BR Standard Riddles "Std 5MT" Class 4-6-0
Class | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BR5 | 73000 | 12/04/1951 | 17A 17A 17A 19B 17A 16A 41B 41D 17A 2F 2B 6D 9J 9H W |
Derby Derby Derby Sheffield Millhouses Derby Nottingham Sheffield Grimesthorpe Canklow Derby Woodford Halse Oxley Shrewsbury Agecroft Patricroft Withdrawn |
04/1951 26/05/1951 22/03/1952 24/01/1953 21/03/1953 03/10/1953 10/05/1958 07/01/1961 06/01/1962 22/09/1962 16/01/1965 03/04/1965 30/04/1966 22/10/1966 30/03/1968 |
30/03/1968 |
BR5 | 73001 | 09/05/1951 | 17A 84G 82C 82E 85B 82F W |
Derby Shrewsbury Swindon Bristol Barrow Road Gloucester Horton Road Bath Green Park (S&D) Withdrawn |
05/1951 24/03/1956 01/12/1956 25/01/1964 07/02/1965 07/03/1965 12/1965 |
31/12/1965 |
BR5 | 73002 | 18/05/1951 | 17A 17A 16A 41D 41C 41D 71A 71G W |
Derby Derby Nottingham Canklow Sheffield Millhouses Canklow Eastleigh Weymouth Radipole (GWR) Withdrawn |
05/1951 26/01/1952 03/10/1953 10/05/1958 09/01/1960 29/04/1961 08/12/1962 16/09/1963 19/03/1967 |
19/03/1967 |
BR5 | 73003 | 05/1951 | 15C 22A 89A 83E 82E 81F W |
Leicester Midland Bristol Barrow Road Shrewsbury Yeovil Town Bristol Barrow Road Oxford Withdrawn |
05/1951 25/01/1958 30/03/1963 08/09/1963 28/09/1963 11/07/1965 12/1965 |
31/12/1965 |
BR5 | 73004 | 08/06/1951 | 15C 17A 15C 17E 15C 41C 6A 1A 1E 5E 6C 9K W |
Leicester Midland Derby Leicester Midland Heaton Mersey Leicester Midland Sheffield Millhouses Chester (MR) Willesden Bletchley Nuneaton Croes Newydd Bolton Withdrawn |
06/1951 29/12/1951 26/01/1952 26/01/1957 23/03/1957 10/05/1958 06/02/1960 14/05/1960 07/03/1964 09/01/1965 19/06/1965 30/04/1966 28/10/1967 |
28/10/1967 |
BR5 | 73005 | 20/06/1951 | 63A 67A W |
Perth South Corkerhill Withdrawn |
06/1951 19/01/1963 26/06/1966 |
26/06/1966 |
BR5 | 73006 | 28/06/1951 | 63A 67A 9H W |
Perth South Corkerhill Patricroft Withdrawn |
06/1951 19/01/1963 18/07/1964 11/03/1967 |
11/03/1967 |
BR5 | 73007 | 09/07/1951 | 63A 65F 65J W |
Perth South Grangemouth Stirling Withdrawn |
07/1951 25/07/1964 30/10/1965 03/03/1966 |
03/03/1966 |
BR5 | 73008 | 13/07/1951 | 63A RTS RTS 63A 61B W |
Perth South Rugby Testing Station (on loan) Rugby Testing Station (on loan) Perth South Aberdeen Ferryhill Withdrawn |
07/1951 11/08/1951 08/09/1951 19/04/1952 22/08/1964 20/09/1965 |
20/09/1965 |
BR5 | 73009 | 19/07/1951 | 63A 67A W |
Perth South Corkerhill Withdrawn |
07/1951 19/01/1963 14/07/1966 |
14/07/1966 |
BR5 | 73010 | 14/08/1951 | 20A 15E 14D 2F 2B 9H W |
Holbeck (MR) Leicester (G.C.) Neasden Woodford Halse Oxley Patricroft Withdrawn |
08/1951 12/09/1959 18/06/1960 30/06/1962 16/01/1965 03/04/1965 22/06/1968 |
22/06/1968 |
BR5 | 73011 | 17/08/1951 | 20A 19B 6J 6G 1G 2B 9H W |
Holbeck (MR) Sheffield Millhouses Holyhead Llandudno Junction Woodford Halse Oxley Patricroft Withdrawn |
08/1951 03/10/1953 06/02/1960 09/02/1963 02/11/1963 16/01/1965 03/04/1965 11/11/1967 |
11/11/1967 |
BR5 | 73012 | 24/08/1951 | 20A 84G 82C 87F 82E W |
Holbeck (MR) Shrewsbury Swindon Llanelli Bristol Barrow Road Withdrawn |
08/1951 03/10/1953 01/12/1956 25/01/1964 22/06/1964 09/11/1964 |
06/11/1964 |
BR5 | 73013 | 31/08/1951 | 19B 84G 84K 6A 1A 1E 2B 2D 9K W |
Sheffield Millhouses Shrewsbury Chester West Chester (MR) Willesden Bletchley Oxley Banbury Bolton Withdrawn |
08/1951 03/10/1953 16/07/1955 26/09/1959 14/05/1960 07/03/1964 16/01/1965 19/06/1965 30/04/1966 07/05/1966 |
07/05/1966 |
BR5 | 73014 | 06/09/1951 | 19B 84G 86C 6E 6E 6A 1A 1E 2B 2D 9K W |
Sheffield Millhouses Shrewsbury Cardiff Canton Chester West Chester West Chester (MR) Willesden Bletchley Oxley Banbury Bolton Withdrawn |
09/1951 03/10/1953 13/08/1955 06/09/1958 04/10/1958 09/04/1960 14/05/1960 07/03/1964 16/01/1965 19/06/1965 30/04/1966 22/07/1967 |
22/07/1967 |
BR5 | 73015 | 12/09/1951 | 19B 84G 17A 22A 82F W |
Sheffield Millhouses Shrewsbury Derby Bristol Barrow Road Bath Green Park (S&D) Withdrawn |
09/1951 03/10/1953 24/03/1956 18/05/1957 11/07/1965 25/08/1965 |
25/08/1965 |
BR5 | 73016 | 21/09/1951 | 19A 19B 17A 19B 41D 71A 70B 70A 70B 70G W |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe Sheffield Millhouses Derby Sheffield Millhouses Canklow Eastleigh Feltham Nine Elms Feltham Weymouth Radipole (GWR) Withdrawn |
09/1951 23/02/1952 24/01/1953 21/03/1953 06/01/1962 08/12/1962 06/01/1964 20/11/1964 25/10/1965 22/11/1965 04/12/1966 |
04/12/1966 |
BR5 | 73017 | 28/09/1951 | 16A 84G 86C 84G 82C 71G W |
