Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 301 Today
» 854 Yesterday
» 5270 Week
» 17783 Month
» 105975 Year
» 990356 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NER/LNER Worsdell "Q5" Class 0-8-0


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
08/1901 To Service 2116   NEW AFP Annfield Plain  
09/1901 To Service 2117   NEW NPT Newport (Teeside)  
10/1901 To Service 2118   NEW SHI Shildon  
10/1901 To Service 2119   NEW SHI Shildon  
10/1901 To Service 2120   NEW NPT Newport (Teeside)  
10/1901 To Service 2121   NEW NPT Newport (Teeside)  
11/1901 To Service 2122   NEW NPT Newport (Teeside)  
12/1901 To Service 2123   NEW NPT Newport (Teeside)  
12/1901 To Service 2124   NEW AFP Annfield Plain  
12/1901 To Service 2125   NEW SHI Shildon  
03/1902 To Service 130   NEW HLD Hull Dairycoates  
03/1902 To Service 527   NEW NPT Newport (Teeside)  
03/1902 To Service 1002   NEW HLD Hull Dairycoates  
03/1902 To Service 1320   NEW NPT Newport (Teeside)  
04/1902 To Service 1700   NEW NPT Newport (Teeside)  
04/1902 To Service 1704   NEW NPT Newport (Teeside)  
05/1902 To Service 1708   NEW SBK Starbeck  
05/1902 To Service 1709   NEW BOR Borough Gardens  
06/1902 To Service 1717   NEW SBK Starbeck  
06/1902 To Service 1729   NEW SKN Stockton  
12/1902 To Service 1682   NEW HLD Hull Dairycoates  
12/1902 To Service 1684   NEW NPT Newport (Teeside)  
12/1902 To Service 1685   NEW NPT Newport (Teeside)  
02/1903 To Service 1694   NEW HLD Hull Dairycoates  
03/1903 To Service 83   NEW SHI Shildon  
03/1903 To Service 1696   NEW SHI Shildon  
04/1903 To Service 410   NEW NPT Newport (Teeside)  
04/1903 To Service 474   NEW NPT Newport (Teeside)  
05/1903 To Service 1186   NEW NPT Newport (Teeside)  
06/1903 To Service 162   NEW HAV Haverton Hill  
06/1903 To Service 650   NEW NPT Newport (Teeside)  
06/1903 To Service 651   NEW EHL East Hartlepool  
06/1903 To Service 1009   NEW NPT Newport (Teeside)  
06/1903 To Service 1731   NEW NPT Newport (Teeside)  
06/1903 To Service 1757   NEW NPT Newport (Teeside)  
09/1903 To Service 715   NEW HLD Hull Dairycoates  
09/1903 To Service 785   NEW HLD Hull Dairycoates  
10/1903 To Service 792   NEW NPT Newport (Teeside)  
10/1903 To Service 1128   NEW SKN Stockton  
11/1903 To Service 1218   NEW NPT Newport (Teeside)  
12/1903 To Service 1110   NEW NPT Newport (Teeside)  
12/1903 To Service 1669   NEW NPT Newport (Teeside)  
02/1904 To Service 430   NEW NPT Newport (Teeside)  
03/1904 To Service 411   NEW HAV Haverton Hill  
03/1904 To Service 443   NEW HLD Hull Dairycoates  
03/1904 To Service 444   NEW SHI Shildon  
03/1904 To Service 1111   NEW HAV Haverton Hill  
04/1904 To Service 1149   NEW SCA Scarborough  
04/1904 To Service 1150   NEW NPT Newport (Teeside)  
05/1904 To Service 1173   NEW HLD Hull Dairycoates  
06/1907 To Service 578   NEW HLS Hull Springhead  
06/1907 To Service 660   NEW SKN Stockton  
06/1907 To Service 939   NEW SHI Shildon  
08/1907 To Service 1031   NEW NBH Blyth (North)  
09/1907 To Service 1054   NEW NBH Blyth (North)  
10/1907 To Service 1062   NEW HLD Hull Dairycoates  
10/1907 To Service 1177   NEW HLD Hull Dairycoates  
10/1907 To Service 1178   NEW NPT Newport (Teeside)  
11/1907 To Service 1215   NEW HLD Hull Dairycoates  
12/1907 To Service 644   NEW NBH Blyth (North)  
12/1907 To Service 645   NEW HLD Hull Dairycoates  
12/1907 To Service 646   NEW SHI Shildon  
12/1907 To Service 647   NEW SEL Selby  
03/1908 To Service 648   NEW NPT Newport (Teeside)  
03/1908 To Service 652   NEW HLD Hull Dairycoates  
03/1908 To Service 653   NEW SHI Shildon  
04/1908 To Service 654   NEW BOR Borough Gardens  
05/1908 To Service 655   NEW AFP Annfield Plain  
05/1908 To Service 656   NEW HLS Hull Springhead  
1911 To Service 658   NEW SHI Shildon  
06/1911 To Service 642   NEW SHI Shildon  
06/1911 To Service 643   NEW AFP Annfield Plain  
06/1911 To Service 657   NEW SHI Shildon  
06/1911 To Service 659   NEW NPT Newport (Teeside)  
07/1911 To Service 661   NEW SEL Selby  
07/1911 To Service 669   NEW HLD Hull Dairycoates  
08/1911 To Service 764   NEW HLS Hull Springhead  
08/1911 To Service 767   NEW TDK Tyne Dock  
08/1911 To Service 769   NEW EHL East Hartlepool  
09/1911 To Service 770   NEW NBH Blyth (North)  
09/1911 To Service 771   NEW HLD Hull Dairycoates  
09/1911 To Service 772   NEW SHI Shildon  
09/1911 To Service 773   NEW HLD Hull Dairycoates  
