Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 66 Today
» 839 Yesterday
» 66 Week
» 18387 Month
» 106579 Year
» 990960 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

D3/14 0-6-0


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
19/01/1952 Reallocation 15004     31B March  
19/01/1957 Reallocation 15004 31B March 38E Woodford Halse  
16/02/1957 Reallocation 15004 38E Woodford Halse 35A New England  
05/10/1962 Condemned 15004 35A New England   COND