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 53E | Cudworth | |
12/11/1950 | Reallocation | 63845 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | 53E | Cudworth | |
12/11/1950 | Reallocation | 63857 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | 53E | Cudworth | |
26/11/1950 | Reallocation | 63580 | ANN | Annesley | 39A | Gorton | |
26/11/1950 | Reallocation | 63635 | ANN | Annesley | 39A | Gorton | |
26/11/1950 | Reallocation | 63700 | ANN | Annesley | 39A | Gorton | |
26/11/1950 | Reallocation | 63722 | ANN | Annesley | 39A | Gorton | |
26/11/1950 | Reallocation | 63761 | 38B | Annesley | 39A | Gorton | |
26/11/1950 | Reallocation | 63573 | 38B | Annesley | 39A | Gorton | |
26/11/1950 | Reallocation | 63614 | ANN | Annesley | 39A | Gorton | |
26/11/1950 | Reallocation | 63748 | ANN | Annesley | 39A | Gorton | |
26/11/1950 | Reallocation | 63681 | ANN | Annesley | 39A | Gorton | |
26/11/1950 | Reallocation | 63662 | ANN | Annesley | 39A | Gorton | |
26/11/1950 | Reallocation | 63702 | 38B | Annesley | 39A | Gorton | |
26/11/1950 | Reallocation | 63706 | ANN | Annesley | 39A | Gorton | |
26/11/1950 | Reallocation | 63781 | 38B | Annesley | 39A | Gorton | |
26/11/1950 | Reallocation | 63787 | 38B | Annesley | 39A | Gorton | |
26/11/1950 | Reallocation | 63716 | ANN | Annesley | 39A | Gorton | |
26/11/1950 | Reallocation | 63829 | 38B | Annesley | 39A | Gorton | |
26/11/1950 | Reallocation | 63841 | ANN | Annesley | 39A | Gorton | |
26/11/1950 | Reallocation | 63853 | ANN | Annesley | 39A | Gorton | |
26/11/1950 | Reallocation | 63858 | ANN | Annesley | 39A | Gorton | |
26/11/1950 | Reallocation | 63859 | 38B | Annesley | 39A | Gorton | |
26/11/1950 | Reallocation | 63873 | ANN | Annesley | 39A | Gorton | |
26/11/1950 | Reallocation | 63912 | ANN | Annesley | 39A | Gorton | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 63580 | 39A | Gorton | 39A | Gorton | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 63635 | 39A | Gorton | 39A | Gorton | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 63700 | 39A | Gorton | 39A | Gorton | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 63722 | 39A | Gorton | 39A | Gorton | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 63761 | 39A | Gorton | 39A | Gorton | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 63614 | 39A | Gorton | 39A | Gorton | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 63748 | 39A | Gorton | 39A | Gorton | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 63754 | 53E | Cudworth | 53E | Cudworth | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 63681 | 39A | Gorton | 39A | Gorton | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 63662 | 39A | Gorton | 39A | Gorton | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 63702 | 39A | Gorton | 39A | Gorton | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 63706 | 39A | Gorton | 39A | Gorton | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 63781 | 39A | Gorton | 39A | Gorton | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 63787 | 39A | Gorton | 39A | Gorton | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 63716 | 39A | Gorton | 39A | Gorton | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 63829 | 39A | Gorton | 39A | Gorton | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 63841 | 39A | Gorton | 39A | Gorton | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 63845 | 53E | Cudworth | 53E | Cudworth | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 63853 | 39A | Gorton | 39A | Gorton | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 63857 | 53E | Cudworth | 53E | Cudworth | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 63858 | 39A | Gorton | 39A | Gorton | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 63859 | 39A | Gorton | 39A | Gorton | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 63873 | 39A | Gorton | 39A | Gorton | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 63912 | 39A | Gorton | 39A | Gorton | |
03/12/1950 | Reallocation | 63625 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 36D | Barnsley | |
03/12/1950 | Reallocation | 63656 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 36D | Barnsley | |
31/12/1950 | Reallocation | 63625 | 36D | Barnsley | 36D | Barnsley | |
31/12/1950 | Reallocation | 63656 | 36D | Barnsley | 36D | Barnsley | |
01/01/1951 | Reallocation | 63620 | CUD | Cudworth | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | |
01/01/1951 | Reallocation | 63843 | 53E | Cudworth | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | |
31/01/1951 | Reallocation | 63620 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | |
31/01/1951 | Reallocation | 63843 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | |
11/03/1951 | Reallocation | 63682 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 39A | Gorton | |
11/03/1951 | Reallocation | 63877 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 39A | Gorton | |
18/03/1951 | Reallocation | 63684 | FRO | Frodingham | 38A | Colwick | |
18/03/1951 | Reallocation | 63587 | FRO | Frodingham | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | |
18/03/1951 | Reallocation | 63602 | FRO | Frodingham | 38A | Colwick | |
18/03/1951 | Reallocation | 63763 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 36D | Barnsley | |
18/03/1951 | Reallocation | 63847 | FRO | Frodingham | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | |
18/03/1951 | Reallocation | 63907 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 36D | Barnsley | |
25/03/1951 | Reallocation | 63837 | LNG | Langwith Junction | 40D | Tuxford | |
28/03/1951 | Reallocation | 63644 | LNG | Langwith Junction | 40D | Tuxford | |
31/03/1951 | Reallocation | 63684 | 38A | Colwick | 38A | Colwick | |
31/03/1951 | Reallocation | 63587 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | |
31/03/1951 | Reallocation | 63602 | 38A | Colwick | 38A | Colwick | |
31/03/1951 | Reallocation | 63682 | 39A | Gorton | 39A | Gorton | |
31/03/1951 | Reallocation | 63644 | 40D | Tuxford | 40D | Tuxford | |
31/03/1951 | Reallocation | 63763 | 36D | Barnsley | 36D | Barnsley | |
31/03/1951 | Reallocation | 63837 | 40D | Tuxford | 40D | Tuxford | |
31/03/1951 | Reallocation | 63847 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | |
31/03/1951 | Reallocation | 63877 | 39A | Gorton | 39A | Gorton | |
31/03/1951 | Reallocation | 63907 | 36D | Barnsley | 36D | Barnsley | |
08/04/1951 | Reallocation | 63682 | 39A | Gorton | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | |
08/04/1951 | Reallocation | 63839 | 39A | Gorton | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | |
08/04/1951 | Reallocation | 63877 | 39A | Gorton | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | |
14/04/1951 | Reallocation | 63682 | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | |
14/04/1951 | Reallocation | 63839 | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | |
14/04/1951 | Reallocation | 63877 | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | |
15/04/1951 | Reallocation | 63753 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | 53C | Hull Springhead | |
15/04/1951 | Reallocation | 63770 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | 53C | Hull Springhead | |
21/04/1951 | Reallocation | 63753 | 53C | Hull Springhead | 53C | Hull Springhead | |
21/04/1951 | Reallocation | 63770 | 53C | Hull Springhead | 53C | Hull Springhead | |
22/04/1951 | Reallocation | 63667 | CUD | Cudworth | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | |
28/04/1951 | Reallocation | 63667 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | |
06/05/1951 | Reallocation | 63644 | 40D | Tuxford | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
12/05/1951 | Reallocation | 63644 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
13/05/1951 | Reallocation | 63772 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | 53E | Cudworth | |
19/05/1951 | Reallocation | 63772 | 53E | Cudworth | 53E | Cudworth | |
20/05/1951 | Reallocation | 63601 | FRO | Frodingham | 40B | Immingham | |
20/05/1951 | Reallocation | 63649 | FRO | Frodingham | 40B | Immingham | |
20/05/1951 | Reallocation | 63832 | FRO | Frodingham | 40B | Immingham | |
20/05/1951 | Reallocation | 63837 | 40D | Tuxford | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
26/05/1951 | Reallocation | 63601 | 40B | Immingham | 40B | Immingham | |
26/05/1951 | Reallocation | 63649 | 40B | Immingham | 40B | Immingham | |
26/05/1951 | Reallocation | 63832 | 40B | Immingham | 40B | Immingham | |
26/05/1951 | Reallocation | 63837 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
09/06/1951 | Reallocation | 63839 | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | 38A | Colwick | |
09/06/1951 | Reallocation | 63877 | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | 38A | Colwick | |
19/06/1951 | Reallocation | 63839 | 38A | Colwick | 38A | Colwick | |
01/07/1951 | Reallocation | 63640 | FRO | Frodingham | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | |
01/07/1951 | Reallocation | 63584 | FRO | Frodingham | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | |
01/07/1951 | Reallocation | 63645 | FRO | Frodingham | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | |
07/07/1951 | Reallocation | 63640 | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | |
07/07/1951 | Reallocation | 63584 | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | |
07/07/1951 | Reallocation | 63645 | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | |
12/08/1951 | Reallocation | 63772 | 53E | Cudworth | 20C | Royston | |
12/08/1951 | Reallocation | 63751 | CUD | Cudworth | 20C | Royston | |
12/08/1951 | Reallocation | 63754 | 53E | Cudworth | 20C | Royston | |
12/08/1951 | Reallocation | 63845 | 53E | Cudworth | 20C | Royston | |
12/08/1951 | Reallocation | 63849 | CUD | Cudworth | 20C | Royston | |
12/08/1951 | Reallocation | 63857 | 53E | Cudworth | 20C | Royston | |
