Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 88 Today
» 1224 Yesterday
» 3900 Week
» 33398 Month
» 370244 Year
» 1591809 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

BR Standard Riddles "BR4/1" Class 4-6-0


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
21/05/1951 To Service 75000   NEW 82C Swindon  
16/08/1951 To Service 75001   NEW 84G Shrewsbury  
24/08/1951 To Service 75002   NEW 84G Shrewsbury  
27/08/1951 To Service 75004   NEW 82A Bristol Bath Road  
30/08/1951 To Service 75003   NEW 84G Shrewsbury  
09/09/1951 To Service 75005   NEW 84G Shrewsbury  
30/09/1951 Reallocation 75000 82C Swindon 84G Shrewsbury  
06/12/1951 To Service 75014   NEW 10C Patricroft  
20/12/1951 To Service 75015   NEW 27C Southport  
03/01/1952 To Service 75016   NEW 27C Southport  
18/01/1952 To Service 75017   NEW 27C Southport  
07/03/1952 To Service 75018   NEW 27C Southport  
21/03/1952 To Service 75019   NEW 27C Southport  
30/04/1952 Reallocation 75006     84G Shrewsbury  
15/06/1953 To Service 75030   NEW 1E Bletchley  
16/06/1953 To Service 75031   NEW 1E Bletchley  
30/06/1953 To Service 75032   NEW 1E Bletchley  
07/1953 To Service 75034   NEW 1E Bletchley  
03/07/1953 To Service 75033   NEW 1E Bletchley  
13/08/1953 To Service 75035   NEW 1E Bletchley  
14/08/1953 To Service 75036   NEW 1E Bletchley  
14/08/1953 To Service 75037   NEW 1E Bletchley  
25/08/1953 To Service 75038   NEW 1E Bletchley  
27/08/1953 To Service 75039   NEW 1E Bletchley  
09/1953 To Service 75044   NEW 15D Bedford  
02/09/1953 To Service 75040   NEW 15D Bedford  
10/09/1953 To Service 75041   NEW 15D Bedford  
11/09/1953 To Service 75042   NEW 15D Bedford  
17/09/1953 To Service 75043   NEW 15D Bedford  
28/09/1953 To Service 75045   NEW 24A Accrington  
10/1953 To Service 75049   NEW 24A Accrington  
03/10/1953 Reallocation 75001 84G Shrewsbury 82C Swindon  
03/10/1953 Reallocation 75002 84G Shrewsbury 82C Swindon  
03/10/1953 Reallocation 75004 82A Bristol Bath Road 82C Swindon  
03/10/1953 Reallocation 75005 84G Shrewsbury 86C Cardiff Canton  
03/10/1953 Reallocation 75006 84G Shrewsbury 86C Cardiff Canton  
03/10/1953 Reallocation 75007     86C Cardiff Canton  
03/10/1953 Reallocation 75009     86C Cardiff Canton  
03/10/1953 Reallocation 75010     6G Llandudno Junction  
03/10/1953 Reallocation 75011     6G Llandudno Junction  
03/10/1953 Reallocation 75012     6G Llandudno Junction  
03/10/1953 Reallocation 75013     6G Llandudno Junction  
03/10/1953 Reallocation 75014 10C Patricroft 6G Llandudno Junction  
05/10/1953 To Service 75046   NEW 24A Accrington  
16/10/1953 To Service 75047   NEW 24A Accrington  
23/10/1953 To Service 75048   NEW 24A Accrington  
31/10/1953 Reallocation 75008     86C Cardiff Canton  
31/10/1953 Reallocation 75040 15D Bedford 24A Accrington  
31/10/1953 Reallocation 75041 15D Bedford 24A Accrington  
31/10/1953 Reallocation 75042 15D Bedford 24A Accrington  
31/10/1953 Reallocation 75043 15D Bedford 24A Accrington  
31/10/1953 Reallocation 75044 15D Bedford 24A Accrington  
13/11/1953 To Service 75020   NEW 89A Oswestry  
23/11/1953 To Service 75021   NEW 86C Cardiff Canton  
02/12/1953 To Service 75022   NEW 86C Cardiff Canton  
26/12/1953 Reallocation 75000 84G Shrewsbury 82C Swindon  
26/12/1953 Reallocation 75003 84G Shrewsbury 82C Swindon  
26/12/1953 Reallocation 75006 86C Cardiff Canton 89A Oswestry  
26/12/1953 Reallocation 75023     89A Oswestry  
26/12/1953 Reallocation 75024     89A Oswestry  
27/02/1954 Reallocation 75005 86C Cardiff Canton 89A Oswestry  
29/04/1954 To Service 75025   NEW 83D Laira  
13/05/1954 To Service 75026   NEW 83D Laira  
17/05/1954 To Service 75027   NEW 83D Laira  
19/06/1954 Reallocation 75028     83D Laira  
19/06/1954 Reallocation 75029     83D Laira  
19/06/1954 Reallocation 75030 1E Bletchley 6G Llandudno Junction  
09/10/1954 Reallocation 75001 82C Swindon 81F Oxford  
09/10/1954 Reallocation 75004 82C Swindon 81F Oxford  
09/10/1954 Reallocation 75027 83D Laira 81D Reading (W.R.)  
09/10/1954 Reallocation 75029 83D Laira 81D Reading (W.R.)  
