HBR/LNER Stirling "Q10" Class 0-8-0
HBR | NER | LNER (1924) | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
117 | 3117 | 2498 | 02/1907 | Hull Springhead | 01/10/1931 | Hull Springhead | 24.67 | ||||
118 | 3118 | 2499 | 03/1907 | Hull Springhead | 06/08/1931 | Selby | 24.42 | ||||
119 | 3119 | 2500 | 03/1907 | Hull Springhead | 02/05/1931 | Hull Dairycoates | 24.17 | ||||
120 | 3120 | 2501 | 03/1907 | Hull Springhead | 13/08/1931 | Hull Dairycoates | 24.42 | ||||
121 | 3121 | 2502 | 08/1907 | Hull Springhead | 04/11/1931 | Hull Dairycoates | 24.25 | ||||
122 | 3122 | 2503 | 04/1907 | Hull Springhead | 30/10/1931 | Selby | 24.5 | ||||
123 | 3123 | 2504 | 05/1907 | Hull Springhead | 30/10/1931 | Selby | 24.42 | ||||
124 | 3124 | 2505 | 05/1907 | Hull Springhead | 06/08/1931 | Selby | 24.25 | ||||
125 | 3125 | 2506 | 06/1907 | Hull Springhead | 13/08/1931 | Selby | 24.17 | ||||
126 | 3126 | 2507 | 06/1907 | Hull Springhead | 13/08/1931 | Selby | 24.17 | ||||
127 | 3127 | 2508 | 09/1907 | Hull Springhead | 30/10/1931 | Selby | 24.08 | ||||
128 | 3128 | 2509 | 10/1907 | Hull Springhead | 01/10/1931 | Selby | 24 | ||||
129 | 3129 | 2510 | 10/1907 | Hull Springhead | 06/08/1931 | Hull Dairycoates | 23.83 | ||||
130 | 3130 | 2511 | 10/1907 | Hull Springhead | 01/10/1931 | Hull Dairycoates | 24 | ||||
131 | 3131 | 2512 | 11/1907 | Hull Springhead | 01/10/1931 | Hull Dairycoates | 23.92 |