Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 232 Today
» 839 Yesterday
» 232 Week
» 18553 Month
» 106745 Year
» 991126 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

D3/11 0-6-0


BR (1955 Num) Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
15101 30/04/1948 84E
81A
88B
88M
86A
91M
2F
W
Tyseley
Old Oak Common
Cardiff East Dock
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff Canton
To London Midland Region
Bescot
Withdrawn
30/06/1951
24/01/1953
01/11/1958
03/11/1962
29/11/1964
01/05/1966
22/04/1967
05/08/1967
05/08/1967
15102 31/05/1948 88B
88M
86A
91M
2F
W
Cardiff East Dock
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff Canton
To London Midland Region
Bescot
Withdrawn
29/11/1958
03/11/1962
29/11/1964
01/05/1966
22/04/1967
22/07/1967
22/07/1967
15103 31/05/1948 84E
81A
88B
88M
86A
91M
2C
2F
W
Tyseley
Old Oak Common
Cardiff East Dock
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff Canton
To London Midland Region
Stourbridge Junction
Bescot
Withdrawn
30/06/1951
25/11/1953
29/11/1958
03/11/1962
29/11/1964
19/06/1966
25/06/1966
22/04/1967
26/08/1967
26/08/1967
15104 31/05/1948 88B
88M
86A
91M
2C
2F
W
Cardiff East Dock
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff Canton
To London Midland Region
Stourbridge Junction
Bescot
Withdrawn
29/11/1958
03/11/1962
29/11/1964
19/06/1966
16/07/1966
22/04/1967
22/07/1967
22/07/1967
15105 31/07/1948 88B
88M
86A
2G
2F
W
Cardiff East Dock
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff Canton
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Bescot
Withdrawn
27/12/1958
03/11/1962
29/11/1964
17/09/1966
22/04/1967
26/08/1967
26/08/1967
15106 31/07/1948 88B
88M
86A
2G
2F
W
Cardiff East Dock
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff Canton
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Bescot
Withdrawn
29/11/1958
03/11/1962
29/11/1964
17/09/1966
22/04/1967
26/08/1967
26/08/1967