Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 80 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 5227 Week
» 15397 Month
» 293193 Year
» 1177574 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GCR/LNER Robinson "Q4" Class 0-8-0


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
11/1902 To Service 1053   NEW MEX Mexborough  
09/1903 To Service 56   NEW BRN Barnsley  
10/1903 To Service 58   NEW MEX Mexborough  
10/1903 To Service 59   NEW BRN Barnsley  
11/1903 To Service 68   NEW BRN Barnsley  
11/1903 To Service 70   NEW SHF Sheffield Neepsend  
11/1903 To Service 71   NEW STV Staveley (G.C.)  
11/1903 To Service 86   NEW STV Staveley (G.C.)  
11/1903 To Service 87   NEW BRN Barnsley  
11/1903 To Service 91   NEW BRN Barnsley  
14/12/1903 Reallocation 64     MEX Mexborough  
14/12/1903 Reallocation 67     MEX Mexborough  
01/1904 To Service 135   NEW MEX Mexborough  
01/1904 To Service 137   NEW BRN Barnsley  
02/1904 To Service 139   NEW KEA Keadby  
02/1904 To Service 140   NEW KEA Keadby  
03/1904 To Service 142   NEW BRN Barnsley  
03/1904 To Service 143   NEW KEA Keadby  
03/1904 To Service 144   NEW IMM Immingham  
03/1904 To Service 145   NEW MEX Mexborough  
03/1904 To Service 147   NEW KEA Keadby  
04/1904 To Service 148   NEW MEX Mexborough  
04/1904 To Service 149   NEW MEX Mexborough  
04/1904 To Service 150   NEW KEA Keadby  
01/04/1904 Reallocation 136     MEX Mexborough  
05/1904 To Service 151   NEW MEX Mexborough  
05/1904 To Service 153   NEW KEA Keadby  
07/1905 To Service 1073   NEW MEX Mexborough  
07/1905 To Service 1074   NEW KEA Keadby  
03/1907 To Service 1135   NEW LNG Langwith Junction  
03/1907 To Service 1137   NEW LNG Langwith Junction  
03/1907 To Service 1138   NEW LNG Langwith Junction  
03/1907 To Service 1139   NEW LNG Langwith Junction  
03/1907 To Service 1141   NEW LNG Langwith Junction  
03/1907 To Service 1142   NEW LNG Langwith Junction  
04/1907 To Service 1143   NEW LNG Langwith Junction  
04/1907 To Service 1144   NEW KEA Keadby  
07/1907 Reallocation 151 MEX Mexborough DON Doncaster  
19/06/1908 Reallocation 1054     MEX Mexborough  
02/1909 To Service 39   NEW KEA Keadby  
04/1909 To Service 44   NEW MEX Mexborough  
06/1909 To Service 62   NEW MEX Mexborough  
07/1909 To Service 63   NEW KEA Keadby  
14/07/1909 Reallocation 48     MEX Mexborough  
08/1909 To Service 5212   NEW STV Staveley (G.C.)  
13/08/1909 Reallocation 49     MEX Mexborough  
09/1909 To Service 213   NEW SHF Sheffield Neepsend  
11/12/1909 Reallocation 356     MEX Mexborough  
1910 To Service 963   NEW MEX Mexborough  
14/03/1910 Reallocation 65     MEX Mexborough  
06/1910 To Service 401   NEW MEX Mexborough  
06/1910 To Service 1174   NEW MEX Mexborough  
07/1910 To Service 1176   NEW LNG Langwith Junction  
08/1910 To Service 956   NEW KEA Keadby  
08/1910 To Service 957   NEW LNG Langwith Junction  
08/1910 To Service 958   NEW MEX Mexborough  
21/08/1910 Reallocation 1175     MEX Mexborough  
10/1910 To Service 960   NEW MEX Mexborough  
04/10/1910 Reallocation 1177     MEX Mexborough  
11/1910 To Service 1179   NEW LNG Langwith Junction  
12/1910 To Service 964   NEW IMM Immingham  
12/1910 To Service 965   NEW MEX Mexborough  
01/1911 To Service 1181   NEW IMM Immingham  
02/1911 To Service 1182   NEW MEX Mexborough  
08/02/1911 Reallocation 962     MEX Mexborough  
29/04/1911 Reallocation 1178     MEX Mexborough  
27/04/1912 Reallocation 164     MEX Mexborough  
19/05/1912 Reallocation 163     MEX Mexborough  
20/06/1912 Reallocation 1140     LNG Langwith Junction  
11/10/1912 Reallocation 159     MEX Mexborough  
18/10/1912 Reallocation 162     MEX Mexborough  
14/12/1912 Reallocation 1075     MEX Mexborough  
21/12/1912 Reallocation 146     MEX Mexborough  
04/01/1913 Reallocation 161     STV Staveley (G.C.)  