Nottingham Shrewsbury Cardiff Canton Shrewsbury Swindon Weymouth Radipole (GWR) Withdrawn |
09/1951 03/10/1953 16/06/1956 14/07/1956 01/12/1956 13/10/1958 04/10/1964 |
04/10/1964 |
BR5 | 73018 | 04/10/1951 | 16A 84G 82C 71G 70C W |
Nottingham Shrewsbury Swindon Weymouth Radipole (GWR) Guildford Withdrawn |
09/1951 03/10/1953 01/12/1956 13/10/1958 17/04/1967 09/07/1967 |
09/07/1967 |
BR5 | 73019 | 10/10/1951 | 82B 82F 82E 82F 85C 85B 2B 9K W |
St Philips Marsh Bath Green Park (S&D) Bristol Barrow Road Bath Green Park (S&D) Gloucester Barnwood Gloucester Horton Road Oxley Bolton Withdrawn |
03/10/1953 14/06/1958 16/07/1960 08/10/1960 21/04/1962 04/05/1964 01/11/1964 30/04/1966 14/01/1967 |
14/01/1967 |
BR5 | 73020 | 16/10/1951 | 1A 6A 84K 84G 82C 71G 70C W |
Willesden Chester (MR) Chester West Shrewsbury Swindon Weymouth Radipole (GWR) Guildford Withdrawn |
06/09/1952 04/10/1952 03/10/1953 09/10/1954 01/12/1956 13/10/1958 17/04/1967 09/07/1967 |
09/07/1967 |
BR5 | 73021 | 22/10/1951 | 84K 86C 84G 87F 82E 85C 85B 81F W |
Chester West Cardiff Canton Shrewsbury Llanelli Bristol Barrow Road Gloucester Barnwood Gloucester Horton Road Oxford Withdrawn |
03/10/1953 11/04/1959 23/04/1960 21/05/1960 14/07/1962 06/10/1962 04/05/1964 11/07/1965 25/08/1965 |
25/08/1965 |
BR5 | 73022 | 26/10/1951 | 82B 87E 82B 82C 71G 70D 70C 70A W |
St Philips Marsh Landore St Philips Marsh Swindon Weymouth Radipole (GWR) Eastleigh Guildford Nine Elms Withdrawn |
03/10/1953 26/12/1953 30/01/1954 17/07/1954 13/10/1958 12/10/1964 08/06/1965 27/06/1966 16/04/1967 |
16/04/1967 |
BR5 | 73023 | 05/11/1951 | 10C 84K 86C 87F 82F 81F W |
Patricroft Chester West Cardiff Canton Llanelli Bath Green Park (S&D) Oxford Withdrawn |
11/1951 03/10/1953 11/04/1959 21/05/1960 22/06/1964 12/10/1964 25/08/1965 |
25/08/1965 |
BR5 | 73024 | 15/11/1951 | 84K 84G 86C 6E 6E 86C 84G 82E 82E 85C 89A 83E 87F 82E 81F W |
Chester West Shrewsbury Cardiff Canton Chester West Chester West Cardiff Canton Shrewsbury Bristol Barrow Road Bristol Barrow Road Gloucester Barnwood Shrewsbury Yeovil Town Llanelli Bristol Barrow Road Oxford Withdrawn |
03/10/1953 09/10/1954 14/07/1956 06/09/1958 04/10/1958 11/04/1959 23/04/1960 14/07/1962 11/08/1962 06/10/1962 18/03/1963 09/09/1963 28/09/1963 22/06/1964 12/10/1964 09/11/1964 |
06/11/1964 |
BR5 | 73025 | 19/11/1951 | 84G 86C 6E 6E 84G 2B 6D 9J 9H W |
Shrewsbury Cardiff Canton Chester West Chester West Shrewsbury Oxley Shrewsbury Agecroft Patricroft Withdrawn |
03/10/1953 17/07/1954 06/09/1958 04/10/1958 11/04/1959 23/01/1965 06/03/1965 30/04/1966 22/10/1966 14/10/1967 |
14/10/1967 |
BR5 | 73026 | 27/11/1951 | 84G 86C 6E 84G 2L 2A 9K W |
Shrewsbury Cardiff Canton Chester West Shrewsbury Leamington Tyseley Bolton Withdrawn |
03/10/1953 17/07/1954 06/09/1958 11/04/1959 24/10/1964 19/06/1965 30/04/1966 01/04/1967 |
01/04/1967 |
BR5 | 73027 | 18/12/1951 | 28A 82B 82C W |
Blackpool Central St Philips Marsh Swindon Withdrawn |
12/1951 03/10/1953 17/07/1954 07/02/1964 |
07/02/1964 |
BR5 | 73028 | 28/12/1951 | 28A 82B 82F 82E 82F 82E 82C 85C 85B 2B 9K W |
Blackpool Central St Philips Marsh Bath Green Park (S&D) Bristol Barrow Road Bath Green Park (S&D) Bristol Barrow Road Swindon Gloucester Barnwood Gloucester Horton Road Oxley Bolton Withdrawn |
12/1951 03/10/1953 14/06/1958 16/07/1960 08/10/1960 20/05/1961 30/11/1963 25/01/1964 04/05/1964 01/11/1964 30/04/1966 10/12/1966 |
10/12/1966 |
BR5 | 73029 | 17/01/1952 | 28A 82B 87G 82B 82C 71G 70D 70C 70A W |
Blackpool Central St Philips Marsh Carmarthen St Philips Marsh Swindon Weymouth Radipole (GWR) Eastleigh Guildford Nine Elms Withdrawn |
06/1953 03/10/1953 26/12/1953 30/01/1954 05/10/1957 13/10/1958 14/09/1964 08/06/1965 27/06/1966 09/07/1967 |
09/07/1967 |
BR5 | 73030 | 20/06/1953 | RTS 17A 15C 10C 83D 82E 82F 82E 81F W |
Rugby Testing Station (on loan) Derby Leicester Midland Patricroft Exmouth Junction Bristol Barrow Road Bath Green Park (S&D) Bristol Barrow Road Oxford Withdrawn |
07/1953 28/11/1953 25/01/1958 17/05/1958 06/10/1963 12/10/1964 21/02/1965 07/03/1965 11/07/1965 25/08/1965 |
25/08/1965 |
BR5 | 73031 | 03/07/1953 | 17A 22A RTS 82F 85C 85B 81F W |
Derby Bristol Barrow Road Rugby Testing Station (on loan) Bath Green Park (S&D) Gloucester Barnwood Gloucester Horton Road Oxford Withdrawn |
07/1953 16/06/1957 25/01/1958 02/12/1961 21/04/1962 04/05/1964 11/07/1965 09/1965 |
10/09/1965 |
BR5 | 73032 | 10/07/1953 | 68A 82B 6C 1A 14D 2F 5E 70D 6C W |
