Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1809 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15215 Week
» 68231 Month
» 187758 Year
» 3214611 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
GWR Railcar
GWR |
Date To Service |
Depot Delivered To |
Date Withdrawn |
Depot Withdrawn From |
Svc Age (Yrs) |
Fate |
Where |
When |
Tot Age (Yrs) |
Name |
2
|
09/07/1934 |
|
27/02/1954 |
|
19.58 |
|
|
|
89.78 |
|
3
|
17/07/1934 |
|
26/03/1955 |
|
20.67 |
|
|
|
89.76 |
|
4
|
26/09/1934 |
|
12/07/1958 |
|
23.83 |
Prs |
Preserved |
|
89.56 |
|