Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 103 Today
» 832 Yesterday
» 2796 Week
» 23778 Month
» 165732 Year
» 1050113 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NER/LNER Worsdell "Q5" Class 0-8-0


Class NER LNER (1946) BR (Tmp) BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
Q5/1 2116 3250   63250 08/1901 AFP
TDK
YK
MAL
WHL
W
Annfield Plain
Tyne Dock
York (North)
Malton
West Hartlepool
Withdrawn
08/1901
24/06/1937
23/06/1939
20/05/1940
28/03/1943
26/06/1948
26/06/1948
Q5/1 2117 3251   63251 09/1901 NPT
BOR
W
Newport (Teeside)
Borough Gardens
Withdrawn
09/1901
28/03/1943
20/12/1950
20/12/1950
Q5/1 2118 3252   63252 10/1901 SHI
KBY
DAR
KBY
DAR
BLA
HAV
W
Shildon
Kirkby Stephen
Darlington
Kirkby Stephen
Darlington
Blaydon
Haverton Hill
Withdrawn
10/1901
06/01/1931
02/09/1940
14/11/1940
30/03/1942
28/03/1943
27/07/1947
07/02/1948
07/02/1948
Q5/1 2119 3253   63253 10/1901 SHI
NPT
MID
WHL
W
Shildon
Newport (Teeside)
Middlesbrough
West Hartlepool
Withdrawn
10/1901
07/01/1935
06/02/1937
28/03/1943
22/11/1948
22/11/1948
Q5/1 2120 3254   63254 10/1901 NPT
MID
NPT
BOR
W
Newport (Teeside)
Middlesbrough
Newport (Teeside)
Borough Gardens
Withdrawn
10/1901
06/02/1937
07/11/1938
28/03/1943
11/06/1948
11/06/1948
Q5/1 2121 3255   63255 10/1901 NPT
SHI
NBH
BLA
DAR
NEV
SEL
W
Newport (Teeside)
Shildon
Blyth (North)
Blaydon
Darlington
Neville Hill
Selby
Withdrawn
10/1901
09/01/1926
27/01/1927
28/03/1943
05/10/1947
29/08/1948
06/02/1949
03/11/1949
03/11/1949
Q5/1 2122 3256   63256 11/1901 NPT
MEX
DON
MEX
NPT
MID
WHL
BOR
NPT
MID
W
Newport (Teeside)
Mexborough
Doncaster
Mexborough
Newport (Teeside)
Middlesbrough
West Hartlepool
Borough Gardens
Newport (Teeside)
Middlesbrough
Withdrawn
11/1901
15/12/1933
19/02/1934
05/12/1936
08/05/1937
07/11/1938
28/03/1943
27/06/1948
06/02/1949
22/01/1950
12/06/1950
12/06/1950
Q5/1 2123 3257   63257 12/1901 NPT
BOR
W
Newport (Teeside)
Borough Gardens
Withdrawn
12/1901
28/03/1943
27/11/1950
27/11/1950
Q5/1 2124 3258     12/1901 AFP
TDK
MID
WHL
W
Annfield Plain
Tyne Dock
Middlesbrough
West Hartlepool
Withdrawn
12/1901
24/06/1937
29/03/1938
28/03/1943
26/04/1947
26/04/1947
Q5/1 2125 3259   63259 12/1901 SHI
DAR
BLA
BOR
W
Shildon
Darlington
Blaydon
Borough Gardens
Withdrawn
12/1901
07/01/1935
28/03/1943
20/07/1947
09/05/1951
09/05/1951
Q5/1 130 3260 3260 63260 03/1902 HLD
HAV
BLA
MID
W
Hull Dairycoates
