Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 303 Today
» 815 Yesterday
» 303 Week
» 16282 Month
» 211736 Year
» 1096117 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

D3/6 0-6-0


Date Number (at time) Depot (at time) Code Details Ref Link
Sat 25/02/1961 12000 5B   Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Works sidings.    
Fri 15/12/1961 12000 Wdn   Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Works sidings. SLS 1/1962  
Fri 16/03/1962 12000 Wdn   Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Works sidings.    
Fri 06/04/1962 12000 Wdn   Derby Works visit: Around the works - Works sidings. SLS 5/1962  
Sun 15/04/1962 12001 Wdn   Horwich Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. SLS 5/1962  
Fri 08/06/1962 12000 Wdn   Derby Works visit: Around the works - Klondyke Sidings. SLS 7/1962