10/1911 To Service 774   NEW SHI Shildon  
10/1911 To Service 781   NEW SHI Shildon  
10/1911 To Service 783   NEW EHL East Hartlepool  
11/1911 To Service 789   NEW NPT Newport (Teeside)  
11/1911 To Service 793   NEW NBH Blyth (North)  
11/1911 To Service 794   NEW NPT Newport (Teeside)  
06/09/1922 Reallocation 1032     HLS Hull Springhead  
12/01/1923 Reallocation 767 TDK Tyne Dock BOR Borough Gardens  
30/01/1924 Reallocation 646 SHI Shildon NPT Newport (Teeside)  
30/01/1924 Reallocation 658 SHI Shildon NPT Newport (Teeside)  
30/01/1924 Reallocation 772 SHI Shildon NPT Newport (Teeside)  
08/02/1924 Reallocation 653 SHI Shildon NPT Newport (Teeside)  
22/03/1924 Reallocation 578 HLS Hull Springhead SEL Selby  
22/03/1924 Reallocation 1032 HLS Hull Springhead SEL Selby  
31/05/1924 Reallocation 764 HLS Hull Springhead HLD Hull Dairycoates  
19/06/1924 Reallocation 1062 HLD Hull Dairycoates NPT Newport (Teeside)  
15/07/1924 Reallocation 1149 SCA Scarborough YK York (North)  
26/08/1924 Reallocation 1002 HLD Hull Dairycoates HLS Hull Springhead  
26/08/1924 Reallocation 645 HLD Hull Dairycoates HLS Hull Springhead  
01/10/1924 Reallocation 1149 YK York (North) SCA Scarborough  
10/10/1924 Reallocation 785 HLD Hull Dairycoates HLS Hull Springhead  
10/10/1924 Reallocation 1110 NPT Newport (Teeside) HLS Hull Springhead  
10/10/1924 Reallocation 443 HLD Hull Dairycoates HLS Hull Springhead  
01/1925 Reallocation 655 AFP Annfield Plain BOR Borough Gardens  
30/01/1925 Reallocation 715 HLD Hull Dairycoates HLS Hull Springhead  
30/01/1925 Reallocation 785 HLS Hull Springhead HLD Hull Dairycoates  
30/01/1925 Reallocation 652 HLD Hull Dairycoates HLS Hull Springhead  
07/02/1925 Reallocation 1128 SKN Stockton HLD Hull Dairycoates  
07/02/1925 Reallocation 443 HLS Hull Springhead HLD Hull Dairycoates  
07/02/1925 Reallocation 1173 HLD Hull Dairycoates SKN Stockton  
17/02/1925 Reallocation 1149 SCA Scarborough SEL Selby  
18/08/1925 Reallocation 1032 SEL Selby HLS Hull Springhead  
09/1925 Reallocation 655 BOR Borough Gardens SHI Shildon  
14/12/1925 Reallocation 652 HLS Hull Springhead HLD Hull Dairycoates  
24/12/1925 Reallocation 656 HLS Hull Springhead HLD Hull Dairycoates  
09/01/1926 Reallocation 2121 NPT Newport (Teeside) SHI Shildon  
09/01/1926 Reallocation 410 NPT Newport (Teeside) SHI Shildon  
13/01/1926 Reallocation 1709 BOR Borough Gardens DON Doncaster  
03/1926 Reallocation 1110 HLS Hull Springhead HLD Hull Dairycoates  
27/01/1927 Reallocation 2121 SHI Shildon NBH Blyth (North)  
27/01/1927 Reallocation 654 BOR Borough Gardens SHI Shildon  
01/02/1927 Reallocation 1032 HLS Hull Springhead SHI Shildon  
21/02/1927 Reallocation 785 HLD Hull Dairycoates YK York (North)  
21/02/1927 Reallocation 1110 HLD Hull Dairycoates YK York (North)  
24/05/1927 Reallocation 669 HLD Hull Dairycoates BLA Blaydon  
26/05/1927 Reallocation 1002 HLS Hull Springhead BLA Blaydon  
04/06/1927 Reallocation 645 HLS Hull Springhead BOR Borough Gardens  
24/11/1927 Reallocation 715 HLS Hull Springhead TSK Thirsk  
12/03/1928 Reallocation 443 HLD Hull Dairycoates TSK Thirsk  
19/03/1928 Reallocation 1682 HLD Hull Dairycoates HAV Haverton Hill  
19/03/1928 Reallocation 1694 HLD Hull Dairycoates HAV Haverton Hill  
19/03/1928 Reallocation 1128 HLD Hull Dairycoates HAV Haverton Hill  
13/05/1929 Reallocation 785 YK York (North) TDK Tyne Dock  
13/05/1929 Reallocation 1110 YK York (North) TDK Tyne Dock  
27/05/1929 Reallocation 1709 DON Doncaster BOR Borough Gardens  
05/06/1929 Reallocation 1031 NBH Blyth (North) SHI Shildon  
05/06/1929 Reallocation 1054 NBH Blyth (North) SHI Shildon  
01/08/1929 Reallocation 443 TSK Thirsk SHI Shildon  
09/08/1929 Reallocation 715 TSK Thirsk SBK Starbeck  
14/10/1929 Reallocation 785 TDK Tyne Dock AFP Annfield Plain  
14/10/1929 Reallocation 1110 TDK Tyne Dock AFP Annfield Plain  
04/11/1929 Reallocation 443 SHI Shildon KBY Kirkby Stephen  
25/06/1930 Reallocation 1173 SKN Stockton HAV Haverton Hill  
25/06/1930 Reallocation 660 SKN Stockton HAV Haverton Hill  
14/11/1930 Reallocation 1709 BOR Borough Gardens HTN Heaton  
14/11/1930 Reallocation 767 BOR Borough Gardens HTN Heaton  
15/12/1930 Reallocation 1729 SKN Stockton HAV Haverton Hill  
28/00/1931 Reallocation 652 HLD Hull Dairycoates MAR March  
06/01/1931 Reallocation 2118 SHI Shildon KBY Kirkby Stephen  
06/01/1931 Reallocation 443 KBY Kirkby Stephen SHI Shildon  