11/01/1913 Reallocation 160     MEX Mexborough  
01/02/1913 Reallocation 152     MEX Mexborough  
21/06/1913 Reallocation 959     LNG Langwith Junction  
20/06/1914 Reallocation 1077     LNG Langwith Junction  
07/11/1914 Reallocation 1133     LNG Langwith Junction  
04/02/1916 Reallocation 1134     GOR Gorton  
05/05/1916 Reallocation 85     MEX Mexborough  
15/09/1916 Reallocation 961     MEX Mexborough  
10/11/1916 Reallocation 57     MEX Mexborough  
24/07/1919 Reallocation 1052     GOR Gorton  
08/11/1919 Reallocation 1076     MEX Mexborough  
15/11/1919 Reallocation 1180     MEX Mexborough  
23/02/1920 Reallocation 160 MEX Mexborough KEA Keadby  
09/04/1920 Reallocation 1132     LNG Langwith Junction  
30/08/1921 Reallocation 92     GOR Gorton  
1922 Reallocation 57 MEX Mexborough KEA Keadby  
1922 Reallocation 1076 MEX Mexborough KEA Keadby  
1922 Reallocation 162 MEX Mexborough KEA Keadby  
1922 Reallocation 1178 MEX Mexborough KEA Keadby  
17/02/1922 Reallocation 138     STV Staveley (G.C.)  
01/09/1922 Reallocation 1136     LNG Langwith Junction  
10/1922 Reallocation 85 MEX Mexborough KEA Keadby  
1923 Reallocation 164 MEX Mexborough KEA Keadby  
15/12/1923 Reallocation 1075 MEX Mexborough DON Doncaster  
1924 Reallocation 965 MEX Mexborough DON Doncaster  
31/01/1924 Reallocation 962 MEX Mexborough DON Doncaster  
02/02/1924 Reallocation 92 GOR Gorton STV Staveley (G.C.)  
09/02/1924 Reallocation 1134 GOR Gorton LNG Langwith Junction  
16/02/1924 Reallocation 1052 GOR Gorton MEX Mexborough  
16/02/1924 Reallocation 961 MEX Mexborough DON Doncaster  
10/03/1924 Reallocation 1179 LNG Langwith Junction ANN Annesley  
18/03/1924 Reallocation 6177 MEX Mexborough DON Doncaster  
18/03/1924 Reallocation 6180 MEX Mexborough DON Doncaster  
24/03/1924 Reallocation 136 MEX Mexborough DON Doncaster  
02/04/1924 Reallocation 5152 MEX Mexborough DON Doncaster  
03/05/1924 Reallocation 5070 SHF Sheffield Neepsend BRN Barnsley  
07/1924 Reallocation 958 MEX Mexborough DON Doncaster  
07/1924 Reallocation 960 MEX Mexborough DON Doncaster  
07/1924 Reallocation 963 MEX Mexborough DON Doncaster  
26/03/1925 Reallocation 1075 DON Doncaster MEX Mexborough  
19/05/1925 Reallocation 58 MEX Mexborough DON Doncaster  
19/05/1925 Reallocation 5065 MEX Mexborough DON Doncaster  
19/05/1925 Reallocation 5958 DON Doncaster MEX Mexborough  
14/07/1925 Reallocation 5962 DON Doncaster MAR March  
15/07/1925 Reallocation 5065 DON Doncaster MAR March  
15/07/1925 Reallocation 6177 DON Doncaster MAR March  
15/07/1925 Reallocation 6180 DON Doncaster MAR March  
18/07/1925 Reallocation 5152 DON Doncaster MAR March  
15/10/1926 Reallocation 5064 MEX Mexborough SHF Sheffield Neepsend  
15/10/1926 Reallocation 5146 MEX Mexborough SHF Sheffield Neepsend  
15/10/1926 Reallocation 5149 MEX Mexborough SHF Sheffield Neepsend  
15/10/1926 Reallocation 5049 MEX Mexborough SHF Sheffield Neepsend  
15/10/1926 Reallocation 5159 MEX Mexborough SHF Sheffield Neepsend  
07/12/1926 Reallocation 5149 SHF Sheffield Neepsend MEX Mexborough  
07/12/1926 Reallocation 5159 SHF Sheffield Neepsend MEX Mexborough  
08/12/1926 Reallocation 5146 SHF Sheffield Neepsend MEX Mexborough  
10/12/1926 Reallocation 5049 SHF Sheffield Neepsend MEX Mexborough  
15/12/1926 Reallocation 5064 SHF Sheffield Neepsend DON Doncaster  
04/01/1927 Reallocation 5058 DON Doncaster MAR March  
21/01/1927 Reallocation 5213 SHF Sheffield Neepsend CLK Colwick  
26/01/1927 Reallocation 6140 LNG Langwith Junction CLK Colwick  
31/01/1927 Reallocation 5135 MEX Mexborough MAR March  
02/02/1927 Reallocation 5151 DON Doncaster MAR March  
05/04/1927 Reallocation 5213 CLK Colwick STV Staveley (G.C.)  
