12/1952 |
To Service |
76021 |
|
NEW |
50A |
York (North) |
|
12/1952 |
To Service |
76022 |
|
NEW |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
12/1952 |
To Service |
76023 |
|
NEW |
54A |
Sunderland |
|
01/12/1952 |
To Service |
76000 |
|
NEW |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
05/12/1952 |
To Service |
76001 |
|
NEW |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
11/12/1952 |
To Service |
76002 |
|
NEW |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
18/12/1952 |
To Service |
76020 |
|
NEW |
51A |
Darlington |
|
19/12/1952 |
To Service |
76003 |
|
NEW |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
24/12/1952 |
To Service |
76004 |
|
NEW |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
31/12/1952 |
To Service |
76005 |
|
NEW |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
01/1953 |
To Service |
76024 |
|
NEW |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
16/01/1953 |
To Service |
76006 |
|
NEW |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
30/01/1953 |
To Service |
76007 |
|
NEW |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
02/1953 |
To Service |
76008 |
|
NEW |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
14/02/1953 |
Reallocation |
76021 |
50A |
York (North) |
50B |
Neville Hill |
|
26/02/1953 |
To Service |
76009 |
|
NEW |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
09/03/1953 |
To Service |
76010 |
|
NEW |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
21/03/1953 |
Reallocation |
76024 |
52A |
Gateshead |
52C |
Blaydon |
|
23/03/1953 |
To Service |
76011 |
|
NEW |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
31/03/1953 |
To Service |
76012 |
|
NEW |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
04/1953 |
Reallocation |
76012 |
|
|
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
15/04/1953 |
To Service |
76013 |
|
NEW |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
18/04/1953 |
Reallocation |
76021 |
50B |
Neville Hill |
50C |
Selby |
|
18/04/1953 |
Reallocation |
76024 |
52C |
Blaydon |
52E |
Percy Main |
|
28/04/1953 |
To Service |
76014 |
|
NEW |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
05/1953 |
Reallocation |
76014 |
|
|
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
13/05/1953 |
To Service |
76015 |
|
NEW |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
16/05/1953 |
Reallocation |
76024 |
52E |
Percy Main |
52D.1 |
Alnmouth |
|
26/05/1953 |
To Service |
76016 |
|
NEW |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
13/06/1953 |
To Service |
76017 |
|
NEW |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
20/06/1953 |
Reallocation |
76021 |
50C |
Selby |
50F |
Malton |
|
26/06/1953 |
To Service |
76018 |
|
NEW |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
11/07/1953 |
To Service |
76019 |
|
NEW |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
20/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
76005 |
71A |
Eastleigh |
71B |
Bournemouth |
|
20/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
76006 |
71A |
Eastleigh |
71B |
Bournemouth |
|
29/09/1953 |
To Service |
76025 |
|
NEW |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
10/1953 |
Reallocation |
76025 |
|
|
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
10/1953 |
To Service |
76026 |
|
NEW |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
10/1953 |
To Service |
76028 |
|
NEW |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
01/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
76005 |
71B |
Bournemouth |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
01/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
76006 |
71B |
Bournemouth |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
15/10/1953 |
To Service |
76027 |
|
NEW |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
11/1953 |
To Service |
76029 |
|
NEW |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
17/11/1953 |
To Service |
76030 |
|
NEW |
30A |
Stratford |
|
27/11/1953 |
To Service |
76031 |
|
NEW |
30A |
Stratford |
|
12/1953 |
To Service |
76034 |
|
NEW |
30A |
Stratford |
|
09/12/1953 |
To Service |
76032 |
|
NEW |
30A |
Stratford |
|
17/12/1953 |
To Service |
76033 |
|
NEW |
30A |
Stratford |
|
01/1954 |
Reallocation |
76005 |
71A |
Eastleigh |
75A |
Brighton |
|
01/1954 |
Reallocation |
76006 |
71A |
Eastleigh |
75A |
Brighton |
|
23/01/1954 |
Reallocation |
76021 |
50F |
Malton |
50C |
Selby |
|
24/04/1954 |
Reallocation |
76024 |
52D.1 |
Alnmouth |
52C.1 |
Alston |
|
13/05/1954 |
Reallocation |
76005 |
75A |
Brighton |
71C |
Dorchester |
|
13/05/1954 |
Reallocation |
76006 |
75A |
Brighton |
71C |
Dorchester |
|
28/05/1954 |
To Service |
76035 |
|
NEW |
34E |
Neasden |
|
08/06/1954 |
To Service |
76036 |
|
NEW |
34E |
Neasden |
|
11/06/1954 |
To Service |
76037 |
|
NEW |
34E |
Neasden |
|
01/07/1954 |
To Service |
76038 |
|
NEW |
34E |
Neasden |
|
09/07/1954 |
To Service |
76039 |
|
NEW |
34E |
Neasden |
|
23/07/1954 |
To Service |
76040 |
|
NEW |
34E |
Neasden |
|
30/07/1954 |
To Service |
76041 |
|
NEW |
34E |
Neasden |
|
08/1954 |
To Service |
76044 |
|
NEW |
34E |
Neasden |
|
06/08/1954 |
To Service |
76042 |
|
NEW |
34E |
Neasden |
|
10/08/1954 |
To Service |
76043 |
|
NEW |
34E |
Neasden |
|
03/1955 |
To Service |
76046 |
|
NEW |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
09/03/1955 |
To Service |
76045 |
|
NEW |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
11/03/1955 |
Reallocation |
76005 |
71C |
Dorchester |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
11/03/1955 |
Reallocation |
76006 |
71C |
Dorchester |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
18/03/1955 |
To Service |
76047 |
|
NEW |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
19/03/1955 |
Reallocation |
76035 |
34E |
Neasden |
34D |
Hitchin (GNR) |
|
25/03/1955 |
To Service |
76048 |
|
NEW |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
01/04/1955 |
To Service |
76049 |
|
NEW |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
16/04/1955 |
Reallocation |
76001 |
66B |
Motherwell |
63A.1 |
Blair Atholl |
|
23/04/1955 |
To Service |
76053 |
|
NEW |
75B |
Redhill |
|
30/04/1955 |
To Service |
76054 |
|
NEW |
75B |
Redhill |
|
30/04/1955 |
To Service |
76055 |
|
NEW |
75B |
Redhill |
|
14/05/1955 |
Reallocation |
76001 |
63A.1 |
Blair Atholl |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
14/05/1955 |
To Service |
76056 |
|
NEW |
75B |
Redhill |
|
21/05/1955 |
To Service |
76057 |
|
NEW |
75B |
Redhill |
|
06/1955 |
To Service |
76058 |
|
NEW |
75B |
Redhill |
|
06/1955 |
To Service |
76059 |
|
NEW |
75B |
Redhill |
|
18/06/1955 |
Reallocation |
76023 |
54A |
Sunderland |
51C |
West Hartlepool |
|
18/06/1955 |
Reallocation |
76035 |
34D |
Hitchin (GNR) |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
|
18/06/1955 |
Reallocation |
76049 |
52A |
Gateshead |
52C |
Blaydon |
|
21/06/1955 |
Reallocation |
76005 |
71A |
Eastleigh |
72B |
Salisbury |
|
21/06/1955 |
Reallocation |
76006 |
71A |
Eastleigh |
72B |
Salisbury |
|
21/06/1955 |
Reallocation |
76008 |
71A |
Eastleigh |
72B |
Salisbury |
|
07/1955 |
To Service |
76060 |
|
NEW |
75B |
Redhill |
|
07/1955 |
To Service |
76061 |
|
NEW |
75B |
Redhill |
|
07/1955 |
To Service |
76062 |
|
NEW |
75B |
Redhill |
|
23/07/1955 |
Reallocation |
76046 |
52A |
Gateshead |
52C |
Blaydon |
|
22/10/1955 |
Reallocation |
76045 |
52A |
Gateshead |
52C |
Blaydon |
|
22/10/1955 |
Reallocation |
76047 |
52A |
Gateshead |
52C |
Blaydon |