21/01/1931 Reallocation 430 NPT Newport (Teeside) SBK Starbeck  
09/04/1931 Reallocation 1708 SBK Starbeck NPT Newport (Teeside)  
09/04/1931 Reallocation 1717 SBK Starbeck NPT Newport (Teeside)  
23/04/1931 Reallocation 770 NBH Blyth (North) HAV Haverton Hill  
05/05/1931 Reallocation 1700 NPT Newport (Teeside) HAV Haverton Hill  
05/05/1931 Reallocation 1708 NPT Newport (Teeside) MID Middlesbrough  
05/05/1931 Reallocation 1717 NPT Newport (Teeside) MID Middlesbrough  
05/05/1931 Reallocation 772 NPT Newport (Teeside) HAV Haverton Hill  
06/05/1931 Reallocation 430 SBK Starbeck NEV Neville Hill  
29/05/1931 Reallocation 658 NPT Newport (Teeside) MID Middlesbrough  
18/06/1931 Reallocation 130 HLD Hull Dairycoates HAV Haverton Hill  
21/10/1931 Reallocation 1177 HLD Hull Dairycoates MAR March  
21/10/1931 Reallocation 1215 HLD Hull Dairycoates MAR March  
22/10/1931 Reallocation 771 HLD Hull Dairycoates MAR March  
28/10/1931 Reallocation 656 HLD Hull Dairycoates MAR March  
18/11/1931 Reallocation 1186 NPT Newport (Teeside) SHI Shildon  
18/11/1931 Reallocation 444 SHI Shildon KBY Kirkby Stephen  
05/02/1932 Reallocation 1177 MAR March HLD Hull Dairycoates  
05/02/1932 Reallocation 1215 MAR March HLD Hull Dairycoates  
05/02/1932 Reallocation 652 MAR March HLD Hull Dairycoates  
05/02/1932 Reallocation 656 MAR March HLD Hull Dairycoates  
05/02/1932 Reallocation 771 MAR March HLD Hull Dairycoates  
18/07/1932 Reallocation 648 NPT Newport (Teeside) FER Ferryhill (Co. Durham)  
21/07/1932 Reallocation 1685 NPT Newport (Teeside) DAR Darlington  
15/08/1932 Reallocation 83 SHI Shildon FER Ferryhill (Co. Durham)  
15/08/1932 Reallocation 1696 SHI Shildon FER Ferryhill (Co. Durham)  
15/08/1932 Reallocation 1186 SHI Shildon FER Ferryhill (Co. Durham)  
21/12/1932 Reallocation 646 NPT Newport (Teeside) MID Middlesbrough  
14/03/1933 Reallocation 474 NPT Newport (Teeside) DAR Darlington  
05/10/1933 Reallocation 443 SHI Shildon FER Ferryhill (Co. Durham)  
12/12/1933 Reallocation 430 NEV Neville Hill MEX Mexborough  
15/12/1933 Reallocation 2122 NPT Newport (Teeside) MEX Mexborough  
15/12/1933 Reallocation 773 HLD Hull Dairycoates MEX Mexborough  
19/02/1934 Reallocation 2122 MEX Mexborough DON Doncaster  
19/02/1934 Reallocation 773 MEX Mexborough DON Doncaster  
20/02/1934 Reallocation 430 MEX Mexborough DON Doncaster  
12/06/1934 Reallocation 646 MID Middlesbrough DAR Darlington  
12/07/1934 Reallocation 1709 HTN Heaton NBH Blyth (North)  
13/08/1934 Reallocation 1149 SEL Selby NPT Newport (Teeside)  
20/09/1934 Reallocation 1177 HLD Hull Dairycoates NPT Newport (Teeside)  
20/09/1934 Reallocation 652 HLD Hull Dairycoates NPT Newport (Teeside)  
20/09/1934 Reallocation 656 HLD Hull Dairycoates NPT Newport (Teeside)  
20/09/1934 Reallocation 771 HLD Hull Dairycoates NPT Newport (Teeside)  
09/10/1934 Reallocation 1002 BLA Blaydon NBH Blyth (North)  
07/01/1935 Reallocation 2119 SHI Shildon NPT Newport (Teeside)  
07/01/1935 Reallocation 2125 SHI Shildon DAR Darlington  
07/01/1935 Reallocation 410 SHI Shildon DAR Darlington  
07/01/1935 Reallocation 474 DAR Darlington FER Ferryhill (Co. Durham)  
07/01/1935 Reallocation 939 SHI Shildon NPT Newport (Teeside)  
07/01/1935 Reallocation 1031 SHI Shildon NPT Newport (Teeside)  
07/01/1935 Reallocation 1032 SHI Shildon DAR Darlington  
07/01/1935 Reallocation 1054 SHI Shildon NPT Newport (Teeside)  
07/01/1935 Reallocation 654 SHI Shildon DAR Darlington  
07/01/1935 Reallocation 655 SHI Shildon DAR Darlington  
07/01/1935 Reallocation 642 SHI Shildon NPT Newport (Teeside)  
07/01/1935 Reallocation 657 SHI Shildon NPT Newport (Teeside)  
07/01/1935 Reallocation 774 SHI Shildon DAR Darlington  
25/01/1935 Reallocation 1694 HAV Haverton Hill NPT Newport (Teeside)  
25/01/1935 Reallocation 770 HAV Haverton Hill NPT Newport (Teeside)  
20/03/1935 Reallocation 781 SHI Shildon DAR Darlington  
15/04/1935 Reallocation 764 HLD Hull Dairycoates TDK Tyne Dock  
13/06/1935 Reallocation 1215 HLD Hull Dairycoates WHL West Hartlepool  
28/12/1935 Reallocation 410 DAR Darlington HTN Heaton  
18/01/1936 Reallocation 1685 DAR Darlington FER Ferryhill (Co. Durham)  
05/10/1936 Reallocation 645 BOR Borough Gardens GHD Gateshead  
22/11/1936 Reallocation 773 DON Doncaster MEX Mexborough  
23/11/1936 Reallocation 430 DON Doncaster MEX Mexborough  
05/12/1936 Reallocation 2122 DON Doncaster MEX Mexborough  