06/04/1927 Reallocation 6181 IMM Immingham DON Doncaster  
01/10/1927 Reallocation 5964 IMM Immingham ARD Ardsley  
15/10/1927 Reallocation 6073 MEX Mexborough ARD Ardsley  
01/11/1927 Reallocation 5160 KEA Keadby ARD Ardsley  
11/11/1927 Reallocation 6076 KEA Keadby ARD Ardsley  
1928 Reallocation 5064 DON Doncaster MEX Mexborough  
17/01/1928 Reallocation 5163 MEX Mexborough ARD Ardsley  
31/01/1928 Reallocation 6143 LNG Langwith Junction ARD Ardsley  
31/01/1928 Reallocation 5356 MEX Mexborough ARD Ardsley  
02/02/1928 Reallocation 5138 STV Staveley (G.C.) BRN Barnsley  
16/04/1928 Reallocation 6174 MEX Mexborough ARD Ardsley  
28/04/1928 Reallocation 5049 MEX Mexborough DON Doncaster  
30/04/1928 Reallocation 5048 MEX Mexborough DON Doncaster  
13/05/1928 Reallocation 5062 MEX Mexborough MAR March  
05/06/1928 Reallocation 5136 DON Doncaster ARD Ardsley  
12/06/1928 Reallocation 5159 MEX Mexborough ARD Ardsley  
30/06/1928 Reallocation 6182 MEX Mexborough ARD Ardsley  
11/08/1928 Reallocation 5144 IMM Immingham ARD Ardsley  
04/01/1929 Reallocation 5135 MAR March ARD Ardsley  
24/01/1929 Reallocation 5963 DON Doncaster MAR March  
28/02/1929 Reallocation 5058 MAR March RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
02/03/1929 Reallocation 5065 MAR March SHF Sheffield Neepsend  
02/03/1929 Reallocation 5152 MAR March LNG Langwith Junction  
02/03/1929 Reallocation 5062 MAR March IMM Immingham  
02/03/1929 Reallocation 6180 MAR March LNG Langwith Junction  
03/03/1929 Reallocation 6177 MAR March IMM Immingham  
05/03/1929 Reallocation 6075 MEX Mexborough ARD Ardsley  
08/03/1929 Reallocation 5151 MAR March IMM Immingham  
09/03/1929 Reallocation 5963 MAR March ANN Annesley  
14/03/1929 Reallocation 5962 MAR March STV Staveley (G.C.)  
