NBR/LNER "Y9" Class 0-4-0ST
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/1921 | Condemned | 1099 | COND | ||||
11/1921 | Condemned | 1086 | COND | ||||
07/1922 | Condemned | 1085 | COND | ||||
12/1923 | Condemned | 1103 | COND | ||||
08/1938 | Condemned | 10087 | COND | ||||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8092 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8093 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8094 | KPS | Kipps | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8095 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 68096 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8097 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8098 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8099 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8100 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8101 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8104 | POL | Polmont | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8105 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8106 | KPS | Kipps | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8107 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8108 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 68103 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8111 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8112 | KPS | Kipps | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8102 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 68109 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8110 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8113 | POL | Polmont | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8114 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8115 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8116 | KPS | Kipps | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8117 | KPS | Kipps | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8118 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8119 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8121 | KPS | Kipps | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8122 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8123 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8124 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
21/10/1950 | Reallocation | 8108 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
24/03/1951 | Reallocation | 68119 | LOAN | 64A | St Margarets | ||
24/03/1951 | Reallocation | 8122 | LOAN | 64A | St Margarets | ||
24/03/1951 | Reallocation | 8124 | LOAN | 65A | Eastfield | ||
31/03/1951 | Reallocation | 68118 | EFD | Eastfield | 67C | Ayr | |
31/03/1951 | Reallocation | 68119 | 64A | St Margarets | 64A | St Margarets | |
21/04/1951 | Reallocation | 68114 | LOAN | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
21/04/1951 | Reallocation | 68118 | 67C | Ayr | 67C | Ayr | |
19/05/1951 | Reallocation | 68118 | 67C | Ayr | 65A | Eastfield | |
19/05/1951 | Reallocation | 8124 | Motherwell GW | 65A | Eastfield | ||
16/06/1951 | Reallocation | 8098 | LOAN | 64A | St Margarets | ||
22/03/1952 | Reallocation | 68099 | STM | St Margarets | 64A | St Margarets | |
22/03/1952 | Reallocation | 68105 | STM | St Margarets | 64A | St Margarets | |
19/04/1952 | Reallocation | 68095 | STM | St Margarets | 64A | St Margarets | |
17/05/1952 | Reallocation | 68116 | KPS | Kipps | 65E | Kipps | |
12/07/1952 | Reallocation | 68118 | 65A | Eastfield | 65G | Yoker | |
27/02/1953 | Condemned | 68092 | STM | St Margarets | COND | ||
04/03/1953 | Condemned | 68111 | STM | St Margarets | COND | ||
05/09/1953 | Reallocation | 68103 | EFD | Eastfield | 64A | St Margarets | |
28/11/1953 | Reallocation | 68098 | 64A | St Margarets | 64E | Polmont | |
01/12/1953 | Condemned | 68107 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | COND | ||
20/02/1954 | Reallocation | 68103 | 64A | St Margarets | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
22/04/1954 | Condemned | 68109 | EFD | Eastfield | COND | ||
07/05/1954 | Condemned | 68096 | STM | St Margarets | COND | ||
21/08/1954 | Condemned | 68103 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | COND | ||
30/12/1954 | Condemned | 68098 | 64E | Polmont | COND | ||
12/01/1955 | Condemned | 68112 | KPS | Kipps | COND | ||
19/02/1955 | Reallocation | 68118 | 65G | Yoker | 64A | St Margarets | |
12/04/1955 | Condemned | 68094 | KPS | Kipps | COND | ||
25/04/1955 | Condemned | 68105 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
01/07/1955 | Condemned | 68121 | KPS | Kipps | COND | ||
01/08/1955 | Condemned | 68122 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
06/08/1955 | Reallocation | 68108 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | 64A | St Margarets | |
06/08/1955 | Reallocation | 68124 | 65A | Eastfield | 65E | Kipps | |
10/08/1955 | Condemned | 68120 | PS | COND | |||
01/10/1955 | Reallocation | 68108 | 64A | St Margarets | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
21/01/1956 | Reallocation | 68118 | 64A | St Margarets | 67C | Ayr | |
18/02/1956 | Reallocation | 68102 | STM | St Margarets | 64E | Polmont | |
18/02/1956 | Reallocation | 68110 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | 65A | Eastfield | |
12/05/1956 | Reallocation | 68102 | 64E | Polmont | 64A | St Margarets | |
12/05/1956 | Reallocation | 68110 | 65A | Eastfield | 65E | Kipps | |
13/11/1956 | Condemned | 68099 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
04/07/1957 | Condemned | 68115 | STM | St Margarets | COND | ||
26/08/1957 | Condemned | 68106 | KPS | Kipps | COND | ||
31/08/1957 | Reallocation | 68118 | 67C | Ayr | 64A | St Margarets | |
28/09/1957 | Reallocation | 68100 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | 65E | Kipps | |
21/12/1957 | Reallocation | 68108 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | 65E | Kipps | |
21/12/1957 | Reallocation | 68123 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | 65E | Kipps | |
08/01/1958 | Condemned | 68093 | STM | St Margarets | COND | ||
12/04/1958 | Condemned | 68113 | POL | Polmont | COND | ||
12/04/1958 | Condemned | 68116 | 65E | Kipps | COND | ||
10/05/1958 | Reallocation | 68114 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | 65D | Dawsholm | |
14/10/1958 | Condemned | 68097 | STM | St Margarets | COND | ||
24/10/1958 | Condemned | 68118 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
20/12/1958 | Reallocation | 68124 | 65E | Kipps | 67C | Ayr | |
23/12/1958 | Condemned | 68102 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
09/05/1959 | Reallocation | 68114 | 65D | Dawsholm | 65E | Kipps | |
29/09/1959 | Condemned | 68124 | 67C | Ayr | COND | ||
24/10/1959 | Reallocation | 68110 | 65E | Kipps | 67C | Ayr | |
05/11/1959 | Condemned | 68108 | 65E | Kipps | COND | ||
19/12/1959 | Reallocation | 68110 | 67C | Ayr | 65E | Kipps | |
06/1960 | Condemned | 68100 | 65E | Kipps | COND | ||
09/08/1960 | Condemned | 68123 | 65E | Kipps | COND | ||
10/1960 | Condemned | 68114 | 65E | Kipps | COND | ||
17/12/1960 | Reallocation | 68104 | POL | Polmont | 65E | Kipps | |
31/08/1961 | Condemned | 68110 | 65E | Kipps | COND | ||
02/10/1961 | Condemned | 68119 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
16/07/1962 | Condemned | 68117 | KPS | Kipps | COND | ||
08/10/1962 | Condemned | 68101 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | COND | ||
08/10/1962 | Condemned | 68104 | 65E | Kipps | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 68095 | 64A | St Margarets | COND |