LMS/BR Derby D16/1 Co-Co
BR (1955 Num) | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
10000 | 30/11/1947 | 1B 1A 70A 1B 1A W |
Camden (New) Willesden Nine Elms Camden Willesden Withdrawn |
30/11/1947 13/11/1948 19/04/1953 30/04/1955 21/11/1959 12/1963 |
12/1963 |
10001 | 10/07/1948 | 1B 1A 70A 1B 1A W |
Camden (New) Willesden Nine Elms Camden Willesden Withdrawn |
10/07/1948 13/11/1948 19/04/1953 26/03/1955 21/11/1959 12/03/1966 |
12/03/1966 |