Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 522 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2429 Week
» 21211 Month
» 269504 Year
» 1153885 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GCR/LNER Robinson "Q4" Class 0-8-0


Class GCR LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR (Tmp) BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
Q4/1 1052 6052 3200   63200 11/1902 GOR
MEX
CLK
LNG
RET
ARD
W
Gorton
Mexborough
Colwick
Langwith Junction
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Ardsley
Withdrawn
24/07/1919
16/02/1924
01/01/1931
09/01/1931
03/08/1943
05/10/1947
05/09/1949
05/09/1949
Q4/1 1053 6053       11/1902 MEX
LNG
BRN
W
Mexborough
Langwith Junction
Barnsley
Withdrawn
11/1902
24/11/1936
11/10/1937
28/02/1939
28/02/1939
Q4/1 1054 6054 3201   63201 1902 MEX
DON
MEX
LNG
RET
GRA
BRN
W
Mexborough
Doncaster
Mexborough
Langwith Junction
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Grantham
Barnsley
Withdrawn
19/06/1908
30/01/1930
08/02/1930
06/01/1931
03/08/1943
28/09/1946
13/02/1949
22/01/1951
22/01/1951
Q4/1 56 5056 3202   63202 09/1903 BRN
SHF
RET
BRN
GRA
37A
W
Barnsley
Sheffield Neepsend
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Barnsley
Grantham
Ardsley
Withdrawn
09/1903
09/05/1929
03/06/1929
07/04/1933
06/03/1949
04/06/1950
25/09/1951
25/09/1951
Q4/1 57 5057 3203     09/1903 MEX
KEA
IMM
RET
NWE
NWE
LNG
BRN
LNG
BRN
W
Mexborough
Keadby
Immingham
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
New England
New England
Langwith Junction
Barnsley
Langwith Junction
Barnsley
Withdrawn
10/11/1916
1922
30/10/1930
09/08/1943
12/12/1943
27/08/1944
01/11/1945
07/04/1946
27/10/1946
05/10/1947
06/11/1950
06/11/1950
Q4/1 58 5058 9925   69925 10/1903 MEX
DON
MAR
RET
BRN
FRO
LNG
EFD
W
Mexborough
Doncaster
March
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Barnsley
Frodingham
Langwith Junction
Eastfield
Withdrawn
10/1903
19/05/1925
04/01/1927
28/02/1929
28/04/1934
11/07/1942
09/11/1942
26/08/1943
13/08/1954
13/08/1954
Q4/1 59 5059 3204   63204 10/1903 BRN
LNG
BRN
GRA
37A
W
Barnsley
Langwith Junction
Barnsley
Grantham
Ardsley
Withdrawn
10/1903
27/10/1946
05/10/1947
13/02/1949
11/06/1950
25/06/1951
25/06/1951
Q4/1 64 5064 3205     10/1903 MEX
SHF
DON
MEX
ANN
ARD
W
Mexborough
Sheffield Neepsend
Doncaster
Mexborough
Annesley
Ardsley
Withdrawn
14/12/1903
15/10/1926
15/12/1926
1928
05/01/1931
28/12/1935
26/12/1950
26/12/1950
Q4/2 65 5065 3206     10/1903 MEX
DON
MAR
SHF
RET
GRA
W
Mexborough
Doncaster
March
Sheffield Neepsend
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Grantham
Withdrawn
14/03/1910
19/05/1925
15/07/1925
02/03/1929
16/03/1929
28/09/1946
26/02/1949
26/02/1949
Q4/1 67 5067 3207   63207 10/1903 MEX
CLK
ANN
LNG
RET
GRA
37A
W
Mexborough
Colwick
Annesley
Langwith Junction
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Grantham
Ardsley
Withdrawn
14/12/1903
02/01/1931
09/01/1931
14/04/1936
03/08/1943
28/09/1946
11/06/1950
07/08/1950
07/08/1950
Q4/1 68 5068 3208   69934 11/1903 BRN
MEX
DON
FRO
W
Barnsley
Mexborough
Doncaster
Frodingham
Withdrawn
11/1903
06/10/1944
25/08/1946
26/09/1946
20/08/1959
20/08/1959
Q4/1 70 5070 3209   69929 11/1903 SHF
BRN
SHF
RET
LNG
IMM
LNG
36C
W
Sheffield Neepsend
Barnsley
Sheffield Neepsend
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Langwith Junction
Immingham
Langwith Junction
Frodingham
Withdrawn
11/1903
03/05/1924
08/01/1930
25/02/1930
19/12/1943
09/05/1944
15/10/1944
15/06/1958
28/08/1959
28/08/1959
Q4/2 71 5071       11/1903 STV
SHF
BRN
W
Staveley (G.C.)
