Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 232 Today
» 1182 Yesterday
» 4869 Week
» 16162 Month
» 280795 Year
» 1502360 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

08 0-6-0


BR (1955 Num) BR (Class 13) BR (Pre Tops) BR (TOPS) BR (Tops) Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
13000   D3000     01/11/1952 84E
82B
82A
82A
86A
82A
W
Tyseley (New)
St Philips Marsh
Bristol Bath Road
Bristol Bath Road
Cardiff Canton
Bristol Bath Road
Withdrawn
01/11/1952
26/12/1953
04/11/1961
29/11/1964
27/09/1969
14/11/1970
19/11/1972
19/11/1972
13001   D3001     21/10/1952 84E
82B
82A
82A
81A
55H
30A
W
Tyseley (New)
St Philips Marsh
Bristol Bath Road
Bristol Bath Road
Old Oak Common
Neville Hill
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/11/1952
26/12/1953
04/11/1961
29/11/1964
15/03/1969
14/06/1969
25/10/1969
19/11/1972
19/11/1972
13002   D3002     24/10/1952 84E
82B
82A
82A
W
Tyseley (New)
St Philips Marsh
Bristol Bath Road
Bristol Bath Road
Withdrawn
01/11/1952
26/12/1953
04/11/1961
29/11/1964
17/07/1972
17/07/1972
13003   D3003     31/10/1952 84E
82B
82A
82A
W
Tyseley (New)
St Philips Marsh
Bristol Bath Road
Bristol Bath Road
Withdrawn
14/11/1952
26/12/1953
04/11/1961
29/11/1964
17/07/1972
17/07/1972
13004   D3004   08001 14/11/1952 84E
84F
6A
6J
36A
40B
GD
W
Tyseley (New)
Stourbridge Junction
Chester (MR)
Holyhead
Doncaster
Immingham
Gateshead
Withdrawn
14/11/1952
10/09/1960
01/10/1966
11/03/1967
18/03/1972
01/07/1972
18/10/1975
30/06/1978
30/06/1978
13005   D3005   08002 14/11/1952 67C
10D
8F
DR
W
Ayr (New)
Lostock Hall
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Doncaster
Withdrawn
14/11/1952
05/11/1966
06/05/1972
11/05/1974
04/09/1977
04/09/1977
13006   D3006     27/12/1952 67C
10D
5A
10D
8F
36A
40B
W
Ayr (New)
Lostock Hall
Crewe Diesel
Lostock Hall
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Doncaster
Immingham
Withdrawn
27/12/1952
05/11/1966
07/12/1968
04/01/1969
10/10/1970
18/03/1972
01/07/1972
26/11/1972
26/11/1972
13007   D3007   08003 27/12/1952 67B
10D
10A
10D
9A
10D
9A
8J
BR
DR
DN
W
Hurlford (New)
Lostock Hall
Carnforth
Lostock Hall
Longsight
Lostock Hall
Longsight
Allerton
Bristol Bath Road
Doncaster
Darlington
Withdrawn
27/12/1952
05/11/1966
18/05/1968
27/07/1968
07/12/1968
04/01/1969
15/02/1969
08/05/1971
27/04/1974
01/11/1975
16/11/1975
12/12/1977
12/12/1977
13008   D3008   08004 27/12/1952 67B
10A
12C
10D
8J
GD
BG
DN
W
Hurlford (New)
Carnforth
Barrow in Furness
Lostock Hall
Allerton
Gateshead
Hull Botanic Gardens
Darlington
Withdrawn
27/12/1952
05/11/1966
10/08/1968
12/10/1968
25/01/1969
03/08/1974
28/12/1974
07/12/1975
21/08/1983
21/08/1983
13009   D3009   08005 27/12/1952 67B
12B
9A
8J
BS
W
Hurlford (New)
Carlisle Upperby
Longsight
Allerton
Bescot
Withdrawn
27/12/1952
05/11/1966
04/03/1967
26/06/1971
04/12/1976
15/10/1978
15/10/1978
13010   D3010   08006 17/12/1952 73C
71A
GL
BR
DR
DN
W
Hither Green (New)
Eastleigh
Gloucester Horton Road
Bristol Bath Road
Doncaster
Darlington
Withdrawn
17/12/1952
06/11/1954
04/08/1973
14/06/1975
01/11/1975
16/11/1975
24/02/1980
24/02/1980
13011   D3011     19/12/1952 73C
71A
W
Hither Green (New)
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
19/12/1952
06/11/1954
01/10/1972
01/10/1972
13012   D3012   08007 23/12/1952 73C
71A
W
Hither Green (New)
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
23/12/1952
06/11/1954
01/01/1973
01/01/1973
13013   D3013     23/12/1952 73C
71A
W
Hither Green (New)
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
23/12/1952
13/05/1954
01/10/1972
01/10/1972
13014   D3014     24/12/1952 73C
71A
75C
71A
W
Hither Green (New)
Eastleigh
Norwood Junction
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
24/12/1952
13/05/1954
05/10/1960
05/03/1962
01/10/1972
01/10/1972
13015   D3015   08008 24/01/1953 1A
1B
1A
1E
41A
SB
TI
W
Willesden (New)
Camden
Willesden
Bletchley
Tinsley
Shirebrook
Tinsley
Withdrawn
24/01/1953
17/09/1960
03/01/1966
23/05/1970
22/07/1972
31/08/1974
04/12/1976
27/11/1983
27/11/1983
13016   D3016   08009 24/01/1953 1A
1B
1A
AF
W
Willesden (New)
Camden
Willesden
Ashford Chart Leacon
Withdrawn
24/01/1953
17/09/1960
05/11/1960
27/04/1974
30/11/1975
30/11/1975
13017   D3017   08010 21/03/1953 1A
1B
1A
W
Willesden (New)
Camden
Willesden
Withdrawn
21/03/1953
26/03/1960
03/01/1966
18/12/1977
18/12/1977
13018   D3018   08011 21/03/1953 1A
14A
1E
W
Willesden (New)
Cricklewood East
Bletchley
Withdrawn
21/03/1953
22/05/1971
17/07/1971
13/12/1991
13/12/1991
13019   D3019   08012 21/03/1953 1A
5B
8C
8A
8J
W
Willesden (New)
Crewe South
Speke Junction
Edge Hill
Allerton
Withdrawn
21/03/1953
28/12/1957
06/09/1958
30/03/1963
11/05/1968
01/06/1973
01/06/1973
13020   D3020   08013 18/04/1953 3D
2E

W
Aston (New)
Saltley

Withdrawn
18/04/1953
16/10/1965
06/10/1973
01/12/1973
01/12/1973
13021   D3021   08014 16/05/1953 3C
2F
16A
W
Ryecroft (Walsall) (New)
Bescot
Toton
Withdrawn
16/05/1953
22/04/1967
08/06/1968
18/05/1980
18/05/1980
13022   D3022   08015 16/05/1953 14A
30A
SB
W
Cricklewood East (New)
Stratford
Shirebrook
Withdrawn
16/05/1953
24/06/1972
26/01/1974
21/09/1980
21/09/1980
13023   D3023   08016 13/06/1953 14A
2F
1E
TO
NH
W
Cricklewood East (New)
Bescot
Bletchley
Toton
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
13/06/1953
19/08/1967
11/05/1968
22/12/1973
09/11/1974
18/05/1980
18/05/1980
13024   D3024   08017 13/06/1953 14A
2F
1E
9A
NH
W
Cricklewood East (New)
Bescot
Bletchley
Longsight
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
13/06/1953
29/07/1967
11/05/1968
07/10/1972
12/05/1973
01/08/1973
01/08/1973
13025   D3025   08018 05/09/1953 84E
84F
2F
16A
16F
TO
W
Tyseley (New)
Stourbridge Junction
Bescot
Toton
Burton
Toton
Withdrawn
05/09/1953
13/08/1960
22/04/1967
01/06/1968
14/02/1970
06/10/1973
17/07/1983
17/07/1983
13026   D3026     03/10/1953 84E
84B
2C
2A
16A
41A
W
Tyseley (New)
Oxley
Stourbridge Junction
Tyseley
Toton
Tinsley
Withdrawn
03/10/1953
16/07/1960
19/06/1965
06/11/1965
01/06/1968
08/07/1972
12/11/1972
12/11/1972
13027   D3027   08019 03/10/1953 84E
84B
2F
2E
1A
DY
W
Tyseley (New)
Oxley
Bescot
Saltley
Willesden
Derby
Withdrawn
03/10/1953
16/07/1960
22/04/1967
07/10/1967
09/01/1971
11/01/1975
25/09/1983
25/09/1983
13028   D3028   08020 03/10/1953 84E
84B
6D
5A
W
Tyseley (New)
Oxley
Shrewsbury
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
03/10/1953
16/07/1960
25/03/1967
19/06/1971
01/08/1973
01/08/1973
13029   D3029   08021 03/10/1953 84E
84F
2F
16A
W
Tyseley (New)
Stourbridge Junction
Bescot
Toton
Withdrawn
03/10/1953
13/08/1960
22/04/1967
13/07/1968
07/12/1986
07/12/1986
13030   D3030   08022 03/10/1953 81A
81D
81A
41J
W
Old Oak Common (New)
Reading (W.R.)
Old Oak Common
Shirebrook
Withdrawn
03/10/1953
24/08/1964
22/11/1964
22/07/1967
17/03/1985
17/03/1985
13031   D3031   08023 31/10/1953 81A
5A
91M
CH
W
Old Oak Common (New)
Crewe Diesel
To London Midland Region
Chester West
Withdrawn
31/10/1953
22/07/1967
31/08/1967
16/03/1974
25/09/1983
25/09/1983
13032   D3032   08024 31/10/1953 81A
5A
41A
W
Old Oak Common (New)
Crewe Diesel
Tinsley
Withdrawn
31/10/1953
22/07/1967
27/05/1972
26/12/1982
26/12/1982
13033   D3033   08025 31/10/1953 81A
86A
91M
8C
8J
CD
HD
W
Old Oak Common (New)
Cardiff Canton
To London Midland Region
Speke Junction
Allerton
Crewe Diesel
Holyhead
Withdrawn
31/10/1953
28/08/1966
31/08/1967
16/09/1967
11/05/1968
15/12/1973
20/04/1974
18/12/1977
18/12/1977
13034   D3034     28/11/1953 84B
2H
2F
16A
36A
41A
W
Oxley (New)
Monument Lane
Bescot
Toton
Doncaster
Tinsley
Withdrawn
28/11/1953
23/01/1965
22/04/1967
01/06/1968
16/10/1971
08/07/1972
19/11/1972
19/11/1972
13035   D3035     28/11/1953 84B
6D
5A
41A
W
Oxley (New)
Shrewsbury
Crewe Diesel
Tinsley
Withdrawn
28/11/1953
11/03/1967
19/06/1971
22/07/1972
17/12/1972
17/12/1972
13036   D3036   08026 28/11/1953 84B
2F
16A
MC
W
Oxley (New)
Bescot
Toton
March
Withdrawn
28/11/1953
22/04/1967
27/07/1968
21/07/1973
04/07/1982
04/07/1982
13037   D3037     28/11/1953 84B
84E
84B
2F
16A
41A
W
Oxley (New)
Tyseley
Oxley
Bescot
Toton
Tinsley
Withdrawn
28/11/1953
20/04/1957
18/05/1957
22/04/1967
27/07/1968
15/07/1972
17/12/1972
17/12/1972
13038   D3038     28/11/1953 84B
2F
6A
9A
W
Oxley (New)
Bescot
Chester (MR)
Longsight
Withdrawn
28/11/1953
22/04/1967
19/10/1968
21/10/1972
30/12/1972
30/12/1972
13039   D3039   08027 28/11/1953 84B
6D
2B
2F
16C
16A
W
Oxley (New)
Shrewsbury
Oxley
Bescot
Derby
Toton
Withdrawn
28/11/1953
11/03/1967
25/03/1967
22/04/1967
28/10/1967
11/05/1968
02/11/1980
02/11/1980
13040   D3040   08028 22/01/1954 70B
70D
BR
91S
EH
W
Feltham (New)
Eastleigh
Bristol Bath Road
To Southern Region
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
22/01/1954
18/01/1965
09/03/1974
12/07/1975
31/07/1975
05/04/1981
05/04/1981
13041   D3041   08029 27/01/1954 70B

R
75A
75C
EH
EJ
W
Feltham (New)

