Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 661 Today
» 1408 Yesterday
» 3306 Week
» 5888 Month
» 270521 Year
» 1492086 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

BR Standard Riddles "Standard Class 4" Class 4-6-0


Class BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
BR4/1 75000 05/1951 82C
84G
82C
84E
81F
82E
84D
83E
85A
W
Swindon
Shrewsbury
Swindon
Tyseley
Oxford
Bristol Barrow Road
Leamington
Yeovil Town
Worcester
Withdrawn
05/1951
30/09/1951
26/12/1953
05/09/1959
25/02/1961
14/07/1962
08/09/1962
14/09/1963
11/07/1965
12/1965
31/12/1965
BR4/1 75001 08/1951 84G
82C
81F
82E
83E
W
Shrewsbury
Swindon
Oxford
Bristol Barrow Road
Yeovil Town
Withdrawn
08/1951
03/10/1953
09/10/1954
06/04/1963
28/09/1963
12/1964
12/1964
BR4/1 75002 08/1951 84G
82C
89A
82C
85E
82G
82E
89C
6C
5D
W
Shrewsbury
Swindon
Oswestry
Swindon
Gloucester Barnwood
Templecombe (S&D)
Bristol Barrow Road
Machynlleth
Croes Newydd
Stoke
Withdrawn
08/1951
03/10/1953
06/10/1956
26/01/1957
30/01/1960
07/10/1961
16/06/1962
06/10/1962
10/12/1966
03/06/1967
12/08/1967
12/08/1967
BR4/1 75003 08/1951 84G
82C
85A
84E
83E
85A
W
Shrewsbury
Swindon
Worcester
Tyseley
Yeovil Town
Worcester
Withdrawn
08/1951
26/12/1953
22/02/1958
16/07/1960
02/11/1963
11/07/1965
01/10/1965
01/10/1965
BR4/1 75004 08/1951 82A
82C
81F
86C
82E
82G
82F
89C
6D
W
Bristol Bath Road
Swindon
Oxford
Cardiff Canton
Bristol Barrow Road
Templecombe (S&D)
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Machynlleth
Shrewsbury
Withdrawn
08/1951
03/10/1953
09/10/1954
16/07/1955
04/10/1958
02/12/1961
19/05/1962
03/11/1962
29/01/1966
11/03/1967
11/03/1967
BR4/1 75005 09/1951 84G
86C
89A
6E
84E
85A
85B
83D
83E
85A
W
Shrewsbury
Cardiff Canton
Oswestry
Chester West
Tyseley
Worcester
Gloucester Horton Road
Exmouth Junction
Yeovil Town
Worcester
Withdrawn
09/1951
03/10/1953
27/02/1954
06/09/1958
11/04/1959
16/07/1960
25/01/1964
13/04/1964
16/05/1965
11/07/1965
18/11/1965
18/11/1965
BR4/1 75006 09/1951 84G
86C
89A
6E
84E
89C
89B
5D
2A
6D
6C
5D
W
Shrewsbury
Cardiff Canton
Oswestry
Chester West
Tyseley
Machynlleth
Croes Newydd
Stoke
Tyseley
Shrewsbury
Croes Newydd
Stoke
Withdrawn
30/04/1952
03/10/1953
26/12/1953
06/09/1958
11/04/1959
06/10/1962
09/03/1963
28/11/1964
17/07/1965
06/11/1965
11/03/1967
10/06/1967
12/08/1967
12/08/1967
BR4/1 75007 09/1951 86C
81F
82G
83E
W
Cardiff Canton
Oxford
Templecombe (S&D)
Yeovil Town
Withdrawn
03/10/1953
04/10/1958
06/04/1963
12/10/1964
03/1965
03/1965
BR4/1 75008 10/1951 86C
81F
83G
83D