Sheffield Neepsend
Barnsley
Withdrawn
11/1903
29/06/1929
08/01/1930
07/06/1939
07/06/1939
Q4/2 85 5085 3210     11/1903 MEX
KEA
IMM
KEA
FRO
IMM
RET
ARD
W
Mexborough
Keadby
Immingham
Keadby
Frodingham
Immingham
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Ardsley
Withdrawn
05/05/1916
10/1922
29/10/1929
11/06/1932
18/06/1932
13/09/1939
09/08/1943
05/10/1947
10/10/1949
10/10/1949
Q4/1 86 5086       11/1903 STV
W
Staveley (G.C.)
Withdrawn
11/1903
10/04/1937
10/04/1937
Q4/1 87 5087 3211   69933 11/1903 BRN
ARD
MEX
HLD
GHD
SEL
W
Barnsley
Ardsley
Mexborough
Hull Dairycoates
Gateshead
Selby
Withdrawn
11/1903
26/06/1944
19/07/1944
17/09/1944
13/12/1944
06/02/1949
11/12/1958
11/12/1958
Q4/2 91 5091       11/1903 BRN
W
Barnsley
Withdrawn
11/1903
17/11/1937
17/11/1937
Q4/2 92 5092 3212     11/1903 GOR
STV
BRN
LNG
BRN
W
Gorton
Staveley (G.C.)
Barnsley
Langwith Junction
Barnsley
Withdrawn
30/08/1921
02/02/1924
31/08/1943
22/09/1944
07/04/1946
23/05/1949
23/05/1949
Q4/1 135 5135       01/1904 MEX
MAR
ARD
BFD
ARD
W
Mexborough
March
Ardsley
Bradford Hammerton Street
Ardsley
Withdrawn
01/1904
31/01/1927
04/01/1929
16/03/1929
23/04/1934
10/06/1937
10/06/1937
Q4/1 136 5136 3213     01/1904 MEX
DON
ARD
W
Mexborough
Doncaster
Ardsley
Withdrawn
01/04/1904
24/03/1924
05/06/1928
19/06/1950
19/06/1950
Q4/1 137 5137 3214     01/1904 BRN
LNG
BRN
W
Barnsley
Langwith Junction
Barnsley
Withdrawn
01/1904
23/09/1944
07/04/1946
16/05/1949
16/05/1949
Q4/2 138 5138 9937   69937 02/1904 STV
BRN
ARD
MEX
DON
FRO
W
Staveley (G.C.)
