Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 395 Today
» 1251 Yesterday
» 4133 Week
» 1646 Month
» 229530 Year
» 1451095 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

BR Standard Riddles "Britannia" Class 4-6-2


Class BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
BRIT 70000 05/01/1951 30A
32A
1A
5A
5B
9D
W
Stratford
Norwich Thorpe
Willesden
Crewe North
Crewe South
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
05/01/1951
31/01/1959
30/03/1963
25/05/1963
29/05/1965
05/03/1966
28/05/1966
28/05/1966
BRIT 70001 14/02/1951 30A
32A
31B
1A
2J
12A
W
Stratford
Norwich Thorpe
March
Willesden
Aston
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
14/02/1951
31/01/1959
16/09/1961
30/03/1963
14/12/1963
10/10/1964
03/09/1966
03/09/1966
BRIT 70002 06/03/1951 30A
32D
32A
31B
12A
W
Stratford
Yarmouth South Town
Norwich Thorpe
March
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
06/03/1951
10/01/1959
31/01/1959
01/07/1961
07/12/1963
14/01/1967
14/01/1967
BRIT 70003 01/03/1951 30A
32A
31B
12A
W
Stratford
Norwich Thorpe
March
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
01/03/1951
31/01/1959
15/07/1961
07/12/1963
25/03/1967
25/03/1967
BRIT 70004 30/03/1951 30A
73A
9E
1A
21D
1A
12C
12A
1A
5A
9B
12A
W
Stratford
Stewarts Lane
Trafford Park (LMS)
Willesden
Aston
Willesden
Carlisle Canal
Carlisle Kingmoor
Willesden
Crewe North
Stockport Edgeley
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
30/03/1951
06/10/1951
12/07/1958
24/12/1960
03/03/1962
28/04/1962
25/05/1963
22/06/1963
27/07/1963
09/01/1965
29/05/1965
17/06/1967
30/12/1967
30/12/1967
BRIT 70005 07/04/1951 30A
30A
32A
31B
1A
2J
12A
W
Stratford
Stratford
Norwich Thorpe
March
Willesden
Aston
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
07/04/1951
16/02/1952
31/01/1959
16/09/1961
30/03/1963
14/12/1963
10/10/1964
29/07/1967
29/07/1967
BRIT 70006 12/04/1951 30A
32A
30A
31B
12A
W
Stratford
Norwich Thorpe
Stratford
March
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
12/04/1951
19/05/1951
20/10/1951
09/12/1961
07/12/1963
20/05/1967
20/05/1967
BRIT 70007 25/04/1951 30A
32A
31B
12A
W
Stratford
Norwich Thorpe
March
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
25/04/1951
19/05/1951
18/11/1961
07/12/1963
19/06/1965
19/06/1965
BRIT 70008 28/04/1951 32A
31B
12A
W
Norwich Thorpe
March
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
28/04/1951
16/09/1961
07/12/1963
14/01/1967
14/01/1967
BRIT 70009 04/05/1951 32A
70A
32A
31B
12A
W
Norwich Thorpe
Nine Elms
Norwich Thorpe
March
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
04/05/1951
27/06/1951
20/10/1951
16/09/1961
07/12/1963
21/01/1967
21/01/1967
BRIT 70010 05/05/1951 32A
31B
1A
5A
5B
12A
W
Norwich Thorpe
March
Willesden
Crewe North
Crewe South
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
05/05/1951