|
22/10/1955 |
Reallocation |
76048 |
52A |
Gateshead |
52C |
Blaydon |
|
21/01/1956 |
Reallocation |
76045 |
52C |
Blaydon |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
21/01/1956 |
Reallocation |
76049 |
52C |
Blaydon |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
76021 |
50C |
Selby |
51F |
West Auckland |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
76022 |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
51H |
Kirkby Stephen |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
76024 |
52C.1 |
Alston |
51F |
West Auckland |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
76045 |
52A |
Gateshead |
51F |
West Auckland |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
76046 |
52C |
Blaydon |
51F |
West Auckland |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
76047 |
52C |
Blaydon |
51H |
Kirkby Stephen |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
76048 |
52C |
Blaydon |
51H |
Kirkby Stephen |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
76049 |
52A |
Gateshead |
51F |
West Auckland |
|
07/1956 |
To Service |
76063 |
|
NEW |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
07/1956 |
To Service |
76064 |
|
NEW |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
07/1956 |
To Service |
76065 |
|
NEW |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
07/1956 |
To Service |
76066 |
|
NEW |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
21/07/1956 |
Reallocation |
76020 |
51A |
Darlington |
51H |
Kirkby Stephen |
|
21/07/1956 |
Reallocation |
76023 |
51C |
West Hartlepool |
51H |
Kirkby Stephen |
|
08/1956 |
To Service |
76050 |
|
NEW |
51A |
Darlington |
|
08/1956 |
To Service |
76067 |
|
NEW |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
08/1956 |
To Service |
76068 |
|
NEW |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
15/08/1956 |
To Service |
76069 |
|
NEW |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
27/08/1956 |
Reallocation |
76009 |
71A |
Eastleigh |
75B |
Redhill |
|
27/08/1956 |
Reallocation |
76014 |
71A |
Eastleigh |
75B |
Redhill |
|
31/08/1956 |
To Service |
76051 |
|
NEW |
50A |
York (North) |
|
06/09/1956 |
To Service |
76052 |
|
NEW |
50A |
York (North) |
|
27/09/1956 |
To Service |
76070 |
|
NEW |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
05/10/1956 |
To Service |
76071 |
|
NEW |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
12/10/1956 |
To Service |
76072 |
|
NEW |
68B |
Dumfries |
|
20/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
76050 |
51A |
Darlington |
51F |
West Auckland |
|
20/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
76051 |
50A |
York (North) |
51H |
Kirkby Stephen |
|
20/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
76052 |
50A |
York (North) |
51H |
Kirkby Stephen |
|
20/10/1956 |
To Service |
76073 |
|
NEW |
68B |
Dumfries |
|
02/11/1956 |
To Service |
76074 |
|
NEW |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
14/12/1956 |
To Service |
76075 |
|
NEW |
10D |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
19/12/1956 |
To Service |
76076 |
|
NEW |
10D |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
27/12/1956 |
To Service |
76077 |
|
NEW |
10D |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
29/12/1956 |
To Service |
76078 |
|
NEW |
10D |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
25/01/1957 |
Reallocation |
76009 |
75B |
Redhill |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
25/01/1957 |
Reallocation |
76014 |
75B |
Redhill |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
30/01/1957 |
To Service |
76079 |
|
NEW |
10D |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
02/1957 |
Reallocation |
76079 |
|
|
10D |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
08/02/1957 |
To Service |
76080 |
|
NEW |
24D |
Lower Darwen |
|
21/02/1957 |
To Service |
76081 |
|
NEW |
24D |
Lower Darwen |
|
03/1957 |
To Service |
76082 |
|
NEW |
24D |
Lower Darwen |
|
20/03/1957 |
To Service |
76083 |
|
NEW |
24D |
Lower Darwen |
|
28/03/1957 |
To Service |
76084 |
|
NEW |
24D |
Lower Darwen |
|
04/1957 |
Reallocation |
76084 |
|
|
24D |
Lower Darwen |
|
10/04/1957 |
To Service |
76085 |
|
NEW |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
23/04/1957 |
To Service |
76086 |
|
NEW |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
05/1957 |
Reallocation |
76086 |
|
|
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
07/05/1957 |
To Service |
76087 |
|
NEW |
17F |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
16/05/1957 |
To Service |
76088 |
|
NEW |
17F |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
25/05/1957 |
To Service |
76089 |
|
NEW |
17F |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
30/05/1957 |
To Service |
76100 |
|
NEW |
65D |
Dawsholm |
|
06/1957 |
Reallocation |
76089 |
|
|
17F |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
06/06/1957 |
To Service |
76090 |
|
NEW |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
06/06/1957 |
To Service |
76101 |
|
NEW |
65D |
Dawsholm |
|
14/06/1957 |
To Service |
76102 |
|
NEW |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
19/06/1957 |
To Service |
76091 |
|
NEW |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
21/06/1957 |
To Service |
76103 |
|
NEW |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
28/06/1957 |
To Service |
76092 |
|
NEW |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
07/1957 |
To Service |
76106 |
|
NEW |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
|
06/07/1957 |
To Service |
76104 |
|
NEW |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
|
11/07/1957 |
To Service |
76093 |
|
NEW |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
13/07/1957 |
To Service |
76105 |
|
NEW |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
|
08/1957 |
To Service |
76095 |
|
NEW |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
01/08/1957 |
To Service |
76107 |
|
NEW |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
|
08/08/1957 |
To Service |
76094 |
|
NEW |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
10/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
76085 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
21A |
Saltley |
|
10/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
76087 |
17F |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
21A |
Saltley |
|
10/08/1957 |
To Service |
76108 |
|
NEW |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
|
20/08/1957 |
To Service |
76109 |
|
NEW |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
20/08/1957 |
To Service |
76110 |
|
NEW |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
20/08/1957 |
To Service |
76111 |
|
NEW |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
04/09/1957 |
To Service |
76096 |
|
NEW |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
19/09/1957 |
To Service |
76112 |
|
NEW |
68B |
Dumfries |
|
25/09/1957 |
To Service |
76097 |
|
NEW |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
02/10/1957 |
To Service |
76113 |
|
NEW |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
17/10/1957 |
To Service |
76098 |
|
NEW |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
17/10/1957 |
To Service |
76114 |
|
NEW |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
27/11/1957 |
To Service |
76099 |
|
NEW |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
21/12/1957 |
Reallocation |
76112 |
68B |
Dumfries |
68C |
Stranraer |
|
06/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