04/12/1954 Reallocation 75029 81D Reading (W.R.) 85B Gloucester Horton Road  
01/01/1955 Reallocation 75027 81D Reading (W.R.) 81F Oxford  
01/01/1955 Reallocation 75029 85B Gloucester Horton Road 81F Oxford  
29/01/1955 Reallocation 75040 24A Accrington 15D Bedford  
29/01/1955 Reallocation 75041 24A Accrington 15D Bedford  
29/01/1955 Reallocation 75042 24A Accrington 15D Bedford  
29/01/1955 Reallocation 75043 24A Accrington 15D Bedford  
29/01/1955 Reallocation 75044 24A Accrington 15D Bedford  
26/02/1955 Reallocation 75030 6G Llandudno Junction 6G Llandudno Junction  
26/02/1955 Reallocation 75031 1E Bletchley 6G Llandudno Junction  
26/02/1955 Reallocation 75032 1E Bletchley 6G Llandudno Junction  
26/02/1955 Reallocation 75033 1E Bletchley 6A Chester (MR)  
26/02/1955 Reallocation 75034 1E Bletchley 6A Chester (MR)  
26/02/1955 Reallocation 75035 1E Bletchley 6A Chester (MR)  
26/02/1955 Reallocation 75039 1E Bletchley 6A Chester (MR)  
16/07/1955 Reallocation 75004 81F Oxford 86C Cardiff Canton  
26/08/1955 To Service 75065   NEW 74C Dover Marine  
01/09/1955 To Service 75066   NEW 74C Dover Marine  
12/09/1955 To Service 75067   NEW 74C Dover Marine  
15/09/1955 To Service 75068   NEW 74C Dover Marine  
28/09/1955 To Service 75069   NEW 74C Dover Marine  
08/10/1955 Reallocation 75045 24A Accrington 27A Bank Hall  
13/10/1955 To Service 75070   NEW 72A Exmouth Junction  
26/10/1955 To Service 75071   NEW 72A Exmouth Junction  
01/11/1955 To Service 75072   NEW 72A Exmouth Junction  
05/11/1955 Reallocation 75046 24A Accrington 27A Bank Hall  
05/11/1955 Reallocation 75047 24A Accrington 27A Bank Hall  
05/11/1955 Reallocation 75048 24A Accrington 27A Bank Hall  
05/11/1955 Reallocation 75049 24A Accrington 27A Bank Hall  
18/11/1955 To Service 75074   NEW 72A Exmouth Junction  
25/11/1955 To Service 75075   NEW 72A Exmouth Junction  
30/11/1955 To Service 75073   NEW 72A Exmouth Junction  
12/1955 Reallocation 75074     72A Exmouth Junction  
12/1955 Reallocation 75075     72A Exmouth Junction  
09/12/1955 To Service 75076   NEW 72A Exmouth Junction  
29/12/1955 To Service 75077   NEW 72A Exmouth Junction  
31/12/1955 Reallocation 75031 6G Llandudno Junction 6A Chester (MR)  
31/12/1955 Reallocation 75032 6G Llandudno Junction 6A Chester (MR)  
20/01/1956 To Service 75078   NEW 72A Exmouth Junction  
20/01/1956 To Service 75079   NEW 72A Exmouth Junction  
19/05/1956 Reallocation 75034 6A Chester (MR) 24A Accrington  
19/05/1956 Reallocation 75049 27A Bank Hall 6A Chester (MR)  
09/06/1956 Reallocation 75033 6A Chester (MR) 6G Llandudno Junction  
15/06/1956 Reallocation 75070 72A Exmouth Junction 71G Bath Green Park (S&D)  
15/06/1956 Reallocation 75071 72A Exmouth Junction 71G Bath Green Park (S&D)  
15/06/1956 Reallocation 75072 72A Exmouth Junction 71G Bath Green Park (S&D)  
15/06/1956 Reallocation 75073 72A Exmouth Junction 71A Eastleigh  
15/06/1956 Reallocation 75074 72A Exmouth Junction 71A Eastleigh  
15/06/1956 Reallocation 75075 72A Exmouth Junction 70D Basingstoke  
15/06/1956 Reallocation 75076 72A Exmouth Junction 70D Basingstoke  
15/06/1956 Reallocation 75077 72A Exmouth Junction 70D Basingstoke  
15/06/1956 Reallocation 75078 72A Exmouth Junction 70D Basingstoke  
15/06/1956 Reallocation 75079 72A Exmouth Junction 70D Basingstoke  
16/06/1956 Reallocation 75025 83D Laira 82C Swindon  
16/06/1956 Reallocation 75026 83D Laira 82C Swindon  
16/06/1956 Reallocation 75028 83D Laira 89A Oswestry  
16/06/1956 Reallocation 75032 6A Chester (MR) 6G Llandudno Junction  
11/08/1956 Reallocation 75034 24A Accrington 6A Chester (MR)  
11/08/1956 Reallocation 75049 6A Chester (MR) 27A Bank Hall  
08/09/1956 Reallocation 75023 89A Oswestry 82C Swindon  
15/09/1956 Reallocation 75033 6G Llandudno Junction 6A Chester (MR)  
06/10/1956 Reallocation 75002 82C Swindon 89A Oswestry  
06/10/1956 Reallocation 75032 6G Llandudno Junction 6A Chester (MR)  
09/11/1956 To Service 75050   NEW 6G Llandudno Junction  
27/11/1956 To Service 75051   NEW 6A Chester (MR)  
20/12/1956 To Service 75052   NEW 1E Bletchley  
29/12/1956 Reallocation 75030 6G Llandudno Junction 1E Bletchley  
01/1957 To Service 75053   NEW 6A Chester (MR)  
17/01/1957 To Service 75054   NEW 6A Chester (MR)  
23/01/1957 To Service 75055   NEW 15D Bedford  
26/01/1957 Reallocation 75002 89A Oswestry 82C Swindon  
26/01/1957 Reallocation 75026 82C Swindon 89A Oswestry  
28/02/1957 To Service 75056   NEW 16A Nottingham  
03/1957 Reallocation 75056     16A Nottingham  
03/1957 To Service 75057   NEW 15C Leicester Midland  
01/04/1957 Reallocation 75070 71G Bath Green Park (S&D) 71A Eastleigh  
01/04/1957 Reallocation 75073 71A Eastleigh 71G Bath Green Park (S&D)  
08/04/1957 To Service 75058   NEW 15C Leicester Midland  
15/04/1957 To Service 75059   NEW 15C Leicester Midland  
02/05/1957 To Service 75060   NEW 15C Leicester Midland  
15/05/1957 To Service 75061   NEW 15C Leicester Midland  
18/05/1957 Reallocation 75010 6G Llandudno Junction 6H Bangor  
18/05/1957 Reallocation 75012 6G Llandudno Junction 6H Bangor  
18/05/1957 Reallocation 75031 6A Chester (MR) 6H Bangor  
13/06/1957 To Service 75063   NEW 16A Nottingham  
15/06/1957 Reallocation 75022 86C Cardiff Canton 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)  
