Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 355 Today
» 1151 Yesterday
» 2577 Week
» 19228 Month
» 213072 Year
» 724174 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

D3/11 0-6-0


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
30/06/1951 Reallocation 15101     84E Tyseley  
30/06/1951 Reallocation 15103     84E Tyseley  
24/01/1953 Reallocation 15101 84E Tyseley 81A Old Oak Common  
25/11/1953 Reallocation 15103 84E Tyseley 81A Old Oak Common  
01/11/1958 Reallocation 15101 81A Old Oak Common 88B Cardiff East Dock  
29/11/1958 Reallocation 15102     88B Cardiff East Dock  
29/11/1958 Reallocation 15103 81A Old Oak Common 88B Cardiff East Dock  
29/11/1958 Reallocation 15104     88B Cardiff East Dock  
29/11/1958 Reallocation 15106     88B Cardiff East Dock  
27/12/1958 Reallocation 15105     88B Cardiff East Dock  
03/11/1962 Reallocation 15101 88B Cardiff East Dock 88M Cardiff Cathays  
03/11/1962 Reallocation 15102 88B Cardiff East Dock 88M Cardiff Cathays  
03/11/1962 Reallocation 15103 88B Cardiff East Dock 88M Cardiff Cathays  
03/11/1962 Reallocation 15104 88B Cardiff East Dock 88M Cardiff Cathays  
03/11/1962 Reallocation 15105 88B Cardiff East Dock 88M Cardiff Cathays  
03/11/1962 Reallocation 15106 88B Cardiff East Dock 88M Cardiff Cathays  
29/11/1964 Reallocation 15101 88M Cardiff Cathays 86A Cardiff Canton  
29/11/1964 Reallocation 15102 88M Cardiff Cathays 86A Cardiff Canton  
29/11/1964 Reallocation 15103 88M Cardiff Cathays 86A Cardiff Canton  
29/11/1964 Reallocation 15104 88M Cardiff Cathays 86A Cardiff Canton  
29/11/1964 Reallocation 15105 88M Cardiff Cathays 86A Cardiff Canton  
29/11/1964 Reallocation 15106 88M Cardiff Cathays 86A Cardiff Canton  
01/05/1966 Reallocation 15101 86A Cardiff Canton 91M To London Midland Region  
01/05/1966 Reallocation 15102 86A Cardiff Canton 91M To London Midland Region  
19/06/1966 Reallocation 15103 86A Cardiff Canton 91M To London Midland Region  
19/06/1966 Reallocation 15104 86A Cardiff Canton 91M To London Midland Region  
25/06/1966 Reallocation 15103 91M To London Midland Region 2C Stourbridge Junction  
16/07/1966 Reallocation 15104 91M To London Midland Region 2C Stourbridge Junction  
17/09/1966 Reallocation 15105 86A Cardiff Canton 2G Ryecroft (Walsall)  
17/09/1966 Reallocation 15106 86A Cardiff Canton 2G Ryecroft (Walsall)  
22/04/1967 Reallocation 15101 91M To London Midland Region 2F Bescot  
22/04/1967 Reallocation 15102 91M To London Midland Region 2F Bescot  
22/04/1967 Reallocation 15103 2C Stourbridge Junction 2F Bescot  
22/04/1967 Reallocation 15104 2C Stourbridge Junction 2F Bescot  
22/04/1967 Reallocation 15105 2G Ryecroft (Walsall) 2F Bescot  
22/04/1967 Reallocation 15106 2G Ryecroft (Walsall) 2F Bescot  
22/07/1967 Condemned 15102 2F Bescot   COND  
22/07/1967 Condemned 15104 2F Bescot   COND  
05/08/1967 Condemned 15101 2F Bescot   COND  
26/08/1967 Condemned 15103 2F Bescot   COND  
26/08/1967 Condemned 15105 2F Bescot   COND  
26/08/1967 Condemned 15106 2F Bescot   COND