Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 53 Today
» 986 Yesterday
» 5561 Week
» 26463 Month
» 26463 Year
» 1248028 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

BR Standard Riddles "Standard Class 2 Tank" Class 2-6-2T


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
04/07/1953 To Service 84000   NEW 5A Crewe North  
06/07/1953 To Service 84001   NEW 5A Crewe North  
07/08/1953 To Service 84002   NEW 10D Plodder Lane  
08/08/1953 Reallocation 84000 5A Crewe North 10D Plodder Lane  
08/08/1953 Reallocation 84001 5A Crewe North 10D Plodder Lane  
10/08/1953 To Service 84003   NEW 10D Plodder Lane  
19/08/1953 To Service 84004   NEW 10D Plodder Lane  
24/08/1953 To Service 84005   NEW 15D Bedford  
26/08/1953 To Service 84006   NEW 17B Burton  
31/08/1953 To Service 84007   NEW 17B Burton  
31/08/1953 To Service 84008   NEW 17B Burton  
03/09/1953 To Service 84009   NEW 20C Royston  
08/09/1953 To Service 84010   NEW 25F Low Moor  
17/09/1953 To Service 84012   NEW 25F Low Moor  
18/09/1953 To Service 84011   NEW 25F Low Moor  
21/09/1953 To Service 84013   NEW 25F Low Moor  
22/09/1953 To Service 84014   NEW 25F Low Moor  
02/10/1953 To Service 84015   NEW 25F Low Moor  
07/10/1953 To Service 84016   NEW 26D Bury  
13/10/1953 To Service 84017   NEW 26D Bury  
23/10/1953 To Service 84018   NEW 26D Bury  
31/10/1953 To Service 84019   NEW 26D Bury  
27/03/1954 Reallocation 84000 10D Plodder Lane 6E Wrexham Rhosddu  
27/03/1954 Reallocation 84001 10D Plodder Lane 6E Wrexham Rhosddu  
27/03/1954 Reallocation 84002 10D Plodder Lane 6E Wrexham Rhosddu  
27/03/1954 Reallocation 84003 10D Plodder Lane 6E Wrexham Rhosddu  
19/06/1954 Reallocation 84016 26D Bury 24F Fleetwood  
19/06/1954 Reallocation 84017 26D Bury 24F Fleetwood  
19/06/1954 Reallocation 84018 26D Bury 24F Fleetwood  
19/06/1954 Reallocation 84019 26D Bury 24F Fleetwood  
25/09/1954 Reallocation 84010 25F Low Moor 26F Lees (Oldham)  
25/09/1954 Reallocation 84015 25F Low Moor 26F Lees (Oldham)  
09/10/1954 Reallocation 84004 10D Plodder Lane 6E Wrexham Rhosddu  
09/10/1954 Reallocation 84012 25F Low Moor 26F Lees (Oldham)  
29/01/1955 Reallocation 84009 20C Royston 20F Skipton  
29/01/1955 Reallocation 84011 25F Low Moor 27A Bank Hall  
29/01/1955 Reallocation 84013 25F Low Moor 27A Bank Hall  
29/01/1955 Reallocation 84014 25F Low Moor 27A Bank Hall  
23/04/1955 Reallocation 84014 27A Bank Hall 27C Southport  
21/05/1955 Reallocation 84012 26F Lees (Oldham) 24B Rose Grove  
21/05/1955 Reallocation 84015 26F Lees (Oldham) 24B Rose Grove  
16/07/1955 Reallocation 84009 20F Skipton 20C Royston  
08/10/1955 Reallocation 84001 6E Wrexham Rhosddu 6D Chester Northgate  
08/10/1955 Reallocation 84002 6E Wrexham Rhosddu 6D Chester Northgate  
08/10/1955 Reallocation 84012 24B Rose Grove 27A Bank Hall  
08/10/1955 Reallocation 84015 24B Rose Grove 24F Fleetwood  
03/12/1955 Reallocation 84013 27A Bank Hall 26E Lees (Oldham)  
03/12/1955 Reallocation 84014 27C Southport 26E Lees (Oldham)  
03/12/1955 Reallocation 84019 24F Fleetwood 26E Lees (Oldham)  
19/05/1956 Reallocation 84010 26F Lees (Oldham) 24B Rose Grove  
