Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 304 Today
» 854 Yesterday
» 5273 Week
» 17786 Month
» 105978 Year
» 990359 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

DN DES1 0-6-0


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
12/08/1944 To Service 8000   NEW STR Stratford  
12/08/1944 To Service 8001   NEW STR Stratford  
22/03/1945 To Service 8002   NEW STR Stratford  
22/03/1945 To Service 8003   NEW STR Stratford  
06/1945 Reallocation 8001 STR Stratford 98Su Stratford  
20/06/1945 Reallocation 8000 STR Stratford MAR March  
20/06/1945 Reallocation 8002 STR Stratford MAR March  
11/1945 Reallocation 8001 98Su   MAR March  
20/06/1946 Reallocation 8003 STR Stratford MAR March  
21/01/1956 Reallocation 15001 MAR March 40B Immingham  
18/02/1956 Reallocation 15001 40B Immingham 31B March  
15/01/1966 Reallocation 15000 MAR March 31B Crewe Diesel  
15/01/1966 Reallocation 15001 31B March 31B Crewe Diesel  
15/01/1966 Reallocation 15002 MAR March 31B Crewe Diesel  
15/01/1966 Reallocation 15003 MAR March 31B Crewe Diesel  
05/02/1966 Reallocation 15000 31B March 5A Crewe Diesel  
05/02/1966 Reallocation 15000 5A Crewe Diesel 5D Stoke  
05/02/1966 Reallocation 15001 31B March 5A Crewe Diesel  
05/02/1966 Reallocation 15001 5A Crewe Diesel 5D Stoke  
05/02/1966 Reallocation 15002 31B March 5D Stoke  
05/02/1966 Reallocation 15002 31B March 5A Crewe Diesel  
05/02/1966 Reallocation 15003 31B March 5A Crewe Diesel  
05/02/1966 Reallocation 15003 5A Crewe Diesel 5D Stoke  
23/04/1966 Reallocation 15000 5D Stoke 5B Crewe South  
23/04/1966 Reallocation 15001 5D Stoke 5B Crewe South  
23/04/1966 Reallocation 15002 5D Stoke 5B Crewe South  
23/04/1966 Reallocation 15002 5A Crewe Diesel 5B Crewe South  
23/04/1966 Reallocation 15003 5D Stoke 5B Crewe South  
15/04/1967 Condemned 15001 98S     COND  
06/05/1967 Condemned 15003 5B Crewe South   COND  
05/08/1967 Condemned 15000 5B Crewe South   COND  
05/08/1967 Condemned 15002 5B Crewe South   COND