O4 |
966
|
|
5966
|
3500
|
3572
|
|
|
63572
|
|
09/1911 |
18/11/1959 |
Intensifore lubricator removed |
20/07/1935 |
O4 |
331
|
|
5331
|
3504
|
3585
|
|
|
63585
|
|
10/1911 |
19/12/1963 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
25/04/1936 |
O4 |
333
|
|
5333
|
3506
|
3594
|
|
|
63594
|
|
11/1911 |
21/04/1964 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
24/10/1936 |
O4 |
334
|
|
5334
|
3507
|
3598
|
|
|
63598
|
|
11/1911 |
03/11/1962 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
29/08/1936 |
O4 |
26
|
|
5026
|
3501
|
3577
|
|
|
63577
|
|
12/1911 |
03/12/1963 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
05/05/1934 |
O4 |
69
|
|
5069
|
3502
|
3580
|
043
|
|
63580
|
|
12/1911 |
03/12/1963 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
05/03/1938 |
O4 |
133
|
|
5133
|
3510
|
3607
|
|
|
63607
|
3607
|
01/1912 |
05/09/1965 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
20/12/1935 |
O4 |
400
|
|
5400
|
3522
|
3658
|
|
|
63658
|
|
02/1912 |
09/12/1962 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
18/01/1936 |
O4 |
402
|
|
5402
|
|
|
769
|
|
|
|
02/1912 |
26/10/1941 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
22/10/1938 |
O4 |
403
|
|
5403
|
3524
|
3660
|
|
|
63660
|
|
03/1912 |
14/09/1959 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
29/08/1936 |
O4 |
404
|
|
5404
|
3525
|
3664
|
|
|
63664
|
|
03/1912 |
23/09/1962 |
Water Treatment apparatus fitted |
24/01/1959 |
O4 |
408
|
|
5408
|
3529
|
3678
|
|
|
63678
|
|
05/1912 |
18/07/1963 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
24/06/1936 |
O4 |
349
|
|
5349
|
3515
|
3632
|
|
|
63632
|
|
07/1912 |
16/01/1964 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
29/08/1936 |
O4 |
350
|
|
5350
|
3516
|
3634
|
|
|
63634
|
|
07/1912 |
23/09/1962 |
Water Treatment apparatus fitted |
03/01/1959 |
O4 |
351
|
|
5351
|
3517
|
3635
|
|
|
63635
|
|
08/1912 |
09/05/1962 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
12/03/1938 |
O4 |
352
|
|
5352
|
3518
|
3640
|
|
|
63640
|
|
08/1912 |
04/05/1959 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
10/10/1936 |
O4 |
353
|
|
5353
|
3519
|
3643
|
|
|
63643
|
|
08/1912 |
30/11/1960 |
Water Treatment apparatus fitted |
03/06/1959 |
O4 |
1184
|
|
6184
|
3531
|
3680
|
|
|
63680
|
3680
|
07/1912 |
09/09/1959 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
22/08/1936 |
O4 |
1188
|
|
6188
|
3535
|
3690
|
|
|
63690
|
|
07/1912 |
09/12/1962 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
13/06/1936 |
O4 |
1190
|
|
6190
|
3537
|
3693
|
|
|
63693
|
|
07/1912 |
19/11/1962 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
28/04/1934 |
O4 |
1192
|
|
6192
|
3539
|
3700
|
|
|
63700
|
|
08/1912 |
20/12/1960 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
27/06/1936 |
O4 |
1194
|
|
6194
|
3541
|
3710
|
|
|
63710
|
3710
|
09/1912 |
13/07/1959 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
30/01/1937 |
O4 |
1195
|
|
6195
|
3542
|
3711
|
|
|
63711
|
|
09/1912 |
17/11/1962 |
Ross Pop |
24/03/1923 |
O4 |
1196
|
|
6196
|
|
|
701
|
|
|
|
09/1912 |
12/09/1941 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
18/06/1938 |
O4 |
1199
|
|
6199
|
3546
|
3722
|
|
|
63722
|
|
09/1912 |
