MR/LMS Johnson "3F" Class 0-6-0
Class | LMS | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
3F | 3723 | 43723 | 1901 | 19E 16A 18C 18A W |
Belle Vue Nottingham Hasland Toton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/11/1948 22/03/1952 21/05/1955 03/09/1955 |
03/09/1955 |
3F | 3191 | 43191 | 09/1888 | 17A W |
Derby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/05/1954 |
22/05/1954 |
3F | 3192 | 43192 | 09/1888 | 16A 9B W |
Nottingham Stockport Edgeley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/02/1957 22/08/1959 |
22/08/1959 |
3F | 3193 | 43193 | 10/1888 | 16D 19A 19A 16D 15A 15B 15B 17B 18B W |
Mansfield Sheffield Grimesthorpe Sheffield Grimesthorpe Mansfield Wellingborough Kettering Kettering Burton Westhouses Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/11/1948 11/12/1948 15/01/1949 11/02/1950 02/06/1951 16/06/1951 22/03/1952 03/12/1955 22/03/1958 |
22/03/1958 |
3F | 3200 | 43200 | 1890 | 17A W |
Derby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/04/1961 |
29/04/1961 |
3F | 3203 | 43203 | 1890 | 21A 21B 41B W |
Saltley Bournville Sheffield Grimesthorpe Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/01/1949 08/03/1958 01/10/1960 |
01/10/1960 |
3F | 3205 | 43205 | 1890 | 15C W |
Leicester Midland Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/12/1959 |
19/12/1959 |
3F | 3207 | 43207 | 1890 | 8B 5B 5B 9G 5B 9G W |
Warrington Dallam Crewe South Crewe South Northwich Crewe South Gorton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/12/1949 14/01/1950 25/02/1956 11/08/1956 10/01/1959 05/1960 |
05/1960 |
3F | 3208 | 43208 | 1890 | 19C W |
Canklow Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/08/1958 |
09/08/1958 |
3F | 3210 | 43210 | 1890 | 21A W |
Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/08/1959 |
08/08/1959 |
3F | 3212 | 43212 | 1890 | 18C 9F W |
Hasland Heaton Mersey Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/01/1959 09/07/1960 |
09/07/1960 |
3F | 3213 | 43213 | 1890 | 22B 10D 9D W |
Gloucester Barnwood Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Buxton (LNWR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/01/1958 08/10/1960 19/05/1962 |
19/05/1962 |
3F | 3214 | 43214 | 1890 | 17B 21A W |
Burton Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/10/1948 17/06/1961 |
17/06/1961 |
3F | 3219 | 43219 | 1890 | 18C 21A W |
Hasland Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/10/1953 28/11/1959 |
28/11/1959 |
3F | 3222 | 43222 | 1890 | 15D 41B W |
Bedford Sheffield Grimesthorpe Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/04/1958 27/06/1959 |
27/06/1959 |
3F | 3223 | 43223 | 1890 | 21A W |
Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/06/1959 |
13/06/1959 |
3F | 3224 | 43224 | 1890 | 18D W |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/11/1957 |
30/11/1957 |
3F | 3225 | 43225 | 1890 | 21A 21D 21A 19A 19A 19C 19C W |
Saltley Stratford-on-Avon (LMS) Saltley Sheffield Grimesthorpe Sheffield Grimesthorpe Canklow Canklow Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 18/06/1949 17/05/1952 14/06/1952 01/11/1952 29/11/1952 29/04/1961 |
29/04/1961 |
3F | 3226 | 43226 | 1890 | 20G 18A 17A W |
Hellifield Toton Derby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/06/1948 01/10/1949 15/09/1956 |
15/09/1956 |
3F | 3231 | 43231 | 1890 | 20B 20G 17A 3E 3E 8B W |
Stourton Hellifield Derby Monument Lane Monument Lane Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
08/02/1936 01/01/1948 22/01/1949 14/01/1950 04/02/1950 25/01/1958 11/10/1958 |
11/10/1958 |
3F | 3232 | 43232 | 1890 | 15C W |
Leicester Midland Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/09/1956 |
03/09/1956 |
3F | 3233 | 43233 | 1890 | 20C W |
Royston Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/1959 |
11/1959 |
3F | 3234 | 43234 | 1890 | 18D 41B 41D W |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) Sheffield Grimesthorpe Canklow Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/09/1959 07/01/1961 04/02/1961 |
04/02/1961 |
3F | 3235 | 43235 | 1890 | 18B 18A 9G W |
Westhouses Toton Gorton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/06/1959 07/11/1959 20/08/1960 |
20/08/1960 |
3F | 3237 | 43237 | 1890 | 11A 4A 8B 8B W |
Carnforth Shrewsbury Warrington Dallam Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/03/1948 27/11/1948 11/12/1948 30/05/1959 |
30/05/1959 |
3F | 3239 | 43239 | 1890 | 16D W |
Mansfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/12/1957 |
28/12/1957 |
3F | 3240 | 43240 | 1890 | 18D 18A 18A 16A 3E 11A 12A 8B W |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) Toton Toton Nottingham Monument Lane Carnforth Carlisle Kingmoor Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/01/1950 21/01/1950 08/07/1950 18/05/1957 10/08/1957 20/06/1959 15/10/1960 29/09/1962 |
29/09/1962 |
3F | 3241 | 43241 | 1890 | 19A 68A W |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/05/1953 20/06/1959 |
20/06/1959 |
3F | 3242 | 43242 | 1890 | 18D 18A 18A 16C 21A W |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) Toton Toton Kirkby in Ashfield Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/01/1950 21/01/1950 07/10/1950 10/01/1959 04/08/1962 |
04/08/1962 |
3F | 3243 | 43243 | 1890 | 19C 19A W |
Canklow Sheffield Grimesthorpe Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/04/1955 30/07/1960 |
30/07/1960 |
3F | 3244 | 43244 | 1890 | 17B 15B 15C W |
Burton Kettering Leicester Midland Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/07/1952 25/02/1956 10/01/1959 |
10/01/1959 |
3F | 3245 | 43245 | 1890 | 14C 9F 9G W |
St Albans Heaton Mersey Gorton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/01/1959 10/12/1960 01/04/1961 |
01/04/1961 |
3F | 3246 | 43246 | 1890 | 14A 21A 21B 21A W |
Cricklewood East Saltley Bournville Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/10/1948 21/02/1953 16/05/1953 27/10/1956 |
27/10/1956 |
3F | 3247 | 43247 | 1890 | 17B W |
Burton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/11/1959 |
21/11/1959 |
3F | 3249 | 43249 | 1890 | 16A 15B W |
Nottingham Kettering Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/04/1958 19/12/1959 |
19/12/1959 |
3F | 3250 | 43250 | 1890 | 20C 17C W |
Royston Rowsley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/12/1959 13/05/1961 |
13/05/1961 |
3F | 3251 | 43251 | 1890 | 20F 18A 18A 16D 18A 18A W |
Skipton Toton Toton Mansfield Toton Toton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/06/1950 17/06/1950 07/10/1950 10/03/1951 24/03/1951 19/12/1959 |