Carlisle Kingmoor St Philips Marsh Birkenhead Mollington Street Willesden Neasden Woodford Halse Nuneaton Eastleigh Croes Newydd Withdrawn |
07/1953 03/10/1953 14/06/1958 21/05/1960 08/10/1960 30/06/1962 18/07/1964 11/04/1965 22/05/1965 07/08/1965 |
07/08/1965 |
BR5 | 73033 | 07/08/1953 | 66A 84G 84B 6E 6A 1A 6A 1A 6A 1A 1E 2B 5E 70D 9H W |
Polmadie Shrewsbury Oxley Chester West Chester (MR) Willesden Chester (MR) Willesden Chester (MR) Willesden Bletchley Oxley Nuneaton Eastleigh Patricroft Withdrawn |
08/1953 03/10/1953 03/11/1956 14/06/1958 26/09/1959 14/05/1960 09/06/1962 16/06/1962 28/07/1962 11/08/1962 07/03/1964 16/01/1965 06/03/1965 11/04/1965 24/07/1965 30/01/1968 |
30/01/1968 |
BR5 | 73034 | 14/08/1953 | 68A 84G 84B 84G 9J 9H W |
Carlisle Kingmoor Shrewsbury Oxley Shrewsbury Agecroft Patricroft Withdrawn |
08/1953 03/10/1953 03/11/1956 14/06/1958 30/04/1966 22/10/1966 16/03/1968 |
16/03/1968 |
BR5 | 73035 | 24/08/1953 | 66A 84G 84B 84G 9H W |
Polmadie Shrewsbury Oxley Shrewsbury Patricroft Withdrawn |
08/1953 03/10/1953 03/11/1956 14/06/1958 24/07/1965 30/01/1968 |
30/01/1968 |
BR5 | 73036 | 01/09/1953 | 68A 84G 84E 84G W |
Carlisle Kingmoor Shrewsbury Tyseley Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
08/1953 03/10/1953 03/11/1956 25/01/1958 25/09/1965 |
25/09/1965 |
BR5 | 73037 | 08/09/1953 | 84G 84E 84G 87F 82E 81F 70D 70C 70A W |
Shrewsbury Tyseley Shrewsbury Llanelli Bristol Barrow Road Oxford Eastleigh Guildford Nine Elms Withdrawn |
03/10/1953 03/11/1956 25/01/1958 21/04/1962 22/06/1964 12/10/1964 28/03/1965 08/06/1965 27/06/1966 09/07/1967 |
09/07/1967 |
BR5 | 73038 | 12/09/1953 | 84K 6A 6G 1A 1E 2B 5E 6D W |
Chester West Chester (MR) Llandudno Junction Willesden Bletchley Oxley Nuneaton Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
03/10/1953 09/04/1960 17/11/1962 02/11/1963 07/03/1964 16/01/1965 06/03/1965 24/07/1965 09/1965 |
09/1965 |
BR5 | 73039 | 25/09/1953 | 82B 6C 1A 1E 5E 9H W |
St Philips Marsh Birkenhead Mollington Street Willesden Bletchley Nuneaton Patricroft Withdrawn |
03/10/1953 14/06/1958 21/05/1960 07/03/1964 09/01/1965 24/07/1965 09/09/1967 |
09/09/1967 |
BR5 | 73040 | 05/10/1953 | 6A 1A 1E 5E 6C 9K 9H W |
Chester (MR) Willesden Bletchley Nuneaton Croes Newydd Bolton Patricroft Withdrawn |
10/1953 02/11/1963 07/03/1964 09/01/1965 24/07/1965 30/04/1966 13/04/1968 11/05/1968 |
11/05/1968 |
BR5 | 73041 | 14/10/1953 | 6A 6J 70A 71G 71A 71G 70D 70C W |
Chester (MR) Holyhead Nine Elms Weymouth Radipole (GWR) Eastleigh Weymouth Radipole (GWR) Eastleigh Guildford Withdrawn |
10/1953 10/08/1957 14/06/1959 26/11/1959 18/03/1961 03/05/1961 14/09/1964 08/06/1965 20/06/1965 |
20/06/1965 |
BR5 | 73042 | 27/10/1953 | 6A 6J 70A 71G 71A 71G W |
Chester (MR) Holyhead Nine Elms Weymouth Radipole (GWR) Eastleigh Weymouth Radipole (GWR) Withdrawn |
10/1953 10/08/1957 14/06/1959 26/11/1959 18/03/1961 03/05/1961 08/08/1965 |
08/08/1965 |
BR5 | 73043 | 30/10/1953 | 10C 41B 41D 71A 70B 70D 70C 70A W |
Patricroft Sheffield Grimesthorpe Canklow Eastleigh Feltham Eastleigh Guildford Nine Elms Withdrawn |
10/1953 10/05/1958 15/04/1961 08/12/1962 06/01/1964 14/09/1964 08/06/1965 27/06/1966 09/07/1967 |
09/07/1967 |
BR5 | 73044 | 09/11/1953 | 10C 83D 81F W |
Patricroft Exmouth Junction Oxford Withdrawn |
11/1953 06/10/1963 10/01/1965 03/1965 |
19/03/1965 |
BR5 | 73045 | 18/11/1953 | 20A 15E 14D 2F 6D 5E 6C 9H W |
Holbeck (MR) Leicester (G.C.) Neasden Woodford Halse Shrewsbury Nuneaton Croes Newydd Patricroft Withdrawn |
11/1953 12/09/1959 18/06/1960 30/06/1962 20/06/1964 19/09/1964 22/05/1965 24/07/1965 26/08/1967 |
26/08/1967 |
BR5 | 73046 | 25/11/1953 | 15C 41C 41D 70A W |
Leicester Midland Sheffield Millhouses Canklow Nine Elms Withdrawn |
11/1953 10/05/1958 29/04/1961 08/12/1962 06/09/1964 |
06/09/1964 |
BR5 | 73047 | 08/12/1953 | 19B 71G 6D W |
Sheffield Millhouses Bath Green Park (S&D) Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
12/1953 12/08/1955 12/07/1964 05/12/1964 |
05/12/1964 |
BR5 | 73048 | 17/12/1953 | 19B 6A 1A 1E 5E 2D 9K W |
Sheffield Millhouses Chester (MR) Willesden Bletchley Nuneaton Banbury Bolton Withdrawn |
12/1953 06/02/1960 02/11/1963 07/03/1964 09/01/1965 19/06/1965 30/04/1966 14/10/1967 |
14/10/1967 |
BR5 | 73049 | 30/12/1953 | 15C 71G 84G 82E 82F 81F W |
Leicester Midland Bath Green Park (S&D) Shrewsbury Bristol Barrow Road Bath Green Park (S&D) Oxford Withdrawn |
12/1953 12/08/1955 23/04/1960 16/06/1962 14/07/1962 12/10/1964 03/1965 |
19/03/1965 |
BR5 | 73050 | 14/04/1954 | 71G 85C 82F 87F 6D 9J 9H W |