Reinstated
Brighton
Selhurst
Eastleigh
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Withdrawn
27/01/1954
06/10/1968
09/12/1968
10/02/1969
29/12/1971
19/07/1973
09/03/1974
05/03/1978
05/03/1978
13042   D3042   08030 03/02/1954 70B
70D
70B
73C
70D
W
Feltham (New)
Eastleigh
Feltham
Hither Green
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
03/02/1954
12/04/1965
08/06/1965
01/01/1969
04/10/1972
10/07/1982
10/07/1982
13043   D3043   08031 20/02/1954 73C
74A
73C
70D
SW
91S
EH
W
Hither Green (New)
Ashford
Hither Green
Eastleigh
Swindon
To Southern Region
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
20/02/1954
09/05/1955
12/10/1964
04/10/1972
08/12/1973
12/07/1975
31/07/1975
04/07/1982
04/07/1982
13044   D3044   08032 17/03/1954 75C
73C
74A
70B
75C
91M
16A
W
Norwood Junction (New)
Hither Green
Ashford
Feltham
Selhurst
To London Midland Region
Toton
Withdrawn
17/03/1954
06/11/1954
07/07/1955
30/07/1962
29/07/1968
23/09/1968
12/10/1968
25/08/1974
25/08/1974
13045   D3045     26/03/1954 73C
74A
70B
70D
W
Hither Green (New)
Ashford
Feltham
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
26/03/1954
10/10/1955
02/07/1962
30/09/1968
05/11/1972
05/11/1972
13046   D3046   08033 09/04/1954 75C
73C
74A
75C
71A
75C
70B
91M
6A
TI
91E
W
Norwood Junction (New)
Hither Green
Ashford
Norwood Junction
Eastleigh
Norwood Junction
Feltham
To London Midland Region
Chester (MR)
Tinsley
To Eastern Region
Withdrawn
09/04/1954
06/11/1954
10/10/1955
19/12/1955
27/01/1956
24/02/1958
02/07/1962
23/09/1968
12/10/1968
23/03/1974
23/03/1974
06/01/1985
06/01/1985
13047   D3047   08034 14/04/1954 73C
75C
70C
70B
70D
W
Hither Green (New)
Norwood Junction
Guildford
Feltham
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
14/04/1954
08/02/1955
05/03/1962
09/07/1967
01/01/1969
01/07/1973
01/07/1973
13048   D3048   08035 23/04/1954 75C
70C
70B
70D
73F
70D
OC
EJ
W
Norwood Junction (New)
Guildford
Feltham
Eastleigh
Ashford Chart Leacon
Eastleigh
Old Oak Common
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Withdrawn
23/04/1954
05/03/1962
09/07/1967
03/06/1969
30/09/1971
16/11/1972
23/03/1974
07/08/1976
30/09/1979
30/09/1979
13049   D3049   08036 23/04/1954 75C
73C
75C
70C
81D
86A
2E
6D
5A
6G
CH
CD
W
Norwood Junction (New)
Hither Green
Norwood Junction
Guildford
Reading (W.R.)
Cardiff Canton
Saltley
Shrewsbury
Crewe Diesel
Llandudno Junction
Chester West
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
23/04/1954
06/11/1954
08/02/1955
01/05/1962
20/06/1965
19/06/1966
15/10/1966
10/12/1966
19/06/1971
09/10/1971
23/08/1975
08/11/1975
07/09/1981
07/09/1981
13050   D3050   08037 22/05/1954 5B
1A
16A
16F
W
Crewe South (New)
Willesden
Toton
Burton
Withdrawn
22/05/1954
04/12/1954
16/12/1967
28/02/1970
03/02/1980
03/02/1980
13051   D3051   08038 19/06/1954 5B
1E
1A
W
Crewe South (New)
Bletchley
Willesden
Withdrawn
19/06/1954
14/08/1954
13/08/1955
01/06/1973
01/06/1973
13052   D3052   08039 19/06/1954 5B
1E
1A
W
Crewe South (New)
Bletchley
Willesden
Withdrawn
19/06/1954
14/08/1954
13/08/1955
01/12/1973
01/12/1973
13053   D3053   08040 19/06/1954 5B
2A

2A
21F
2B
1F
1E
W
Crewe South (New)
Rugby

Rugby
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Nuneaton
Rugby
Bletchley
Withdrawn
19/06/1954
14/08/1954
22/03/1958
25/10/1958
05/05/1962
19/01/1963
19/03/1966
11/01/1969
01/06/1973
01/06/1973
13054   D3054   08041 17/07/1954 5B
2A
1E
BS
W
Crewe South (New)
Rugby
Bletchley
Bescot
Withdrawn
17/07/1954
14/08/1954
27/07/1968
04/12/1976
08/08/1978
08/08/1978
13055   D3055   08042 17/07/1954 5B
2A

2A
1E
YK
W
Crewe South (New)
Rugby

Rugby
Bletchley
York (North)
Withdrawn
17/07/1954
14/08/1954
14/06/1958
25/10/1958
11/01/1969
03/08/1974
11/03/1979
11/03/1979
13056   D3056   08043 14/08/1954 18A
15A
2F
15A
15A
15B
16C
16A
BU
W
Toton (New)
Wellingborough
Woodford Halse
Wellingborough
Leicester Midland
Wellingborough
Derby
Toton
Burton
Withdrawn
14/08/1954
08/09/1956
25/11/1961
16/12/1961
03/04/1965
16/04/1966
04/11/1967
29/03/1969
13/07/1974
18/12/1977
18/12/1977
13057   D3057   08044 14/08/1954 15A
15A
15B
15A
DR
FP
HI
GD
W
Wellingborough (New)
Leicester Midland
Wellingborough
Leicester Midland
Doncaster
Finsbury Park
Hitchin (GNR)
Gateshead
Withdrawn
14/08/1954
03/04/1965
16/04/1966
29/03/1969
15/06/1974
31/08/1974
11/01/1975
20/09/1975
04/01/1978
04/01/1978
13058   D3058   08045 11/09/1954 15A
2F
15A
2F
15A
15A
15B
16A
W
Wellingborough (New)
Woodford Halse
Wellingborough
Woodford Halse
Wellingborough
Leicester Midland
Wellingborough
Toton
Withdrawn
11/09/1954
17/11/1962
08/12/1962
27/04/1963
11/05/1963
03/04/1965
16/04/1966
29/03/1969
04/07/1982
04/07/1982
13059   D3059   08046 11/09/1954 15A
2F
15A
2F
15A
2F
15A
15A
15B
15A
16C
16A
16F
W
Wellingborough (New)
Woodford Halse
Wellingborough
Woodford Halse
Wellingborough
Woodford Halse
Wellingborough
Leicester Midland
Wellingborough
Leicester Midland
Derby
Toton
Burton
Withdrawn
11/09/1954
03/12/1960
18/02/1961
27/05/1961
17/06/1961
17/03/1962
16/06/1962
03/04/1965
16/04/1966
04/11/1967
11/11/1967
29/03/1969
28/02/1970
18/05/1980
18/05/1980
13060   D3060   08047 22/08/1953 36B
41C
W
Mexborough (New)
Wath
Withdrawn
22/08/1953
07/03/1964
28/10/1979
28/10/1979
13061   D3061   08048 22/08/1953 36B
41C
W
Mexborough (New)
Wath
Withdrawn
22/08/1953
07/03/1964
12/12/1977
12/12/1977
13062   D3062   08049 10/09/1953 36B
41C
W
Mexborough (New)
Wath
Withdrawn
10/09/1953
07/03/1964
17/05/1981
17/05/1981
13063   D3063   08050 24/10/1953 36B
41C
W
Mexborough (New)
Wath
Withdrawn
24/10/1953
07/03/1964
25/10/1981
25/10/1981
13064   D3064   08051 09/09/1953 36B
41C
W
Mexborough (New)
Wath
Withdrawn
09/09/1953
07/03/1964
11/07/1982
11/07/1982
13065   D3065   08052 24/10/1953 38E
30A
31B
W
Woodford Halse (New)
Stratford
March
Withdrawn
24/10/1953
23/04/1955
17/09/1955
25/01/1981
25/01/1981
13066   D3066   08053 24/10/1953 38E
1H
1F
1E
LA
SW
BR
DR
DN
W
Woodford Halse (New)
Northampton
Rugby
Bletchley
Laira
Swindon
Bristol Bath Road
Doncaster
Darlington
Withdrawn
24/10/1953
19/06/1965
02/10/1965
11/01/1969
18/05/1974
22/06/1974
20/09/1975
01/11/1975
16/11/1975
01/03/1981
01/03/1981
13067   D3067   08054 21/11/1953 38E
1A
BY
WN
SF
GD
W
Woodford Halse (New)
Willesden
Bletchley
Willesden
Stratford
Gateshead
Withdrawn
21/11/1953
19/06/1965
16/06/1973
04/08/1973
29/12/1973
06/09/1975
16/02/1980
16/02/1980
13068   D3068   08055 21/11/1953 38E
1A
1H
1F
  
