Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 315 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 5920 Week
» 17467 Month
» 417149 Year
» 493736 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

D16/2 1Co-Co1


Date Number (at time) Depot (at time) Code Details Ref Link
Sat 25/03/1961 10201 1A   Stabled in the roundhouse at Willesden - All over green, lined orange and black The Early Years of London Diesels  
Fri 15/12/1961 10202 1A   Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Test house. SLS 1/1962  
Fri 06/04/1962 10203 1A   Derby Works visit: Around the works - Test house. SLS 5/1962  
Fri 08/06/1962 10201,
10203
1A,
1A
  Derby Works visit: Around the works - Klondyke Sidings. SLS 7/1962