Haverton Hill
Blaydon
Middlesbrough
Withdrawn
03/1902
18/06/1931
23/07/1945
20/07/1947
21/06/1950
21/06/1950
Q5/1 527 3261 3261 63261 03/1902 NPT
TDK
BOR
W
Newport (Teeside)
Tyne Dock
Borough Gardens
Withdrawn
03/1902
28/03/1943
13/04/1947
31/10/1950
31/10/1950
Q5/1 1002 3262   63262 03/1902 HLD
HLS
BLA
NBH
BLA
SEL
W
Hull Dairycoates
Hull Springhead
Blaydon
Blyth (North)
Blaydon
Selby
Withdrawn
03/1902
26/08/1924
26/05/1927
09/10/1934
28/03/1943
20/07/1947
22/08/1950
22/08/1950
Q5/2 1320 3263   63263 03/1902 NPT
MID
W
Newport (Teeside)
Middlesbrough
Withdrawn
03/1902
07/11/1938
01/11/1948
01/11/1948
Q5/1 1700 3264   63264 04/1902 NPT
HAV
TDK
BOR
W
Newport (Teeside)
Haverton Hill
Tyne Dock
Borough Gardens
Withdrawn
04/1902
05/05/1931
28/03/1943
13/04/1947
26/06/1948
26/06/1948
Q5/1 1704 3265     04/1902 NPT
MID
NPT
W
Newport (Teeside)
Middlesbrough
Newport (Teeside)
Withdrawn
04/1902
06/02/1937
22/09/1944
26/04/1947
26/04/1947
Q5/1 1708 3266     05/1902 SBK
NPT
MID
NPT
MID
W
Starbeck
Newport (Teeside)
Middlesbrough
Newport (Teeside)
Middlesbrough
Withdrawn
05/1902
09/04/1931
05/05/1931
07/11/1938
05/06/1939
22/11/1947
22/11/1947
Q5/1 1709 3267   63267 05/1902 BOR
DON
BOR
HTN
NBH
HTN
DAR
TDK
BOR
W
Borough Gardens
Doncaster
Borough Gardens
Heaton
Blyth (North)
Heaton
Darlington
Tyne Dock
Borough Gardens
Withdrawn
05/1902
13/01/1926
27/05/1929
14/11/1930
12/07/1934
28/03/1943
04/11/1944
12/05/1946
13/04/1947
06/06/1951
06/06/1951
Q5/1 1717 3268   63268 06/1902 SBK
NPT
MID
W
Starbeck
Newport (Teeside)
Middlesbrough
Withdrawn
06/1902
09/04/1931
05/05/1931
07/02/1948
07/02/1948
Q5/1 1729 3269     06/1902 SKN
HAV
MID
W
Stockton
Haverton Hill
Middlesbrough
Withdrawn
06/1902
15/12/1930
27/05/1937
19/07/1947
19/07/1947
Q5/1 1682 3270   63270 12/1902 HLD
HAV
20D
50F
50A
W
Hull Dairycoates
Haverton Hill
Normanton
Malton
York (North)
Withdrawn
12/1902
19/03/1928
14/11/1948
14/01/1951
11/03/1951
10/08/1951
10/08/1951
Q5/1 1684 3271   63271 12/1902 NPT
BOR
W
Newport (Teeside)
Borough Gardens
Withdrawn
12/1902
28/03/1943
22/11/1950
22/11/1950
Q5/1 1685 3272   63272 12/1902 NPT
DAR
FER
DAR
BLA
CUD
MID
W
Newport (Teeside)
Darlington
Ferryhill (Co. Durham)
Darlington
Blaydon
Cudworth
Middlesbrough
Withdrawn
12/1902
21/07/1932
18/01/1936
07/11/1938
28/03/1943
20/07/1947
13/02/1949
03/07/1950
03/07/1950
Q5/1 1694 3273   63273 02/1903 HLD
HAV
NPT
MID
NPT