5A
W
Woodford Halse (New)
Willesden
Northampton
Rugby
To Crewe Works
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
21/11/1953
10/04/1965
26/06/1965
02/10/1965
01/10/1966
18/05/1968
02/11/1980
02/11/1980
13069   D3069     21/11/1953 38E
1A
1C
1E
30A
W
Woodford Halse (New)
Willesden
Watford
Bletchley
Stratford
Withdrawn
21/11/1953
03/04/1965
10/04/1965
19/06/1965
04/03/1972
07/01/1973
07/01/1973
13070   D3070   08056 21/11/1953 53C
53A
50A
50B
50C
HM
W
Hull Springhead (New)
Hull Dairycoates
York (North)
Hull Dairycoates
Hull Botanic Gardens
Healey Mills
Withdrawn
21/11/1953
22/05/1954
09/07/1960
12/09/1964
26/09/1970
21/07/1973
03/08/1986
03/08/1986
13071   D3071   08057 21/11/1953 53A
53C
53A
50A
50B
56G
56B
W
Hull Dairycoates (New)
Hull Springhead
Hull Dairycoates
York (North)
Hull Dairycoates
Bradford Hammerton Street
Healey Mills
Withdrawn
21/11/1953
20/02/1954
19/03/1955
09/07/1960
12/09/1964
19/06/1965
08/10/1966
28/07/1976
28/07/1976
13072   D3072   08058 19/12/1953 53A
53C
53A
52A
52H
52A
52E
W
Hull Dairycoates (New)
Hull Springhead
Hull Dairycoates
Gateshead
Tyne Dock
Gateshead
Percy Main
Withdrawn
19/12/1953
20/02/1954
19/03/1955
20/05/1961
15/09/1962
08/06/1963
29/01/1966
04/04/1982
04/04/1982
13073   D3073   08059 19/12/1953 53A
52A
52E
52A
51L
W
Hull Dairycoates (New)
Gateshead
Percy Main
Gateshead
Thornaby
Withdrawn
19/12/1953
08/04/1961
15/02/1964
14/08/1965
10/04/1971
21/09/1980
21/09/1980
13074   D3074   08060 19/12/1953 53A
50C
40A
W
Hull Dairycoates (New)
Hull Botanic Gardens
Lincoln
Withdrawn
19/12/1953
26/09/1970
24/10/1970
24/06/1984
24/06/1984
13075   D3075   08061 23/01/1954 53A
50C
36A
W
Hull Dairycoates (New)
Hull Botanic Gardens
Doncaster
Withdrawn
23/01/1954
26/09/1970
17/06/1972
06/05/1984
06/05/1984
13076   D3076   08062 23/01/1954 53A
52G
52A
50A
W
Hull Dairycoates (New)
Sunderland
Gateshead
York (North)
Withdrawn
23/01/1954
08/04/1961
26/08/1961
22/06/1963
30/09/1984
30/09/1984
13077   D3077   08063 23/01/1954 53A
50C
DN
W
Hull Dairycoates (New)
Hull Botanic Gardens
Darlington
Withdrawn
23/01/1954
26/09/1970
07/12/1975
08/07/1984
08/07/1984
13078   D3078     23/01/1954 53A
52H
52E
52A
51L
W
Hull Dairycoates (New)
Tyne Dock
Percy Main
Gateshead
Thornaby
Withdrawn
23/01/1954
29/07/1961
08/06/1963
29/01/1966
24/10/1970
30/11/1972
30/11/1972
13079   D3079   08064 23/01/1954 53A
50C
DR
HM
W
Hull Dairycoates (New)
Hull Botanic Gardens
Doncaster
Healey Mills
Withdrawn
23/01/1954
26/09/1970
07/12/1975
09/05/1976
23/12/1984
23/12/1984
13080   D3080   08065 20/02/1954 53A
50C
36C
40B
W
Hull Dairycoates (New)
Hull Botanic Gardens
Frodingham
Immingham
Withdrawn
20/02/1954
26/09/1970
11/12/1971
15/01/1972
04/09/1977
04/09/1977
13081   D3081   08066 20/02/1954 53A
50C
36A
40B
W
Hull Dairycoates (New)
Hull Botanic Gardens
Doncaster
Immingham
Withdrawn
20/02/1954
26/09/1970
08/01/1972
06/05/1972
04/09/1977
04/09/1977
13082   D3082   08067 09/10/1954 21A
16F
16C
W
Saltley (New)
Burton
Derby
Withdrawn
09/10/1954
19/09/1970
09/10/1971
17/07/1983
17/07/1983
13083   D3083   08068 09/10/1954 16A
5B
5A
9A
8F
NH
LO
CD
W
Nottingham (New)
Crewe South
Crewe Diesel
Longsight
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Newton Heath
Longsight
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
09/10/1954
05/03/1966
25/11/1967
06/05/1972
27/05/1972
06/04/1974
13/04/1974
28/12/1974
17/07/1983
17/07/1983
13084   D3084   08069 09/10/1954 16A
5B
5A
6G
6A
HD
BC
W
Nottingham (New)
Crewe South
Crewe Diesel
Llandudno Junction
Chester (MR)
Holyhead
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Withdrawn
09/10/1954
05/03/1966
25/11/1967
27/01/1968
05/02/1972
24/11/1973
03/08/1974
27/02/1983
27/02/1983
13085   D3085   08070 06/11/1954 16A
2A
6A
W
Nottingham (New)
Tyseley
Chester (MR)
Withdrawn
06/11/1954
05/03/1966
22/04/1967
18/12/1977
18/12/1977
13086   D3086   08071 06/11/1954 16A
21A
16A
19A
41A
41A
31B
34G
HI
DN
W
Nottingham (New)
Saltley (on loan)
Nottingham
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
March
Finsbury Park
Hitchin (GNR)
Darlington
Withdrawn
06/11/1954
04/12/1954
01/01/1955
29/12/1956
16/09/1961
26/04/1964
18/12/1965
10/03/1973
20/09/1975
13/12/1975
14/02/1978
14/02/1978
13087   D3087   08072 06/11/1954 8C
12A
12A
9A
8F
W
Speke Junction (New)
Carlisle Upperby
Carlisle Kingmoor
Longsight
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
06/11/1954
01/12/1956
22/06/1963
04/11/1972
13/01/1973
01/06/1973
01/06/1973
13088   D3088   08073 06/11/1954 8C
12A
21C
2F
2G
2F
W
Speke Junction (New)
Carlisle Upperby
Bushbury
Bescot
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Bescot
Withdrawn
06/11/1954
01/12/1956
05/11/1960
19/09/1964
16/04/1966
22/04/1967
01/12/1973
01/12/1973
13089   D3089   08074 04/12/1954 8C
26A
8C
5B
24K
5B
2B
21E
2F
8F
W
Speke Junction (New)
Newton Heath
Speke Junction
Crewe South
Preston
Crewe South
Nuneaton
Monument Lane
Bescot
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
04/12/1954
25/02/1956
24/03/1956
01/12/1956
04/10/1958
01/11/1958
10/06/1961
20/01/1962
22/04/1967
11/05/1968
09/12/1973
09/12/1973
13090   D3090   08075 04/12/1954 3B
2F
2G
2F
16C
TI
91E
W
Bushbury (New)
Bescot
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Bescot
Derby
Tinsley
To Eastern Region
Withdrawn
04/12/1954
17/04/1965
16/04/1966
22/04/1967
11/07/1970
23/03/1974
23/03/1974
13/12/1981
13/12/1981
13091   D3091   08076 04/12/1954 3C
2F
51L
TI
W
Ryecroft (Walsall) (New)
Bescot
Thornaby
Tinsley
Withdrawn
04/12/1954
22/04/1967
20/05/1972
21/07/1973
21/09/1980
21/09/1980
13092   D3092     27/11/1954 75C
75A
75C
70C
73F
73C
W
Norwood Junction (New)
Brighton
Norwood Junction
Guildford
Ashford
Hither Green
Withdrawn
27/11/1954
11/03/1955
21/06/1955
24/02/1958
10/06/1960
09/12/1963
01/10/1972
01/10/1972
13093   D3093     04/12/1954 75C
75A
70C
70B
70D
5A
91M
73F
73F
W
Norwood Junction (New)
Brighton
Guildford
Feltham
Eastleigh
Crewe Diesel
To London Midland Region
Ashford Chart Leacon
Ashford Chart Leacon
Withdrawn
04/12/1954
11/03/1955
30/07/1962
14/10/1963
08/06/1965
26/04/1969
28/04/1969
30/09/1971
16/10/1971
31/05/1972
31/05/1972
13094   D3094     11/12/1954 75C
75A
70B
70D
70B
70D
70B
70D
75C
W
Norwood Junction (New)
Brighton
Feltham
Eastleigh
Feltham
Eastleigh
Feltham
Eastleigh
Selhurst
Withdrawn
11/12/1954
11/03/1955
10/10/1967
01/01/1968
05/02/1968
30/09/1968
11/10/1968
01/01/1969
09/06/1969
01/10/1972
01/10/1972
13095   D3095     18/12/1954 75C
73C
75A
75C
70D
91M
5A
73F
73F
W
Norwood Junction (New)
Hither Green
Brighton
Norwood Junction
Eastleigh
To London Midland Region
Crewe Diesel
Ashford Chart Leacon
Ashford Chart Leacon
Withdrawn
18/12/1954
11/03/1955
01/05/1962
02/07/1962
01/01/1968
03/06/1969
21/06/1969
30/09/1971
16/10/1971
31/05/1972
31/05/1972
13096   D3096     25/12/1954 75C
73C
75C
75A
70D
75C
W
Norwood Junction (New)
Hither Green
Norwood Junction
Brighton
Eastleigh
Selhurst
Withdrawn
25/12/1954
20/04/1955
05/10/1960
05/03/1962
30/09/1968
25/03/1969
31/05/1972
31/05/1972
13097   D3097     15/01/1955 75C
73C
W
Norwood Junction (New)
Hither Green
Withdrawn
15/01/1955
20/04/1955
31/05/1972
31/05/1972
13098   D3098     22/01/1955 75C
75A
73C
5A
91M
73F
91S
W
Norwood Junction (New)
Brighton
Hither Green
Crewe Diesel
To London Midland Region
Ashford Chart Leacon
To Southern Region
Withdrawn
22/01/1955
20/04/1955
21/06/1955
12/11/1966
14/11/1966
30/09/1971
11/12/1971
01/10/1972
01/10/1972
13099   D3099     22/01/1955 75C
75A
75C
73C
73FSub
W
Norwood Junction (New)
Brighton
Norwood Junction
Hither Green
Ashford Chart Leacon
Withdrawn
22/01/1955
20/04/1955
21/06/1955
07/07/1955
10/01/1966
08/10/1972
08/10/1972
13100   D3100     29/01/1955 75C
75A
75C
73C
70B
75A
75C
75A
70D
75C
W
Norwood Junction (New)
Brighton
Norwood Junction
Hither Green
Feltham
Brighton
Norwood Junction
Brighton
Eastleigh
Selhurst
Withdrawn
29/01/1955
20/04/1955
21/06/1955
10/10/1955
05/04/1960
30/07/1962
08/06/1965
18/01/1967
30/09/1968
25/03/1969
01/10/1972
01/10/1972
13101   D3101     05/02/1955 75C
75A
75C
73C
70D
73F
W
Norwood Junction (New)
Brighton
Norwood Junction
Hither Green
Eastleigh
Ashford Chart Leacon
Withdrawn
05/02/1955
20/04/1955
21/06/1955
10/10/1955
12/10/1964
07/05/1969
31/05/1972
31/05/1972
13102   D3102   08077 11/02/1955 86E
86B
82C
2E
8J
8H
8F
DR
CA
Severn Tunnel Junction (New)
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Swindon
Saltley
Allerton
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Doncaster
Cambridge
11/02/1955
27/07/1968
27/09/1969
06/12/1969
24/01/1970
07/03/1970
08/01/1972
11/01/1976
25/01/1976
08/08/1976
13103   D3103   08078 16/02/1955 86E
86B
2E
8H
W
Severn Tunnel Junction (New)
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Saltley
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Withdrawn
16/02/1955
27/07/1968
06/12/1969
14/02/1970
14/08/1983
14/08/1983
13104   D3104   08079 23/02/1955 86E
86B
8J
8J
8H
8F
5A
8H
8F
W
Severn Tunnel Junction (New)
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Allerton
Allerton
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Crewe Diesel
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
23/02/1955
27/07/1968
21/02/1970
07/03/1970
14/03/1970
09/10/1971
18/12/1971
01/01/1972
01/01/1972
04/12/1983
04/12/1983
13105   D3105   08080 23/02/1955 84C
81A
84C
2A
5A
W
Banbury (New)
Old Oak Common
Banbury
Tyseley
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
23/02/1955
11/08/1956
06/10/1956
08/10/1966
19/10/1968
02/11/1980
02/11/1980
13106   D3106   08081 04/03/1955 84C
2B
2E
2D
2A
2F
1A
OC
91E
SF
GD
W
Banbury (New)
Oxley
Saltley
Banbury
Tyseley
Bescot
Willesden
Old Oak Common
To Eastern Region
Stratford
Gateshead
Withdrawn
04/03/1955
30/01/1965
27/02/1965
01/05/1965
08/10/1966
20/09/1969
27/01/1973
14/06/1975
12/07/1975
12/07/1975
13/09/1975
06/04/1980
06/04/1980
13107   D3107   08082 11/03/1955 84C
2J
2E
1A
1E
1A
1E
W
Banbury (New)
Aston
Saltley
Willesden
Bletchley
Willesden
Bletchley
Withdrawn
11/03/1955
01/05/1965
16/10/1965
14/11/1970
20/11/1971
22/01/1972
10/02/1973
02/11/1980
02/11/1980
13108   D3108   08083 11/03/1955 84C
82B
84C
81D
84C
2A
2F
W
Banbury (New)
St Philips Marsh
Banbury
Reading (W.R.)
Banbury
Tyseley
Bescot
Withdrawn
11/03/1955
10/09/1955
08/10/1955
05/09/1959
03/10/1959
08/10/1966
20/09/1969
08/07/1984
08/07/1984
13109   D3109   08084 16/03/1955 84C
2A
8C
8J
8F
NH
W
Banbury (New)
Tyseley
Speke Junction
Allerton
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
16/03/1955
08/10/1966
07/10/1967
11/05/1968
22/07/1972
06/10/1973
02/11/1980
02/11/1980
13110   D3110   08085 22/03/1955 84C
2A
1E
W
Banbury (New)
Tyseley
Bletchley
Withdrawn
22/03/1955
08/10/1966