Bath Green Park (S&D) Gloucester Barnwood Bath Green Park (S&D) Llanelli Shrewsbury Agecroft Patricroft Withdrawn |
04/1954 11/08/1962 17/11/1962 13/04/1964 25/04/1964 30/04/1966 22/10/1966 29/06/1968 |
29/06/1968 |
BR5 | 73051 | 10/05/1954 | 71G W |
Bath Green Park (S&D) Withdrawn |
05/1954 25/08/1965 |
25/08/1965 |
BR5 | 73052 | 20/05/1954 | 71G W |
Bath Green Park (S&D) Withdrawn |
05/1954 12/1964 |
26/12/1964 |
BR5 | 73053 | 04/06/1954 | 20A 15E 14D 2F 14A 14E 2F 6D 9H W |
Holbeck (MR) Leicester (G.C.) Neasden Woodford Halse Cricklewood East Bedford Woodford Halse Shrewsbury Patricroft Withdrawn |
06/1954 12/09/1959 18/06/1960 30/06/1962 18/05/1963 06/07/1963 03/08/1963 18/07/1964 24/07/1965 09/03/1968 |
09/03/1968 |
BR5 | 73054 | 06/1954 | 20A 17A 22A 82F W |
Holbeck (MR) Derby Bristol Barrow Road Bath Green Park (S&D) Withdrawn |
06/1954 13/08/1955 18/05/1957 22/04/1961 25/08/1965 |
25/08/1965 |
BR5 | 73055 | 23/06/1954 | 66A W |
Polmadie Withdrawn |
07/08/1954 25/05/1966 |
25/05/1966 |
BR5 | 73056 | 02/07/1954 | 66A 61B W |
Polmadie Aberdeen Ferryhill Withdrawn |
07/08/1954 22/08/1964 26/06/1965 |
26/06/1965 |
BR5 | 73057 | 08/07/1954 | 66A 67A W |
Polmadie Corkerhill Withdrawn |
07/08/1954 27/06/1964 29/03/1966 |
29/03/1966 |
BR5 | 73058 | 13/07/1954 | 66A 61B W |
Polmadie Aberdeen Ferryhill Withdrawn |
07/08/1954 22/08/1964 05/11/1964 |
05/11/1964 |
BR5 | 73059 | 13/08/1954 | 66A W |
Polmadie Withdrawn |
31/08/1954 01/05/1967 |
01/05/1967 |
BR5 | 73060 | 26/08/1954 | 66A 66B 66A W |
Polmadie Motherwell Polmadie Withdrawn |
08/1954 29/10/1955 31/08/1957 01/05/1967 |
01/05/1967 |
BR5 | 73061 | 02/09/1954 | 66A 66B 66A W |
Polmadie Motherwell Polmadie Withdrawn |
09/1954 29/10/1955 06/07/1957 26/12/1964 |
26/12/1964 |
BR5 | 73062 | 15/09/1954 | 66A 66B 66A W |
Polmadie Motherwell Polmadie Withdrawn |
10/1954 29/10/1955 06/07/1957 26/06/1965 |
26/06/1965 |
BR5 | 73063 | 29/09/1954 | 66A W |
Polmadie Withdrawn |
10/1954 23/06/1966 |
23/06/1966 |
BR5 | 73064 | 01/10/1954 | 66A W |
Polmadie Withdrawn |
10/1954 01/05/1967 |
01/05/1967 |
BR5 | 73065 | 13/10/1954 | 19B 41D 71A 70B 70A 70C 70A W |
Sheffield Millhouses Canklow Eastleigh Feltham Nine Elms Guildford Nine Elms Withdrawn |
10/1954 06/01/1962 08/12/1962 06/01/1964 20/11/1964 08/06/1965 27/06/1966 09/07/1967 |
09/07/1967 |
BR5 | 73066 | 15/10/1954 | 20A 15E 14D 15E 2F 14A 2L 2A 9K W |
Holbeck (MR) Leicester (G.C.) Neasden Leicester (G.C.) Woodford Halse Cricklewood East Leamington Tyseley Bolton Withdrawn |
10/1954 12/09/1959 18/06/1960 30/06/1962 12/01/1963 18/05/1963 10/10/1964 19/06/1965 30/04/1966 15/04/1967 |
15/04/1967 |
BR5 | 73067 | 10/1954 | 16A 15C 41C 6J 6A 1A 1E 2B 6D 9J 9H W |
Nottingham Leicester Midland Sheffield Millhouses Holyhead Chester (MR) Willesden Bletchley Oxley Shrewsbury Agecroft Patricroft Withdrawn |
10/1954 22/02/1958 10/05/1958 06/02/1960 09/02/1963 02/11/1963 07/03/1964 16/01/1965 03/04/1965 30/04/1966 22/10/1966 30/03/1968 |
30/03/1968 |
BR5 | 73068 | 10/1954 | 17A 22A 85C 82F 85B 82F W |
Derby Bristol Barrow Road Gloucester Barnwood Bath Green Park (S&D) Gloucester Horton Road Bath Green Park (S&D) Withdrawn |
10/1954 18/05/1957 06/10/1962 04/05/1964 10/01/1965 11/04/1965 12/1965 |
31/12/1965 |
BR5 | 73069 | 06/11/1954 | 17A 20A 15E 14D 15E 2F 14A 2L 2A 9K 9H 10A W |
Derby Holbeck (MR) Leicester (G.C.) Neasden Leicester (G.C.) Woodford Halse Cricklewood East Leamington Tyseley Bolton Patricroft Carnforth Withdrawn |
06/11/1954 13/08/1955 12/09/1959 18/06/1960 30/06/1962 16/02/1963 18/05/1963 10/10/1964 19/06/1965 30/04/1966 13/04/1968 06/07/1968 10/08/1968 |
10/08/1968 |
BR5 | 73070 | 13/11/1954 | 6A 1A 1E 6D 9K W |
Chester (MR) Willesden Bletchley Shrewsbury Bolton Withdrawn |
13/11/1954 02/11/1963 07/03/1964 20/06/1964 30/04/1966 29/04/1967 |
29/04/1967 |
BR5 | 73071 | 20/11/1954 | 6A 34A 6A 14A 14E 2F 2B 6D 9H W |
Chester (MR) Kings Cross Chester (MR) Cricklewood East Bedford Woodford Halse Oxley Shrewsbury Patricroft Withdrawn |
20/11/1954 18/02/1956 18/05/1957 25/05/1963 06/07/1963 03/08/1963 16/01/1965 03/04/1965 24/07/1965 16/09/1967 |
16/09/1967 |
BR5 | 73072 | 11/12/1954 | 6A 66A W |
Chester (MR) Polmadie Withdrawn |
11/12/1954 22/11/1958 27/10/1966 |
27/10/1966 |
BR5 | 73073 | 18/12/1954 | 10C 71G 15C 41C 6J 6G 1G 5E 9H W |
Patricroft Bath Green Park (S&D) Leicester Midland Sheffield Millhouses Holyhead Llandudno Junction Woodford Halse Nuneaton Patricroft Withdrawn |