76007 |
71A |
Eastleigh |
71A |
Salisbury |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
76084 |
24D |
Lower Darwen |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
11/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
76048 |
51H |
Kirkby Stephen |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
13/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
76007 |
71A |
Eastleigh |
72B |
Salisbury |
|
13/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
76009 |
71A |
Eastleigh |
72C |
Yeovil Town |
|
13/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
76010 |
71A |
Eastleigh |
72C |
Yeovil Town |
|
13/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
76011 |
71A |
Eastleigh |
72C |
Yeovil Town |
|
25/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
76048 |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
24G |
Skipton |
|
25/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
76084 |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
24G |
Skipton |
|
10/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
76085 |
21A |
Saltley |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
10/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
76086 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
10/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
76087 |
21A |
Saltley |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
21/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
76084 |
24G |
Skipton |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
11/03/1959 |
Reallocation |
76009 |
72C |
Yeovil Town |
72B |
Salisbury |
|
11/03/1959 |
Reallocation |
76010 |
72C |
Yeovil Town |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
11/03/1959 |
Reallocation |
76011 |
72C |
Yeovil Town |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
28/03/1959 |
Reallocation |
76084 |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
24D |
Lower Darwen |
|
11/04/1959 |
Reallocation |
76102 |
65C |
Parkhead |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
11/04/1959 |
Reallocation |
76103 |
65C |
Parkhead |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
30/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
76020 |
51H |
Kirkby Stephen |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
30/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
76048 |
24G |
Skipton |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
06/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
76020 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
14/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
76059 |
75B |
Redhill |
72B |
Salisbury |
|
14/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
76060 |
75B |
Redhill |
72B |
Salisbury |
|
14/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
76061 |
75B |
Redhill |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
14/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
76062 |
75B |
Redhill |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
76024 |
51F |
West Auckland |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
26/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
76056 |
75B |
Redhill |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
26/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
76057 |
75B |
Redhill |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
26/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
76058 |
75B |
Redhill |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
28/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
76024 |
52A |
Gateshead |
52B |
Heaton |
|
31/12/1959 |
Reallocation |
76056 |
71A |
Eastleigh |
71B |
Bournemouth |
|
31/12/1959 |
Reallocation |
76057 |
71A |
Eastleigh |
71B |
Bournemouth |
|
31/12/1959 |
Reallocation |
76058 |
71A |
Eastleigh |
71B |
Bournemouth |
|
16/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
76109 |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
62C |
Dunfermline Upper |
|
10/03/1960 |
Reallocation |
76006 |
72B |
Salisbury |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
10/03/1960 |
Reallocation |
76009 |
72B |
Salisbury |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
10/03/1960 |
Reallocation |
76017 |
71A |
Eastleigh |
72B |
Salisbury |
|
10/03/1960 |
Reallocation |
76018 |
71A |
Eastleigh |
72B |
Salisbury |
|
10/03/1960 |
Reallocation |
76059 |
72B |
Salisbury |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
10/03/1960 |
Reallocation |
76060 |
72B |
Salisbury |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
10/03/1960 |
Reallocation |
76066 |
71A |
Eastleigh |
72B |
Salisbury |
|
10/03/1960 |
Reallocation |
76067 |
71A |
Eastleigh |
72B |
Salisbury |
|
05/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
76062 |
71A |
Eastleigh |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
30/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
76022 |
51H |
Kirkby Stephen |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
30/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
76023 |
51H |
Kirkby Stephen |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
30/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
76051 |
51H |
Kirkby Stephen |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
05/1960 |
Reallocation |
76001 |
66B |
Motherwell |
63C |
Oban |
|
06/05/1960 |
Reallocation |
76053 |
75B |
Redhill |
72B |
Salisbury |
|
06/05/1960 |
Reallocation |
76054 |
75B |
Redhill |
72B |
Salisbury |
|
06/05/1960 |
Reallocation |
76055 |
75B |
Redhill |
72B |
Salisbury |
|
07/05/1960 |
Reallocation |
76110 |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
62C |
Dunfermline Upper |
|
07/05/1960 |
Reallocation |
76111 |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
62C |
Dunfermline Upper |
|
14/05/1960 |
Reallocation |
76052 |
51H |
Kirkby Stephen |
14D |
Neasden |
|
04/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
76106 |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
61C |
Keith |
|
04/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
76107 |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
61C |
Keith |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
76030 |
30A |
Stratford |
31A |
Cambridge |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
76032 |
30A |
Stratford |
31A |
Cambridge |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
76033 |
30A |
Stratford |
31A |
Cambridge |
|
25/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
76047 |
51H |
Kirkby Stephen |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
02/07/1960 |
Reallocation |
76001 |
63C |
Oban |
63B |
Fort William |
|
09/07/1960 |
Reallocation |
76024 |
52B |
Heaton |
52G |
Sunderland |
|
10/07/1960 |
Reallocation |
76100 |
65D |
Dawsholm |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
30/07/1960 |
Reallocation |
76102 |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
30/07/1960 |
Reallocation |
76103 |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
30/07/1960 |
Reallocation |
76114 |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
06/08/1960 |
Reallocation |
76023 |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
10/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
76088 |
17F |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
14D |
Neasden |
|
17/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
76030 |
31A |
Cambridge |
31B |
March |
|
17/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
76032 |
31A |
Cambridge |
31B |
March |
|
