GNR/LNER Ivatt "Q2" Class 0-8-0
GNR | LNER (Tmp) | LNER (1924) | Date To Service | Rebuilt From | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Rebuilt To | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
451 | 3451 | 10/1909 | 09/1933 | 23.92 | |||||||||
452 | 3452 | 11/1909 | 02/1934 | 24.25 | |||||||||
453 | 3453 | 11/1909 | 05/1933 | 23.5 | |||||||||
454 | 3454 | 12/1909 | 02/1934 | 24.17 | |||||||||
455 | 3455 | 12/1909 | 08/1933 | 23.67 | |||||||||
402 | 3402 | 03/1902 | 22/04/1912 from Q1 |
Colwick | 13/09/1927 | Colwick | 25.5 | ||||||
405 | 405N | 3405 | 04/1902 | 28/09/1911 from Q1 |
Ardsley | 26/06/1935 | Ardsley | 33.17 | |||||
406 | 406N | 3406 | 04/1902 | 26/07/1912 from Q1 |
Ardsley | 03/02/1934 | Ardsley | 31.83 | |||||
407 | 407N | 3407 | 04/1902 | 23/07/1912 from Q1 |
Ardsley | 16/06/1934 | Ardsley | 32.17 | |||||
410 | 3410 | 07/1902 | 12/06/1912 from Q1 |
Colwick | 18/10/1935 | Ardsley | 33.25 | ||||||
416 | 3416 | 12/1902 | 19/08/1911 from Q1 |
Colwick | 17/12/1935 | Colwick | 33 | ||||||
417 | 3417 | 01/1903 | 02/12/1908 from Q1 |
Colwick | 17/12/1935 | Colwick | 32.92 | ||||||
420 | 3420 | 01/1903 | 05/09/1911 from Q1 |
New England | 10/02/1937 | 14/02/1914 to Q3 |
Ardsley | 34.08 | |||||
421 | 421N | 3421 | 01/1903 | 23/12/1915 from Q1 |
Colwick | 19/05/1934 | Colwick | 31.33 | |||||
450 | 3450 | 08/1909 | 23/10/1920 from Q1 |
Colwick | 15/06/1933 | Colwick | 23.83 |