19/12/1959 |
3F | 3252 | 43252 | 1890 | 18D 19A W |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) Sheffield Grimesthorpe Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/09/1953 18/06/1955 |
18/06/1955 |
3F | 3253 | 43253 | 1890 | 16B 18B 18B 21A W |
Spital Bridge Westhouses Westhouses Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/11/1948 11/12/1948 07/02/1959 02/05/1959 |
02/05/1959 |
3F | 3254 | 43254 | 1890 | 18B 19A 41D 17B 17A W |
Westhouses Sheffield Grimesthorpe Canklow Burton Derby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/12/1954 16/09/1961 11/11/1961 07/04/1962 18/08/1962 |
18/08/1962 |
3F | 3256 | 43256 | 1890 | 17B W |
Burton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/02/1960 |
27/02/1960 |
3F | 3257 | 43257 | 1890 | 22B 21A 20F 20F 24J 8B 9D 8B W |
Gloucester Barnwood Saltley Skipton Skipton Lancaster Green Ayre Warrington Dallam Buxton (LNWR) Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/10/1948 17/05/1952 14/06/1952 12/07/1958 07/11/1959 16/09/1961 23/09/1961 29/09/1962 |
29/09/1962 |
3F | 3258 | 43258 | 12/1890 | 22B 10D W |
Gloucester Barnwood Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/01/1958 18/07/1959 |
18/07/1959 |
3F | 3259 | 43259 | 12/1890 | 18A 17A W |
Toton Derby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/10/1949 16/02/1957 |
16/02/1957 |
3F | 3261 | 43261 | 1891 | 14A 15D 15D 14A 15C 14E 9G W |
Cricklewood East Bedford Bedford Cricklewood East Leicester Midland Bedford Gorton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/09/1951 06/10/1951 26/01/1952 10/01/1959 31/10/1959 24/09/1960 08/12/1962 |
08/12/1962 |
3F | 3263 | 43263 | 1891 | 22B 21A 21B 21B 21A W |
Gloucester Barnwood Saltley Bournville Bournville Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/10/1948 29/01/1949 12/07/1952 07/11/1959 02/06/1962 |
02/06/1962 |
3F | 3265 | 43265 | 1891 | 14A W |
Cricklewood East Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/05/1948 |
29/05/1948 |
3F | 3266 | 43266 | 1891 | 18B W |
Westhouses Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/03/1961 |
18/03/1961 |
3F | 3267 | 43267 | 1891 | 20B 20C W |
Stourton Royston Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/01/1953 22/04/1961 |
22/04/1961 |
3F | 3268 | 43268 | 1891 | 9D W |
Buxton (LNWR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/06/1961 |
17/06/1961 |
3F | 3269 | 43269 | 1891 | 9D W |
Buxton (LNWR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/05/1948 |
29/05/1948 |
3F | 3271 | 43271 | 1891 | 9D 11E 24H W |
Buxton (LNWR) Lancaster Green Ayre Hellifield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/01/1954 03/10/1959 19/12/1959 |
19/12/1959 |
3F | 3273 | 43273 | 1891 | 17A 17D 17D W |
Derby Rowsley Rowsley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/11/1948 11/12/1948 22/10/1955 |
22/10/1955 |
3F | 3274 | 43274 | 1891 | 9D W |
Buxton (LNWR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/01/1959 |
10/01/1959 |
3F | 3275 | 43275 | 1891 | 9A W |
Longsight Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/01/1956 |
14/01/1956 |
3F | 3277 | 43277 | 1891 | 21D 21B 84G 85C 84G 15C W |
Stratford-on-Avon (LMS) Bournville Shrewsbury Hereford Shrewsbury Leicester Midland Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/04/1952 17/05/1952 30/06/1952 31/10/1953 22/02/1959 15/07/1961 |
15/07/1961 |
3F | 3278 | 43278 | 1891 | 9D W |
Buxton (LNWR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/12/1959 |
19/12/1959 |
3F | 3281 | 43281 | 1891 | 9B W |
Stockport Edgeley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/12/1956 |
22/12/1956 |
3F | 3282 | 43282 | 1891 | 9D 8B 8B W |
Buxton (LNWR) Warrington Dallam Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/06/1950 17/06/1950 13/10/1962 |
13/10/1962 |
3F | 3283 | 43283 | 1891 | 8B W |
Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/08/1953 |
29/08/1953 |
3F | 3284 | 43284 | 1891 | 21A W |
Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/06/1961 |
03/06/1961 |
3F | 3286 | 43286 | 1891 | 17B W |
Burton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/09/1957 |
14/09/1957 |
3F | 3287 | 43287 | 1891 | 18A 16C W |
Toton Kirkby in Ashfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/10/1950 19/12/1959 |
19/12/1959 |
3F | 3290 | 43290 | 1891 | 17D W |
Rowsley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/12/1957 |
28/12/1957 |
3F | 3292 | 43292 | 1891 | 18D 18A 17C 17A W |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) Toton Coalville Derby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/01/1954 16/07/1955 25/02/1956 03/1959 |
03/1959 |
3F | 3293 | 43293 | 1891 | 20H W |
Lancaster Green Ayre Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/12/1953 |
05/12/1953 |
3F | 3294 | 43294 | 1891 | 18D 17A 10D W |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) Derby Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/06/1954 25/01/1958 14/11/1959 |
14/11/1959 |
3F | 3295 | 43295 | 1891 | 20F 24J 8B W |
Skipton Lancaster Green Ayre Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/07/1958 07/11/1959 28/10/1961 |
28/10/1961 |
3F | 3296 | 43296 | 1891 | 9D W |
Buxton (LNWR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/03/1954 |
13/03/1954 |
3F | 3297 | 43297 | 1891 | 18D W |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/06/1950 |
10/06/1950 |
3F | 3298 | 43298 | 1891 | 18D W |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/11/1955 |
26/11/1955 |
3F | 3299 | 43299 | 1891 | 18D W |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/08/1954 |
14/08/1954 |
3F | 3300 | 43300 | 10/1891 | 19C 16A 9D W |
Canklow Nottingham Buxton (LNWR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/07/1950 24/04/1954 13/12/1958 |
13/12/1958 |
3F | 3301 | 43301 | 10/1891 | 20D 20E 20E 68A W |
Normanton Manningham Manningham Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/06/1951 16/06/1951 16/05/1953 25/10/1958 |
25/10/1958 |
3F | 3305 | 43305 | 12/1891 | 18A 16C 16C 9B W |
Toton Kirkby in Ashfield Kirkby in Ashfield Stockport Edgeley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/09/1950 07/10/1950 18/05/1957 02/04/1960 |
02/04/1960 |
3F | 3306 | 43306 | 12/1891 | 17B 17A W |
Burton Derby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/03/1959 11/03/1961 |
11/03/1961 |
3F | 3307 | 43307 | 12/1891 | 20H 14C 14A 41B W |