08/05/1971
23/03/1986
23/03/1986
13111   D3111   08086 25/03/1955 84G
1F
2F
2G
2F
DR
HM
W
Shrewsbury (New)
Rugby
Bescot
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Bescot
Doncaster
Healey Mills
Withdrawn
25/03/1955
29/05/1965
05/03/1966
16/04/1966
22/04/1967
11/01/1976
25/01/1976
03/08/1980
03/08/1980
13112   D3112   08087 01/04/1955 84F
84G
84F
84C
2F
2G
2F
2A
2E
30A
GD
W
Stourbridge Junction (New)
Shrewsbury
Stourbridge Junction
Banbury
Bescot
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Bescot
Tyseley
Saltley
Stratford
Gateshead
Withdrawn
01/04/1955
21/05/1955
16/07/1955
24/08/1963
12/03/1966
16/04/1966
22/04/1967
20/09/1969
08/05/1971
20/05/1972
06/09/1975
16/11/1979
16/11/1979
13113   D3113   08088 13/04/1955 84F
84G
84F
5A
W
Stourbridge Junction (New)
Shrewsbury
Stourbridge Junction
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
13/04/1955
21/05/1955
16/07/1955
22/04/1967
25/09/1983
25/09/1983
13114   D3114   08089 19/04/1955 84G
81A
82C
85B
BR
91E
SF
CA
W
Shrewsbury (New)
Old Oak Common
Swindon
Gloucester Horton Road
Bristol Bath Road
To Eastern Region
Stratford
Cambridge
Withdrawn
19/04/1955
05/11/1960
18/03/1968
01/06/1968
16/03/1974
10/01/1976
11/01/1976
25/01/1976
21/09/1980
21/09/1980
13115   D3115   08090 25/04/1955 84G
84F
2F
2G
2F
DR
CA
W
Shrewsbury (New)
Stourbridge Junction
Bescot
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Bescot
Doncaster
Cambridge
Withdrawn
25/04/1955
16/07/1955
03/10/1964
16/04/1966
22/04/1967
11/01/1976
25/01/1976
27/11/1977
27/11/1977
13116   D3116   08091 29/04/1955 84G
84F
2F
2G
2F
BR
NA
W
Shrewsbury (New)
Stourbridge Junction
Bescot
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Bescot
Bristol Bath Road
Newton Abbot
Withdrawn
29/04/1955
13/06/1959
03/10/1964
16/04/1966
22/04/1967
15/03/1975
13/12/1975
14/11/1982
14/11/1982
13127   D3127   08092 24/07/1954 35A
41A
41F
41A
41B
41A
41A
31B
W
New England (New)
Sheffield Darnall
Mexborough
Sheffield Darnall
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
March
Withdrawn
24/07/1954
12/04/1958
31/10/1959
07/11/1959
14/11/1959
19/12/1959
26/04/1964
18/12/1965
30/11/1978
30/11/1978
13128   D3128   08093 31/08/1954 35A
41A
34D
34G
31B
BG
FH
W
New England (New)
Sheffield Darnall
Hitchin (GNR)
Finsbury Park
March
Hull Botanic Gardens
Frodingham
Withdrawn
31/08/1954
12/04/1958
22/04/1961
01/10/1966
29/10/1966
16/11/1974
23/05/1976
26/07/1981
26/07/1981
13129   D3129   08094 31/08/1954 35A
41A
41B
41A
41A
31B
W
New England (New)
Sheffield Darnall
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
March
Withdrawn
31/08/1954
12/04/1958
16/08/1958
16/09/1961
26/04/1964
18/12/1965
19/06/1983
19/06/1983
13130   D3130   08095 31/08/1954 35A
31B
W
New England (New)
March
Withdrawn
31/08/1954
21/01/1956
27/02/1983
27/02/1983
13131   D3131   08096 31/08/1954 35A
41A
41A
31B
HO
W
New England (New)
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
March
Holbeck (MR)
Withdrawn
31/08/1954
12/04/1958
26/04/1964
18/12/1965
09/03/1974
09/09/1984
09/09/1984
13132   D3132   08097 30/10/1954 65F
91E
34E
31B
W
Grangemouth (New)
To Eastern Region
New England
March
Withdrawn
30/10/1954
31/08/1968
31/08/1968
26/10/1968
11/03/1981
11/03/1981
13133   D3133   08098 30/10/1954 65F
66A
67C
36A
55C
W
Grangemouth (New)
Polmadie
Ayr
Doncaster
Healey Mills
Withdrawn
30/10/1954
02/10/1971
27/11/1971
15/04/1972
14/10/1972
30/11/1980
30/11/1980
13134   D3134   08099 30/10/1954 65F
91E
30E
30A
FH
BG
W
Grangemouth (New)
To Eastern Region
Colchester
Stratford
Frodingham
Hull Botanic Gardens
Withdrawn
30/10/1954
31/08/1968
31/08/1968
20/06/1970
09/03/1974
07/06/1975
12/09/1982
12/09/1982
13135   D3135   08100 27/11/1954 65F
36A
W
Grangemouth (New)
Doncaster
Withdrawn
27/11/1954
07/03/1970
19/12/1982
19/12/1982
13136   D3136   08101 25/12/1954 65F
66A
65A
36A
40A
W
Grangemouth (New)
Polmadie
Eastfield
Doncaster
Lincoln
Withdrawn
25/12/1954
02/10/1971
01/04/1972
15/04/1972
06/05/1972
17/07/1983
17/07/1983
13167   D3167   08102 24/08/1955 21A
DR
91E
W
Saltley (New)
Doncaster
To Eastern Region
Withdrawn
24/08/1955
04/01/1976
10/01/1976
14/03/1988
14/03/1988
13168   D3168   08103 26/08/1955 21A
W
Saltley (New)
Withdrawn
26/08/1955
25/09/1983
25/09/1983
13169   D3169   08104 02/09/1955 2A
12A
W
Rugby (New)
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
02/09/1955
06/04/1963
04/07/1982
04/07/1982
13170   D3170   08105 02/09/1955 12A
12A
W
Carlisle Upperby (New)
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
02/09/1955
22/06/1963
17/07/1983
17/07/1983
13171   D3171   08106 07/09/1955 12A
12A
12C
12A
W
Carlisle Upperby (New)
Carlisle Upperby
Carlisle Canal
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
07/09/1955
16/06/1956
07/11/1959
22/06/1963
24/01/1982
24/01/1982
13172   D3172     07/09/1955 5B
24K
24C
12A
W
Crewe South (New)
Preston
Lostock Hall
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
07/09/1955
04/10/1958
16/09/1961
23/02/1963
07/05/1972
07/05/1972
13173   D3173   08107 20/09/1955 5B
1A
12A
W
Crewe South (New)
Willesden
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
20/09/1955
25/02/1956
22/06/1963
19/12/1982
19/12/1982
13174   D3174   08108 23/09/1955 5B
1A
1F
6J
16C
OC
SF
CA
W
Crewe South (New)
Willesden
Rugby
Holyhead
Derby
Old Oak Common
Stratford
Cambridge
Withdrawn
23/09/1955
25/02/1956
12/02/1966
19/03/1966
18/03/1972
16/11/1974
10/01/1976
25/01/1976
08/07/1984
08/07/1984
13175   D3175   08109 29/09/1955 5B
6J
16C
EJ
OC
W
Crewe South (New)
Holyhead
Derby
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Old Oak Common
Withdrawn
29/09/1955
10/12/1966
18/03/1972
22/06/1974
12/07/1975
05/04/1981
05/04/1981
13176   D3176   08110 30/09/1955 5B
9A
5B
6A
8H
EJ
W
Crewe South (New)
Longsight
Crewe South
Chester (MR)
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Withdrawn
30/09/1955
23/07/1960
10/09/1960
24/09/1960
08/05/1971
12/10/1974
21/10/1979
21/10/1979
13177   D3177   08111 30/09/1955 6A
2A
1A
8F
WS
EJ
WS
W
Chester (MR) (New)
Rugby
Willesden
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Worcester
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Worcester
Withdrawn
30/09/1955
01/12/1956
10/08/1957
22/02/1969
13/04/1974
08/11/1975
19/06/1976
01/04/1979
01/04/1979
13178   D3178   08112 06/10/1955 6A
2A
1A
14A
1A
CD
W
Chester (MR) (New)
Rugby
Willesden
Cricklewood East
Willesden
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
06/10/1955
01/12/1956
16/06/1957
10/02/1973
31/03/1973
05/04/1975
04/07/1982
04/07/1982
13179   D3179   08113 07/10/1955 17A
14A
1E
BR
LA
BZ
W
Derby (New)
Cricklewood East
Bletchley
Bristol Bath Road
Laira
St Blazey
Withdrawn
07/10/1955
16/06/1956
06/05/1972
27/07/1974
02/11/1974
08/05/1976
18/03/1984
18/03/1984
13180   D3180   08114 18/10/1955 17A
21A
17A
14A
16C
36A
W
Derby (New)
Saltley
Derby
Cricklewood East
Derby
Doncaster
Withdrawn
18/10/1955
03/12/1955
24/03/1956
16/06/1956
25/11/1967
16/10/1971
06/11/1983
06/11/1983
13181   D3181   08115 18/10/1955 17A
14A
16D
16E
5A
41A
W
Derby (New)
Cricklewood East
Nottingham
Kirkby in Ashfield
Crewe Diesel
Tinsley
Withdrawn
18/10/1955
16/06/1956
06/11/1965
12/02/1966
12/11/1966
05/08/1972
08/07/1984
08/07/1984
13182   D3182   08116 18/10/1955 82B
82A
82A
51L
66A
67C
62A
65F
66A
65A
52A
W
St Philips Marsh (New)
Bristol Bath Road
Bristol Bath Road
Thornaby
Polmadie
Ayr
Thornton Junction
Grangemouth
Polmadie
Eastfield
Gateshead
Withdrawn
18/10/1955
04/11/1961
29/11/1964
27/01/1968
01/06/1968
27/07/1968
30/11/1968
28/12/1968
02/10/1971
01/04/1972
22/07/1972
15/08/1982
15/08/1982
13183   D3183     24/10/1955 82B
82A
82A
82C
W
St Philips Marsh (New)
Bristol Bath Road
Bristol Bath Road
Swindon
Withdrawn
24/10/1955
04/11/1961
29/11/1964
14/06/1969
30/12/1972
30/12/1972
13184   D3184   08117 27/10/1955 82B
82A
82A
91M
8C
8F
EJ
W
St Philips Marsh (New)
Bristol Bath Road
Bristol Bath Road
To London Midland Region
Speke Junction
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Withdrawn
27/10/1955
04/11/1961
29/11/1964
31/08/1967
16/09/1967
07/10/1967
11/01/1975
01/01/1979
01/01/1979
13185   D3185   08118 04/11/1955 82B
82A
82A
86B
LE
W
St Philips Marsh (New)
Bristol Bath Road
Bristol Bath Road
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Landore
Withdrawn
04/11/1955
04/11/1961
29/11/1964
16/10/1971
30/11/1979
23/03/1980
23/03/1980
13186   D3186   08119 04/11/1955 82B
82A
88M
87B
81A
81C
81A
85B
82A
16C
16A
91M
16C
EJ
W
St Philips Marsh (New)
Bristol Bath Road
Cardiff Cathays
Margam
Old Oak Common
Southall
Old Oak Common
Gloucester Horton Road
Bristol Bath Road
Derby
Toton
To London Midland Region
Derby
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Withdrawn
04/11/1955
04/11/1961
15/12/1962
04/05/1964
28/03/1965
19/09/1965
07/11/1965
31/05/1967
18/03/1968
15/06/1968
22/06/1968
27/07/1968
29/03/1969
11/01/1975
01/06/1979
01/06/1979
13187   D3187   08120 04/11/1955 82B
82C
82B
82A
82A
81D
86A
91M
8C
8J
73F
DN
91E
W
St Philips Marsh (New)
Swindon
St Philips Marsh
Bristol Bath Road
Bristol Bath Road
Reading (W.R.)
Cardiff Canton
To London Midland Region
Speke Junction
Allerton
Ashford Chart Leacon
Darlington
To Eastern Region
Withdrawn
04/11/1955
13/08/1960
09/09/1961
04/11/1961
29/11/1964
15/01/1966
30/10/1966
31/08/1967
16/09/1967
11/05/1968
30/09/1971
16/11/1975
29/11/1975
25/10/1981
25/10/1981
13188   D3188   08121 09/11/1955 86F
86B
1A
14A
1E
W
Tondu (New)
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Willesden
Cricklewood East
Bletchley
Withdrawn
09/11/1955
27/07/1968
26/09/1970
13/03/1971
21/08/1971
10/06/1984
10/06/1984
13189   D3189   08122 10/11/1955 86F
86B
W
Tondu (New)
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Withdrawn
10/11/1955
27/07/1968
02/06/1977
02/06/1977
13190   D3190   08123 15/11/1955 86F
86B
5A
W
Tondu (New)
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
15/11/1955
27/07/1968
03/10/1970
20/03/1984
20/03/1984
13191   D3191   08124 15/11/1955 84B
2F
2A
2F
DR
NR
W
Oxley (New)
Bescot
Tyseley
Bescot
Doncaster
Norwich Thorpe
Withdrawn
15/11/1955
22/04/1967
20/09/1969
15/11/1969
09/02/1976
23/05/1976
01/03/1981
01/03/1981
13192   D3192   08125 18/11/1955 84G
84E
84F
2F
8J
8F
8J
BS
BS
CD
W
Shrewsbury (New)
Tyseley
Stourbridge Junction
Bescot
Allerton
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Allerton
Bescot
Bescot
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
18/11/1955
31/12/1955
10/09/1960
22/04/1967
12/07/1969
01/11/1969
10/01/1970
28/12/1974
08/03/1975
02/08/1975
31/12/1981
31/12/1981
13193   D3193     22/11/1955 84G
W
Shrewsbury (New)
Withdrawn
22/11/1955
16/09/1967
16/09/1967
13194   D3194   08126 24/11/1955 84G
5A
CH