02/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63664 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
02/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63772 | 20C | Royston | 38A | Colwick | |
02/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63603 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
02/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63620 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 53A | To Western Region / GWR | |
02/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63751 | 20C | Royston | 38A | Colwick | |
02/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63753 | 53C | Hull Springhead | 36A | Doncaster | |
02/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63754 | 20C | Royston | 38A | Colwick | |
02/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63673 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 53A | Oxley | |
02/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63667 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
02/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63764 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | 36A | Doncaster | |
02/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63769 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | 36A | Doncaster | |
02/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63770 | 53C | Hull Springhead | 53C | Southall | |
02/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63801 | CLK | Colwick | 38B | Annesley | |
02/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63816 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | 53A | To Western Region / GWR | |
02/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63823 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | 53A | To Western Region / GWR | |
02/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63828 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | 36A | Doncaster | |
02/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63835 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | 53A | Oxley | |
02/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63843 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 36A | Doncaster | |
02/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63628 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | 53A | To Western Region / GWR | |
02/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63845 | 20C | Royston | 38A | Colwick | |
02/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63849 | 20C | Royston | 38A | Colwick | |
02/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63855 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | 36A | Doncaster | |
02/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63857 | 20C | Royston | 38A | Colwick | |
02/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63881 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | 53A | To Western Region / GWR | |
02/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63894 | CLK | Colwick | 38B | Annesley | |
02/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63732 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
08/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63664 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
08/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63772 | 38A | Colwick | 38A | Colwick | |
08/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63603 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
08/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63751 | 38A | Colwick | 38A | Colwick | |
08/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63753 | 36A | Doncaster | 36A | Doncaster | |
08/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63754 | 38A | Colwick | 38A | Colwick | |
08/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63667 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
08/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63764 | 36A | Doncaster | 36A | Doncaster | |
08/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63769 | 36A | Doncaster | 36A | Doncaster | |
08/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63801 | 38B | Annesley | 38B | Annesley | |
08/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63828 | 36A | Doncaster | 36A | Doncaster | |
08/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63843 | 36A | Doncaster | 36A | Doncaster | |
08/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63845 | 38A | Colwick | 38A | Colwick | |
08/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63849 | 38A | Colwick | 38A | Colwick | |
08/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63855 | 36A | Doncaster | 36A | Doncaster | |
08/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63857 | 38A | Colwick | 38A | Colwick | |
08/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63894 | 38B | Annesley | 38B | Annesley | |
08/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63732 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
16/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63620 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 40B | Immingham | |
16/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63770 | 53C | Hull Springhead | 40B | Immingham | |
16/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63823 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 40B | Immingham | |
16/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63881 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 40B | Immingham | |
20/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63812 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | 53A | To Western Region / GWR | |
22/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63620 | 40B | Immingham | 40B | Immingham | |
22/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63770 | 40B | Immingham | 40B | Immingham | |
22/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63823 | 40B | Immingham | 40B | Immingham | |
22/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63881 | 40B | Immingham | 40B | Immingham | |
23/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63673 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 38A | Colwick | |
23/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63812 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 38A | Colwick | |
23/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63816 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 38A | Colwick | |
23/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63835 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 38A | Colwick | |
23/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63628 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 38A | Colwick | |
29/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63673 | 38A | Colwick | 38A | Colwick | |
29/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63812 | 38A | Colwick | 38A | Colwick | |
29/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63816 | 38A | Colwick | 38A | Colwick | |
29/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63835 | 38A | Colwick | 38A | Colwick | |
29/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63628 | 38A | Colwick | 38A | Colwick | |
30/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63618 | 38A | Colwick | 38B | Annesley | |
30/09/1951 | Reallocation | 63699 | 38A | Colwick | 38B | Annesley | |
06/10/1951 | Reallocation | 63618 | 38B | Annesley | 38B | Annesley | |
06/10/1951 | Reallocation | 63699 | 38B | Annesley | 38B | Annesley | |
14/10/1951 | Reallocation | 63858 | 39A | Gorton | 36A | Doncaster | |
20/10/1951 | Reallocation | 63858 | 36A | Doncaster | 36A | Doncaster | |
21/10/1951 | Reallocation | 63762 | CLK | Colwick | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | |
27/10/1951 | Reallocation | 63762 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | |
28/10/1951 | Reallocation | 63753 | 36A | Doncaster | 36B | Mexborough | |
28/10/1951 | Reallocation | 63701 | MAR | March | 36B | Mexborough | |
28/10/1951 | Reallocation | 63704 | MAR | March | 36B | Mexborough | |
28/10/1951 | Reallocation | 63828 | 36A | Doncaster | 36B | Mexborough | |
28/10/1951 | Reallocation | 63843 | 36A | Doncaster | 36B | Mexborough | |
28/10/1951 | Reallocation | 63897 | MAR | March | 36B | Mexborough | |
28/10/1951 | Reallocation | 63730 | MAR | March | 36B | Mexborough | |
03/11/1951 | Reallocation | 63753 | 36B | Mexborough | 36B | Mexborough | |
03/11/1951 | Reallocation | 63701 | 36B | Mexborough | 36B | Mexborough | |
03/11/1951 | Reallocation | 63704 | 36B | Mexborough | 36B | Mexborough | |
03/11/1951 | Reallocation | 63828 | 36B | Mexborough | 36B | Mexborough | |
03/11/1951 | Reallocation | 63843 | 36B | Mexborough | 36B | Mexborough | |
03/11/1951 | Reallocation | 63897 | 36B | Mexborough | 36B | Mexborough | |
03/11/1951 | Reallocation | 63730 | 36B | Mexborough | 36B | Mexborough | |
04/11/1951 | Reallocation | 63699 | 38B | Annesley | 38A | Colwick | |
04/11/1951 | Reallocation | 63801 | 38B | Annesley | 38A | Colwick | |
10/11/1951 | Reallocation | 63699 | 38A | Colwick | 38A | Colwick | |
10/11/1951 | Reallocation | 63801 | 38A | Colwick | 38A | Colwick | |
18/11/1951 | Reallocation | 63706 | 39A | Gorton | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | |
18/11/1951 | Reallocation | 63767 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | 39A | Gorton | |
24/11/1951 | Reallocation | 63706 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | |
24/11/1951 | Reallocation | 63767 | 39A | Gorton | 39A | Gorton | |
02/12/1951 | Reallocation | 63658 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 40B | Immingham | |
02/12/1951 | Reallocation | 63807 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 40B | Immingham | |
02/12/1951 | Reallocation | 63884 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | |
02/12/1951 | Reallocation | 63900 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 40B | Immingham | |
02/12/1951 | Reallocation | 63908 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 40B | Immingham | |
09/12/1951 | Reallocation | 63586 | 40B | Immingham | 36B | Mexborough | |
09/12/1951 | Reallocation | 63693 | 40B | Immingham | 36B | Mexborough | |
09/12/1951 | Reallocation | 63698 | 40B | Immingham | 36B | Mexborough | |
09/12/1951 | Reallocation | 63593 | 40B | Immingham | 36B | Mexborough | |
29/12/1951 | Reallocation | 63586 | 36B | Mexborough | 36B | Mexborough | |
29/12/1951 | Reallocation | 63658 | 40B | Immingham | 40B | Immingham | |
29/12/1951 | Reallocation | 63693 | 36B | Mexborough | 36B | Mexborough | |
29/12/1951 | Reallocation | 63698 | 36B | Mexborough | 36B | Mexborough | |
29/12/1951 | Reallocation | 63593 | 36B | Mexborough | 36B | Mexborough | |
29/12/1951 | Reallocation | 63648 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | |
29/12/1951 | Reallocation | 63807 | 40B | Immingham | 40B | Immingham | |
29/12/1951 | Reallocation | 63884 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | |
29/12/1951 | Reallocation | 63900 | 40B | Immingham | 40B | Immingham | |
29/12/1951 | Reallocation | 63908 | 40B | Immingham | 40B | Immingham | |
17/02/1952 | Reallocation | 63702 | 39A | Gorton | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | |
17/02/1952 | Reallocation | 63705 | 39A | Gorton | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | |
22/02/1952 | Condemned | 042 | FRO | Frodingham | COND | ||
22/02/1952 | Condemned | 040 | LNG | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
22/02/1952 | Condemned | 044 | 40E | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
22/02/1952 | Condemned | 041 | 38A | Colwick | COND | ||
23/02/1952 | Reallocation | 63702 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | |
23/02/1952 | Reallocation | 63705 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | |
24/02/1952 | Reallocation | 63618 | 38B | Annesley | 38A | Colwick | |
02/03/1952 | Reallocation | 63669 | FRO | Frodingham | 36D | Barnsley | |
02/03/1952 | Reallocation | 63824 | FRO | Frodingham | 36D | Barnsley | |
09/03/1952 | Reallocation | 63735 | CLK | Colwick | 31B | March | |
09/03/1952 | Reallocation | 63724 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 31B | March | |
22/03/1952 | Reallocation | 63669 | 36D | Barnsley | 36D | Barnsley | |
22/03/1952 | Reallocation | 63618 | 38A | Colwick | 38A | Colwick | |
22/03/1952 | Reallocation | 63735 | 31B | March | 31B | March | |
22/03/1952 | Reallocation | 63824 | 36D | Barnsley | 36D | Barnsley | |
22/03/1952 | Reallocation | 63724 | 31B | March | 31B | March | |
30/03/1952 | Reallocation | 63735 | 31B | March | 38A | Colwick | |
30/03/1952 | Reallocation | 63675 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | |
30/03/1952 | Reallocation | 63724 | 31B | March | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
19/04/1952 | Reallocation | 63735 | 38A | Colwick | 38A | Colwick | |
19/04/1952 | Reallocation | 63675 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | |
19/04/1952 | Reallocation | 63724 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
27/04/1952 | Reallocation | 63772 | 38A | Colwick | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | |
04/05/1952 | Reallocation | 63787 | 39A | Gorton | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | |
04/05/1952 | Reallocation | 63912 | 39A | Gorton | 38A | Colwick | |
11/05/1952 | Reallocation | 63636 | CLK | Colwick | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
11/05/1952 | Reallocation | 63893 | 38A | Colwick | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
11/05/1952 | Reallocation | 63729 | CLK | Colwick | 40B | Immingham | |
17/05/1952 | Reallocation | 63772 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | |
17/05/1952 | Reallocation | 63636 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
17/05/1952 | Reallocation | 63787 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | |
17/05/1952 | Reallocation | 63893 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
17/05/1952 | Reallocation | 63729 | 40B | Immingham | 40B | Immingham | |
17/05/1952 | Reallocation | 63912 | 38A | Colwick | 38A | Colwick | |
18/07/1952 | Reallocation | 63575 | 39A | Gorton | 40B | Immingham | |
20/07/1952 | Reallocation | 63801 | 38A | Colwick | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | |
09/08/1952 | Reallocation | 63801 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | |
17/08/1952 | Reallocation | 63718 | 36C | Frodingham | 36D | Barnsley | |
17/08/1952 | Reallocation | 63726 | FRO | Frodingham | 36D | Barnsley | |
17/08/1952 | Reallocation | 63731 | FRO | Frodingham | 36D | Barnsley | |
17/08/1952 | Reallocation | 63915 | 39A | Gorton | 40B | Immingham | |
31/08/1952 | Reallocation | 63894 | 38B | Annesley | 38A | Colwick | |
06/09/1952 | Reallocation | 63575 | 40B | Immingham | 40B | Immingham | |
06/09/1952 | Reallocation | 63718 | 36D | Barnsley | 36D | Barnsley | |
06/09/1952 | Reallocation | 63894 | 38A | Colwick | 38A | Colwick | |
06/09/1952 | Reallocation | 63726 | 36D | Barnsley | 36D | Barnsley | |
06/09/1952 | Reallocation | 63731 | 36D | Barnsley | 36D | Barnsley | |
06/09/1952 | Reallocation | 63915 | 40B | Immingham | 40B | Immingham | |
22/09/1952 | Reallocation | 63633 | 39A | Gorton | 37A | Ardsley | |
22/09/1952 | Reallocation | 63666 | 36B | Mexborough | 40B | Immingham | |
22/09/1952 | Reallocation | 63801 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | 38A | Colwick | |
22/09/1952 | Reallocation | 63828 | 36B | Mexborough | 40B | Immingham | |
22/09/1952 | Reallocation | 63857 | 38A | Colwick | 37A | Ardsley | |
22/09/1952 | Reallocation | 63864 | 39A | Gorton | 37A | Ardsley | |
22/09/1952 | Reallocation | 63920 | FRO | Frodingham | 37A | Ardsley | |
28/09/1952 | Reallocation | 63674 | ANN | Annesley | 38A | Colwick | |
28/09/1952 | Reallocation | 63639 | ANN | Annesley | 38A | Colwick | |
28/09/1952 | Reallocation | 63798 | ANN | Annesley | 38A | Colwick | |
28/09/1952 | Reallocation | 63851 | 38B | Annesley | 38A | Colwick | |
04/10/1952 | Reallocation | 63674 | 38A | Colwick | 38A | Colwick | |
04/10/1952 | Reallocation | 63633 | 37A | Ardsley | 37A | Ardsley | |
04/10/1952 | Reallocation | 63639 | 38A | Colwick | 38A | Colwick | |
04/10/1952 | Reallocation | 63666 | 40B | Immingham | 40B | Immingham | |
04/10/1952 | Reallocation | 63798 | 38A | Colwick | 38A | Colwick | |
04/10/1952 | Reallocation | 63801 | 38A | Colwick | 38A | Colwick | |
04/10/1952 | Reallocation | 63828 | 40B | Immingham | 40B | Immingham | |
04/10/1952 | Reallocation | 63851 | 38A | Colwick | 38A | Colwick | |
04/10/1952 | Reallocation | 63857 | 37A | Ardsley | 37A | Ardsley | |
04/10/1952 | Reallocation | 63864 | 37A | Ardsley | 37A | Ardsley | |
04/10/1952 | Reallocation | 63920 | 37A | Ardsley | 37A | Ardsley | |
05/10/1952 | Reallocation | 63666 | 40B | Immingham | 36B | Mexborough | |
05/10/1952 | Reallocation | 63801 | 38A | Colwick | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | |
05/10/1952 | Reallocation | 63828 | 40B | Immingham | 36B | Mexborough | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 63666 | 36B | Mexborough | 36B | Mexborough | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 63801 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 63828 | 36B | Mexborough | 36B | Mexborough | |
09/11/1952 | Reallocation | 63823 | 40B | Immingham | 40D | Tuxford | |
16/11/1952 | Reallocation | 63724 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 40D | Tuxford | |
29/11/1952 | Reallocation | 63823 | 40D | Tuxford | 40D | Tuxford | |
29/11/1952 | Reallocation | 63724 | 40D | Tuxford | 40D | Tuxford | |
01/02/1953 | Reallocation | 63674 | 38A | Colwick | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | |
15/03/1953 | Reallocation | 63621 | 40B | Immingham | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
15/03/1953 | Reallocation | 63624 | 40B | Immingham | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
15/03/1953 | Reallocation | 63807 | 40B | Immingham | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
26/04/1953 | Reallocation | 63674 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | 38A | Colwick | |
07/06/1953 | Reallocation | 63745 | FRO | Frodingham | 40B | Immingham | |
07/06/1953 | Reallocation | 63621 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 40B | Immingham | |
07/06/1953 | Reallocation | 63624 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 40B | Immingham | |
07/06/1953 | Reallocation | 63807 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 40B | Immingham | |
21/06/1953 | Reallocation | 63766 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | 38A | Colwick | |
21/06/1953 | Reallocation | 63899 | 39A | Gorton | 38A | Colwick | |
20/09/1953 | Reallocation | 63601 | 40B | Immingham | 39A | Gorton | |
20/09/1953 | Reallocation | 63607 | 40B | Immingham | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | |
20/09/1953 | Reallocation | 63658 | 40B | Immingham | 38A | Colwick | |
20/09/1953 | Reallocation | 63745 | 40B | Immingham | 38A | Colwick | |
20/09/1953 | Reallocation | 63575 | 40B | Immingham | 39A | Gorton | |
20/09/1953 | Reallocation | 63620 | 40B | Immingham | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | |
20/09/1953 | Reallocation | 63621 | 40B | Immingham | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | |
20/09/1953 | Reallocation | 63624 | 40B | Immingham | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | |
20/09/1953 | Reallocation | 63647 | 40B | Immingham | 38A | Colwick | |
20/09/1953 | Reallocation | 63649 | 40B | Immingham | 38A | Colwick | |
20/09/1953 | Reallocation | 63657 | 40B | Immingham | 38A | Colwick | |
20/09/1953 | Reallocation | 63807 | 40B | Immingham | 38A | Colwick | |
20/09/1953 | Reallocation | 63709 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 39A | Gorton | |
