Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 97 Today
» 921 Yesterday
» 4566 Week
» 5456 Month
» 313437 Year
» 1197818 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NER/LNER Raven "Q7" Class 0-8-0


Class NER LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
Q7 901   3460 63460 10/1919 HLD
HAV
SKN
WHL
DAR
TDK
W
Hull Dairycoates
Haverton Hill
Stockton
West Hartlepool
Darlington
Tyne Dock
Withdrawn
10/1919
19/07/1928
05/05/1931
19/03/1937
25/11/1938
28/03/1943
03/12/1962
03/12/1962
Q7 902   3461 63461 10/1919 HLD
TDK
TDK
52C
54B
W
Hull Dairycoates
Tyne Dock (on loan)
Tyne Dock
Blaydon
Tyne Dock
Withdrawn
10/1919
24/04/1926
02/03/1927
17/06/1956
16/06/1957
10/12/1962
10/12/1962
Q7 903   3462 63462 10/1919 TDK
52C
52H
W
Tyne Dock
Blaydon
Tyne Dock
Withdrawn
10/1919
17/06/1956
08/03/1959
03/12/1962
03/12/1962
Q7 904   3463 63463 11/1919 HLD
HAV
SKN
DAR
TDK
52G
52H
W
Hull Dairycoates
Haverton Hill
Stockton
Darlington
Tyne Dock
Sunderland
Tyne Dock
Withdrawn
11/1919
19/07/1928
05/05/1931
18/01/1936
28/03/1943
14/06/1959
13/12/1959
03/12/1962
03/12/1962
Q7 905   3464 63464 11/1919 HLD
HAV
SKN
SEL
TDK
52C
52G
52H
W
Hull Dairycoates
Haverton Hill
Stockton
Selby
Tyne Dock
Blaydon
Sunderland
Tyne Dock
Withdrawn
11/1919
19/07/1928
05/05/1931
13/08/1934
28/03/1943
17/06/1956
25/01/1959
13/12/1959
03/12/1962
03/12/1962
Q7   624 3465 63465 19/03/1924 HLD
DON
HLD
SKN
SEL
TDK
W
Hull Dairycoates
Doncaster
Hull Dairycoates
Stockton
Selby
Tyne Dock
Withdrawn
19/03/1924
22/09/1924
27/02/1925
19/07/1928
27/11/1930
28/03/1943
03/12/1962
03/12/1962
Q7   625 3466 63466 18/03/1924 HLD
SKN
HAV
WHL
DAR
TDK
54A
52H
W
Hull Dairycoates
Stockton
Haverton Hill
West Hartlepool
Darlington
Tyne Dock
Sunderland
Tyne Dock
Withdrawn
18/03/1924
19/07/1928
03/04/1930
06/12/1937
04/11/1938
28/03/1943
23/09/1956
13/12/1959
03/12/1962
03/12/1962
Q7   626 3467 63467 01/04/1924 HLD
SKN
SEL
WHL
NPT
DAR
TDK
54A
52H
W
Hull Dairycoates
Stockton
Selby
West Hartlepool
Newport (Teeside)
Darlington
Tyne Dock
Sunderland
Tyne Dock
Withdrawn
01/04/1924
19/07/1928
27/11/1930
06/09/1941
03/09/1942
14/09/1942
28/03/1943
23/09/1956
20/08/1961
26/11/1962
26/11/1962
Q7   628 3468 63468 03/04/1924 HLD
SKN
SEL
YK
TDK
52C
54B
W
Hull Dairycoates
Stockton
Selby
York (North)
Tyne Dock
Blaydon
Tyne Dock
Withdrawn
03/04/1924
19/07/1928
27/11/1930
03/09/1932
28/03/1943
17/06/1956
16/06/1957
26/11/1962
26/11/1962
Q7   629 3469 63469 08/04/1924 HLD
TDK
TDK
AFP
TDK
52G
52H
W
Hull Dairycoates
Tyne Dock (on loan)
Tyne Dock
Annfield Plain
Tyne Dock
Sunderland
Tyne Dock
Withdrawn
08/04/1924
24/04/1926
02/03/1927
14/10/1929
01/03/1940
25/01/1959
20/08/1961
03/12/1962
03/12/1962
Q7   630 3470 63470 16/04/1924 HLD
SKN
SEL
TDK
52C
54B
W
Hull Dairycoates
Stockton
Selby
Tyne Dock
Blaydon
Tyne Dock
Withdrawn
16/04/1924
24/05/1928
27/11/1930
28/03/1943
17/06/1956
08/06/1958
03/12/1962
03/12/1962
Q7   631 3471 63471 03/05/1924 TDK
BOR
GHD
SEL
TDK
52C
52H
W
Tyne Dock
Borough Gardens
Gateshead
Selby
Tyne Dock
Blaydon
Tyne Dock
Withdrawn
03/05/1924
1927
29/05/1933
10/02/1938
28/03/1943
17/06/1956
08/03/1959
17/12/1962
17/12/1962
Q7   632 3472 63472 30/04/1924 TDK
AFP
TDK
52C
52H
W
Tyne Dock
Annfield Plain
Tyne Dock
Blaydon
Tyne Dock
Withdrawn
30/04/1924
01/1927
14/10/1929
17/06/1956
08/03/1959
03/12/1962
03/12/1962
Q7   633 3473 63473 03/05/1924 TDK
BOR
GHD
YK
YK
TDK
52G
52H
W
Tyne Dock
Borough Gardens
Gateshead
York (North) (on loan)
York (North)
Tyne Dock
Sunderland
Tyne Dock
Withdrawn
03/05/1924
1930
29/05/1933
03/04/1935
19/03/1937
28/03/1943
21/06/1959
13/12/1959
17/12/1962
17/12/1962
Q7   634 3474 63474 08/05/1924 TDK
54A
52H
W
Tyne Dock
Sunderland
Tyne Dock
Withdrawn
08/05/1924
23/09/1956
15/01/1961
17/12/1962
17/12/1962