D3/11 0-6-0
BR (1955 Num) | Date To Service | Bld | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) | Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
15101 | 15/04/1948 | SW | 05/08/1967 | Bescot | 19.33 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 10/1969 | 21.52 | ||
15102 | 20/04/1948 | SW | 22/07/1967 | Bescot | 19.25 | Cut | Steelbreaking and Dismantling Co. (Chesterfield) | 09/1968 | 20.42 | ||
15103 | 21/05/1948 | SW | 26/08/1967 | Bescot | 19.25 | Cut | Steelbreaking and Dismantling Co. (Chesterfield) | 09/1968 | 20.33 | ||
15104 | 31/05/1948 | SW | 22/07/1967 | Bescot | 19.17 | Cut | Steelbreaking and Dismantling Co. (Chesterfield) | 09/1968 | 20.31 | ||
15105 | 02/07/1948 | SW | 26/08/1967 | Bescot | 19.08 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 10/1969 | 21.30 | ||
15106 | 09/07/1948 | SW | 26/08/1967 | Bescot | 19.08 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 09/1969 | 21.20 |