20/09/1953 | Reallocation | 63832 | 40B | Immingham | 38A | Colwick | |
20/09/1953 | Reallocation | 63881 | 40B | Immingham | 38A | Colwick | |
20/09/1953 | Reallocation | 63729 | 40B | Immingham | 38A | Colwick | |
20/09/1953 | Reallocation | 63908 | 40B | Immingham | 38A | Colwick | |
20/09/1953 | Reallocation | 63915 | 40B | Immingham | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
26/09/1953 | Reallocation | 63603 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 39A | Gorton | |
27/09/1953 | Reallocation | 63677 | 40D | Tuxford | 37A | Ardsley | |
27/09/1953 | Reallocation | 63634 | TUX | Tuxford | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
27/09/1953 | Reallocation | 63570 | TUX | Tuxford | 37A | Ardsley | |
27/09/1953 | Reallocation | 63588 | TUX | Tuxford | 37A | Ardsley | |
27/09/1953 | Reallocation | 63691 | TUX | Tuxford | 37A | Ardsley | |
27/09/1953 | Reallocation | 63823 | 40D | Tuxford | 37A | Ardsley | |
27/09/1953 | Reallocation | 63852 | TUX | Tuxford | 37A | Ardsley | |
27/09/1953 | Reallocation | 63861 | TUX | Tuxford | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
27/09/1953 | Reallocation | 63885 | TUX | Tuxford | 37A | Ardsley | |
27/09/1953 | Reallocation | 63724 | 40D | Tuxford | 37A | Ardsley | |
18/10/1953 | Reallocation | 63751 | 38A | Colwick | 38B | Annesley | |
29/11/1953 | Reallocation | 63899 | 38A | Colwick | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | |
06/12/1953 | Reallocation | 63920 | 37A | Ardsley | 37C | Bradford Hammerton Street | |
20/12/1953 | Reallocation | 63584 | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | 37A | Ardsley | |
20/12/1953 | Reallocation | 63605 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | 37A | Ardsley | |
20/12/1953 | Reallocation | 63691 | 37A | Ardsley | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | |
20/12/1953 | Reallocation | 63852 | 37A | Ardsley | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | |
27/12/1953 | Reallocation | 63735 | 38A | Colwick | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | |
27/12/1953 | Reallocation | 63751 | 38B | Annesley | 38A | Colwick | |
21/03/1954 | Reallocation | 63807 | 38A | Colwick | 39A | Gorton | |
21/03/1954 | Reallocation | 63835 | 38A | Colwick | 39A | Gorton | |
21/03/1954 | Reallocation | 63881 | 38A | Colwick | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | |
13/06/1954 | Reallocation | 63635 | 39A | Gorton | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | |
13/06/1954 | Reallocation | 63761 | 39A | Gorton | 36C | Frodingham | |
13/06/1954 | Reallocation | 63799 | 39A | Gorton | 36C | Frodingham | |
13/06/1954 | Reallocation | 63599 | 39A | Gorton | 38A | Colwick | |
13/06/1954 | Reallocation | 63614 | 39A | Gorton | 38A | Colwick | |
13/06/1954 | Reallocation | 63742 | 39A | Gorton | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | |
13/06/1954 | Reallocation | 63748 | 39A | Gorton | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | |
13/06/1954 | Reallocation | 63638 | 39A | Gorton | 38A | Colwick | |
13/06/1954 | Reallocation | 63662 | 39A | Gorton | 36C | Frodingham | |
13/06/1954 | Reallocation | 63695 | 39A | Gorton | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | |
13/06/1954 | Reallocation | 63708 | 39A | Gorton | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | |
13/06/1954 | Reallocation | 63829 | 39A | Gorton | 38A | Colwick | |
13/06/1954 | Reallocation | 63841 | 39A | Gorton | 38A | Colwick | |
13/06/1954 | Reallocation | 63853 | 39A | Gorton | 36C | Frodingham | |
13/06/1954 | Reallocation | 63859 | 39A | Gorton | 38A | Colwick | |
13/06/1954 | Reallocation | 63873 | 39A | Gorton | 38A | Colwick | |
13/06/1954 | Reallocation | 63876 | 39A | Gorton | 38A | Colwick | |
13/06/1954 | Reallocation | 63880 | 39A | Gorton | 36C | Frodingham | |
13/06/1954 | Reallocation | 63891 | 39A | Gorton | 38A | Colwick | |
27/06/1954 | Reallocation | 63613 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | 38A | Colwick | |
27/06/1954 | Reallocation | 63706 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | 38A | Colwick | |
04/07/1954 | Reallocation | 63835 | 39A | Gorton | 38A | Colwick | |
18/07/1954 | Reallocation | 63601 | 39A | Gorton | 36C | Frodingham | |
18/07/1954 | Reallocation | 63658 | 38A | Colwick | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | |
18/07/1954 | Reallocation | 63599 | 38A | Colwick | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | |
18/07/1954 | Reallocation | 63781 | 39A | Gorton | 38A | Colwick | |
18/07/1954 | Reallocation | 63912 | 38A | Colwick | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | |
22/08/1954 | Reallocation | 63807 | 39A | Gorton | 36C | Frodingham | |
29/08/1954 | Reallocation | 63722 | 39A | Gorton | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | |
14/11/1954 | Reallocation | 63804 | 38A | Colwick | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | |
21/11/1954 | Reallocation | 63753 | 36B | Mexborough | 36A | Doncaster | |
21/11/1954 | Reallocation | 63649 | 38A | Colwick | 39A | Gorton | |
21/11/1954 | Reallocation | 63766 | 38A | Colwick | 39A | Gorton | |
09/01/1955 | Reallocation | 63607 | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | 40D | Tuxford | |
09/01/1955 | Reallocation | 63635 | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | 40D | Tuxford | |
09/01/1955 | Reallocation | 63643 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 40D | Tuxford | |
09/01/1955 | Reallocation | 63683 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 40D | Tuxford | |
09/01/1955 | Reallocation | 63722 | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | 40D | Tuxford | |
09/01/1955 | Reallocation | 63597 | LNG | Langwith Junction | 40D | Tuxford | |
09/01/1955 | Reallocation | 63622 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | 40D | Tuxford | |
09/01/1955 | Reallocation | 63691 | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | 40D | Tuxford | |
09/01/1955 | Reallocation | 63758 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 40D | Tuxford | |
09/01/1955 | Reallocation | 63893 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 40D | Tuxford | |
09/01/1955 | Reallocation | 63912 | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | 40D | Tuxford | |
30/01/1955 | Reallocation | 63655 | FRO | Frodingham | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
06/02/1955 | Reallocation | 63753 | 36A | Doncaster | 36B | Mexborough | |
13/02/1955 | Reallocation | 63704 | 36B | Mexborough | 36D | Barnsley | |
15/05/1955 | Reallocation | 63764 | 36A | Doncaster | 36B | Mexborough | |
17/07/1955 | Reallocation | 63674 | 38A | Colwick | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | |
17/07/1955 | Reallocation | 63706 | 38A | Colwick | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | |
24/07/1955 | Reallocation | 63615 | LNG | Langwith Junction | 40B | Immingham | |
24/07/1955 | Reallocation | 63750 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 40B | Immingham | |
24/07/1955 | Reallocation | 63644 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 40B | Immingham | |
24/07/1955 | Reallocation | 63665 | LNG | Langwith Junction | 40B | Immingham | |
24/07/1955 | Reallocation | 63759 | LNG | Langwith Junction | 40B | Immingham | |
24/07/1955 | Reallocation | 63837 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 40B | Immingham | |
13/11/1955 | Reallocation | 63659 | FRO | Frodingham | 36D | Barnsley | |
13/11/1955 | Reallocation | 63911 | FRO | Frodingham | 36D | Barnsley | |
18/12/1955 | Reallocation | 63677 | 37A | Ardsley | 36B | Mexborough | |
25/12/1955 | Reallocation | 63739 | 39A | Gorton | 40E | Langwith Junction | |
01/01/1956 | Reallocation | 63587 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | 38A | Colwick | |
01/01/1956 | Reallocation | 63674 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | 38A | Colwick | |
01/01/1956 | Reallocation | 63675 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | 38A | Colwick | |
01/01/1956 | Reallocation | 63694 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | 38A | Colwick | |
08/01/1956 | Reallocation | 63915 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 39A | Gorton | |
22/01/1956 | Reallocation | 63602 | 38A | Colwick | 38B | Annesley | |
22/01/1956 | Reallocation | 63639 | 38A | Colwick | 38B | Annesley | |
22/01/1956 | Reallocation | 63845 | 38A | Colwick | 38B | Annesley | |
22/01/1956 | Reallocation | 63877 | 38A | Colwick | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | |
29/01/1956 | Reallocation | 63684 | 38A | Colwick | 36B | Mexborough | |
29/01/1956 | Reallocation | 63723 | 38A | Colwick | 36B | Mexborough | |
29/01/1956 | Reallocation | 63745 | 38A | Colwick | 36B | Mexborough | |
29/01/1956 | Reallocation | 63613 | 38A | Colwick | 36A | Doncaster | |
29/01/1956 | Reallocation | 63618 | 38A | Colwick | 36A | Doncaster | |
29/01/1956 | Reallocation | 63751 | 38A | Colwick | 36B | Mexborough | |
29/01/1956 | Reallocation | 63756 | CLK | Colwick | 36B | Mexborough | |
29/01/1956 | Reallocation | 63673 | 38A | Colwick | 36B | Mexborough | |
29/01/1956 | Reallocation | 63781 | 38A | Colwick | 36B | Mexborough | |
29/01/1956 | Reallocation | 63798 | 38A | Colwick | 36B | Mexborough | |
29/01/1956 | Reallocation | 63812 | 38A | Colwick | 36B | Mexborough | |
29/01/1956 | Reallocation | 63832 | 38A | Colwick | 36B | Mexborough | |
29/01/1956 | Reallocation | 63835 | 38A | Colwick | 36B | Mexborough | |
29/01/1956 | Reallocation | 63841 | 38A | Colwick | 36B | Mexborough | |
29/01/1956 | Reallocation | 63628 | 38A | Colwick | 36B | Mexborough | |
29/01/1956 | Reallocation | 63851 | 38A | Colwick | 36B | Mexborough | |
29/01/1956 | Reallocation | 63876 | 38A | Colwick | 36B | Mexborough | |
29/01/1956 | Reallocation | 63891 | 38A | Colwick | 36B | Mexborough | |
29/01/1956 | Reallocation | 63894 | 38A | Colwick | 36B | Mexborough | |