24/09/1963 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
05/06/1936 |
O4 |
1200
|
|
6200
|
3547
|
3723
|
|
|
63723
|
|
10/1912 |
09/11/1959 |
Ross Pop |
15/10/1921 |
O4 |
1201
|
|
6201
|
3548
|
3727
|
|
|
63727
|
|
10/1912 |
01/02/1964 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
10/07/1937 |
O4 |
1202
|
|
6202
|
|
|
739
|
|
|
|
10/1912 |
19/09/1941 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
07/03/1936 |
O4 |
1203
|
|
6203
|
3550
|
3736
|
|
|
63736
|
|
08/1912 |
29/08/1963 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
20/12/1935 |
O4 |
1206
|
|
6206
|
3553
|
3743
|
|
|
63743
|
|
08/1912 |
09/06/1962 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
07/03/1936 |
O4 |
1210
|
|
6210
|
3557
|
3762
|
|
|
63762
|
|
08/1912 |
16/03/1962 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
11/07/1936 |
O4 |
1216
|
|
6216
|
3563
|
3789
|
|
|
63789
|
|
09/1912 |
17/11/1962 |
Drop Grate fitted |
04/1946 |
O4 |
1219
|
|
6219
|
3566
|
3799
|
|
|
63799
|
|
10/1912 |
24/11/1961 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
07/03/1936 |
O4 |
1222
|
|
6222
|
3569
|
3809
|
040
|
|
63809
|
|
10/1912 |
22/02/1952 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
14/03/1936 |
O4 |
1224
|
|
6224
|
3571
|
|
|
|
63571
|
|
10/1912 |
13/12/1964 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
12/03/1938 |
O4 |
1225
|
|
6225
|
|
|
732
|
|
|
|
11/1912 |
14/09/1941 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
29/09/1934 |
O4 |
1228
|
|
6228
|
3575
|
|
|
|
63575
|
3575
|
11/1912 |
03/11/1962 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
18/01/1936 |
O4 |
1229
|
|
6229
|
3576
|
|
|
|
63576
|
|
11/1912 |
29/11/1963 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
25/01/1936 |
O4 |
1231
|
|
6231
|
3578
|
|
|
|
63578
|
|
11/1912 |
17/11/1962 |
Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted |
28/01/1950 |
O4 |
1236
|
|
6236
|
3583
|
|
|
|
63583
|
|
11/1912 |
30/06/1959 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
19/02/1938 |
O4 |
1237
|
|
6237
|
3584
|
|
|
|
63584
|
|
11/1912 |
08/08/1962 |
Water Treatment apparatus fitted |
30/07/1960 |
O4 |
1238
|
|
6238
|
|
|
761
|
|
|
|
12/1912 |
19/09/1941 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
18/01/1936 |
O4 |
1240
|
|
6240
|
3587
|
|
|
|
63587
|
|
12/1912 |
23/09/1962 |
Water Treatment apparatus fitted |
05/03/1960 |
O4 |
1241
|
|
6241
|
3588
|
|
|
|
63588
|
|
12/1912 |
08/08/1962 |
Water Treatment apparatus fitted |
08/10/1960 |
O4 |
1242
|
|
6242
|
3589
|
|
|
|
63589
|
|
12/1912 |
11/07/1965 |
Ross Pop |
11/02/1922 |
O4 |
1244
|
|
6244
|
3591
|
|
|
|
63591
|
|
12/1912 |
17/11/1962 |
Ross Pop |
17/06/1922 |
O4 |
1246
|
|
6246
|
3593
|
|
|
|
63593
|
|
12/1912 |
03/10/1965 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
18/05/1934 |
O4 |
1249
|
|
6249
|
3596
|
|
|
|
63596
|
|
12/1912 |
29/08/1963 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
18/01/1936 |
O4 |
1250
|
|
6250
|
3597
|
|
|
|
63597
|
|
12/1912 |
18/05/1961 |
Water Treatment apparatus fitted |
14/06/1958 |
O4 |
1252
|
|
6252
|
3599
|
|
|
|
63599
|
3599
|
01/1913 |
09/02/1962 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
23/05/1936 |
O4 |
376
|
|
