LNER Gresley "V1" Class 2-6-2T
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
12/1935 | Reallocation | 486 | HTN | Heaton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7600 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7601 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7602 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7603 | PKD | Parkhead | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7604 | PKD | Parkhead | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7605 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7606 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7607 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7608 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7609 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7610 | HAY | Haymarket | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7611 | PKD | Parkhead | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7612 | PKD | Parkhead | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7613 | PKD | Parkhead | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7614 | PKD | Parkhead | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7615 | HAY | Haymarket | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7616 | PKD | Parkhead | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7617 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7618 | STG | Stirling | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7619 | PKD | Parkhead | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7620 | HAY | Haymarket | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7621 | PKD | Parkhead | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7622 | PKD | Parkhead | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7623 | PKD | Parkhead | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7624 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7625 | PKD | Parkhead | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7626 | PKD | Parkhead | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7627 | KPS | Kipps | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7628 | PKD | Parkhead | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7629 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7630 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7631 | PKD | Parkhead | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7632 | PKD | Parkhead | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7633 | PKD | Parkhead | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7635 | HTN | Heaton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7636 | BLA | Blaydon | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7637 | HTN | Heaton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7638 | MID | Middlesbrough | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7639 | MID | Middlesbrough | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7640 | HTN | Heaton | HTN | Heaton | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7641 | HTN | Heaton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7642 | HTN | Heaton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7643 | PKD | Parkhead | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7644 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7645 | NEV | Neville Hill | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7646 | NEV | Neville Hill | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7647 | NEV | Neville Hill | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7648 | PKD | Parkhead | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7649 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7650 | STG | Stirling | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7651 | HTN | Heaton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7652 | HTN | Heaton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7653 | HTN | Heaton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7654 | HTN | Heaton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7655 | PKD | Parkhead | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7656 | NEV | Neville Hill | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7657 | NEV | Neville Hill | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7658 | BLA | Blaydon | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7659 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7660 | KPS | Kipps | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7661 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7662 | PKD | Parkhead | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7663 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7664 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7665 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7666 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7667 | STR | Stratford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7668 | STR | Stratford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7670 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7671 | STR | Stratford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7673 | STR | Stratford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7674 | PKD | Parkhead | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7676 | STR | Stratford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7677 | STR | Stratford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7678 | PKD | Parkhead | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7679 | STR | Stratford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7680 | STR | Stratford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7681 | STR | Stratford | |||
