Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 97 Today
» 1006 Yesterday
» 2032 Week
» 17034 Month
» 361213 Year
» 872315 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LNER Gresley "V2" Class 2-6-2


LNER (1924) LNER (1946 1st) LNER (1946 2nd) BR (Tmp) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
4771 700 800 60800 13/06/1936 Kings Cross 21/08/1962 Kings Cross 26.17 Prs Preserved
4772 701 801 60801 08/08/1936 York (North) 01/10/1962 Tweedmouth 26.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 26/10/1962 26.23
4773 702 802 60802 03/10/1936 York (North) 05/03/1964 St Margarets 27.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 03/1964 27.47
4774 703 803 60803 30/10/1936 New England 16/06/1963 New England 26.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 28/11/1963 27.10
4775 704 804 E804 60804 28/11/1936 Dundee Tay Bridge 05/12/1963 Dundee Tay Bridge 27.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 14/02/1964 27.23
4776 705 805 60805 16/07/1937 York (North) 23/12/1963 York (North) 26.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 03/01/1964 26.48
4777 706 806 60806 06/08/1937 York (North) 04/09/1966 York (North) 29.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1966 29.21
4778 707 807 60807 24/08/1937 Heaton 19/11/1962 Heaton 25.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 07/01/1963 25.39
4779 708 808 60808 09/09/1937 Heaton 05/10/1964 Darlington 27.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 15/10/1964 27.12
4780 709 809 60809 31/08/1937 York (North) 06/07/1964 Darlington 26.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 24/08/1964 27.00
4781 710 810 E810 60810 03/09/1937 Heaton 21/11/1965 York (North) 28.17 Cut W George, Station Steel (Wath) 01/1966 28.39
4782 711 811 60811 10/09/1937 York (North) 23/04/1962 Heaton 24.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 10/05/1962 24.68
4783 712 812 60812 18/09/1937 Heaton 09/07/1964 Gateshead 26.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 10/1964 27.09
4784 713 813 60813 27/09/1937 Doncaster 26/09/1966 Dundee Tay Bridge 29 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 11/1966 29.15
4785 714 814 60814 08/10/1937 Kings Cross 19/04/1963 Grantham 25.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 04/1963 25.53
4786 715 815 E815 60815 20/10/1937 New England 05/05/1962 Leicester (G.C.) 24.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 07/09/1962 24.90
4787 716 816 60816 26/10/1937 Aberdeen Ferryhill 22/10/1965 St Margarets 28 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 12/1965 28.16
4788 717 817 60817 01/11/1937 Doncaster 16/06/1963 New England 25.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 28/11/1963 26.09
4789 718 818 60818 08/11/1937 Kings Cross 22/08/1966 Dundee Tay Bridge 28.75 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 10/1966 28.95
4790 719 819 E819 60819 15/11/1937 Aberdeen Ferryhill 29/12/1962 St Margarets 25.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 18/10/1963 25.94
4791 720 820 60820 23/11/1937 New England 20/06/1962 New England 24.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 20/06/1962 24.59
4792 721 821 60821 03/12/1937 Doncaster 29/12/1962 New England 25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 23/05/1963 25.48
4793 722 822 60822 09/12/1937 Aberdeen Ferryhill 07/12/1964 Dundee Tay Bridge 27 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 02/1965 27.21
4794 723 823 E823 60823 21/12/1937 Kings Cross 26/03/1962 Perth (LNER) 24.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 10/04/1962 24.32
4795 724 824 60824 22/12/1937 New England 26/09/1966 St Margarets 28.75 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 11/1966 28.92
4796 725 825 60825 06/01/1938 Doncaster 27/04/1964 Dundee Tay Bridge 26.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 09/1964 26.71
4797 726 826 60826 12/01/1938 Kings Cross 12/04/1962 Doncaster 24.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 12/04/1962 24.26
4798 727 827 60827 18/01/1938 New England 29/12/1962 St Margarets 24.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 25/10/1963 25.78
4799 728 828 60828 28/03/1938 York (North) 04/10/1965 York (North) 27.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1965 27.65