5376
|
|
|
763
|
|
|
|
04/1913 |
10/09/1941 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
26/03/1938 |
O4 |
377
|
|
5377
|
3602
|
|
|
|
63602
|
|
05/1913 |
29/12/1962 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
20/06/1936 |
O4 |
379
|
|
5379
|
3604
|
|
|
|
63604
|
|
06/1913 |
01/05/1964 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
15/10/1938 |
O4 |
380
|
|
5380
|
3605
|
|
|
|
63605
|
|
06/1913 |
08/08/1962 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
11/04/1936 |
O4 |
382
|
|
5382
|
|
|
713
|
|
|
|
07/1913 |
10/09/1941 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
31/10/1936 |
O4 |
383
|
|
5383
|
|
|
711
|
|
|
|
08/1913 |
10/09/1941 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
15/08/1936 |
O4 |
385
|
|
5385
|
3610
|
|
|
|
63610
|
|
12/1913 |
24/11/1962 |
Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted |
16/04/1949 |
O4 |
386
|
|
5386
|
3611
|
|
|
|
63611
|
3611
|
01/1914 |
26/03/1964 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
31/10/1936 |
O4 |
387
|
|
5387
|
3612
|
|
|
|
63612
|
|
01/1914 |
14/11/1965 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
14/03/1936 |
O4 |
389
|
|
5389
|
3614
|
|
|
|
63614
|
|
02/1914 |
28/04/1959 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
13/06/1936 |
O4 |
390
|
|
5390
|
3615
|
|
|
|
63615
|
|
02/1914 |
07/09/1964 |
Wakefield 2C Lubricator added to axles |
19/07/1934 |
O4 |
391
|
|
5391
|
3616
|
|
|
|
63616
|
3616
|
03/1914 |
23/09/1962 |
Water Treatment apparatus fitted |
25/09/1959 |
O4 |
394
|
|
5394
|
3619
|
|
|
|
63619
|
|
04/1914 |
21/10/1963 |
Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted |
20/08/1949 |
O4 |
396
|
|
5396
|
3621
|
|
|
|
63621
|
|
05/1914 |
23/09/1962 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
19/11/1938 |
O4 |
398
|
|
5398
|
3623
|
|
|
|
63623
|
|
05/1914 |
09/02/1962 |
Ross Pop |
16/04/1921 |
O4 |
271
|
|
5271
|
|
|
756
|
|
|
|
08/1914 |
05/10/1941 |
Ross Pop |
26/03/1921 |
O4 |
|
2922
|
6564
|
3737
|
|
|
1807
|
63737
|
|
09/1917 |
09/12/1962 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
26/02/1938 |
O4 |
|
|
6285
|
3739
|
|
|
1811
|
63739
|
|
10/1917 |
03/10/1965 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
02/04/1936 |
O4 |
|
|
6284
|
3744
|
|
|
1819
|
63744
|
|
10/1917 |
19/07/1963 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
23/06/1934 |
O4 |
|
2963
|
6571
|
3746
|
|
|
1821
|
63746
|
3746
|
10/1917 |
27/02/1964 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
28/07/1934 |
O4 |
1278
|
|
6278
|
3750
|
|
|
1831
|
63750
|
|
11/1917 |
09/03/1964 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
25/07/1936 |
O4 |
|
|
6575
|
3752
|
|
|
1834
|
63752
|
3752
|
12/1917 |
17/11/1962 |
Drop Grate fitted |
02/1946 |
O4 |
|
2966
|
6578
|
3755
|
|
|
1840
|
63755
|
|
12/1917 |
26/11/1962 |
Westinghouse Brake fitted |
05/07/1952 |
O4 |
1255
|
|
6255
|
3756
|
|
|
1841
|
63756
|
|
01/1918 |
18/06/1959 |
Empire twin plunger Lubricator fitted to axles |
18/08/1934 |
O4 |
|
2903
|
6356
|
3670
|
|
|
1651
|
63670
|
|
09/1917 |
04/06/1964 |
Drop Grate fitted |
04/1946 |
O4 |
|
|
6324
|
3687
|
|
|
1669
|
63687
|
|
02/1918 |
16/10/1963 |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