MID
W
Hull Dairycoates
Haverton Hill
Newport (Teeside)
Middlesbrough
Newport (Teeside)
Middlesbrough
Withdrawn
02/1903
19/03/1928
25/01/1935
06/02/1937
22/09/1944
02/11/1947
28/03/1949
28/03/1949
Q5/1 83 3274   63274 03/1903 SHI
FER
DAR
NPT
TDK
NPT
W
Shildon
Ferryhill (Co. Durham)
Darlington
Newport (Teeside)
Tyne Dock
Newport (Teeside)
Withdrawn
03/1903
15/08/1932
07/11/1938
15/04/1939
28/03/1943
06/02/1949
18/09/1950
18/09/1950
Q5/1 162 3275   63275 06/1903 HAV
TDK
BOR
HAV
W
Haverton Hill
Tyne Dock
Borough Gardens
Haverton Hill
Withdrawn
06/1903
28/03/1943
13/04/1947
15/02/1948
18/04/1949
18/04/1949
Q5/1 1696 3276   63276 03/1903 SHI
FER
DAR
SEL
NEV
SEL
W
Shildon
Ferryhill (Co. Durham)
Darlington
Selby
Neville Hill
Selby
Withdrawn
03/1903
15/08/1932
07/11/1938
29/06/1939
28/03/1943
23/07/1945
20/02/1950
20/02/1950
Q5/1 410 3277   63277 04/1903 NPT
SHI
DAR
HTN
BLA
DAR
W
Newport (Teeside)
Shildon
Darlington
Heaton
Blaydon
Darlington
Withdrawn
04/1903
09/01/1926
07/01/1935
28/12/1935
27/05/1940
20/07/1947
02/05/1949
02/05/1949
Q5/1 474 3278   63278 04/1903 NPT
DAR
FER
DAR
BLA
DAR
NEV
SEL
W
Newport (Teeside)
Darlington
Ferryhill (Co. Durham)
Darlington
Blaydon
Darlington
Neville Hill
Selby
Withdrawn
04/1903
14/03/1933
07/01/1935
07/11/1938
28/03/1943
27/07/1947
11/07/1948
10/07/1949
30/08/1950
30/08/1950
Q5/1 1186 3279   63279 05/1903 NPT
SHI
FER
DAR
SEL
W
Newport (Teeside)
Shildon
Ferryhill (Co. Durham)
Darlington
Selby
Withdrawn
05/1903
18/11/1931
15/08/1932
07/11/1938
26/06/1939
14/02/1948
14/02/1948
Q5/1 650 3280   63280 06/1903 NPT
SEL
NEV
SEL
W
Newport (Teeside)
Selby
Neville Hill
Selby
Withdrawn
06/1903
12/06/1939
06/02/1949
10/07/1949
25/10/1950
25/10/1950
Q5/1 651 3281 3281 63281 06/1903 EHL
HAV
WHL
NPT
MID
W
East Hartlepool
Haverton Hill
West Hartlepool
Newport (Teeside)
Middlesbrough
Withdrawn
06/1903
10/12/1938
28/03/1943
06/02/1949
01/05/1949
12/06/1950
12/06/1950
Q5/1 1009 3282   63282 06/1903 NPT
BOR
TDK
BOR
MID
W
Newport (Teeside)
Borough Gardens
Tyne Dock
Borough Gardens
Middlesbrough
Withdrawn
06/1903
28/03/1943
19/10/1944
13/04/1947
15/02/1948
11/12/1950
11/12/1950
Q5/1 1731 3283   63283 06/1903 NPT
SKN
NPT
BOR
W
Newport (Teeside)
Stockton
Newport (Teeside)
Borough Gardens
Withdrawn
06/1903
16/10/1939
01/02/1943
28/03/1943
19/12/1950
19/12/1950
Q5/1 1757 3284   63284 06/1903 NPT
BOR
W
Newport (Teeside)
Borough Gardens
