Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 326 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 5931 Week
» 17478 Month
» 417160 Year
» 493747 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

188


BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
79470 17/08/1957 To Western Region / GWR 24/07/1981 23.92 60.37
79471 18/05/1957 To Western Region / GWR 60.62
79472 18/05/1957 To Western Region / GWR 60.62
79473 25/05/1957 To Western Region / GWR 60.60
79474
79475 03/09/1956 St Margarets 61.33
79476 17/09/1956 St Margarets 61.29
79477 01/10/1956 St Margarets 61.25
79478 15/10/1956 St Margarets 61.21
79479 30/10/1956 St Margarets 61.17
79480 12/11/1956 St Margarets 61.13
79481 26/11/1956 St Margarets 61.10
79482 18/12/1956 St Margarets 61.04