85A
W
Cardiff Canton
Oxford
Templecombe (S&D)
Exmouth Junction
Worcester
Withdrawn
31/10/1953
01/11/1958
20/07/1964
12/10/1964
13/06/1965
12/1965
31/12/1965
BR4/1 75009 10/1951 86C
85A
85E
82G
89C
89B
6G
6F
6D
6C
10D
10A
W
Cardiff Canton
Worcester
Gloucester Barnwood
Templecombe (S&D)
Machynlleth
Croes Newydd
Llandudno Junction
Machynlleth
Shrewsbury
Croes Newydd
Lostock Hall
Carnforth
Withdrawn
03/10/1953
17/05/1958
06/09/1958
07/10/1961
17/11/1962
09/03/1963
19/02/1966
16/07/1966
10/12/1966
11/03/1967
13/05/1967
24/06/1967
03/08/1968
03/08/1968
BR4/1 75010 11/1951 6G
6H
6G
6A
6C
10D
10A
W
Llandudno Junction
Bangor
Llandudno Junction
Chester (MR)
Croes Newydd
Lostock Hall
Carnforth
Withdrawn
03/10/1953
18/05/1957
10/08/1957
09/03/1963
05/03/1966
13/05/1967
24/06/1967
14/10/1967
14/10/1967
BR4/1 75011 11/1951 6G
17A
8F
10G
W
Llandudno Junction
Derby
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Skipton
Withdrawn
03/10/1953
25/05/1963
23/11/1963
20/03/1965
05/11/1966
05/11/1966
BR4/1 75012 11/1951 6G
6H
6G
6A
6F
6C
6D
6D
W
Llandudno Junction
Bangor
Llandudno Junction
Chester (MR)
Machynlleth
Croes Newydd
Shrewsbury
Shrewsbury
Withdrawn
03/10/1953
18/05/1957
10/08/1957
09/03/1963
08/01/1966
05/03/1966
19/03/1966
16/07/1966
28/01/1967
28/01/1967
BR4/1 75013 11/1951 6G
6A
6B
1E
6F
6D
6C
5D
W
Llandudno Junction
Chester (MR)
Mold Junction
Bletchley
Machynlleth
Shrewsbury
Croes Newydd
Stoke
Withdrawn
03/10/1953
12/09/1959
09/04/1960
05/05/1962
19/06/1965
10/12/1966
11/03/1967
13/05/1967
12/08/1967
12/08/1967
BR4/1 75014 11/1951 10C
6G
6A
6G
6A
6B
1E
5D
2A
6D
W
Patricroft
Llandudno Junction
Chester (MR)
Llandudno Junction
Chester (MR)
Mold Junction
Bletchley
Stoke
Tyseley
Shrewsbury
Withdrawn
11/1951
03/10/1953
05/10/1957
20/06/1959
12/09/1959
09/04/1960
05/05/1962
21/09/1963
20/06/1964
19/09/1964
31/12/1966
31/12/1966
BR4/1 75015 12/1951 27C
8L
8F
10G
10A
W
Southport
Aintree
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Skipton
Carnforth
Withdrawn
12/1951
14/12/1963
25/04/1964
20/03/1965
11/02/1967
30/12/1967
30/12/1967
BR4/1 75016 01/1952 27C
2B
6D
6C
16B
W
Southport
Nuneaton
Shrewsbury
Croes Newydd
Colwick
Withdrawn
01/1952
25/05/1963
19/06/1965
11/03/1967
24/06/1967
08/07/1967
08/07/1967
BR4/1 75017 01/1952 27C
8F
10G
W
Southport
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Skipton
Withdrawn
01/1952
14/12/1963
20/03/1965
07/01/1967
07/01/1967
BR4/1 75018 03/1952 27C
2B
6H
5D
5E
5D
W
Southport
Nuneaton
Bangor
Stoke
Nuneaton
Stoke
Withdrawn