31/12/1936 Reallocation 444 KBY Kirkby Stephen DAR Darlington  
31/12/1936 Reallocation 1032 DAR Darlington KBY Kirkby Stephen  
06/02/1937 Reallocation 2119 NPT Newport (Teeside) MID Middlesbrough  
06/02/1937 Reallocation 2120 NPT Newport (Teeside) MID Middlesbrough  
06/02/1937 Reallocation 1704 NPT Newport (Teeside) MID Middlesbrough  
06/02/1937 Reallocation 1694 NPT Newport (Teeside) MID Middlesbrough  
06/02/1937 Reallocation 1669 NPT Newport (Teeside) MID Middlesbrough  
06/02/1937 Reallocation 1178 NPT Newport (Teeside) MID Middlesbrough  
06/02/1937 Reallocation 656 NPT Newport (Teeside) MID Middlesbrough  
06/02/1937 Reallocation 794 NPT Newport (Teeside) MID Middlesbrough  
13/03/1937 Reallocation 430 MEX Mexborough FER Ferryhill (Co. Durham)  
01/04/1937 Reallocation 773 MEX Mexborough FER Ferryhill (Co. Durham)  
08/05/1937 Reallocation 2122 MEX Mexborough NPT Newport (Teeside)  
27/05/1937 Reallocation 1729 HAV Haverton Hill MID Middlesbrough  
27/05/1937 Reallocation 411 HAV Haverton Hill MID Middlesbrough  
08/06/1937 Reallocation 669 BLA Blaydon HTN Heaton  
24/06/1937 Reallocation 2116 AFP Annfield Plain TDK Tyne Dock  
24/06/1937 Reallocation 2124 AFP Annfield Plain TDK Tyne Dock  
24/06/1937 Reallocation 785 AFP Annfield Plain TDK Tyne Dock  
24/06/1937 Reallocation 1110 AFP Annfield Plain TDK Tyne Dock  
24/06/1937 Reallocation 643 AFP Annfield Plain TDK Tyne Dock  
27/07/1937 Reallocation 715 SBK Starbeck NEV Neville Hill  
14/12/1937 Reallocation 715 NEV Neville Hill DAR Darlington  
05/02/1938 Reallocation 578 SEL Selby GHD Gateshead  
10/02/1938 Reallocation 764 TDK Tyne Dock YK York (North)  
23/03/1938 Reallocation 793 NBH Blyth (North) NPT Newport (Teeside)  
28/03/1938 Reallocation 1215 WHL West Hartlepool EHL East Hartlepool  
28/03/1938 Reallocation 647 SEL Selby MAL Malton  
29/03/1938 Reallocation 2124 TDK Tyne Dock MID Middlesbrough  
29/03/1938 Reallocation 785 TDK Tyne Dock NPT Newport (Teeside)  
29/03/1938 Reallocation 1110 TDK Tyne Dock MID Middlesbrough  
25/04/1938 Reallocation 661 SEL Selby NPT Newport (Teeside)  
07/11/1938 Reallocation 2120 MID Middlesbrough NPT Newport (Teeside)  
07/11/1938 Reallocation 2122 NPT Newport (Teeside) MID Middlesbrough  
07/11/1938 Reallocation 1320 NPT Newport (Teeside) MID Middlesbrough  
07/11/1938 Reallocation 1708 MID Middlesbrough NPT Newport (Teeside)  
07/11/1938 Reallocation 1685 FER Ferryhill (Co. Durham) DAR Darlington  
07/11/1938 Reallocation 83 FER Ferryhill (Co. Durham) DAR Darlington  
07/11/1938 Reallocation 1696 FER Ferryhill (Co. Durham) DAR Darlington  
07/11/1938 Reallocation 474 FER Ferryhill (Co. Durham) DAR Darlington  
07/11/1938 Reallocation 1186 FER Ferryhill (Co. Durham) DAR Darlington  
07/11/1938 Reallocation 1110 MID Middlesbrough NPT Newport (Teeside)  
07/11/1938 Reallocation 430 FER Ferryhill (Co. Durham) DAR Darlington  
07/11/1938 Reallocation 443 FER Ferryhill (Co. Durham) DAR Darlington  
07/11/1938 Reallocation 1149 NPT Newport (Teeside) MID Middlesbrough  
07/11/1938 Reallocation 1178 MID Middlesbrough NPT Newport (Teeside)  
07/11/1938 Reallocation 648 FER Ferryhill (Co. Durham) DAR Darlington  
07/11/1938 Reallocation 653 NPT Newport (Teeside) MID Middlesbrough  
07/11/1938 Reallocation 773 FER Ferryhill (Co. Durham) DAR Darlington  
07/11/1938 Reallocation 789 NPT Newport (Teeside) MID Middlesbrough  
07/11/1938 Reallocation 794 MID Middlesbrough NPT Newport (Teeside)  
10/12/1938 Reallocation 651 EHL East Hartlepool HAV Haverton Hill  
10/12/1938 Reallocation 783 EHL East Hartlepool HAV Haverton Hill  
15/04/1939 Reallocation 83 DAR Darlington NPT Newport (Teeside)  
17/04/1939 Reallocation 1215 EHL East Hartlepool WHL West Hartlepool  
22/04/1939 Reallocation 769 EHL East Hartlepool DAR Darlington  
13/05/1939 Reallocation 1215 WHL West Hartlepool DAR Darlington  
29/05/1939 Reallocation 647 MAL Malton SEL Selby  
05/06/1939 Reallocation 1708 NPT Newport (Teeside) MID Middlesbrough  
12/06/1939 Reallocation 650 NPT Newport (Teeside) SEL Selby  
16/06/1939 Reallocation 1110 NPT Newport (Teeside) SEL Selby  
23/06/1939 Reallocation 2116 TDK Tyne Dock YK York (North)  
24/06/1939 Reallocation 646 DAR Darlington SEL Selby  
24/06/1939 Reallocation 669 HTN Heaton TDK Tyne Dock  
26/06/1939 Reallocation 1186 DAR Darlington SEL Selby  
27/06/1939 Reallocation 769 DAR Darlington SEL Selby  
