BR Standard Riddles "Std 9F" Class 2-10-0
BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
92020 | 21/03/1955 | Wellingborough | 21/10/1967 | 12.58 | Cut | Buttigiegs (Newport) | 04/1968 | 13.08 | |
92021 | 21/03/1955 | Wellingborough | 11/11/1967 | Speke Junction | 12.67 | Cut | Campbells (Airdrie) | 01/1968 | 12.83 |
92022 | 21/03/1955 | Wellingborough | 11/11/1967 | Speke Junction | 12.67 | Cut | Campbells (Airdrie) | 04/1968 | 13.08 |
92023 | 21/03/1955 | Rugby Testing Station | 11/11/1967 | Speke Junction | 12.67 | Cut | Campbells (Airdrie) | 04/1968 | 13.08 |
92024 | 11/06/1955 | Wellingborough | 11/11/1967 | Speke Junction | 12.42 | Cut | Campbells (Airdrie) | 05/1968 | 12.94 |
92025 | 18/06/1955 | Wellingborough | 11/11/1967 | Speke Junction | 12.42 | Cut | Campbells (Airdrie) | 04/1968 | 12.84 |
92026 | 18/06/1955 | Wellingborough | 11/11/1967 | Speke Junction | 12.42 | Cut | Campbells (Airdrie) | 04/1968 | 12.84 |
92027 | 25/06/1955 | Wellingborough | 05/08/1967 | 12.17 | Cut | Buttigiegs (Newport) | 12/1967 | 12.48 | |
92028 | 09/07/1955 | Wellingborough | 22/10/1966 | 11.25 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 01/1967 | 11.53 | |
92029 | 09/07/1955 | Wellingborough | 11/11/1967 | Speke Junction | 12.33 | Cut | Campbells (Airdrie) | 28/02/1968 | 12.65 |