Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 37 Today
» 834 Yesterday
» 5469 Week
» 17290 Month
» 186062 Year
» 1070443 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

D3/10 0-6-0


BR (1955 Num) Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
2 15100 30/04/1936 PDN
87C
82B
82C
81C
82C
W
Old Oak Common
Danygraig
St Philips Marsh
Swindon
Southall
Swindon
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/12/1950
30/04/1951
30/01/1960
06/10/1962
31/08/1963
21/04/1965
21/04/1965