18/12/1954 20/04/1955 13/08/1955 10/05/1958 06/02/1960 09/02/1963 02/11/1963 18/07/1964 24/07/1965 04/11/1967 |
04/11/1967 |
BR5 | 73074 | 25/12/1954 | 10C 71G 19B 20A 19B 41B 41D 70A W |
Patricroft Bath Green Park (S&D) Sheffield Millhouses Holbeck (MR) Sheffield Millhouses Sheffield Grimesthorpe Canklow Nine Elms Withdrawn |
25/12/1954 20/04/1955 13/08/1955 25/02/1956 24/03/1956 10/01/1959 15/04/1961 08/12/1962 06/09/1964 |
06/09/1964 |
BR5 | 73075 | 22/04/1955 | 66A W |
Polmadie Withdrawn |
22/04/1955 16/12/1965 |
16/12/1965 |
BR5 | 73076 | 29/04/1955 | 66A W |
Polmadie Withdrawn |
29/04/1955 13/07/1964 |
13/07/1964 |
BR5 | 73077 | 13/05/1955 | 65A 67A W |
Eastfield Corkerhill Withdrawn |
13/05/1955 19/01/1963 02/01/1965 |
02/01/1965 |
BR5 | 73078 | 21/05/1955 | 65A 66E W |
Eastfield Carstairs Withdrawn |
21/05/1955 29/01/1966 14/07/1966 |
14/07/1966 |
BR5 | 73079 | 31/05/1955 | 67A 66A W |
Corkerhill Polmadie Withdrawn |
31/05/1955 29/04/1967 01/05/1967 |
01/05/1967 |
BR5 | 73080 | 06/1955 | 75C 70A 71G 71A 71G W |
Norwood Junction Nine Elms Weymouth Radipole (GWR) Eastleigh Weymouth Radipole (GWR) Withdrawn |
06/1955 14/06/1959 26/11/1959 18/03/1961 03/05/1961 25/12/1966 |
25/12/1966 |
BR5 | 73081 | 17/06/1955 | 73A 70A 70C W |
Stewarts Lane Nine Elms Guildford Withdrawn |
06/1955 14/06/1959 08/06/1965 31/07/1966 |
31/07/1966 |
BR5 | 73082 | 24/06/1955 | 73A 70A 70C W |
Stewarts Lane Nine Elms Guildford Withdrawn |
07/1955 14/06/1959 08/06/1965 19/06/1966 |
19/06/1966 |
BR5 | 73083 | 07/1955 | 73A 70A 70B 70G W |
Stewarts Lane Nine Elms Feltham Weymouth Radipole (GWR) Withdrawn |
07/1955 14/06/1959 14/09/1964 20/11/1964 04/09/1966 |
04/09/1966 |
BR5 | 73084 | 29/07/1955 | 73A 70A 70B 70D W |
Stewarts Lane Nine Elms Feltham Eastleigh Withdrawn |
07/1955 14/06/1959 25/10/1965 22/11/1965 19/12/1965 |
19/12/1965 |
BR5 | 73085 | 05/08/1955 | 73A 70A 70B 70D 70A W |
Stewarts Lane Nine Elms Feltham Eastleigh Nine Elms Withdrawn |
08/1955 14/06/1959 25/10/1965 22/11/1965 27/06/1966 02/07/1967 |
02/07/1967 |
BR5 | 73086 | 16/08/1955 | 73A 70A W |
Stewarts Lane Nine Elms Withdrawn |
08/1955 14/06/1959 02/10/1966 |
02/10/1966 |
BR5 | 73087 | 26/08/1955 | 73A 71G 71A 71G 73A 82F 82F 70A 82F 70A 82F 82F 70A 70B 70D 70C W |
Stewarts Lane Bath Green Park (S&D) Eastleigh Bath Green Park (S&D) Stewarts Lane Bath Green Park (S&D) Bath Green Park (S&D) Nine Elms Bath Green Park (S&D) Nine Elms Bath Green Park (S&D) Bath Green Park (S&D) Nine Elms Feltham Eastleigh Guildford Withdrawn |
08/1955 27/08/1956 27/10/1956 19/07/1957 08/10/1957 17/05/1958 12/06/1958 13/10/1958 13/06/1959 05/04/1960 18/06/1960 17/06/1961 23/08/1961 14/09/1964 12/10/1964 08/06/1965 02/10/1966 |
02/10/1966 |
BR5 | 73088 | 01/09/1955 | 73A 82F 70A 70C W |
Stewarts Lane Bath Green Park (S&D) Nine Elms Guildford Withdrawn |
09/1955 17/05/1958 13/10/1958 25/10/1965 02/10/1966 |
02/10/1966 |
BR5 | 73089 | 09/09/1955 | 73A 70A 70D 70C W |
Stewarts Lane Nine Elms Eastleigh Guildford Withdrawn |
09/1955 06/06/1958 14/09/1964 25/10/1965 25/09/1966 |
25/09/1966 |
BR5 | 73090 | 08/10/1955 | 10C 84G 2B 6D W |
Patricroft Shrewsbury Oxley Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
08/10/1955 06/09/1958 23/01/1965 06/03/1965 09/10/1965 |
09/10/1965 |
BR5 | 73091 | 14/10/1955 | 10C 84G 85C 85B W |
Patricroft Shrewsbury Gloucester Barnwood Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
10/1955 06/09/1958 07/10/1961 04/05/1964 05/1965 |
21/05/1965 |
BR5 | 73092 | 21/10/1955 | 84G 85C 85B 82F 70D 70C W |
Shrewsbury Gloucester Barnwood Gloucester Horton Road Bath Green Park (S&D) Eastleigh Guildford Withdrawn |
06/09/1958 07/10/1961 04/05/1964 20/07/1964 28/03/1965 25/10/1965 09/07/1967 |
09/07/1967 |
BR5 | 73093 | 04/11/1955 | 84G 85C 85B 82F 70D 70C W |
Shrewsbury Gloucester Barnwood Gloucester Horton Road Bath Green Park (S&D) Eastleigh Guildford Withdrawn |
06/09/1958 07/10/1961 04/05/1964 07/03/1965 28/03/1965 25/10/1965 09/07/1967 |
09/07/1967 |
BR5 | 73094 | 10/11/1955 | 10C 84G 82E 85C 6D 9H W |
Patricroft Shrewsbury Bristol Barrow Road Gloucester Barnwood Shrewsbury (Re-instd) Patricroft Withdrawn |
11/1955 06/09/1958 07/10/1961 02/12/1961 07/02/1964 23/05/1964 24/07/1965 13/05/1967 |
13/05/1967 |
BR5 | 73095 | 11/1955 | 10C 84G 6C 9J W |
Patricroft Shrewsbury Croes Newydd Agecroft Withdrawn |
11/1955 06/09/1958 28/08/1965 30/04/1966 27/08/1966 |
27/08/1966 |
BR5 | 73096 | 25/11/1955 | 10C 84G 85C 85B 2B 5E 6C 9H W |