03/1952
25/05/1963
22/06/1963
21/09/1963
30/04/1966
04/06/1966
17/06/1967
17/06/1967
BR4/1 75019 03/1952 27C
8F
10G
10A
12E
10A
W
Southport
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Skipton
Carnforth
Tebay
Carnforth
Withdrawn
03/1952
14/12/1963
20/03/1965
21/01/1967
22/04/1967
06/01/1968
03/08/1968
03/08/1968
BR4/1 75020 11/1953 89A
6E
84E
89C
89B
5D
6D
8L
10A
W
Oswestry
Chester West
Tyseley
Machynlleth
Croes Newydd
Stoke
Shrewsbury
Aintree
Carnforth
Withdrawn
11/1953
06/09/1958
11/04/1959
11/07/1959
09/03/1963
16/01/1965
03/01/1966
11/03/1967
17/06/1967
03/08/1968
03/08/1968
BR4/1 75021 11/1953 86C
82E
81F
89C
89B
6D
6C
10A
W
Cardiff Canton
Bristol Barrow Road
Oxford
Machynlleth
Croes Newydd
Shrewsbury
Croes Newydd
Carnforth
Withdrawn
11/1953
04/10/1958
05/11/1960
19/05/1962
09/03/1963
19/03/1966
16/07/1966
29/04/1967
10/02/1968
10/02/1968
BR4/1 75022 12/1953 86C
87K
86C
82E
81F
83D
82E
83D
85A
W
Cardiff Canton
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Cardiff Canton
Bristol Barrow Road
Oxford
Exmouth Junction
Bristol Barrow Road
Exmouth Junction
Worcester
Withdrawn
12/1953
15/06/1957
10/08/1957
04/10/1958
07/10/1961
04/05/1964
21/02/1965
07/03/1965
13/06/1965
12/1965
31/12/1965
BR4/1 75023 12/1953 89A
82C
85A
85E
82G
89C
89B
5D
W
Oswestry
Swindon
Worcester
Gloucester Barnwood
Templecombe (S&D)
Machynlleth
Croes Newydd
Stoke
Withdrawn
26/12/1953
08/09/1956
30/11/1957
06/09/1958
07/10/1961
06/10/1962
09/03/1963
16/01/1965
15/01/1966
15/01/1966
BR4/1 75024 12/1953 89A
84G
81F
82C
84E
89C
89B
6J
6F
5D
12E
W
Oswestry
Shrewsbury
Oxford
Swindon
Tyseley
Machynlleth
Croes Newydd
Holyhead
Machynlleth
Stoke
Tebay
Withdrawn
26/12/1953
22/02/1958
27/12/1958
21/03/1959
05/09/1959
17/11/1962
09/03/1963
19/06/1965
16/07/1966
10/12/1966
13/05/1967
11/11/1967
11/11/1967
BR4/1 75025 04/1954 83D
82C
85A
89C
85A
85B
83D
85A
W
Laira
Swindon
Worcester
Machynlleth
Worcester
Gloucester Horton Road
Exmouth Junction
Worcester
Withdrawn
04/1954
16/06/1956
30/11/1957
13/08/1960
03/12/1960
25/01/1964
13/04/1964
13/06/1965
12/1965
31/12/1965
BR4/1 75026 05/1954 83D
82C
89A
6E
84E
89C
89B
8K
8L
10G
10A
12E
W
Laira
Swindon
Oswestry
Chester West
Tyseley
Machynlleth
Croes Newydd
Bank Hall
Aintree
Skipton
Carnforth
Tebay
Withdrawn
05/1954
16/06/1956
26/01/1957
06/09/1958
11/04/1959
11/07/1959
09/03/1963
06/02/1965
22/10/1966
19/11/1966
08/04/1967
22/04/1967
30/12/1967
30/12/1967
BR4/1 75027 05/1954 83D
81D
81F
82C
82G
89C
89B
8K
8L
10G
10A
12E
10A
W
Laira
Reading (W.R.)