09/12/1961
30/03/1963
09/01/1965
29/05/1965
26/06/1965
23/09/1967
23/09/1967
BRIT 70011 14/05/1951 32A
31B
12A
12B
12A
W
Norwich Thorpe
March
Carlisle Kingmoor
Carlisle Upperby
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
14/05/1951
16/09/1961
07/12/1963
06/02/1965
17/12/1966
23/12/1967
23/12/1967
BRIT 70012 21/05/1951 32A
30A
32D
32A
31B
1A
5A
5B
6G
5B
12A
W
Norwich Thorpe
Stratford
Yarmouth South Town
Norwich Thorpe
March
Willesden
Crewe North
Crewe South
Llandudno Junction
Crewe South
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
21/05/1951
15/11/1958
10/01/1959
31/01/1959
30/09/1961
30/03/1963
09/01/1965
29/05/1965
26/02/1966
23/04/1966
20/08/1966
30/12/1967
30/12/1967
BRIT 70013 30/05/1951 32A
32B
32A
31B
12A
12B
12A
10A
W
Norwich Thorpe
Ipswich
Norwich Thorpe
March
Carlisle Kingmoor
Carlisle Upperby
Carlisle Kingmoor
Carnforth
Withdrawn
30/05/1951
11/10/1958
10/01/1959
16/09/1961
07/12/1963
06/02/1965
17/12/1966
06/01/1968
17/08/1968
17/08/1968
BRIT 70014 02/06/1951 70A
9E
26A
1A
14D
16D
1A
6G
1A
5A
5B
6G
5B
12A
W
Nine Elms
Trafford Park (LMS)
Newton Heath
Willesden
Neasden
Annesley
Willesden
Llandudno Junction
Willesden
Crewe North
Crewe South
Llandudno Junction
Crewe South
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
02/06/1951
12/07/1958
31/12/1960
16/09/1961
16/09/1961
23/06/1962
06/10/1962
29/12/1962
18/05/1963
09/01/1965
29/05/1965
26/02/1966
23/04/1966
06/08/1966
30/12/1967
30/12/1967
BRIT 70015 12/06/1951 1B
30A
81A
86C
9E
26A
1A
14D
16D
1A
6G
5A
9B
12A
W
Camden
Stratford
Old Oak Common
Cardiff Canton
Trafford Park (LMS)
Newton Heath
Willesden
Neasden
Annesley
Willesden
Llandudno Junction
Crewe North
Stockport Edgeley
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
12/06/1951
19/01/1952
05/09/1953
29/12/1956
12/07/1958
31/12/1960
16/09/1961
16/09/1961
23/06/1962
06/10/1962
29/12/1962
14/09/1963
29/05/1965
17/06/1967
05/08/1967
05/08/1967
BRIT 70016 18/06/1951 20A
30A
83D
86C
12C
9A
5A
6G
6J
21D
12A
W
Holbeck (MR)
Stratford
Laira
Cardiff Canton
Carlisle Canal
Longsight
Crewe North
Llandudno Junction
Holyhead
Aston
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
18/06/1951
22/03/1952
08/08/1953
29/12/1956
16/09/1961
19/05/1962
15/09/1962
08/12/1962
02/03/1963
25/05/1963
10/10/1964
19/08/1967
19/08/1967
BRIT 70017 02/06/1951 81A
86C
9E
1A
21D
2A
21D
6G
5A
5B
9D
12A
W
Old Oak Common
Cardiff Canton
Trafford Park (LMS)
Willesden
Aston
Rugby
Aston
Llandudno Junction
Crewe North
Crewe South
Newton Heath
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
02/06/1951
29/12/1956
12/07/1958
17/12/1960
09/09/1961
13/10/1962
23/02/1963
18/05/1963
14/09/1963
29/05/1965
24/07/1965
21/05/1966
01/10/1966
01/10/1966
BRIT 70018 25/06/1951 81A
86C
12C
9A
5A
5B
12B
12A
W
Old Oak Common
Cardiff Canton
Carlisle Canal
Longsight
Crewe North
Crewe South