Withdrawn
06/1903
28/03/1943
13/06/1951
13/06/1951
Q5/1 715 3285   63285 09/1903 HLD
HLS
TSK
SBK
NEV
DAR
KBY
DAR
BLA
MID
NEV
SEL
W
Hull Dairycoates
Hull Springhead
Thirsk
Starbeck
Neville Hill
Darlington
Kirkby Stephen
Darlington
Blaydon
Middlesbrough
Neville Hill
Selby
Withdrawn
09/1903
30/01/1925
24/11/1927
09/08/1929
27/07/1937
14/12/1937
02/09/1940
21/05/1941
28/03/1943
05/10/1947
13/06/1948
10/07/1949
27/09/1950
27/09/1950
Q5/1 785 3286   63286 09/1903 HLD
HLS
HLD
YK
TDK
AFP
TDK
NPT
BOR
SEL
W
Hull Dairycoates
Hull Springhead
Hull Dairycoates
York (North)
Tyne Dock
Annfield Plain
Tyne Dock
Newport (Teeside)
Borough Gardens
Selby
Withdrawn
09/1903
10/10/1924
30/01/1925
21/02/1927
13/05/1929
14/10/1929
24/06/1937
29/03/1938
28/03/1943
15/02/1948
11/04/1949
11/04/1949
Q5/1 792 3287   63287 10/1903 NPT
BOR
W
Newport (Teeside)
Borough Gardens
Withdrawn
10/1903
28/03/1943
29/11/1950
29/11/1950
Q5/1 1128 3288     10/1903 SKN
HLD
HAV
W
Stockton
Hull Dairycoates
Haverton Hill
Withdrawn
10/1903
07/02/1925
19/03/1928
02/08/1947
02/08/1947
Q5/1 1218 3289   63289 11/1903 NPT
BOR
MID
W
Newport (Teeside)
Borough Gardens
Middlesbrough
Withdrawn
11/1903
28/03/1943
15/02/1948
21/08/1950
21/08/1950
Q5/1 1110 3290   63290 12/1903 NPT
HLS
HLD
YK
TDK
AFP
TDK
MID
NPT
SEL
WHL
NPT
MID
SEL
W
Newport (Teeside)
Hull Springhead
Hull Dairycoates
York (North)
Tyne Dock
Annfield Plain
Tyne Dock
Middlesbrough
Newport (Teeside)
Selby
West Hartlepool
Newport (Teeside)
Middlesbrough
Selby
Withdrawn
12/1903
10/10/1924
03/1926
21/02/1927
13/05/1929
14/10/1929
24/06/1937
29/03/1938
07/11/1938
16/06/1939
14/11/1948
06/02/1949
24/04/1949
15/01/1950
25/07/1950
25/07/1950
Q5/1 1669 3291   63291 12/1903 NPT
MID
NPT
MID
W
Newport (Teeside)
Middlesbrough
Newport (Teeside)
Middlesbrough
Withdrawn
12/1903
06/02/1937
20/09/1944
02/11/1947
12/02/1949
12/02/1949
Q5/1 411 3292   63292 03/1904 HAV
MID
W
Haverton Hill
Middlesbrough
Withdrawn
03/1904
27/05/1937
08/11/1948
08/11/1948
Q5/1 430 3293   63293 02/1904 NPT
SBK
NEV
MEX
DON
MEX
FER
DAR
BLA
WHL
NPT
MID
W
Newport (Teeside)
Starbeck
Neville Hill
Mexborough
Doncaster
Mexborough
Ferryhill (Co. Durham)
Darlington
Blaydon
West Hartlepool
Newport (Teeside)
Middlesbrough
Withdrawn
02/1904
21/01/1931
06/05/1931
12/12/1933
20/02/1934
23/11/1936
13/03/1937
07/11/1938
28/03/1943
20/07/1947
05/12/1948
24/04/1949
09/01/1950
09/01/1950