17/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
76033 |
31A |
Cambridge |
31B |
March |
|
26/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
76031 |
30A |
Stratford |
31B |
March |
|
26/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
76034 |
30A |
Stratford |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
10/12/1960 |
Reallocation |
76088 |
14D |
Neasden |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
17/12/1960 |
Reallocation |
76102 |
65C |
Parkhead |
65D |
Dawsholm |
|
14/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
76090 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
14/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
76091 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
14/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
76093 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
14/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
76094 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
11/02/1961 |
Reallocation |
76113 |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
24/02/1961 |
Reallocation |
76100 |
65C |
Parkhead |
65D |
Dawsholm |
|
11/03/1961 |
Reallocation |
76095 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
11/03/1961 |
Reallocation |
76103 |
65C |
Parkhead |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
26/05/1961 |
Reallocation |
76025 |
71A |
Eastleigh |
71B |
Bournemouth |
|
01/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
76104 |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
01/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
76105 |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
01/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
76106 |
61C |
Keith |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
01/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
76107 |
61C |
Keith |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
01/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
76108 |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
06/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
76015 |
71A |
Eastleigh |
71B |
Bournemouth |
|
23/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
76019 |
71A |
Eastleigh |
71B |
Bournemouth |
|
23/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
76026 |
71A |
Eastleigh |
71B |
Bournemouth |
|
26/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
76074 |
65A |
Eastfield |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
16/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
76024 |
52G |
Sunderland |
50A |
York (North) |
|
16/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
76034 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
31B |
March |
|
21/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
76074 |
65C |
Parkhead |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
21/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
76091 |
65C |
Parkhead |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
21/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
76093 |
65C |
Parkhead |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
21/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
76094 |
65C |
Parkhead |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
21/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
76103 |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
21/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
76114 |
65C |
Parkhead |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
18/11/1961 |
Reallocation |
76113 |
65C |
Parkhead |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
30/12/1961 |
Reallocation |
76095 |
65C |
Parkhead |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
30/12/1961 |
Reallocation |
76105 |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
30/12/1961 |
Reallocation |
76106 |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
10/02/1962 |
Reallocation |
76022 |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
10/02/1962 |
Reallocation |
76051 |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
05/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
76027 |
71A |
Eastleigh |
71B |
Bournemouth |
|
05/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
76058 |
71B |
Bournemouth |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
24/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
76111 |
62C |
Dunfermline Upper |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
19/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
76113 |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
19/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
76114 |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
16/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
76096 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
67C |
Ayr |
|
16/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
76097 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
67C |
Ayr |
|
16/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
76099 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
67C |
Ayr |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
76024 |
50A |
York (North) |
51L |
Thornaby |
|
30/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
76035 |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
30/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
76036 |
34E |
Neasden |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
30/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
76037 |
34E |
Neasden |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
30/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
76038 |
34E |
Neasden |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
30/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
76039 |
34E |
Neasden |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
30/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
76040 |
34E |
Neasden |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
30/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
76041 |
34E |
Neasden |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
30/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
76044 |
34E |
Neasden |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
07/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
76043 |
34E |
Neasden |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
07/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
76052 |
14D |
Neasden |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
14/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
76022 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
21D |
Aston |
|
14/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
76042 |
34E |
Neasden |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
14/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
76051 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
21D |
Aston |
|
21/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
76020 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
21D |
Aston |
|
21/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
76023 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
21D |
Aston |
|
08/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
76001 |
63B |
Fort William |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
08/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
76090 |
65C |
Parkhead |
68D |
Beattock |
|
22/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