Oxford
Swindon
Templecombe (S&D)
Machynlleth
Croes Newydd
Bank Hall
Aintree
Skipton
Carnforth
Tebay
Carnforth
Withdrawn
05/1954
09/10/1954
01/01/1955
21/02/1959
27/02/1960
17/11/1962
09/03/1963
06/02/1965
22/10/1966
12/11/1966
21/01/1967
22/04/1967
06/01/1968
03/08/1968
03/08/1968
BR4/1 75028 05/1954 83D
89A
6E
6K
6E
11B
6B
6K
6B
1E
6F
W
Laira
Oswestry
Chester West
Rhyl
Chester West
Workington
Mold Junction
Rhyl
Mold Junction
Bletchley
Machynlleth
Withdrawn
19/06/1954
16/06/1956
06/09/1958
20/06/1959
12/09/1959
09/04/1960
11/06/1960
10/06/1961
09/09/1961
05/05/1962
19/06/1965
11/12/1965
11/12/1965
BR4/1 75029 05/1954 83D
81D
85B
81F
27C
81F
82C
81F
84E
89C
89B
6G
6D
6C
5D
W
Laira
Reading (W.R.)
Gloucester Horton Road
Oxford
Southport
Oxford
Swindon
Oxford
Tyseley
Machynlleth
Croes Newydd
Llandudno Junction
Shrewsbury
Croes Newydd
Stoke
Withdrawn
19/06/1954
09/10/1954
04/12/1954
01/01/1955
18/10/1958
24/01/1959
21/02/1959
03/12/1960
28/01/1961
17/11/1962
09/03/1963
19/06/1965
03/09/1966
11/03/1967
10/06/1967
12/08/1967
12/08/1967
BR4/1 75030 06/1953 1E
6G
6G
1E
6D
1A
2B
5D
W
Bletchley
Llandudno Junction
Llandudno Junction
Bletchley
Chester Northgate
Willesden
Nuneaton
Stoke
Withdrawn
06/1953
19/06/1954
26/02/1955
29/12/1956
07/11/1959
09/01/1960
19/01/1963
21/09/1963
30/12/1967
30/12/1967
BR4/1 75031 06/1953 1E
6G
6A
6H
6G
6A
6G
6A
6B
6K
1A
21D
5D
W
Bletchley
Llandudno Junction
Chester (MR)
Bangor
Llandudno Junction
Chester (MR)
Llandudno Junction
Chester (MR)
Mold Junction
Rhyl
Willesden
Aston
Stoke
Withdrawn
06/1953
26/02/1955
31/12/1955
18/05/1957
10/08/1957
05/10/1957
20/06/1959
12/09/1959
09/04/1960
10/06/1961
09/09/1961
29/12/1962
21/09/1963
12/02/1966
12/02/1966
BR4/1 75032 06/1953 1E
6G
6A
6G
6A
6H
6G
6A
6G
27C
27A
5D
12E
10A
W
Bletchley
Llandudno Junction
Chester (MR)
Llandudno Junction
Chester (MR)
Bangor
Llandudno Junction
Chester (MR)
Llandudno Junction
Southport
Bank Hall
Stoke
Tebay
Carnforth
Withdrawn
06/1953
26/02/1955
31/12/1955
16/06/1956
06/10/1956
10/08/1957
30/11/1957
12/09/1959
23/06/1962
25/05/1963
20/07/1963
05/02/1966
13/05/1967
06/01/1968
17/02/1968
17/02/1968
BR4/1 75033 07/1953 1E
6A
6G
6A
6K
6A
6K
6E
11B
6B
6K
6G
27C
27A
9F
6A
6C
6D
6C
10A
W
Bletchley
Chester (MR)
Llandudno Junction
Chester (MR)
Rhyl
Chester (MR)
Rhyl
Chester West
Workington
Mold Junction
Rhyl
Llandudno Junction
Southport
Bank Hall
Heaton Mersey
Chester (MR)
Croes Newydd
Shrewsbury
Croes Newydd
Carnforth
Withdrawn
07/1953
26/02/1955
16/06/1956
06/10/1956
10/08/1957
05/10/1957
20/06/1959
12/09/1959
09/04/1960
11/06/1960
05/05/1962
22/09/1962
25/05/1963
20/07/1963
09/04/1966
30/04/1966
21/05/1966
21/01/1967