Q5/1 443 3294   63294 03/1904 HLD
HLS
HLD
TSK
SHI
KBY
SHI
FER
DAR
SEL
WHL
SEL
W
Hull Dairycoates
Hull Springhead
Hull Dairycoates
Thirsk
Shildon
Kirkby Stephen
Shildon
Ferryhill (Co. Durham)
Darlington
Selby
West Hartlepool
Selby
Withdrawn
03/1904
10/10/1924
07/02/1925
12/03/1928
01/08/1929
04/11/1929
06/01/1931
05/10/1933
07/11/1938
02/08/1939
28/03/1943
27/06/1948
03/11/1949
03/11/1949
Q5/1 444 3295   63295 03/1904 SHI
KBY
DAR
KBY
DAR
BLA
MID
W
Shildon
Kirkby Stephen
Darlington
Kirkby Stephen
Darlington
Blaydon
Middlesbrough
Withdrawn
03/1904
18/11/1931
31/12/1936
21/05/1941
17/11/1941
28/03/1943
05/10/1947
22/11/1948
22/11/1948
Q5/1 1111 3296 3296 63296 03/1904 HAV
TDK
BOR
TDK
BOR
W
Haverton Hill
Tyne Dock
Borough Gardens
Tyne Dock
Borough Gardens
Withdrawn
03/1904
28/03/1943
23/12/1943
22/09/1944
14/01/1946
22/08/1949
22/08/1949
Q5/1 1149 3297   63297 04/1904 SCA
YK
SCA
SEL
NPT
MID
NLN
WHL
W
Scarborough
York (North)
Scarborough
Selby
Newport (Teeside)
Middlesbrough
Northallerton
West Hartlepool
Withdrawn
04/1904
15/07/1924
01/10/1924
17/02/1925
13/08/1934
07/11/1938
28/03/1943
19/02/1944
22/02/1949
22/02/1949
Q5/1 1150 3298   63298 04/1904 NPT
BOR
W
Newport (Teeside)
Borough Gardens
Withdrawn
04/1904
28/03/1943
27/02/1948
27/02/1948
Q5/1 1173 3299   63299 05/1904 HLD
SKN
HAV
W
Hull Dairycoates
Stockton
Haverton Hill
Withdrawn
05/1904
07/02/1925
25/06/1930
12/02/1949
12/02/1949
Q5/1 578 3300   63300 06/1907 HLS
SEL
GHD
HTN
BLA
WHL
NEV
NPT
W
Hull Springhead
Selby
Gateshead
Heaton
Blaydon
West Hartlepool
Neville Hill
Newport (Teeside)
Withdrawn
06/1907
22/03/1924
05/02/1938
21/11/1940
22/10/1944
20/07/1947
05/04/1948
30/05/1948
16/05/1949
16/05/1949
Q5/2 660 3301   63301 06/1907 SKN
HAV
W
Stockton
Haverton Hill
Withdrawn
06/1907
25/06/1930
31/12/1948
31/12/1948
Q5/1 939 3302     06/1907 SHI
NPT
BLA
W
Shildon
Newport (Teeside)
Blaydon
Withdrawn
06/1907
07/01/1935
23/07/1945
18/09/1947
18/09/1947
Q5/1 1031 3303   63303 08/1907 NBH
SHI
NPT
SEL
WHL
BOR
W
Blyth (North)
Shildon
Newport (Teeside)
Selby
West Hartlepool
Borough Gardens
Withdrawn
08/1907
05/06/1929
07/01/1935
15/07/1939
28/03/1943
11/07/1948
23/04/1951
23/04/1951
Q5/1 1032 3304     09/1907 HLS
SEL
HLS
SHI
DAR
KBY
DAR
W
Hull Springhead
Selby
Hull Springhead
Shildon
Darlington
Kirkby Stephen
Darlington
Withdrawn
06/09/1922
22/03/1924
18/08/1925
01/02/1927
07/01/1935
31/12/1936