Patricroft Shrewsbury Gloucester Barnwood Gloucester Horton Road Oxley Nuneaton Croes Newydd Patricroft Withdrawn |
11/1955 06/09/1958 14/07/1962 04/05/1964 01/11/1964 06/03/1965 19/06/1965 24/07/1965 25/11/1967 |
25/11/1967 |
BR5 | 73097 | 06/12/1955 | 10C 84G 9H W |
Patricroft Shrewsbury Patricroft Withdrawn |
12/1955 06/09/1958 24/07/1965 06/05/1967 |
06/05/1967 |
BR5 | 73098 | 15/12/1955 | 10C 6E 66A W |
Patricroft Chester West Polmadie Withdrawn |
12/1955 04/10/1958 22/11/1958 03/03/1966 |
03/03/1966 |
BR5 | 73099 | 30/12/1955 | 10C 6E 66A 66C 66A W |
Patricroft Chester West Polmadie Hamilton (West) Polmadie Withdrawn |
12/1955 04/10/1958 22/11/1958 30/07/1960 21/10/1961 19/10/1966 |
19/10/1966 |
BR5 | 73100 | 26/08/1955 | 67A W |
Corkerhill Withdrawn |
26/08/1955 20/01/1967 |
20/01/1967 |
BR5 | 73101 | 01/09/1955 | 67A W |
Corkerhill Withdrawn |
01/09/1955 24/08/1966 |
24/08/1966 |
BR5 | 73102 | 14/09/1955 | 67A W |
Corkerhill Withdrawn |
14/09/1955 31/12/1966 |
31/12/1966 |
BR5 | 73103 | 21/09/1955 | 67A W |
Corkerhill Withdrawn |
21/09/1955 22/10/1965 |
22/10/1965 |
BR5 | 73104 | 27/09/1955 | 67A W |
Corkerhill Withdrawn |
27/09/1955 22/10/1965 |
22/10/1965 |
BR5 | 73105 | 09/12/1955 | 65A 65F 65J 67A W |
Eastfield Grangemouth Stirling Corkerhill Withdrawn |
12/1955 26/12/1964 30/10/1965 25/06/1966 23/09/1966 |
23/09/1966 |
BR5 | 73106 | 12/1955 | 65A 60A 63A 67A W |
Eastfield Inverness Perth South Corkerhill Withdrawn |
12/1955 06/07/1957 26/10/1957 25/07/1964 19/06/1965 |
19/06/1965 |
BR5 | 73107 | 23/12/1955 | 65A 60A 63A 66B W |
Eastfield Inverness Perth South Motherwell Withdrawn |
12/1955 06/07/1957 26/10/1957 25/07/1964 02/09/1966 |
02/09/1966 |
BR5 | 73108 | 12/1955 | 65A 66E W |
Eastfield Carstairs Withdrawn |
12/1955 29/01/1966 31/12/1966 |
31/12/1966 |
BR5 | 73109 | 01/1956 | 65A W |
Eastfield Withdrawn |
01/1956 29/10/1964 |
29/10/1964 |
BR5 | 73110 | 24/09/1955 | 70A 70D 70C W |
Nine Elms Eastleigh Guildford Withdrawn |
10/1956 14/09/1964 25/10/1965 29/01/1967 |
29/01/1967 |
BR5 | 73111 | 15/10/1955 | 70A 70D W |
Nine Elms Eastleigh Withdrawn |
10/1956 14/09/1964 10/1965 |
10/1965 |
BR5 | 73112 | 22/10/1955 | 70A 70D 70A W |
Nine Elms Eastleigh Nine Elms Withdrawn |
10/1956 14/09/1964 12/10/1964 20/06/1965 |
20/06/1965 |
BR5 | 73113 | 10/1956 | 70A 70D 70G W |
Nine Elms Eastleigh Weymouth Radipole (GWR) Withdrawn |
10/1956 14/09/1964 25/10/1965 22/01/1967 |
22/01/1967 |
BR5 | 73114 | 11/1956 | 70A 70D 70G W |
Nine Elms Eastleigh Weymouth Radipole (GWR) Withdrawn |
11/1956 14/09/1964 25/10/1965 05/06/1966 |
05/06/1966 |
BR5 | 73115 | 15/11/1955 | 70A 70D 70A 70C W |
Nine Elms Eastleigh Nine Elms Guildford Withdrawn |
11/1956 14/09/1964 27/06/1966 17/10/1966 19/03/1967 |
19/03/1967 |
BR5 | 73116 | 15/11/1955 | 71G 71A 70A 71G 70A 82F 82F 70A 70D W |
Bath Green Park (S&D) Eastleigh Nine Elms Bath Green Park (S&D) Nine Elms Bath Green Park (S&D) Bath Green Park (S&D) Nine Elms Eastleigh Withdrawn |
27/08/1956 27/10/1956 11/1956 19/07/1957 08/10/1957 12/06/1958 13/06/1959 05/04/1960 14/09/1964 29/11/1964 |
29/11/1964 |
BR5 | 73117 | 25/11/1955 | 70A 70D 70A 70C W |
Nine Elms Eastleigh Nine Elms Guildford Withdrawn |
11/1956 14/09/1964 27/06/1966 17/10/1966 19/03/1967 |
19/03/1967 |
BR5 | 73118 | 12/1956 | 70A 70D 70A 70C W |
Nine Elms Eastleigh Nine Elms Guildford Withdrawn |
12/1956 14/09/1964 27/06/1966 17/10/1966 09/07/1967 |
09/07/1967 |
BR5 | 73119 | 09/12/1955 | 70A 70D W |
Nine Elms Eastleigh Withdrawn |
12/1956 14/09/1964 19/03/1967 |
19/03/1967 |
BR5 | 73120 | 10/01/1956 | 63A 67A W |
Perth South Corkerhill Withdrawn |
01/1956 19/01/1963 31/12/1966 |
31/12/1966 |
BR5 | 73121 | 19/01/1956 | 67A W |
Corkerhill Withdrawn |
01/1956 01/1966 |
01/1966 |
BR5 | 73122 | 30/01/1956 | 67A W |
Corkerhill Withdrawn |
01/1956 10/09/1965 |
10/09/1965 |
BR5 | 73123 | 10/02/1956 | 67A W |
Corkerhill Withdrawn |
02/1956 08/05/1965 |
08/05/1965 |
BR5 | 73124 | 24/02/1956 | 67A W |
Corkerhill Withdrawn |
02/1956 06/12/1965 |
06/12/1965 |
BR5 | 73125 | 06/07/1956 | 84G 26F W |
Shrewsbury Patricroft Withdrawn |
07/1956 06/09/1958 29/06/1968 |
29/06/1968 |
BR5 | 73126 | 13/07/1956 | 84G 26F W |
Shrewsbury Patricroft Withdrawn |
07/1956 06/09/1958 20/04/1968 |
20/04/1968 |
BR5 | 73127 | 09/08/1956 | 84G 26F W |
Shrewsbury Patricroft Withdrawn |
08/1956 06/09/1958 04/11/1967 |
04/11/1967 |
BR5 | 73128 | 28/08/1956 | 84G 26F 16J 9H W |
Shrewsbury Patricroft Rowsley Patricroft Withdrawn |
