Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 396 Today
» 854 Yesterday
» 5365 Week
» 17878 Month
» 106070 Year
» 990451 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

D3/5 0-6-0


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
02/02/1955 To Service 13152   NEW 40B Immingham  
07/02/1955 To Service 13153   NEW 40B Immingham  
17/02/1955 To Service 13154   NEW 40B Immingham  
17/02/1955 To Service 13155   NEW 40B Immingham  
02/03/1955 To Service 13156   NEW 40B Immingham  
18/03/1955 To Service 13157   NEW 40B Immingham  
25/03/1955 To Service 13158   NEW 40B Immingham  
12/08/1955 To Service 13159   NEW 40B Immingham  
16/08/1955 To Service 13160   NEW 40B Immingham  
07/09/1955 To Service 13161   NEW 40B Immingham  
16/09/1955 To Service 13162   NEW 40B Immingham  
20/09/1955 To Service 13163   NEW 34A Kings Cross  
27/09/1955 To Service 13164   NEW 34A Kings Cross  
30/09/1955 Reallocation 13162 40B Immingham 30A Stratford  
06/10/1955 To Service 13165   NEW 34A Kings Cross  
12/10/1955 To Service 13166   NEW 34A Kings Cross  
18/02/1956 Reallocation 13158 40B Immingham 34A Kings Cross  
18/02/1956 Reallocation 13159 40B Immingham 34A Kings Cross  
18/02/1956 Reallocation 13160 40B Immingham 34A Kings Cross  
18/02/1956 Reallocation 13161 40B Immingham 34A Kings Cross  
16/02/1957 Reallocation 13159 34A Kings Cross 40B Immingham  
18/05/1957 Reallocation 13158 34A Kings Cross 40B Immingham  
18/05/1957 Reallocation 13160 34A Kings Cross 40B Immingham  
08/01/1958 Reallocation 13161 34A Kings Cross 40B Immingham  
08/01/1958 Reallocation 13162 30A Stratford 40B Immingham  
08/01/1958 Reallocation 13163 34A Kings Cross 40B Immingham  
08/01/1958 Reallocation 13164 34A Kings Cross 40B Immingham  
26/09/1959 Reallocation 3165 34A Kings Cross 40B Immingham  
26/09/1959 Reallocation 13166 34A Kings Cross 40B Immingham  
04/12/1965 Reallocation 3152 40B Immingham 16D Nottingham  
04/12/1965 Reallocation 3152 16D Nottingham 91E To Eastern Region  
04/12/1965 Reallocation 3153 40B Immingham 16D Nottingham  
04/12/1965 Reallocation 3153 16D Nottingham 91E To Eastern Region  
04/12/1965 Reallocation 3164 16D Nottingham 91E To Eastern Region  
04/12/1965 Reallocation 3164 40B Immingham 16D Nottingham  
04/12/1965 Reallocation 3165 40B Immingham 16D Nottingham  
04/12/1965 Reallocation 3165 16D Nottingham 91E To Eastern Region  
04/12/1965 Reallocation 3166 40B Immingham 16D Nottingham  
04/12/1965 Reallocation 3166 16D Nottingham 91E To Eastern Region  
11/12/1965 Reallocation 3152 91M To London Midland Region 40E Colwick  
11/12/1965 Reallocation 3152 91E To Eastern Region 91M To London Midland Region  
11/12/1965 Reallocation 3153 91M To London Midland Region 40E Colwick  
11/12/1965 Reallocation 3153 91E To Eastern Region 91M To London Midland Region  
11/12/1965 Reallocation 3164 91E To Eastern Region 91M To London Midland Region  
11/12/1965 Reallocation 3164 91M To London Midland Region 40E Colwick  
11/12/1965 Reallocation 3165 91E To Eastern Region 91M To London Midland Region  
11/12/1965 Reallocation 3165 91M To London Midland Region 40E Colwick  
11/12/1965 Reallocation 3166 91M To London Midland Region 40E Colwick  
11/12/1965 Reallocation 3166 91E To Eastern Region 91M To London Midland Region  
03/01/1966 Reallocation 3165 40E Colwick 16D Nottingham  
08/01/1966 Reallocation 3152 40E Colwick 16B Colwick  
08/01/1966 Reallocation 3153 40E Colwick 16B Colwick  
08/01/1966 Reallocation 3164 40E Colwick 16B Colwick  
08/01/1966 Reallocation 3165 16D Nottingham 16B Colwick  
08/01/1966 Reallocation 3166 40E Colwick 16B Colwick  
05/02/1966 Reallocation 3154 40B Immingham 16B Colwick  
05/02/1966 Reallocation 3156 40B Immingham 16B Colwick  
05/02/1966 Reallocation 3157 40B Immingham 16B Colwick  
05/02/1966 Reallocation 3160 40B Immingham 16B Colwick  
05/02/1966 Reallocation 3162 40B Immingham 16B Colwick  
19/02/1967 Condemned 3158 40B Immingham   COND  
08/07/1967 Condemned 3165 16B Colwick   COND  
15/07/1967 Condemned 3153 16B Colwick   COND  
15/07/1967 Condemned 3154 16B Colwick   COND  
15/07/1967 Condemned 3156 16B Colwick   COND  
15/07/1967 Condemned 3166 16B Colwick   COND  
17/09/1967 Condemned 3155 40B Immingham   COND  
17/09/1967 Condemned 3159 40B Immingham   COND  
17/09/1967 Condemned 3161 40B Immingham   COND  
17/09/1967 Condemned 3163 40B Immingham   COND  
30/09/1967 Condemned 3152 16B Colwick   COND  
30/09/1967 Condemned 3157 16B Colwick   COND  
14/10/1967 Condemned 3160 16B Colwick   COND  
18/11/1967 Condemned 3162 16B Colwick   COND  
18/11/1967 Condemned 3164 16B Colwick   COND