29/06/1939 Reallocation 1696 DAR Darlington SEL Selby  
13/07/1939 Reallocation 1215 DAR Darlington SEL Selby  
15/07/1939 Reallocation 1031 NPT Newport (Teeside) SEL Selby  
29/07/1939 Reallocation 773 DAR Darlington MID Middlesbrough  
02/08/1939 Reallocation 443 DAR Darlington SEL Selby  
19/08/1939 Reallocation 789 MID Middlesbrough DAR Darlington  
16/10/1939 Reallocation 1731 NPT Newport (Teeside) SKN Stockton  
16/10/1939 Reallocation 1177 NPT Newport (Teeside) SKN Stockton  
16/10/1939 Reallocation 642 NPT Newport (Teeside) SKN Stockton  
01/03/1940 Reallocation 643 TDK Tyne Dock BOR Borough Gardens  
01/03/1940 Reallocation 669 TDK Tyne Dock BOR Borough Gardens  
20/05/1940 Reallocation 2116 YK York (North) MAL Malton  
27/05/1940 Reallocation 410 HTN Heaton BLA Blaydon  
02/09/1940 Reallocation 2118 KBY Kirkby Stephen DAR Darlington  
02/09/1940 Reallocation 715 DAR Darlington KBY Kirkby Stephen  
14/11/1940 Reallocation 2118 DAR Darlington KBY Kirkby Stephen  
14/11/1940 Reallocation 1032 KBY Kirkby Stephen DAR Darlington  
21/11/1940 Reallocation 578 GHD Gateshead HTN Heaton  
21/11/1940 Reallocation 645 GHD Gateshead HTN Heaton  
03/03/1941 Reallocation 652 NPT Newport (Teeside) AUK West Auckland  
21/05/1941 Reallocation 715 KBY Kirkby Stephen DAR Darlington  
21/05/1941 Reallocation 444 DAR Darlington KBY Kirkby Stephen  
17/11/1941 Reallocation 444 KBY Kirkby Stephen DAR Darlington  
30/03/1942 Reallocation 2118 KBY Kirkby Stephen DAR Darlington  
01/02/1943 Reallocation 1731 SKN Stockton NPT Newport (Teeside)  
01/02/1943 Reallocation 1177 SKN Stockton NPT Newport (Teeside)  
01/02/1943 Reallocation 642 SKN Stockton NPT Newport (Teeside)  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 2116 MAL Malton WHL West Hartlepool  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 2117 NPT Newport (Teeside) BOR Borough Gardens  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 2118 DAR Darlington BLA Blaydon  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 2119 MID Middlesbrough WHL West Hartlepool  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 2120 NPT Newport (Teeside) BOR Borough Gardens  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 2121 NBH Blyth (North) BLA Blaydon  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 2122 MID Middlesbrough WHL West Hartlepool  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 2123 NPT Newport (Teeside) BOR Borough Gardens  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 2124 MID Middlesbrough WHL West Hartlepool  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 2125 DAR Darlington BLA Blaydon  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 527 NPT Newport (Teeside) TDK Tyne Dock  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 1002 NBH Blyth (North) BLA Blaydon  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 1700 HAV Haverton Hill TDK Tyne Dock  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 1709 NBH Blyth (North) HTN Heaton  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 1684 NPT Newport (Teeside) BOR Borough Gardens  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 1685 DAR Darlington BLA Blaydon  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 83 NPT Newport (Teeside) TDK Tyne Dock  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 162 HAV Haverton Hill TDK Tyne Dock  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 1696 SEL Selby NEV Neville Hill  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 474 DAR Darlington BLA Blaydon  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 651 HAV Haverton Hill WHL West Hartlepool  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 1009 NPT Newport (Teeside) BOR Borough Gardens  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 1731 NPT Newport (Teeside) BOR Borough Gardens  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 1757 NPT Newport (Teeside) BOR Borough Gardens  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 715 DAR Darlington BLA Blaydon  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 785 NPT Newport (Teeside) BOR Borough Gardens  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 792 NPT Newport (Teeside) BOR Borough Gardens  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 1218 NPT Newport (Teeside) BOR Borough Gardens  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 430 DAR