14/11/1940
19/07/1947
19/07/1947
Q5/1 1054 3305   63305 09/1907 NBH
SHI
NPT
MID
W
Blyth (North)
Shildon
Newport (Teeside)
Middlesbrough
Withdrawn
09/1907
05/06/1929
07/01/1935
08/01/1944
16/05/1949
16/05/1949
Q5/2 1062 3306   63306 10/1907 HLD
NPT
BLA
HAV
W
Hull Dairycoates
Newport (Teeside)
Blaydon
Haverton Hill
Withdrawn
10/1907
19/06/1924
28/07/1945
05/10/1947
20/12/1948
20/12/1948
Q5/1 1177 3307   63307 10/1907 HLD
MAR
HLD
NPT
SKN
NPT
SKN
DAR
W
Hull Dairycoates
March
Hull Dairycoates
Newport (Teeside)
Stockton
Newport (Teeside)
Stockton
Darlington
Withdrawn
10/1907
21/10/1931
05/02/1932
20/09/1934
16/10/1939
01/02/1943
20/01/1947
02/11/1947
16/05/1949
16/05/1949
Q5/1 1178 3308   63308 10/1907 NPT
MID
NPT
MID
W
Newport (Teeside)
Middlesbrough
Newport (Teeside)
Middlesbrough
Withdrawn
10/1907
06/02/1937
07/11/1938
03/01/1944
12/02/1949
12/02/1949
Q5/1 1215 3309     11/1907 HLD
MAR
HLD
WHL
EHL
WHL
DAR
SEL
WHL
W
Hull Dairycoates
March
Hull Dairycoates
West Hartlepool
East Hartlepool
West Hartlepool
Darlington
Selby
West Hartlepool
Withdrawn
11/1907
21/10/1931
05/02/1932
13/06/1935
28/03/1938
17/04/1939
13/05/1939
13/07/1939
28/03/1943
07/12/1946
07/12/1946
Q5/1 644 3310   63310 12/1907 NBH
HTN
SEL
W
Blyth (North)
Heaton
Selby
Withdrawn
12/1907
28/03/1943
22/10/1944
11/06/1948
11/06/1948
Q5/1 645 3311 3311 63311 12/1907 HLD
HLS
BOR
GHD
HTN
DAR
MID
DAR
CUD
WHL
NPT
HAV
W
Hull Dairycoates
Hull Springhead
Borough Gardens
Gateshead
Heaton
Darlington
Middlesbrough
Darlington
Cudworth
West Hartlepool
Newport (Teeside)
Haverton Hill
Withdrawn
12/1907
26/08/1924
04/06/1927
05/10/1936
21/11/1940
04/11/1944
28/07/1946
25/08/1946
29/09/1946
14/11/1948
06/02/1949
01/05/1949
29/09/1951
29/09/1951
Q5/1 646 3312   63312 12/1907 SHI
NPT
MID
DAR
SEL
W
Shildon
Newport (Teeside)
Middlesbrough
Darlington
Selby
Withdrawn
12/1907
30/01/1924
21/12/1932
12/06/1934
24/06/1939
22/08/1949
22/08/1949
Q5/1 647 3313   63313 12/1907 SEL
MAL
SEL
W
Selby
Malton
Selby
Withdrawn
12/1907
28/03/1938
29/05/1939
21/11/1949
21/11/1949
Q5/1 648 3314 3314 63314 03/1908 NPT
FER
DAR
AUK
NEV
20D
HAV
W
Newport (Teeside)
Ferryhill (Co. Durham)
Darlington
West Auckland
Neville Hill
Normanton
Haverton Hill
Withdrawn
03/1908
18/07/1932
07/11/1938
17/08/1946
04/01/1948
30/05/1948
14/11/1948
03/09/1951
03/09/1951
Q5/1 652 3315   63315 03/1908 HLD
HLS
HLD
MAR
HLD
NPT
AUK
NEV
W
Hull Dairycoates
