Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 30 Today
» 866 Yesterday
» 1702 Week
» 20023 Month
» 108215 Year
» 992596 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

D3/12 0-6-0


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1     NORW Norwood Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 2     NORW Norwood Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 3     NORW Norwood Junction  
30/04/1951 Reallocation 15202 NORW Norwood Junction 91W To Western Region / GWR Used to shunt Acton yard.
30/04/1951 Reallocation 15203 NORW Norwood Junction 91W To Western Region / GWR Used to shunt Acton yard
20/07/1953 Reallocation 15202 91W To Western Region / GWR 75C Norwood Junction  
20/07/1953 Reallocation 15203 91W To Western Region / GWR 75C Norwood Junction  
17/11/1956 Reallocation 15202 75C Norwood Junction 73C Hither Green  
01/02/1962 Reallocation 15201 NORW Norwood Junction 73C Hither Green  
19/08/1963 Reallocation 15201 73C Hither Green 71A Eastleigh  
09/12/1963 Reallocation 15202 73C Hither Green 73F Ashford Chart Leacon  
29/11/1964 Condemned 15201 71A Eastleigh   COND  
29/11/1964 Condemned 15203 75C Norwood Junction   COND  
13/12/1964 Condemned 15202 73F Ashford Chart Leacon   COND