BR Standard Riddles "Std 6P" Class 4-6-2
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
29/12/1951 | To Service | 72000 | NEW | 66A | Polmadie | ||
29/12/1951 | To Service | 72001 | NEW | 66A | Polmadie | ||
14/01/1952 | To Service | 72002 | NEW | 66A | Polmadie | ||
19/01/1952 | To Service | 72003 | NEW | 66A | Polmadie | ||
02/1952 | To Service | 72005 | NEW | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
02/1952 | To Service | 72007 | NEW | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
02/1952 | To Service | 72008 | NEW | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
02/02/1952 | To Service | 72004 | NEW | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
27/02/1952 | To Service | 72006 | NEW | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
03/1952 | To Service | 72009 | NEW | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
26/10/1957 | Reallocation | 72000 | 66A | Polmadie | 64B | Haymarket | |
26/10/1957 | Reallocation | 72002 | 66A | Polmadie | 64B | Haymarket | |
26/10/1957 | Reallocation | 72005 | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | 64B | Haymarket | |
26/10/1957 | Reallocation | 72006 | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | 64B | Haymarket | |
19/04/1958 | Reallocation | 72005 | 64B | Haymarket | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | |
19/04/1958 | Reallocation | 72006 | 64B | Haymarket | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | |
10/05/1958 | Reallocation | 72000 | 64B | Haymarket | 66A | Polmadie | |
10/05/1958 | Reallocation | 72002 | 64B | Haymarket | 66A | Polmadie | |
10/05/1958 | Reallocation | 72005 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | |
10/05/1958 | Reallocation | 72006 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | |
13/09/1958 | Reallocation | 72009 | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | 30A | Stratford | |
25/10/1958 | Reallocation | 72009 | 30A | Stratford | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | |
21/11/1959 | Reallocation | 72001 | 66A | Polmadie | 64B | Haymarket | |
21/11/1959 | Reallocation | 72002 | 66A | Polmadie | 64B | Haymarket | |
21/11/1959 | Reallocation | 72003 | 66A | Polmadie | 64A | St Margarets | |
21/11/1959 | Reallocation | 72004 | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | 64A | St Margarets | |
19/12/1959 | Reallocation | 72000 | 66A | Polmadie | 64A | St Margarets | |
09/04/1960 | Reallocation | 72000 | 64A | St Margarets | 66A | Polmadie | |
09/04/1960 | Reallocation | 72001 | 64B | Haymarket | 66A | Polmadie | |
09/04/1960 | Reallocation | 72002 | 64B | Haymarket | 66A | Polmadie | |
09/04/1960 | Reallocation | 72003 | 64A | St Margarets | 66A | Polmadie | |
09/04/1960 | Reallocation | 72004 | 64A | St Margarets | 66A | Polmadie | |
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 72000 | 66A | Polmadie | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 72001 | 66A | Polmadie | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 72002 | 66A | Polmadie | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 72003 | 66A | Polmadie | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 72004 | 66A | Polmadie | COND | ||
01/05/1965 | Condemned | 72005 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | COND | ||
28/08/1965 | Condemned | 72009 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | COND | ||
04/12/1965 | Condemned | 72007 | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | COND | ||
16/04/1966 | Condemned | 72008 | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | COND | ||
21/05/1966 | Condemned | 72006 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | COND |