29/01/1956 | Reallocation | 63908 | 38A | Colwick | 36B | Mexborough | |
26/02/1956 | Reallocation | 63665 | 40B | Immingham | 40D | Tuxford | |
17/06/1956 | Reallocation | 63639 | 38B | Annesley | 38A | Colwick | |
16/09/1956 | Reallocation | 63708 | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | 40B | Immingham | |
16/09/1956 | Reallocation | 63860 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | 40B | Immingham | |
11/11/1956 | Reallocation | 63602 | 38B | Annesley | 38A | Colwick | |
11/11/1956 | Reallocation | 63845 | 38B | Annesley | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | |
25/11/1956 | Reallocation | 63612 | MEX | Mexborough | 36D | Barnsley | |
20/01/1957 | Reallocation | 63775 | 36B | Mexborough | 39A | Gorton | |
02/12/1957 | Reallocation | 63648 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | |
05/01/1958 | Reallocation | 63920 | 37C | Bradford Hammerton Street | 56B | Ardsley | |
02/02/1958 | Reallocation | 63802 | IMM | Immingham | 36D | Barnsley | |
02/02/1958 | Reallocation | 63836 | IMM | Immingham | 36D | Barnsley | |
23/02/1958 | Reallocation | 63654 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 36C | Frodingham | |
06/07/1958 | Reallocation | 63818 | FRO | Frodingham | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
12/10/1958 | Reallocation | 63585 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 40E | Colwick | |
12/10/1958 | Reallocation | 63829 | 38A | Colwick | 41J | Langwith Junction | |
02/12/1958 | Condemned | 63668 | MEX | Mexborough | COND | ||
07/12/1958 | Reallocation | 63770 | 40B | Immingham | 40E | Colwick | |
21/12/1958 | Reallocation | 63781 | 36B | Mexborough | 36C | Frodingham | |
18/01/1959 | Reallocation | 63853 | 36C | Frodingham | 41J | Langwith Junction | |
19/01/1959 | Condemned | 63667 | 40E | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
01/02/1959 | Reallocation | 63607 | 40D | Tuxford | 41J | Langwith Junction | |
01/02/1959 | Reallocation | 63635 | 40D | Tuxford | 41J | Langwith Junction | |
01/02/1959 | Reallocation | 63643 | 40D | Tuxford | 41J | Langwith Junction | |
01/02/1959 | Reallocation | 63683 | 40D | Tuxford | 41J | Langwith Junction | |
01/02/1959 | Reallocation | 63722 | 40D | Tuxford | 41J | Langwith Junction | |
01/02/1959 | Reallocation | 63597 | 40D | Tuxford | 41J | Langwith Junction | |
01/02/1959 | Reallocation | 63622 | 40D | Tuxford | 41J | Langwith Junction | |
01/02/1959 | Reallocation | 63665 | 40D | Tuxford | 41J | Langwith Junction | |
01/02/1959 | Reallocation | 63691 | 40D | Tuxford | 41J | Langwith Junction | |
01/02/1959 | Reallocation | 63758 | 40D | Tuxford | 41J | Langwith Junction | |
01/02/1959 | Reallocation | 63893 | 40D | Tuxford | 41J | Langwith Junction | |
01/02/1959 | Reallocation | 63912 | 40D | Tuxford | 41J | Langwith Junction | |
10/02/1959 | Condemned | 63581 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
10/02/1959 | Condemned | 63629 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
22/02/1959 | Reallocation | 63588 | 37A | Ardsley | 56A | Wakefield | |
22/02/1959 | Reallocation | 63857 | 37A | Ardsley | 56A | Wakefield | |
22/02/1959 | Reallocation | 63864 | 37A | Ardsley | 56A | Wakefield | |
22/02/1959 | Reallocation | 63920 | 56B | Ardsley | 56A | Wakefield | |
23/02/1959 | Condemned | 63620 | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
23/02/1959 | Condemned | 63835 | 36B | Mexborough | COND | ||
27/02/1959 | Condemned | 63797 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
06/03/1959 | Condemned | 63682 | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
06/03/1959 | Condemned | 63769 | 36A | Doncaster | COND | ||
10/03/1959 | Condemned | 63876 | 36B | Mexborough | COND | ||
12/03/1959 | Condemned | 63751 | 36B | Mexborough | COND | ||
12/03/1959 | Condemned | 63638 | 38A | Colwick | COND | ||
12/03/1959 | Condemned | 63790 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
20/03/1959 | Condemned | 63714 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
22/03/1959 | Reallocation | 63677 | 36B | Mexborough | 36A | Doncaster | |
22/03/1959 | Reallocation | 63693 | 36B | Mexborough | 36A | Doncaster | |
31/03/1959 | Condemned | 63855 | 36A | Doncaster | COND | ||
31/03/1959 | Condemned | 63729 | 38A | Colwick | COND | ||
03/04/1959 | Condemned | 63839 | 38A | Colwick | COND | ||
05/04/1959 | Reallocation | 63698 | 36B | Mexborough | 36A | Doncaster | |
08/04/1959 | Condemned | 63905 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | COND | ||
16/04/1959 | Condemned | 63625 | 36D | Barnsley | COND | ||
16/04/1959 | Condemned | 63745 | 36B | Mexborough | COND | ||
16/04/1959 | Condemned | 63851 | 36B | Mexborough | COND | ||
24/04/1959 | Condemned | 63696 | FRO | Frodingham | COND | ||
28/04/1959 | Condemned | 63614 | 38A | Colwick | COND | ||
04/05/1959 | Condemned | 63640 | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
04/05/1959 | Condemned | 63847 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | COND | ||
08/05/1959 | Condemned | 63673 | 36B | Mexborough | COND | ||
08/05/1959 | Condemned | 63812 | 36B | Mexborough | COND | ||
08/06/1959 | Condemned | 63699 | 38A | Colwick | COND | ||
18/06/1959 | Condemned | 63761 | 36C | Frodingham | COND | ||
18/06/1959 | Condemned | 63756 | 36B | Mexborough | COND | ||
21/06/1959 | Reallocation | 63602 | 38A | Colwick | 36C | Frodingham | |
21/06/1959 | Reallocation | 63647 | 38A | Colwick | 36C | Frodingham | |
22/06/1959 | Condemned | 63654 | 36C | Frodingham | COND | ||
30/06/1959 | Condemned | 63583 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
13/07/1959 | Condemned | 63710 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
06/08/1959 | Reallocation | 63665 | 41J | Langwith Junction | 36C | Frodingham | |
09/08/1959 | Reallocation | 63819 | IMM | Immingham | 40E | Colwick | |
21/08/1959 | Condemned | 63582 | 39A | Gorton | COND | ||
09/09/1959 | Condemned | 63680 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
13/09/1959 | Reallocation | 63748 | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | 36C | Frodingham | |
14/09/1959 | Condemned | 63660 | FRO | Frodingham | COND | ||
25/10/1959 | Reallocation | 63836 | 36D | Barnsley | 36C | Frodingham | |
30/10/1959 | Condemned | 63694 | 38A | Colwick | COND | ||
31/10/1959 | Condemned | 63749 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | COND | ||
09/11/1959 | Condemned | 63723 | 36B | Mexborough | COND | ||
18/11/1959 | Condemned | 63572 | FRO | Frodingham | COND | ||
18/11/1959 | Condemned | 63642 | FRO | Frodingham | COND | ||
22/11/1959 | Reallocation | 63824 | 36D | Barnsley | 36C | Frodingham | |
29/11/1959 | Reallocation | 63632 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 41G | Barnsley | |
29/11/1959 | Reallocation | 63722 | 41J | Langwith Junction | 41G | Barnsley | |
29/11/1959 | Reallocation | 63612 | 36D | Barnsley | 41J | Langwith Junction | |
29/11/1959 | Reallocation | 63622 | 41J | Langwith Junction | 41G | Barnsley | |
29/11/1959 | Reallocation | 63697 | BRN | Barnsley | 41J | Langwith Junction | |
29/11/1959 | Reallocation | 63704 | 36D | Barnsley | 41J | Langwith Junction | |
29/11/1959 | Reallocation | 63763 | 36D | Barnsley | 41J | Langwith Junction | |
29/11/1959 | Reallocation | 63801 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | 41J | Langwith Junction | |
29/11/1959 | Reallocation | 63718 | 36D | Barnsley | 41J | Langwith Junction | |
29/11/1959 | Reallocation | 63731 | 36D | Barnsley | 41J | Langwith Junction | |
02/12/1959 | Condemned | 63753 | 36B | Mexborough | COND | ||
02/12/1959 | Condemned | 63889 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
11/12/1959 | Condemned | 63804 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | COND | ||
27/12/1959 | Reallocation | 63666 | 36B | Mexborough | 36C | Frodingham | |
27/12/1959 | Reallocation | 63764 | 36B | Mexborough | 36C | Frodingham | |
27/12/1959 | Reallocation | 63730 | 36B | Mexborough | 36C | Frodingham | |
03/01/1960 | Reallocation | 63669 | 36D | Barnsley | 41F | Mexborough | |
03/01/1960 | Reallocation | 63632 | 41G | Barnsley | 41F | Mexborough | |
03/01/1960 | Reallocation | 63722 | 41G | Barnsley | 41F | Mexborough | |
03/01/1960 | Reallocation | 63727 | 36D | Barnsley | 41F | Mexborough | |
03/01/1960 | Reallocation | 63622 | 41G | Barnsley | 41F | Mexborough | |
03/01/1960 | Reallocation | 63623 | BRN | Barnsley | 41F | Mexborough | |
03/01/1960 | Reallocation | 63656 | 36D | Barnsley | 41F | Mexborough | |
03/01/1960 | Reallocation | 63659 | 36D | Barnsley | 41F | Mexborough | |
03/01/1960 | Reallocation | 63802 | 36D | Barnsley | 41F | Mexborough | |
03/01/1960 | Reallocation | 63883 | 36D | Barnsley | 41F | Mexborough | |
03/01/1960 | Reallocation | 63726 | 36D | Barnsley | 41F | Mexborough | |
03/01/1960 | Reallocation | 63904 | BRN | Barnsley | 41F | Mexborough | |
03/01/1960 | Reallocation | 63907 | 36D | Barnsley | 41F | Mexborough | |
03/01/1960 | Reallocation | 63911 | 36D | Barnsley | 41F | Mexborough | |
03/01/1960 | Reallocation | 63913 | 20F | Skipton | 41F | Mexborough | |
14/01/1960 | Condemned | 63733 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
31/01/1960 | Reallocation | 63772 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | 41F | Mexborough | |
31/01/1960 | Reallocation | 63602 | 36C | Frodingham | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
31/01/1960 | Reallocation | 63647 | 36C | Frodingham | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
31/01/1960 | Reallocation | 63648 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | 41F | Mexborough | |
31/01/1960 | Reallocation | 63665 | 36C | Frodingham | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
31/01/1960 | Reallocation | 63702 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | 41F | Mexborough | |
31/01/1960 | Reallocation | 63771 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | 41F | Mexborough | |