W
Shrewsbury (New)
Crewe Diesel
Chester West

Withdrawn
24/11/1955
04/04/1970
24/11/1973
23/08/1975
02/11/1980
02/11/1980
13195   D3195   08127 25/11/1955 81D
81F
82A
87E
40B
51L
52A
W
Reading (W.R.) (New)
Oxford
Bristol Bath Road
Landore
Immingham
Thornaby
Gateshead
Withdrawn
25/11/1955
27/07/1963
18/03/1968
09/11/1968
05/04/1969
10/10/1970
24/10/1970
03/08/1980
03/08/1980
13196   D3196   08128 02/12/1955 81D
81A
81C
81A
81D
81A
81C
81A
82A
87E
81D

81D
82C
86B
41A
41J
W
Reading (W.R.) (New)
Old Oak Common
Southall
Old Oak Common
Reading (W.R.)
Old Oak Common
Southall
Old Oak Common
Bristol Bath Road
Landore
Reading (W.R.)

Reading (W.R.)
Swindon
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Tinsley
Shirebrook
Withdrawn
02/12/1955
27/02/1960
23/04/1960
21/05/1960
16/07/1960
22/04/1961
15/07/1961
31/08/1967
30/09/1967
09/11/1968
06/12/1969
24/01/1970
04/04/1970
04/04/1970
04/04/1970
08/01/1972
29/01/1972
06/08/1980
06/08/1980
13197   D3197   08129 30/12/1955 66A
66C
66A
66C
91M
16C
8C
8J
NH
W
Polmadie (New)
Hamilton (West)
Polmadie
Hamilton (West)
To London Midland Region
Derby
Speke Junction
Allerton
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
30/12/1955
16/06/1962
30/05/1964
30/05/1964
26/08/1967
09/09/1967
11/11/1967
11/05/1968
06/10/1973
17/07/1983
17/07/1983
13198   D3198   08130 08/12/1955 66A
66C
66A
67A
8F
W
Polmadie (New)
Hamilton (West)
Polmadie
Corkerhill
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
08/12/1955
16/06/1962
30/05/1964
25/06/1966
22/10/1966
19/12/1982
19/12/1982
13199   D3199   08131 08/12/1955 66A
67C
36A
41A
W
Polmadie (New)
Ayr
Doncaster
Tinsley
Withdrawn
08/12/1955
31/12/1966
20/01/1973
27/01/1973
15/03/1981
15/03/1981
13200   D3200   08132 13/12/1955 66A
12A
10A
12C
KM
CD
W
Polmadie (New)
Carlisle Kingmoor
Carnforth
Barrow in Furness
Carlisle Kingmoor
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
13/12/1955
05/11/1966
04/03/1967
10/08/1968
03/08/1974
30/11/1974
29/01/1986
29/01/1986
13201   D3201   08133 16/12/1955 66A
66C
67A
67C
40A
W
Polmadie (New)
Hamilton (West)
Corkerhill
Ayr
Lincoln
Withdrawn
16/12/1955
07/09/1963
30/05/1964
26/03/1966
26/10/1968
21/09/1980
21/09/1980
13202   D3202   08134 16/12/1955 66B
66C
12A
12D
12C
67C
12A
8F
KM
SY
W
Motherwell (New)
Hamilton (West)
Carlisle Kingmoor
Workington
Barrow in Furness
Ayr
Carlisle Kingmoor
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Carlisle Kingmoor
Saltley
Withdrawn
16/12/1955
16/03/1963
05/11/1966
19/11/1966
21/01/1967
01/04/1972
06/05/1972
13/01/1973
30/06/1973
06/07/1974
20/08/1981
20/08/1981
13203   D3203   08135 21/12/1955 66B
66C
EJ
W
Motherwell (New)
Hamilton (West)
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Withdrawn
21/12/1955
16/03/1963
09/02/1974
12/02/1977
12/02/1977
13204   D3204   08136 21/12/1955 66B
66C
36A
W
Motherwell (New)
Hamilton (West)
Doncaster
Withdrawn
21/12/1955
16/03/1963
15/04/1972
07/08/1983
07/08/1983
13205   D3205   08137 23/12/1955 66B
66C
40A
W
Motherwell (New)
Hamilton (West)
Lincoln
Withdrawn
23/12/1955
16/03/1963
09/11/1968
28/11/1982
28/11/1982
13206   D3206   08138 30/12/1955 66C
66B
66C
36A
36C
NR
W
Hamilton (West) (New)
Motherwell
Hamilton (West)
Doncaster
Frodingham
Norwich Thorpe
Withdrawn
30/12/1955
06/06/1959
16/03/1963
15/04/1972
06/05/1972
23/05/1976
14/01/1978
14/01/1978
13207   D3207   08139 26/01/1956 65A
67C
31B
W
Eastfield (New)
Ayr
March
Withdrawn
26/01/1956
25/07/1964
04/01/1969
21/09/1980
21/09/1980
13208   D3208   08140 03/02/1956 65A
67C
BR
LA
W
Eastfield (New)
Ayr
Bristol Bath Road
Laira
Withdrawn
03/02/1956
25/07/1964
16/03/1974
08/03/1975
02/06/1977
02/06/1977
13209   D3209   08141 09/02/1956 65A
67B
67C
41E
91E
W
Eastfield (New)
Hurlford
Ayr
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
To Eastern Region
Withdrawn
09/02/1956
25/06/1966
26/11/1966
31/08/1968
31/08/1968
25/01/1988
25/01/1988
13210   D3210   08142 16/02/1956 62A
65A
10D
12C
W
Thornton Junction (New)
Eastfield
Lostock Hall
Barrow in Furness
Withdrawn
16/02/1956
11/05/1957
05/11/1966
13/01/1968
13/11/1983
13/11/1983
13211   D3211   08143 24/02/1956 62A
65A
66C
62A
65F
64H
61B
65A
W
Thornton Junction (New)
Eastfield
Hamilton (West)
Thornton Junction
Grangemouth
Leith Central
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Eastfield
Withdrawn
24/02/1956
11/05/1957
26/10/1968
25/01/1969
28/02/1970
30/05/1970
21/08/1971
01/07/1972
16/03/1976
27/03/1976
16/03/1976
13212   D3212   08144 29/02/1956 65C
65A
66C
67C
W
Parkhead (New)
Eastfield
Hamilton (West)
Ayr
Withdrawn
29/02/1956
24/11/1962
26/10/1968
29/04/1972
12/12/1977
12/12/1977
13213   D3213   08145 05/03/1956 65C
65A
65F
65A
65F
64H
62C
GM
DT
W
Parkhead (New)
Eastfield
Grangemouth
Eastfield
Grangemouth
Leith Central
Dunfermline Townhill
Grangemouth
Dunfermline Townhill
Withdrawn
05/03/1956
24/11/1962
26/10/1968
30/11/1968
30/11/1968
01/08/1970
29/05/1971
29/05/1976
03/07/1976
12/12/1977
12/12/1977
13214   D3214   08146 13/03/1956 65C
65A
65B
65A
67C
60A
63A
65F
67C
52A
36A
W
Parkhead (New)
Eastfield
St Rollox (Balornock)
Eastfield
Ayr
Inverness
Perth South
Grangemouth
Ayr
Gateshead
Doncaster
Withdrawn
13/03/1956
24/11/1962
25/01/1964
25/12/1965
26/11/1966
28/06/1969
27/12/1969
28/02/1970
01/04/1972
22/07/1972
26/08/1972
01/12/1980
01/12/1980
13215   D3215   08147 16/03/1956 65B
65F
67A
62C
52A
W
St Rollox (Balornock) (New)
Grangemouth
Corkerhill
Dunfermline Upper
Gateshead
Withdrawn
16/03/1956
02/11/1963
04/12/1965
30/12/1967
22/07/1972
17/07/1983
17/07/1983
13216   D3216   08148 23/03/1956 65B
65F
67A
62C
52A
W
St Rollox (Balornock) (New)
Grangemouth
Corkerhill
Dunfermline Upper
Gateshead
Withdrawn
23/03/1956
02/11/1963
25/12/1965
30/12/1967
22/07/1972
31/03/1984
31/03/1984
13217   D3217   08149 02/04/1955 75C
73C
75A
75C
75A
70D
5A
DY
BR
91W
W
Norwood Junction (New)
Hither Green
Brighton
Norwood Junction
Brighton
Eastleigh
Crewe Diesel
Derby
Bristol Bath Road
To Western Region / GWR
Withdrawn
02/04/1955
09/05/1955
21/06/1955
05/03/1962
02/07/1962
30/09/1968
04/01/1969
26/01/1974
08/03/1975
08/03/1975
05/04/1981
05/04/1981
13218   D3218   08150 09/04/1955 75C
75A
75C
EH
W
Norwood Junction (New)
Brighton
Selhurst
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
09/04/1955
21/06/1955
03/06/1969
31/10/1976
14/10/1984
14/10/1984
13219   D3219   08151 16/04/1955 75C
75A
70D
W
Norwood Junction (New)
Brighton
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
16/04/1955
21/06/1955
30/04/1970
02/01/1979
02/01/1979
13220   D3220   08152 22/04/1955 75C
75A
75C
75A
73C
W
Norwood Junction (New)
Brighton
Norwood Junction
Brighton
Hither Green
Withdrawn
23/04/1955
21/06/1955
01/05/1962
08/06/1965
02/05/1973
18/07/1980
18/07/1980
13221   D3221   08153 22/04/1955 75C
75A
75A
75A
75C
70B
70C
70B
2E
5A
6A
W
Norwood Junction (New)
Brighton
Brighton
Brighton
Norwood Junction
Feltham
Guildford
Feltham
Saltley
Crewe Diesel
Chester (MR)
Withdrawn
23/04/1955
21/06/1955
18/07/1959
05/04/1960
05/07/1965
19/09/1966
14/11/1966
09/07/1967
04/01/1969
01/02/1969
21/10/1972
19/12/1982
19/12/1982
13222   D3222   08154 08/06/1955 75C
75A
73C
W
Norwood Junction (New)
Brighton
Hither Green
Withdrawn
08/06/1955
14/11/1966
02/05/1973
13/10/1979
13/10/1979
13223   D3223   08155 02/07/1955 75C
75A
73FSub
W
Norwood Junction (New)
Brighton
Ashford Chart Leacon
Withdrawn
02/07/1955
14/11/1966
09/07/1967
02/01/1979
02/01/1979
13224   D3224   08156 25/06/1955 75C
73C
73F
W
Norwood Junction (New)
Hither Green
Ashford Chart Leacon
Withdrawn
25/06/1955
30/09/1968
03/06/1969
02/01/1979
02/01/1979
13225   D3225   08157 02/07/1955 75C
73C
73F
W
Norwood Junction (New)
Hither Green
Ashford Chart Leacon
Withdrawn
02/07/1955
30/09/1968
04/10/1972
09/04/1977
09/04/1977
13226   D3226   08158 02/07/1955 75C
70D
75A
73C
W
Norwood Junction (New)
Eastleigh
Brighton
Hither Green
Withdrawn
02/07/1955
18/01/1965
14/11/1966
02/05/1973
02/01/1979
02/01/1979
13227   D3227   08159 13/12/1955 51B
51A
W
Newport (Teeside) (New)
Darlington
Withdrawn
13/12/1955
21/01/1956
24/11/1985
24/11/1985
13228   D3228   08160 15/12/1955 51D
51A

1E
W
Middlesbrough (New)
Darlington
Wolverton Works
Bletchley
Withdrawn
15/12/1955
21/01/1956
17/09/1966
18/05/1968
24/12/1985
24/12/1985
13229   D3229   08161 21/12/1955 51A
W
Darlington (New)
Withdrawn
21/12/1955
24/11/1985
24/11/1985
13230   D3230   08162 29/12/1955 53A
56G
56B
W
Hull Dairycoates (New)
Bradford Hammerton Street
Healey Mills
Withdrawn
29/12/1955
01/06/1963
08/10/1966
20/07/1980
20/07/1980
13231   D3231   08163 30/12/1955 53A
56G
56B
W
Hull Dairycoates (New)
Bradford Hammerton Street
Healey Mills
Withdrawn
30/12/1955
08/06/1963
08/10/1966
19/12/1982
19/12/1982
13232   D3232   08164 12/01/1956 53A
53C
53A
50C
W
Hull Dairycoates (New)
Hull Springhead
Hull Dairycoates
Hull Botanic Gardens
Withdrawn
12/01/1956
24/03/1956
06/12/1958
26/09/1970
23/03/1986
23/03/1986
13233   D3233   08165 18/01/1956 53A
53C
53E
50B
50C
W
Hull Dairycoates (New)
Hull Springhead
Goole
Hull Dairycoates
Hull Botanic Gardens
Withdrawn
18/01/1956
24/03/1956
29/11/1958
10/12/1960
26/09/1970
27/07/1980
27/07/1980
13234   D3234   08166 25/01/1956 53A
53C
50B
50C
W
Hull Dairycoates (New)
Hull Springhead
Hull Dairycoates
Hull Botanic Gardens
Withdrawn
25/01/1956
24/03/1956
26/05/1962
26/09/1970
04/07/1982
04/07/1982
13235   D3235   08167 02/02/1956 53A
53C
50A
50B
56G
55A
51A
W
Hull Dairycoates (New)
Hull Springhead
York (North)
Hull Dairycoates
Bradford Hammerton Street
Holbeck (MR)
Darlington
Withdrawn
02/02/1956
24/03/1956
10/12/1960
19/01/1963
01/06/1963
19/10/1963
22/05/1965
15/09/1977
15/09/1977
13236   D3236   08168 07/02/1956 53A
53C
50B
50C
W
Hull Dairycoates (New)
Hull Springhead
Hull Dairycoates
Hull Botanic Gardens
Withdrawn
07/02/1956
24/03/1956
26/05/1962
26/09/1970
14/03/1988
14/03/1988
13237   D3237   08169 09/02/1956 50A
W
York (North) (New)
Withdrawn
09/02/1956
15/03/1981
15/03/1981
13238   D3238   08170 15/02/1956 50A
W
York (North) (New)
Withdrawn
15/02/1956
23/03/1986
23/03/1986
13239   D3239   08171 17/02/1956 50A
W
York (North) (New)
Withdrawn
17/02/1956
24/04/1983
24/04/1983
13240   D3240   08172 24/02/1956 50A
55A
W
York (North) (New)
Holbeck (MR)
Withdrawn
24/02/1956
04/11/1972
04/08/1985
04/08/1985
13241   D3241   08173 02/03/1956 50A
52E
52B
52G
52A
52E
51A
51L
64H
64B
67C
ED
W
York (North) (New)
Percy Main
Heaton
Sunderland
Gateshead
Percy Main
Darlington
Thornaby
Leith Central
Haymarket
Ayr
Eastfield
Withdrawn
02/03/1956
16/06/1956
13/12/1958
04/03/1961
08/06/1963
11/09/1965
10/05/1969
11/07/1970
16/10/1971
27/05/1972
24/02/1973
29/12/1973
11/12/1978
11/12/1978
13242   D3242   08174 06/03/1956 50A
52E
52B
52G
52E
51L
W
York (North) (New)
Percy Main
Heaton
Sunderland
Percy Main
Thornaby
Withdrawn
06/03/1956
16/06/1956
13/12/1958
08/04/1961
08/06/1963
07/09/1968
29/08/1981
29/08/1981
13243   D3243   08175 09/03/1956 50A
52E
52B
52E
52A
61B
65F
W
York (North) (New)
Percy Main
Heaton
Percy Main
Gateshead
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Grangemouth
Withdrawn
09/03/1956
16/06/1956
13/12/1958
08/06/1963
14/08/1965
22/01/1972
25/11/1972
11/12/1978
11/12/1978
13244   D3244   08176 15/03/1956 50A
52E
52B
52E
W
York (North) (New)
Percy Main
Heaton
Percy Main
Withdrawn
15/03/1956
16/06/1956
13/12/1958
08/06/1963
24/11/1985
24/11/1985
13245   D3245   08177 14/05/1956 5B
8G
5B
5A
W
Crewe South (New)
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Crewe South
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
14/05/1956
22/11/1958
25/07/1959
25/11/1967
30/10/1988
30/10/1988
13246   D3246   08178 14/05/1956 16A
16C
W
Nottingham (New)
Derby
Withdrawn
14/05/1956
04/11/1967
01/05/1982
01/05/1982
13247   D3247   08179 14/05/1956 16A
5A
6A
5A
W
Nottingham (New)
Crewe Diesel
Chester (MR)
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
14/05/1956
12/11/1966
01/01/1972
05/02/1972
22/06/1975
22/06/1975
13248   D3248   08180 18/05/1956 17A
14A
17A
21A
30A
CA