76047 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
22/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
76048 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
22/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
76085 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
22/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
76087 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
22/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
76088 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
22/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
76089 |
17F |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
08/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
76030 |
31B |
March |
75A |
Brighton |
|
08/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
76031 |
31B |
March |
75A |
Brighton |
|
08/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
76032 |
31B |
March |
75A |
Brighton |
|
08/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
76033 |
31B |
March |
75A |
Brighton |
|
08/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
76034 |
31B |
March |
75A |
Brighton |
|
22/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
76020 |
21D |
Aston |
5D |
Stoke |
|
22/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
76022 |
21D |
Aston |
5D |
Stoke |
|
22/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
76023 |
21D |
Aston |
5D |
Stoke |
|
22/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
76051 |
21D |
Aston |
5D |
Stoke |
|
19/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
76004 |
66B |
Motherwell |
66D |
Greenock Ladyburn |
|
19/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
76070 |
66B |
Motherwell |
66D |
Greenock Ladyburn |
|
19/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
76071 |
66B |
Motherwell |
66D |
Greenock Ladyburn |
|
19/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
76075 |
10D |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
5D |
Stoke |
|
19/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
76099 |
67C |
Ayr |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
19/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
76108 |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
67B |
Hurlford |
|
16/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
76030 |
75A |
Brighton |
70C |
Guildford |
|
16/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
76031 |
75A |
Brighton |
70C |
Guildford |
|
16/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
76032 |
75A |
Brighton |
70C |
Guildford |
|
16/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
76033 |
75A |
Brighton |
70C |
Guildford |
|
16/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
76034 |
75A |
Brighton |
70C |
Guildford |
|
21/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
76086 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
5D |
Stoke |
|
21/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
76088 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
5D |
Stoke |
|
28/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
76047 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
5D |
Stoke |
|
28/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
76085 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
5D |
Stoke |
|
12/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
76020 |
5D |
Stoke |
5F |
Uttoxeter |
|
12/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
76022 |
5D |
Stoke |
5F |
Uttoxeter |
|
12/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
76023 |
5D |
Stoke |
5F |
Uttoxeter |
|
12/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
76047 |
5D |
Stoke |
2E |
Saltley |
|
12/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
76052 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
2E |
Saltley |
|
12/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
76085 |
5D |
Stoke |
2E |
Saltley |
|
12/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
76086 |
5D |
Stoke |
2E |
Saltley |
|
12/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
76087 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
2E |
Saltley |
|
12/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
76088 |
5D |
Stoke |
2E |
Saltley |
|
02/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
76021 |
51F |
West Auckland |
67B |
Hurlford |
|
02/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
76024 |
51L |
Thornaby |
67B |
Hurlford |
|
02/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
76045 |
51F |
West Auckland |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
02/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
76046 |
51F |
West Auckland |
65D |
Dawsholm |
|
02/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
76049 |
51F |
West Auckland |
64G |
Hawick |
|
02/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
76050 |
51F |
West Auckland |
64G |
Hawick |
|
02/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
76103 |
65F |
Grangemouth |
65D |
Dawsholm |
|
30/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
76074 |
65F |
Grangemouth |
65D |
Dawsholm |
|
28/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
76105 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
64F |
Bathgate |
|
28/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
76106 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
64F |
Bathgate |
|
10/05/1964 |
Condemned |
76028 |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
COND |
|
30/05/1964 |
Reallocation |
76001 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
67D |
Ardrossan |
|
30/05/1964 |
Reallocation |
76070 |
66D |
Greenock Ladyburn |
66F |
Beattock |
|
30/05/1964 |
Reallocation |
76091 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
67B |
Hurlford |
|
30/05/1964 |
Reallocation |
76092 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
67B |
Hurlford |
|
30/05/1964 |
Reallocation |
76098 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
67D |
Ardrossan |
|
30/05/1964 |
Reallocation |
76099 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
67D |
Ardrossan |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
76023 |
5F |
Uttoxeter |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
76044 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
5D |
Stoke |
|
22/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
76053 |
72B |
Salisbury |
70C |
Guildford |
|
22/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
76054 |
72B |
Salisbury |
70C |
Guildford |
|
22/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
76055 |
72B |
Salisbury |
70C |
Guildford |
|
27/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
76094 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
67B |
Hurlford |
|
13/07/1964 |
Condemned |
76097 |
67C |
Ayr |
|
COND |
|
25/07/1964 |
Reallocation |
76048 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
2E |
Saltley |
|
01/08/1964 |
Reallocation |
76040 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
2E |
Saltley |
|
01/08/1964 |
Reallocation |
76042 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
2E |
Saltley |
|
01/08/1964 |
Reallocation |
76043 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
2E |
Saltley |
|
02/08/1964 |
Condemned |
76032 |
70C |
Guildford |
|
COND |
|
08/08/1964 |
Reallocation |
76036 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
2E |
Saltley |
|
08/08/1964 |
Reallocation |
76038 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
2E |
Saltley |
|
15/08/1964 |
Reallocation |
76022 |
5F |
