Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 327 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 5932 Week
» 17479 Month
» 417161 Year
» 493748 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

D16/2 1Co-Co1


BR (Pre 1955) Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
10201 30/12/1950 73A
70A
1B
1A

W
Stewarts Lane (New)
Nine Elms
Camden
Willesden

Withdrawn
30/12/1950
19/03/1952
23/04/1955
21/11/1959
15/10/1962
07/12/1963
07/12/1963
10202 15/09/1951 17A
70A
1B
1A

W
Derby (New)
Nine Elms
Camden
Willesden

Withdrawn
15/09/1951
19/03/1952
23/04/1955
21/11/1959
11/11/1962
07/12/1963
07/12/1963
10203 07/1954 70A
1B
1A

W
Nine Elms (New)
Camden
Willesden

Withdrawn
07/1954
13/08/1955
21/11/1959
15/10/1962
07/12/1963
07/12/1963