16/03/1929 Reallocation 5065 SHF Sheffield Neepsend RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
16/03/1929 Reallocation 5135 ARD Ardsley BFD Bradford Hammerton Street  
04/1929 Reallocation 5148 MEX Mexborough DON Doncaster  
09/05/1929 Reallocation 5056 BRN Barnsley SHF Sheffield Neepsend  
03/06/1929 Reallocation 5056 SHF Sheffield Neepsend RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
10/06/1929 Reallocation 5062 IMM Immingham KEA Keadby  
13/06/1929 Reallocation 5151 IMM Immingham KEA Keadby  
29/06/1929 Reallocation 5071 STV Staveley (G.C.) SHF Sheffield Neepsend  
05/09/1929 Reallocation 5149 MEX Mexborough BRN Barnsley  
11/09/1929 Reallocation 6140 CLK Colwick KEA Keadby  
20/09/1929 Reallocation 6177 IMM Immingham KEA Keadby  
10/10/1929 Reallocation 5138 BRN Barnsley ARD Ardsley  
10/10/1929 Reallocation 6076 ARD Ardsley KEA Keadby  
10/10/1929 Reallocation 5163 ARD Ardsley KEA Keadby  
10/10/1929 Reallocation 5964 ARD Ardsley KEA Keadby  
12/10/1929 Reallocation 5356 ARD Ardsley KEA Keadby  
16/10/1929 Reallocation 6073 ARD Ardsley KEA Keadby  
29/10/1929 Reallocation 5085 KEA Keadby IMM Immingham  
03/12/1929 Reallocation 5143 KEA Keadby DON Doncaster  
03/12/1929 Reallocation 6177 KEA Keadby DON Doncaster  
31/12/1929 Reallocation 6178 KEA Keadby ARD Ardsley  
08/01/1930 Reallocation 5070 BRN Barnsley SHF Sheffield Neepsend  
08/01/1930 Reallocation 5071 SHF Sheffield Neepsend BRN Barnsley  
10/01/1930 Reallocation 5139 KEA Keadby IMM Immingham  
27/01/1930 Reallocation 5143 DON Doncaster BRN Barnsley  
30/01/1930 Reallocation 6054 MEX Mexborough DON Doncaster  
08/02/1930 Reallocation 6054 DON Doncaster MEX Mexborough  
25/02/1930 Reallocation 5070 SHF Sheffield Neepsend RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
22/03/1930 Reallocation 6076 KEA Keadby ARD Ardsley  
01/04/1930 Reallocation 6073 KEA Keadby ARD Ardsley  
07/05/1930 Reallocation 5958 MEX Mexborough LNG Langwith Junction  
02/08/1930 Reallocation 6144 KEA Keadby IMM Immingham  
04/10/1930 Reallocation 6178 ARD Ardsley BFD Bradford Hammerton Street  
12/10/1930 Reallocation 5162 KEA Keadby IMM Immingham  
30/10/1930 Reallocation 5057 KEA Keadby IMM Immingham  
01/11/1930 Reallocation 5063 KEA Keadby IMM Immingham  
12/12/1930 Reallocation 5163 KEA Keadby IMM Immingham  
01/01/1931 Reallocation 6052 MEX Mexborough CLK Colwick  
02/01/1931 Reallocation 5067 MEX Mexborough CLK Colwick  
05/01/1931 Reallocation 5064 MEX Mexborough ANN Annesley  
06/01/1931 Reallocation 6054 MEX Mexborough LNG Langwith Junction  
09/01/1931 Reallocation 6052 CLK Colwick LNG Langwith Junction  
09/01/1931 Reallocation 5067 CLK Colwick ANN Annesley  
02/03/1931 Reallocation 6174 ARD Ardsley BFD Bradford Hammerton Street  
25/03/1931 Reallocation 6140 KEA Keadby IMM Immingham  
10/04/1931 Reallocation 5062 KEA Keadby SHF Sheffield Neepsend  
07/05/1931 Reallocation 6135 LNG Langwith Junction ARD Ardsley  
18/05/1931 Reallocation 5959 LNG Langwith Junction ARD Ardsley  
22/05/1931 Reallocation 5963 ANN Annesley ARD Ardsley  
04/06/1931 Reallocation 6174 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street ARD Ardsley  
20/06/1931 Reallocation 5062 SHF Sheffield Neepsend STV Staveley (G.C.)  