16/06/1957 Reallocation 75062     16A Nottingham  
22/06/1957 Reallocation 75033 6A Chester (MR) 6K Rhyl  
26/06/1957 To Service 75064   NEW 16A Nottingham  
10/08/1957 Reallocation 75010 6H Bangor 6G Llandudno Junction  
10/08/1957 Reallocation 75012 6H Bangor 6G Llandudno Junction  
10/08/1957 Reallocation 75022 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 86C Cardiff Canton  
10/08/1957 Reallocation 75031 6H Bangor 6G Llandudno Junction  
10/08/1957 Reallocation 75032 6A Chester (MR) 6H Bangor  
10/08/1957 Reallocation 75034 6A Chester (MR) 6K Rhyl  
10/08/1957 Reallocation 75035 6A Chester (MR) 6H Bangor  
16/09/1957 Reallocation 75033 6K Rhyl 6A Chester (MR)  
05/10/1957 Reallocation 75014 6G Llandudno Junction 6A Chester (MR)  
05/10/1957 Reallocation 75031 6G Llandudno Junction 6A Chester (MR)  
05/10/1957 Reallocation 75034 6K Rhyl 6H Bangor  
05/10/1957 Reallocation 75050 6G Llandudno Junction 6A Chester (MR)  
08/10/1957 Reallocation 75074 71A Eastleigh 70D Basingstoke  
30/11/1957 Reallocation 75023 82C Swindon 85A Worcester  
30/11/1957 Reallocation 75025 82C Swindon 85A Worcester  
30/11/1957 Reallocation 75032 6H Bangor 6G Llandudno Junction  
30/11/1957 Reallocation 75034 6H Bangor 6G Llandudno Junction  
30/11/1957 Reallocation 75035 6H Bangor 6G Llandudno Junction  
22/02/1958 Reallocation 75003 82C Swindon 85A Worcester  
22/02/1958 Reallocation 75024 89A Oswestry 84G Shrewsbury  
17/05/1958 Reallocation 75009 86C Cardiff Canton 85A Worcester  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 75053 6A Chester (MR) 6K Rhyl  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 75054 6A Chester (MR) 6K Rhyl  
12/07/1958 Reallocation 75051 6A Chester (MR) 6K Rhyl  
06/09/1958 Reallocation 75005 89A Oswestry 6E Chester West  
06/09/1958 Reallocation 75006 89A Oswestry 6E Chester West  
06/09/1958 Reallocation 75009 85A Worcester 85E Gloucester Barnwood  
06/09/1958 Reallocation 75020 89A Oswestry 6E Chester West  
06/09/1958 Reallocation 75023 85A Worcester 85E Gloucester Barnwood  
06/09/1958 Reallocation 75026 89A Oswestry 6E Chester West  
06/09/1958 Reallocation 75028 89A Oswestry 6E Chester West  
04/10/1958 Reallocation 75004 86C Cardiff Canton 82E Bristol Barrow Road  
04/10/1958 Reallocation 75007 86C Cardiff Canton 81F Oxford  
04/10/1958 Reallocation 75021 86C Cardiff Canton 82E Bristol Barrow Road  
04/10/1958 Reallocation 75022 86C Cardiff Canton 82E Bristol Barrow Road  
04/10/1958 Reallocation 75034 6G Llandudno Junction 6A Chester (MR)  
04/10/1958 Reallocation 75035 6G Llandudno Junction 6A Chester (MR)  
04/10/1958 Reallocation 75051 6K Rhyl 6A Chester (MR)  
04/10/1958 Reallocation 75053 6K Rhyl 6A Chester (MR)  
04/10/1958 Reallocation 75054 6K Rhyl 6A Chester (MR)  
18/10/1958 Reallocation 75029 81F Oxford 27C Southport  
01/11/1958 Reallocation 75008 86C Cardiff Canton 81F Oxford  
27/12/1958 Reallocation 75024 84G Shrewsbury 81F Oxford  
24/01/1959 Reallocation 75029 27C Southport 81F Oxford  
21/02/1959 Reallocation 75027 81F Oxford 82C Swindon  
21/02/1959 Reallocation 75029 81F Oxford 82C Swindon  
11/03/1959 Reallocation 75070 71A Eastleigh 75A Brighton  
11/03/1959 Reallocation 75074 70D Basingstoke 73A Stewarts Lane  
11/03/1959 Reallocation 75075 70D Basingstoke 75E Three Bridges  
21/03/1959 Reallocation 75024 81F Oxford 82C Swindon  
11/04/1959 Reallocation 75005 6E Chester West 84E Tyseley  
11/04/1959 Reallocation 75006 6E Chester West 84E Tyseley  
11/04/1959 Reallocation 75020 6E Chester West 84E Tyseley  
11/04/1959 Reallocation 75026 6E Chester West 84E Tyseley  
02/05/1959 Reallocation 75042 15D Bedford 15C Leicester Midland  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 75065 74C Dover Marine 71B Bournemouth  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 75066 74C Dover Marine 71B Bournemouth  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 75067 74C Dover Marine 71B Bournemouth  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 75068 74C Dover Marine 71B Bournemouth  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 75069 74C Dover Marine 71B Bournemouth  
15/06/1959 Reallocation 75033 6A Chester (MR) 6K Rhyl  
20/06/1959 Reallocation 75014 6A Chester (MR) 6G Llandudno Junction  
20/06/1959 Reallocation 75028 6E Chester West 6K Rhyl  
20/06/1959 Reallocation 75031 6A Chester (MR) 6G Llandudno Junction  
11/07/1959 Reallocation 75020 84E Tyseley 89C Machynlleth  
11/07/1959 Reallocation 75026 84E Tyseley 89C Machynlleth  
05/09/1959 Reallocation 75000 82C Swindon 84E Tyseley  
05/09/1959 Reallocation 75024 82C Swindon 84E Tyseley  
06/09/1959 Reallocation 75033 6K Rhyl 6E Chester West  
12/09/1959 Reallocation 75013 6G Llandudno Junction 6A Chester (MR)  
12/09/1959 Reallocation 75014 6G Llandudno Junction 6A Chester (MR)  
12/09/1959 Reallocation 75028 6K Rhyl 6E Chester West  
12/09/1959 Reallocation 75031 6G Llandudno Junction 6A Chester (MR)  
12/09/1959 Reallocation 75032 6G Llandudno Junction 6A Chester (MR)  
07/11/1959 Reallocation 75030 1E Bletchley 6D Chester Northgate  
07/11/1959 Reallocation 75052 1E Bletchley 6D Chester Northgate  
26/11/1959 Reallocation 75069 71B Bournemouth 73A Stewarts Lane  
09/01/1960 Reallocation 75030 6D Chester Northgate 1A Willesden  
09/01/1960 Reallocation 75052 6D Chester Northgate 1A Willesden  