11/03/1967
29/04/1967
30/12/1967
30/12/1967
BR4/1 75034 07/1953 1E
6A
24A
6A
6K
6H
6G
6A
6K
6B
6K
6G
21D
5D
10A
W
Bletchley
Chester (MR)
Accrington
Chester (MR)
Rhyl
Bangor
Llandudno Junction
Chester (MR)
Rhyl
Mold Junction
Rhyl
Llandudno Junction
Aston
Stoke
Carnforth
Withdrawn
07/1953
26/02/1955
19/05/1956
11/08/1956
10/08/1957
05/10/1957
30/11/1957
04/10/1958
10/06/1961
09/09/1961
05/05/1962
15/09/1962
22/12/1962
21/09/1963
24/06/1967
10/02/1968
10/02/1968
BR4/1 75035 08/1953 1E
6A
6H
6G
6A
6K
6G
6H
5D
12E
W
Bletchley
Chester (MR)
Bangor
Llandudno Junction
Chester (MR)
Rhyl
Llandudno Junction
Bangor
Stoke
Tebay
Withdrawn
08/1953
26/02/1955
10/08/1957
30/11/1957
04/10/1958
23/06/1962
15/09/1962
29/06/1963
04/06/1966
27/05/1967
22/07/1967
22/07/1967
BR4/1 75036 08/1953 1E
6G
6H
2B
5D
W
Bletchley
Llandudno Junction
Bangor
Nuneaton
Stoke
Withdrawn
08/1953
10/06/1961
22/06/1963
29/06/1963
21/09/1963
11/06/1966
11/06/1966
BR4/1 75037 08/1953 1E
21D
5D
12E
W
Bletchley
Aston
Stoke
Tebay
Withdrawn
08/1953
22/12/1962
21/09/1963
13/05/1967
30/12/1967
30/12/1967
BR4/1 75038 08/1953 1E
6D
W
Bletchley
Shrewsbury
Withdrawn
08/1953
10/10/1964
25/12/1965
25/12/1965
BR4/1 75039 08/1953 1E
6A
1E
17A
8F
10G
10A
12E
W
Bletchley
Chester (MR)
Bletchley
Derby
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Skipton
Carnforth
Tebay
Withdrawn
08/1953
26/02/1955
10/03/1962
25/05/1963
23/11/1963
20/03/1965
21/01/1967
22/04/1967
23/09/1967
23/09/1967
BR4/1 75040 08/1953 15D
24A
15D
17A
15C
17A
5D
10A
W
Bedford
Accrington
Bedford
Derby
Leicester Midland
Derby
Stoke
Carnforth
Withdrawn
08/1953
31/10/1953
29/01/1955
16/01/1960
23/01/1960
22/09/1962
05/10/1963
24/06/1967
21/10/1967
21/10/1967
BR4/1 75041 08/1953 15D
24A
15D
15C
17A
8F
10G
10A
W
Bedford
Accrington
Bedford
Leicester Midland
Derby
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Skipton
Carnforth
Withdrawn
08/1953
31/10/1953
29/01/1955
16/01/1960
22/09/1962
23/11/1963
20/03/1965
08/04/1967
27/01/1968
27/01/1968
BR4/1 75042 09/1953 15D
24A
15D
15C
17A
8F
10G
10A
W
Bedford
Accrington
Bedford
Leicester Midland
Derby
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Skipton
Carnforth
Withdrawn
09/1953
31/10/1953
29/01/1955
02/05/1959
22/09/1962
23/11/1963
20/03/1965
08/04/1967
04/11/1967
04/11/1967
BR4/1 75043 09/1953 15D
24A
15D
15C
17A
8R
8L
10A
W
Bedford
Accrington
Bedford
Leicester Midland
Derby
Walton on the Hill
Aintree
Carnforth
Withdrawn
09/1953
31/10/1953
29/01/1955
16/01/1960
22/09/1962
23/11/1963
14/12/1963
17/06/1967
30/12/1967
30/12/1967
BR4/1 75044 09/1953 15D
24A
15D
16A
15C
17A
8F
10G
W
Bedford
Accrington
Bedford
Nottingham
Leicester Midland