07/11/1931 Reallocation 5956 KEA Keadby IMM Immingham  
25/01/1932 Reallocation 5062 STV Staveley (G.C.) BRN Barnsley  
29/03/1932 Reallocation 5213 STV Staveley (G.C.) BRN Barnsley  
30/03/1932 Reallocation 5212 STV Staveley (G.C.) BRN Barnsley  
08/06/1932 Reallocation 6074 KEA Keadby FRO Frodingham  
11/06/1932 Reallocation 5085 IMM Immingham KEA Keadby  
11/06/1932 Reallocation 5139 IMM Immingham KEA Keadby  
18/06/1932 Reallocation 5085 KEA Keadby FRO Frodingham  
18/06/1932 Reallocation 5139 KEA Keadby FRO Frodingham  
18/06/1932 Reallocation 5140 KEA Keadby FRO Frodingham  
18/06/1932 Reallocation 5147 KEA Keadby FRO Frodingham  
18/06/1932 Reallocation 5150 KEA Keadby FRO Frodingham  
18/06/1932 Reallocation 5151 KEA Keadby FRO Frodingham  
18/06/1932 Reallocation 5153 KEA Keadby FRO Frodingham  
18/06/1932 Reallocation 5039 KEA Keadby FRO Frodingham  
18/06/1932 Reallocation 5356 KEA Keadby FRO Frodingham  
18/06/1932 Reallocation 5164 KEA Keadby FRO Frodingham  
18/06/1932 Reallocation 5964 KEA Keadby FRO Frodingham  
07/04/1933 Reallocation 5056 RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) BRN Barnsley  
17/02/1934 Reallocation 5960 DON Doncaster MEX Mexborough  
17/02/1934 Reallocation 6181 DON Doncaster MEX Mexborough  
20/02/1934 Reallocation 6138 LNG Langwith Junction CLK Colwick  
21/02/1934 Reallocation 6132 LNG Langwith Junction CLK Colwick  
23/02/1934 Reallocation 6137 LNG Langwith Junction CLK Colwick  
23/02/1934 Reallocation 5049 DON Doncaster MEX Mexborough  
28/02/1934 Reallocation 5152 LNG Langwith Junction ARD Ardsley  
23/04/1934 Reallocation 5135 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street ARD Ardsley  
28/04/1934 Reallocation 5058 RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) BRN Barnsley  
18/08/1934 Condemned 5139 FRO Frodingham   COND  
13/11/1934 Reallocation 5965 DON Doncaster ARD Ardsley  
21/11/1934 Reallocation 6177 DON Doncaster BFD Bradford Hammerton Street  
05/12/1934 Condemned 6138 CLK Colwick   COND  
1935 Reallocation 5161 STV Staveley (G.C.) BRN Barnsley  
07/10/1935 Reallocation 6132 CLK Colwick ARD Ardsley  
02/11/1935 Reallocation 6137 CLK Colwick ARD Ardsley  
10/12/1935 Condemned 6073 ARD Ardsley   COND  
28/12/1935 Reallocation 5064 ANN Annesley ARD Ardsley  
20/01/1936 Condemned 6074 FRO Frodingham   COND  
31/01/1936 Reallocation 5961 DON Doncaster FRO Frodingham  
14/04/1936 Reallocation 5067 ANN Annesley LNG Langwith Junction  
15/04/1936 Reallocation 6179 ANN Annesley LNG Langwith Junction  
28/04/1936 Condemned 5957 LNG Langwith Junction   COND  
02/05/1936 Condemned 5960 MEX Mexborough   COND  
16/05/1936 Condemned 6143 ARD Ardsley   COND  
05/06/1936 Condemned 6174 ARD Ardsley   COND  
22/06/1936 Condemned 5063 IMM Immingham   COND  
26/06/1936 Reallocation 5048 DON Doncaster ARD Ardsley  
21/08/1936 Reallocation 5148 DON Doncaster ARD Ardsley  
21/09/1936 Condemned 5145 MEX Mexborough   COND  
03/10/1936 Condemned 5963 ARD Ardsley   COND  
21/10/1936 Reallocation 5146 MEX Mexborough ARD Ardsley  
11/1936 Reallocation 5044 MEX Mexborough LNG Langwith Junction  
16/11/1936 Reallocation 5049 MEX Mexborough LNG Langwith Junction  
19/11/1936 Reallocation 6175 MEX Mexborough ARD Ardsley  
24/11/1936 Reallocation 6053 MEX Mexborough LNG Langwith Junction  
04/12/1936 Reallocation 6181 MEX Mexborough LNG Langwith Junction  
05/03/1937 Condemned 5958 LNG Langwith Junction   COND  
09/03/1937 Reallocation 6181 LNG Langwith Junction ARD Ardsley  
10/04/1937 Condemned 5086 STV Staveley (G.C.)   COND  
06/05/1937 Reallocation 5049 LNG Langwith Junction MEX Mexborough  
07/05/1937 Reallocation 6180 LNG Langwith Junction MEX Mexborough  