R
R
W
Derby (New)
Cricklewood East
Derby
Saltley
Stratford
Cambridge

Reinstated
Reinstated
Withdrawn
18/05/1956
26/01/1957
23/03/1957
05/10/1957
20/05/1972
22/02/1976
08/08/1976
31/12/1976
10/03/1979
03/05/1981
03/05/1981
13249   D3249   08181 18/05/1956 17A
14A
16F
16A
W
Derby (New)
Cricklewood East
Burton
Toton
Withdrawn
18/05/1956
26/01/1957
14/10/1967
28/02/1970
04/07/1982
04/07/1982
13250   D3250   08182 25/05/1955 17A
21A
W
Derby (New)
Saltley
Withdrawn
25/05/1955
09/08/1958
15/03/1981
15/03/1981
13251   D3251   08183 25/05/1955 19A
41A
41A
41E
W
Sheffield Grimesthorpe (New)
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Withdrawn
25/05/1955
16/09/1961
26/04/1964
01/01/1966
31/03/1984
31/03/1984
13252   D3252   08184 01/06/1955 19A
41A
41A
36C
36A
W
Sheffield Grimesthorpe (New)
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
Frodingham
Doncaster
Withdrawn
01/06/1955
16/09/1961
26/04/1964
30/11/1968
19/02/1972
21/06/1981
21/06/1981
13253   D3253   08185 01/06/1955 19A
41A
41A
BR
W
Sheffield Grimesthorpe (New)
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
Bristol Bath Road
Withdrawn
01/06/1955
16/09/1961
26/04/1964
20/09/1975
14/02/1982
14/02/1982
13254   D3254   08186 01/06/1955 19A
41A
41A
W
Sheffield Grimesthorpe (New)
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
Withdrawn
01/06/1955
16/09/1961
26/04/1964
17/03/1985
17/03/1985
13255   D3255     08/06/1955 82B
82A
88M
87E
84B
82A
85B
W
St Philips Marsh (New)
Bristol Bath Road
Cardiff Cathays
Landore
St Blazey
Bristol Bath Road
Gloucester Horton Road
Withdrawn
08/06/1955
04/11/1961
06/04/1963
20/07/1964
30/04/1967
27/09/1969
11/03/1972
30/12/1972
30/12/1972
13256   D3256   08187 08/06/1955 82B
82A
88M
86A
W
St Philips Marsh (New)
Bristol Bath Road
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff Canton
Withdrawn
08/06/1955
04/11/1961
06/04/1963
29/11/1964
24/07/1983
24/07/1983
13257   D3257   08188 13/06/1955 82B
82A
88M
86A
W
St Philips Marsh (New)
Bristol Bath Road
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff Canton
Withdrawn
13/06/1955
04/11/1961
06/04/1963
29/11/1964
24/04/1983
24/04/1983
13258   D3258   08189 20/06/1956 87F
86E
87F
88B
88C
88B
88M
86A
W
Llanelly (New)
Severn Tunnel Junction
Llanelly
Cardiff East Dock
Barry
Cardiff East Dock
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff Canton
Withdrawn
20/06/1956
08/09/1956
01/12/1956
10/08/1957
29/11/1958
27/12/1958
03/11/1962
29/11/1964
06/12/1981
06/12/1981
13259   D3259   08190 22/06/1956 87F
88B
88M
86A
W
Llanelly (New)
Cardiff East Dock
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff Canton
Withdrawn
22/06/1956
10/08/1957
03/11/1962
29/11/1964
12/10/1980
12/10/1980
13260   D3260   08191 29/06/1956 87F
88B
88M
86A
W
Llanelly (New)
Cardiff East Dock
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff Canton
Withdrawn
29/06/1956
10/08/1957
03/11/1962
29/11/1964
20/01/1988
20/01/1988
13261   D3261     05/07/1956 87F
88B
88M
86A
W
Llanelly (New)
Cardiff East Dock
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff Canton
Withdrawn
05/07/1956
10/08/1957
03/11/1962
29/11/1964
30/12/1972
30/12/1972
13262   D3262   08192 12/07/1956 87F
87A
88B
88M
86A
W
Llanelly (New)
Neath (Court Sart)
Cardiff East Dock
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff Canton
Withdrawn
12/07/1956
01/12/1956
10/08/1957
03/11/1962
29/11/1964
09/07/1982
09/07/1982
13263   D3263   08193 10/08/1956 87F
87A
88B
88M
86A
W
Llanelly (New)
Neath (Court Sart)
Cardiff East Dock
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff Canton
Withdrawn
10/08/1956
01/12/1956
10/08/1957
03/11/1962
29/11/1964
10/07/1983
10/07/1983
13264   D3264   08194 20/08/1956 87B
87A
88B
88M
86A
W
Duffryn Yard (New)
Neath (Court Sart)
Cardiff East Dock
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff Canton
Withdrawn
20/08/1956
01/12/1956
10/08/1957
03/11/1962
29/11/1964
09/11/1980
09/11/1980
13265   D3265   08195 23/08/1956 87B
87A
88B
88M
86A
W
Duffryn Yard (New)
Neath (Court Sart)
Cardiff East Dock
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff Canton
Withdrawn
23/08/1956
01/12/1956
10/08/1957
03/11/1962
29/11/1964
25/09/1983
25/09/1983
13266   D3266   08196 24/08/1956 87B
87A
88B
88M
86A
W
Duffryn Yard (New)
Neath (Court Sart)
Cardiff East Dock
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff Canton
Withdrawn
24/08/1956
01/12/1956
07/09/1957
03/11/1962
29/11/1964
01/11/1983
01/11/1983
13267   D3267   08197 31/08/1956 87B
87A
88B
88C
88B
88M
86A
86B
86A
82C
41A
41J
W
Duffryn Yard (New)
Neath (Court Sart)
Cardiff East Dock
Barry
Cardiff East Dock
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff Canton
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Cardiff Canton
Swindon
Tinsley
Shirebrook
Withdrawn
31/08/1956
01/12/1956
02/11/1957
29/11/1958
27/12/1958
03/11/1962
29/11/1964
31/05/1967
27/07/1968
14/06/1969
08/01/1972
29/01/1972
25/04/1982
25/04/1982
13268   D3268   08198 07/09/1956 81D
87E
86A
W
Reading (W.R.) (New)
Landore
Cardiff Canton
Withdrawn
07/09/1956
18/03/1968
01/11/1969
01/12/1980
01/12/1980
13269   D3269   08199 14/09/1956 81D

81D
1A
81A
14A
W
Reading (W.R.) (New)