Uttoxeter |
2C |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
13/09/1964 |
Condemned |
76034 |
70C |
Guildford |
|
COND |
|
14/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
76018 |
72B |
Salisbury |
70D |
Eastleigh |
|
14/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
76019 |
71B |
Bournemouth |
70D |
Eastleigh |
|
14/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
76066 |
72B |
Salisbury |
70C |
Guildford |
|
04/10/1964 |
Condemned |
76029 |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
COND |
|
12/10/1964 |
Reallocation |
76013 |
71A |
Eastleigh |
70F |
Bournemouth |
|
12/10/1964 |
Reallocation |
76014 |
71A |
Eastleigh |
70F |
Bournemouth |
|
12/10/1964 |
Condemned |
76072 |
68B |
Dumfries |
|
COND |
|
12/10/1964 |
Reallocation |
76100 |
65D |
Dawsholm |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
18/10/1964 |
Condemned |
76054 |
70C |
Guildford |
|
COND |
|
31/10/1964 |
Reallocation |
76046 |
65D |
Dawsholm |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
31/10/1964 |
Reallocation |
76074 |
65D |
Dawsholm |
67E |
Dumfries |
|
31/10/1964 |
Reallocation |
76101 |
65D |
Dawsholm |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
31/10/1964 |
Reallocation |
76102 |
65D |
Dawsholm |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
31/10/1964 |
Reallocation |
76103 |
65D |
Dawsholm |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
07/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
76022 |
2C |
Stourbridge Junction |
2B |
Oxley |
|
28/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
76104 |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
64F |
Bathgate |
|
28/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
76107 |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
64F |
Bathgate |
|
28/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
76111 |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
64F |
Bathgate |
|
05/12/1964 |
Reallocation |
76020 |
5F |
Uttoxeter |
5D |
Stoke |
|
12/12/1964 |
Reallocation |
76035 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
1A |
Willesden |
|
12/12/1964 |
Reallocation |
76037 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
1A |
Willesden |
|
12/12/1964 |
Reallocation |
76039 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
1A |
Willesden |
|
12/12/1964 |
Reallocation |
76041 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
1A |
Willesden |
|
12/12/1964 |
Reallocation |
76089 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
1A |
Willesden |
|
26/12/1964 |
Reallocation |
76004 |
66D |
Greenock Ladyburn |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
26/12/1964 |
Reallocation |
76070 |
66F |
Beattock |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
26/12/1964 |
Reallocation |
76071 |
66D |
Greenock Ladyburn |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
76023 |
5B |
Crewe South |
5D |
Stoke |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
76089 |
1A |
Willesden |
5D |
Stoke |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
76095 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
2J |
Aston |
|
18/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
76030 |
70C |
Guildford |
70D |
Eastleigh |
|
18/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
76031 |
70C |
Guildford |
70D |
Eastleigh |
|
18/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
76033 |
70C |
Guildford |
70D |
Eastleigh |
|
18/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
76053 |
70C |
Guildford |
70B |
Feltham |
|
18/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
76055 |
70C |
Guildford |
70B |
Feltham |
|
18/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
76066 |
70C |
Guildford |
70B |
Feltham |
|
23/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
76085 |
2E |
Saltley |
5D |
Stoke |
|
23/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
76099 |
67D |
Ardrossan |
5D |
Stoke |
|
30/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
76040 |
2E |
Saltley |
2J |
Aston |
|
27/02/1965 |
Reallocation |
76001 |
67D |
Ardrossan |
67C |
Ayr |
|
27/02/1965 |
Reallocation |
76098 |
67D |
Ardrossan |
67C |
Ayr |
|
13/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
76080 |
24D |
Lower Darwen |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
13/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
76081 |
24D |
Lower Darwen |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
13/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
76082 |
24D |
Lower Darwen |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
13/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
76083 |
24D |
Lower Darwen |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
13/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
76084 |
24D |
Lower Darwen |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
27/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
76036 |
2E |
Saltley |
2F |
Bescot |
|
27/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
76042 |
2E |
Saltley |
2F |
Bescot |
|
27/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
76047 |
2E |
Saltley |
2F |
Bescot |
|
27/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
76086 |
2E |
Saltley |
2F |
Bescot |
|
27/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
76087 |
2E |
Saltley |
2F |
Bescot |
|
27/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
76088 |
2E |
Saltley |
2F |
Bescot |
|
25/04/1965 |
Condemned |
76030 |
70D |
Eastleigh |
|
COND |
|
29/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
76052 |
2E |
Saltley |
2B |
Oxley |
|
04/07/1965 |
Condemned |
76017 |
72B |
Salisbury |
|
COND |
|
05/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
76053 |
70B |
Feltham |
70D |
Eastleigh |
|
05/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
76055 |
70B |
Feltham |
70E |
Salisbury |
|
05/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
76066 |
70B |
Feltham |
70D |
Eastleigh |
|
17/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
76052 |
2B |
Oxley |
2E |
Saltley |
|
31/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
76020 |
5D |
Stoke |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
31/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
76035 |
1A |
Willesden |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
07/08/1965 |
Reallocation |
76052 |
2E |
Saltley |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
07/08/1965 |
Reallocation |
76095 |
2J |
Aston |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
04/09/1965 |
Reallocation |
76106 |
64F |
Bathgate |
1A |
Willesden |
|
10/09/1965 |
Condemned |
76050 |
64G |
Hawick |
|
COND |
|
18/09/1965 |
Condemned |
76106 |
1A |
Willesden |
|
COND |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
76037 |
1A |
Willesden |
2B |
Oxley |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
76039 |
1A |
Willesden |
2B |
Oxley |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
76041 |
1A |
Willesden |
2B |
Oxley |
|
03/10/1965 |
Condemned |
76015 |
71B |
Bournemouth |
|
COND |
|
03/10/1965 |
Condemned |
76027 |
71B |
Bournemouth |
|
COND |
|
03/10/1965 |
Condemned |
76062 |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
COND |
|
09/10/1965 |
Condemned |
76023 |
5D |
Stoke |
|
COND |
|
10/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
76005 |
72B |
Salisbury |
70F |
Bournemouth |
|
10/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
76006 |
71A |
Eastleigh |
70F |
Bournemouth |
|
