Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 121 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1029 Week
» 22011 Month
» 163965 Year
» 1048346 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

D3/10 0-6-0


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2     PDN Old Oak Common  
31/12/1950 Reallocation 15100 PDN Old Oak Common 87C Danygraig  
30/04/1951 Reallocation 15100 87C Danygraig 82B St Philips Marsh  
30/01/1960 Reallocation 15100 82B St Philips Marsh 82C Swindon  
06/10/1962 Reallocation 15100 82C Swindon 81C Southall  
31/08/1963 Reallocation 15100 81C Southall 82C Swindon  
21/04/1965 Condemned 15100 82C Swindon   COND