16/01/1960 Reallocation 75040 15D Bedford 17A Derby  
16/01/1960 Reallocation 75041 15D Bedford 15C Leicester Midland  
16/01/1960 Reallocation 75043 15D Bedford 15C Leicester Midland  
16/01/1960 Reallocation 75044 15D Bedford 16A Nottingham  
16/01/1960 Reallocation 75055 15D Bedford 16A Nottingham  
23/01/1960 Reallocation 75040 17A Derby 15C Leicester Midland  
23/01/1960 Reallocation 75044 16A Nottingham 15C Leicester Midland  
23/01/1960 Reallocation 75055 16A Nottingham 15C Leicester Midland  
30/01/1960 Reallocation 75002 82C Swindon 85E Gloucester Barnwood  
09/02/1960 Reallocation 75070 75A Brighton 75E Three Bridges  
27/02/1960 Reallocation 75027 82C Swindon 82G Templecombe (S&D)  
09/04/1960 Reallocation 75013 6A Chester (MR) 6B Mold Junction  
09/04/1960 Reallocation 75014 6A Chester (MR) 6B Mold Junction  
09/04/1960 Reallocation 75028 6E Chester West 11B Workington  
09/04/1960 Reallocation 75031 6A Chester (MR) 6B Mold Junction  
09/04/1960 Reallocation 75033 6E Chester West 11B Workington  
11/06/1960 Reallocation 75028 11B Workington 6B Mold Junction  
11/06/1960 Reallocation 75033 11B Workington 6B Mold Junction  
18/06/1960 Reallocation 75053 6A Chester (MR) 6K Rhyl  
18/06/1960 Reallocation 75054 6A Chester (MR) 6K Rhyl  
16/07/1960 Reallocation 75003 85A Worcester 84E Tyseley  
16/07/1960 Reallocation 75005 84E Tyseley 85A Worcester  
13/08/1960 Reallocation 75025 85A Worcester 89C Machynlleth  
17/09/1960 Reallocation 75053 6K Rhyl 6B Mold Junction  
17/09/1960 Reallocation 75054 6K Rhyl 6B Mold Junction  
05/11/1960 Reallocation 75021 82E Bristol Barrow Road 81F Oxford  
03/12/1960 Reallocation 75025 89C Machynlleth 85A Worcester  
03/12/1960 Reallocation 75029 82C Swindon 81F Oxford  
28/01/1961 Reallocation 75029 81F Oxford 84E Tyseley  
25/02/1961 Reallocation 75000 84E Tyseley 81F Oxford  
25/02/1961 Reallocation 75055 15C Leicester Midland 16A Nottingham  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 75068 71B Bournemouth 71A Eastleigh  
10/06/1961 Reallocation 75028 6B Mold Junction 6K Rhyl  
10/06/1961 Reallocation 75031 6B Mold Junction 6K Rhyl  
10/06/1961 Reallocation 75034 6A Chester (MR) 6K Rhyl  
10/06/1961 Reallocation 75036 1E Bletchley 6G Llandudno Junction  
06/07/1961 Reallocation 75066 71B Bournemouth 71A Eastleigh  
23/08/1961 Reallocation 75065 71B Bournemouth 71A Eastleigh  
23/08/1961 Reallocation 75067 71B Bournemouth 71A Eastleigh  
09/09/1961 Reallocation 75028 6K Rhyl 6B Mold Junction  
09/09/1961 Reallocation 75031 6K Rhyl 1A Willesden  
09/09/1961 Reallocation 75034 6K Rhyl 6B Mold Junction  
07/10/1961 Reallocation 75002 85E Gloucester Barnwood 82G Templecombe (S&D)  
07/10/1961 Reallocation 75009 85E Gloucester Barnwood 82G Templecombe (S&D)  
07/10/1961 Reallocation 75022 82E Bristol Barrow Road 81F Oxford  
07/10/1961 Reallocation 75023 85E Gloucester Barnwood 82G Templecombe (S&D)  
02/12/1961 Reallocation 75004 82E Bristol Barrow Road 82G Templecombe (S&D)  
10/02/1962 Reallocation 75055 16A Nottingham 15C Leicester Midland  
10/03/1962 Reallocation 75039 6A Chester (MR) 1E Bletchley  
05/05/1962 Reallocation 75013 6B Mold Junction 1E Bletchley  
05/05/1962 Reallocation 75014 6B Mold Junction 1E Bletchley  
05/05/1962 Reallocation 75028 6B Mold Junction 1E Bletchley  
05/05/1962 Reallocation 75033 6B Mold Junction 6K Rhyl  
05/05/1962 Reallocation 75034 6B Mold Junction 6K Rhyl  
05/05/1962 Reallocation 75053 6B Mold Junction 1E Bletchley  
05/05/1962 Reallocation 75054 6B Mold Junction 1E Bletchley  
19/05/1962 Reallocation 75004 82G Templecombe (S&D) 82F Bath Green Park (S&D)  
19/05/1962 Reallocation 75021 81F Oxford 89C Machynlleth  
16/06/1962 Reallocation 75002 82G Templecombe (S&D) 82E Bristol Barrow Road  
23/06/1962 Reallocation 75032 6A Chester (MR) 6G Llandudno Junction  
23/06/1962 Reallocation 75035 6A Chester (MR) 6K Rhyl  
23/06/1962 Reallocation 75050 6A Chester (MR) 6H Bangor  
23/06/1962 Reallocation 75051 6A Chester (MR) 1E Bletchley  
14/07/1962 Reallocation 75000 81F Oxford 82E Bristol Barrow Road  
08/09/1962 Reallocation 75000 82E Bristol Barrow Road 84D Leamington  
15/09/1962 Reallocation 75034 6K Rhyl 6G Llandudno Junction  
15/09/1962 Reallocation 75035 6K Rhyl 6G Llandudno Junction  
15/09/1962 Reallocation 75050 6H Bangor 6G Llandudno Junction  
22/09/1962 Reallocation 75033 6K Rhyl 6G Llandudno Junction  
22/09/1962 Reallocation 75040 15C Leicester Midland 17A Derby  
22/09/1962 Reallocation 75041 15C Leicester Midland 17A Derby  
22/09/1962 Reallocation 75042 15C Leicester Midland 17A Derby  
22/09/1962 Reallocation 75043 15C Leicester Midland 17A Derby  
22/09/1962 Reallocation 75044 15C Leicester Midland 17A Derby  
22/09/1962 Reallocation 75055 15C Leicester Midland 17A Derby  
22/09/1962 Reallocation 75056 16A Nottingham 17A Derby  
22/09/1962 Reallocation 75057 15C Leicester Midland 17A Derby  
22/09/1962 Reallocation 75058 15C Leicester Midland 17A Derby  
22/09/1962 Reallocation 75059 15C Leicester Midland 17A Derby  
22/09/1962 Reallocation 75060 15C Leicester Midland 17A Derby  
22/09/1962 Reallocation 75061 15C Leicester Midland 17A Derby  
22/09/1962 Reallocation 75062 16A Nottingham 17A Derby  
22/09/1962 Reallocation 75063 16A Nottingham 17A Derby  
22/09/1962 Reallocation 75064 16A Nottingham 17A Derby  