10/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
76009 |
71A |
Eastleigh |
70F |
Bournemouth |
|
10/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
76010 |
71A |
Eastleigh |
70F |
Bournemouth |
|
10/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
76011 |
71A |
Eastleigh |
70F |
Bournemouth |
|
10/10/1965 |
Condemned |
76065 |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
COND |
|
10/10/1965 |
Condemned |
76068 |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
COND |
|
16/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
76040 |
2J |
Aston |
2E |
Saltley |
|
17/10/1965 |
Condemned |
76055 |
70E |
Salisbury |
|
COND |
|
18/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
76100 |
65F |
Grangemouth |
67C |
Ayr |
|
22/10/1965 |
Condemned |
76107 |
64F |
Bathgate |
|
COND |
|
29/10/1965 |
Condemned |
76112 |
68C |
Stranraer |
|
COND |
|
30/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
76045 |
65F |
Grangemouth |
66E |
Carstairs |
|
30/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
76046 |
65F |
Grangemouth |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
30/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
76049 |
64G |
Hawick |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
30/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
76101 |
65F |
Grangemouth |
67C |
Ayr |
|
30/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
76102 |
65F |
Grangemouth |
67E |
Dumfries |
|
30/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
76103 |
65F |
Grangemouth |
67E |
Dumfries |
|
30/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
76113 |
65F |
Grangemouth |
66E |
Carstairs |
|
31/10/1965 |
Condemned |
76025 |
71B |
Bournemouth |
|
COND |
|
07/11/1965 |
Condemned |
76056 |
71B |
Bournemouth |
|
COND |
|
13/11/1965 |
Reallocation |
76036 |
2F |
Bescot |
2C |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
13/11/1965 |
Reallocation |
76042 |
2F |
Bescot |
2C |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
04/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
76101 |
67C |
Ayr |
67F |
Stranraer |
|
04/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
76103 |
67E |
Dumfries |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
05/12/1965 |
Condemned |
76060 |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
COND |
|
13/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
76100 |
67C |
Ayr |
66F |
Beattock |
|
25/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
76098 |
67C |
Ayr |
66F |
Beattock |
|
03/01/1966 |
Condemned |
76111 |
64F |
Bathgate |
|
COND |
|
10/01/1966 |
Condemned |
76045 |
66E |
Carstairs |
|
COND |
|
17/01/1966 |
Condemned |
76071 |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
COND |
|
24/01/1966 |
Condemned |
76049 |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
COND |
|
24/01/1966 |
Condemned |
76105 |
64F |
Bathgate |
|
COND |
|
29/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
76049 |
98W |
|
64F |
Bathgate |
|
29/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
76104 |
64F |
Bathgate |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
29/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
76105 |
98W |
|
66A |
Polmadie |
|
05/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
76051 |
5D |
Stoke |
16B |
Colwick |
|
05/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
76075 |
5D |
Stoke |
16B |
Colwick |
|
05/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
76089 |
5D |
Stoke |
16B |
Colwick |
|
20/02/1966 |
Condemned |
76019 |
70D |
Eastleigh |
|
COND |
|
12/03/1966 |
Reallocation |
76044 |
5D |
Stoke |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
12/03/1966 |
Reallocation |
76085 |
5D |
Stoke |
16B |
Colwick |
|
12/03/1966 |
Reallocation |
76099 |
5D |
Stoke |
16B |
Colwick |
|
19/03/1966 |
Reallocation |
76047 |
2F |
Bescot |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
25/03/1966 |
Condemned |
76003 |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
COND |
|
26/03/1966 |
Reallocation |
76074 |
67E |
Dumfries |
67C |
Ayr |
|
26/03/1966 |
Reallocation |
76086 |
2F |
Bescot |
2E |
Saltley |
|
26/03/1966 |
Reallocation |
76087 |
2F |
Bescot |
2C |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
26/03/1966 |
Reallocation |
76088 |
2F |
Bescot |
2B |
Oxley |
|
26/03/1966 |
Reallocation |
76101 |
67F |
Stranraer |
67C |
Ayr |
|
23/04/1966 |
Condemned |
76020 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
COND |
|
23/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
76036 |
2C |
Stourbridge Junction |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
30/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
76073 |
68B |
Dumfries |
67C |
Ayr |
|
30/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
76100 |
66F |
Beattock |
67C |
Ayr |
|
30/04/1966 |
Reallocation |
76103 |
66A |
Polmadie |
66F |
Beattock |
|
07/05/1966 |
Condemned |
76035 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
COND |
|
07/05/1966 |
Reallocation |
76042 |
2C |
Stourbridge Junction |
2B |
Oxley |
|
07/05/1966 |
Reallocation |
76087 |
2C |
Stourbridge Junction |
2B |
Oxley |
|
06/1966 |
Condemned |
76085 |
16B |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
18/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
76038 |
2E |
Saltley |
6F |
Machynlleth |
|
18/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
76043 |
2E |
Saltley |
6F |
Machynlleth |
|
18/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
76086 |
2E |
Saltley |
6F |
Machynlleth |
|
25/06/1966 |
Condemned |
76042 |
2B |
Oxley |
|
COND |
|
25/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
76102 |
67E |
Dumfries |
67B |
Hurlford |
|
25/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
76103 |
66F |
Beattock |
67C |
Ayr |
|
26/06/1966 |
Condemned |
76073 |
67C |
Ayr |
|
COND |
|
27/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
76012 |
71A |
Eastleigh |
70C |
Guildford |
|
27/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
76016 |
71A |
Eastleigh |
70C |
Guildford |
|
27/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
76018 |
70D |
Eastleigh |
70C |
Guildford |
|
27/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
76031 |
70D |
Eastleigh |
70C |
Guildford |
|
27/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
76033 |
70D |
Eastleigh |
70C |
Guildford |
|
27/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
76053 |
70D |
Eastleigh |
70C |
Guildford |
|
27/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
76058 |
71A |
Eastleigh |
70C |
Guildford |
|
27/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
76059 |
71A |
Eastleigh |
70C |
Guildford |
|
14/07/1966 |
Condemned |
76108 |
67B |
Hurlford |
|
COND |
|
17/07/1966 |
Condemned |
76103 |
67C |
Ayr |
|
COND |
|
06/08/1966 |
Condemned |
76099 |
16B |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
09/08/1966 |
Condemned |
76092 |
67B |
Hurlford |
|
COND |
|
17/08/1966 |
Condemned |
76001 |
67C |
Ayr |
|
COND |
|
17/08/1966 |
Condemned |
76070 |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
COND |
|
17/08/1966 |
Condemned |
76100 |
67C |
Ayr |
|
COND |
|
27/08/1966 |
Condemned |
76022 |
2B |
Oxley |
|
COND |
|
04/09/1966 |
Condemned |
76010 |
70F |
Bournemouth |
|
COND |
|
04/09/1966 |
Condemned |
76012 |
70C |
Guildford |
|
COND |
|
04/09/1966 |
Condemned |
76013 |
70F |
Bournemouth |
|
COND |
|
04/09/1966 |
Condemned |
76014 |
70F |
Bournemouth |
|
COND |
|
10/09/1966 |
Condemned |
76038 |
6F |
Machynlleth |
|
COND |
|