03/06/1961 |
O4 |
|
2913
|
6343
|
3688
|
|
|
1670
|
63688
|
3688
|
02/1918 |
26/09/1965 |
Wakefield 2C Lubricator added to axles |
13/06/1934 |
O4 |
|
|
6554
|
3629
|
|
|
1701
|
63629
|
|
12/1917 |
10/02/1959 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
30/05/1936 |
O4 |
|
|
6555
|
3630
|
|
|
1712
|
63630
|
|
02/1918 |
11/07/1965 |
Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted |
27/08/1949 |
O4 |
|
2975
|
6536
|
3633
|
|
|
1717
|
63633
|
|
07/1918 |
08/08/1962 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
08/02/1936 |
O4 |
|
|
6366
|
3645
|
|
|
1604
|
63645
|
|
02/1918 |
14/04/1964 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
23/05/1936 |
O4 |
|
2870
|
6374
|
3646
|
|
|
1605
|
63646
|
3646
|
02/1918 |
11/07/1965 |
Drop Grate fitted |
02/1946 |
O4 |
|
|
6545
|
3650
|
|
|
1609
|
63650
|
|
03/1918 |
27/06/1965 |
Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted |
03/09/1949 |
O4 |
|
|
6539
|
3651
|
|
|
1610
|
63651
|
|
03/1918 |
11/07/1965 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
04/08/1934 |
O4 |
|
2901
|
6371
|
3652
|
|
|
1611
|
63652
|
|
03/1918 |
11/11/1963 |
Drop Grate fitted |
02/1946 |
O4 |
|
|
6363
|
3656
|
|
|
1617
|
63656
|
|
06/1918 |
19/11/1962 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
18/07/1936 |
O4 |
|
|
6546
|
3657
|
|
|
1618
|
63657
|
|
06/1918 |
23/09/1962 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
20/06/1936 |
O4 |
|
|
6368
|
|
|
715
|
1619
|
|
|
07/1918 |
13/09/1941 |
Empire twin plunger Lubricator fitted to axles |
06/01/1934 |
O4 |
|
|
6360
|
3659
|
|
|
1620
|
63659
|
|
07/1918 |
09/12/1962 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
20/06/1936 |
O4 |
|
|
6359
|
3663
|
|
|
1625
|
63663
|
|
08/1918 |
01/11/1964 |
Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted |
06/08/1949 |
O4 |
|
|
6542
|
3666
|
|
|
1628
|
63666
|
|
09/1918 |
15/12/1962 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
07/08/1937 |
O4 |
|
2956
|
6367
|
3667
|
|
|
1629
|
63667
|
|
09/1918 |
19/01/1959 |
Water Treatment apparatus fitted |
25/10/1958 |
O4 |
|
|
6361
|
3668
|
|
|
1631
|
63668
|
|
10/1918 |
02/12/1958 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
16/05/1936 |
O4 |
|
2914
|
6339
|
|
|
717
|
1674
|
|
|
04/1918 |
14/09/1941 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
06/02/1937 |
O4 |
|
2915
|
6349
|
3694
|
|
|
1675
|
63694
|
|
04/1918 |
30/10/1959 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
10/10/1936 |
O4 |
|
|
6323
|
3696
|
|
|
1678
|
63696
|
|
05/1918 |
24/04/1959 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
19/09/1936 |
O4 |
|
|
6497
|
|
|
706
|
1683
|
|
|
07/1918 |
13/09/1941 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
01/08/1936 |
O4 |
|
|
6498
|
3701
|
|
|
1684
|
63701
|
|
07/1918 |
01/08/1965 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
01/02/1936 |
O4 |
|
|
6336
|
3703
|
|
|
1686
|
63703
|
|
08/1918 |
31/01/1965 |
Water Treatment apparatus fitted |
05/07/1958 |
O4 |
|
|
6499
|
|
|
712
|
1687
|
|
|
11/1918 |
13/09/1941 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
24/10/1936 |
O4 |
|
|
6318
|
3708
|
|
|
1688
|
63708
|
|
11/1918 |
23/09/1962 |
Water Treatment apparatus fitted |