17/04/1948 | Reallocation | 7603 | PKD | Parkhead | EFD | Eastfield | |
05/06/1948 | Reallocation | 7645 | NEV | Neville Hill | HTN | Heaton | |
05/06/1948 | Reallocation | 7646 | NEV | Neville Hill | HTN | Heaton | |
05/06/1948 | Reallocation | 7647 | NEV | Neville Hill | HTN | Heaton | |
05/06/1948 | Reallocation | 7656 | NEV | Neville Hill | GHD | Gateshead | |
31/07/1948 | Reallocation | 67677 | STR | Stratford | PKS | Parkeston Quay | |
14/08/1948 | Reallocation | 67677 | PKS | Parkeston Quay | STR | Stratford | |
21/08/1948 | Reallocation | 67665 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | PKD | Parkhead | |
28/08/1948 | Reallocation | 67677 | STR | Stratford | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |
11/09/1948 | Reallocation | 67665 | PKD | Parkhead | KPS | Kipps | |
23/10/1948 | Reallocation | 7673 | STR | Stratford | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |
13/11/1948 | Reallocation | 7656 | GHD | Gateshead | BLA | Blaydon | |
18/12/1948 | Reallocation | 7644 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | EFD | Eastfield | |
25/12/1948 | Reallocation | 7671 | STR | Stratford | STR | Stratford | |
15/01/1949 | Reallocation | 67661 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | EFD | Eastfield | |
22/01/1949 | Reallocation | 7667 | STR | Stratford | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |
22/01/1949 | Reallocation | 7671 | STR | Stratford | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |
22/01/1949 | Reallocation | 67676 | STR | Stratford | PKD | Parkhead | |
12/02/1949 | Reallocation | 67618 | STG | Stirling | EFD | Eastfield | |
12/03/1949 | Reallocation | 67668 | STR | Stratford | STM | St Margarets | |
26/03/1949 | Reallocation | 7667 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | STR | Stratford | |
26/03/1949 | Reallocation | 7671 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | STR | Stratford | |
02/04/1949 | Reallocation | 7673 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | STR | Stratford | |
09/04/1949 | Reallocation | 67642 | HTN | Heaton | GHD | Gateshead | |
12/11/1949 | Reallocation | 67667 | STR | Stratford | KL | Kings Lynn | |
12/11/1949 | Reallocation | 67671 | STR | Stratford | KL | Kings Lynn | |
29/01/1950 | Reallocation | 67673 | STR | Stratford | MID | Middlesbrough | |
23/04/1950 | Reallocation | 67667 | KL | Kings Lynn | 65A | Eastfield | |
23/04/1950 | Reallocation | 67671 | KL | Kings Lynn | 65A | Eastfield | |
31/05/1950 | Reallocation | 67642 | GHD | Gateshead | 52B | Heaton | |
31/05/1950 | Reallocation | 67647 | HTN | Heaton | 51D | Middlesbrough | |
31/05/1950 | Reallocation | 67653 | HTN | Heaton | 52C | Blaydon | |
30/06/1950 | Reallocation | 67642 | 52B | Heaton | 52B | Heaton | |
30/06/1950 | Reallocation | 67647 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 51D | Middlesbrough | |
30/06/1950 | Reallocation | 67653 | 52C | Blaydon | 52C | Blaydon | |
01/10/1950 | Reallocation | 67647 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 52A | Gateshead | |
21/10/1950 | Reallocation | 67647 | 52A | Gateshead | 52A | Gateshead | |
25/11/1950 | Reallocation | 67618 | EFD | Eastfield | 65E | Kipps | |
25/11/1950 | Reallocation | 67673 | MID | Middlesbrough | 52B | Heaton | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 67618 | 65E | Kipps | 65E | Kipps | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 67673 | 52B | Heaton | 52B | Heaton | |
18/02/1951 | Reallocation | 67663 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | 51D | Middlesbrough | |
18/02/1951 | Reallocation | 67677 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | 51D | Middlesbrough | |
24/03/1951 | Reallocation | 67663 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 51D | Middlesbrough | |
24/03/1951 | Reallocation | 67677 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 51D | Middlesbrough | |
07/07/1951 | Reallocation | 67647 | 52A | Gateshead | 51D | Middlesbrough | |
07/07/1951 | Reallocation | 67673 | 52B | Heaton | 51D | Middlesbrough | |
14/07/1951 | Reallocation | 67647 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 51E | Stockton | |
21/07/1951 | Reallocation | 67647 | 51E | Stockton | 51E | Stockton | |
21/07/1951 | Reallocation | 67673 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 51D | Middlesbrough | |
29/09/1951 | Reallocation | 67647 | 51E | Stockton | 52A | Gateshead | |
29/09/1951 | Reallocation | 67673 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 52B | Heaton | |
20/10/1951 | Reallocation | 67647 | 52A | Gateshead | 52A | Gateshead | |
20/10/1951 | Reallocation | 67673 | 52B | Heaton | 52B | Heaton | |
14/06/1952 | Reallocation | 67664 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | 65A | Eastfield | |
14/06/1952 | Reallocation | 67679 | STR | Stratford | 65C | Parkhead | |
12/07/1952 | Reallocation | 67647 | 52A | Gateshead | 52B | Heaton | |
19/07/1952 | Reallocation | 67647 | 52B | Heaton | 52B | Heaton | |