19/05/1956 Reallocation 84011 27A Bank Hall 24B Rose Grove  
11/08/1956 Reallocation 84000 6E Wrexham Rhosddu 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street  
11/08/1956 Reallocation 84002 6D Chester Northgate 1E Bletchley  
11/08/1956 Reallocation 84003 6E Wrexham Rhosddu 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street  
11/08/1956 Reallocation 84004 6E Wrexham Rhosddu 1E Bletchley  
27/03/1957 To Service 84020   NEW 74A Ashford  
30/03/1957 To Service 84021   NEW 74A Ashford  
30/03/1957 To Service 84022   NEW 74A Ashford  
05/04/1957 To Service 84023   NEW 74A Ashford  
10/04/1957 To Service 84024   NEW 74A Ashford  
16/04/1957 To Service 84025   NEW 74B Ramsgate  
18/04/1957 To Service 84026   NEW 74B Ramsgate  
15/05/1957 To Service 84028   NEW 74B Ramsgate  
16/05/1957 To Service 84027   NEW 74B Ramsgate  
18/05/1957 Reallocation 84011 24B Rose Grove 24D Lower Darwen  
18/05/1957 Reallocation 84012 27A Bank Hall 24D Lower Darwen  
11/06/1957 To Service 84029   NEW 74B Ramsgate  
10/08/1957 Reallocation 84015 24F Fleetwood 24J Lancaster Green Ayre  
10/08/1957 Reallocation 84016 24F Fleetwood 24J Lancaster Green Ayre  
19/04/1958 Reallocation 84019 26E Lees (Oldham) 26C Bolton  
09/08/1958 Reallocation 84015 24J Lancaster Green Ayre 24G Skipton  
15/11/1958 Reallocation 84016 24J Lancaster Green Ayre 24F Fleetwood  
10/01/1959 Reallocation 84006 17B Burton 15A Wellingborough  
14/02/1959 Reallocation 84007 17B Burton 15A Wellingborough  
14/02/1959 Reallocation 84008 17B Burton 15A Wellingborough  
21/02/1959 Reallocation 84014 26E Lees (Oldham) 26C Bolton  
02/05/1959 Reallocation 84013 26E Lees (Oldham) 26C Bolton  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 84025 74B Ramsgate 73F Ashford  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 84026 74B Ramsgate 73F Ashford  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 84027 74B Ramsgate 73F Ashford  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 84028 74B Ramsgate 73F Ashford  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 84029 74B Ramsgate 73F Ashford  
20/06/1959 Reallocation 84009 20C Royston 53A Hull Dairycoates  
12/12/1959 Reallocation 84010 24B Rose Grove 24F Fleetwood  
09/01/1960 Reallocation 84001 6D Chester Northgate 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street  
10/02/1961 Reallocation 84020 74A Ashford 73A Stewarts Lane  
10/02/1961 Reallocation 84021 74A Ashford 73B Bricklayers Arms  
10/02/1961 Reallocation 84022 74A Ashford 73B Bricklayers Arms  
10/02/1961 Reallocation 84023 74A Ashford 73B Bricklayers Arms  
10/02/1961 Reallocation 84024 74A Ashford 73B Bricklayers Arms  
25/03/1961 Reallocation 84011 24D Lower Darwen 24F Fleetwood  