4800 729 829 60829 01/04/1938 Dundee Tay Bridge 31/05/1962 New England 24.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 05/1962 24.14
4801 730 830 60830 13/04/1938 Kings Cross 16/06/1963 Grantham 25.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 21/08/1963 25.37
4802 731 831 60831 30/05/1938 Heaton 06/12/1966 York (North) 28.58 Cut Drapers (Hull) 02/1967 28.73
4803 732 832 60832 22/07/1938 St Margarets 29/12/1962 New England 24.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 12/06/1963 24.91
4804 733 833 60833 31/08/1938 York (North) 25/05/1964 York (North) 25.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 08/1964 25.98
4805 734 834 60834 09/09/1938 Aberdeen Ferryhill 19/03/1964 Dundee Tay Bridge 25.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 11/1964 26.20
4806 735 835 60835 23/09/1938 York (North) 19/10/1965 St Margarets 27.08 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 12/1965 27.25
4807 736 836 60836 23/09/1938 Dundee Tay Bridge 31/12/1966 Dundee Tay Bridge 28.25 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 07/07/1967 28.81
4808 737 837 60837 05/10/1938 York (North) 16/11/1965 York (North) 27.08 Cut Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) 12/1965 27.21
4809 738 838 60838 11/10/1938 Dundee Tay Bridge 23/01/1964 Dundee Tay Bridge 25.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 02/1964 25.36
4810 739 839 60839 19/10/1938 York (North) 22/10/1962 York (North) 24 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 13/12/1962 24.17
4811 740 840 60840 28/10/1938 Dundee Tay Bridge 29/12/1962 St Margarets 24.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 29/11/1963 25.10
4812 741 841 60841 18/11/1938 Doncaster 22/09/1963 Doncaster 24.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 21/11/1963 25.02
4813 742 842 60842 09/12/1938 New England 22/10/1962 York (North) 23.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 03/12/1962 24.00
4814 743 843 60843 30/12/1938 York (North) 04/10/1965 Ardsley 26.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1965 26.90
4815 744 844 60844 03/02/1939 St Margarets 08/11/1965 Dundee Tay Bridge 26.75 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 12/1965 26.88
4816 745 845 60845 22/02/1939 Kings Cross 23/09/1962 New England 23.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 13/12/1962 23.82
4817 746 846 60846 17/02/1939 Doncaster 19/10/1965 St Margarets 26.67 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 12/1965 26.84
4818 747 847 60847 06/03/1939 York (North) 29/06/1965 York (North) 26.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 08/1965 26.46
4819 748 848 60848 03/03/1939 St Margarets 16/07/1962 York (North) 23.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 01/08/1962 23.43
4820 749 849 60849 10/03/1939 Doncaster 12/04/1962 Doncaster 23.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 12/04/1962 23.11
4821 750 850 60850 17/03/1939 Kings Cross 26/02/1962 Doncaster 22.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 03/1962 23.01
4822 751 851 E851 60851 24/03/1939 Dundee Tay Bridge 29/12/1962 Aberdeen Ferryhill 23.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 13/09/1963 24.49
4823 752 852 60852 31/03/1939 Doncaster 22/09/1963 Doncaster 24.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 13/11/1963 24.64
4824 753 853 60853 11/04/1939 Doncaster 22/09/1963 Doncaster 24.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 22/11/1963 24.63
4825 754 854 60854 19/04/1939 New England 16/06/1963 New England 24.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 02/10/1963 24.47
4826 755 855 60855 21/04/1939 Kings Cross 13/04/1964 York (North) 25 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 19/05/1964 25.10
4827 756 856 60856 02/05/1939 York (North) 25/05/1964 York (North) 25 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 08/1964 25.31
4828 757 857 60857 10/05/1939 Gorton 17/04/1962 Doncaster 22.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 17/04/1962 22.95
4829 758 858 60858 16/05/1939 Kings Cross 06/10/1963 Doncaster 24.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 10/01/1964 24.67
