Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 832 Today
» 871 Yesterday
» 832 Week
» 21814 Month
» 163768 Year
» 1048149 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

D2/12 0-6-0


BR (Pre Tops) Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
D2510 28/08/1961 6C
1E
1A
1E
1F
W
Birkenhead Mollington Street (New)
Bletchley
Willesden
Bletchley
Rugby
Withdrawn
28/08/1961
19/12/1964
16/10/1965
19/03/1966
01/10/1966
26/08/1967
26/08/1967
D2511 28/08/1961 12E
12D
12C
W
Barrow in Furness (New)
Workington
Barrow in Furness
Withdrawn
28/08/1961
22/10/1966
24/06/1967
30/12/1967
30/12/1967
D2512 11/09/1961 12E
W
Barrow in Furness (New)
Withdrawn
11/09/1961
13/05/1967
13/05/1967
D2513 05/10/1961 12E
12A
12C
W
Barrow in Furness (New)
Carlisle Kingmoor
Barrow in Furness
Withdrawn
05/10/1961
21/01/1967
22/04/1967
19/08/1967
19/08/1967
D2514 16/10/1961 12E
12A
12D
12C
W
Barrow in Furness (New)
Carlisle Kingmoor
Workington
Barrow in Furness
Withdrawn
16/10/1961
21/01/1967
22/04/1967
24/06/1967
05/08/1967
05/08/1967
D2515 18/10/1961 12E
W
Barrow in Furness (New)
Withdrawn
18/10/1961
05/08/1967
05/08/1967
D2516 10/11/1961 12E
W
Barrow in Furness (New)
Withdrawn
10/11/1961
05/08/1967
05/08/1967
D2517 10/11/1961 12E
12A
W
Barrow in Furness (New)
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
10/11/1961
21/01/1967
25/02/1967
25/02/1967
D2518 22/11/1961 1C
1A
5A
W
Watford (New)
Willesden
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
22/11/1961
05/01/1963
22/10/1966
25/02/1967
25/02/1967
D2519 30/11/1961 5B
5A
W
Crewe South (New)
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
30/11/1961
08/10/1966
29/07/1967
29/07/1967