Lancaster Green Ayre St Albans Cricklewood East Sheffield Grimesthorpe Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/03/1950 15/04/1950 08/03/1958 30/07/1960 |
30/07/1960 |
3F | 3308 | 43308 | 01/1892 | 17A 3D 3D 2B 8B W |
Derby Aston Aston Nuneaton Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/01/1950 04/02/1950 29/12/1956 23/02/1957 17/10/1959 |
17/10/1959 |
3F | 3309 | 43309 | 01/1892 | 18D 18A 18A 21A W |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) Toton Toton Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/04/1951 19/05/1951 07/11/1959 01/04/1961 |
01/04/1961 |
3F | 3310 | 43310 | 01/1892 | 18D W |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/12/1955 |
10/12/1955 |
3F | 3312 | 43312 | 01/1892 | 17A 17B 17A W |
Derby Burton Derby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/02/1952 26/02/1955 18/01/1958 |
18/01/1958 |
3F | 3313 | 43313 | 01/1892 | 14A 15D W |
Cricklewood East Bedford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/03/1954 14/04/1956 |
14/04/1956 |
3F | 3314 | 43314 | 28/02/1892 | 8B W |
Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/04/1960 |
02/04/1960 |
3F | 3315 | 43315 | 28/02/1892 | 17A W |
Derby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/08/1959 |
22/08/1959 |
3F | 3317 | 43317 | 28/02/1892 | 16A 16B 18B 18B W |
Nottingham Spital Bridge Westhouses Westhouses Withdrawn |
02/11/1935 01/01/1948 20/11/1948 11/12/1948 15/10/1955 |
15/10/1955 |
3F | 3318 | 43318 | 28/02/1892 | 17A W |
Derby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/08/1959 |
22/08/1959 |
3F | 3319 | 43319 | 28/02/1892 | 16B W |
Spital Bridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/12/1950 |
09/12/1950 |
3F | 3321 | 43321 | 03/1892 | 21A 21C 21A 21A 20D 20C 20D 21A W |
Saltley Bromsgrove Saltley Saltley Normanton Royston Normanton Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/04/1949 10/06/1950 17/06/1950 03/11/1951 11/07/1953 31/12/1955 05/12/1959 18/02/1961 |
18/02/1961 |
3F | 3323 | 43323 | 03/1892 | 17A 17D W |
Derby Rowsley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/12/1956 06/1958 |
06/1958 |
3F | 3324 | 43324 | 03/1892 | 17A W |
Derby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/04/1959 |
04/04/1959 |
3F | 3325 | 43325 | 03/1892 | 19C 19A 9A 1C W |
Canklow Sheffield Grimesthorpe Longsight Watford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/12/1955 28/01/1956 12/07/1958 18/02/1961 |
18/02/1961 |
3F | 3326 | 43326 | 03/1892 | 15C W |
Leicester Midland Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/07/1960 |
30/07/1960 |
3F | 3327 | 43327 | 03/1892 | 18A 16D 16D 17B W |
Toton Mansfield Mansfield Burton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/09/1950 07/10/1950 22/03/1952 19/12/1959 |
19/12/1959 |
3F | 3329 | 43329 | 04/1892 | 11A 8B 9D W |
Carnforth Warrington Dallam Buxton (LNWR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/04/1948 30/11/1957 04/06/1960 |
04/06/1960 |
3F | 3330 | 43330 | 04/1892 | 20H 5B 99C 5B 9G 2F 9G W |
Lancaster Green Ayre Crewe South Crewe Works Crewe South Gorton Woodford Halse Gorton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/02/1952 22/03/1958 01/11/1958 10/01/1959 14/02/1959 02/07/1960 26/08/1961 |
26/08/1961 |
3F | 3331 | 43331 | 05/1892 | 18B W |
Westhouses Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/12/1955 |
03/12/1955 |
3F | 3332 | 43332 | 05/1892 | 20C 19A W |
Royston Sheffield Grimesthorpe Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/01/1954 10/05/1958 |
10/05/1958 |
3F | 3333 | 43333 | 05/1892 | 15C 15B 14E W |
Leicester Midland Kettering Bedford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/03/1958 24/10/1959 21/01/1961 |
21/01/1961 |
3F | 3334 | 43334 | 05/1892 | 19A W |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/03/1956 |
10/03/1956 |
3F | 3335 | 43335 | 05/1892 | 20G 19A 19A W |
Hellifield Sheffield Grimesthorpe Sheffield Grimesthorpe Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/11/1948 11/12/1948 22/08/1959 |
22/08/1959 |
3F | 3336 | 43336 | 05/1892 | 21A W |
Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/08/1952 |
23/08/1952 |
3F | 3337 | 43337 | 06/1892 | 20F 22B W |
Skipton Gloucester Barnwood Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/02/1950 20/02/1960 |
17/02/1960 |
3F | 3338 | 43338 | 06/1892 | 17D W |
Rowsley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/03/1948 |
27/03/1948 |
3F | 3339 | 43339 | 06/1892 | 21A W |
Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/08/1959 |
22/08/1959 |
3F | 3340 | 43340 | 1891 | 17B W |
Burton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/10/1960 |
15/10/1960 |
3F | 3341 | 43341 | 1891 | 16D 19B 19A W |
Mansfield Sheffield Millhouses Sheffield Grimesthorpe Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/01/1949 04/10/1952 25/09/1957 |
25/09/1957 |
3F | 3342 | 43342 | 1891 | 17D 14E 17A 14E 17A W |
Rowsley Bedford Derby Bedford Derby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/12/1962 26/01/1963 16/02/1963 11/05/1963 24/08/1963 |
24/08/1963 |
3F | 3344 | 43344 | 1891 | 22B 21A 22A 8G W |
Gloucester Barnwood Saltley Bristol Barrow Road Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/01/1954 09/10/1954 26/03/1960 07/05/1960 |
07/05/1960 |
3F | 3351 | 43351 | 1891 | 20E 68A W |
Manningham Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/05/1953 10/12/1955 |
10/12/1955 |
3F | 3355 | 43355 | 1891 | 21B 21A W |
Bournville Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/01/1959 02/05/1959 |
02/05/1959 |
3F | 3356 | 43356 | 1891 | 22D W |
Templecombe (S&D) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/07/1958 |
19/07/1958 |
3F | 3357 | 43357 | 1891 | 8B 9B W |
Warrington Dallam Stockport Edgeley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/08/1953 02/1959 |
02/1959 |
3F | 3359 | 43359 | 1891 | 21B 21A W |
Bournville Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/11/1959 20/08/1960 |
20/08/1960 |
3F | 3361 | 43361 | 1891 | 19E 16A 17A 17B 41B 41D 41B W |
Belle Vue Nottingham Derby Burton Sheffield Grimesthorpe Canklow Sheffield Grimesthorpe Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/11/1948 01/10/1949 16/07/1955 08/03/1958 12/04/1958 05/09/1959 15/10/1960 |
15/10/1960 |
3F | 3364 | 43364 | 1891 | 17A W |
Derby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/12/1953 |
26/12/1953 |
3F | 3367 | 43367 | 1891 | 15A 15B W |
Wellingborough Kettering Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/08/1955 04/01/1958 |
04/01/1958 |