24/09/1962 Reallocation 75070 75E Three Bridges 75D Stewarts Lane  
24/09/1962 Reallocation 75075 75E Three Bridges 75D Stewarts Lane  
06/10/1962 Reallocation 75002 82E Bristol Barrow Road 89C Machynlleth  
06/10/1962 Reallocation 75006 84E Tyseley 89C Machynlleth  
06/10/1962 Reallocation 75023 82G Templecombe (S&D) 89C Machynlleth  
20/10/1962 Reallocation 75033 6G Llandudno Junction 2B Nuneaton  
03/11/1962 Reallocation 75004 82F Bath Green Park (S&D) 89C Machynlleth  
03/11/1962 Reallocation 75072 71G Bath Green Park (S&D) 82G Templecombe (S&D)  
17/11/1962 Reallocation 75009 82G Templecombe (S&D) 89C Machynlleth  
17/11/1962 Reallocation 75024 84E Tyseley 89C Machynlleth  
17/11/1962 Reallocation 75027 82G Templecombe (S&D) 89C Machynlleth  
17/11/1962 Reallocation 75029 84E Tyseley 89C Machynlleth  
17/11/1962 Reallocation 75071 71G Bath Green Park (S&D) 82G Templecombe (S&D)  
17/11/1962 Reallocation 75073 71G Bath Green Park (S&D) 82G Templecombe (S&D)  
17/12/1962 Reallocation 75065 71A Eastleigh 70D Basingstoke  
17/12/1962 Reallocation 75066 71A Eastleigh 70D Basingstoke  
17/12/1962 Reallocation 75067 71A Eastleigh 75A Brighton  
17/12/1962 Reallocation 75068 71A Eastleigh 75A Brighton  
22/12/1962 Reallocation 75034 6G Llandudno Junction 21D Aston  
22/12/1962 Reallocation 75037 1E Bletchley 21D Aston  
22/12/1962 Reallocation 75053 1E Bletchley 21D Aston  
29/12/1962 Reallocation 75031 1A Willesden 21D Aston  
19/01/1963 Reallocation 75030 1A Willesden 2B Nuneaton  
19/01/1963 Reallocation 75052 1A Willesden 2B Nuneaton  
09/03/1963 Reallocation 75006 89C Machynlleth 89B Croes Newydd  
09/03/1963 Reallocation 75009 89C Machynlleth 89B Croes Newydd  
09/03/1963 Reallocation 75010 6G Llandudno Junction 6A Chester (MR)  
09/03/1963 Reallocation 75012 6G Llandudno Junction 6A Chester (MR)  
09/03/1963 Reallocation 75020 89C Machynlleth 89B Croes Newydd  
09/03/1963 Reallocation 75021 89C Machynlleth 89B Croes Newydd  
09/03/1963 Reallocation 75023 89C Machynlleth 89B Croes Newydd  
09/03/1963 Reallocation 75024 89C Machynlleth 89B Croes Newydd  
09/03/1963 Reallocation 75026 89C Machynlleth 89B Croes Newydd  
09/03/1963 Reallocation 75027 89C Machynlleth 89B Croes Newydd  
09/03/1963 Reallocation 75029 89C Machynlleth 89B Croes Newydd  
01/04/1963 Reallocation 75065 70D Basingstoke 71A Eastleigh  
01/04/1963 Reallocation 75066 70D Basingstoke 71A Eastleigh  
01/04/1963 Reallocation 75076 70D Basingstoke 70A Nine Elms  
01/04/1963 Reallocation 75077 70D Basingstoke 70A Nine Elms  
01/04/1963 Reallocation 75078 70D Basingstoke 70A Nine Elms  
01/04/1963 Reallocation 75079 70D Basingstoke 71A Eastleigh  
06/04/1963 Reallocation 75001 81F Oxford 82E Bristol Barrow Road  
06/04/1963 Reallocation 75007 81F Oxford 82G Templecombe (S&D)  
19/04/1963 Reallocation 75067 75A Brighton 75D Stewarts Lane  
19/04/1963 Reallocation 75068 75A Brighton 75D Stewarts Lane  
19/05/1963 Reallocation 75033 2B Nuneaton 27C Southport  
25/05/1963 Reallocation 75011 6G Llandudno Junction 17A Derby  
25/05/1963 Reallocation 75016 27C Southport 2B Nuneaton  
25/05/1963 Reallocation 75018 27C Southport 2B Nuneaton  
25/05/1963 Reallocation 75032 6G Llandudno Junction 27C Southport  
25/05/1963 Reallocation 75039 1E Bletchley 17A Derby  
25/05/1963 Reallocation 75045 27A Bank Hall 2B Nuneaton  
25/05/1963 Reallocation 75050 6G Llandudno Junction 27A Bank Hall  
25/05/1963 Reallocation 75051 1E Bletchley 17A Derby  
25/05/1963 Reallocation 75055 17A Derby 1E Bletchley  
25/05/1963 Reallocation 75056 17A Derby 1E Bletchley  
25/05/1963 Reallocation 75063 17A Derby 2B Nuneaton  
22/06/1963 Reallocation 75018 2B Nuneaton 6H Bangor  
22/06/1963 Reallocation 75036 6G Llandudno Junction 6H Bangor  
29/06/1963 Reallocation 75035 6G Llandudno Junction 6H Bangor  
29/06/1963 Reallocation 75036 6H Bangor 2B Nuneaton  
20/07/1963 Reallocation 75032 27C Southport 27A Bank Hall  
20/07/1963 Reallocation 75033 27C Southport 27A Bank Hall  
22/07/1963 Reallocation 75074 73A Stewarts Lane 75C Norwood Junction  
22/07/1963 Reallocation 75075 75D Stewarts Lane 75C Norwood Junction  
19/08/1963 Reallocation 75069 73A Stewarts Lane 70A Nine Elms  
19/08/1963 Reallocation 75070 75D Stewarts Lane 70A Nine Elms  
08/09/1963 Reallocation 75000 84D Leamington 83E Yeovil Town  
16/09/1963 Reallocation 75067 75D Stewarts Lane 75C Norwood Junction  
16/09/1963 Reallocation 75068 75D Stewarts Lane 75C Norwood Junction  
21/09/1963 Reallocation 75014 1E Bletchley 5D Stoke  
21/09/1963 Reallocation 75018 6H Bangor 5D Stoke  
21/09/1963 Reallocation 75030 2B Nuneaton 5D Stoke  
21/09/1963 Reallocation 75031 21D Aston 5D Stoke  
21/09/1963 Reallocation 75034 21D Aston 5D Stoke  
21/09/1963 Reallocation 75036 2B Nuneaton 5D Stoke  
21/09/1963 Reallocation 75037 21D Aston 5D Stoke  
21/09/1963 Reallocation 75053 21D Aston 5D Stoke  
21/09/1963 Reallocation 75056 1E Bletchley 5D Stoke  
28/09/1963 Reallocation 75001 82E Bristol Barrow Road 83E Yeovil Town  
05/10/1963 Reallocation 75040 17A Derby 5D Stoke  
05/10/1963 Reallocation 75062 17A Derby 5D Stoke  
06/10/1963 Reallocation 75003 84E Tyseley 83E Yeovil Town  
23/11/1963 Reallocation 75011 17A Derby 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)  
23/11/1963 Reallocation 75039 17A Derby 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)  