25/03/1961 Reallocation 84012 24D Lower Darwen 24F Fleetwood  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 84020 73A Stewarts Lane 72A Exmouth Junction  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 84021 73B Bricklayers Arms 72A Exmouth Junction  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 84022 73B Bricklayers Arms 72A Exmouth Junction  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 84023 73B Bricklayers Arms 72A Exmouth Junction  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 84024 73B Bricklayers Arms 75A Brighton  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 84025 73F Ashford 75A Brighton  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 84026 73F Ashford 75A Brighton  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 84027 73F Ashford 75A Brighton  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 84028 73F Ashford 71A Eastleigh  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 84029 73F Ashford 71A Eastleigh  
17/06/1961 Reallocation 84000 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 8B Warrington Dallam  
17/06/1961 Reallocation 84001 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 8B Warrington Dallam  
24/06/1961 Reallocation 84008 15A Wellingborough 14D Neasden  
01/07/1961 Reallocation 84005 15D Bedford 14D Neasden  
16/09/1961 Reallocation 84003 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 6K Rhyl  
16/09/1961 Reallocation 84020 72A Exmouth Junction 6G Llandudno Junction  
16/09/1961 Reallocation 84021 72A Exmouth Junction 6G Llandudno Junction  
16/09/1961 Reallocation 84022 72A Exmouth Junction 6G Llandudno Junction  
16/09/1961 Reallocation 84023 72A Exmouth Junction 24J Lancaster Green Ayre  
16/09/1961 Reallocation 84024 75A Brighton 8B Warrington Dallam  
16/09/1961 Reallocation 84025 75A Brighton 26A Newton Heath  
16/09/1961 Reallocation 84026 75A Brighton 26A Newton Heath  
16/09/1961 Reallocation 84027 75A Brighton 26A Newton Heath  
16/09/1961 Reallocation 84028 71A Eastleigh 24G Skipton  
16/09/1961 Reallocation 84029 71A Eastleigh 14E Bedford  
21/10/1961 Reallocation 84027 26A Newton Heath 26C Bolton  
04/11/1961 Reallocation 84026 26A Newton Heath 26C Bolton  
11/11/1961 Reallocation 84025 26A Newton Heath 26C Bolton  
09/12/1961 Reallocation 84005 14D Neasden 14E Bedford  
09/12/1961 Reallocation 84006 15A Wellingborough 14D Neasden  
06/01/1962 Reallocation 84023 24J Lancaster Green Ayre 8D Widnes  
06/01/1962 Reallocation 84024 8B Warrington Dallam 8D Widnes  
20/01/1962 Reallocation 84006 14D Neasden 14E Bedford  
20/01/1962 Reallocation 84029 14E Bedford 14D Neasden  
27/01/1962 Reallocation 84027 26C Bolton 15A Wellingborough  
17/03/1962 Reallocation 84005 14E Bedford 14D Neasden  
17/03/1962 Reallocation 84006 14E Bedford 14D Neasden  
24/03/1962 Reallocation 84007 15A Wellingborough 16D Annesley  
24/03/1962 Reallocation 84027 15A Wellingborough 16D Annesley  
14/04/1962 Reallocation 84006 14D Neasden 16D Annesley  
07/07/1962 Reallocation 84005 14D Neasden 14B Kentish Town  
07/07/1962 Reallocation 84008 14D Neasden 14B Kentish Town  
07/07/1962 Reallocation 84029 14D Neasden 14B Kentish Town  
14/07/1962 Reallocation 84021 6G Llandudno Junction 99C Crewe Works  
14/07/1962 Reallocation 84022 6G Llandudno Junction 99C Crewe Works  
14/07/1962 Reallocation 84023 8D Widnes 99C Crewe Works  
14/07/1962 Reallocation 84024 8D Widnes 99C Crewe Works  
01/12/1962 Reallocation 84001 8B Warrington Dallam 6G Llandudno Junction  