Hull Springhead
Hull Dairycoates
March
Hull Dairycoates
Newport (Teeside)
West Auckland
Neville Hill
Withdrawn
03/1908
30/01/1925
14/12/1925
28/00/1931
05/02/1932
20/09/1934
03/03/1941
04/01/1948
25/03/1948
25/03/1948
Q5/1 653 3316   63316 03/1908 SHI
NPT
MID
NPT
MID
W
Shildon
Newport (Teeside)
Middlesbrough
Newport (Teeside)
Middlesbrough
Withdrawn
03/1908
08/02/1924
07/11/1938
22/09/1944
02/11/1947
04/04/1949
04/04/1949
Q5/1 654 3317   63317 04/1908 BOR
SHI
DAR
BLA
NPT
MID
W
Borough Gardens
Shildon
Darlington
Blaydon
Newport (Teeside)
Middlesbrough
Withdrawn
04/1908
27/01/1927
07/01/1935
28/03/1943
20/07/1947
02/11/1947
12/02/1949
12/02/1949
Q5/1 655 3318   63318 05/1908 AFP
BOR
SHI
DAR
BLA
WHL
MID
W
Annfield Plain
Borough Gardens
Shildon
Darlington
Blaydon
West Hartlepool
Middlesbrough
Withdrawn
05/1908
01/1925
09/1925
07/01/1935
28/03/1943
20/07/1947
05/12/1948
27/06/1949
27/06/1949
Q5/1 656 3319   63319 05/1908 HLS
HLD
MAR
HLD
NPT
MID
DAR
SEL
W
Hull Springhead
Hull Dairycoates
March
Hull Dairycoates
Newport (Teeside)
Middlesbrough
Darlington
Selby
Withdrawn
05/1908
24/12/1925
28/10/1931
05/02/1932
20/09/1934
06/02/1937
21/11/1948
20/11/1949
18/04/1951
18/04/1951
Q5/1 642 3320     06/1911 SHI
NPT
SKN
NPT
BOR
W
Shildon
Newport (Teeside)
Stockton
Newport (Teeside)
Borough Gardens
Withdrawn
06/1911
07/01/1935
16/10/1939
01/02/1943
28/03/1943
22/03/1947
22/03/1947
Q5/1 643 3321   63321 06/1911 AFP
TDK
BOR
W
Annfield Plain
Tyne Dock
Borough Gardens
Withdrawn
06/1911
24/06/1937
01/03/1940
06/03/1948
06/03/1948
Q5/2 657 3322   63322 06/1911 SHI
NPT
MID
W
Shildon
Newport (Teeside)
Middlesbrough
Withdrawn
06/1911
07/01/1935
08/01/1944
12/02/1949
12/02/1949
Q5/1 658 3323   63323 1911 SHI
NPT
MID
NPT
MID
W
Shildon
Newport (Teeside)
Middlesbrough
Newport (Teeside)
Middlesbrough
Withdrawn
1911
30/01/1924
29/05/1931
20/09/1944
02/11/1947
08/11/1948
08/11/1948
Q5/1 659 3324     06/1911 NPT
TDK
W
Newport (Teeside)
Tyne Dock
Withdrawn
06/1911
28/03/1943
16/10/1947
16/10/1947
Q5/1 661 3325     07/1911 SEL
NPT
TDK
W
Selby
Newport (Teeside)
Tyne Dock
Withdrawn
07/1911
25/04/1938
28/03/1943
22/03/1947
22/03/1947
Q5/1 669 3326 3326 63326 07/1911 HLD
BLA
HTN
TDK
BOR
TDK
BOR
W
Hull Dairycoates
Blaydon
Heaton
Tyne Dock
Borough Gardens
Tyne Dock
Borough Gardens
Withdrawn
07/1911
24/05/1927
08/06/1937
24/06/1939
01/03/1940
19/10/1944
13/04/1947
06/10/1951
