LMS Deeley "3F" Class 0-6-0
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
22/06/1946 | Reallocation | 3782 | 14A | Cricklewood East | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3775 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3776 | 17A | Derby | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3777 | 15D | Bedford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3778 | 18A | Toton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3779 | 17C | Coalville | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3781 | 20G | Hellifield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3782 | 14A | Cricklewood East | 14A | Cricklewood East | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3783 | 20E | Manningham | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3784 | 20F | Skipton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3785 | 15D | Bedford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3786 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3787 | 18A | Toton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3789 | 20C | Royston | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3790 | 15C | Leicester Midland | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3791 | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3792 | 22D | Templecombe (S&D) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3793 | 18A | Toton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3795 | 18A | Toton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3796 | 15A | Wellingborough | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3797 | 15A | Wellingborough | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3798 | 18A | Toton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3799 | 18A | Toton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3800 | 14A | Cricklewood East | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3801 | 14C | St Albans | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3802 | 16D | Mansfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3803 | 18A | Toton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3804 | 18A | Toton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3805 | 18A | Toton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3806 | 14A | Cricklewood East | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3807 | 15C | Leicester Midland | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3808 | 15A | Wellingborough | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3809 | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3810 | 18A | Toton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3811 | 19D | Heaton Mersey | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3812 | 21A | Saltley | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3813 | 19C | Canklow | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3814 | 19C | Canklow | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3815 | 17B | Burton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3817 | 18A | Toton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3818 | 18A | Toton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3819 | 18A | Toton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3820 | 18A | Toton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3821 | 18A | Toton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3822 | 21D | Stratford-on-Avon (LMS) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3823 | 18A | Toton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3824 | 18A | Toton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3825 | 18A | Toton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3826 | 18A | Toton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3827 | 18A | Toton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3828 | 18A | Toton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3829 | 15C | Leicester Midland | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3830 | 15A | Wellingborough | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3831 | 18A | Toton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3832 | 18A | Toton | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 3833 | 18A | Toton | |||
08/05/1948 | Condemned | 3831 | 18A | Toton | COND | ||
05/06/1948 | Reallocation | 3781 | 20G | Hellifield | 14A | Cricklewood East | |
17/07/1948 | Reallocation | 3802 | 16D | Mansfield | 14A | Cricklewood East | |
11/09/1948 | Condemned | 3796 | 15A | Wellingborough | COND | ||
02/10/1948 | Reallocation | 3791 | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | 21A | Saltley | |
23/10/1948 | Reallocation | 43800 | 14A | Cricklewood East | 21A | Saltley | |
11/12/1948 | Reallocation | 3781 | 14A | Cricklewood East | 20B | Stourton | |
18/12/1948 | Reallocation | 3781 | 20B | Stourton | 20B | Stourton | |
15/01/1949 | Reallocation | 3809 | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | 17B | Burton | |
02/1949 | Condemned | 43783 | 20E | Manningham | COND | ||
12/02/1949 | Reallocation | 43802 | 14A | Cricklewood East | 18C | Hasland | |
07/05/1949 | Reallocation | 43806 | 14A | Cricklewood East | 15C | Leicester Midland | |
29/10/1949 | Reallocation | 43792 | 22D | Templecombe (S&D) | 22E | Highbridge | |
14/01/1950 | Reallocation | 43787 | 18A | Toton | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | |
14/01/1950 | Condemned | 43813 | 19C | Canklow | COND | ||
14/01/1950 | Condemned | 43830 | 15A | Wellingborough | COND | ||
04/02/1950 | Reallocation | 43787 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | |
13/05/1950 | Condemned | 43818 | 18A | Toton | COND | ||
03/06/1950 | Condemned | 43805 | 18A | Toton | COND | ||
21/10/1950 | Reallocation | 43787 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | 8B | Warrington Dallam | |
04/11/1950 | Reallocation | 43787 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | 8B | Warrington Dallam | |
25/11/1950 | Condemned | 43802 | 18C | Hasland | COND | ||