23/11/1963 Reallocation 75041 17A Derby 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)  
23/11/1963 Reallocation 75042 17A Derby 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)  
23/11/1963 Reallocation 75043 17A Derby 8R Walton on the Hill  
23/11/1963 Reallocation 75044 17A Derby 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)  
23/11/1963 Reallocation 75051 17A Derby 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)  
23/11/1963 Reallocation 75057 17A Derby 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)  
23/11/1963 Reallocation 75059 17A Derby 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)  
23/11/1963 Reallocation 75060 17A Derby 8R Walton on the Hill  
23/11/1963 Reallocation 75061 17A Derby 8R Walton on the Hill  
23/11/1963 Reallocation 75064 17A Derby 8R Walton on the Hill  
14/12/1963 Reallocation 75015 27C Southport 8L Aintree  
14/12/1963 Reallocation 75017 27C Southport 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)  
14/12/1963 Reallocation 75019 27C Southport 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)  
14/12/1963 Reallocation 75043 8R Walton on the Hill 8L Aintree  
14/12/1963 Reallocation 75060 8R Walton on the Hill 8L Aintree  
14/12/1963 Reallocation 75061 8R Walton on the Hill 8L Aintree  
14/12/1963 Reallocation 75064 8R Walton on the Hill 8L Aintree  
06/01/1964 Reallocation 75067 75C Norwood Junction 70D Eastleigh  
06/01/1964 Reallocation 75068 75C Norwood Junction 70D Eastleigh  
06/01/1964 Reallocation 75074 75C Norwood Junction 70D Eastleigh  
06/01/1964 Reallocation 75075 75C Norwood Junction 70D Eastleigh  
25/01/1964 Reallocation 75005 85A Worcester 85B Gloucester Horton Road  
25/01/1964 Reallocation 75025 85A Worcester 85B Gloucester Horton Road  
25/01/1964 Reallocation 75058 17A Derby 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)  
13/04/1964 Reallocation 75005 85B Gloucester Horton Road 83D Exmouth Junction  
13/04/1964 Reallocation 75025 85B Gloucester Horton Road 83D Exmouth Junction  
25/04/1964 Reallocation 75015 8L Aintree 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)  
04/05/1964 Reallocation 75022 81F Oxford 83D Exmouth Junction  
20/06/1964 Reallocation 75014 5D Stoke 2A Tyseley  
12/07/1964 Reallocation 75071 82G Templecombe (S&D) 6C Croes Newydd  
20/07/1964 Reallocation 75008 81F Oxford 83G Templecombe (S&D)  
14/09/1964 Reallocation 75074 70D Eastleigh 70A Nine Elms  
19/09/1964 Reallocation 75014 2A Tyseley 6D Shrewsbury  
19/09/1964 Reallocation 75053 5D Stoke 6D Shrewsbury  
19/09/1964 Reallocation 75055 1E Bletchley 6D Shrewsbury  
19/09/1964 Reallocation 75063 2B Nuneaton 6D Shrewsbury  
04/10/1964 Condemned 75067 70D Eastleigh   COND  
10/10/1964 Reallocation 75038 1E Bletchley 6D Shrewsbury  
10/10/1964 Reallocation 75055 6D Shrewsbury 1E Bletchley  
12/10/1964 Reallocation 75007 82G Templecombe (S&D) 83E Yeovil Town  
12/10/1964 Reallocation 75008 83G Templecombe (S&D) 83D Exmouth Junction  
28/11/1964 Reallocation 75006 89B Croes Newydd 5D Stoke  
14/12/1964 Condemned 75001 98W     COND  
16/01/1965 Reallocation 75020 89B Croes Newydd 5D Stoke  
16/01/1965 Reallocation 75023 89B Croes Newydd 5D Stoke  
16/01/1965 Reallocation 75054 1E Bletchley 5D Stoke  
06/02/1965 Reallocation 75026 89B Croes Newydd 8K Bank Hall  
06/02/1965 Reallocation 75027 89B Croes Newydd 8K Bank Hall  
21/02/1965 Reallocation 75022 83D Exmouth Junction 82E Bristol Barrow Road  
06/03/1965 Reallocation 75051 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 10G Skipton  
06/03/1965 Reallocation 75057 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 10G Skipton  
06/03/1965 Reallocation 75058 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 10G Skipton  
06/03/1965 Reallocation 75059 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 10G Skipton  
07/03/1965 Reallocation 75022 82E Bristol Barrow Road 83D Exmouth Junction  
20/03/1965 Reallocation 75011 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 10G Skipton  
20/03/1965 Reallocation 75015 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 10G Skipton  
20/03/1965 Reallocation 75017 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 10G Skipton  
20/03/1965 Reallocation 75019 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 10G Skipton  
20/03/1965 Reallocation 75039 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 10G Skipton  
20/03/1965 Reallocation 75041 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 10G Skipton  
20/03/1965 Reallocation 75042 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 10G Skipton  
20/03/1965 Reallocation 75044 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 10G Skipton  
21/04/1965 Condemned 75007 98W     COND  
16/05/1965 Reallocation 75005 83D Exmouth Junction 83E Yeovil Town  
08/06/1965 Reallocation 75069 70A Nine Elms 70D Eastleigh  
08/06/1965 Reallocation 75070 70A Nine Elms 70D Eastleigh  
08/06/1965 Reallocation 75074 70A Nine Elms 70D Eastleigh  
08/06/1965 Reallocation 75076 70A Nine Elms 70D Eastleigh  
08/06/1965 Reallocation 75077 70A Nine Elms 70D Eastleigh  
08/06/1965 Reallocation 75078 70A Nine Elms 70D Eastleigh  
13/06/1965 Reallocation 75008 83D Exmouth Junction 85A Worcester  
13/06/1965 Reallocation 75022 83D Exmouth Junction 85A Worcester  