06/10/1951
Q5/1 764 3327   63327 08/1911 HLS
HLD
TDK
YK
WHL
NPT
W
Hull Springhead
Hull Dairycoates
Tyne Dock
York (North)
West Hartlepool
Newport (Teeside)
Withdrawn
08/1911
31/05/1924
15/04/1935
10/02/1938
28/03/1943
07/09/1947
22/11/1948
22/11/1948
Q5/1 767 3328   63328 08/1911 TDK
BOR
HTN
DAR
MID
W
Tyne Dock
Borough Gardens
Heaton
Darlington
Middlesbrough
Withdrawn
08/1911
12/01/1923
14/11/1930
04/11/1944
13/02/1949
13/01/1951
13/01/1951
Q5/1 769 3329     08/1911 EHL
DAR
SEL
W
East Hartlepool
Darlington
Selby
Withdrawn
08/1911
22/04/1939
27/06/1939
21/12/1946
21/12/1946
Q5/1 770 3330   63330 09/1911 NBH
HAV
NPT
SKN
DAR
W
Blyth (North)
Haverton Hill
Newport (Teeside)
Stockton
Darlington
Withdrawn
09/1911
23/04/1931
25/01/1935
20/01/1947
02/11/1947
28/12/1949
28/12/1949
Q5/1 771 3331   63331 09/1911 HLD
MAR
HLD
NPT
MID
BLA
HAV
W
Hull Dairycoates
March
Hull Dairycoates
Newport (Teeside)
Middlesbrough
Blaydon
Haverton Hill
Withdrawn
09/1911
22/10/1931
05/02/1932
20/09/1934
08/01/1944
23/07/1945
05/10/1947
12/02/1949
12/02/1949
Q5/1 772 3332   63332 09/1911 SHI
NPT
HAV
TDK
CUD
MID
W
Shildon
Newport (Teeside)
Haverton Hill
Tyne Dock
Cudworth
Middlesbrough
Withdrawn
09/1911
30/01/1924
05/05/1931
28/03/1943
29/09/1946
13/02/1949
22/03/1949
22/03/1949
Q5/1 773 3333   63333 09/1911 HLD
MEX
DON
MEX
FER
DAR
MID
W
Hull Dairycoates
Mexborough
Doncaster
Mexborough
Ferryhill (Co. Durham)
Darlington
Middlesbrough
Withdrawn
09/1911
15/12/1933
19/02/1934
22/11/1936
01/04/1937
07/11/1938
29/07/1939
21/12/1950
21/12/1950
Q5/1 774 3334   63334 10/1911 SHI
DAR
W
Shildon
Darlington
Withdrawn
10/1911
07/01/1935
16/05/1949
16/05/1949
Q5/1 781 3335   63335 10/1911 SHI
DAR
W
Shildon
Darlington
Withdrawn
10/1911
20/03/1935
29/08/1949
29/08/1949
Q5/1 783 3336   63336 10/1911 EHL
HAV
WHL
SEL
W
East Hartlepool
Haverton Hill
West Hartlepool
Selby
Withdrawn
10/1911
10/12/1938
28/03/1943
14/11/1948
16/10/1950
16/10/1950
Q5/1 789 3337     11/1911 NPT
MID
DAR
W
Newport (Teeside)
Middlesbrough
Darlington
Withdrawn
11/1911
07/11/1938
19/08/1939
02/08/1947
02/08/1947
Q5/1 793 3338   63338 11/1911 NBH
NPT
W
Blyth (North)
Newport (Teeside)
Withdrawn
11/1911
23/03/1938
01/10/1949
01/10/1949
Q5/1 794 3339   63339 11/1911 NPT
MID
NPT
MID
W
Newport (Teeside)
Middlesbrough
Newport (Teeside)
Middlesbrough
Withdrawn
11/1911
06/02/1937
07/11/1938
08/01/1944
07/02/1948
07/02/1948