3F | 3368 | 43368 | 1891 | 17A W |
Derby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/11/1961 |
14/11/1961 |
3F | 3369 | 43369 | 1891 | 16A 19C W |
Nottingham Canklow Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/04/1957 08/08/1959 |
08/08/1959 |
3F | 3370 | 43370 | 1892 | 17A 17D W |
Derby Rowsley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/04/1948 21/11/1959 |
21/11/1959 |
3F | 3371 | 43371 | 1892 | 16B 16A 16A 19C W |
Spital Bridge Nottingham Nottingham Canklow Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/06/1950 17/06/1950 20/04/1957 26/08/1961 |
26/08/1961 |
3F | 3373 | 43373 | 1892 | 22B 14E 14E W |
Gloucester Barnwood Bedford Bedford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/10/1959 07/11/1959 21/05/1960 |
21/05/1960 |
3F | 3374 | 43374 | 1892 | 21A 15C W |
Saltley Leicester Midland Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/03/1959 24/06/1961 |
24/06/1961 |
3F | 3378 | 43378 | 1892 | 16A 6K W |
Nottingham Rhyl Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/05/1957 19/12/1959 |
19/12/1959 |
3F | 3379 | 43379 | 1892 | 18B 20G 18B 16C 16C 17A 21A W |
Westhouses Hellifield (on loan) Westhouses Kirkby in Ashfield Kirkby in Ashfield Derby Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/08/1948 13/11/1948 28/04/1951 19/05/1951 11/08/1951 10/01/1959 28/11/1959 |
28/11/1959 |
3F | 3381 | 43381 | 1892 | 21D 21A 21A W |
Stratford-on-Avon (LMS) Saltley Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/02/1951 28/02/1951 27/06/1959 |
27/06/1959 |
3F | 3386 | 43386 | 1892 | 18D W |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/04/1961 |
22/04/1961 |
3F | 3387 | 43387 | 1892 | 9D 8B W |
Buxton (LNWR) Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/11/1957 19/12/1959 |
19/12/1959 |
3F | 3388 | 43388 | 1892 | 17B 19A W |
Burton Sheffield Grimesthorpe Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/01/1954 12/09/1959 |
12/09/1959 |
3F | 3389 | 43389 | 1892 | 8B 3D 5B 9G 2F 21A W |
Warrington Dallam Aston Crewe South Gorton Woodford Halse Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/08/1953 22/03/1958 10/01/1959 14/02/1959 18/07/1959 04/08/1962 |
04/08/1962 |
3F | 3392 | 43392 | 1892 | 20B W |
Stourton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/01/1958 |
25/01/1958 |
3F | 3394 | 43394 | 1892 | 4A 5B 9G 2F W |
Shrewsbury Crewe South Gorton Woodford Halse Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/08/1958 10/01/1959 14/02/1959 09/07/1960 |
09/07/1960 |
3F | 3395 | 43395 | 1892 | 17B 41B 41D 41B W |
Burton Sheffield Grimesthorpe Canklow Sheffield Grimesthorpe Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/03/1958 12/04/1958 05/09/1959 11/03/1961 |
11/03/1961 |
3F | 3396 | 43396 | 1892 | 7D W |
Rhyl Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/08/1957 |
17/08/1957 |
3F | 3398 | 43398 | 1892 | 8B W |
Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/12/1959 |
05/12/1959 |
3F | 3399 | 43399 | 1892 | 16A 2E W |
Nottingham Northampton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/04/1954 27/08/1960 |
27/08/1960 |
3F | 3400 | 43400 | 1893 | 14A 17D 17D 9E 9G W |
Cricklewood East Rowsley Rowsley Trafford Park (LMS) Gorton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/12/1952 03/01/1953 10/01/1959 02/04/1960 10/03/1962 |
10/03/1962 |
3F | 3401 | 43401 | 1893 | 20A 16A W |
Holbeck (MR) Nottingham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/07/1950 27/04/1957 |
27/04/1957 |
3F | 3402 | 43402 | 1893 | 17A W |
Derby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/04/1957 |
13/04/1957 |
3F | 3405 | 43405 | 1893 | 18A 15C W |
Toton Leicester Midland Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/02/1959 18/02/1961 |
18/02/1961 |
3F | 3406 | 43406 | 1893 | 17A 17B 41B W |
Derby Burton Sheffield Grimesthorpe Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/02/1952 08/03/1958 20/02/1960 |
20/02/1960 |
3F | 3408 | 43408 | 1893 | 14A 20B 20B W |
Cricklewood East Stourton Stourton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/12/1948 18/12/1948 08/04/1950 |
08/04/1950 |
3F | 3410 | 43410 | 1892 | 3C 5B 9B 8B W |
Ryecroft (Walsall) Crewe South Stockport Edgeley Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 04/10/1958 17/09/1960 24/03/1962 |
24/03/1962 |
3F | 3411 | 43411 | 1892 | 15C W |
Leicester Midland Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/05/1961 |
27/05/1961 |
3F | 3419 | 43419 | 1892 | 22A 22E 71H W |
Bristol Barrow Road Highbridge Templecombe (S&D) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/10/1949 11/06/1956 06/09/1958 |
06/09/1958 |
3F | 3427 | 43427 | 1892 | 22B 22D 22A 82G 85E 82G W |
Gloucester Barnwood Templecombe (S&D) Bristol Barrow Road Templecombe (S&D) Gloucester Barnwood Templecombe (S&D) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/02/1948 29/05/1948 01/11/1958 26/03/1960 18/06/1960 01/07/1961 |
27/06/1961 |
3F | 3428 | 43428 | 1892 | 15D W |
Bedford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/12/1962 |
08/12/1962 |
3F | 3429 | 43429 | 1892 | 17C 17A 17D W |
Coalville Derby Rowsley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/01/1954 05/11/1955 23/04/1960 |
23/04/1960 |
3F | 3431 | 43431 | 1893 | 16D 41B W |
Mansfield Sheffield Grimesthorpe Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/03/1958 20/02/1960 |
20/02/1960 |
3F | 3433 | 43433 | 1893 | 21A W |
Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/12/1959 |
05/12/1959 |
3F | 3435 | 43435 | 1893 | 21A 17A 14E 21A W |
Saltley Derby Bedford Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/04/1959 11/04/1961 15/07/1961 21/04/1962 |
21/04/1962 |
3F | 3436 | 43436 | 1893 | 22A 71H 24B W |
Bristol Barrow Road Templecombe (S&D) Rose Grove Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/12/1952 14/07/1961 30/06/1962 |
30/06/1962 |
3F | 3439 | 43439 | 1893 | 22A W |
Bristol Barrow Road Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/06/1948 |
19/06/1948 |
3F | 3440 | 43440 | 1893 | 14A 14E W |
Cricklewood East Bedford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/01/1959 05/12/1959 |
05/12/1959 |
3F | 3441 | 43441 | 1893 | 21A W |
Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/11/1958 |
29/11/1958 |
3F | 3443 | 43443 | 1893 | 21A W |
Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/12/1957 |
14/12/1957 |
3F | 3444 | 43444 | 1893 | 22A 21A 22A W |
Bristol Barrow Road Saltley Bristol Barrow Road Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/11/1953 09/10/1954 22/11/1960 |