31/01/1960 | Reallocation | 63824 | 36C | Frodingham | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
31/01/1960 | Reallocation | 63877 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | 41F | Mexborough | |
31/01/1960 | Reallocation | 63884 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | 41F | Mexborough | |
28/02/1960 | Reallocation | 63722 | 41F | Mexborough | 41J | Langwith Junction | |
28/02/1960 | Reallocation | 63718 | 41J | Langwith Junction | 41F | Mexborough | |
27/03/1960 | Reallocation | 63661 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | |
01/04/1960 | Condemned | 63888 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
10/04/1960 | Reallocation | 63616 | 40B | Immingham | 40E | Colwick | |
10/04/1960 | Reallocation | 63750 | 40B | Immingham | 40E | Colwick | |
10/04/1960 | Reallocation | 63644 | 40B | Immingham | 40E | Colwick | |
10/04/1960 | Reallocation | 63860 | 40B | Immingham | 40E | Colwick | |
10/04/1960 | Reallocation | 63900 | 40B | Immingham | 40E | Colwick | |
01/05/1960 | Reallocation | 63607 | 41J | Langwith Junction | 40B | Immingham | |
01/05/1960 | Reallocation | 63634 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 40B | Immingham | |
01/05/1960 | Reallocation | 63612 | 41J | Langwith Junction | 41F | Mexborough | |
01/05/1960 | Reallocation | 63704 | 41J | Langwith Junction | 41F | Mexborough | |
01/05/1960 | Reallocation | 63758 | 41J | Langwith Junction | 40B | Immingham | |
16/05/1960 | Reallocation | 63643 | 41J | Langwith Junction | 40B | Immingham | |
16/05/1960 | Reallocation | 63707 | 40E | Langwith Junction | 40B | Immingham | |
06/07/1960 | Condemned | 63716 | 39A | Gorton | COND | ||
11/07/1960 | Condemned | 63894 | 36B | Mexborough | COND | ||
02/10/1960 | Reallocation | 63612 | 41F | Mexborough | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | |
02/10/1960 | Reallocation | 63656 | 41F | Mexborough | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | |
14/11/1960 | Condemned | 63669 | 41F | Mexborough | COND | ||
20/11/1960 | Reallocation | 63764 | 36C | Frodingham | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
20/11/1960 | Reallocation | 63730 | 36C | Frodingham | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
30/11/1960 | Condemned | 63643 | 40B | Immingham | COND | ||
04/12/1960 | Reallocation | 63661 | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | 41F | Mexborough | |
04/12/1960 | Reallocation | 63720 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | 41F | Mexborough | |
20/12/1960 | Condemned | 63700 | 39A | Gorton | COND | ||
23/02/1961 | Condemned | 63709 | 39A | Gorton | COND | ||
24/03/1961 | Condemned | 63649 | 39A | Gorton | COND | ||
21/04/1961 | Condemned | 63595 | FRO | Frodingham | COND | ||
27/04/1961 | Condemned | 63573 | 39A | Gorton | COND | ||
18/05/1961 | Condemned | 63597 | 41J | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
18/05/1961 | Condemned | 63747 | FRO | Frodingham | COND | ||
18/05/1961 | Condemned | 63662 | 36C | Frodingham | COND | ||
25/05/1961 | Condemned | 63608 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | COND | ||
25/05/1961 | Condemned | 63782 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | COND | ||
11/06/1961 | Reallocation | 63857 | 56A | Wakefield | 56B | Ardsley | |
11/06/1961 | Reallocation | 63864 | 56A | Wakefield | 56B | Ardsley | |
22/06/1961 | Condemned | 63626 | FRO | Frodingham | COND | ||
22/06/1961 | Condemned | 63845 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | COND | ||
23/06/1961 | Condemned | 63915 | 39A | Gorton | COND | ||
09/07/1961 | Reallocation | 63704 | 41F | Mexborough | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
09/07/1961 | Reallocation | 63904 | 41F | Mexborough | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
16/07/1961 | Reallocation | 63779 | MEX | Mexborough | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
23/07/1961 | Reallocation | 63726 | 41F | Mexborough | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
30/07/1961 | Reallocation | 63586 | 36B | Mexborough | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
30/07/1961 | Reallocation | 63771 | 41F | Mexborough | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
01/08/1961 | Condemned | 63719 | 39A | Gorton | COND | ||
06/08/1961 | Reallocation | 63798 | 36B | Mexborough | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
03/09/1961 | Reallocation | 63622 | 41F | Mexborough | 41J | Langwith Junction | |
03/09/1961 | Reallocation | 63774 | 36B | Mexborough | 41J | Langwith Junction | |
03/09/1961 | Reallocation | 63828 | 36B | Mexborough | 41J | Langwith Junction | |
03/09/1961 | Reallocation | 63720 | 41F | Mexborough | 41J | Langwith Junction | |
13/09/1961 | Condemned | 63891 | 36B | Mexborough | COND | ||
05/10/1961 | Condemned | 63860 | 40E | Colwick | COND | ||
05/11/1961 | Reallocation | 63593 | 36B | Mexborough | 36C | Frodingham | |
05/11/1961 | Reallocation | 63802 | 41F | Mexborough | 36C | Frodingham | |
12/11/1961 | Reallocation | 63593 | 36C | Frodingham | 36A | Doncaster | |
12/11/1961 | Reallocation | 63802 | 36C | Frodingham | 36A | Doncaster | |
23/11/1961 | Condemned | 63904 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | COND | ||
24/11/1961 | Condemned | 63757 | 36B | Mexborough | COND | ||
24/11/1961 | Condemned | 63799 | 36C | Frodingham | COND | ||
26/11/1961 | Reallocation | 63632 | 41F | Mexborough | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
26/11/1961 | Reallocation | 63727 | 41F | Mexborough | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
26/11/1961 | Reallocation | 63702 | 41F | Mexborough | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
26/11/1961 | Reallocation | 63908 | 36B | Mexborough | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
03/12/1961 | Reallocation | 63832 | 36B | Mexborough | 36C | Frodingham | |
03/12/1961 | Reallocation | 63628 | 36B | Mexborough | 36C | Frodingham | |
03/12/1961 | Reallocation | 63884 | 41F | Mexborough | 36C | Frodingham | |
03/12/1961 | Reallocation | 63897 | 36B | Mexborough | 36C | Frodingham | |
10/12/1961 | Reallocation | 63672 | MEX | Mexborough | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
10/12/1961 | Reallocation | 63791 | MEX | Mexborough | 36C | Frodingham | |
10/12/1961 | Reallocation | 63718 | 41F | Mexborough | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
10/12/1961 | Reallocation | 63898 | MEX | Mexborough | 36C | Frodingham | |
22/12/1961 | Condemned | 63570 | 37A | Ardsley | COND | ||
19/01/1962 | Condemned | 63833 | 40E | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
26/01/1962 | Condemned | 63648 | 41F | Mexborough | COND | ||
26/01/1962 | Condemned | 63870 | 40E | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
09/02/1962 | Condemned | 63599 | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
09/02/1962 | Condemned | 63623 | 41F | Mexborough | COND | ||
11/02/1962 | Reallocation | 63661 | 41F | Mexborough | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | |
11/02/1962 | Reallocation | 63701 | 36B | Mexborough | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | |
11/02/1962 | Reallocation | 63841 | 36B | Mexborough | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | |
11/02/1962 | Reallocation | 63913 | 41F | Mexborough | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | |
24/02/1962 | Condemned | 63681 | 39A | Gorton | COND | ||
02/03/1962 | Condemned | 63677 | 36A | Doncaster | COND | ||
16/03/1962 | Condemned | 63762 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | COND | ||
24/03/1962 | Condemned | 63775 | 39A | Gorton | COND | ||
13/04/1962 | Condemned | 63779 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | COND | ||
09/05/1962 | Condemned | 63635 | 41J | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
24/05/1962 | Condemned | 63758 | 40B | Immingham | COND | ||
24/05/1962 | Condemned | 63798 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | COND | ||
05/06/1962 | Condemned | 63917 | FRO | Frodingham | COND | ||
08/06/1962 | Condemned | 63787 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | COND | ||
09/06/1962 | Condemned | 63743 | 39A | Gorton | COND | ||
21/07/1962 | Condemned | 63603 | 39A | Gorton | COND | ||
21/07/1962 | Condemned | 63895 | 39A | Gorton | COND | ||
08/08/1962 | Condemned | 63584 | 37A | Ardsley | COND | ||
08/08/1962 | Condemned | 63588 | 56A | Wakefield | COND | ||
08/08/1962 | Condemned | 63605 | 37A | Ardsley | COND | ||
08/08/1962 | Condemned | 63633 | 37A | Ardsley | COND | ||
08/08/1962 | Condemned | 63823 | 37A | Ardsley | COND | ||
08/08/1962 | Condemned | 63857 | 56B | Ardsley | COND | ||
08/08/1962 | Condemned | 63864 | 56B | Ardsley | COND | ||
08/08/1962 | Condemned | 63885 | 37A | Ardsley | COND | ||
08/08/1962 | Condemned | 63724 | 37A | Ardsley | COND | ||
08/08/1962 | Condemned | 63920 | 56A | Wakefield | COND | ||
10/08/1962 | Condemned | 63713 | 39A | Gorton | COND | ||
26/08/1962 | Condemned | 63766 | 39A | Gorton | COND | ||
09/09/1962 | Reallocation | 63661 | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | 41F | Mexborough | |
09/09/1962 | Reallocation | 63841 | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | 41F | Mexborough | |
09/09/1962 | Reallocation | 63852 | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | 41F | Mexborough | |
09/09/1962 | Reallocation | 63734 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | 41F | Mexborough | |
15/09/1962 | Condemned | 63686 | 39A | Gorton | COND | ||
15/09/1962 | Condemned | 63631 | 39A | Gorton | COND | ||
15/09/1962 | Condemned | 63641 | 39A | Gorton | COND | ||
16/09/1962 | Reallocation | 63586 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 36C | Frodingham | |
16/09/1962 | Reallocation | 63693 | 36A | Doncaster | 36C | Frodingham | |
16/09/1962 | Reallocation | 63613 | 36A | Doncaster | 36C | Frodingham | |
16/09/1962 | Reallocation | 63881 | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | 41J | Langwith Junction | |