08/05/1937 Condemned 5062 BRN Barnsley   COND  
08/05/1937 Condemned 5356 FRO Frodingham   COND  
22/05/1937 Condemned 6142 LNG Langwith Junction   COND  
05/06/1937 Reallocation 6077 LNG Langwith Junction MEX Mexborough  
10/06/1937 Condemned 5135 ARD Ardsley   COND  
11/10/1937 Reallocation 6053 LNG Langwith Junction BRN Barnsley  
10/11/1937 Reallocation 5048 ARD Ardsley BRN Barnsley  
17/11/1937 Condemned 5091 BRN Barnsley   COND  
27/11/1937 Condemned 5140 FRO Frodingham   COND  
22/12/1937 Condemned 5401 MEX Mexborough   COND  
07/01/1938 Condemned 6144 IMM Immingham   COND  
08/01/1938 Reallocation 5162 IMM Immingham MEX Mexborough  
12/03/1938 Condemned 5212 BRN Barnsley   COND  
14/05/1938 Condemned 5144 ARD Ardsley   COND  
13/07/1938 Condemned 5213 BRN Barnsley   COND  
30/08/1938 Condemned 5964 FRO Frodingham   COND  
29/10/1938 Condemned 5148 ARD Ardsley   COND  
29/10/1938 Condemned 5965 ARD Ardsley   COND  
07/01/1939 Reallocation 5039 FRO Frodingham BRN Barnsley  
31/01/1939 Condemned 6141 LNG Langwith Junction   COND  
19/02/1939 Reallocation 5164 FRO Frodingham BRN Barnsley  
28/02/1939 Condemned 6053 BRN Barnsley   COND  
28/02/1939 Condemned 6137 ARD Ardsley   COND  
06/03/1939 Condemned 5150 FRO Frodingham   COND  
16/03/1939 Condemned 6181 ARD Ardsley   COND  
04/05/1939 Reallocation 5164 BRN Barnsley ARD Ardsley  
16/05/1939 Condemned 5151 FRO Frodingham   COND  
16/05/1939 Condemned 6182 ARD Ardsley   COND  
07/06/1939 Condemned 5071 BRN Barnsley   COND  
04/07/1939 Condemned 5956 IMM Immingham   COND  
15/08/1939 Condemned 6178 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street   COND  
22/08/1939 Reallocation 5961 FRO Frodingham MEX Mexborough  
27/08/1939 Reallocation 5147 FRO Frodingham BFD Bradford Hammerton Street  
13/09/1939 Reallocation 5085 FRO Frodingham IMM Immingham  
17/11/1939 Condemned 5143 BRN Barnsley   COND  
17/11/1939 Condemned 5049 MEX Mexborough   COND  
07/12/1939 Reallocation 5039 BRN Barnsley MEX Mexborough  
09/12/1939 Condemned 5149 BRN Barnsley   COND  
06/01/1940 Condemned 6075 ARD Ardsley   COND  
06/12/1940 Reallocation 5152 ARD Ardsley BRN Barnsley  
02/02/1941 Reallocation 6177 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street ARD Ardsley  
04/10/1941 Reallocation 6140 IMM Immingham CLK Colwick  
05/10/1941 Reallocation 6140 CLK Colwick LNG Langwith Junction  
16/10/1941 Reallocation 6140 LNG Langwith Junction IMM Immingham  
02/12/1941 Reallocation 5147 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street ARD Ardsley  
03/05/1942 Reallocation 5163 IMM Immingham LIN Lincoln  
07/05/1942 Reallocation 6140 IMM Immingham LIN Lincoln  
19/07/1943 Condemned 6175 ARD Ardsley   COND  
03/08/1943 Reallocation 6052 LNG Langwith Junction RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
03/08/1943 Reallocation 6054 LNG Langwith Junction RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
03/08/1943 Reallocation 5067 LNG Langwith Junction RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
03/08/1943 Reallocation 6133 LNG Langwith Junction RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
03/08/1943 Reallocation 6134 LNG Langwith Junction RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
03/08/1943 Reallocation 6136 LNG Langwith Junction RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
03/08/1943 Reallocation 5044 LNG Langwith Junction RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
03/08/1943 Reallocation 6176 LNG Langwith Junction RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
03/08/1943 Reallocation 6179 LNG Langwith Junction RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
