Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 2 Today
» 954 Yesterday
» 2863 Week
» 21645 Month
» 269938 Year
» 1154319 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LNER Robinson "Q1" Class 0-8-0T


GCR LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR Date To Service Rebuilt From Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
58 5058 9925 69925 10/1903 25/06/1942
from Q4
Mexborough 13/08/1954 Eastfield 50.83
68 5068 9934 69934 11/1903 06/09/1944
from Q4
Barnsley 20/08/1959 Frodingham 55.75
70 5070 9929 69929 11/1903 13/11/1943
from Q4
Sheffield Neepsend 28/08/1959 Frodingham 55.75
87 5087 9933 69933 11/1903 20/05/1944
from Q4
Barnsley 11/12/1958 Selby 55.08
138 5138 9937 69937 02/1904 08/09/1945
from Q4
05/11/1956 Frodingham 52.75
147 5147 9935 69935 03/1904 16/01/1945
from Q4
Keadby 03/09/1959 Frodingham 55.5
1077 6077 9930 69930 08/1905 11/12/1943
from Q4
02/10/1958 Frodingham 53.17
1139 6139 9927 69927 03/1907 26/12/1942
from Q4
Langwith Junction 18/04/1956 Eastfield 49.08
44 5044 3230 69931 04/1909 28/01/1944
from Q4
Mexborough 26/11/1958 Selby 49.58
48 5048 9928 69928 05/1909 20/03/1943
from Q4
20/08/1959 Frodingham 50.25
959 5959 9932 69932 09/1910 04/03/1944
from Q4
12/11/1958 Frodingham 48.17
961 5961 9926 69926 11/1910 21/11/1942
from Q4
03/02/1958 Frodingham 47.25
1179 6179 9936 69936 11/1910 28/04/1945
from Q4
Langwith Junction 15/09/1959 Frodingham 48.83