Barnsley
Ardsley
Mexborough
Doncaster
Frodingham
Withdrawn
17/02/1922
02/02/1928
10/10/1929
19/09/1945
25/08/1946
28/09/1946
05/11/1956
05/11/1956
Q4/2 139 5139       02/1904 KEA
IMM
KEA
FRO
W
Keadby
Immingham
Keadby
Frodingham
Withdrawn
02/1904
10/01/1930
11/06/1932
18/06/1932
18/08/1934
18/08/1934
Q4/2 140 5140       02/1904 KEA
FRO
W
Keadby
Frodingham
Withdrawn
02/1904
18/06/1932
27/11/1937
27/11/1937
Q4/1 142 5142 3216   63216 03/1904 BRN
LNG
BRN
LNG
BRN
W
Barnsley
Langwith Junction
Barnsley
Langwith Junction
Barnsley
Withdrawn
03/1904
21/09/1944
07/04/1946
27/10/1946
05/09/1947
05/09/1949
05/09/1949
Q4/1 143 5143       03/1904 KEA
DON
BRN
W
Keadby
Doncaster
Barnsley
Withdrawn
03/1904
03/12/1929
27/01/1930
17/11/1939
17/11/1939
Q4/1 144 5144       03/1904 IMM
ARD
W
Immingham
Ardsley
Withdrawn
03/1904
11/08/1928
14/05/1938
14/05/1938
Q4/1 145 5145       03/1904 MEX
W
Mexborough
Withdrawn
03/1904
21/09/1936
21/09/1936
Q4/1 146 5146 3217   63217 03/1904 MEX
SHF
MEX
ARD
BFD
37A
W
Mexborough
Sheffield Neepsend
Mexborough
Ardsley
Bradford Hammerton Street
Ardsley
Withdrawn
21/12/1912
15/10/1926
08/12/1926
21/10/1936
30/06/1946
04/06/1950
14/03/1951
14/03/1951
Q4/1 147 5147 9935   69935 03/1904 KEA
FRO
BFD
ARD
DON
FRO
W
Keadby
Frodingham
Bradford Hammerton Street
Ardsley
Doncaster
Frodingham
Withdrawn
03/1904
18/06/1932
27/08/1939
02/12/1941
25/08/1946
26/09/1946
03/09/1959
03/09/1959
Q4/1 148 5148       04/1904 MEX
DON
ARD
W
Mexborough
Doncaster
Ardsley
Withdrawn
04/1904
04/1929
21/08/1936
29/10/1938
29/10/1938
Q4/1 149 5149       04/1904 MEX
SHF
MEX
BRN
W
Mexborough
Sheffield Neepsend
Mexborough
Barnsley
Withdrawn
04/1904
15/10/1926
07/12/1926
05/09/1929
09/12/1939
09/12/1939
Q4/1 150 5150       04/1904 KEA
FRO
W
Keadby
Frodingham
Withdrawn
04/1904
18/06/1932
06/03/1939
06/03/1939
Q4/1 151 5151       05/1904 MEX
DON
MAR
IMM
KEA
FRO
W
Mexborough
Doncaster
March
Immingham
Keadby
Frodingham
Withdrawn
05/1904
07/1907
02/02/1927
08/03/1929
13/06/1929
18/06/1932
16/05/1939
16/05/1939
Q4/1 152 5152 3219     05/1904 MEX
DON
MAR
LNG
ARD
BRN
W
Mexborough
Doncaster
March
Langwith Junction
Ardsley
Barnsley
Withdrawn
01/02/1913
02/04/1924
18/07/1925
02/03/1929
28/02/1934
06/12/1940
26/12/1949
26/12/1949
Q4/2 153 5153 3220   63220 05/1904 KEA
FRO
BRN
LNG
BRN
W
Keadby
Frodingham
Barnsley
Langwith Junction
Barnsley
Withdrawn
05/1904
18/06/1932
09/08/1943
27/10/1946
05/10/1947
14/03/1951
14/03/1951
Q4/1 1073 6073       07/1905 MEX
ARD
KEA
ARD
W
Mexborough
Ardsley
Keadby
Ardsley
Withdrawn
07/1905
15/10/1927
16/10/1929
01/04/1930
10/12/1935
10/12/1935
Q4/1 1074 6074       07/1905 KEA
FRO
W
Keadby
Frodingham
Withdrawn
07/1905
08/06/1932
20/01/1936
20/01/1936