22/11/1960 |
3F | 3446 | 43446 | 1893 | 20C W |
Royston Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/04/1962 |
17/04/1962 |
3F | 3448 | 43448 | 1893 | 14A W |
Cricklewood East Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/01/1954 |
16/01/1954 |
3F | 3449 | 43449 | 1893 | 20B 20D 14E W |
Stourton Normanton Bedford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/01/1953 05/12/1959 08/09/1962 |
08/09/1962 |
3F | 3453 | 43453 | 1893 | 18A 21A 14E W |
Toton Saltley Bedford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/11/1959 22/09/1962 02/03/1963 |
02/03/1963 |
3F | 3454 | 43454 | 1893 | 20A 20E 15C 15C 15D W |
Holbeck (MR) Manningham Leicester Midland Leicester Midland Bedford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/07/1948 10/12/1949 24/12/1949 23/02/1952 12/02/1955 |
12/02/1955 |
3F | 3456 | 43456 | 1893 | 20B 14E 9G W |
Stourton Bedford Gorton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/12/1959 12/03/1960 23/04/1960 |
23/04/1960 |
3F | 3457 | 43457 | 1893 | 9A 9G W |
Longsight Gorton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/10/1958 04/06/1960 |
04/06/1960 |
3F | 3458 | 43458 | 1893 | 16A W |
Nottingham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/1949 |
04/1949 |
3F | 3459 | 43459 | 1893 | 17A W |
Derby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/04/1961 |
08/04/1961 |
3F | 3462 | 43462 | 1894 | 22D 22A 21C W |
Templecombe (S&D) Bristol Barrow Road Bromsgrove Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/05/1948 24/04/1954 07/04/1956 |
07/04/1956 |
3F | 3463 | 43463 | 1894 | 19B 19A 19C 19C W |
Sheffield Millhouses Sheffield Grimesthorpe Canklow Canklow Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/01/1949 01/11/1952 29/11/1952 09/02/1957 |
09/02/1957 |
3F | 3464 | 43464 | 1894 | 22A 5B 99C 5B W |
Bristol Barrow Road Crewe South Crewe Works Crewe South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/08/1958 04/10/1958 27/12/1958 31/03/1962 |
31/03/1962 |
3F | 3468 | 43468 | 1894 | 19A 16C 21A W |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe Kirkby in Ashfield Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/04/1950 10/01/1959 27/05/1961 |
27/05/1961 |
3F | 3469 | 43469 | 1894 | 17A 17B W |
Derby Burton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/06/1954 09/03/1957 |
09/03/1957 |
3F | 3474 | 43474 | 1896 | 15D W |
Bedford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/03/1961 |
18/03/1961 |
3F | 3476 | 43476 | 1896 | 20B 20C W |
Stourton Royston Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/01/1953 18/05/1957 |
18/05/1957 |
3F | 3482 | 43482 | 1896 | 17A 21A W |
Derby Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/07/1954 01/04/1961 |
01/04/1961 |
3F | 3484 | 43484 | 1896 | 21A W |
Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/07/1960 |
30/07/1960 |
3F | 3490 | 43490 | 1896 | 21A W |
Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/12/1959 |
19/12/1959 |
3F | 3491 | 43491 | 1896 | 21A 84G 85C 84G W |
Saltley Shrewsbury Hereford Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/05/1952 30/06/1952 31/10/1953 01/02/1958 |
01/02/1958 |
3F | 3494 | 43494 | 1896 | 16C 16D 17B W |
Kirkby in Ashfield Mansfield Burton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/03/1951 24/04/1954 26/11/1955 |
26/11/1955 |
3F | 3496 | 43496 | 1896 | 17A 17D W |
Derby Rowsley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/07/1953 04/08/1962 |
04/08/1962 |
3F | 3497 | 43497 | 1896 | 20D W |
Normanton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/12/1955 |
03/12/1955 |
3F | 3499 | 43499 | 1896 | 18A 15B 9G W |
Toton Kettering Gorton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/11/1959 18/06/1960 04/08/1962 |
04/08/1962 |
3F | 3502 | 43502 | 1896 | 3C 11E 24F W |
Ryecroft (Walsall) Lancaster Green Ayre Fleetwood Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/04/1955 03/10/1959 19/12/1959 |
19/12/1959 |
3F | 3506 | 43506 | 1897 | 22B 10D W |
Gloucester Barnwood Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/01/1958 02/05/1959 |
02/05/1959 |
3F | 3507 | 43507 | 1897 | 22B 21A W |
Gloucester Barnwood Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/10/1948 23/09/1961 |
23/09/1961 |
3F | 3509 | 43509 | 1897 | 20C 20E 20D 20D W |
Royston Manningham Normanton Normanton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/03/1948 10/12/1949 24/12/1949 12/03/1960 |
12/03/1960 |
3F | 3510 | 43510 | 1897 | 17A W |
Derby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/05/1962 |
12/05/1962 |
3F | 3514 | 43514 | 1897 | 20D 68A 8B 9D W |
Normanton Carlisle Kingmoor Warrington Dallam Buxton (LNWR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/11/1952 15/10/1960 23/09/1961 13/10/1962 |
13/10/1962 |
3F | 3515 | 43515 | 1897 | 18D W |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/04/1961 |
29/04/1961 |
3F | 3520 | 43520 | 1897 | 21D 21B 21A 22B 14E W |
Stratford-on-Avon (LMS) Bournville Saltley Gloucester Barnwood Bedford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/02/1953 05/09/1953 03/12/1955 24/10/1959 05/12/1959 |
05/12/1959 |
3F | 3521 | 43521 | 1897 | 21D 21B 21B 21A 14E 17A W |
Stratford-on-Avon (LMS) Bournville Bournville Saltley Bedford Derby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/04/1952 12/07/1952 20/02/1960 22/09/1962 06/04/1963 06/07/1963 |
06/07/1963 |
3F | 3522 | 43522 | 1897 | 16D W |
Mansfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/09/1958 |
27/09/1958 |
3F | 3523 | 43523 | 1897 | 21D 21A 21A 21B 21A W |
Stratford-on-Avon (LMS) Saltley Saltley Bournville Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/02/1951 28/02/1951 28/12/1957 05/09/1959 20/08/1960 |
20/08/1960 |
3F | 3524 | 43524 | 1897 | 18D W |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/11/1955 |
05/11/1955 |
3F | 3529 | 43529 | 1897 | 16D 15D 21A W |
Mansfield Bedford Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/09/1954 27/08/1960 26/08/1961 |
26/08/1961 |
3F | 3531 | 43531 | 1897 | 21A 15A 15A 15D W |
Saltley Wellingborough Wellingborough Bedford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/05/1952 14/06/1952 08/10/1955 31/10/1959 |
31/10/1959 |
3F | 3538 | 43538 | 1897 | 16A 35C 35C 9G 9D W |
Nottingham Spital Bridge Spital Bridge Northwich Buxton (LNWR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/01/1951 17/02/1951 29/11/1952 17/01/1959 05/12/1959 |
05/12/1959 |
3F | 3540 | 43540 | 1897 | 21A W |
Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/02/1953 |
21/02/1953 |
3F | 3544 | 43544 | 1897 | 21A W |
Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/12/1955 |
03/12/1955 |
3F | 3546 | 43546 | 1897 | 18D W |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/11/1956 |
24/11/1956 |
3F | 3548 | 43548 | 1897 | 17A W |
Derby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/03/1961 |
04/03/1961 |
3F | 3550 | 43550 | 1897 | 17A 16A 17A W |
Derby Nottingham Derby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/11/1948 01/10/1949 22/12/1956 |
22/12/1956 |
3F | 3553 | 43553 | 1897 | 20C 20E W |
Royston Manningham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/03/1956 14/02/1959 |
14/02/1959 |
3F | 3558 | 43558 | 1897 | 16D 16A 16A 21A 9F W |
Mansfield Nottingham Nottingham Saltley Heaton Mersey Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/06/1950 17/06/1950 29/12/1956 10/01/1959 22/08/1959 |
22/08/1959 |
3F | 3562 | 43562 | 1897 | 21B 16A 9D 9D 5B 9G 9D W |
Bournville Nottingham Buxton (LNWR) Buxton (LNWR) Crewe South Gorton Buxton (LNWR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/11/1948 14/01/1950 04/02/1950 08/08/1953 10/01/1959 14/02/1959 18/02/1961 |
18/02/1961 |
3F | 3565 | 43565 | 1897 | 14A 14C 14E W |
Cricklewood East St Albans Bedford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/10/1951 10/01/1959 23/06/1962 |
23/06/1962 |
3F | 3568 | 43568 | 1897 | 21D 21B 21A W |
Stratford-on-Avon (LMS) Bournville Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/02/1953 05/09/1953 21/05/1955 |
21/05/1955 |
3F | 3570 | 43570 | 08/1899 | 11A 4A 17B 17A W |
Carnforth Shrewsbury Burton Derby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/01/1948 21/02/1959 12/03/1960 04/06/1960 |
04/06/1960 |
3F | 3572 | 43572 | 08/1899 | 17A 9F 9E W |
Derby Heaton Mersey Trafford Park (LMS) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/01/1959 07/11/1959 26/11/1960 |
26/11/1960 |
3F | 3573 | 43573 | 08/1899 | W 4A |
Withdrawn Shrewsbury |
01/1948 01/01/1948 |
01/1948 |
3F | 3574 | 43574 | 08/1899 | 17A 17B W |
Derby Burton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/02/1952 19/11/1960 |
19/11/1960 |
3F | 3575 | 43575 | 09/1899 | 18D W |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/05/1958 |
30/05/1958 |
3F | 3578 | 43578 | 09/1899 | 17A W |
Derby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/02/1959 |
07/02/1959 |
3F | 3579 | 43579 | 09/1899 | 20B 56A 56F 56A W |
Stourton Wakefield Low Moor Wakefield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/06/1957 14/06/1958 31/10/1959 03/12/1960 |
03/12/1960 |
3F | 3580 | 43580 | 10/1899 | 18B 9E W |
Westhouses Trafford Park (LMS) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/01/1959 15/04/1961 |
15/04/1961 |
3F | 3581 | 43581 | 10/1899 | 4A W |
Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/07/1955 |
09/07/1955 |
3F | 3582 | 43582 | 10/1899 | 17B W |
Burton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/05/1951 |
05/05/1951 |
3F | 3583 | 43583 | 10/1899 | 21B 21A W |
Bournville Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/01/1960 04/08/1962 |
04/08/1962 |
3F | 3584 | 43584 | 10/1899 | 17A W |
Derby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/06/1959 |
06/06/1959 |
3F | 3585 | 43585 | 10/1899 | 20G W |
Hellifield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/09/1962 |
22/09/1962 |
3F | 3586 | 43586 | 10/1899 | 20G 20B 20E W |
Hellifield Stourton Manningham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/02/1954 03/12/1955 02/08/1962 |
02/08/1962 |
3F | 3587 | 43587 | 11/1899 | 16D 19C 17B 9E W |
Mansfield Canklow Burton Trafford Park (LMS) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/02/1950 27/02/1954 10/01/1959 17/10/1959 |
17/10/1959 |
3F | 3593 | 43593 | 01/1900 | 22A 71H 22A 85D 85C W |
Bristol Barrow Road Templecombe (S&D) Bristol Barrow Road Bromsgrove Gloucester Barnwood Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/06/1950 31/07/1950 07/10/1950 22/04/1961 30/12/1961 17/11/1962 |
17/11/1962 |
3F | 3594 | 43594 | 01/1900 | 21A W |
Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/10/1960 |
29/10/1960 |
3F | 3595 | 43595 | 01/1900 | 19A W |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/03/1957 |
09/03/1957 |
3F | 3596 | 43596 | 01/1900 | 19A 16C W |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe Kirkby in Ashfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/04/1950 11/05/1957 |
11/05/1957 |
3F | 3598 | 43598 | 01/1900 | 17A 21A 17A W |
Derby Saltley Derby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/07/1954 09/10/1954 08/09/1956 |
08/09/1956 |
3F | 3599 | 43599 | 02/1900 | 18A 21A W |
Toton Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/10/1953 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 |
3F | 3600 | 43600 | 1899 | 4A W |
Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/05/1955 |
07/05/1955 |
3F | 3604 | 43604 | 1899 | 22B 19A 19A W |
Gloucester Barnwood Sheffield Grimesthorpe Sheffield Grimesthorpe Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/11/1948 11/12/1948 05/12/1953 |
05/12/1953 |
3F | 3605 | 43605 | 1899 | 19A 18D W |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/01/1952 24/09/1961 |
24/09/1961 |
3F | 3607 | 43607 | 1899 | 19A W |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/06/1956 |
09/06/1956 |
3F | 3608 | 43608 | 1899 | 17B W |
Burton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/08/1962 |
04/08/1962 |
3F | 3612 | 43612 | 1899 | 19E 39A W |
Belle Vue Gorton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/04/1956 10/01/1959 |
10/01/1959 |
3F | 3615 | 43615 | 1899 | 8B 2B 6G 8B W |
Warrington Dallam Nuneaton Llandudno Junction Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/02/1957 30/11/1957 17/01/1959 13/10/1962 |
13/10/1962 |
3F | 3618 | 43618 | 1899 | 4A 8B 8B 2B 11B 6K W |
Shrewsbury Warrington Dallam Warrington Dallam Nuneaton Barrow in Furness Rhyl Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/12/1948 18/12/1948 23/02/1957 30/11/1957 19/04/1958 24/03/1962 |
24/03/1962 |
3F | 3619 | 43619 | 1899 | 17B 8B W |
Burton Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/02/1957 29/08/1959 |
29/08/1959 |
3F | 3620 | 43620 | 1899 | 21A 17A W |
Saltley Derby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/04/1962 15/02/1964 |
15/02/1964 |
3F | 3621 | 43621 | 1899 | 21A 21A 84G 85C 84G 17B 17A W |
Saltley Saltley Shrewsbury Hereford Shrewsbury Burton Derby Withdrawn |