Darlington BLA Blaydon  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 443 SEL Selby WHL West Hartlepool  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 444 DAR Darlington BLA Blaydon  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 1111 HAV Haverton Hill TDK Tyne Dock  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 1149 MID Middlesbrough NLN Northallerton  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 1150 NPT Newport (Teeside) BOR Borough Gardens  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 1031 SEL Selby WHL West Hartlepool  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 1215 SEL Selby WHL West Hartlepool  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 644 NBH Blyth (North) HTN Heaton  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 654 DAR Darlington BLA Blaydon  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 655 DAR Darlington BLA Blaydon  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 642 NPT Newport (Teeside) BOR Borough Gardens  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 659 NPT Newport (Teeside) TDK Tyne Dock  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 661 NPT Newport (Teeside) TDK Tyne Dock  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 764 YK York (North) WHL West Hartlepool  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 772 HAV Haverton Hill TDK Tyne Dock  
28/03/1943 Reallocation 783 HAV Haverton Hill WHL West Hartlepool  
23/12/1943 Reallocation 1111 TDK Tyne Dock BOR Borough Gardens  
03/01/1944 Reallocation 1178 NPT Newport (Teeside) MID Middlesbrough  
08/01/1944 Reallocation 1054 NPT Newport (Teeside) MID Middlesbrough  
08/01/1944 Reallocation 657 NPT Newport (Teeside) MID Middlesbrough  
08/01/1944 Reallocation 771 NPT Newport (Teeside) MID Middlesbrough  
08/01/1944 Reallocation 794 NPT Newport (Teeside) MID Middlesbrough  
19/02/1944 Reallocation 1149 NLN Northallerton WHL West Hartlepool  
20/09/1944 Reallocation 1669 MID Middlesbrough NPT Newport (Teeside)  
20/09/1944 Reallocation 658 MID Middlesbrough NPT Newport (Teeside)  
22/09/1944 Reallocation 1704 MID Middlesbrough NPT Newport (Teeside)  
22/09/1944 Reallocation 1694 MID Middlesbrough NPT Newport (Teeside)  
22/09/1944 Reallocation 1111 BOR Borough Gardens TDK Tyne Dock  
22/09/1944 Reallocation 653 MID Middlesbrough NPT Newport (Teeside)  
19/10/1944 Reallocation 1009 BOR Borough Gardens TDK Tyne Dock  
19/10/1944 Reallocation 669 BOR Borough Gardens TDK Tyne Dock  
22/10/1944 Reallocation 578 HTN Heaton BLA Blaydon  
22/10/1944 Reallocation 644 HTN Heaton SEL Selby  
04/11/1944 Reallocation 1709 HTN Heaton DAR Darlington  
04/11/1944 Reallocation 645 HTN Heaton DAR Darlington  
04/11/1944 Reallocation 767 HTN Heaton DAR Darlington  
23/07/1945 Reallocation 130 HAV Haverton Hill BLA Blaydon  
23/07/1945 Reallocation 1696 NEV Neville Hill SEL Selby  
23/07/1945 Reallocation 939 NPT Newport (Teeside) BLA Blaydon  
23/07/1945 Reallocation 771 MID Middlesbrough BLA Blaydon  
28/07/1945 Reallocation 1062 NPT Newport (Teeside) BLA Blaydon  
14/01/1946 Reallocation 1111 TDK Tyne Dock BOR Borough Gardens  
12/05/1946 Reallocation 3267 DAR Darlington TDK Tyne Dock  
28/07/1946 Reallocation 645 DAR Darlington MID Middlesbrough  
17/08/1946 Reallocation 3314 DAR Darlington AUK West Auckland  
25/08/1946 Reallocation 3311 MID Middlesbrough DAR Darlington  
29/09/1946 Reallocation 3311 DAR Darlington CUD Cudworth  
29/09/1946 Reallocation 772 TDK Tyne Dock CUD Cudworth  
07/12/1946 Condemned 3309 WHL West Hartlepool   COND  
21/12/1946 Condemned 3329 SEL Selby   COND  
20/01/1947 Reallocation 3307 NPT Newport (Teeside) SKN Stockton  
20/01/1947 Reallocation 3330 NPT Newport (Teeside) SKN Stockton  
22/03/1947 Condemned 3320 BOR Borough Gardens   COND  
22/03/1947 Condemned 3325 TDK Tyne Dock   COND  
13/04/1947 Reallocation 3261 TDK Tyne Dock BOR Borough Gardens  
13/04/1947 Reallocation 3264 TDK Tyne Dock BOR Borough Gardens  
13/04/1947 Reallocation 3267 TDK Tyne Dock BOR Borough Gardens  
13/04/1947 Reallocation 3275 TDK Tyne Dock BOR Borough Gardens  
13/04/1947 Reallocation 3282 TDK Tyne Dock BOR Borough Gardens  
13/04/1947 Reallocation 3326 TDK Tyne Dock BOR Borough Gardens  
26/04/1947 Condemned 3258 WHL West Hartlepool   COND  
26/04/1947 Condemned 3265 NPT Newport (Teeside)   COND  
19/07/1947 Condemned 3269 MID Middlesbrough   COND  