08/12/1962 Reallocation 84009 53A Hull Dairycoates 6G Llandudno Junction  
29/12/1962 Reallocation 84008 14B Kentish Town 15C Leicester Midland  
19/01/1963 Reallocation 84005 14B Kentish Town 15A Wellingborough  
19/01/1963 Reallocation 84029 14B Kentish Town 15A Wellingborough  
02/02/1963 Reallocation 84005 15A Wellingborough 14E Bedford  
09/02/1963 Reallocation 84003 6K Rhyl 6G Llandudno Junction  
09/02/1963 Reallocation 84005 14E Bedford 15A Wellingborough  
16/02/1963 Reallocation 84012 24F Fleetwood 27C Southport  
16/02/1963 Reallocation 84029 15A Wellingborough 15C Leicester Midland  
13/04/1963 Reallocation 84000 8B Warrington Dallam 89D Oswestry  
20/04/1963 Reallocation 84004 1E Bletchley 89D Oswestry  
04/05/1963 Reallocation 84008 15C Leicester Midland 15A Wellingborough  
25/05/1963 Reallocation 84026 26C Bolton 99H Horwich Works  
12/10/1963 Condemned 84012 27C Southport   COND  
26/10/1963 Reallocation 84017 24F Fleetwood 8M Southport  
14/12/1963 Reallocation 84007 16D Annesley 15B Wellingborough  
28/12/1963 Reallocation 84026 99H Horwich Works 9K Bolton  
18/01/1964 Condemned 84007 15B Wellingborough   COND  
08/02/1964 Reallocation 84005 15A Wellingborough 15A Leicester Midland  
08/02/1964 Reallocation 84008 15A Wellingborough 15A Leicester Midland  
21/03/1964 Reallocation 84003 6G Llandudno Junction 6C Croes Newydd  
21/03/1964 Reallocation 84009 6G Llandudno Junction 6C Croes Newydd  
02/05/1964 Condemned 84027 16D Annesley   COND  
30/05/1964 Reallocation 84005 15A Leicester Midland 15B Wellingborough  
30/05/1964 Reallocation 84008 15A Leicester Midland 15B Wellingborough  
13/06/1964 Reallocation 84003 6C Croes Newydd 6G Llandudno Junction  
13/06/1964 Reallocation 84009 6C Croes Newydd 6G Llandudno Junction  
13/06/1964 Condemned 84029 15C Leicester Midland   COND  
20/06/1964 Reallocation 84017 8M Southport 9K Bolton  
18/07/1964 Reallocation 84006 16D Annesley 15B Wellingborough  
05/09/1964 Condemned 84021 99C Crewe Works   COND  
05/09/1964 Condemned 84022 99C Crewe Works   COND  
05/09/1964 Condemned 84023 99C Crewe Works   COND  
05/09/1964 Condemned 84024 99C Crewe Works   COND  
19/09/1964 Reallocation 84005 15B Wellingborough 15A Leicester Midland  
19/09/1964 Reallocation 84006 15B Wellingborough 15A Leicester Midland  
19/09/1964 Reallocation 84008 15B Wellingborough 15A Leicester Midland  
10/1964 Condemned 84001 6G Llandudno Junction   COND  
10/1964 Condemned 84020 6G Llandudno Junction   COND  
19/12/1964 Reallocation 84013 26C Bolton 9B Stockport Edgeley  
19/12/1964 Reallocation 84014 26C Bolton 9B Stockport Edgeley  
19/12/1964 Reallocation 84026 9K Bolton 9B Stockport Edgeley  
23/01/1965 Reallocation 84000 89D Oswestry 6C Croes Newydd  
23/01/1965 Reallocation 84004 89D Oswestry 6C Croes Newydd  
17/04/1965 Condemned 84002 1E Bletchley   COND  
24/04/1965 Condemned 84011 24F Fleetwood   COND  
24/04/1965 Condemned 84018 24F Fleetwood   COND  
22/05/1965 Reallocation 84013 9B Stockport Edgeley 15A Leicester Midland  
19/06/1965 Reallocation 84016 24F Fleetwood 9B Stockport Edgeley  
19/06/1965 Reallocation 84017 9K Bolton 9B Stockport Edgeley  
