179
BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) | Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
59255 | ||||||||||
59256 | 28/07/1985 | Derby | ||||||||
59257 | ||||||||||
59258 | ||||||||||
59259 | ||||||||||
59260 | ||||||||||
59261 | ||||||||||
59262 | ||||||||||
59263 | ||||||||||
59264 | 18/01/1988 | Ayr | ||||||||
59265 | ||||||||||
59266 | ||||||||||
59267 | ||||||||||
59268 | 29/09/1987 | Ayr | ||||||||
59269 | ||||||||||
59270 | 30/12/1968 | Cardiff Canton | ||||||||
59271 | 30/12/1968 | Cardiff Canton | ||||||||
59272 | ||||||||||
59273 | ||||||||||
59274 | ||||||||||
59275 | ||||||||||
59276 | ||||||||||
59277 | ||||||||||
59278 | ||||||||||
59279 | ||||||||||
59280 | ||||||||||
59281 | ||||||||||
59282 | ||||||||||
59283 | ||||||||||
59284 | ||||||||||
59285 | 10/09/1987 | Haymarket | ||||||||
59286 | ||||||||||
59287 | ||||||||||
59288 | ||||||||||
59289 | ||||||||||
59290 | ||||||||||
59291 | ||||||||||
59292 | ||||||||||
59293 | 31/03/1985 | Derby | ||||||||
59294 | ||||||||||
59295 | ||||||||||
59296 | ||||||||||
59297 | ||||||||||
59298 | ||||||||||
59299 | ||||||||||
59300 | ||||||||||
59301 | ||||||||||
59579 | 30/12/1968 | Laira | ||||||||
59580 | 29/09/1987 | Haymarket | ||||||||
59581 | ||||||||||
59582 | ||||||||||
59583 | ||||||||||
59584 | 30/12/1968 | Laira | ||||||||
59585 | 30/12/1968 | Laira | ||||||||
59586 | ||||||||||
59587 | ||||||||||
59588 | ||||||||||
59679 | 19/12/1959 | Kittybrewster | 64.32 | |||||||
59680 | 19/12/1959 | Kittybrewster | 64.32 | |||||||
59681 | 26/12/1959 | Kittybrewster | 29/09/1987 | Haymarket | 27.75 | 64.30 | ||||
59682 | 26/12/1959 | Kittybrewster | 10/09/1987 | Haymarket | 27.75 | 64.30 | ||||
59683 | 02/01/1960 | Kittybrewster | 64.28 | |||||||
59684 | 02/01/1960 | Kittybrewster | 64.28 | |||||||
59685 | 09/01/1960 | Kittybrewster | 64.26 |