19/07/1947 Condemned 3304 DAR Darlington   COND  
20/07/1947 Reallocation 3259 BLA Blaydon BOR Borough Gardens  
20/07/1947 Reallocation 3260 BLA Blaydon MID Middlesbrough  
20/07/1947 Reallocation 3262 BLA Blaydon SEL Selby  
20/07/1947 Reallocation 3272 BLA Blaydon CUD Cudworth  
20/07/1947 Reallocation 3277 BLA Blaydon DAR Darlington  
20/07/1947 Reallocation 3293 BLA Blaydon WHL West Hartlepool  
20/07/1947 Reallocation 3300 BLA Blaydon WHL West Hartlepool  
20/07/1947 Reallocation 3317 BLA Blaydon NPT Newport (Teeside)  
20/07/1947 Reallocation 3318 BLA Blaydon WHL West Hartlepool  
27/07/1947 Reallocation 3252 BLA Blaydon HAV Haverton Hill  
27/07/1947 Reallocation 3278 BLA Blaydon DAR Darlington  
02/08/1947 Condemned 3288 HAV Haverton Hill   COND  
02/08/1947 Condemned 3337 DAR Darlington   COND  
07/09/1947 Reallocation 3327 WHL West Hartlepool NPT Newport (Teeside)  
18/09/1947 Condemned 3302 BLA Blaydon   COND  
05/10/1947 Reallocation 3255 BLA Blaydon DAR Darlington  
05/10/1947 Reallocation 3285 BLA Blaydon MID Middlesbrough  
05/10/1947 Reallocation 3295 BLA Blaydon MID Middlesbrough  
05/10/1947 Reallocation 3306 BLA Blaydon HAV Haverton Hill  
05/10/1947 Reallocation 3331 BLA Blaydon HAV Haverton Hill  
16/10/1947 Condemned 3324 TDK Tyne Dock   COND  
02/11/1947 Reallocation 3273 NPT Newport (Teeside) MID Middlesbrough  
02/11/1947 Reallocation 3291 NPT Newport (Teeside) MID Middlesbrough  
02/11/1947 Reallocation 3307 SKN Stockton DAR Darlington  
02/11/1947 Reallocation 3316 NPT Newport (Teeside) MID Middlesbrough  
02/11/1947 Reallocation 3317 NPT Newport (Teeside) MID Middlesbrough  
02/11/1947 Reallocation 3323 NPT Newport (Teeside) MID Middlesbrough  
02/11/1947 Reallocation 3330 SKN Stockton DAR Darlington  
22/11/1947 Condemned 3266 MID Middlesbrough   COND  
04/01/1948 Reallocation 3314 AUK West Auckland NEV Neville Hill  
04/01/1948 Reallocation 3315 AUK West Auckland NEV Neville Hill  
07/02/1948 Condemned 3252 HAV Haverton Hill   COND  
07/02/1948 Condemned 3268 MID Middlesbrough   COND  
07/02/1948 Condemned 3339 MID Middlesbrough   COND  
14/02/1948 Condemned 3279 SEL Selby   COND  
15/02/1948 Reallocation 3275 BOR Borough Gardens HAV Haverton Hill  
15/02/1948 Reallocation 3282 BOR Borough Gardens MID Middlesbrough  
15/02/1948 Reallocation 3286 BOR Borough Gardens SEL Selby  
15/02/1948 Reallocation 3289 BOR Borough Gardens MID Middlesbrough  
27/02/1948 Condemned 3298 BOR Borough Gardens   COND  
06/03/1948 Condemned 3321 BOR Borough Gardens   COND  
25/03/1948 Condemned 3315 NEV Neville Hill   COND  
05/04/1948 Reallocation 3300 WHL West Hartlepool NEV Neville Hill  
30/05/1948 Reallocation 3300 NEV Neville Hill NPT Newport (Teeside)  
30/05/1948 Reallocation 3314 NEV Neville Hill 20D Normanton  
11/06/1948 Condemned 3254 BOR Borough Gardens   COND  
11/06/1948 Condemned 3310 SEL Selby   COND  
13/06/1948 Reallocation 3285 MID Middlesbrough NEV Neville Hill  
26/06/1948 Condemned 3250 WHL West Hartlepool   COND  
26/06/1948 Condemned 3264 BOR Borough Gardens   COND  
27/06/1948 Reallocation 3256 WHL West Hartlepool BOR Borough Gardens  
27/06/1948 Reallocation 3294 WHL West Hartlepool SEL Selby  
11/07/1948 Reallocation 3278 DAR Darlington NEV Neville Hill  
11/07/1948 Reallocation 3303 WHL West Hartlepool BOR Borough Gardens  
29/08/1948 Reallocation 3255 DAR Darlington NEV Neville Hill  
01/11/1948 Condemned 3263 MID Middlesbrough   COND  
08/11/1948 Condemned 3292 MID Middlesbrough   COND  
08/11/1948 Condemned 3323 MID Middlesbrough   COND  
14/11/1948 Reallocation 3270 HAV Haverton Hill 20D Normanton  
14/11/1948 Reallocation 63290 SEL Selby WHL West Hartlepool  
14/11/1948 Reallocation 3311 CUD Cudworth WHL West Hartlepool  
14/11/1948 Reallocation 3314 20D Normanton HAV Haverton Hill  
14/11/1948 Reallocation 3336 WHL West Hartlepool SEL Selby  
21/11/1948 Reallocation 63319 MID Middlesbrough DAR Darlington  
22/11/1948 Condemned 3253 WHL West Hartlepool   COND  
22/11/1948 Condemned 3295 MID Middlesbrough   COND  
22/11/1948 Condemned 3327 NPT Newport (Teeside)   COND  
05/12/1948 Reallocation 3293 WHL West Hartlepool NPT Newport (Teeside)  
05/12/1948 Reallocation 3318 WHL West Hartlepool MID Middlesbrough  
20/12/1948 Condemned 3306 HAV Haverton Hill   COND  
31/12/1948 Condemned 3301 HAV Haverton Hill   COND  
06/02/1949 Reallocation 63255 NEV Neville Hill SEL Selby  
