Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 301 Today
» 854 Yesterday
» 5270 Week
» 17783 Month
» 105975 Year
» 990356 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

D3/6 0-6-0


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
04/1936 To Service 7074   NEW 5A Crewe North  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7074 5A Crewe North 5B Crewe South  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7076     5B Crewe South  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7079     5B Crewe South  
16/06/1956 Condemned 12002 5B Crewe South   COND  
29/04/1961 Condemned 12000 5B Crewe South   COND  
03/02/1962 Condemned 12001 5B Crewe South   COND