09/08/1943 Reallocation 5057 IMM Immingham RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
09/08/1943 Reallocation 5085 IMM Immingham RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
09/08/1943 Reallocation 5153 FRO Frodingham BRN Barnsley  
31/08/1943 Reallocation 5092 STV Staveley (G.C.) BRN Barnsley  
05/09/1943 Reallocation 5962 STV Staveley (G.C.) BRN Barnsley  
12/12/1943 Reallocation 5057 RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) NWE New England  
12/12/1943 Reallocation 6134 RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) NWE New England  
12/12/1943 Reallocation 6136 RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) NWE New England  
12/12/1943 Reallocation 6140 LIN Lincoln RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
12/12/1943 Reallocation 5163 LIN Lincoln NWE New England  
12/12/1943 Reallocation 6176 RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) NWE New England  
12/12/1943 Reallocation 6179 RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) NWE New England  
27/08/1944 Reallocation 5057 NWE New England NWE New England  
27/08/1944 Reallocation 6134 NWE New England NWE New England  
27/08/1944 Reallocation 6136 NWE New England NWE New England  
27/08/1944 Reallocation 5163 NWE New England NWE New England  
27/08/1944 Reallocation 6176 NWE New England NWE New England  
27/08/1944 Reallocation 6179 NWE New England NWE New England  
21/09/1944 Reallocation 5142 BRN Barnsley LNG Langwith Junction  
22/09/1944 Reallocation 5092 BRN Barnsley LNG Langwith Junction  
23/09/1944 Reallocation 5137 BRN Barnsley LNG Langwith Junction  
23/09/1944 Reallocation 5962 BRN Barnsley LNG Langwith Junction  
27/05/1945 Reallocation 6140 RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) NWE New England  
28/10/1945 Reallocation 6134 NWE New England RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
28/10/1945 Reallocation 6136 NWE New England LNG Langwith Junction  
28/10/1945 Reallocation 6140 NWE New England RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
28/10/1945 Reallocation 5163 NWE New England LNG Langwith Junction  
28/10/1945 Reallocation 6176 NWE New England RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
01/11/1945 Reallocation 5057 NWE New England LNG Langwith Junction  
07/04/1946 Reallocation 5057 LNG Langwith Junction BRN Barnsley  
07/04/1946 Reallocation 5092 LNG Langwith Junction BRN Barnsley  
07/04/1946 Reallocation 3214 LNG Langwith Junction BRN Barnsley  
07/04/1946 Reallocation 3216 LNG Langwith Junction BRN Barnsley  
07/04/1946 Reallocation 3235 LNG Langwith Junction BRN Barnsley  
07/04/1946 Reallocation 5962 LNG Langwith Junction BRN Barnsley  
14/04/1946 Reallocation 6136 LNG Langwith Junction BRN Barnsley  
30/06/1946 Reallocation 3217 ARD Ardsley BFD Bradford Hammerton Street  
01/09/1946 Reallocation 6134 RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) GRA Grantham  
28/09/1946 Reallocation 3201 RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) GRA Grantham  
28/09/1946 Reallocation 5065 RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) GRA Grantham  
28/09/1946 Reallocation 5067 RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) GRA Grantham  
28/09/1946 Reallocation 6140 RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) GRA Grantham  
13/10/1946 Reallocation 6176 RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) GRA Grantham  
27/10/1946 Reallocation 3203 BRN Barnsley LNG Langwith Junction  
27/10/1946 Reallocation 3204 BRN Barnsley LNG Langwith Junction  
27/10/1946 Reallocation 3216 BRN Barnsley LNG Langwith Junction  
27/10/1946 Reallocation 3220 BRN Barnsley LNG Langwith Junction  