06/02/1949 Reallocation 63256 BOR Borough Gardens NPT Newport (Teeside)  
06/02/1949 Reallocation 63274 TDK Tyne Dock NPT Newport (Teeside)  
06/02/1949 Reallocation 63280 SEL Selby NEV Neville Hill  
06/02/1949 Reallocation 63281 WHL West Hartlepool NPT Newport (Teeside)  
06/02/1949 Reallocation 63290 WHL West Hartlepool NPT Newport (Teeside)  
06/02/1949 Reallocation 63311 WHL West Hartlepool NPT Newport (Teeside)  
12/02/1949 Condemned 63291 MID Middlesbrough   COND  
12/02/1949 Condemned 63299 HAV Haverton Hill   COND  
12/02/1949 Condemned 63308 MID Middlesbrough   COND  
12/02/1949 Condemned 63317 MID Middlesbrough   COND  
12/02/1949 Condemned 63322 MID Middlesbrough   COND  
12/02/1949 Condemned 63331 HAV Haverton Hill   COND  
13/02/1949 Reallocation 63272 CUD Cudworth MID Middlesbrough  
13/02/1949 Reallocation 63328 DAR Darlington MID Middlesbrough  
13/02/1949 Reallocation 63332 CUD Cudworth MID Middlesbrough  
22/02/1949 Condemned 63297 WHL West Hartlepool   COND  
22/03/1949 Condemned 63332 MID Middlesbrough   COND  
28/03/1949 Condemned 63273 MID Middlesbrough   COND  
04/04/1949 Condemned 63316 MID Middlesbrough   COND  
11/04/1949 Condemned 63286 SEL Selby   COND  
18/04/1949 Condemned 63275 HAV Haverton Hill   COND  
24/04/1949 Reallocation 63290 NPT Newport (Teeside) MID Middlesbrough  
24/04/1949 Reallocation 63293 NPT Newport (Teeside) MID Middlesbrough  
01/05/1949 Reallocation 63281 NPT Newport (Teeside) MID Middlesbrough  
01/05/1949 Reallocation 63311 NPT Newport (Teeside) HAV Haverton Hill  
02/05/1949 Condemned 63277 DAR Darlington   COND  
16/05/1949 Condemned 63300 NPT Newport (Teeside)   COND  
16/05/1949 Condemned 63305 MID Middlesbrough   COND  
16/05/1949 Condemned 63307 DAR Darlington   COND  
16/05/1949 Condemned 63334 DAR Darlington   COND  
27/06/1949 Condemned 63318 MID Middlesbrough   COND  
10/07/1949 Reallocation 63278 NEV Neville Hill SEL Selby  
10/07/1949 Reallocation 63280 NEV Neville Hill SEL Selby  
10/07/1949 Reallocation 63285 NEV Neville Hill SEL Selby  
22/08/1949 Condemned 63296 BOR Borough Gardens   COND  
22/08/1949 Condemned 63312 SEL Selby   COND  
29/08/1949 Condemned 63335 DAR Darlington   COND  
01/10/1949 Condemned 63338 NPT Newport (Teeside)   COND  
03/11/1949 Condemned 63255 SEL Selby   COND  
03/11/1949 Condemned 63294 SEL Selby   COND  
20/11/1949 Reallocation 63319 DAR Darlington SEL Selby  
21/11/1949 Condemned 63313 SEL Selby   COND  
28/12/1949 Condemned 63330 DAR Darlington   COND  
09/01/1950 Condemned 63293 MID Middlesbrough   COND  
15/01/1950 Reallocation 63290 MID Middlesbrough SEL Selby  
22/01/1950 Reallocation 63256 NPT Newport (Teeside) MID Middlesbrough  
20/02/1950 Condemned 63276 SEL Selby   COND  
12/06/1950 Condemned 63256 MID Middlesbrough   COND  
12/06/1950 Condemned 63281 MID Middlesbrough   COND  
21/06/1950 Condemned 63260 MID Middlesbrough   COND  
03/07/1950 Condemned 63272 MID Middlesbrough   COND  
25/07/1950 Condemned 63290 SEL Selby   COND  
21/08/1950 Condemned 63289 MID Middlesbrough   COND  
22/08/1950 Condemned 63262 SEL Selby   COND  
30/08/1950 Condemned 63278 SEL Selby   COND  
18/09/1950 Condemned 63274 NPT Newport (Teeside)   COND  
27/09/1950 Condemned 63285 SEL Selby   COND  
16/10/1950 Condemned 63336 SEL Selby   COND  
25/10/1950 Condemned 63280 SEL Selby   COND  
31/10/1950 Condemned 63261 BOR Borough Gardens   COND  
22/11/1950 Condemned 63271 BOR Borough Gardens   COND  
27/11/1950 Condemned 63257 BOR Borough Gardens   COND  
29/11/1950 Condemned 63287 BOR Borough Gardens   COND  
11/12/1950 Condemned 63282 MID Middlesbrough   COND  
19/12/1950 Condemned 63283 BOR Borough Gardens   COND  
20/12/1950 Condemned 63251 BOR Borough Gardens   COND  
21/12/1950 Condemned 63333 MID Middlesbrough   COND  
13/01/1951 Condemned 63328 MID Middlesbrough   COND  
14/01/1951 Reallocation 63270 20D Normanton 50F Malton  
11/03/1951 Reallocation 63270 50F Malton 50A York (North)  
18/04/1951 Condemned 63319 SEL Selby   COND  
23/04/1951 Condemned 63303 BOR Borough Gardens   COND  
09/05/1951 Condemned 63259 BOR Borough Gardens   COND  
06/06/1951 Condemned 63267 BOR Borough Gardens   COND  
13/06/1951 Condemned 63284 BOR Borough Gardens   COND  
10/08/1951 Condemned 63270 50A York (North)   COND  
03/09/1951 Condemned 63314 HAV Haverton Hill   COND  
29/09/1951 Condemned 63311 HAV Haverton Hill   COND  
06/10/1951 Condemned 63326 BOR Borough Gardens   COND