Q4/1 1075 6075       08/1905 MEX
DON
MEX
ARD
W
Mexborough
Doncaster
Mexborough
Ardsley
Withdrawn
14/12/1912
15/12/1923
26/03/1925
05/03/1929
06/01/1940
06/01/1940
Q4/2 1076 6076 3221 3221   08/1905 MEX
KEA
ARD
KEA
ARD
W
Mexborough
Keadby
Ardsley
Keadby
Ardsley
Withdrawn
08/11/1919
1922
11/11/1927
10/10/1929
22/03/1930
26/12/1950
26/12/1950
Q4/1 1077 6077 9930   69930 08/1905 LNG
MEX
LNG
IMM
MEX
DON
FRO
30A
36C
W
Langwith Junction
Mexborough
Langwith Junction
Immingham
Mexborough
Doncaster
Frodingham
Stratford
Frodingham
Withdrawn
20/06/1914
05/06/1937
13/02/1944
09/05/1944
13/09/1944
25/08/1946
24/09/1946
16/04/1950
27/08/1950
02/10/1958
02/10/1958
Q4/1 1132 6132 3223   63223 02/1907 LNG
CLK
ARD
W
Langwith Junction
Colwick
Ardsley
Withdrawn
09/04/1920
21/02/1934
07/10/1935
11/06/1951
11/06/1951
Q4/1 1133 6133 3224     02/1907 LNG
RET
ARD
W
Langwith Junction
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Ardsley
Withdrawn
07/11/1914
03/08/1943
05/10/1947
26/02/1949
26/02/1949
Q4/2 1134 6134 3225   63225 02/1907 GOR
LNG
RET
NWE
NWE
RET
GRA
ARD
W
Gorton
Langwith Junction
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
New England
New England
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Grantham
Ardsley
Withdrawn
04/02/1916
09/02/1924
03/08/1943
12/12/1943
27/08/1944
28/10/1945
01/09/1946
22/04/1947
25/09/1951
25/09/1951
Q4/1 1135 6135 3226     03/1907 LNG
ARD
W
Langwith Junction
Ardsley
Withdrawn
03/1907
07/05/1931
16/10/1950
16/10/1950
Q4/1 1136 6136 3227   63227 03/1907 LNG
RET
NWE
NWE
LNG
BRN
LNG
BRN
37A
W
Langwith Junction
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
New England
New England
Langwith Junction
Barnsley
Langwith Junction
Barnsley
Ardsley
Withdrawn
01/09/1922
03/08/1943
12/12/1943
27/08/1944
28/10/1945
14/04/1946
27/10/1946
05/10/1947
08/1950
26/05/1951
26/05/1951
Q4/1 1137 6137       03/1907 LNG
CLK
ARD
W
Langwith Junction
Colwick
Ardsley
Withdrawn
03/1907
23/02/1934
02/11/1935
28/02/1939
28/02/1939
Q4/1 1138 6138       03/1907 LNG
CLK
W
Langwith Junction
Colwick
Withdrawn
03/1907
20/02/1934
05/12/1934
05/12/1934
Q4/2 1139 6139 9927   69927 03/1907 LNG
EFD
LNG
EFD
W
Langwith Junction
Eastfield
Langwith Junction
Eastfield
Withdrawn
03/1907
31/03/1943
21/04/1943
26/08/1943
18/04/1956
18/04/1956
Q4/2 1140 6140 3228     03/1907 LNG
CLK
KEA
IMM
CLK
LNG
IMM
LIN
RET
NWE
RET
GRA
W
Langwith Junction
Colwick
Keadby
Immingham
Colwick
Langwith Junction
Immingham
Lincoln
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
New England
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Grantham
Withdrawn
20/06/1912
26/01/1927
11/09/1929
25/03/1931
04/10/1941
05/10/1941
16/10/1941
07/05/1942
12/12/1943
27/05/1945
28/10/1945