Reading (W.R.)
Willesden
Old Oak Common
Cricklewood East
Withdrawn
14/09/1956
24/01/1970
04/04/1970
09/05/1970
29/05/1970
02/12/1972
25/01/1983
25/01/1983
13270   D3270   08200 29/09/1956 73C
75C
70B
70D
W
Hither Green (New)
Norwood Junction
Feltham
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
29/09/1956
24/11/1960
17/12/1962
10/01/1966
13/04/1986
13/04/1986
13271   D3271   08201 29/09/1956 73C
75C
70B
70D
W
Hither Green (New)
Norwood Junction
Feltham
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
29/09/1956
05/03/1962
17/12/1962
03/06/1969
19/12/1982
19/12/1982
13272   D3272   08202 06/10/1956 73C
75C
70B
70D
W
Hither Green (New)
Norwood Junction
Feltham
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
06/10/1956
01/05/1962
17/12/1962
03/06/1969
23/05/1989
23/05/1989
13273   D3273   08203 11/10/1956 73C
75C
70B
70D
W
Hither Green (New)
Norwood Junction
Feltham
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
11/10/1956
30/07/1962
17/12/1962
03/06/1969
01/07/1987
01/07/1987
13274   D3274   08204 17/10/1956 73C
75C
70B
70D
W
Hither Green (New)
Norwood Junction
Feltham
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
17/10/1956
05/03/1962
17/12/1962
03/06/1969
21/08/1983
21/08/1983
13275   D3275   08205 22/10/1956 65A
62A
63A
66A
67C
34E
91E
31B
W
Eastfield (New)
Thornton Junction
Perth South
Polmadie
Ayr
New England
To Eastern Region
March
Withdrawn
22/10/1956
22/12/1956
29/01/1966
31/08/1968
31/08/1968
14/09/1968
28/09/1968
26/10/1968
13/11/1983
13/11/1983
13276   D3276   08206 26/10/1956 65A
65F
56B
36A
55B
55G
W
Eastfield (New)
Grangemouth
Healey Mills
Doncaster
York (North)
Knottingley
Withdrawn
26/10/1956
15/02/1958
08/10/1966
09/11/1968
03/04/1971
08/05/1971
19/02/1988
19/02/1988
13277   D3277   08207 26/10/1956 65C
65A
67A
67C
40A
FH
SF
W
Parkhead (New)
Eastfield
Corkerhill
Ayr
Lincoln
Frodingham
Stratford
Withdrawn
26/10/1956
24/11/1962
27/06/1964
26/03/1966
26/10/1968
29/12/1973
09/03/1974
28/09/1980
28/09/1980
13278   D3278   08208 02/11/1956 65B
65A
62C
66A
67C
41A
W
St Rollox (Balornock) (New)
Eastfield
Dunfermline Upper
Polmadie
Ayr
Tinsley
Withdrawn
02/11/1956
25/12/1965
24/02/1968
27/07/1968
28/12/1968
30/12/1972
07/10/1984
07/10/1984
13279   D3279   08209 02/11/1956 65B
65A
62C
65A
65F
31B
W
St Rollox (Balornock) (New)
Eastfield
Dunfermline Upper
Eastfield
Grangemouth
March
Withdrawn
02/11/1956
25/12/1965
27/01/1968
24/02/1968
28/12/1968
30/12/1972
27/02/1983
27/02/1983
13280   D3280   08210 09/11/1956 65B
66A
66E
66C
36C
W
St Rollox (Balornock) (New)
Polmadie
Carstairs
Hamilton (West)
Frodingham
Withdrawn
09/11/1956
08/06/1963
03/08/1963
07/09/1963
05/10/1968
26/09/1988
26/09/1988
13281   D3281   08211 10/11/1956 65F
56B
64B
36C
TE
W
Grangemouth (New)
Healey Mills
Haymarket
Frodingham
Thornaby
Withdrawn
10/11/1956
08/10/1966
28/12/1968
26/01/1969
20/11/1976
03/03/1985
03/03/1985
13282   D3282   08212 16/11/1956 66B
66C
TE
W
Motherwell (New)
Hamilton (West)
Thornaby
Withdrawn
16/11/1956
16/03/1963
16/11/1975
06/09/1981
06/09/1981
13283   D3283   08213 16/11/1956 66B
66C
66A
66B
66C
12B
12A
12C
12A
8F
NH
W
Motherwell (New)
Hamilton (West)
Polmadie
Motherwell
Hamilton (West)
Carlisle Upperby
Carlisle Kingmoor
Barrow in Furness
Carlisle Kingmoor
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
16/11/1956
06/06/1959
26/09/1959
11/03/1961
16/03/1963
05/11/1966
04/03/1967
03/01/1970
06/05/1972
05/08/1972
08/12/1973
02/11/1980
02/11/1980
13284   D3284   08214 23/11/1956 66B
66C
TI
SB
W
Motherwell (New)
Hamilton (West)
Tinsley
Shirebrook
Withdrawn
23/11/1956
16/03/1963
09/06/1973
24/11/1973
19/02/1984
19/02/1984
13285   D3285   08215 23/11/1956 66B
66C
66A
66B
66C
51L
W
Motherwell (New)
Hamilton (West)
Polmadie
Motherwell
Hamilton (West)
Thornaby
Withdrawn
23/11/1956
06/06/1959
26/09/1959
11/03/1961
16/03/1963
30/12/1972
26/09/1982
26/09/1982
13286   D3286   08216 30/11/1956 66B
66C
12C
W
Motherwell (New)
Hamilton (West)
Barrow in Furness
Withdrawn
30/11/1956
16/03/1963
10/08/1968
02/11/1980
02/11/1980
13287   D3287   08217 30/11/1956 66B
66D
66B
66C
GD
W
Motherwell (New)
Greenock Ladyburn
Motherwell
Hamilton (West)
Gateshead
Withdrawn
30/11/1956
29/07/1961
19/01/1963
16/03/1963
16/11/1975
25/04/1982
25/04/1982
13288   D3288   08218 10/12/1956 19A
41A
41A
BR
W
Sheffield Grimesthorpe (New)
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
Bristol Bath Road
Withdrawn
10/12/1956
16/09/1961
26/04/1964
05/06/1976
20/07/1980
20/07/1980
13289   D3289   08219 10/12/1956 19A
18A
41B
41A
41A
W
Sheffield Grimesthorpe (New)
Toton
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
Withdrawn
10/12/1956
23/02/1957
11/10/1958
16/09/1961
26/04/1964
20/03/1983
20/03/1983
13290   D3290   08220 14/12/1956 16A
5A
W
Nottingham (New)
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
14/12/1956
12/11/1966
30/03/1986
30/03/1986
13291   D3291   08221 21/12/1956 19A
16A
10A
5B
5A
BY
W
Sheffield Grimesthorpe (New)
Nottingham
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Crewe South
Crewe Diesel
Bletchley
Withdrawn
21/12/1956
23/02/1957
10/08/1957
25/07/1959
25/11/1967
12/01/1974
01/03/1981
01/03/1981
13292   D3292   08222 27/12/1956 19A
18A
10A
5B
5A
W
Sheffield Grimesthorpe (New)
Toton
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Crewe South
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
27/12/1956
23/02/1957
10/08/1957
25/07/1959
25/11/1967
23/12/1984
23/12/1984
13293   D3293   08223 28/12/1956 19A
18A
41B
41A
41A
W
Sheffield Grimesthorpe (New)
Toton
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
Withdrawn
28/12/1956
23/02/1957
11/10/1958
16/09/1961
26/04/1964
24/06/1979
24/06/1979
13294   D3294   08224 28/12/1956 55A
55D
55F
W
(New)
Holbeck (MR)
Royston
Bradford Hammerton Street
Withdrawn
28/12/1956
09/09/1967
20/07/1968
13/03/1971
27/07/1988
27/07/1988
13295   D3295   08225 14/01/1957 55A
W
(New)
Holbeck (MR)
Withdrawn
14/01/1957
09/09/1967
06/10/1985
06/10/1985
13296   D3296   08226 17/01/1957 55A
W
(New)
Holbeck (MR)
Withdrawn
17/01/1957
09/09/1967
24/11/1985
24/11/1985
13297   D3297   08227 04/02/1957 55B
56B
66A
67A
66A
65A
W
Stourton (New)
Healey Mills
Polmadie
Corkerhill
Polmadie
Eastfield
Withdrawn
04/02/1957
08/10/1966
01/06/1968
31/08/1968
26/12/1970
01/04/1972
01/11/1983
01/11/1983
13298   D3298   08228 28/03/1956 30A
30F
30E
W
Stratford (New)
Parkeston Quay
Colchester
Withdrawn
28/03/1956
08/02/1958
07/01/1967
07/04/1985
07/04/1985
13299   D3299   08229 05/04/1956 30A
30F
30E
36C
W
Stratford (New)
Parkeston Quay
Colchester
Frodingham
Withdrawn
05/04/1956
19/07/1958
07/01/1967
27/06/1970
04/12/1977
04/12/1977
13300   D3300   08230 12/04/1956 30A
MR
W
Stratford (New)
March
Withdrawn
12/04/1956
10/03/1979
28/09/1980
28/09/1980
13301   D3301   08231 13/04/1956 30A
W
Stratford (New)
Withdrawn
13/04/1956
21/06/1981
21/06/1981
13302   D3302   08232 20/04/1956 30A
30F
30A
W
Stratford (New)
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Withdrawn
20/04/1956
14/03/1959
30/06/1966
26/09/1982
26/09/1982
13303   D3303   08233 25/05/1956 30A
W
Stratford (New)
Withdrawn
25/05/1956
10/05/1981
10/05/1981
13304   D3304   08234 02/05/1956 34E
14A
WN
W
Neasden (New)
Cricklewood East
Willesden
Withdrawn
02/05/1956
07/11/1959
24/08/1974
19/09/1982
19/09/1982
13305   D3305   08235 08/05/1956 34E
14A
WN
W
Neasden (New)
Cricklewood East
Willesden
Withdrawn
08/05/1956
07/11/1959
14/06/1975
10/07/1983
10/07/1983
13306   D3306   08236 11/05/1956 34E
14A
WN
W
Neasden (New)
Cricklewood East
Willesden
Withdrawn
11/05/1956
07/11/1959
14/06/1975
07/09/1975
07/09/1975
13307   D3307   08237 16/05/1956 34A
34G
41A
41B
34G
30E
W
Kings Cross (New)
Finsbury Park
Sheffield Darnall
Sheffield Darnall
Finsbury Park
Colchester
Withdrawn
16/05/1956
14/01/1961
06/07/1963
02/05/1964
30/05/1964
08/06/1968
07/10/1984
07/10/1984
13308   D3308   08238 20/05/1956 34A
34G
41A
41J
LA
W
Kings Cross (New)
Finsbury Park
Tinsley
Shirebrook
Laira
Withdrawn
20/05/1956
14/01/1961
22/02/1969
21/10/1972
05/06/1976
18/03/1984
18/03/1984
13309   D3309   08239 30/06/1956 34A
34G
30A
W
Kings Cross (New)
Finsbury Park
Stratford
Withdrawn
30/06/1956
14/01/1961
28/12/1968
08/07/1984
08/07/1984
13310   D3310   08240 06/06/1956 34A
34G
41A
W
Kings Cross (New)
Finsbury Park
Tinsley
Withdrawn
06/06/1956
14/01/1961
22/02/1969
04/07/1982
04/07/1982
13311   D3311   08241 12/06/1956 34A
34G
30A
W
Kings Cross (New)
Finsbury Park
Stratford
Withdrawn
12/06/1956
14/01/1961
28/12/1968
25/10/1981
25/10/1981
13312   D3312   08242 15/06/1956 34A
34G
40B
W
Kings Cross (New)
Finsbury Park
Immingham
Withdrawn
15/06/1956
14/01/1961
28/12/1968
14/12/1986
14/12/1986
13313   D3313   08243 25/06/1956 50A
50B
50C
36A
55C
NL
W
York (North) (New)
Hull Dairycoates
Hull Botanic Gardens
Doncaster
Healey Mills
Neville Hill
Withdrawn
25/06/1956
23/05/1964
26/09/1970
11/12/1971
14/10/1972
25/01/1976
18/02/1986
18/02/1986
13314   D3314   08244 03/07/1956 50A
41A
W
York (North) (New)
Tinsley
Withdrawn
03/07/1956
06/12/1969
04/05/1986
04/05/1986
13315   D3315   08245 05/07/1956 50A
W
York (North) (New)
Withdrawn
05/07/1956
20/05/1984
20/05/1984
13316   D3316   08246 20/09/1956 52E
52B
52A
52E
64H
64B
62C
HA
W
Percy Main (New)
Heaton
Gateshead
Percy Main
Leith Central
Haymarket
Dunfermline Townhill
Haymarket
Withdrawn
20/09/1956
13/12/1958
08/06/1963
14/08/1965
22/01/1972
27/05/1972
24/02/1973
29/12/1973
08/08/1982
08/08/1982
13317   D3317   08247 27/10/1956 52E
52B
52A
51L
64H
64B
W
Percy Main (New)
Heaton
Gateshead
Thornaby
Leith Central
Haymarket
Withdrawn
27/10/1956
13/12/1958
08/06/1963
19/07/1969
22/01/1972
27/05/1972
15/03/1981
15/03/1981
13318   D3318   08248 09/10/1956 50A
50B
50C
W
York (North) (New)
Hull Dairycoates
Hull Botanic Gardens
Withdrawn
09/10/1956
15/09/1962
26/09/1970
23/09/1984
23/09/1984
13319   D3319   08249 11/10/1956 50A
W
York (North) (New)
Withdrawn
11/10/1956
19/05/1985
19/05/1985
13320   D3320   08250 16/10/1956 50A
40B
30A
NR
W
York (North) (New)
Immingham
Stratford
Norwich Thorpe
Withdrawn
16/10/1956
18/10/1969
13/02/1971
23/05/1976
30/11/1988
30/11/1988
13321   D3321   08251 23/10/1956 52E
52B
52A
52E
67C
51L
91N
W
Percy Main (New)
Heaton
Gateshead
Percy Main
Ayr
Thornaby
To North Eastern Region
Withdrawn
23/10/1956
13/12/1958
08/06/1963
14/08/1965
01/06/1968
20/07/1968
31/08/1968
14/09/1980
14/09/1980
13322   D3322   08252 08/11/1956 52E
52B
52H
52E
52A
51L
HM
W
Percy Main (New)
Heaton
Tyne Dock
Percy Main
Gateshead
Thornaby
Healey Mills
Withdrawn
08/11/1956
13/12/1958
20/05/1961
08/06/1963
11/09/1965
17/07/1971
22/02/1976
02/08/1981
02/08/1981
13323   D3323   08253 13/11/1956 53A
50C
W
Hull Dairycoates (New)
Hull Botanic Gardens
Withdrawn
13/11/1956
26/09/1970
25/02/1987
25/02/1987
13324   D3324   08254 19/11/1956 52E
52B
52A
52E
W
Percy Main (New)
Heaton
Gateshead
Percy Main
Withdrawn
19/11/1956
13/12/1958
20/06/1959
08/06/1963
02/11/1986
02/11/1986
13325   D3325   08255 23/11/1956 34A
41A
41J
41J
W
Kings Cross (New)
Sheffield Darnall
Langwith Junction
Shirebrook
Withdrawn
23/11/1956
26/09/1959
15/12/1962
31/10/1966
07/10/1984
07/10/1984
13326   D3326   08256 28/11/1956 35A
41A
41B
41A
34G
34D
34G
30A
30E
W
New England (New)
Sheffield Darnall
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
Finsbury Park
Hitchin (GNR)
Finsbury Park
Stratford
Colchester
Withdrawn
28/11/1956
12/04/1958
02/05/1964
09/10/1965
06/11/1965
11/12/1965
01/10/1966
06/05/1967
11/05/1968
19/02/1984
19/02/1984
13327   D3327   08257 03/12/1956 31B
W
March (New)
Withdrawn
03/12/1956
20/10/1985
20/10/1985
13328   D3328   08258 06/12/1956 36B
31B
W
Mexborough (New)
March
Withdrawn
06/12/1956
18/05/1957
30/11/1988
30/11/1988
13329   D3329   08259 14/12/1956 36B
41C
91W
NA
W
Mexborough (New)
Wath
To Western Region / GWR
Newton Abbot
Withdrawn
14/12/1956
07/03/1964
05/04/1975
05/04/1975
01/07/1987
01/07/1987
13330   D3330   08260 21/12/1956 36B
41A
41B
41A
W
Mexborough (New)
Sheffield Darnall
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
Withdrawn
21/12/1956
15/11/1958
02/05/1964
09/10/1965
21/08/1983
21/08/1983
13331   D3331   08261 28/11/1956 41A
34A
34B
34G
30E