4830 759 859 60859 18/05/1939 Leicester (G.C.) 20/09/1965 Gateshead 26.33 Cut Ellis Metals (Derwenthaugh Road, Swalwell) 10/1965 26.43
4831 760 860 E860 60860 26/05/1939 Gateshead 22/10/1962 Heaton 23.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 24/01/1963 23.68
4832 761 861 60861 06/06/1939 Gorton 12/08/1963 Ardsley 24.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 22/08/1963 24.23
4833 762 862 E862 60862 13/06/1939 Gorton 16/06/1963 New England 24 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 27/11/1963 24.47
4834 763 863 60863 19/06/1939 Doncaster 28/04/1962 Leicester (G.C.) 22.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 09/05/1962 22.90
4835 764 864 60864 26/06/1939 York (North) 16/03/1964 York (North) 24.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 09/04/1964 24.81
4836 765 865 E865 60865 29/06/1939 New England 14/06/1965 Gateshead 26 Cut Ellis Metals (Derwenthaugh Road, Swalwell) 07/1965 26.06
4837 766 866 60866 06/07/1939 Kings Cross 29/12/1962 New England 23.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 24/05/1963 23.90
4838 767 867 E867 60867 20/07/1939 Doncaster 01/05/1962 New England 22.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/05/1962 22.80
4839 768 868 60868 31/07/1939 York (North) 26/09/1966 St Margarets 27.17 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 11/1966 27.31
4840 769 869 60869 10/08/1939 Kings Cross 16/06/1963 New England 23.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 27/11/1963 24.32
4841 770 870 60870 12/08/1939 New England 16/07/1963 Doncaster 23.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 29/07/1963 23.98
4842 771 871 60871 01/09/1939 Grantham 22/09/1963 Doncaster 24 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 07/11/1963 24.20
4843 772 872 E872 60872 22/04/1939 Doncaster 22/09/1963 Doncaster 24.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 29/10/1963 24.54
4844 773 873 E873 60873 18/05/1939 New England 29/12/1962 St Margarets 23.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 30/10/1963 24.47
4845 774 874 60874 27/06/1939 Doncaster 22/08/1962 New England 23.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 22/08/1962 23.17
4846 775 875 E875 60875 28/07/1939 Doncaster 05/03/1962 Doncaster 22.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 03/1962 22.65
4847 776 876 60876 30/05/1940 New England 19/10/1965 York (North) 25.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1965 25.56
4848 777 877 60877 26/06/1940 New England 13/02/1966 York (North) 25.67 Cut Drapers (Hull) 04/1966 25.82
4849 778 878 60878 12/07/1940 New England 22/10/1962 York (North) 22.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 06/11/1962 22.33
4850 779 879 60879 06/08/1940 New England 03/12/1962 York (North) 22.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 28/12/1962 22.41
4851 780 880 60880 04/09/1940 Doncaster 22/09/1963 Doncaster 23 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 14/11/1963 23.21
4852 781 881 60881 12/10/1940 Doncaster 16/06/1963 New England 22.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 27/11/1963 23.14
4853 782 882 60882 07/10/1939 Carlisle Canal 13/07/1964 St Margarets 24.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 02/1965 25.38
4854 783 883 60883 20/10/1939 Heaton 24/02/1963 St Margarets 23.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 05/1963 23.58
4855 784 884 60884 27/10/1939 Heaton 06/09/1965 Darlington 25.92 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 10/1965 25.99
4856 785 885 60885 10/11/1939 Heaton 06/09/1965 Darlington 25.83 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 10/1965 25.95
4857 786 886 60886 18/11/1939 Heaton 10/04/1966 York (North) 26.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 06/1966 26.59
4858 787 887 E887 60887 30/11/1939 Heaton 06/07/1964 York (North) 24.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 08/1964 24.73
4859 788 888 60888 07/12/1939 Heaton 29/12/1962 Aberdeen Ferryhill 23 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 27/09/1963 23.82
4860 789 889 E889 60889 17/12/1939 Doncaster 11/06/1963 Doncaster 23.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 06/1963 23.51