28/09/1946
15/08/1949
15/08/1949
Q4/2 1141 6141       03/1907 LNG
W
Langwith Junction
Withdrawn
03/1907
31/01/1939
31/01/1939
Q4/1 1142 6142       03/1907 LNG
W
Langwith Junction
Withdrawn
03/1907
22/05/1937
22/05/1937
Q4/1 1143 6143       04/1907 LNG
ARD
W
Langwith Junction
Ardsley
Withdrawn
04/1907
31/01/1928
16/05/1936
16/05/1936
Q4/1 1144 6144       04/1907 KEA
IMM
W
Keadby
Immingham
Withdrawn
04/1907
02/08/1930
07/01/1938
07/01/1938
Q4/1 39 5039 3229     02/1909 KEA
FRO
BRN
MEX
GRA
BRN
W
Keadby
Frodingham
Barnsley
Mexborough
Grantham
Barnsley
Withdrawn
02/1909
18/06/1932
07/01/1939
07/12/1939
23/02/1947
06/03/1949
04/12/1950
04/12/1950
Q4/1 44 5044 9931   69931 04/1909 MEX
LNG
RET
LNG
MEX
SEL
GHD
SEL
W
Mexborough
Langwith Junction
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Langwith Junction
Mexborough
Selby
Gateshead
Selby
Withdrawn
04/1909
11/1936
03/08/1943
13/02/1944
06/05/1944
17/09/1944
13/12/1944
06/02/1949
26/11/1958
26/11/1958
Q4/1 48 5048 9928   69928 05/1909 MEX
DON
ARD
BRN
LNG
IMM
LNG
36C
W
Mexborough
Doncaster
Ardsley
Barnsley
Langwith Junction
Immingham
Langwith Junction
Frodingham
Withdrawn
14/07/1909
30/04/1928
26/06/1936
10/11/1937
13/04/1943
28/08/1944
01/10/1944
15/06/1958
20/08/1959
20/08/1959
Q4/2 49 5049       06/1909 MEX
SHF
MEX
DON
MEX
LNG
MEX
W
Mexborough
Sheffield Neepsend
Mexborough
Doncaster
Mexborough
Langwith Junction
Mexborough
Withdrawn
13/08/1909
15/10/1926
10/12/1926
28/04/1928
23/02/1934
16/11/1936
06/05/1937
17/11/1939
17/11/1939
Q4/1 62 5062       06/1909 DON
MEX
MAR
IMM
KEA
SHF
STV
BRN
W
Doncaster
Mexborough
March
Immingham
Keadby
Sheffield Neepsend
Staveley (G.C.)
Barnsley
Withdrawn
07/1907
06/1909
13/05/1928
02/03/1929
10/06/1929
10/04/1931
20/06/1931
25/01/1932
08/05/1937
08/05/1937
Q4/1 63 5063       07/1909 KEA
IMM
W
Keadby
Immingham
Withdrawn
07/1909
01/11/1930
22/06/1936
22/06/1936
Q4/1   5212       08/1909 STV
BRN
W
Staveley (G.C.)
Barnsley
Withdrawn
08/1909
30/03/1932
12/03/1938
12/03/1938
Q4/1 213 5213       09/1909 SHF
CLK
STV
BRN
W
Sheffield Neepsend
Colwick
Staveley (G.C.)
Barnsley
Withdrawn
09/1909
21/01/1927
05/04/1927
29/03/1932
13/07/1938
13/07/1938
Q4/1 356 5356       10/1909 MEX
ARD
KEA
FRO
W
Mexborough
Ardsley
Keadby
Frodingham
Withdrawn
11/12/1909
31/01/1928
12/10/1929
18/06/1932
08/05/1937
08/05/1937
Q4/1 159 5159 3231     10/1909 MEX
SHF
MEX
ARD
W
Mexborough
Sheffield Neepsend
Mexborough
Ardsley
Withdrawn
11/10/1912
15/10/1926
07/12/1926
12/06/1928
20/03/1950
20/03/1950
Q4/2 160 5160 3232   63232 11/1909 MEX
KEA
ARD
W
Mexborough
Keadby
Ardsley
Withdrawn
11/01/1913
23/02/1920
01/11/1927
05/06/1950
05/06/1950
Q4/1 161 5161 3233   63233 11/1909 STV
BRN
LNG
BRN
W
Staveley (G.C.)
