Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 29 Today
» 866 Yesterday
» 1701 Week
» 20022 Month
» 108214 Year
» 992595 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

DN DES1 0-6-0


LNER (1946) BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
8000 15000 12/08/1944 STR
MAR
5A
5A
5D
5B
W
ZE
Stratford (New)
March
Crewe Diesel (on loan)
Crewe Diesel
Stoke
Crewe South
Withdrawn
(on loan)
12/08/1944
20/06/1945
15/01/1966
05/02/1966
05/02/1966
23/04/1966
05/08/1967
10/1967
05/08/1967
8001 15001 12/08/1944 STR
STR
R
40B
31B
5A
5A
5D
5B
ZE
W
Stratford (New)
Stratford (on loan)
Reinstated
Immingham
March
Crewe Diesel (on loan)
Crewe Diesel
Stoke
Crewe South
(on loan)
Withdrawn
12/08/1944
06/1945
11/1945
21/01/1956
18/02/1956
15/01/1966
05/02/1966
05/02/1966
23/04/1966
03/11/1966
15/04/1967
15/04/1967
8002 15002 22/03/1945 STR
MAR
5A
5D
5A
5B
W
Stratford (New)
March
Crewe Diesel (on loan)
Stoke
Crewe Diesel
Crewe South
Withdrawn
22/03/1945
20/06/1945
15/01/1966
05/02/1966
05/02/1966
23/04/1966
05/08/1967
05/08/1967
8003 15003 22/03/1945 STR
MAR
5A
5A
5D
5B
W
Stratford (New)
March
Crewe Diesel (on loan)
Crewe Diesel
Stoke
Crewe South
Withdrawn
22/03/1945
20/06/1946
15/01/1966
05/02/1966
05/02/1966
23/04/1966
06/05/1967
06/05/1967