4861 790 890 60890 28/12/1939 Doncaster 05/05/1962 Leicester (G.C.) 22.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 29/08/1962 22.68
4862 791 891 E891 60891 29/12/1939 Heaton 12/10/1964 Gateshead 24.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 12/1964 24.98
4863 792 892 60892 11/01/1940 Kings Cross 21/11/1963 St Margarets 23.83 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 01/1964 24.03
4864 793 893 E893 60893 20/01/1940 New England 23/09/1962 New England 22.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 12/12/1962 22.91
4865 794 894 60894 20/01/1940 St Margarets 29/12/1962 St Margarets 22.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 15/11/1963 23.84
4866 795 895 60895 26/01/1940 Heaton 04/10/1965 York (North) 25.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1965 25.82
4867 796 896 60896 03/02/1940 Doncaster 23/09/1962 Doncaster 22.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 10/1962 22.71
4868 797 897 60897 10/02/1940 Kings Cross 11/06/1963 Doncaster 23.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 16/07/1963 23.44
4869 798 898 60898 22/02/1940 Heaton 28/11/1963 Aberdeen Ferryhill 23.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 13/12/1963 23.82
4870 799 899 60899 23/02/1940 New England 22/09/1963 Doncaster 23.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 13/11/1963 23.74
4871 800 900 60900 02/03/1940 Kings Cross 11/04/1963 St Margarets 23.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 04/1963 23.13
4872 801 901 60901 09/03/1940 York (North) 14/06/1965 Gateshead 25.25 Cut Ellis Metals (Derwenthaugh Road, Swalwell) 07/1965 25.37
4873 802 902 60902 15/03/1940 Doncaster 22/09/1963 Doncaster 23.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 07/11/1963 23.66
4874 803 903 E903 60903 20/03/1940 Doncaster 10/02/1963 New England 22.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 27/05/1963 23.20
4875 804 904 60904 03/04/1940 York (North) 09/07/1964 Gateshead 24.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 24/08/1964 24.41
4876 805 905 60905 10/04/1940 New England 22/09/1963 Doncaster 23.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 18/10/1963 23.54
4877 806 906 60906 17/04/1940 Doncaster 28/05/1963 New England 23.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 05/06/1963 23.15
4878 807 907 60907 19/04/1940 York (North) 28/05/1962 York (North) 22.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 05/1962 22.08
4879 808 908 60908 29/04/1940 Doncaster 04/06/1962 Doncaster 22.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 04/06/1962 22.11
4880 809 909 60909 04/05/1940 Doncaster 08/06/1962 Doncaster 22.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 08/06/1962 22.11
4881 810 910 60910 10/05/1940 York (North) 15/04/1964 Gateshead 23.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 21/05/1964 24.05
4882 811 911 60911 15/05/1940 Doncaster 03/12/1962 York (North) 22.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 18/12/1962 22.61
4883 812 912 E912 60912 24/05/1940 New England 29/04/1963 New England 22.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 14/05/1963 22.99
4884 813 913 60913 06/06/1940 New England 12/10/1964 Gateshead 24.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 24/10/1964 24.40
4885 814 914 60914 14/06/1940 New England 23/09/1962 New England 22.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 12/12/1962 22.51
4886 815 915 60915 15/06/1940 New England 26/11/1962 Darlington 22.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 14/12/1962 22.51
4887 816 916 60916 24/07/1940 Doncaster 26/06/1964 Darlington 23.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 08/1964 24.08
4888 817 917 60917 10/08/1940 Doncaster 13/04/1962 Doncaster 21.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 13/04/1962 21.69
4889 818 918 60918 28/08/1941 York (North) 08/10/1962 York (North) 21.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 17/10/1962 21.15
4890 819 919 60919 07/09/1941 Heaton 02/09/1966 Dundee Tay Bridge 25 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 10/1966 25.12
4891 820 920 60920 04/10/1941 Doncaster 29/12/1962 St Margarets 21.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 14/10/1963 22.04
