D3/1 0-4-0
Date | Number (at time) | Depot (at time) | Code | Details | Ref | Link |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sat 25/02/1961 | D2904, D2912, D2912 |
1D, W8, 2A |
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Diesel repair shop. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Diesel repair shop. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Diesel repair shop. |
|||
Fri 15/12/1961 | D2908, D2908, D2909, D2909, D2913, D2913 |
2A, W8, 2A, W8, W8, 2A |
Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Diesel erecting shop. Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Diesel erecting shop. Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Diesel erecting shop. Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Diesel erecting shop. Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Ex-Works on shed. Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Ex-Works on shed. |
SLS 1/1962 | ||
Fri 16/03/1962 | D2904, D2912, D2912 |
1D, W8, 2A |
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Ex-Works on Derby shed. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Works sidings. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Works sidings. |
|||
Fri 06/04/1962 | D2908, D2908, D2912, D2912 |
2A, W8, 2A, W8 |
Derby Works visit: Around the works - Test house. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Test house. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Diesel erecting shop. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Diesel erecting shop. |
SLS 5/1962 | ||
Fri 08/06/1962 | D2911, D2911 |
2A, W8 |
Derby Works visit: Around the works - Test house. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Test house. |
SLS 7/1962 | ||
Sat 14/10/1967 | D2900, D2902, D2904, D2906, D2907, D2909, D2910, D2911, D2912, D2913 |
Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn |
Slag Reduction Co., Ickles scrapyard: Noted still intact in the scrapyard of the Slag Reduction Co., Ickles (Rotherham) | RCTS 1/1968 |