20/09/1952 | Reallocation | 67639 | MID | Middlesbrough | 52B | Heaton | |
20/09/1952 | Reallocation | 67677 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 52B | Heaton | |
04/10/1952 | Reallocation | 67639 | 52B | Heaton | 52B | Heaton | |
04/10/1952 | Reallocation | 67677 | 52B | Heaton | 52B | Heaton | |
20/06/1953 | Reallocation | 67639 | 52B | Heaton | 51D | Middlesbrough | |
20/06/1953 | Reallocation | 67677 | 52B | Heaton | 51D | Middlesbrough | |
09/1953 | Condemned | 67635 | HTN | Heaton | COND | ||
23/10/1954 | Reallocation | 67639 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 52C | Blaydon | |
21/01/1956 | Reallocation | 67603 | EFD | Eastfield | 65E | Kipps | |
18/02/1956 | Reallocation | 67630 | STM | St Margarets | 64G | Hawick | |
17/03/1956 | Reallocation | 67603 | 65E | Kipps | 65A | Eastfield | |
12/05/1956 | Reallocation | 67630 | 64G | Hawick | 64A | St Margarets | |
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 67677 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | |
17/11/1956 | Reallocation | 67673 | 52B | Heaton | 52C | Blaydon | |
20/04/1957 | Reallocation | 67639 | 52C | Blaydon | 52A | Gateshead | |
20/04/1957 | Reallocation | 67673 | 52C | Blaydon | 52A | Gateshead | |
20/07/1957 | Reallocation | 67658 | BLA | Blaydon | 52B | Heaton | |
20/07/1957 | Reallocation | 67677 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | 51D | Middlesbrough | |
21/09/1957 | Reallocation | 67677 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | |
09/11/1957 | Reallocation | 67645 | HTN | Heaton | 52A | Gateshead | |
14/12/1957 | Reallocation | 67641 | HTN | Heaton | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
14/12/1957 | Reallocation | 67642 | 52B | Heaton | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
14/12/1957 | Reallocation | 67647 | 52B | Heaton | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
14/06/1958 | Reallocation | 67641 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 52B | Heaton | |
14/06/1958 | Reallocation | 67642 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 52B | Heaton | |
14/06/1958 | Reallocation | 67647 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 52B | Heaton | |
02/08/1958 | Reallocation | 67608 | STM | St Margarets | 65C | Parkhead | |
11/10/1958 | Reallocation | 67637 | HTN | Heaton | 54A | Sunderland | |
11/10/1958 | Reallocation | 67640 | HTN | Heaton | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | |
11/10/1958 | Reallocation | 67645 | 52A | Gateshead | 54A | Sunderland | |
11/10/1958 | Reallocation | 67673 | 52A | Gateshead | 54A | Sunderland | |
31/01/1959 | Reallocation | 67635 | 98W | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
31/01/1959 | Reallocation | 67637 | 54A | Sunderland | 52A | Gateshead | |
14/02/1959 | Reallocation | 67629 | STM | St Margarets | 65C | Parkhead | |
14/02/1959 | Reallocation | 67630 | 64A | St Margarets | 65C | Parkhead | |
20/06/1959 | Reallocation | 67635 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | |
20/06/1959 | Reallocation | 67640 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | |
20/06/1959 | Reallocation | 67645 | 54A | Sunderland | 52B | Heaton | |
20/06/1959 | Reallocation | 67673 | 54A | Sunderland | 52B | Heaton | |
03/10/1959 | Reallocation | 67645 | 52B | Heaton | 52G | Sunderland | |
03/10/1959 | Reallocation | 67673 | 52B | Heaton | 52G | Sunderland | |
07/07/1960 | Condemned | 67671 | 65A | Eastfield | COND | ||
19/11/1960 | Reallocation | 67630 | 65C | Parkhead | 65A | Eastfield | |
17/12/1960 | Reallocation | 67665 | KPS | Kipps | 64A | St Margarets | |
14/01/1961 | Reallocation | 67665 | 64A | St Margarets | 65C | Parkhead | |
11/03/1961 | Reallocation | 67630 | 65A | Eastfield | 65C | Parkhead | |
06/05/1961 | Reallocation | 67665 | 65C | Parkhead | 64A | St Margarets | |
17/06/1961 | Reallocation | 67637 | 52A | Gateshead | 52B | Heaton | |
21/06/1961 | Condemned | 67610 | HAY | Haymarket | COND | ||
23/06/1961 | Condemned | 67665 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
05/08/1961 | Reallocation | 67673 | 52G | Sunderland | 52B | Heaton | |
25/11/1961 | Reallocation | 67635 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 51L | Thornaby | |
22/01/1962 | Condemned | 67601 | EFD | Eastfield | COND | ||
12/02/1962 | Condemned | 67659 | STM | St Margarets | COND | ||
05/03/1962 | Condemned | 67622 | PKD | Parkhead | COND | ||
05/03/1962 | Condemned | 67631 | PKD | Parkhead | COND | ||
05/03/1962 | Condemned | 67655 | PKD | Parkhead | COND | ||
24/03/1962 | Reallocation | 67664 | 65A | Eastfield | 67B | Hurlford | |
02/04/1962 | Condemned | 67603 | 65A | Eastfield | COND | ||
07/05/1962 | Condemned | 67602 | EFD | Eastfield | COND | ||
07/05/1962 | Condemned | 67629 | 65C | Parkhead | COND | ||
24/05/1962 | Condemned | 67637 | 52B | Heaton | COND | ||
09/07/1962 | Condemned | 67649 | STM | St Margarets | COND | ||
01/10/1962 | Condemned | 67673 | 52B | Heaton | COND | ||
22/10/1962 | Condemned | 67639 | 52A | Gateshead | COND | ||
22/10/1962 | Condemned | 67641 | 52B | Heaton | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 67630 | 65C | Parkhead | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 67664 | 67B | Hurlford | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 67680 | STR | Stratford | COND |