25/10/1958 |
O4 |
|
|
6276
|
3758
|
|
|
1847
|
63758
|
|
12/1917 |
24/05/1962 |
Water Treatment apparatus fitted |
21/03/1959 |
O4 |
1282
|
|
6282
|
3759
|
|
|
1848
|
63759
|
|
12/1917 |
23/09/1962 |
Water Treatment apparatus fitted |
26/09/1959 |
O4 |
|
2933
|
6579
|
3760
|
|
|
1849
|
63760
|
|
02/1918 |
26/11/1962 |
Westinghouse Brake fitted |
26/07/1952 |
O4 |
|
|
6271
|
3765
|
|
|
1858
|
63765
|
|
03/1918 |
11/10/1964 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
22/10/1936 |
O4 |
|
|
6513
|
3768
|
|
|
1861
|
63768
|
|
03/1918 |
11/07/1965 |
Drop Grate fitted |
02/1946 |
O4 |
|
|
6268
|
3774
|
|
|
1868
|
63774
|
|
04/1918 |
10/03/1963 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
14/11/1936 |
O4 |
|
|
6267
|
3776
|
|
|
1870
|
63776
|
|
04/1918 |
29/12/1962 |
Water Treatment apparatus fitted |
11/10/1958 |
O4 |
|
|
6588
|
3779
|
|
|
1875
|
63779
|
|
05/1918 |
13/04/1962 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
22/02/1936 |
O4 |
|
|
6505
|
3780
|
|
|
1876
|
63780
|
|
05/1918 |
07/07/1963 |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
14/10/1961 |
O4 |
|
|
6506
|
3782
|
|
|
1879
|
63782
|
|
05/1918 |
25/05/1961 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
09/05/1936 |
O4 |
|
2897
|
6590
|
3785
|
|
|
1882
|
63785
|
|
05/1918 |
27/03/1966 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
11/04/1936 |
O4 |
|
2894
|
6515
|
3786
|
|
|
1884
|
63786
|
|
06/1918 |
27/09/1964 |
Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted |
12/02/1949 |
O4 |
|
|
6591
|
3787
|
|
|
1885
|
63787
|
|
06/1918 |
08/06/1962 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
15/08/1936 |
O4 |
1283
|
|
6283
|
3792
|
|
|
1895
|
63792
|
|
02/1918 |
27/10/1962 |
Empire twin plunger Lubricator fitted to axles |
18/08/1934 |
O4 |
|
|
6596
|
3796
|
|
|
1902
|
63796
|
|
03/1918 |
27/10/1962 |
Wakefield 2C Lubricator added to axles |
14/07/1934 |
O4 |
|
2877
|
6597
|
|
|
707
|
1903
|
|
|
03/1918 |
13/09/1941 |
Empire twin plunger Lubricator fitted to axles |
22/09/1934 |
O4 |
|
2869
|
6517
|
|
|
726
|
1905
|
|
|
03/1918 |
05/10/1941 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
05/09/1936 |
O4 |
|
|
6598
|
3801
|
|
|
1908
|
63801
|
|
03/1918 |
16/07/1963 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
03/10/1936 |
O4 |
|
|
6600
|
|
|
718
|
1914
|
|
|
05/1918 |
14/09/1941 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
07/03/1936 |
O4 |
|
2884
|
6601
|
3806
|
|
|
1915
|
63806
|
|
05/1918 |
24/11/1962 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
13/08/1938 |
O4 |
|
2892
|
6519
|
3808
|
|
|
1917
|
63808
|
|
05/1918 |
17/11/1962 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
23/05/1936 |
O4 |
|
|
6604
|
3813
|
|
|
1925
|
63813
|
|
06/1918 |
07/03/1965 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
14/10/1938 |
O4 |
|
|
6263
|
3817
|
|
|
1933
|
63817
|
|
07/1918 |
17/11/1962 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
04/07/1936 |
O4 |
|
|
6552
|
3709
|
|
|
1689
|
63709
|
|
12/1918 |
23/02/1961 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
23/05/1936 |
O4 |
1334
|
2917
|
6334
|
3712
|
|
|
1692
|
63712
|
|
01/1919 |
26/11/1962 |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