Derby
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Skipton
Withdrawn
09/1953
31/10/1953
29/01/1955
16/01/1960
23/01/1960
22/09/1962
23/11/1963
20/03/1965
12/03/1966
12/03/1966
BR4/1 75045 09/1953 24A
27A
2B
W
Accrington
Bank Hall
Nuneaton
Withdrawn
09/1953
08/10/1955
25/05/1963
23/04/1966
23/04/1966
BR4/1 75046 09/1953 24A
27A
9F
6A
6C
5D
W
Accrington
Bank Hall
Heaton Mersey
Chester (MR)
Croes Newydd
Stoke
Withdrawn
09/1953
05/11/1955
16/04/1966
30/04/1966
21/05/1966
13/05/1967
12/08/1967
12/08/1967
BR4/1 75047 10/1953 24A
27A
5D
6C
6F
6C
6D
6C
5D
W
Accrington
Bank Hall
Stoke
Croes Newydd
Machynlleth
Croes Newydd
Shrewsbury
Croes Newydd
Stoke
Withdrawn
10/1953
05/11/1955
05/02/1966
05/03/1966
16/07/1966
10/12/1966
21/01/1967
11/03/1967
10/06/1967
12/08/1967
12/08/1967
BR4/1 75048 10/1953 24A
27A
6A
6C
10D
10A
W
Accrington
Bank Hall
Chester (MR)
Croes Newydd
Lostock Hall
Carnforth
Withdrawn
10/1953
05/11/1955
30/04/1966
21/05/1966
27/05/1967
24/06/1967
03/08/1968
03/08/1968
BR4/1 75049 10/1953 24A
27A
6A
27A
W
Accrington
Bank Hall
Chester (MR)
Bank Hall
Withdrawn
10/1953
05/11/1955
19/05/1956
11/08/1956
08/10/1966
08/10/1966
BR4/1 75050 10/1956 6G
6A
6H
6G
27A
5D
5E
5D
W
Llandudno Junction
Chester (MR)
Bangor
Llandudno Junction
Bank Hall
Stoke
Nuneaton
Stoke
Withdrawn
10/1956
05/10/1957
23/06/1962
15/09/1962
25/05/1963
05/02/1966
12/03/1966
04/06/1966
26/11/1966
26/11/1966
BR4/1 75051 11/1956 6A
6K
6A
1E
17A
8F
10G
W
Chester (MR)
Rhyl
Chester (MR)
Bletchley
Derby
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Skipton
Withdrawn
11/1956
12/07/1958
04/10/1958
23/06/1962
25/05/1963
23/11/1963
06/03/1965
29/10/1966
29/10/1966
BR4/1 75052 12/1956 1E
6D
1A
2B
6J
6F
6C
5D
W
Bletchley
Chester Northgate
Willesden
Nuneaton
Holyhead
Machynlleth
Croes Newydd
Stoke
Withdrawn
12/1956
07/11/1959
09/01/1960
19/01/1963
19/06/1965
16/07/1966
10/12/1966
10/06/1967
12/08/1967
12/08/1967
BR4/1 75053 01/1957 6A
6K
6A
6K
6B
1E
21D
5D
6D
W
Chester (MR)
Rhyl
Chester (MR)
Rhyl
Mold Junction
Bletchley
Aston
Stoke
Shrewsbury
Withdrawn
01/1957
14/06/1958
04/10/1958
18/06/1960
17/09/1960
05/05/1962
22/12/1962
21/09/1963
19/09/1964
10/09/1966
10/09/1966
BR4/1 75054 01/1957 6A
6K
6A
6K
6B
1E
5D
W
Chester (MR)
Rhyl
Chester (MR)
Rhyl
Mold Junction
Bletchley
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/1957
14/06/1958
04/10/1958
18/06/1960
17/09/1960
05/05/1962
16/01/1965
27/08/1966
27/08/1966
BR4/1 75055 01/1957 15D
16A
15C
16A
15C
17A
1E
6D
1E
6F
6D
6C
5D
W
Bedford
Nottingham
Leicester Midland
Nottingham
Leicester Midland
Derby
Bletchley
Shrewsbury
Bletchley
Machynlleth
Shrewsbury
Croes Newydd
Stoke