4892 821 921 60921 16/10/1941 New England 11/06/1963 Doncaster 21.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 20/06/1963 21.69
4893 822 922 60922 31/10/1941 Doncaster 09/07/1964 Gateshead 22.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 08/1964 22.81
4894 823 923 60923 15/11/1941 Heaton 04/10/1965 Ardsley 23.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1965 24.02
4895 824 924 E924 60924 22/11/1941 Kings Cross 22/09/1963 Doncaster 21.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 05/11/1963 21.97
4896 825 925 60925 04/12/1941 York (North) 25/05/1964 York (North) 22.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 08/1964 22.71
4897 826 926 60926 17/12/1941 Gateshead 01/10/1962 Tweedmouth 20.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 25/01/1963 21.12
4898 827 927 60927 20/12/1941 Doncaster 03/12/1962 St Margarets 21 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 04/1963 21.33
3655 828 928 60928 24/06/1941 Doncaster 05/03/1962 Doncaster 20.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 06/1962 20.99
3656 829 929 60929 25/06/1941 Doncaster 21/06/1965 York (North) 24 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 08/1965 24.16
3657 830 930 60930 26/07/1941 Doncaster 23/09/1962 Doncaster 21.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/11/1962 21.28
3658 831 931 60931 23/08/1941 Aberdeen Ferryhill 03/09/1965 St Margarets 24.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 09/1965 24.08
3659 832 932 60932 22/10/1941 Gateshead 25/05/1964 York (North) 22.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 08/1964 22.83
3660 833 933 60933 23/10/1941 York (North) 29/12/1962 St Margarets 21.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 06/12/1963 22.13
3661 834 934 60934 07/01/1942 York (North) 22/10/1962 Tweedmouth 20.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 03/05/1963 21.33
3662 835 935 60935 17/02/1942 Doncaster 07/06/1963 Doncaster 21.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 13/06/1963 21.33
3663 836 936 60936 03/03/1942 Doncaster 23/09/1962 Doncaster 20.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 15/10/1962 20.63
3664 837 937 E937 60937 09/03/1942 Dundee Tay Bridge 29/12/1962 St Margarets 20.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 01/11/1963 21.66
4899 838 938 60938 29/01/1942 Doncaster 01/10/1962 Doncaster 20.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 11/1962 20.81
3641 839 939 60939 12/02/1942 Gateshead 12/10/1964 York (North) 22.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 16/10/1964 22.69
3642 840 940 60940 21/02/1942 Heaton 11/10/1965 Gateshead 23.67 Cut Ellis Metals (Derwenthaugh Road, Swalwell) 11/1965 23.75
3643 841 941 60941 04/03/1942 York (North) 06/07/1964 York (North) 22.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 08/1964 22.47
3644 842 942 60942 13/03/1942 Gateshead 25/05/1964 York (North) 22.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 24/08/1964 22.47
3645 843 943 60943 26/03/1942 Doncaster 23/09/1962 Doncaster 20.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 15/10/1962 20.57
3646 844 944 60944 17/04/1942 Heaton 20/09/1965 Gateshead 23.42 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 10/1965 23.51
3647 845 945 60945 15/05/1942 Doncaster 06/07/1964 York (North) 22.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 08/1964 22.27
3648 846 946 60946 21/05/1942 York (North) 11/10/1965 Gateshead 23.42 Cut Ellis Metals (Derwenthaugh Road, Swalwell) 11/1965 23.50
3649 847 947 60947 03/06/1942 Gateshead 01/10/1962 Tweedmouth 20.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 24/10/1962 20.41
3650 848 948 60948 11/06/1942 Doncaster 22/09/1963 Doncaster 21.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 04/11/1963 21.41
3651 849 949 60949 18/06/1942 Heaton 26/11/1962 Tweedmouth 20.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 23/05/1963 20.94
3652 850 950 60950 26/06/1942 Doncaster 22/09/1963 Doncaster 21.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 05/11/1963 21.38
3653 851 951 60951 07/07/1942 Haymarket 29/12/1962 St Margarets 20.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 22/11/1963 21.39
3654 852 952 60952 18/07/1942 Gateshead 11/10/1965 Gateshead 23.25 Cut Ellis Metals (Derwenthaugh Road, Swalwell) 11/1965 23.35