08/09/1962 |
O4 |
|
|
6310
|
3716
|
|
|
1696
|
63716
|
|
02/1919 |
06/07/1960 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
17/10/1936 |
O4 |
|
|
6313
|
3718
|
|
|
1699
|
63718
|
|
03/1919 |
29/12/1962 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
04/04/1936 |
O4 |
|
|
6315
|
|
|
759
|
1700
|
|
|
04/1919 |
19/09/1941 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
09/02/1935 |
O4 |
|
2888
|
6521
|
3821
|
|
|
1943
|
63821
|
|
10/1918 |
29/12/1962 |
Empire twin plunger Lubricator fitted to axles |
12/05/1934 |
O4 |
|
2944
|
6608
|
3823
|
|
|
1949
|
63823
|
|
10/1918 |
08/08/1962 |
Water Treatment apparatus fitted |
27/05/1961 |
O4 |
1306
|
2945
|
6306
|
3827
|
|
|
1956
|
63827
|
|
11/1918 |
12/01/1964 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
04/07/1936 |
O4 |
|
2885
|
6522
|
3836
|
|
|
1978
|
63836
|
|
10/1918 |
29/04/1964 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
02/07/1938 |
O4 |
|
2893
|
6523
|
3837
|
|
|
1979
|
63837
|
|
11/1918 |
29/12/1962 |
Water Treatment apparatus fitted |
18/04/1959 |
O4 |
|
|
6261
|
3838
|
|
|
1981
|
63838
|
|
11/1918 |
27/10/1962 |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
31/01/1962 |
O4 |
|
2861
|
6305
|
3839
|
|
|
1991
|
63839
|
|
12/1918 |
03/04/1959 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
17/10/1936 |
O4 |
|
2949
|
6302
|
3841
|
|
|
1995
|
63841
|
|
02/1919 |
01/03/1964 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
19/09/1936 |
O4 |
|
|
6257
|
3842
|
|
|
1998
|
63842
|
3842
|
02/1919 |
04/04/1965 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
27/02/1936 |
O4 |
1
|
|
5001
|
3626
|
|
|
2005
|
63626
|
|
01/1919 |
22/06/1961 |
Intensifore lubricator removed |
18/03/1936 |
O4 |
5
|
|
5005
|
3627
|
|
044
|
2006
|
63627
|
|
03/1919 |
22/02/1952 |
Intensifore lubricator removed |
25/01/1936 |
O4 |
|
2858
|
6331
|
3721
|
|
|
1645
|
63721
|
|
06/1919 |
03/11/1962 |
Intensifore lubricator removed |
10/08/1935 |
O4 |
|
|
6561
|
3641
|
|
|
1728
|
63641
|
|
09/1919 |
15/09/1962 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
04/07/1936 |
O4 |
|
|
6538
|
3642
|
|
|
1729
|
63642
|
|
07/1919 |
18/11/1959 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
01/08/1936 |
O4 |
|
|
6298
|
3883
|
|
|
1800
|
63883
|
|
04/1919 |
29/12/1962 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
03/11/1936 |
O4 |
1256
|
2836
|
6256
|
3846
|
|
|
2044
|
63846
|
|
05/1919 |
02/06/1964 |
Intensifore lubricator removed |
19/03/1938 |
O4 |
|
2854
|
6299
|
3851
|
|
|
2053
|
63851
|
|
06/1919 |
16/04/1959 |
Intensifore lubricator removed |
21/12/1935 |
O4 |
|
2855
|
6289
|
3852
|
|
|
2054
|
63852
|
3852
|
06/1919 |
30/01/1964 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
02/04/1938 |
O4 |
1292
|
2851
|
6292
|
3853
|
|
|
2055
|
63853
|
|
06/1919 |
26/11/1963 |
Intensifore lubricator removed |
01/02/1936 |
O4 |
|
2835
|
6617
|
3856
|
|
|
2062
|
63856
|
3856
|
06/1919 |
26/11/1962 |
Westinghouse Brake fitted |
17/05/1952 |
O4 |
|
|
6619
|
3858
|
|
|
2064
|
63858
|
3858
|
07/1919 |
17/04/1966 |
Intensifore lubricator removed |
01/02/1936 |
O4 |
|
|
6621
|
3860
|
|
|
2066
|
63860
|
|
07/1919 |
05/10/1961 |
Water Treatment apparatus fitted |
26/06/1959 |