16/12/1950 | Condemned | 43827 | 18A | Toton | COND | ||
31/12/1950 | Reallocation | 43801 | 14C | St Albans | 14C | St Albans | |
03/02/1951 | Condemned | 43811 | 19D | Heaton Mersey | COND | ||
18/05/1951 | Condemned | 43824 | 18A | Toton | COND | ||
08/09/1951 | Condemned | 43777 | 15D | Bedford | COND | ||
08/09/1951 | Reallocation | 43779 | 17C | Coalville | 16C | Kirkby in Ashfield | |
29/09/1951 | Condemned | 43801 | 14C | St Albans | COND | ||
29/12/1951 | Reallocation | 43776 | 17A | Derby | 17D | Rowsley | |
19/04/1952 | Reallocation | 43822 | 21D | Stratford-on-Avon (LMS) | 21B | Bournville | |
17/05/1952 | Reallocation | 43800 | 21A | Saltley | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | |
17/05/1952 | Reallocation | 43822 | 21B | Bournville | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
14/06/1952 | Reallocation | 43800 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | |
28/06/1952 | Condemned | 43820 | 18A | Toton | COND | ||
30/06/1952 | Reallocation | 43822 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 85C | Hereford | |
06/09/1952 | Condemned | 43807 | 15C | Leicester Midland | COND | ||
29/11/1952 | Reallocation | 43786 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | 2B | Nuneaton | |
20/12/1952 | Condemned | 43804 | 18A | Toton | COND | ||
25/04/1953 | Condemned | 43792 | 22E | Highbridge | COND | ||
13/06/1953 | Condemned | 43797 | 15A | Wellingborough | COND | ||
05/09/1953 | Condemned | 43833 | 18A | Toton | COND | ||
31/10/1953 | Reallocation | 43798 | 18A | Toton | 21A | Saltley | |
31/10/1953 | Reallocation | 43803 | 18A | Toton | 21A | Saltley | |
31/10/1953 | Reallocation | 43817 | 18A | Toton | 21A | Saltley | |
31/10/1953 | Reallocation | 43822 | 85C | Hereford | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
28/11/1953 | Reallocation | 43799 | 18A | Toton | 15C | Leicester Midland | |
30/01/1954 | Condemned | 43782 | 14A | Cricklewood East | COND | ||
20/02/1954 | Condemned | 43819 | 18A | Toton | COND | ||
27/02/1954 | Reallocation | 43785 | 15D | Bedford | 14C | St Albans | |
06/03/1954 | Condemned | 43779 | 16C | Kirkby in Ashfield | COND | ||
27/03/1954 | Reallocation | 43784 | 20F | Skipton | 20E | Manningham | |
27/03/1954 | Reallocation | 43785 | 14C | St Albans | 15D | Bedford | |
10/04/1954 | Condemned | 43821 | 18A | Toton | COND | ||
19/06/1954 | Reallocation | 43778 | 18A | Toton | 17B | Burton | |
09/10/1954 | Reallocation | 43781 | 20B | Stourton | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | |
09/10/1954 | Reallocation | 43829 | 15C | Leicester Midland | 15D | Bedford | |
26/02/1955 | Reallocation | 43808 | 15A | Wellingborough | 15D | Bedford | |
23/04/1955 | Condemned | 43810 | 18A | Toton | COND | ||
10/09/1955 | Condemned | 43803 | 21A | Saltley | COND | ||
10/09/1955 | Condemned | 43817 | 21A | Saltley | COND | ||
19/11/1955 | Condemned | 43791 | 21A | Saltley | COND | ||
26/11/1955 | Condemned | 43775 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | COND | ||
26/11/1955 | Condemned | 43781 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | COND | ||
02/06/1956 | Condemned | 43790 | 15C | Leicester Midland | COND | ||
11/08/1956 | Reallocation | 43825 | 18A | Toton | 18B | Westhouses | |
06/04/1957 | Condemned | 43795 | 18A | Toton | COND | ||
26/10/1957 | Condemned | 43786 | 2B | Nuneaton | COND | ||
09/11/1957 | Condemned | 43806 | 15C | Leicester Midland | COND | ||
23/11/1957 | Condemned | 43776 | 17D | Rowsley | COND | ||
25/01/1958 | Reallocation | 43778 | 17B | Burton | 17D | Rowsley | |
08/03/1958 | Reallocation | 43828 | 18A | Toton | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | |
15/03/1958 | Condemned | 43823 | 18A | Toton | COND | ||
28/06/1958 | Condemned | 43798 | 21A | Saltley | COND | ||
06/09/1958 | Condemned | 43815 | 17B | Burton | COND | ||
10/01/1959 | Condemned | 43787 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | COND | ||
28/02/1959 | Reallocation | 43822 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 3A | Bescot | |
29/08/1959 | Reallocation | 43778 | 17D | Rowsley | 17B | Burton | |
07/11/1959 | Reallocation | 43778 | 17B | Burton | 17A | Derby | |
07/11/1959 | Reallocation | 43793 | 18A | Toton | 15C | Leicester Midland | |
07/11/1959 | Reallocation | 43826 | 18A | Toton | 9G | Gorton | |
07/11/1959 | Reallocation | 43832 | 18A | Toton | 9F | Heaton Mersey | |
14/11/1959 | Condemned | 43829 | 15D | Bedford | COND | ||
21/11/1959 | Condemned | 43785 | 15D | Bedford | COND | ||
05/12/1959 | Reallocation | 43789 | 20C | Royston | 17B | Burton | |
26/12/1959 | Condemned | 43799 | 15C | Leicester Midland | COND | ||
16/01/1960 | Condemned | 43828 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | COND | ||
06/02/1960 | Reallocation | 43789 | 17B | Burton | 9G | Gorton | |
06/02/1960 | Reallocation | 43809 | 17B | Burton | 9G | Gorton | |
17/09/1960 | Condemned | 43784 | 20E | Manningham | COND | ||
15/10/1960 | Condemned | 43814 | 19C | Canklow | COND | ||
10/12/1960 | Reallocation | 43832 | 9F | Heaton Mersey | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
04/02/1961 | Condemned | 43800 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | COND | ||
04/03/1961 | Condemned | 43778 | 17A | Derby | COND | ||
11/04/1961 | Reallocation | 43822 | 3A | Bescot | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | |
22/04/1961 | Condemned | 43809 | 9G | Gorton | COND | ||
17/06/1961 | Condemned | 43812 | 21A | Saltley | COND | ||
14/11/1961 | Condemned | 43826 | 9G | Gorton | COND | ||
14/11/1961 | Condemned | 43832 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | COND | ||
18/11/1961 | Reallocation | 43825 | 18B | Westhouses | 17C | Rowsley | |
10/03/1962 | Condemned | 43793 | 15C | Leicester Midland | COND | ||
07/04/1962 | Condemned | 43825 | 17C | Rowsley | COND | ||
09/06/1962 | Condemned | 43789 | 9G | Gorton | COND | ||
11/08/1962 | Condemned | 43822 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | COND | ||
08/09/1962 | Condemned | 43808 | 15D | Bedford | COND |