Carlisle Upperby
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
30/09/1951
29/12/1956
16/09/1961
19/05/1962
15/09/1962
29/05/1965
05/03/1966
17/12/1966
24/12/1966
24/12/1966
BRIT 70019 30/06/1951 83A
83D
86C
12A
9A
5A
21D
5A
5B
12B
W
Newton Abbot
Laira
Cardiff Canton
Carlisle Kingmoor
Longsight
Crewe North
Aston
Crewe North
Crewe South
Carlisle Upperby
Withdrawn
30/06/1951
30/09/1951
29/12/1956
16/09/1961
16/06/1962
15/09/1962
25/05/1963
14/09/1963
29/05/1965
24/07/1965
12/03/1966
12/03/1966
BRIT 70020 31/07/1951 81A
86C
12A
9A
5A
12C
1A
5A
5B
12B
12A
W
Old Oak Common
Cardiff Canton
Carlisle Kingmoor
Longsight
Crewe North
Carlisle Canal
Willesden
Crewe North
Crewe South
Carlisle Upperby
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
31/07/1951
29/12/1956
16/09/1961
16/06/1962
15/09/1962
26/01/1963
25/05/1963
09/01/1965
29/05/1965
24/07/1965
17/12/1966
21/01/1967
21/01/1967
BRIT 70021 03/08/1951 83D
86C
9E
1A
21D
1A
5A
5B
9D
9B
12A
W
Laira
Cardiff Canton
Trafford Park (LMS)
Willesden
Aston
Willesden
Crewe North
Crewe South
Newton Heath
Stockport Edgeley
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
03/08/1951
26/01/1957
12/07/1958
04/02/1961
10/03/1962
17/03/1962
09/01/1965
29/05/1965
24/07/1965
21/05/1966
17/06/1967
30/12/1967
30/12/1967
BRIT 70022 16/08/1951 83D
83D
83A
86C
12A
9A
21D
2A
21D
12A
12B
12A
W
Laira
Laira
Newton Abbot
Cardiff Canton
Carlisle Kingmoor
Longsight
Aston
Rugby
Aston
Carlisle Kingmoor
Carlisle Upperby
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
30/09/1951
29/02/1952
30/04/1952
29/12/1956
16/09/1961
16/06/1962
15/09/1962
13/10/1962
23/02/1963
10/10/1964
07/11/1964
17/12/1966
23/12/1967
23/12/1967
BRIT 70023 21/08/1951 81A
12A
9A
21D
2A
21D
5A
6J
5A
5B
6G
5B
12A
W
Old Oak Common
Carlisle Kingmoor
Longsight
Aston
Rugby
Aston
Crewe North
Holyhead
Crewe North
Crewe South
Llandudno Junction
Crewe South
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
30/09/1951
16/09/1961
16/06/1962
15/09/1962
13/10/1962
23/02/1963
14/09/1963
19/09/1964
06/02/1965
29/05/1965
26/02/1966
23/04/1966
17/09/1966
30/12/1967
30/12/1967
BRIT 70024 06/10/1951 83D
86C
21D
2A
21D
1A
5A
6J
5A
5B
6G
5B
12B
12A
W
Laira
Cardiff Canton
Aston
Rugby
Aston
Willesden
Crewe North
Holyhead
Crewe North
Crewe South
Llandudno Junction
Crewe South
Carlisle Upperby
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
29/02/1952
29/12/1956
16/09/1961
13/10/1962
23/02/1963
20/04/1963
02/11/1963
19/09/1964
06/02/1965
29/05/1965
26/02/1966
23/04/1966
20/08/1966
17/12/1966
30/12/1967
30/12/1967
BRIT 70025 13/09/1952 86C
21D
5A
5B
6G
5B
12A
W
Cardiff Canton
Aston
Crewe North
Crewe South
Llandudno Junction
Crewe South
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
13/09/1952
16/05/1953
16/09/1961
25/05/1963
29/05/1965
26/02/1966
23/04/1966
17/09/1966
23/12/1967
23/12/1967