O4 |
|
|
6622
|
3861
|
|
|
2068
|
63861
|
|
07/1919 |
21/02/1965 |
Intensifore lubricator removed |
21/03/1936 |
O4 |
|
|
6532
|
3862
|
|
|
2073
|
63862
|
|
08/1919 |
03/11/1962 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
08/08/1936 |
O4 |
|
|
6533
|
3863
|
|
|
2074
|
63863
|
|
08/1919 |
20/06/1965 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
27/06/1936 |
O4 |
|
|
6534
|
3864
|
|
|
2075
|
63864
|
|
08/1919 |
08/08/1962 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
18/07/1936 |
O4 |
|
|
6535
|
3865
|
|
|
2076
|
63865
|
3865
|
08/1919 |
17/11/1962 |
Drop Grate fitted |
1946 |
O4 |
|
|
6623
|
|
|
716
|
2078
|
|
|
08/1919 |
13/09/1941 |
Intensifore lubricator removed |
12/01/1935 |
O4 |
|
|
6624
|
3867
|
|
|
2079
|
63867
|
|
08/1919 |
17/11/1962 |
Intensifore lubricator removed |
22/02/1936 |
O4 |
|
|
6625
|
3868
|
|
|
2081
|
63868
|
|
08/1919 |
11/07/1965 |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
14/10/1961 |
O4 |
|
|
6626
|
3869
|
|
|
2082
|
63869
|
|
08/1919 |
17/11/1962 |
Intensifore lubricator removed |
31/10/1936 |
O4 |
|
|
6627
|
3870
|
|
|
2084
|
63870
|
3870
|
09/1919 |
26/01/1962 |
Water Treatment apparatus fitted |
01/11/1958 |
O4 |
|
|
6628
|
|
|
786
|
2087
|
|
|
10/1919 |
18/10/1941 |
Intensifore lubricator removed |
20/06/1936 |
O4 |
|
2845
|
6525
|
3872
|
|
|
2094
|
63872
|
|
05/1919 |
30/01/1964 |
Drop Grate fitted |
08/1946 |
O4 |
|
|
6630
|
3874
|
|
|
2096
|
63874
|
|
06/1919 |
26/11/1962 |
Westinghouse Brake fitted |
18/10/1952 |
O4 |
|
2857
|
6528
|
3876
|
|
|
2099
|
63876
|
|
06/1919 |
10/03/1959 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
24/10/1936 |
O4 |
|
2853
|
6529
|
3877
|
|
|
2101
|
63877
|
|
06/1919 |
21/03/1965 |
Intensifore lubricator removed |
17/08/1935 |
O4 |
|
|
6634
|
3885
|
|
|
2132
|
63885
|
|
09/1919 |
08/08/1962 |
Water Treatment apparatus fitted |
17/12/1960 |
O4 |
|
|
6635
|
3886
|
|
|
2133
|
63886
|
|
09/1919 |
27/10/1962 |
Intensifore lubricator removed |
21/03/1936 |
O4 |
|
|
6636
|
3887
|
|
|
2134
|
63887
|
|
09/1919 |
02/03/1963 |
Drop Grate fitted |
04/1946 |
O4 |
|
|
6637
|
3888
|
|
|
2135
|
63888
|
3888
|
09/1919 |
01/04/1960 |
Intensifore lubricator removed |
18/01/1936 |
O4 |
|
|
6638
|
3889
|
|
|
2136
|
63889
|
3889
|
09/1919 |
02/12/1959 |
Intensifore lubricator removed |
02/11/1935 |
O4 |
|
2846
|
6639
|
3890
|
|
|
2144
|
63890
|
|
05/1919 |
17/03/1963 |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
03/02/1962 |
O4 |
|
2852
|
6293
|
3893
|
|
|
2148
|
63893
|
3893
|
06/1919 |
20/06/1965 |
Intensifore lubricator removed |
13/06/1935 |
O4 |
1300
|
2843
|
6300
|
3894
|
|
|
2149
|
63894
|
|
06/1919 |
11/07/1960 |
Intensifore lubricator removed |
31/08/1935 |
O4 |
|
2840
|
6296
|
3895
|
|
|
2150
|
63895
|
|
06/1919 |
21/07/1962 |
Intensifore lubricator removed |
09/11/1935 |
O4 |
|
|
6254
|
3897
|
|
|
2153
|
63897
|
|
06/1919 |
22/05/1963 |
Intensifore lubricator removed |
13/06/1936 |
O4 |
|
|
6253
|
3898
|
|
|
2157
|
63898
|
|
06/1919 |
02/05/1963 |
Intensifore lubricator removed |
15/05/1936 |
O4 |
|
|
6641
|
3900
|
|
|
2162
|
63900
|
|
11/1919 |
23/09/1962 |
Water Treatment apparatus fitted |
08/08/1959 |
O4 |
|
|
6642
|
3901
|
|
|
2165
|