Withdrawn
01/1957
16/01/1960
23/01/1960
25/02/1961
10/02/1962
22/09/1962
25/05/1963
19/09/1964
10/10/1964
19/06/1965
10/12/1966
11/03/1967
13/05/1967
27/05/1967
27/05/1967
BR4/1 75056 03/1957 16A
17A
1E
5D
W
Nottingham
Derby
Bletchley
Stoke
Withdrawn
03/1957
22/09/1962
25/05/1963
21/09/1963
11/06/1966
11/06/1966
BR4/1 75057 03/1957 15C
17A
8F
10G
W
Leicester Midland
Derby
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Skipton
Withdrawn
03/1957
22/09/1962
23/11/1963
06/03/1965
12/02/1966
12/02/1966
BR4/1 75058 04/1957 15C
17A
8F
10G
10A
W
Leicester Midland
Derby
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Skipton
Carnforth
Withdrawn
04/1957
22/09/1962
25/01/1964
06/03/1965
08/04/1967
30/12/1967
30/12/1967
BR4/1 75059 04/1957 15C
17A
8F
10G
10A
W
Leicester Midland
Derby
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Skipton
Carnforth
Withdrawn
04/1957
22/09/1962
23/11/1963
06/03/1965
08/04/1967
22/07/1967
22/07/1967
BR4/1 75060 05/1957 15C
17A
8R
8L
8A
9F
6A
6C
W
Leicester Midland
Derby
Walton on the Hill
Aintree
Edge Hill
Heaton Mersey
Chester (MR)
Croes Newydd
Withdrawn
05/1957
22/09/1962
23/11/1963
14/12/1963
26/06/1965
02/04/1966
30/04/1966
21/05/1966
22/04/1967
22/04/1967
BR4/1 75061 05/1957 15C
17A
8R
8L
W
Leicester Midland
Derby
Walton on the Hill
Aintree
Withdrawn
05/1957
22/09/1962
23/11/1963
14/12/1963
04/02/1967
04/02/1967
BR4/1 75062 05/1957 16A
17A
5D
10D
10A
W
Nottingham
Derby
Stoke
Lostock Hall
Carnforth
Withdrawn
16/06/1957
22/09/1962
05/10/1963
13/05/1967
24/06/1967
10/02/1968
10/02/1968
BR4/1 75063 06/1957 16A
17A
2B
6D
W
Nottingham
Derby
Nuneaton
Shrewsbury
Withdrawn
06/1957
22/09/1962
25/05/1963
19/09/1964
28/05/1966
28/05/1966
BR4/1 75064 06/1957 16A
17A
8R
8L
W
Nottingham
Derby
Walton on the Hill
Aintree
Withdrawn
06/1957
22/09/1962
23/11/1963
14/12/1963
20/05/1967
20/05/1967
BR4/1 75065 08/1955 74C
71B
71A
70D
71A
W
Dover Marine
Bournemouth
Eastleigh
Basingstoke
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
08/1955
14/06/1959
23/08/1961
17/12/1962
01/04/1963
04/09/1966
04/09/1966
BR4/1 75066 09/1955 74C
71B
71A
70D
71A
W
Dover Marine
Bournemouth
Eastleigh
Basingstoke
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
09/1955
14/06/1959
06/07/1961
17/12/1962
01/04/1963
02/1966
02/1966
BR4/1 75067 09/1955 74C
71B
71A
75A
75D
75C
70D
W
Dover Marine
Bournemouth
Eastleigh
Brighton
Stewarts Lane
Norwood Junction
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
09/1955
14/06/1959
23/08/1961
17/12/1962
19/04/1963
16/09/1963
06/01/1964
04/10/1964
04/10/1964
BR4/1 75068 09/1955 74C
71B
71A
75A
75D
75C
70D
W
Dover Marine
Bournemouth
Eastleigh
Brighton