BRIT 70026 07/10/1952 86C
21D
6J
9B
W
Cardiff Canton
Aston
Holyhead
Stockport Edgeley
Withdrawn
07/10/1952
16/09/1961
06/04/1963
29/05/1965
14/01/1967
14/01/1967
BRIT 70027 24/10/1952 86C
21D
6J
5A
5B
6G
5B
12A
W
Cardiff Canton
Aston
Holyhead
Crewe North
Crewe South
Llandudno Junction
Crewe South
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
24/10/1952
16/09/1961
25/05/1963
06/02/1965
29/05/1965
26/02/1966
23/04/1966
17/09/1966
01/07/1967
01/07/1967
BRIT 70028 27/10/1952 86C
21D
9A
21D
9A
21D
1A
5A
5B
6G
5B
12A
W
Cardiff Canton
Aston
Longsight
Aston
Longsight
Aston
Willesden
Crewe North
Crewe South
Llandudno Junction
Crewe South
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
27/10/1952
16/09/1961
31/03/1962
16/06/1962
07/07/1962
15/09/1962
25/05/1963
14/09/1963
29/05/1965
26/02/1966
23/04/1966
17/09/1966
16/09/1967
16/09/1967
BRIT 70029 08/11/1952 86C
86C
21D
12A
12B
12A
W
Cardiff Canton
Cardiff Canton
Aston
Carlisle Kingmoor
Carlisle Upperby
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
08/11/1952
29/11/1952
16/09/1961
10/10/1964
07/11/1964
17/12/1966
21/10/1967
21/10/1967
BRIT 70030 19/11/1952 6J
9A
9A
32A
32D
32A
31B
5A
5B
12B
W
Holyhead
Longsight
Longsight
Norwich Thorpe
Yarmouth South Town
Norwich Thorpe
March
Crewe North
Crewe South
Carlisle Upperby
Withdrawn
19/11/1952
03/01/1953
21/02/1953
25/07/1953
11/10/1958
31/01/1959
17/06/1961
06/07/1963
29/05/1965
24/07/1965
25/06/1966
25/06/1966
BRIT 70031 29/11/1952 6J
9A
9E
9A
21D
1A
5A
5B
12B
12A
W
Holyhead
Longsight
Trafford Park (LMS)
Longsight
Aston
Willesden
Crewe North
Crewe South
Carlisle Upperby
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
29/11/1952
24/01/1953
30/04/1960
24/09/1960
09/09/1961
20/04/1963
09/01/1965
29/05/1965
24/07/1965
17/12/1966
11/11/1967
11/11/1967
BRIT 70032 10/12/1952 6J
9A
9E
1A
12A
12B
12A
W
Holyhead
Longsight
Trafford Park (LMS)
Willesden
Carlisle Kingmoor
Carlisle Upperby
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
10/12/1952
24/01/1953
06/02/1960
14/01/1961
10/10/1964
07/11/1964
17/12/1966
30/09/1967
30/09/1967
BRIT 70033 13/12/1952 6J
9A
9E
1A
6G
6J
1A
5A
5B
12A
W
Holyhead
Longsight
Trafford Park (LMS)
Willesden
Llandudno Junction
Holyhead
Willesden
Crewe North
Crewe South
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
13/12/1952
24/01/1953
06/02/1960
04/02/1961
29/12/1962
02/03/1963
25/05/1963
14/09/1963
29/05/1965
26/06/1965
15/07/1967
15/07/1967
BRIT 70034 20/12/1952 9A
30A
32A
31B
1A
5A
5B
9D
12A
W
Longsight
Stratford
Norwich Thorpe
March
Willesden
Crewe North
Crewe South
Newton Heath
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
20/12/1952
25/07/1953
31/01/1959
17/06/1961
30/03/1963
20/06/1964
29/05/1965
24/07/1965
21/05/1966
06/05/1967
06/05/1967
BRIT 70035 22/12/1952 32A
31B
32A
40B
31B
12A
W
Norwich Thorpe
March
Norwich Thorpe