63901
|
|
12/1919 |
17/11/1962 |
Drop Grate fitted |
02/1946 |
O4 |
|
|
6330
|
|
|
744
|
1638
|
|
|
07/1919 |
19/09/1941 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
13/06/1936 |
O4 |
|
2831
|
6329
|
3724
|
|
|
1640
|
63724
|
3724
|
08/1919 |
08/08/1962 |
Water Treatment apparatus fitted |
28/01/1961 |
O4 |
|
2832
|
6328
|
3725
|
|
|
1641
|
63725
|
|
08/1919 |
11/07/1965 |
Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted |
20/08/1949 |
O4 |
|
|
6308
|
3728
|
|
|
1739
|
63728
|
|
10/1919 |
20/12/1964 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
03/07/1937 |
O4 |
1309
|
|
6309
|
3729
|
|
|
1741
|
63729
|
|
11/1919 |
31/03/1959 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
07/03/1936 |
O4 |
|
2961
|
6326
|
3730
|
|
|
1743
|
63730
|
|
11/1919 |
02/01/1966 |
Intensifore lubricator removed |
18/08/1934 |
O4 |
|
|
6307
|
3731
|
|
|
1746
|
63731
|
|
12/1919 |
29/10/1963 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
29/08/1936 |
O4 |
|
|
6502
|
3733
|
|
|
1748
|
63733
|
|
04/1920 |
14/01/1960 |
Intensifore lubricator removed |
24/10/1936 |
O4 |
|
|
6503
|
3734
|
|
|
1749
|
63734
|
|
04/1920 |
08/08/1965 |
Intensifore lubricator removed |
07/12/1935 |
O4 |
412
|
|
5412
|
3902
|
|
|
|
63902
|
|
01/1918 |
11/04/1965 |
Intensifore lubricator removed |
21/11/1936 |
O4 |
414
|
|
5414
|
3904
|
|
|
|
63904
|
3904
|
04/1918 |
23/11/1961 |
Intensifore lubricator removed |
20/10/1934 |
O4 |
415
|
|
5415
|
3905
|
|
|
|
63905
|
|
05/1918 |
08/04/1959 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
31/12/1938 |
O4 |
417
|
|
5417
|
3906
|
|
|
|
63906
|
3906
|
06/1918 |
03/01/1965 |
Intensifore lubricator removed |
20/02/1937 |
O4 |
418
|
|
5418
|
3907
|
|
|
|
63907
|
|
08/1918 |
22/05/1964 |
Intensifore lubricator removed |
30/01/1936 |
O4 |
419
|
|
5419
|
3908
|
|
|
|
63908
|
|
09/1918 |
01/10/1963 |
Intensifore lubricator removed |
06/04/1935 |
O4 |
420
|
|
5420
|
|
|
733
|
|
|
|
04/1919 |
14/09/1941 |
Intensifore lubricator removed |
05/10/1935 |
O4 |
421
|
|
5421
|
|
|
781
|
|
|
|
07/1919 |
11/10/1941 |
Intensifore lubricator removed |
19/10/1935 |
O4 |
422
|
|
5422
|
3911
|
|
|
|
63911
|
|
06/1919 |
09/12/1962 |
Intensifore lubricator removed |
06/03/1937 |
O4 |
10
|
|
5010
|
3912
|
|
|
|
63912
|
|
08/1919 |
09/12/1962 |
Water Treatment apparatus fitted |
06/06/1959 |
O4 |
11
|
|
5011
|
3913
|
|
|
|
63913
|
3913
|
08/1919 |
06/06/1965 |
Intensifore lubricator removed |
01/05/1936 |
O4 |
12
|
|
5012
|
3914
|
|
|
|
63914
|
|
09/1919 |
28/05/1964 |
Intensifore lubricator removed |
14/08/1937 |
O4 |
13
|
|
5013
|
3915
|
|
|
|
63915
|
|
10/1919 |
23/06/1961 |
Intensifore lubricator removed |
03/11/1934 |
O4 |
14
|
|
5014
|
|
|
787
|
|
|
|
11/1920 |
25/10/1941 |
Intensifore lubricator removed |
02/11/1935 |
O4 |
15
|
|
5015
|
3917
|
|
|
|
63917
|
|
12/1920 |
05/06/1962 |
Intensifore lubricator removed |
29/06/1935 |
O4 |
17
|
|
5017
|
|
|
766
|
|
|
|
12/1920 |
18/10/1941 |
Intensifore lubricator removed |
09/11/1935 |
O4 |
19
|
|
5019
|
|
|
721
|
|
|
|
01/1921 |
14/09/1941 |
Intensifore lubricator removed |
25/07/1936 |
O4 |
22
|
|
5022
|
3920
|
|
|
|
63920
|
|
02/1921 |
08/08/1962 |
Water Treatment apparatus fitted |
22/04/1961 |