10/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
76040 |
2E |
Saltley |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
10/09/1966 |
Condemned |
76043 |
6F |
Machynlleth |
|
COND |
|
10/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
76048 |
2E |
Saltley |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
17/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
76086 |
6F |
Machynlleth |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
23/09/1966 |
Condemned |
76109 |
62C |
Dunfermline Upper |
|
COND |
|
24/09/1966 |
Condemned |
76086 |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
COND |
|
24/09/1966 |
Condemned |
76089 |
16B |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
25/09/1966 |
Condemned |
76059 |
70C |
Guildford |
|
COND |
|
02/10/1966 |
Condemned |
76016 |
70C |
Guildford |
|
COND |
|
02/10/1966 |
Condemned |
76018 |
70C |
Guildford |
|
COND |
|
02/10/1966 |
Condemned |
76057 |
71B |
Bournemouth |
|
COND |
|
08/10/1966 |
Condemned |
76044 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
COND |
|
08/10/1966 |
Condemned |
76082 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
COND |
|
17/10/1966 |
Reallocation |
76069 |
71A |
Eastleigh |
70C |
Guildford |
|
19/10/1966 |
Condemned |
76004 |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
COND |
|
19/10/1966 |
Condemned |
76021 |
67B |
Hurlford |
|
COND |
|
19/10/1966 |
Condemned |
76074 |
67C |
Ayr |
|
COND |
|
22/10/1966 |
Condemned |
76083 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
COND |
|
12/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
76051 |
16B |
Colwick |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
12/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
76075 |
16B |
Colwick |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
26/11/1966 |
Condemned |
76076 |
10D |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
COND |
|
26/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
76094 |
67B |
Hurlford |
66F |
Beattock |
|
26/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
76114 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
66F |
Beattock |
|
12/1966 |
Condemned |
76102 |
67B |
Hurlford |
|
COND |
|
03/12/1966 |
Condemned |
76047 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
COND |
|
03/12/1966 |
Condemned |
76078 |
10D |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
COND |
|
10/12/1966 |
Condemned |
76052 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
COND |
|
10/12/1966 |
Condemned |
76096 |
67C |
Ayr |
|
COND |
|
10/12/1966 |
Condemned |
76101 |
67C |
Ayr |
|
COND |
|
10/12/1966 |
Condemned |
76110 |
62C |
Dunfermline Upper |
|
COND |
|
31/12/1966 |
Condemned |
76002 |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
COND |
|
31/12/1966 |
Condemned |
76024 |
67B |
Hurlford |
|
COND |
|
31/12/1966 |
Condemned |
76090 |
68D |
Beattock |
|
COND |
|
31/12/1966 |
Condemned |
76091 |
67B |
Hurlford |
|
COND |
|
31/12/1966 |
Condemned |
76113 |
66E |
Carstairs |
|
COND |
|
31/12/1966 |
Condemned |
76114 |
66F |
Beattock |
|
COND |
|
01/1967 |
Condemned |
76033 |
70C |
Guildford |
|
COND |
|
07/01/1967 |
Condemned |
76087 |
2B |
Oxley |
|
COND |
|
08/01/1967 |
Condemned |
76061 |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
COND |
|
28/01/1967 |
Condemned |
76036 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
COND |
|
29/01/1967 |
Condemned |
76053 |
70C |
Guildford |
|
COND |
|
04/02/1967 |
Reallocation |
76037 |
2B |
Oxley |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
04/02/1967 |
Condemned |
76048 |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
COND |
|
22/02/1967 |
Condemned |
76093 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
COND |
|
25/02/1967 |
Reallocation |
76088 |
2B |
Oxley |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
04/03/1967 |
Condemned |
76095 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
COND |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
76039 |
2B |
Oxley |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
76041 |
2B |
Oxley |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
26/03/1967 |
Condemned |
76058 |
70C |
Guildford |
|
COND |
|
01/04/1967 |
Condemned |
76041 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
COND |
|
08/04/1967 |
Reallocation |
76037 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
08/04/1967 |
Reallocation |
76039 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
08/04/1967 |
Condemned |
76040 |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
COND |
|
09/04/1967 |
Condemned |
76063 |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
COND |
|
17/04/1967 |
Reallocation |
76007 |
72B |
Salisbury |
70F |
Bournemouth |
|
17/04/1967 |
Reallocation |
76008 |
72B |
Salisbury |
70F |
Bournemouth |
|
17/04/1967 |
Reallocation |
76067 |
72B |
Salisbury |
70F |
Bournemouth |
|
29/04/1967 |
Condemned |
76051 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
COND |
|
01/05/1967 |
Condemned |
76000 |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
COND |
|
01/05/1967 |
Condemned |
76046 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
COND |
|
01/05/1967 |
Condemned |
76094 |
66F |
Beattock |
|
COND |
|
01/05/1967 |
Condemned |
76098 |
66F |
Beattock |
|
COND |
|
01/05/1967 |
Condemned |
76104 |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
COND |
|
14/05/1967 |
Condemned |
76008 |
70F |
Bournemouth |
|
COND |
|
10/06/1967 |
Condemned |
76037 |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
COND |
|
10/06/1967 |
Condemned |
76039 |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
COND |
|
10/06/1967 |
Condemned |
76088 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
COND |
|
18/06/1967 |
Condemned |
76069 |
70C |
Guildford |
|
COND |
|
24/06/1967 |
Reallocation |
76075 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
24/06/1967 |
Reallocation |
76077 |
10D |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
24/06/1967 |
Reallocation |
76079 |
10D |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
24/06/1967 |
Reallocation |
76080 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
24/06/1967 |
Reallocation |
76081 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
24/06/1967 |
Reallocation |
76084 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
09/07/1967 |
Condemned |
76005 |
70F |
Bournemouth |
|
COND |
|
09/07/1967 |
Condemned |
76006 |
70F |
Bournemouth |
|
COND |
|
09/07/1967 |
Condemned |
76007 |
70F |
Bournemouth |
|
COND |
|
09/07/1967 |
Condemned |
76009 |
70F |
Bournemouth |
|
COND |
|
09/07/1967 |
Condemned |
76011 |
70F |
Bournemouth |
|
COND |
|
09/07/1967 |
Condemned |
76026 |
71B |
Bournemouth |
|
COND |
|
09/07/1967 |
Condemned |
76031 |
70C |
Guildford |
|
COND |
|
09/07/1967 |
Condemned |
76064 |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
COND |
|
09/07/1967 |
Condemned |
76066 |
70D |
Eastleigh |
|
COND |
|
09/07/1967 |
Condemned |
76067 |
70F |
Bournemouth |
|
COND |
|
22/07/1967 |
Condemned |
76081 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
07/10/1967 |
Condemned |
76075 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
02/12/1967 |
Condemned |
76077 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
02/12/1967 |
Condemned |
76079 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
02/12/1967 |
Condemned |
76080 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
02/12/1967 |
Condemned |
76084 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|