Barnsley
Langwith Junction
Barnsley
Withdrawn
04/01/1913
1935
27/10/1946
05/10/1947
06/02/1950
06/02/1950
Q4/1 162 5162 3234   63234 12/1909 MEX
KEA
IMM
MEX
GRA
37A
W
Mexborough
Keadby
Immingham
Mexborough
Grantham
Ardsley
Withdrawn
18/10/1912
1922
12/10/1930
08/01/1938
23/02/1947
04/06/1950
05/03/1951
05/03/1951
Q4/2 163 5163 3235 3235   12/1909 MEX
ARD
KEA
IMM
LIN
NWE
NWE
LNG
BRN
LNG
BRN
W
Mexborough
Ardsley
Keadby
Immingham
Lincoln
New England
New England
Langwith Junction
Barnsley
Langwith Junction
Barnsley
Withdrawn
19/05/1912
17/01/1928
10/10/1929
12/12/1930
03/05/1942
12/12/1943
27/08/1944
28/10/1945
07/04/1946
27/10/1946
05/10/1947
07/05/1951
07/05/1951
Q4/2 164 5164 3236   63236 12/1909 MEX
KEA
FRO
BRN
ARD
W
Mexborough
Keadby
Frodingham
Barnsley
Ardsley
Withdrawn
27/04/1912
1923
18/06/1932
19/02/1939
04/05/1939
26/05/1951
26/05/1951
Q4/1 401 5401       06/1910 MEX
W
Mexborough
Withdrawn
06/1910
22/12/1937
22/12/1937
Q4/1 956 5956       08/1910 KEA
IMM
W
Keadby
Immingham
Withdrawn
08/1910
07/11/1931
04/07/1939
04/07/1939
Q4/2 957 5957       08/1910 LNG
W
Langwith Junction
Withdrawn
08/1910
28/04/1936
28/04/1936
Q4/1 958 5958       08/1910 MEX
DON
MEX
LNG
W
Mexborough
Doncaster
Mexborough
Langwith Junction
Withdrawn
08/1910
07/1924
19/05/1925
07/05/1930
05/03/1937
05/03/1937
Q4/1 959 5959 9932   69932 09/1910 LNG
ARD
MEX
SHF
MEX
DON
FRO
W
Langwith Junction
Ardsley
Mexborough
Sheffield Darnall
Mexborough
Doncaster
Frodingham
Withdrawn
21/06/1913
18/05/1931
14/04/1944
02/07/1944
17/08/1944
25/08/1946
24/09/1946
12/11/1958
12/11/1958
Q4/1 960 5960       10/1910 MEX
DON
MEX
W
Mexborough
Doncaster
Mexborough
Withdrawn
10/1910
07/1924
17/02/1934
02/05/1936
02/05/1936
Q4/1 961 5961 9926   69926 11/1910 MEX
DON
FRO
MEX
CAM
MAR
36C
W
Mexborough
Doncaster
Frodingham
Mexborough
Cambridge
March
Frodingham
Withdrawn
15/09/1916
16/02/1924
31/01/1936
22/08/1939
01/10/1945
21/10/1948
08/04/1951
03/02/1958
03/02/1958
Q4/1 962 5962 3238     11/1910 MEX
DON
MAR
STV
BRN
LNG
BRN
LNG
BRN
W
Mexborough
Doncaster
March
Staveley (G.C.)