08/1956 06/09/1958 08/02/1964 02/05/1964 11/05/1968 |
11/05/1968 |
BR5 | 73129 | 31/08/1956 | 84G 26F W |
Shrewsbury Patricroft Withdrawn |
08/1956 06/09/1958 02/12/1967 |
02/12/1967 |
BR5 | 73130 | 12/09/1956 | 84G 26F W |
Shrewsbury Patricroft Withdrawn |
09/1956 06/09/1958 21/01/1967 |
21/01/1967 |
BR5 | 73131 | 24/09/1956 | 84G 26F W |
Shrewsbury Patricroft Withdrawn |
09/1956 06/09/1958 30/01/1968 |
30/01/1968 |
BR5 | 73132 | 04/10/1956 | 84G 26F W |
Shrewsbury Patricroft Withdrawn |
09/1956 06/09/1958 30/03/1968 |
30/03/1968 |
BR5 | 73133 | 11/10/1956 | 84G 26F W |
Shrewsbury Patricroft Withdrawn |
09/1956 06/09/1958 29/06/1968 |
29/06/1968 |
BR5 | 73134 | 18/10/1956 | 84G 26F W |
Shrewsbury Patricroft Withdrawn |
09/1956 06/09/1958 22/06/1968 |
22/06/1968 |
BR5 | 73135 | 27/10/1956 | 6J 15C 17A 17C 17C 16C 9H W |
Holyhead Leicester Midland Derby Rowsley Rowsley Derby Patricroft Withdrawn |
27/10/1956 17/05/1958 10/01/1959 21/11/1959 07/04/1962 02/05/1964 12/09/1964 30/03/1968 |
30/03/1968 |
BR5 | 73136 | 03/11/1956 | 6J 15C 17A 17C 17C 16C 9H W |
Holyhead Leicester Midland Derby Rowsley Rowsley Derby Patricroft Withdrawn |
03/11/1956 17/05/1958 10/01/1959 21/11/1959 07/04/1962 02/05/1964 06/06/1964 16/03/1968 |
16/03/1968 |
BR5 | 73137 | 09/11/1956 | 6J 15C 16A 15C 17A 17C 17C 15C 17C 16C 9H W |
Holyhead Leicester Midland Nottingham Leicester Midland Derby Rowsley Rowsley Leicester Midland Rowsley Derby Patricroft Withdrawn |
11/1956 17/05/1958 14/06/1958 12/07/1958 10/01/1959 21/11/1959 07/04/1962 26/05/1962 23/06/1962 02/05/1964 13/06/1964 17/06/1967 |
17/06/1967 |
BR5 | 73138 | 15/11/1956 | 6J 15C 17A 17C 17C 16C 9H W |
Holyhead Leicester Midland Derby Rowsley Rowsley Derby Patricroft Withdrawn |
11/1956 26/01/1957 10/01/1959 21/11/1959 07/04/1962 02/05/1964 06/06/1964 27/04/1968 |
27/04/1968 |
BR5 | 73139 | 22/11/1956 | 6J 15C 17A 17C 16C 9H W |
Holyhead Leicester Midland Derby Rowsley Derby Patricroft Withdrawn |
11/1956 17/05/1958 10/01/1959 21/11/1959 02/05/1964 13/06/1964 13/05/1967 |
13/05/1967 |
BR5 | 73140 | 29/11/1956 | 15C 6J 15C 9E 15C 17A 17C 17A 17C 16C 9H W |
Leicester Midland Holyhead Leicester Midland Trafford Park (LMS) Leicester Midland Derby Rowsley Derby Rowsley Derby Patricroft Withdrawn |
11/1956 26/01/1957 17/05/1958 04/10/1958 11/10/1958 10/01/1959 21/11/1959 30/09/1961 03/03/1962 02/05/1964 06/06/1964 28/10/1967 |
28/10/1967 |
BR5 | 73141 | 06/12/1956 | 15C 17A 17C 16C 9H W |
Leicester Midland Derby Rowsley Derby Patricroft Withdrawn |
12/1956 10/01/1959 21/11/1959 02/05/1964 06/06/1964 29/07/1967 |
29/07/1967 |
BR5 | 73142 | 13/12/1956 | 15C 17A 17C 16C 9H W |
Leicester Midland Derby Rowsley Derby Patricroft Withdrawn |
12/1956 10/01/1959 21/11/1959 02/05/1964 06/06/1964 27/04/1968 |
27/04/1968 |
BR5 | 73143 | 20/12/1956 | 15C 16A 17A 16A 16A 17A 17C 9H S W |
Leicester Midland Nottingham (on loan) Derby Nottingham (on loan) Nottingham Derby Rowsley Patricroft Stored Withdrawn |
12/1956 14/04/1958 05/01/1959 05/01/1959 10/01/1959 14/01/1959 21/11/1959 08/02/1964 23/08/1965 29/06/1968 |
29/06/1968 |
BR5 | 73144 | 28/12/1956 | 15C 16A 16A 17A 17C 17A 17C 16C 9H W |
Leicester Midland Nottingham Nottingham Derby Rowsley Derby Rowsley Derby Patricroft Withdrawn |
12/1956 19/04/1958 10/01/1959 07/02/1959 21/11/1959 30/09/1961 10/02/1962 02/05/1964 06/06/1964 26/08/1967 |
26/08/1967 |
BR5 | 73145 | 24/01/1957 | 65B 65A 67C W |
St Rollox (Balornock) Eastfield Ayr Withdrawn |
01/1957 26/12/1965 24/09/1966 26/09/1966 |
26/09/1966 |
BR5 | 73146 | 12/02/1957 | 65B 65A 66B W |
St Rollox (Balornock) Eastfield Motherwell Withdrawn |
02/1957 29/01/1966 26/11/1966 01/05/1967 |
01/05/1967 |
BR5 | 73147 | 13/02/1957 | 65B W |
St Rollox (Balornock) Withdrawn |
02/1957 21/08/1965 |
21/08/1965 |
BR5 | 73148 | 07/03/1957 | 65B W |
St Rollox (Balornock) Withdrawn |
03/1957 20/09/1965 |
20/09/1965 |
BR5 | 73149 | 20/03/1957 | 65B 65J W |
St Rollox (Balornock) Stirling Withdrawn |
03/1957 26/11/1966 10/12/1966 |
10/12/1966 |
BR5 | 73150 | 04/04/1957 | 65B 65J W |
St Rollox (Balornock) Stirling Withdrawn |
04/1957 26/11/1966 10/12/1966 |
10/12/1966 |
BR5 | 73151 | 18/04/1957 | 65B W |
St Rollox (Balornock) Withdrawn |
04/1957 22/08/1966 |
22/08/1966 |
BR5 | 73152 | 09/05/1957 | 65B W |
St Rollox (Balornock) Withdrawn |
05/1957 06/12/1965 |
06/12/1965 |
BR5 | 73153 | 24/05/1957 | 65B 65J W |
St Rollox (Balornock) Stirling Withdrawn |
05/1957 26/11/1966 10/12/1966 |
10/12/1966 |
BR5 | 73154 | 14/06/1957 | 65B 65J 66B W |