Immingham
March
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
22/12/1952
14/06/1958
31/01/1959
14/10/1961
22/06/1963
07/12/1963
30/12/1967
30/12/1967
BRIT 70036 23/12/1952 30A
32A
31B
40B
12B
12A
W
Stratford
Norwich Thorpe
March
Immingham
Carlisle Upperby
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
23/12/1952
31/01/1959
26/11/1960
07/10/1961
07/12/1963
29/02/1964
15/10/1966
15/10/1966
BRIT 70037 24/12/1952 30A
32A
31B
40B
12B
12A
W
Stratford
Norwich Thorpe
March
Immingham
Carlisle Upperby
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
24/12/1952
31/01/1959
26/11/1960
30/09/1961
07/12/1963
25/01/1964
05/11/1966
05/11/1966
BRIT 70038 29/01/1953 30A
32A
31B
40B
12B
12A
W
Stratford
Norwich Thorpe
March
Immingham
Carlisle Upperby
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
29/01/1953
31/01/1959
26/11/1960
28/10/1961
07/12/1963
25/01/1964
12/08/1967
12/08/1967
BRIT 70039 09/02/1953 32A
30A
32A
40B
12B
12A
W
Norwich Thorpe
Stratford
Norwich Thorpe
Immingham
Carlisle Upperby
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
09/02/1953
20/06/1953
31/01/1959
10/12/1960
07/12/1963
29/02/1964
23/09/1967
23/09/1967
BRIT 70040 21/03/1953 32A
30A
32A
40B
12B
12A
W
Norwich Thorpe
Stratford
Norwich Thorpe
Immingham
Carlisle Upperby
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
21/03/1953
20/06/1953
31/01/1959
17/12/1960
07/12/1963
29/02/1964
15/04/1967
15/04/1967
BRIT 70041 20/03/1953 30A
32A
40B
12B
12A
W
Stratford
Norwich Thorpe
Immingham
Carlisle Upperby
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
20/03/1953
31/01/1959
24/12/1960
07/12/1963
25/01/1964
15/04/1967
15/04/1967
BRIT 70042 09/04/1953 30A
14B
9E
1A
5A
5B
6J
12A
W
Stratford
Kentish Town
Trafford Park (LMS)
Willesden
Crewe North
Crewe South
Holyhead
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
09/04/1953
14/06/1958
12/07/1958
31/12/1960
25/05/1963
29/05/1965
26/06/1965
11/12/1965
13/05/1967
13/05/1967
BRIT 70043 04/06/1953 9A
18A
9A
21D
9A
21D
1A
5A
5B
W
Longsight
Toton
Longsight
Aston
Longsight
Aston
Willesden
Crewe North
Crewe South
Withdrawn
04/06/1953
03/10/1953
02/01/1954
09/09/1961
24/03/1962
16/06/1962
20/04/1963
20/06/1964
29/05/1965
07/08/1965
07/08/1965
BRIT 70044 04/06/1953 9A
5A
5B
9D
9B
W
Longsight
Crewe North
Crewe South
Newton Heath
Stockport Edgeley
Withdrawn
04/06/1953
18/08/1962
29/05/1965
24/07/1965
21/05/1966
24/10/1966
24/10/1966
BRIT 70045 14/06/1954 6J
6A
5A
1B
26A
14D
21D
6J
2B
2D
12A
W
Holyhead
Chester (MR)
Crewe North
Camden
Newton Heath
Neasden
Aston
Holyhead
Oxley
Banbury
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
14/06/1954
07/11/1959
21/11/1959
12/12/1959
16/01/1960
16/09/1961
30/06/1962
08/12/1962
19/06/1965
02/10/1965
08/01/1966
30/12/1967
30/12/1967
BRIT 70046 22/06/1954 6J
5A
9A
1A
12A
1A
21D
6J
5A
5B
6J
2D
12A
W
Holyhead
