GCR/LNER Robinson "O5" Class 2-8-0
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
28/06/1919 | Reallocation | 422 | GOR | Gorton | |||
20/09/1919 | Reallocation | 417 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
20/09/1919 | Reallocation | 421 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
17/10/1919 | Reallocation | 10 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
15/11/1919 | Reallocation | 11 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
12/12/1919 | Reallocation | 12 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
17/01/1920 | Reallocation | 13 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
12/03/1920 | Reallocation | 420 | GOR | Gorton | |||
11/02/1921 | Reallocation | 14 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |||
04/03/1921 | Reallocation | 17 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |||
18/03/1921 | Reallocation | 19 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |||
15/04/1921 | Reallocation | 22 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | |||
05/08/1921 | Reallocation | 414 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |||
05/08/1921 | Reallocation | 415 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |||
05/08/1921 | Reallocation | 418 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |||
24/03/1922 | Reallocation | 419 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | |||
09/02/1924 | Reallocation | 420 | GOR | Gorton | MEX | Mexborough | |
09/02/1924 | Reallocation | 422 | GOR | Gorton | MEX | Mexborough | |
03/03/1924 | Reallocation | 15 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
03/03/1924 | Reallocation | 17 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | MEX | Mexborough | |
03/03/1924 | Reallocation | 19 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | MEX | Mexborough | |
22/03/1924 | Reallocation | 14 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | MEX | Mexborough | |
22/03/1924 | Reallocation | 22 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | MEX | Mexborough | |
28/03/1932 | Reallocation | 5420 | MEX | Mexborough | MAR | March | |
01/04/1932 | Reallocation | 5421 | MEX | Mexborough | MAR | March |