Barnsley
Langwith Junction
Barnsley
Langwith Junction
Barnsley
Withdrawn
08/02/1911
31/01/1924
14/07/1925
14/03/1929
05/09/1943
23/09/1944
07/04/1946
27/10/1946
05/10/1947
06/02/1950
06/02/1950
Q4/1 963 5963       1910 MEX
DON
MAR
ANN
ARD
W
Mexborough
Doncaster
March
Annesley
Ardsley
Withdrawn
1910
07/1924
24/01/1929
09/03/1929
22/05/1931
03/10/1936
03/10/1936
Q4/2 964 5964       12/1910 IMM
ARD
KEA
FRO
W
Immingham
Ardsley
Keadby
Frodingham
Withdrawn
12/1910
01/10/1927
10/10/1929
18/06/1932
30/08/1938
30/08/1938
Q4/1 965 5965       12/1910 MEX
DON
ARD
W
Mexborough
Doncaster
Ardsley
Withdrawn
12/1910
1924
13/11/1934
29/10/1938
29/10/1938
Q4/1 1174 6174       06/1910 MEX
ARD
BFD
ARD
W
Mexborough
Ardsley
Bradford Hammerton Street
Ardsley
Withdrawn
06/1910
16/04/1928
02/03/1931
04/06/1931
05/06/1936
05/06/1936
Q4/2 1175 6175 3239     06/1910 MEX
ARD
W
Mexborough
Ardsley
Withdrawn
21/08/1910
19/11/1936
19/07/1943
19/07/1943
Q4/2 1176 6176 3240   63240 07/1910 LNG
RET
NWE
NWE
RET
GRA
37A
W
Langwith Junction
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
New England
New England
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Grantham
Ardsley
Withdrawn
07/1910
03/08/1943
12/12/1943
27/08/1944
28/10/1945
13/10/1946
04/06/1950
13/06/1951
13/06/1951
Q4/1 1177 6177 3241     1910 MEX
DON
MAR
IMM
KEA
DON
BFD
ARD
W
Mexborough
Doncaster
March
Immingham
Keadby
Doncaster
Bradford Hammerton Street
Ardsley
Withdrawn
04/10/1910
18/03/1924
15/07/1925
03/03/1929
20/09/1929
03/12/1929
21/11/1934
02/02/1941
17/04/1950
17/04/1950
Q4/1 1178 6178       10/1910 MEX
KEA
ARD
BFD
W
Mexborough
Keadby
Ardsley
Bradford Hammerton Street
Withdrawn
29/04/1911
1922
31/12/1929
04/10/1930
15/08/1939
15/08/1939
Q4/1 1179 6179 9936   69936 11/1910 LNG
ANN
LNG
RET
NWE
NWE
DON
FRO
W
Langwith Junction
Annesley
Langwith Junction
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
New England
New England
Doncaster
Frodingham
Withdrawn
11/1910
10/03/1924
15/04/1936
03/08/1943
12/12/1943
27/08/1944
25/08/1946
28/09/1946
15/09/1959
15/09/1959
Q4/2 1180 6180 3243 3243 63243 01/1911 MEX
DON
MAR
LNG
MEX
GRA
37A
W
Mexborough
Doncaster
March
Langwith Junction
Mexborough
Grantham
Ardsley
Withdrawn
15/11/1919
18/03/1924
15/07/1925
02/03/1929
07/05/1937
23/02/1947
11/06/1950
15/10/1951
15/10/1951
Q4/1 1181 6181       01/1911 IMM
DON
MEX
LNG
ARD
W
Immingham
Doncaster
Mexborough
Langwith Junction
Ardsley
Withdrawn
01/1911
06/04/1927
17/02/1934
04/12/1936
09/03/1937
16/03/1939
16/03/1939
Q4/1 1182 6182       02/1911 MEX
ARD
W
Mexborough
Ardsley
Withdrawn
02/1911
30/06/1928
16/05/1939
16/05/1939