St Rollox (Balornock) Stirling Motherwell Withdrawn |
06/1957 25/12/1965 25/06/1966 31/12/1966 |
31/12/1966 |
BR5 | 73155 | 19/12/1956 | 34E 41C 41D 71A 70B 70D 70C W |
Neasden Sheffield Millhouses Canklow Eastleigh Feltham Eastleigh Guildford Withdrawn |
12/1956 10/05/1958 06/01/1962 08/12/1962 06/01/1964 20/11/1964 17/04/1967 09/07/1967 |
09/07/1967 |
BR5 | 73156 | 19/12/1956 | 34E 41C 41B 17A 14D 15E 2F 14A 2L 2A 9K W |
Neasden Sheffield Millhouses Sheffield Grimesthorpe Derby Neasden Leicester (G.C.) Woodford Halse Cricklewood East Leamington Tyseley Bolton Withdrawn |
12/1956 10/05/1958 10/01/1959 17/09/1960 24/09/1960 30/06/1962 02/03/1963 18/05/1963 10/10/1964 19/06/1965 30/04/1966 25/11/1967 |
25/11/1967 |
BR5 | 73157 | 28/12/1956 | 34E 34A 41A 14D 17A 14D 14A 6A 1G 2B 9H W |
Neasden Kings Cross Sheffield Darnall Neasden Derby Neasden Cricklewood East Chester (MR) Woodford Halse Oxley Patricroft Withdrawn |
12/1956 09/11/1957 15/11/1958 27/12/1958 21/02/1959 18/06/1960 30/06/1962 25/05/1963 02/11/1963 16/01/1965 03/04/1965 11/05/1968 |
11/05/1968 |
BR5 | 73158 | 28/12/1956 | 34E 34A 41A 14D 17A 14D 14A 14E 14A 9H W |
Neasden Kings Cross Sheffield Darnall Neasden Derby Neasden Cricklewood East Bedford Cricklewood East Patricroft Withdrawn |
12/1956 09/11/1957 15/11/1958 03/01/1959 21/02/1959 18/06/1960 30/06/1962 06/07/1963 03/08/1963 28/03/1964 14/10/1967 |
14/10/1967 |
BR5 | 73159 | 11/01/1957 | 34E 34A 41A 14D 17A 14D 15E 2F 5E 9H W |
Neasden Kings Cross Sheffield Darnall Neasden Derby Neasden Leicester (G.C.) Woodford Halse Nuneaton Patricroft Withdrawn |
01/1957 09/11/1957 15/11/1958 27/12/1958 21/02/1959 18/06/1960 30/06/1962 12/01/1963 19/09/1964 24/07/1965 28/10/1967 |
28/10/1967 |
BR5 | 73160 | 23/01/1957 | 52A 55E 1E 2B 9H W |
Gateshead Normanton Bletchley Oxley Patricroft Withdrawn |
01/1957 21/09/1957 25/04/1964 16/01/1965 03/04/1965 11/11/1967 |
11/11/1967 |
BR5 | 73161 | 27/01/1957 | 52A 55E 55H 56A 83D W |
Gateshead Normanton Neville Hill Wakefield Laira Withdrawn |
02/1957 21/09/1957 23/06/1962 22/06/1963 08/09/1963 12/1964 |
26/12/1964 |
BR5 | 73162 | 15/02/1957 | 50A 55G 55H 56A 83D 81F W |
York (North) Huddersfield Hillhouse Neville Hill Wakefield Laira Oxford Withdrawn |
02/1957 15/11/1958 17/06/1961 22/06/1963 08/09/1963 10/01/1965 05/1965 |
21/05/1965 |
BR5 | 73163 | 02/1957 | 50A 55G 56A 2B 9H W |
York (North) Huddersfield Hillhouse Wakefield Oxley Patricroft Withdrawn |
02/1957 15/11/1958 12/09/1964 01/11/1964 03/04/1965 20/11/1965 |
20/11/1965 |
BR5 | 73164 | 05/03/1957 | 50A 55G 82F 82E 81F W |
York (North) Huddersfield Hillhouse Bath Green Park (S&D) Bristol Barrow Road Oxford Withdrawn |
02/1957 15/11/1958 28/09/1963 30/11/1963 12/10/1964 12/1964 |
26/12/1964 |
BR5 | 73165 | 03/1957 | 50A 55G 56A 2B 9H W |
York (North) Huddersfield Hillhouse Wakefield Oxley Patricroft Withdrawn |
02/1957 15/11/1958 12/09/1964 01/11/1964 03/04/1965 09/1965 |
09/1965 |
BR5 | 73166 | 29/03/1957 | 50A 55G 55A 55G 55A 55D 26F 83D 83E 81F W |
York (North) Huddersfield Hillhouse Holbeck (MR) Huddersfield Hillhouse Holbeck (MR) Royston Patricroft Exmouth Junction Yeovil Town Oxford Withdrawn |
03/1957 15/11/1958 25/04/1959 17/09/1960 14/04/1962 15/09/1962 22/06/1963 06/10/1963 12/10/1964 11/07/1965 12/1965 |
31/12/1965 |
BR5 | 73167 | 13/04/1957 | 50A 50E 55E 55A 70B 6D W |
York (North) Scarborough Normanton Holbeck (MR) Feltham Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
04/1957 31/01/1959 20/06/1959 22/06/1963 14/09/1963 15/08/1964 07/08/1965 |
07/08/1965 |
BR5 | 73168 | 18/04/1957 | 50A 50E 55A 55H 56A 70B 70D W |
York (North) Scarborough Holbeck (MR) Neville Hill Wakefield Feltham Eastleigh Withdrawn |
04/1957 31/01/1959 20/06/1959 07/10/1961 22/06/1963 14/09/1963 20/11/1964 19/12/1965 |
19/12/1965 |
BR5 | 73169 | 26/04/1957 | 50A 50E 55A 55H 56A 70B 70D W |
York (North) Scarborough Holbeck (MR) Neville Hill Wakefield Feltham Eastleigh Withdrawn |
04/1957 31/01/1959 20/06/1959 17/06/1961 22/06/1963 14/09/1963 20/11/1964 02/10/1966 |
02/10/1966 |
BR5 | 73170 | 17/05/1957 | 50A 50E 55A 55D 70B 70D W |
York (North) Scarborough Holbeck (MR) Royston Feltham Eastleigh Withdrawn |
04/1957 31/01/1959 20/06/1959 15/09/1962 14/09/1963 20/11/1964 19/06/1966 |
19/06/1966 |
BR5 | 73171 | 24/05/1957 | 50A 55A 55D 70B 70D W |
York (North) Holbeck (MR) Royston Feltham Eastleigh Withdrawn |
05/1957 21/09/1957 15/09/1962 14/09/1963 20/11/1964 02/10/1966 |
02/10/1966 |