08/02/1936 01/01/1948 17/05/1952 30/06/1952 31/10/1953 21/02/1959 12/03/1960 21/04/1962 |
21/04/1962 |
3F | 3622 | 43622 | 1899 | 18C 68A W |
Hasland Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/05/1953 19/12/1959 |
19/12/1959 |
3F | 3623 | 43623 | 1899 | 17B W |
Burton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/08/1959 |
22/08/1959 |
3F | 3624 | 43624 | 1899 | 21A 15A 15B 9G W |
Saltley Wellingborough Kettering Gorton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/02/1956 10/01/1959 02/04/1960 13/05/1961 |
13/05/1961 |
3F | 3627 | 43627 | 1899 | 21A W |
Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/06/1960 |
18/06/1960 |
3F | 3629 | 43629 | 1899 | 14A 15D 15C W |
Cricklewood East Bedford Leicester Midland Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/01/1952 18/04/1953 11/04/1959 |
11/04/1959 |
3F | 3630 | 43630 | 1900 | 19E 39A W |
Belle Vue Gorton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/04/1956 19/05/1959 |
19/05/1959 |
3F | 3631 | 43631 | 1900 | 18A 18C 18D W |
Toton Hasland Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/06/1956 29/12/1956 16/08/1958 |
16/08/1958 |
3F | 3633 | 43633 | 1900 | 18A 3C 3C 8B 8B W |
Toton Ryecroft (Walsall) Ryecroft (Walsall) Warrington Dallam Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/01/1950 04/02/1950 21/10/1950 04/11/1950 28/04/1956 |
28/04/1956 |
3F | 3634 | 43634 | 1900 | 16D 41B W |
Mansfield Sheffield Grimesthorpe Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 02/11/1960 |
02/11/1960 |
3F | 3636 | 43636 | 1900 | 19A 68A W |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/05/1953 12/11/1955 |
12/11/1955 |
3F | 3637 | 43637 | 1900 | 16A 19A 41D 17B 17A W |
Nottingham Sheffield Grimesthorpe Canklow Burton Derby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/11/1955 16/09/1961 11/11/1961 01/09/1962 15/02/1964 |
15/02/1964 |
3F | 3638 | 43638 | 1900 | 19E 39A W |
Belle Vue Gorton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/04/1956 26/12/1959 |
26/12/1959 |
3F | 3639 | 43639 | 1900 | 20D 21A W |
Normanton Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/12/1959 20/08/1960 |
20/08/1960 |
3F | 3644 | 43644 | 1900 | 21A W |
Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/10/1960 |
15/10/1960 |
3F | 3645 | 43645 | 1900 | 22B W |
Gloucester Barnwood Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/11/1962 |
17/11/1962 |
3F | 3650 | 43650 | 1900 | 18A 9E W |
Toton Trafford Park (LMS) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/11/1959 22/10/1960 |
22/10/1960 |
3F | 3651 | 43651 | 1900 | 16B 9G 8B W |
Spital Bridge Northwich Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/11/1952 17/01/1959 25/07/1959 |
25/07/1959 |
3F | 3652 | 43652 | 1900 | 16B 15C 17B W |
Spital Bridge Leicester Midland Burton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/03/1950 25/03/1950 27/08/1960 |
27/08/1960 |
3F | 3653 | 43653 | 1900 | 15C W |
Leicester Midland Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/07/1953 |
04/07/1953 |
3F | 3656 | 43656 | 1900 | 20D W |
Normanton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/03/1958 |
29/03/1958 |
3F | 3657 | 43657 | 1900 | 8B W |
Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/10/1962 |
13/10/1962 |
3F | 3658 | 43658 | 1900 | 22B 17A 17D 17C 17A W |
Gloucester Barnwood Derby Rowsley Coalville Derby Withdrawn |
08/02/1936 01/01/1948 11/07/1953 27/03/1954 21/04/1956 28/09/1963 |
28/09/1963 |
3F | 3660 | 43660 | 1900 | 19C W |
Canklow Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/12/1959 |
05/12/1959 |
3F | 3661 | 43661 | 1900 | 19A W |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/11/1954 |
27/11/1954 |
3F | 3662 | 43662 | 1900 | 19A W |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/08/1953 |
08/08/1953 |
3F | 3664 | 43664 | 1900 | 19C W |
Canklow Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/03/1960 |
12/03/1960 |
3F | 3665 | 43665 | 1900 | 20A 15D W |
Holbeck (MR) Bedford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/11/1951 28/11/1959 |
28/11/1959 |
3F | 3667 | 43667 | 1900 | 21A 21C W |
Saltley Bromsgrove Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/04/1949 03/04/1954 |
03/04/1954 |
3F | 3668 | 43668 | 1900 | 21B 21A W |
Bournville Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/02/1960 04/08/1962 |
04/08/1962 |
3F | 3669 | 43669 | 1900 | 19C 19A 41D 17B 17A W |
Canklow Sheffield Grimesthorpe Canklow Burton Derby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/12/1955 16/09/1961 11/11/1961 07/04/1962 15/02/1964 |
15/02/1964 |
3F | 3673 | 43673 | 04/1901 | 21A W |
Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/08/1961 |
26/08/1961 |
3F | 3674 | 43674 | 04/1901 | 21A W |
Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/08/1959 |
22/08/1959 |
3F | 3675 | 43675 | 04/1901 | 21B W |
Bournville Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/12/1959 |
26/12/1959 |
3F | 3676 | 43676 | 04/1901 | 15C W |
Leicester Midland Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/10/1955 |
15/10/1955 |
3F | 3678 | 43678 | 05/1901 | 20B 68A W |
Stourton Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/05/1953 05/12/1959 |
05/12/1959 |
3F | 3679 | 43679 | 05/1901 | 4A 17B 17A W |
Shrewsbury Burton Derby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/02/1959 12/03/1960 27/01/1962 |
27/01/1962 |
3F | 3680 | 43680 | 05/1901 | 21A W |
Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/08/1962 |
04/08/1962 |
3F | 3681 | 43681 | 05/1901 | 20B 55D 55F W |
Stourton Royston Manningham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/02/1960 14/01/1961 10/1961 |
10/1961 |
3F | 3682 | 43682 | 05/1901 | 17C 22B 71J 82G W |
Coalville Gloucester Barnwood Highbridge Templecombe (S&D) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/02/1955 17/11/1956 11/07/1959 25/08/1962 |
24/08/1962 |
3F | 3683 | 43683 | 05/1901 | 19A W |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/11/1954 |
06/11/1954 |
3F | 3684 | 43684 | 05/1901 | 21A W |
Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/05/1957 |
25/05/1957 |
3F | 3686 | 43686 | 05/1901 | 21A 21C 20A 20A 20C 20E W |
Saltley Bromsgrove Holbeck (MR) Holbeck (MR) Royston Manningham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/10/1949 10/03/1951 24/03/1951 10/11/1951 29/12/1951 03/12/1955 |
03/12/1955 |
3F | 3687 | 43687 | 06/1901 | 21B 21A W |
Bournville Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/02/1960 04/08/1962 |
