BR Standard Riddles "Std 9F" Class 2-10-0
Date | Number (at time) | Depot (at time) | Code | Details | Ref | Link |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sun 22/08/1954 | 92002 | 86A | Swindon Works visit: Around the works. - In "A" shop. | RO 9/1954 | ||
Sat 11/02/1961 | 92202 | 40B | Darlington Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop. | |||
Sat 18/02/1961 | 92239 | 81C | Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop. | |||
Sat 25/02/1961 | 92239 | 81C | Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop. | |||
Sat 11/11/1961 | 92183, 92194, 92195 |
34E, 40B, 40B |
Darlington Works visit: Around the Works - Works yard. Darlington Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Darlington Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
SLS 1/1962 | ||
Sun 12/11/1961 | 92212, 92233, 92241, 92245 |
82F, 88A, 88A, 88A |
Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - Works sidings. Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - "A" shop. Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - "A" shop. Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - "A" shop. |
SLS 1/1962 | ||
Sun 26/11/1961 | 92016, 92017, 92018, 92018, 92025, 92025, 92076, 92082, 92082, 92125, 92125, 92163, 92163 |
26A, 26A, 15A, MRM13, MRM13, 15A, 16D, 15A, MRM13, MRM12, 15B, MRM12, 15B |
Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Works sidings. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Works sidings. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Works sidings. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Minor repair road. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Minor repair road. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Works sidings. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Works sidings. |
SLS 1/1962 | ||
Sun 26/11/1961 | 92239 | 71A | Eastleigh Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. | SLS 1/1962 | ||
Sun 04/03/1962 | 92222, 92237 |
86A, 88A |
Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - "A" shop. Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - "A" shop. |
|||
Sun 04/03/1962 | 92227 | 88A | Wolverhampton Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop. | |||
Sun 18/03/1962 | 92014, 92092, 92102, 92102 |
16D, 16D, MRM10, 15C |
Gorton Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop. Gorton Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop. Gorton Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop. Gorton Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop. |
|||
Sun 25/03/1962 | 92097, 92098, 92144, 92194, 92198 |
52H, 52H, 34E, 40B, 36A |
Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Works yard. Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Waiting entry to works on Da Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Works yard. Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. |
SLS 5/1962 | ||
Sun 08/04/1962 | 92022, 92022, 92045, 92046, 92054, 92054, 92120, 92120 |
15A, MRM13, 6F, 6F, MRM13, 15A, 15C, MRM10 |
Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Works yard. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Works yard. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Works yard. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Works yard. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Works yard. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. |
SLS 5/1962 | ||
Sun 29/11/1964 | 92223 | 2A | Swindon Works visit: In 'A' shop | RO 1/1965 | ||
Sun 21/03/1965 | 92206 | 50A | A visit to Kirkby in Ashfield shed: On shed - steam raising in progress | John Thickitt - depot visit | ||
Fri 06/05/1966 | 92179 | Wdn | Hughes Bolckow Scrapyard: Dumped | RO 8/1966 | ||
Sat 07/05/1966 | 92230, 92244, 92250 |
Wdn, Wdn, Wdn |
Cashmore's Scrapyard, Newport: Dumped Cashmore's Scrapyard, Newport: Dumped Cashmore's Scrapyard, Newport: Dumped |
RO 8/1966 | ||
Sun 21/08/1966 | 92138, 92138 |
W35, 8C |
A visit to Heaton Mersey shed: On shed A visit to Heaton Mersey shed: On shed |
John Thickitt | ||
Sat 29/04/1967 | 92153, 92153 |
W35, 8C |
A visit to Wigan Springs Branch shed: On shed A visit to Wigan Springs Branch shed: On shed |
John Thickitt | ||
Sat 29/04/1967 | 92009 | 86E | Lineside at Ince: Passing - Hauled an eastbound freight, formed of several wagon types, across the WCML at Ince. | John Thickitt |