13/06/1965 Reallocation 75025 83D Exmouth Junction 85A Worcester  
19/06/1965 Reallocation 75013 1E Bletchley 6F Machynlleth  
19/06/1965 Reallocation 75016 2B Nuneaton 6D Shrewsbury  
19/06/1965 Reallocation 75024 89B Croes Newydd 6J Holyhead  
19/06/1965 Reallocation 75028 1E Bletchley 6F Machynlleth  
19/06/1965 Reallocation 75029 89B Croes Newydd 6G Llandudno Junction  
19/06/1965 Reallocation 75052 2B Nuneaton 6J Holyhead  
19/06/1965 Reallocation 75055 1E Bletchley 6F Machynlleth  
26/06/1965 Reallocation 75060 8L Aintree 8A Edge Hill  
11/07/1965 Reallocation 75000 83E Yeovil Town 85A Worcester  
11/07/1965 Reallocation 75003 83E Yeovil Town 85A Worcester  
11/07/1965 Reallocation 75005 83E Yeovil Town 85A Worcester  
17/07/1965 Reallocation 75006 5D Stoke 2A Tyseley  
01/10/1965 Condemned 75003 85A Worcester   COND  
06/11/1965 Reallocation 75006 2A Tyseley 6D Shrewsbury  
18/11/1965 Condemned 75005 85A Worcester   COND  
11/12/1965 Condemned 75028 6F Machynlleth   COND  
25/12/1965 Condemned 75038 6D Shrewsbury   COND  
31/12/1965 Condemned 75000 98W     COND  
31/12/1965 Condemned 75008 98W     COND  
31/12/1965 Condemned 75022 98W     COND  
31/12/1965 Condemned 75025 98W     COND  
31/12/1965 Condemned 75072 98W     COND  
31/12/1965 Condemned 75073 98W     COND  
03/01/1966 Reallocation 75020 5D Stoke 6D Shrewsbury  
08/01/1966 Reallocation 75012 6A Chester (MR) 6F Machynlleth  
15/01/1966 Condemned 75023 5D Stoke   COND  
29/01/1966 Reallocation 75004 89C Machynlleth 6D Shrewsbury  
02/1966 Condemned 75066 71A Eastleigh   COND  
05/02/1966 Reallocation 75032 27A Bank Hall 5D Stoke  
05/02/1966 Reallocation 75047 27A Bank Hall 5D Stoke  
05/02/1966 Reallocation 75050 27A Bank Hall 5D Stoke  
07/02/1966 Reallocation 75033 98S   27A Bank Hall  
12/02/1966 Condemned 75031 5D Stoke   COND  
12/02/1966 Condemned 75057 10G Skipton   COND  
19/02/1966 Reallocation 75009 89B Croes Newydd 6G Llandudno Junction  
05/03/1966 Reallocation 75010 6A Chester (MR) 6C Croes Newydd  
05/03/1966 Reallocation 75012 6F Machynlleth 6C Croes Newydd  
05/03/1966 Reallocation 75047 5D Stoke 6C Croes Newydd  
12/03/1966 Condemned 75044 10G Skipton   COND  
12/03/1966 Reallocation 75050 5D Stoke 5E Nuneaton  
19/03/1966 Reallocation 75012 6C Croes Newydd 6D Shrewsbury  
19/03/1966 Reallocation 75021 89B Croes Newydd 6D Shrewsbury  
30/03/1966 Reallocation 75033 98S   27A Bank Hall  
02/04/1966 Reallocation 75060 8A Edge Hill 9F Heaton Mersey  
04/04/1966 Reallocation 75033 27A Bank Hall 9F Heaton Mersey  
16/04/1966 Reallocation 75046 27A Bank Hall 9F Heaton Mersey  
23/04/1966 Condemned 75045 2B Nuneaton   COND  
24/04/1966 Reallocation 75033 9F Heaton Mersey 6A Chester (MR)  
30/04/1966 Reallocation 75018 5D Stoke 5E Nuneaton  
30/04/1966 Reallocation 75046 9F Heaton Mersey 6A Chester (MR)  
30/04/1966 Reallocation 75048 27A Bank Hall 6A Chester (MR)  
30/04/1966 Reallocation 75060 9F Heaton Mersey 6A Chester (MR)  
21/05/1966 Reallocation 75033 6A Chester (MR) 6C Croes Newydd  
21/05/1966 Reallocation 75046 6A Chester (MR) 6C Croes Newydd  
21/05/1966 Reallocation 75048 6A Chester (MR) 6C Croes Newydd  
21/05/1966 Reallocation 75060 6A Chester (MR) 6C Croes Newydd  
28/05/1966 Condemned 75063 6D Shrewsbury   COND  
04/06/1966 Reallocation 75018 5E Nuneaton 5D Stoke  
04/06/1966 Reallocation 75035 6H Bangor 5D Stoke  
04/06/1966 Reallocation 75050 5E Nuneaton 5D Stoke  
11/06/1966 Condemned 75036 5D Stoke   COND  
11/06/1966 Condemned 75056 5D Stoke   COND  
10/07/1966 Condemned 75078 70D Eastleigh   COND  
16/07/1966 Reallocation 75009 6G Llandudno Junction 6F Machynlleth  
16/07/1966 Reallocation 75012 6D Shrewsbury 6D Shrewsbury  
16/07/1966 Reallocation 75021 6D Shrewsbury 6C Croes Newydd  
16/07/1966 Reallocation 75024 6J Holyhead 6F Machynlleth  
16/07/1966 Reallocation 75047 6C Croes Newydd 6F Machynlleth  
16/07/1966 Reallocation 75052 6J Holyhead 6F Machynlleth  
27/08/1966 Condemned 75054 5D Stoke   COND  
03/09/1966 Reallocation 75029 6G Llandudno Junction 6D Shrewsbury  
04/09/1966 Condemned 75065 71A Eastleigh   COND  
10/09/1966 Condemned 75053 6D Shrewsbury   COND  
11/09/1966 Condemned 75070 70D Eastleigh   COND  
25/09/1966 Condemned 75069 70D Eastleigh   COND  
08/10/1966 Condemned 75049 27A Bank Hall   COND  
22/10/1966 Reallocation 75026 8K Bank Hall 8L Aintree  
22/10/1966 Reallocation 75027 8K Bank Hall 8L Aintree  
29/10/1966 Condemned 75051 10G Skipton   COND  
05/11/1966 Condemned 75011 10G Skipton   COND  
12/11/1966 Reallocation 75027 8L Aintree 10G Skipton  
19/11/1966 Reallocation 75026 8L Aintree 10G Skipton  
20/11/1966 Condemned 75079 71A Eastleigh   COND  
26/11/1966 Condemned 75050 5D Stoke   COND  
10/12/1966 Reallocation 75002 89C Machynlleth 6C Croes Newydd  
10/12/1966 Reallocation 75009 6F Machynlleth 6D Shrewsbury  
10/12/1966 Reallocation 75013 6F Machynlleth 6D Shrewsbury  
10/12/1966 Reallocation 75024 6F Machynlleth 5D Stoke  
10/12/1966 Reallocation 75047 6F Machynlleth 6C Croes Newydd  
10/12/1966 Reallocation 75052 6F Machynlleth 6C Croes Newydd  
10/12/1966 Reallocation 75055 6F Machynlleth 6D Shrewsbury  
31/12/1966 Condemned 75014 6D Shrewsbury   COND  
07/01/1967 Condemned 75017 10G Skipton   COND  
21/01/1967 Reallocation 75019 10G Skipton 10A Carnforth  