03/07/1965 Reallocation 84016 9B Stockport Edgeley 10C Fleetwood  
10/07/1965 Reallocation 84013 15A Leicester Midland 9B Stockport Edgeley  
02/10/1965 Condemned 84003 6G Llandudno Junction   COND  
30/10/1965 Condemned 84000 6C Croes Newydd   COND  
30/10/1965 Condemned 84004 6C Croes Newydd   COND  
30/10/1965 Condemned 84005 15A Leicester Midland   COND  
30/10/1965 Condemned 84006 15A Leicester Midland   COND  
30/10/1965 Condemned 84008 15A Leicester Midland   COND  
13/11/1965 Reallocation 84010 24F Fleetwood 70D Eastleigh  
13/11/1965 Reallocation 84013 9B Stockport Edgeley 70D Eastleigh  
13/11/1965 Reallocation 84014 9B Stockport Edgeley 70D Eastleigh  
13/11/1965 Reallocation 84015 24G Skipton 70D Eastleigh  
13/11/1965 Reallocation 84016 10C Fleetwood 70D Eastleigh  
13/11/1965 Reallocation 84017 9B Stockport Edgeley 70D Eastleigh  
13/11/1965 Reallocation 84019 26C Bolton 70D Eastleigh  
13/11/1965 Reallocation 84025 26C Bolton 70D Eastleigh  
13/11/1965 Reallocation 84026 9B Stockport Edgeley 70D Eastleigh  
13/11/1965 Reallocation 84028 24G Skipton 70D Eastleigh  
20/11/1965 Condemned 84009 6G Llandudno Junction   COND  
06/12/1965 Reallocation 84010 70D Eastleigh 91M To London Midland Region  
06/12/1965 Reallocation 84010 91M To London Midland Region 70D Eastleigh  
06/12/1965 Reallocation 84013 70D Eastleigh 91M To London Midland Region  
06/12/1965 Reallocation 84013 91M To London Midland Region 70D Eastleigh  
06/12/1965 Reallocation 84014 70D Eastleigh 91M To London Midland Region  
06/12/1965 Reallocation 84014 91M To London Midland Region 70D Eastleigh  
06/12/1965 Reallocation 84015 70D Eastleigh 91M To London Midland Region  
06/12/1965 Reallocation 84015 91M To London Midland Region 70D Eastleigh  
06/12/1965 Reallocation 84016 70D Eastleigh 91M To London Midland Region  
06/12/1965 Reallocation 84016 91M To London Midland Region 70D Eastleigh  
06/12/1965 Reallocation 84017 70D Eastleigh 91M To London Midland Region  
06/12/1965 Reallocation 84017 91M To London Midland Region 70D Eastleigh  
06/12/1965 Reallocation 84019 70D Eastleigh 91M To London Midland Region  
06/12/1965 Reallocation 84019 91M To London Midland Region 70D Eastleigh  
06/12/1965 Reallocation 84025 70D Eastleigh 91M To London Midland Region  
06/12/1965 Reallocation 84025 91M To London Midland Region 70D Eastleigh  
06/12/1965 Reallocation 84026 91M To London Midland Region 70D Eastleigh  
06/12/1965 Reallocation 84026 70D Eastleigh 91M To London Midland Region  
06/12/1965 Reallocation 84028 70D Eastleigh 91M To London Midland Region  
06/12/1965 Reallocation 84028 91M To London Midland Region 70D Eastleigh  
11/12/1965 Condemned 84010 70D Eastleigh   COND  
11/12/1965 Condemned 84013 70D Eastleigh   COND  
11/12/1965 Condemned 84014 70D Eastleigh   COND  
11/12/1965 Condemned 84015 70D Eastleigh   COND  
11/12/1965 Condemned 84016 70D Eastleigh   COND  
11/12/1965 Condemned 84017 70D Eastleigh   COND  
11/12/1965 Condemned 84019 70D Eastleigh   COND  
11/12/1965 Condemned 84025 70D Eastleigh   COND  
11/12/1965 Condemned 84026 70D Eastleigh   COND  
11/12/1965 Condemned 84028 70D Eastleigh   COND