GCR/LNER Robinson "O5" Class 2-8-0
GCR | LNER (1924) | WD | LNER (1946) | BR (BR Tmp) | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Rebuilt To | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
412 | 5412 | 3902 | 63902 | 01/1918 | 11/04/1965 | 01/07/1922 to O4 |
Langwith Junction | 47.25 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | |||||
413 | 5413 | 770 | 03/1918 | 08/11/1941 | 01/07/1922 to O4 |
Mexborough | 23.67 | ||||||||
414 | 5414 | 3904 | E3904 | 63904 | 04/1918 | 23/11/1961 | 14/11/1936 to O4 |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 43.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Gorton) | ||||
415 | 5415 | 3905 | 63905 | 05/1918 | 08/04/1959 | 10/10/1936 to O4 |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 40.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Gorton) | |||||
417 | 5417 | 3906 | E3906 | 63906 | 06/1918 | 03/01/1965 | 20/02/1937 to O4 |
Frodingham | 46.58 | Cut | Drapers (Hull) | 05/04/1965 | 46.84 | ||
418 | 5418 | 3907 | 63907 | 08/1918 | 22/05/1964 | 30/01/1936 to O4 |
Langwith Junction | 45.75 | Cut | Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) | |||||
419 | 5419 | 3908 | 63908 | 09/1918 | 01/10/1963 | 06/04/1935 to O4 |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 45.08 | |||||||
420 | 5420 | 733 | 04/1919 | 14/09/1941 | 13/09/1941 to O4 |
March | 22.42 | ||||||||
421 | 5421 | 781 | 07/1919 | 11/10/1941 | 11/10/1941 to O4 |
March | 22.25 | ||||||||
422 | 5422 | 3911 | 63911 | 06/1919 | 09/12/1962 | 23/01/1943 to O4 |
Mexborough | 43.5 | Cut | Round Oak Steelworks (Brierly Hill) | |||||
10 | 5010 | 3912 | 63912 | 08/1919 | 09/12/1962 | 26/07/1941 to O4 |
Langwith Junction | 43.33 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | |||||
11 | 5011 | 3913 | E3913 | 63913 | 08/1919 | 06/06/1965 | 01/05/1936 to O4 |
Staveley (G.C.) | 45.83 | Cut | Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) | ||||
12 | 5012 | 3914 | 63914 | 09/1919 | 28/05/1964 | 06/08/1926 to O4 |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 44.67 | Cut | Rigleys (Bulwell Forest) | |||||
13 | 5013 | 3915 | 63915 | 10/1919 | 23/06/1961 | 01/06/1940 to O4 |
Gorton | 41.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Gorton) | |||||
14 | 5014 | 787 | 11/1920 | 25/10/1941 | 21/01/1933 to O4 |
Mexborough | 20.92 | ||||||||
15 | 5015 | 3917 | 63917 | 12/1920 | 05/06/1962 | 29/06/1935 to O4 |
Frodingham | 41.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Gorton) | |||||
17 | 5017 | 766 | 12/1920 | 18/10/1941 | 29/10/1932 to O4 |
Mexborough | 20.83 | ||||||||
19 | 5019 | 721 | 01/1921 | 14/09/1941 | 05/08/1933 to O4 |
Frodingham | 20.67 | ||||||||
22 | 5022 | 3920 | 63920 | 02/1921 | 08/08/1962 | 05/10/1935 to O4 |
Wakefield | 41.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Gorton) |