21/01/1967 Reallocation 75027 10G Skipton 10A Carnforth  
21/01/1967 Reallocation 75033 6C Croes Newydd 6D Shrewsbury  
21/01/1967 Reallocation 75039 10G Skipton 10A Carnforth  
21/01/1967 Reallocation 75047 6C Croes Newydd 6D Shrewsbury  
28/01/1967 Condemned 75012 6D Shrewsbury   COND  
04/02/1967 Condemned 75061 8L Aintree   COND  
11/02/1967 Reallocation 75015 10G Skipton 10A Carnforth  
11/03/1967 Condemned 75004 6D Shrewsbury   COND  
11/03/1967 Reallocation 75006 6D Shrewsbury 6C Croes Newydd  
11/03/1967 Reallocation 75009 6D Shrewsbury 6C Croes Newydd  
11/03/1967 Reallocation 75013 6D Shrewsbury 6C Croes Newydd  
11/03/1967 Reallocation 75016 6D Shrewsbury 6C Croes Newydd  
11/03/1967 Reallocation 75020 6D Shrewsbury 8L Aintree  
11/03/1967 Reallocation 75029 6D Shrewsbury 6C Croes Newydd  
11/03/1967 Reallocation 75033 6D Shrewsbury 6C Croes Newydd  
11/03/1967 Reallocation 75047 6D Shrewsbury 6C Croes Newydd  
11/03/1967 Reallocation 75055 6D Shrewsbury 6C Croes Newydd  
08/04/1967 Reallocation 75026 10G Skipton 10A Carnforth  
08/04/1967 Reallocation 75041 10G Skipton 10A Carnforth  
08/04/1967 Reallocation 75042 10G Skipton 10A Carnforth  
08/04/1967 Reallocation 75058 10G Skipton 10A Carnforth  
08/04/1967 Reallocation 75059 10G Skipton 10A Carnforth  
22/04/1967 Reallocation 75019 10A Carnforth 12E Tebay  
22/04/1967 Reallocation 75026 10A Carnforth 12E Tebay  
22/04/1967 Reallocation 75027 10A Carnforth 12E Tebay  
22/04/1967 Reallocation 75039 10A Carnforth 12E Tebay  
22/04/1967 Condemned 75060 6C Croes Newydd   COND  
29/04/1967 Reallocation 75021 6C Croes Newydd 10A Carnforth  
29/04/1967 Reallocation 75033 6C Croes Newydd 10A Carnforth  
13/05/1967 Reallocation 75009 6C Croes Newydd 10D Lostock Hall  
13/05/1967 Reallocation 75010 6C Croes Newydd 10D Lostock Hall  
13/05/1967 Reallocation 75013 6C Croes Newydd 5D Stoke  
13/05/1967 Reallocation 75024 5D Stoke 12E Tebay  
13/05/1967 Reallocation 75032 5D Stoke 12E Tebay  
13/05/1967 Reallocation 75037 5D Stoke 12E Tebay  
13/05/1967 Reallocation 75046 6C Croes Newydd 5D Stoke  
13/05/1967 Reallocation 75055 6C Croes Newydd 5D Stoke  
13/05/1967 Reallocation 75062 5D Stoke 10D Lostock Hall  
20/05/1967 Condemned 75064 8L Aintree   COND  
27/05/1967 Reallocation 75035 5D Stoke 12E Tebay  
27/05/1967 Reallocation 75048 6C Croes Newydd 10D Lostock Hall  
27/05/1967 Condemned 75055 5D Stoke   COND  
03/06/1967 Reallocation 75002 6C Croes Newydd 5D Stoke  
10/06/1967 Reallocation 75006 6C Croes Newydd 5D Stoke  
10/06/1967 Reallocation 75029 6C Croes Newydd 5D Stoke  
10/06/1967 Reallocation 75047 6C Croes Newydd 5D Stoke  
10/06/1967 Reallocation 75052 6C Croes Newydd 5D Stoke  
10/06/1967 Reallocation 75071 6C Croes Newydd 5D Stoke  
17/06/1967 Condemned 75018 5D Stoke   COND  
17/06/1967 Reallocation 75020 8L Aintree 10A Carnforth  
17/06/1967 Reallocation 75043 8L Aintree 10A Carnforth  
24/06/1967 Reallocation 75009 10D Lostock Hall 10A Carnforth  
24/06/1967 Reallocation 75010 10D Lostock Hall 10A Carnforth  
24/06/1967 Reallocation 75016 6C Croes Newydd 16B Colwick  
24/06/1967 Reallocation 75034 5D Stoke 10A Carnforth  
24/06/1967 Reallocation 75040 5D Stoke 10A Carnforth  
24/06/1967 Reallocation 75048 10D Lostock Hall 10A Carnforth  
24/06/1967 Reallocation 75062 10D Lostock Hall 10A Carnforth  
02/07/1967 Condemned 75068 70D Eastleigh   COND  
08/07/1967 Condemned 75016 16B Colwick   COND  
09/07/1967 Condemned 75074 70D Eastleigh   COND  
09/07/1967 Condemned 75075 70D Eastleigh   COND  
09/07/1967 Condemned 75076 70D Eastleigh   COND  
09/07/1967 Condemned 75077 70D Eastleigh   COND  
22/07/1967 Condemned 75035 12E Tebay   COND  
22/07/1967 Condemned 75059 10A Carnforth   COND  
12/08/1967 Condemned 75002 5D Stoke   COND  
12/08/1967 Condemned 75006 5D Stoke   COND  
12/08/1967 Condemned 75013 5D Stoke   COND  
12/08/1967 Condemned 75029 5D Stoke   COND  
12/08/1967 Condemned 75046 5D Stoke   COND  
12/08/1967 Condemned 75047 5D Stoke   COND  
12/08/1967 Condemned 75052 5D Stoke   COND  
12/08/1967 Condemned 75071 5D Stoke   COND  
23/09/1967 Condemned 75039 12E Tebay   COND  
14/10/1967 Condemned 75010 10A Carnforth   COND  
21/10/1967 Condemned 75040 10A Carnforth   COND  
04/11/1967 Condemned 75042 10A Carnforth   COND  
11/11/1967 Condemned 75024 12E Tebay   COND  
30/12/1967 Condemned 75015 10A Carnforth   COND  
30/12/1967 Condemned 75026 12E Tebay   COND  
30/12/1967 Condemned 75030 5D Stoke   COND  
30/12/1967 Condemned 75033 10A Carnforth   COND  
30/12/1967 Condemned 75037 12E Tebay   COND  
30/12/1967 Condemned 75043 10A Carnforth   COND  
30/12/1967 Condemned 75058 10A Carnforth   COND  
06/01/1968 Reallocation 75019 12E Tebay 10A Carnforth  
06/01/1968 Reallocation 75027 12E Tebay 10A Carnforth  
06/01/1968 Reallocation 75032 12E Tebay 10A Carnforth  
27/01/1968 Condemned 75041 10A Carnforth   COND  
10/02/1968 Condemned 75021 10A Carnforth   COND  
10/02/1968 Condemned 75034 10A Carnforth   COND  
10/02/1968 Condemned 75062 10A Carnforth   COND  
17/02/1968 Condemned 75032 10A Carnforth   COND  
03/08/1968 Condemned 75009 10A Carnforth   COND  
03/08/1968 Condemned 75019 10A Carnforth   COND  
03/08/1968 Condemned 75020 10A Carnforth   COND  
03/08/1968 Condemned 75027 10A Carnforth   COND  
03/08/1968 Condemned 75048 10A Carnforth   COND