16/09/1962 | Reallocation | 63882 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | 41J | Langwith Junction | |
23/09/1962 | Reallocation | 63607 | 40B | Immingham | 40E | Colwick | |
23/09/1962 | Condemned | 63664 | 40E | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
23/09/1962 | Condemned | 63634 | 40B | Immingham | COND | ||
23/09/1962 | Reallocation | 63692 | 40B | Immingham | 40E | Colwick | |
23/09/1962 | Reallocation | 63707 | 40B | Immingham | 40E | Colwick | |
23/09/1962 | Reallocation | 63738 | IMM | Immingham | 40E | Colwick | |
23/09/1962 | Condemned | 63574 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
23/09/1962 | Condemned | 63587 | 38A | Colwick | COND | ||
23/09/1962 | Condemned | 63609 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
23/09/1962 | Reallocation | 63615 | 40B | Immingham | 40E | Colwick | |
23/09/1962 | Condemned | 63616 | 40E | Colwick | COND | ||
23/09/1962 | Condemned | 63621 | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
23/09/1962 | Reallocation | 63651 | IMM | Immingham | 40E | Colwick | |
23/09/1962 | Condemned | 63657 | 38A | Colwick | COND | ||
23/09/1962 | Condemned | 63708 | 40B | Immingham | COND | ||
23/09/1962 | Condemned | 63759 | 40B | Immingham | COND | ||
23/09/1962 | Reallocation | 63774 | 41J | Langwith Junction | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | |
23/09/1962 | Reallocation | 63837 | 40B | Immingham | 40E | Colwick | |
23/09/1962 | Reallocation | 63878 | IMM | Immingham | 40E | Colwick | |
23/09/1962 | Reallocation | 63881 | 41J | Langwith Junction | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | |
23/09/1962 | Reallocation | 63882 | 41J | Langwith Junction | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | |
23/09/1962 | Condemned | 63900 | 40E | Colwick | COND | ||
14/10/1962 | Reallocation | 63613 | 36C | Frodingham | 36A | Doncaster | |
14/10/1962 | Reallocation | 63802 | 36A | Doncaster | 36C | Frodingham | |
03/11/1962 | Condemned | 63598 | 39A | Gorton | COND | ||
03/11/1962 | Condemned | 63600 | 39A | Gorton | COND | ||
03/11/1962 | Condemned | 63805 | 39A | Gorton | COND | ||
03/11/1962 | Condemned | 63575 | 39A | Gorton | COND | ||
03/11/1962 | Condemned | 63767 | 39A | Gorton | COND | ||
03/11/1962 | Condemned | 63794 | 39A | Gorton | COND | ||
03/11/1962 | Condemned | 63721 | 39A | Gorton | COND | ||
03/11/1962 | Condemned | 63848 | 39A | Gorton | COND | ||
03/11/1962 | Condemned | 63862 | 39A | Gorton | COND | ||
19/11/1962 | Condemned | 63693 | 36C | Frodingham | COND | ||
19/11/1962 | Condemned | 63748 | 36C | Frodingham | COND | ||
19/11/1962 | Condemned | 63656 | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | COND | ||
25/11/1962 | Condemned | 63771 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | COND | ||
02/12/1962 | Reallocation | 63604 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | |
09/12/1962 | Condemned | 63658 | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
09/12/1962 | Reallocation | 63684 | 36B | Mexborough | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | |
09/12/1962 | Condemned | 63690 | FRO | Frodingham | COND | ||
09/12/1962 | Condemned | 63698 | 36A | Doncaster | COND | ||
09/12/1962 | Condemned | 63738 | 40E | Colwick | COND | ||
09/12/1962 | Reallocation | 63772 | 41F | Mexborough | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | |
09/12/1962 | Condemned | 63624 | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
09/12/1962 | Condemned | 63737 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
09/12/1962 | Condemned | 63637 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | COND | ||
09/12/1962 | Condemned | 63659 | 41F | Mexborough | COND | ||
09/12/1962 | Reallocation | 63661 | 41F | Mexborough | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | |
09/12/1962 | Condemned | 63695 | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
09/12/1962 | Condemned | 63783 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
09/12/1962 | Reallocation | 63818 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 36A | Doncaster | |
09/12/1962 | Reallocation | 63841 | 41F | Mexborough | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | |
09/12/1962 | Reallocation | 63852 | 41F | Mexborough | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | |
09/12/1962 | Condemned | 63881 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
09/12/1962 | Reallocation | 63734 | 41F | Mexborough | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | |
09/12/1962 | Condemned | 63911 | 41F | Mexborough | COND | ||
09/12/1962 | Condemned | 63912 | 41J | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
12/12/1962 | Condemned | 63617 | FRO | Frodingham | COND | ||
15/12/1962 | Condemned | 63666 | 36C | Frodingham | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 63602 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 63735 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 63655 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 63776 | 40E | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 63718 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 63821 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 63832 | 36C | Frodingham | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 63837 | 40E | Colwick | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 63883 | 41F | Mexborough | COND | ||
30/12/1962 | Reallocation | 63585 | 40E | Colwick | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
30/12/1962 | Reallocation | 63607 | 40E | Colwick | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
30/12/1962 | Reallocation | 63692 | 40E | Colwick | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
30/12/1962 | Reallocation | 63738 | 98W | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
30/12/1962 | Reallocation | 63685 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | |
30/12/1962 | Reallocation | 63651 | 40E | Colwick | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
30/12/1962 | Reallocation | 63878 | 40E | Colwick | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
13/01/1963 | Reallocation | 63772 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | |
13/01/1963 | Reallocation | 63774 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | |
20/01/1963 | Reallocation | 63684 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | 41F | Mexborough | |
20/01/1963 | Reallocation | 63661 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | 41F | Mexborough | |
20/01/1963 | Reallocation | 63734 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | 41F | Mexborough | |
10/02/1963 | Condemned | 63742 | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | COND | ||
10/02/1963 | Reallocation | 63841 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | |
10/02/1963 | Reallocation | 63852 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | |
24/02/1963 | Condemned | 63618 | 36A | Doncaster | COND | ||
03/03/1963 | Condemned | 63772 | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | COND | ||
03/03/1963 | Reallocation | 63647 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 36A | Doncaster | |
03/03/1963 | Reallocation | 63764 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 36A | Doncaster | |
03/03/1963 | Reallocation | 63730 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 36A | Doncaster | |
10/03/1963 | Condemned | 63774 | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | COND | ||
17/03/1963 | Condemned | 63704 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | COND | ||
17/03/1963 | Condemned | 63880 | 36C | Frodingham | COND | ||
14/04/1963 | Condemned | 63705 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | COND | ||
01/05/1963 | Condemned | 63622 | 41J | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
02/05/1963 | Condemned | 63898 | 36C | Frodingham | COND | ||
22/05/1963 | Condemned | 63897 | 36C | Frodingham | COND | ||
25/05/1963 | Condemned | 63899 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | COND | ||
26/05/1963 | Reallocation | 63611 | MEX | Mexborough | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | |
16/06/1963 | Condemned | 63601 | 36C | Frodingham | COND | ||
16/06/1963 | Reallocation | 63645 | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | 41F | Mexborough | |
16/06/1963 | Reallocation | 63822 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | 41F | Mexborough | |
16/06/1963 | Condemned | 63824 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | COND | ||
16/06/1963 | Reallocation | 63846 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | 41F | Mexborough | |
16/06/1963 | Reallocation | 63850 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | 41F | Mexborough | |
16/06/1963 | Reallocation | 63882 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | 41F | Mexborough | |
16/07/1963 | Condemned | 63801 | 41J | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
19/07/1963 | Condemned | 63744 | FRO | Frodingham | COND | ||
29/08/1963 | Condemned | 63736 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | COND | ||
18/09/1963 | Condemned | 63840 | 40E | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
22/09/1963 | Reallocation | 63684 | 41F | Mexborough | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
22/09/1963 | Reallocation | 63615 | 40E | Colwick | 41J | Langwith Junction | |
22/09/1963 | Reallocation | 63661 | 41F | Mexborough | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
22/09/1963 | Reallocation | 63813 | MEX | Mexborough | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
22/09/1963 | Reallocation | 63734 | 41F | Mexborough | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |
24/09/1963 | Condemned | 63722 | 41J | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
01/10/1963 | Condemned | 63908 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | COND | ||
18/10/1963 | Condemned | 63859 | 38A | Colwick | COND | ||