Crewe North
Longsight
Willesden
Carlisle Kingmoor
Willesden
Aston
Holyhead
Crewe North
Crewe South
Holyhead
Banbury
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
22/06/1954
07/11/1959
06/02/1960
09/09/1961
16/09/1961
14/10/1961
28/04/1962
08/12/1962
06/02/1965
29/05/1965
26/06/1965
02/10/1965
08/01/1966
08/07/1967
08/07/1967
BRIT 70047 25/06/1954 6J
5A
6J
1A
12A
1A
21D
1A
6J
2B
2D
12A
W
Holyhead
Crewe North
Holyhead
Willesden
Carlisle Kingmoor
Willesden
Aston
Willesden
Holyhead
Oxley
Banbury
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
25/06/1954
07/11/1959
13/08/1960
17/06/1961
23/09/1961
14/10/1961
17/03/1962
14/12/1963
25/01/1964
19/06/1965
02/10/1965
08/01/1966
29/07/1967
29/07/1967
BRIT 70048 08/07/1954 6J
5A
1B
26A
14D
16D
1A
6J
21D
12A
12B
12A
W
Holyhead
Crewe North
Camden
Newton Heath
Neasden
Annesley
Willesden
Holyhead
Aston
Carlisle Kingmoor
Carlisle Upperby
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
08/07/1954
07/11/1959
12/12/1959
16/01/1960
16/09/1961
23/06/1962
06/10/1962
29/12/1962
06/04/1963
10/10/1964
07/11/1964
17/12/1966
06/05/1967
06/05/1967
BRIT 70049 28/07/1954 6J
6A
5A
1B
5A
26A
14D
16D
1A
6J
21D
5A
1A
12A
12B
12A
W
Holyhead
Chester (MR)
Crewe North
Camden
Crewe North
Newton Heath
Neasden
Annesley
Willesden
Holyhead
Aston
Crewe North
Willesden
Carlisle Kingmoor
Carlisle Upperby
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
28/07/1954
07/11/1959
21/11/1959
12/12/1959
16/01/1960
06/02/1960
16/09/1961
23/06/1962
06/10/1962
29/12/1962
25/05/1963
02/11/1963
21/03/1964
10/10/1964
07/11/1964
17/12/1966
09/12/1967
09/12/1967
BRIT 70050 04/08/1954 66A
67A
6J
5A
2D
12A
W
Polmadie
Corkerhill
Holyhead
Crewe North
Banbury
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
04/08/1954
21/04/1962
08/12/1962
05/01/1963
02/10/1965
08/01/1966
06/08/1966
06/08/1966
BRIT 70051 11/08/1954 66A
67A
6J
5A
5B
2D
12A
W
Polmadie
Corkerhill
Holyhead
Crewe North
Crewe South
Banbury
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
11/08/1954
21/04/1962
08/12/1962
05/01/1963
29/05/1965
02/10/1965
08/01/1966
16/12/1967
16/12/1967
BRIT 70052 21/08/1954 66A
67A
5B
2D
12A
W
Polmadie
Corkerhill
Crewe South
Banbury
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
21/08/1954
21/04/1962
29/05/1965
02/10/1965
08/01/1966
01/04/1967
01/04/1967
BRIT 70053 03/09/1954 66A
55A
5A
1A
6J
2B
2D
12A
W
Polmadie
Holbeck (MR)
Crewe North
Willesden
Holyhead
Oxley
Banbury
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
03/09/1954
15/11/1958
18/08/1962
21/03/1964
20/06/1964
19/06/1965
02/10/1965
08/01/1966
15/04/1967
15/04/1967
BRIT 70054 13/09/1954 66A
55A
5A
5B
2D
12A
W
Polmadie
Holbeck (MR)
Crewe North
Crewe South
Banbury
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
13/09/1954
15/11/1958
18/08/1962
29/05/1965
02/10/1965
08/01/1966
26/11/1966
26/11/1966