Stewarts Lane
Norwood Junction
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
09/1955
14/06/1959
26/05/1961
17/12/1962
19/04/1963
16/09/1963
06/01/1964
02/07/1967
02/07/1967
BR4/1 75069 09/1955 74C
71B
73A
70A
70D
W
Dover Marine
Bournemouth
Stewarts Lane
Nine Elms
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
09/1955
14/06/1959
26/11/1959
19/08/1963
08/06/1965
25/09/1966
25/09/1966
BR4/1 75070 10/1955 72A
71G
71A
75A
75E
75D
70A
70D
W
Exmouth Junction
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Eastleigh
Brighton
Three Bridges
Stewarts Lane
Nine Elms
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
10/1955
15/06/1956
01/04/1957
11/03/1959
09/02/1960
24/09/1962
19/08/1963
08/06/1965
11/09/1966
11/09/1966
BR4/1 75071 10/1955 72A
71G
82G
6C
5D
W
Exmouth Junction
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Templecombe (S&D)
Croes Newydd
Stoke
Withdrawn
10/1955
15/06/1956
17/11/1962
18/07/1964
10/06/1967
12/08/1967
12/08/1967
BR4/1 75072 11/1955 72A
71G
82G
W
Exmouth Junction
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Templecombe (S&D)
Withdrawn
11/1955
15/06/1956
03/11/1962
12/1965
31/12/1965
BR4/1 75073 11/1955 72A
71A
71G
82G
W
Exmouth Junction
Eastleigh
Bath Green Park (S&D)
Templecombe (S&D)
Withdrawn
11/1955
15/06/1956
01/04/1957
17/11/1962
12/1965
31/12/1965
BR4/1 75074 12/1955 72A
71A
70D
73A
75C
70D
70A
70D
W
Exmouth Junction
Eastleigh
Basingstoke
Stewarts Lane
Norwood Junction
Eastleigh
Nine Elms
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
12/1955
15/06/1956
08/10/1957
11/03/1959
22/07/1963
06/01/1964
14/09/1964
08/06/1965
09/07/1967
09/07/1967
BR4/1 75075 12/1955 72A
70D
75E
75D
75C
70D
W
Exmouth Junction
Basingstoke
Three Bridges
Stewarts Lane
Norwood Junction
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
12/1955
15/06/1956
11/03/1959
24/09/1962
22/07/1963
06/01/1964
09/07/1967
09/07/1967
BR4/1 75076 12/1955 72A
70D
70A
70D
W
Exmouth Junction
Basingstoke
Nine Elms
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
12/1955
15/06/1956
01/04/1963
08/06/1965
09/07/1967
09/07/1967
BR4/1 75077 12/1955 72A
70D
70A
70D
W
Exmouth Junction
Basingstoke
Nine Elms
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
12/1955
15/06/1956
01/04/1963
08/06/1965
09/07/1967
09/07/1967
BR4/1 75078 01/1956 72A
70D
70A
70D
W
Exmouth Junction
Basingstoke
Nine Elms
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
01/1956
15/06/1956
01/04/1963
08/06/1965
10/07/1966
10/07/1966
BR4/1 75079 01/1956 72A
70D
71A
W
Exmouth Junction
Basingstoke
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
01/1956
15/06/1956
01/04/1963
20/11/1966
20/11/1966