04/08/1962 |
3F | 3690 | 43690 | 1901 | 21A W |
Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/08/1957 |
24/08/1957 |
3F | 3693 | 43693 | 1901 | 21D 21A 21A W |
Stratford-on-Avon (LMS) Saltley Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/02/1951 28/02/1951 26/12/1959 |
26/12/1959 |
3F | 3698 | 43698 | 1901 | 21A W |
Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/09/1956 |
01/09/1956 |
3F | 3705 | 43705 | 1901 | 20B 20C 56D 56A W |
Stourton Royston Mirfield Wakefield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/01/1953 15/06/1957 31/10/1959 03/12/1960 |
03/12/1960 |
3F | 3709 | 43709 | 1901 | 17B W |
Burton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/08/1962 |
04/08/1962 |
3F | 3710 | 43710 | 1901 | 15C W |
Leicester Midland Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/03/1958 |
15/03/1958 |
3F | 3711 | 43711 | 1901 | 16A 16D 18D W |
Nottingham Mansfield Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/11/1953 03/12/1955 05/12/1959 |
05/12/1959 |
3F | 3712 | 43712 | 1901 | 22A SR W |
Bristol Barrow Road To Southern Region Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/06/1950 10/01/1959 |
10/01/1959 |
3F | 3714 | 43714 | 1901 | 20D W |
Normanton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/01/1962 |
18/01/1962 |
3F | 3715 | 43715 | 1901 | 19A W |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/02/1961 |
15/02/1961 |
3F | 3717 | 43717 | 1901 | 9A W |
Longsight Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/06/1957 |
01/06/1957 |
3F | 3721 | 43721 | 1901 | 15D 15B 9G W |
Bedford Kettering Gorton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/01/1958 09/04/1960 17/03/1962 |
17/03/1962 |
3F | 3724 | 43724 | 1901 | 16A 17D W |
Nottingham Rowsley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/12/1951 13/12/1952 |
13/12/1952 |
3F | 3727 | 43727 | 1901 | 16D 17A W |
Mansfield Derby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/01/1959 04/07/1959 |
04/07/1959 |
3F | 3728 | 43728 | 1901 | 15C W |
Leicester Midland Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/12/1959 |
05/12/1959 |
3F | 3729 | 43729 | 1901 | 16A 41F W |
Nottingham Mexborough Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/07/1958 27/04/1961 |
27/04/1961 |
3F | 3731 | 43731 | 1901 | 19A W |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/07/1959 |
03/07/1959 |
3F | 3734 | 43734 | 1901 | 22A 82G 24B W |
Bristol Barrow Road Templecombe (S&D) Rose Grove Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/12/1959 14/07/1961 22/09/1962 |
22/09/1962 |
3F | 3735 | 43735 | 1901 | 17A W |
Derby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/09/1960 |
17/09/1960 |
3F | 3737 | 43737 | 1901 | 20B 55D W |
Stourton Royston Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/02/1960 18/02/1961 |
18/02/1961 |
3F | 3742 | 43742 | 1902 | 20D 20E 20E W |
Normanton Manningham Manningham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/12/1949 24/12/1949 05/08/1958 |
05/08/1958 |
3F | 3745 | 43745 | 1902 | 17A 19A W |
Derby Sheffield Grimesthorpe Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/10/1956 11/1958 |
11/1958 |
3F | 3747 | 43747 | 1902 | 19C W |
Canklow Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/11/1951 |
10/11/1951 |
3F | 3748 | 43748 | 1902 | 15C W |
Leicester Midland Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/11/1956 |
03/11/1956 |
3F | 3749 | 43749 | 1902 | 19A W |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/03/1960 |
08/03/1960 |
3F | 3751 | 43751 | 05/1902 | 18D 18A 18A 41B W |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) Toton Toton Sheffield Grimesthorpe Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/04/1951 19/05/1951 30/11/1958 26/08/1961 |
21/08/1961 |
3F | 3753 | 43753 | 1902 | 15C 41D W |
Leicester Midland Canklow Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/03/1958 05/12/1959 |
05/12/1959 |
3F | 3754 | 43754 | 1902 | 22B W |
Gloucester Barnwood Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/11/1962 |
17/11/1962 |
3F | 3755 | 43755 | 1902 | 19A W |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/11/1955 |
26/11/1955 |
3F | 3756 | 43756 | 1902 | 19E 26A 24H W |
Belle Vue Newton Heath Hellifield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/04/1956 18/05/1957 22/09/1962 |
22/09/1962 |
3F | 3757 | 43757 | 1902 | 11A 4A W |
Carnforth Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/04/1948 21/06/1958 |
21/06/1958 |
3F | 3759 | 43759 | 1902 | 17A 21A 17D W |
Derby Saltley Rowsley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/10/1948 03/11/1951 28/11/1959 |
28/11/1959 |
3F | 3760 | 43760 | 1902 | 11A 4A 5B 3A 9D W |
Carnforth Shrewsbury Crewe South Bescot Buxton (LNWR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/04/1948 04/10/1958 24/01/1959 24/06/1961 31/03/1962 |
31/03/1962 |
3F | 3762 | 43762 | 1902 | 16D 21A 21C W |
Mansfield Saltley Bromsgrove Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/10/1948 21/04/1956 25/03/1961 |
21/03/1961 |
3F | 3763 | 43763 | 1902 | 17A 10D 9G 15C 9G W |
Derby Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Gorton Leicester Midland Gorton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/01/1958 13/12/1958 02/05/1959 03/10/1959 10/03/1962 |
10/03/1962 |
3F | 3765 | 43765 | 01/1903 | 16D 20C W |
Mansfield Royston Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/06/1948 19/05/1951 |
19/05/1951 |
3F | 3766 | 43766 | 01/1903 | 15D W |
Bedford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/08/1962 |
04/08/1962 |
3F | 3767 | 43767 | 02/1903 | 21D 18A W |
Stratford-on-Avon (LMS) Toton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/12/1950 03/10/1953 |
03/10/1953 |
3F | 3769 | 43769 | 03/1903 | 18C W |
Hasland Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/06/1948 |
12/06/1948 |
3F | 3770 | 43770 | 03/1903 | 20B 20E 20E W |
Stourton Manningham Manningham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/12/1949 24/12/1949 11/02/1956 |
11/02/1956 |
3F | 3771 | 43771 | 04/1903 | 18C 21A W |
Hasland Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/10/1953 02/1959 |
02/1959 |
3F | 3772 | 43772 | 04/1903 | 19A W |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/03/1950 |
25/03/1950 |
3F | 3773 | 43773 | 05/1903 | 18A 16C 17A 16C 39A 9H W |
Toton Kirkby in Ashfield Derby Kirkby in Ashfield Gorton Gorton Withdrawn |
08/02/1936 01/01/1948 11/08/1951 08/09/1951 08/02/1958 22/02/1958 07/05/1960 |
07/05/1960 |