27/10/1946 Reallocation 6136 BRN Barnsley LNG Langwith Junction  
27/10/1946 Reallocation 3233 BRN Barnsley LNG Langwith Junction  
27/10/1946 Reallocation 3235 BRN Barnsley LNG Langwith Junction  
27/10/1946 Reallocation 5962 BRN Barnsley LNG Langwith Junction  
23/02/1947 Reallocation 3229 MEX Mexborough GRA Grantham  
23/02/1947 Reallocation 3234 MEX Mexborough GRA Grantham  
23/02/1947 Reallocation 3243 MEX Mexborough GRA Grantham  
22/04/1947 Reallocation 3225 GRA Grantham ARD Ardsley  
05/09/1947 Reallocation 3216 LNG Langwith Junction BRN Barnsley  
05/10/1947 Reallocation 3200 RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) ARD Ardsley  
05/10/1947 Reallocation 3203 LNG Langwith Junction BRN Barnsley  
05/10/1947 Reallocation 3204 LNG Langwith Junction BRN Barnsley  
05/10/1947 Reallocation 3210 RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) ARD Ardsley  
05/10/1947 Reallocation 3220 LNG Langwith Junction BRN Barnsley  
05/10/1947 Reallocation 3224 RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) ARD Ardsley  
05/10/1947 Reallocation 3227 LNG Langwith Junction BRN Barnsley  
05/10/1947 Reallocation 3233 LNG Langwith Junction BRN Barnsley  
05/10/1947 Reallocation 3235 LNG Langwith Junction BRN Barnsley  
05/10/1947 Reallocation 3238 LNG Langwith Junction BRN Barnsley  
13/02/1949 Reallocation 3201 GRA Grantham BRN Barnsley  
13/02/1949 Reallocation 63204 BRN Barnsley GRA Grantham  
26/02/1949 Condemned 3206 GRA Grantham   COND  
26/02/1949 Condemned 3224 ARD Ardsley   COND  
06/03/1949 Reallocation 63202 BRN Barnsley GRA Grantham  
06/03/1949 Reallocation 3229 GRA Grantham BRN Barnsley  
16/05/1949 Condemned 3214 BRN Barnsley   COND  
23/05/1949 Condemned 3212 BRN Barnsley   COND  
15/08/1949 Condemned 3228 GRA Grantham   COND  
05/09/1949 Condemned 63200 ARD Ardsley   COND  
05/09/1949 Condemned 63216 BRN Barnsley   COND  
10/10/1949 Condemned 3210 ARD Ardsley   COND  
26/12/1949 Condemned 3219 BRN Barnsley   COND  
06/02/1950 Condemned 63233 BRN Barnsley   COND  
06/02/1950 Condemned 3238 BRN Barnsley   COND  
20/03/1950 Condemned 3231 ARD Ardsley   COND  
17/04/1950 Condemned 3241 ARD Ardsley   COND  
04/06/1950 Reallocation 63202 GRA Grantham 37A Ardsley  
04/06/1950 Reallocation 63217 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 37A Ardsley  
04/06/1950 Reallocation 63234 GRA Grantham 37A Ardsley  
04/06/1950 Reallocation 63240 GRA Grantham 37A Ardsley  
05/06/1950 Condemned 63232 ARD Ardsley   COND  
11/06/1950 Reallocation 63204 GRA Grantham 37A Ardsley  
11/06/1950 Reallocation 63207 GRA Grantham 37A Ardsley  
11/06/1950 Reallocation 63243 GRA Grantham 37A Ardsley  
19/06/1950 Condemned 3213 ARD Ardsley   COND  
08/1950 Reallocation 63227 BRN Barnsley 37A Ardsley  
07/08/1950 Condemned 63207 37A Ardsley   COND  
16/10/1950 Condemned 3226 ARD Ardsley   COND  
06/11/1950 Condemned 3203 BRN Barnsley   COND  
04/12/1950 Condemned 3229 BRN Barnsley   COND  
26/12/1950 Condemned 3205 ARD Ardsley   COND  
26/12/1950 Condemned 3221 ARD Ardsley   COND  
22/01/1951 Condemned 63201 BRN Barnsley   COND  
05/03/1951 Condemned 63234 37A Ardsley   COND  
14/03/1951 Condemned 63217 37A Ardsley   COND  
14/03/1951 Condemned 63220 BRN Barnsley   COND  
07/05/1951 Condemned 3235 BRN Barnsley   COND  
26/05/1951 Condemned 63227 37A Ardsley   COND  
26/05/1951 Condemned 63236 ARD Ardsley   COND  
11/06/1951 Condemned 63223 ARD Ardsley   COND  
13/06/1951 Condemned 63240 37A Ardsley   COND  
25/06/1951 Condemned 63204 37A Ardsley   COND  
25/09/1951 Condemned 63202 37A Ardsley   COND  
25/09/1951 Condemned 63225 ARD Ardsley   COND  
15/10/1951 Condemned 63243 37A Ardsley   COND