29/10/1963 | Condemned | 63731 | 41J | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
26/11/1963 | Condemned | 63853 | 41J | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
29/11/1963 | Condemned | 63576 | FRO | Frodingham | COND | ||
03/12/1963 | Condemned | 63577 | 40E | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
03/12/1963 | Condemned | 043 | 39A | Gorton | COND | ||
05/12/1963 | Condemned | 63672 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | COND | ||
12/12/1963 | Condemned | 63684 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | COND | ||
17/12/1963 | Condemned | 63665 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | COND | ||
19/12/1963 | Condemned | 63585 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | COND | ||
22/12/1963 | Reallocation | 63645 | 41F | Mexborough | 41J | Langwith Junction | |
22/12/1963 | Reallocation | 63850 | 41F | Mexborough | 41J | Langwith Junction | |
12/01/1964 | Condemned | 63827 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | COND | ||
16/01/1964 | Condemned | 63632 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | COND | ||
28/01/1964 | Condemned | 63715 | 40E | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
30/01/1964 | Condemned | 63852 | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | COND | ||
01/02/1964 | Condemned | 63727 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | COND | ||
07/02/1964 | Condemned | 63754 | 38A | Colwick | COND | ||
08/02/1964 | Condemned | 63763 | 41J | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
01/03/1964 | Reallocation | 63822 | 41F | Mexborough | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | |
01/03/1964 | Condemned | 63841 | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | COND | ||
01/03/1964 | Reallocation | 63843 | 36B | Mexborough | 41J | Langwith Junction | |
01/03/1964 | Reallocation | 63846 | 41F | Mexborough | 41J | Langwith Junction | |
01/03/1964 | Reallocation | 63877 | 41F | Mexborough | 41J | Langwith Junction | |
01/03/1964 | Reallocation | 63882 | 41F | Mexborough | 41J | Langwith Junction | |
01/03/1964 | Reallocation | 63907 | 41F | Mexborough | 41J | Langwith Junction | |
05/03/1964 | Condemned | 63720 | 41J | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
09/03/1964 | Condemned | 63750 | 40E | Colwick | COND | ||
12/03/1964 | Condemned | 63829 | 41J | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
20/03/1964 | Condemned | 63822 | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | COND | ||
26/03/1964 | Condemned | 63611 | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | COND | ||
31/03/1964 | Condemned | 63685 | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | COND | ||
14/04/1964 | Condemned | 63645 | 41J | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
23/04/1964 | Condemned | 63726 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | COND | ||
29/04/1964 | Condemned | 63836 | 36C | Frodingham | COND | ||
01/05/1964 | Condemned | 63604 | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | COND | ||
06/05/1964 | Condemned | 63647 | 36A | Doncaster | COND | ||
16/05/1964 | Condemned | 63800 | 40E | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
22/05/1964 | Condemned | 63907 | 41J | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
28/05/1964 | Condemned | 63914 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | COND | ||
02/06/1964 | Condemned | 63846 | 41J | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
09/06/1964 | Condemned | 63884 | 36C | Frodingham | COND | ||
23/06/1964 | Condemned | 63802 | 36C | Frodingham | COND | ||
07/09/1964 | Condemned | 63615 | 41J | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
19/09/1964 | Condemned | 63702 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | COND | ||
25/09/1964 | Condemned | 63807 | 36C | Frodingham | COND | ||
11/10/1964 | Condemned | 63765 | 40E | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
20/12/1964 | Condemned | 63636 | 40E | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
20/12/1964 | Condemned | 63728 | FRO | Frodingham | COND | ||
03/01/1965 | Condemned | 63906 | FRO | Frodingham | COND | ||
10/01/1965 | Reallocation | 63813 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | |
10/01/1965 | Reallocation | 63878 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | |
31/01/1965 | Condemned | 63703 | 40E | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
14/02/1965 | Condemned | 63692 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | COND | ||
21/02/1965 | Condemned | 63861 | 40E | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
07/03/1965 | Condemned | 63683 | 41J | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
07/03/1965 | Condemned | 63813 | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | COND | ||
14/03/1965 | Condemned | 63878 | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | COND | ||
21/03/1965 | Condemned | 63877 | 41J | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
04/04/1965 | Condemned | 63741 | 36C | Frodingham | COND | ||
04/04/1965 | Condemned | 63717 | 40E | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
04/04/1965 | Condemned | 63842 | 40E | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
11/04/1965 | Condemned | 63902 | 40E | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
09/05/1965 | Condemned | 63793 | FRO | Frodingham | COND | ||
23/05/1965 | Condemned | 63679 | LNG | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
23/05/1965 | Condemned | 63882 | 41J | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
06/06/1965 | Condemned | 63913 | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | COND | ||
13/06/1965 | Reallocation | 63607 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 40E | Colwick | |
13/06/1965 | Condemned | 63671 | FRO | Frodingham | COND | ||
13/06/1965 | Reallocation | 63738 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 36A | Doncaster | |
13/06/1965 | Condemned | 63606 | FRO | Frodingham | COND | ||
13/06/1965 | Reallocation | 63612 | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | 41J | Langwith Junction | |
13/06/1965 | Reallocation | 63688 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 36A | Doncaster | |
13/06/1965 | Reallocation | 63651 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 36C | Frodingham | |
13/06/1965 | Reallocation | 63661 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 36C | Frodingham | |
13/06/1965 | Reallocation | 63701 | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | 41J | Langwith Junction | |
13/06/1965 | Reallocation | 63706 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | 41J | Langwith Junction | |
13/06/1965 | Reallocation | 63785 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 36A | Doncaster | |
13/06/1965 | Reallocation | 63734 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 36A | Doncaster | |
20/06/1965 | Condemned | 63691 | 41J | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
20/06/1965 | Condemned | 63850 | 41J | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
20/06/1965 | Condemned | 63893 | 41J | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
11/07/1965 | Condemned | 63707 | 40E | Colwick | COND | ||
11/07/1965 | Condemned | 63651 | 36C | Frodingham | COND | ||
25/07/1965 | Condemned | 63613 | 36A | Doncaster | COND | ||
01/08/1965 | Condemned | 63701 | 41J | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
01/08/1965 | Reallocation | 63781 | 36C | Frodingham | 40E | Colwick | |
08/08/1965 | Condemned | 63661 | 36C | Frodingham | COND | ||
08/08/1965 | Condemned | 63734 | 36A | Doncaster | COND | ||
29/08/1965 | Condemned | 63697 | 41J | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
29/08/1965 | Condemned | 63828 | 41J | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
29/08/1965 | Reallocation | 63858 | 36A | Doncaster | 40E | Colwick | |
05/09/1965 | Condemned | 63607 | 40E | Colwick | COND | ||
05/09/1965 | Condemned | 63791 | 36C | Frodingham | COND | ||
05/09/1965 | Condemned | 63628 | 36C | Frodingham | COND | ||
05/09/1965 | Condemned | 63732 | 40E | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
19/09/1965 | Reallocation | 63653 | 36C | Frodingham | 36A | Doncaster | |
26/09/1965 | Condemned | 63688 | 36A | Doncaster | COND | ||
26/09/1965 | Condemned | 63706 | 41J | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
03/10/1965 | Condemned | 63586 | 36C | Frodingham | COND | ||
03/10/1965 | Condemned | 63593 | 36A | Doncaster | COND | ||
03/10/1965 | Condemned | 63739 | 40E | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
10/10/1965 | Reallocation | 63788 | FRO | Frodingham | 36A | Doncaster | |
07/11/1965 | Condemned | 63819 | 40E | Colwick | COND | ||
07/11/1965 | Condemned | 63843 | 41J | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
14/11/1965 | Condemned | 63612 | 41J | Langwith Junction | COND | ||
19/12/1965 | Condemned | 63639 | 38A | Colwick | COND | ||
19/12/1965 | Condemned | 63770 | 40E | Colwick | COND | ||
26/12/1965 | Reallocation | 63781 | 40E | Colwick | 36A | Doncaster | |
26/12/1965 | Reallocation | 63858 | 40E | Colwick | 36A | Doncaster | |
02/01/1966 | Condemned | 63788 | 36A | Doncaster | COND | ||
02/01/1966 | Condemned | 63730 | 36A | Doncaster | COND | ||
15/01/1966 | Condemned | 63674 | 38A | Colwick | COND | ||
15/01/1966 | Condemned | 63675 | 38A | Colwick | COND | ||
15/01/1966 | Condemned | 63644 | 40E | Colwick | COND | ||
15/01/1966 | Condemned | 63816 | 38A | Colwick | COND | ||
15/01/1966 | Condemned | 63873 | 38A | Colwick | COND | ||
27/02/1966 | Condemned | 63764 | 36A | Doncaster | COND | ||
27/03/1966 | Condemned | 63785 | 36A | Doncaster | COND | ||
17/04/1966 | Condemned | 63653 | 36A | Doncaster | COND | ||
17/04/1966 | Condemned | 63781 | 36A | Doncaster | COND | ||
17/04/1966 | Condemned | 63818 | 36A | Doncaster | COND | ||
17/04/1966 | Condemned | 63858 | 36A | Doncaster | COND |