3665 853 953 60953 26/08/1942 Haymarket 28/05/1962 St Margarets 19.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 06/1962 19.82
3666 854 954 60954 05/09/1942 York (North) 18/11/1963 York (North) 21.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 09/12/1963 21.27
3667 855 955 60955 22/09/1942 Haymarket 26/09/1966 St Margarets 24 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 11/1966 24.16
3668 856 956 60956 30/09/1942 Doncaster 23/09/1962 New England 20 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 11/12/1962 20.21
3669 857 957 E957 60957 07/10/1942 Gateshead 17/12/1964 St Margarets 22.17 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 02/1965 22.38
3670 858 958 E958 60958 15/10/1942 St Margarets 29/12/1962 St Margarets 20.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 14/11/1963 21.10
3671 859 959 60959 02/11/1942 Gateshead 01/07/1963 Aberdeen Ferryhill 20.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 04/10/1963 20.93
3672 860 960 60960 11/11/1942 York (North) 26/02/1962 Thornaby 19.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 07/03/1962 19.33
3673 861 961 60961 02/12/1942 York (North) 05/04/1965 York (North) 22.33 Cut Drapers (Hull) 12/07/1965 22.62
3674 862 962 60962 23/12/1942 York (North) 20/09/1965 Gateshead 22.75 Cut Ellis Metals (Derwenthaugh Road, Swalwell) 10/1965 22.83
3675 863 963 60963 12/01/1943 Heaton 29/06/1965 York (North) 22.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 08/1965 22.61
3676 864 964 E964 60964 26/01/1943 Heaton 08/05/1964 Gateshead 21.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 07/09/1964 21.63
3677 865 965 60965 25/02/1943 Gateshead 29/12/1962 St Margarets 19.83 Cut Campbells (Shieldhall) 11/1963 20.73
3678 866 966 60966 15/03/1943 Gateshead 11/06/1963 Doncaster 20.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 20/06/1963 20.28
3679 867 967 60967 26/03/1943 Gateshead 10/02/1964 York (North) 20.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 19/02/1964 20.92
3680 868 968 60968 15/04/1943 York (North) 20/05/1963 York (North) 20.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 05/1963 20.10
3681 869 969 60969 29/04/1943 Dundee Tay Bridge 18/05/1964 St Margarets 21.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 08/1964 21.31
3682 870 970 60970 12/05/1943 Haymarket 07/02/1966 St Margarets 22.75 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 03/1966 22.86
3683 871 971 60971 02/06/1943 Eastfield 29/12/1962 St Margarets 19.5 Cut Campbells (Shieldhall) 11/1963 20.47
3684 872 972 60972 01/07/1943 Eastfield 28/11/1963 Aberdeen Ferryhill 20.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 27/12/1963 20.50
3685 873 973 60973 27/04/1943 Haymarket 24/01/1966 Dundee Tay Bridge 22.75 Cut P.W. McLellan (Langloan) 03/1966 22.90
3686 874 974 60974 19/08/1943 York (North) 09/12/1963 York (North) 20.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 09/01/1964 20.41
3687 875 975 60975 20/09/1943 York (North) 25/05/1964 York (North) 20.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 08/1964 20.92
3688 876 976 60976 07/10/1943 York (North) 26/09/1966 St Margarets 22.92 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 11/1966 23.12
3689 877 977 60977 27/10/1943 York (North) 26/02/1962 York (North) 18.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 03/1962 18.39
3690 878 978 60978 09/12/1943 York (North) 19/11/1962 Heaton 18.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 24/05/1963 19.47
3691 879 979 60979 20/01/1944 York (North) 01/10/1962 Gateshead 18.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 01/1963 19.00
3692 880 980 60980 10/03/1944 Haymarket 29/12/1962 St Margarets 18.75 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 01/1964 19.86
3693 881 981 60981 20/04/1944 York (North) 15/04/1963 York (North) 19 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 22/05/1963 19.10
3694 882 982 60982 21/06/1944 York (North) 05/10/1964 York (North) 20.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 16/10/1964 20.33
3695 883 983 E983 60983 13/07/1944 Doncaster 23/09/1962 Grantham 18.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 13/12/1962 18.43