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Kings Cross
Hornsey
Finsbury Park
Colchester
Withdrawn
28/11/1956
18/05/1957
19/07/1958
30/04/1960
09/12/1967
04/12/1983
04/12/1983
13332   D3332   08262 04/01/1957 41A
34A
34B
34G
30A
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Kings Cross
Hornsey
Finsbury Park
Stratford
Withdrawn
04/01/1957
18/05/1957
19/10/1957
30/04/1960
09/03/1968
29/01/1984
29/01/1984
13333   D3333   08263 16/01/1957 41A
36B
41C
41J
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Mexborough
Wath
Shirebrook
Withdrawn
16/01/1957
18/05/1957
07/03/1964
26/07/1969
31/03/1984
31/03/1984
13334   D3334   08264 21/01/1957 41A
34A
30A
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Kings Cross
Stratford
Withdrawn
21/01/1957
18/05/1957
10/09/1966
08/07/1984
08/07/1984
13335   D3335   08265 30/01/1957 41A
36B
41A
9G
9A
9D
9A
8F
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Mexborough
Sheffield Darnall
Gorton
Longsight
Newton Heath
Longsight
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
30/01/1957
18/05/1957
15/11/1958
05/05/1962
12/06/1965
07/01/1967
06/07/1968
09/10/1971
31/12/1981
31/12/1981
13336   D3336   08266 20/02/1957 41A
34A
41A
41B
41A
41A
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Kings Cross
Sheffield Darnall
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
Withdrawn
20/02/1957
18/05/1957
10/05/1958
15/04/1961
16/09/1961
26/04/1964
17/03/1985
17/03/1985
13337   D3337   08267 20/03/1957 62A
91E
30A
41E
41A
41E
W
Thornton Junction (New)
To Eastern Region
Stratford
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Tinsley
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Withdrawn
20/03/1957
31/08/1968
07/09/1968
12/10/1968
26/07/1969
08/04/1972
17/12/1977
17/12/1977
13338   D3338   08268 23/03/1957 62A
91E
30A
DN
W
Thornton Junction (New)
To Eastern Region
Stratford
Darlington
Withdrawn
23/03/1957
31/08/1968
07/09/1968
23/11/1975
14/07/1985
14/07/1985
13339   D3339   08269 29/03/1957 62A
91E
41E
30A
W
Thornton Junction (New)
To Eastern Region
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Stratford
Withdrawn
29/03/1957
31/08/1968
07/09/1968
12/10/1968
08/07/1984
08/07/1984
13340   D3340   08270 30/03/1957 62A
16C
16A
W
Thornton Junction (New)
Derby
Toton
Withdrawn
30/03/1957
09/03/1968
13/04/1968
19/12/1982
19/12/1982
13341   D3341   08271 05/04/1957 62A
62C
W
Thornton Junction (New)
Dunfermline Townhill
Withdrawn
05/04/1957
01/08/1970
22/09/1981
22/09/1981
13342   D3342   08272 12/04/1957 62C
62A
31B
W
Dunfermline Upper (New)
Thornton Junction
March
Withdrawn
12/04/1957
26/09/1964
21/12/1968
06/07/1987
06/07/1987
13343   D3343   08273 12/04/1957 62C
62B
8J
8F
W
Dunfermline Upper (New)
Dundee Tay Bridge
Allerton
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
12/04/1957
28/12/1963
06/12/1969
05/08/1972
19/12/1982
19/12/1982
13344   D3344   08274 18/04/1957 62C
GD
91E
W
Dunfermline Upper (New)
Gateshead
To Eastern Region
Withdrawn
18/04/1957
12/07/1975
26/07/1975
23/12/1984
23/12/1984
13345   D3345   08275 26/04/1957 62C
16C
91M
16A
W
Dunfermline Upper (New)
Derby
To London Midland Region
Toton
Withdrawn
26/04/1957
02/03/1968
30/03/1968
06/04/1968
22/02/1983
22/02/1983
13346   D3346   08276 26/04/1957 62C
62B
W
Dunfermline Upper (New)
Dundee Tay Bridge
Withdrawn
26/04/1957
11/08/1962
21/06/1977
21/06/1977
13347   D3347   08277 03/05/1957 62B
40A
W
Dundee Tay Bridge (New)
Lincoln
Withdrawn
03/05/1957
02/11/1968
22/11/1981
22/11/1981
13348   D3348   08278 03/05/1957 66B
66C
W
Motherwell (New)
Hamilton (West)
Withdrawn
03/05/1957
16/03/1963
21/06/1977
21/06/1977
13349   D3349   08279 10/05/1957 66B
66C
8J
W
Motherwell (New)
Hamilton (West)
Allerton
Withdrawn
10/05/1957
16/03/1963
11/05/1968
12/04/1981
12/04/1981
13350   D3350   08280 10/05/1957 66B
66C
W
Motherwell (New)
Hamilton (West)
Withdrawn
10/05/1957
16/03/1963
27/10/1980
27/10/1980
13351   D3351   08281 17/05/1957 66B
66C
91M
16C
GL
91W
BR
NA
W
Motherwell (New)
Hamilton (West)
To London Midland Region
Derby
Gloucester Horton Road
To Western Region / GWR
Bristol Bath Road
Newton Abbot
Withdrawn
17/05/1957
16/03/1963
26/08/1967
09/09/1967
08/03/1975
08/03/1975
13/12/1975
06/03/1976
01/12/1980
01/12/1980
13352   D3352   08282 07/06/1957 87F
87E
87B
81A
82A
91M
8C
8J
W
Llanelly (New)
Landore
Margam
Old Oak Common
Bristol Bath Road
To London Midland Region
Speke Junction
Allerton
Withdrawn
07/06/1957
04/05/1964
29/11/1964
15/01/1966
30/04/1967
31/08/1967
16/09/1967
11/05/1968
02/11/1980
02/11/1980
13353   D3353   08283 11/06/1957 87F
87E
86A
91M
8C
8J
LO
W
Llanelly (New)
Landore
Cardiff Canton
To London Midland Region
Speke Junction
Allerton
Longsight
Withdrawn
11/06/1957
22/06/1964
30/10/1966
31/08/1967
16/09/1967
11/05/1968
11/10/1975
24/02/1986
24/02/1986
13354   D3354   08284 14/06/1957 87F
87A
87F
87E
81C
91M
8C
8F
W
Llanelly (New)
Neath (Court Sart)
Llanelly
Landore
Southall
To London Midland Region
Speke Junction
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
14/06/1957
02/11/1957
11/07/1959
22/06/1964
19/09/1965
31/08/1967
16/09/1967
18/12/1971
01/05/1985
01/05/1985
13355   D3355   08285 19/06/1957 87F
87A
87F
87E
84A
83B
82A
86B
41A
41J
W
Llanelly (New)
Neath (Court Sart)
Llanelly
Landore
Laira
Taunton
Bristol Bath Road
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Tinsley
Shirebrook
Withdrawn
19/06/1957
10/08/1957
25/01/1958
04/05/1964
30/04/1967
31/08/1967
18/03/1968
02/01/1971
08/01/1972
29/01/1972
12/09/1988
12/09/1988
13356   D3356   08286 21/06/1957 87F
87E
W
Llanelly (New)
Landore
Withdrawn
21/06/1957
04/05/1964
25/04/1982
25/04/1982
13357   D3357   08287 27/06/1957 87F
87A
87F
87E
86A
41A
41J
W
Llanelly (New)
Neath (Court Sart)
Llanelly
Landore
Cardiff Canton
Tinsley
Shirebrook
Withdrawn
27/06/1957
10/08/1957
12/06/1958
04/05/1964
30/09/1967
08/01/1972
29/01/1972
27/02/1983
27/02/1983
    D3358   08288 28/06/1957 87F
87A
87F
87E
86A
82C
W
Llanelly (New)
Neath (Court Sart)
Llanelly
Landore
Cardiff Canton
Swindon
Withdrawn
28/06/1957
10/08/1957
08/08/1959
04/05/1964
30/09/1967
14/06/1969
21/01/1983
21/01/1983
    D3359   08289 28/06/1957 87F
87C
87C
87E
91M
8C
CD
W
Llanelly (New)
Danygraig
Danygraig
Landore
To London Midland Region
Speke Junction
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
28/06/1957
19/05/1962
29/06/1963
13/04/1964
31/08/1967
16/09/1967
15/12/1973
22/12/1985
22/12/1985
    D3360   08290 05/07/1957 87F
87A
85B
87F
87A
87F
87F
87C
87E
91M
8C
8J
W
Llanelly (New)
Neath (Court Sart)
Gloucester Horton Road
Llanelly
Neath (Court Sart)
Llanelly
Llanelly
Danygraig
Landore
To London Midland Region
Speke Junction
Allerton
Withdrawn
05/07/1957
10/08/1957
01/11/1958
21/03/1959
18/04/1959
11/07/1959
29/06/1963
27/07/1963
13/04/1964
31/08/1967
16/09/1967
11/05/1968
25/04/1982
25/04/1982
    D3361   08291 05/07/1957 87F
87A
87F
DG
87F
87C
87E
8F
8J
W
Llanelly (New)
Neath (Court Sart)
Llanelly
Danygraig
Llanelly
Danygraig
Landore
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Allerton
Withdrawn
05/07/1957
10/08/1957
12/06/1958
09/09/1961
29/06/1963
27/07/1963
13/04/1964
28/10/1967
10/05/1969
04/01/1983
04/01/1983
13362   D3362   08292 17/05/1957 82C
88B
88M
87A
87B
16A
91M
W
Swindon (New)
Cardiff East Dock
Cardiff Cathays
Neath (Court Sart)
Margam
Toton
To London Midland Region
Withdrawn
17/05/1957
13/07/1957
03/11/1962
02/11/1963
13/04/1964
06/01/1968
18/03/1968
01/05/1984
01/05/1984
13363   D3363   08293 24/05/1957 88B
88M
86A
87E
16A
91M
W
Cardiff East Dock (New)
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff Canton
Landore
Toton
To London Midland Region
Withdrawn
24/05/1957
03/11/1962
29/11/1964
27/03/1966
06/01/1968
18/03/1968
24/12/1985
24/12/1985
13364   D3364   08294 24/05/1957 88B
88M
86A
87E
2F
91M
W
Cardiff East Dock (New)
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff Canton
Landore
Bescot
To London Midland Region
Withdrawn
24/05/1957
03/11/1962
29/11/1964
27/03/1966
02/03/1968
18/03/1968
02/11/1980
02/11/1980
13365   D3365   08295 31/05/1957 88B
88M
86A
91N
55H
55C
W
Cardiff East Dock (New)
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff Canton
To North Eastern Region
Neville Hill
Healey Mills
Withdrawn
31/05/1957
03/11/1962
22/06/1964
18/03/1968
30/03/1968
07/12/1968
23/05/1988
23/05/1988
13366   D3366   08296 31/05/1957 88B
88C
88B
88M
86A
8F
8J
W
Cardiff East Dock (New)
Barry
Cardiff East Dock
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff Canton
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Allerton
Withdrawn
31/05/1957
29/11/1958
27/12/1958
03/11/1962
29/11/1964
21/10/1967
10/01/1970
30/10/1988
30/10/1988
    D3367   08297 11/07/1957 10A
8G
5B
8C
10D
8F
W
Springs Branch (Wigan) (New)
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Crewe South
Speke Junction
Lostock Hall
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
11/07/1957
22/03/1958
25/07/1959
18/07/1964
20/05/1967
06/05/1972
16/08/1988
16/08/1988
    D3368   08298 11/07/1957 10A
24K
24C
8F
LO
W
Springs Branch (Wigan) (New)
Preston
Lostock Hall
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Longsight
Withdrawn
11/07/1957
04/10/1958
16/09/1961
06/05/1972
11/05/1974
08/03/1981
08/03/1981
    D3369   08299 26/07/1957 10A
24K
24C
8F
W
Springs Branch (Wigan) (New)
Preston
Lostock Hall
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
26/07/1957
04/10/1958
16/09/1961
06/05/1972
19/07/1981
19/07/1981
    D3370   08300 02/08/1957 10A
8C
6A
8C
8A
8J
W
Springs Branch (Wigan) (New)
Speke Junction
Chester (MR)
Speke Junction
Edge Hill
Allerton
Withdrawn
02/08/1957
05/03/1960
25/08/1962
22/12/1962
27/04/1963
11/05/1968
17/07/1983
17/07/1983
    D3371   08301 07/08/1957 10A
24K
24C
8F
W
Springs Branch (Wigan) (New)
Preston
Lostock Hall
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
07/08/1957
04/10/1958
16/09/1961
06/05/1972
31/12/1981
31/12/1981
    D3372   08302 10/08/1957 26A
9A
8F
W
Newton Heath (New)
Longsight
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
10/08/1957
06/07/1968
09/10/1971
29/06/1981
29/06/1981
    D3373   08303 15/08/1957 26A
9A
8F
DY
W
Newton Heath (New)
Longsight
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Derby
Withdrawn
15/08/1957
06/07/1968
09/10/1971
20/12/1975
31/12/1981
31/12/1981
    D3374   08304 16/08/1957 26A
24C
8F
W
Newton Heath (New)
Lostock Hall
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
16/08/1957
04/10/1958
06/05/1972
19/05/1985
19/05/1985
    D3375   08305 22/08/1957 55D
55G
55D
55H
55G
W
Royston (New)
Huddersfield Hillhouse
Royston
Neville Hill
Knottingley
Withdrawn
22/08/1957
08/03/1958
27/06/1964
12/09/1964
14/08/1971
30/10/1988
30/10/1988
    D3376   08306 23/08/1957 55D
56G
W
Royston (New)
Bradford Hammerton Street
Withdrawn
23/08/1957
22/06/1963
21/12/1977
21/12/1977
    D3377   08307 30/08/1957 55D
55C
W
Royston (New)
Healey Mills
Withdrawn
30/08/1957
25/05/1968
21/12/1977
21/12/1977
    D3378   08308 30/08/1957 55D
55C
W
Royston (New)
Healey Mills
Withdrawn
30/08/1957
02/10/1971
21/02/1992
21/02/1992
    D3379   08309 05/09/1957 55D
56A
W
Royston (New)
Knottingley
Withdrawn
05/09/1957
07/10/1967
17/07/1992
17/07/1992
    D3380   08310 06/09/1957 55D
55E
55A
51A
TE
W
Royston (New)
Normanton
Holbeck (MR)
Darlington
Thornaby
Withdrawn
06/09/1957
10/05/1958
13/06/1964
22/05/1965
27/07/1974
04/09/1977
04/09/1977
    D3381   08311 12/09/1957 55E
55D
56G
W
Normanton (New)
Royston
Bradford Hammerton Street
Withdrawn
12/09/1957
13/06/1964
27/06/1964
19/12/1982
19/12/1982
    D3382   08312 13/09/1957 66B
66C
66B
66C
W
Motherwell (New)
Hamilton (West)
Motherwell
Hamilton (West)
Withdrawn
13/09/1957
06/06/1959
26/09/1959
16/03/1963
09/05/1983
09/05/1983
    D3383   08313 27/09/1957 66B
66A
W
Motherwell (New)
Polmadie
Withdrawn
27/09/1957
22/10/1960
23/05/1982
23/05/1982
    D3384   08314 20/09/1957 66B
66C
W
Motherwell (New)
Hamilton (West)
Withdrawn
20/09/1957
16/03/1963
22/02/1981
22/02/1981
    D3385   08315 27/09/1957 66B
66C
31B
W
Motherwell (New)
Hamilton (West)
March
Withdrawn
27/09/1957
16/03/1963
02/11/1968
12/02/1979
12/02/1979
    D3386   08316 27/09/1957 65A
65B
65A
66C

W
Eastfield (New)
St Rollox (Balornock)
Eastfield
Hamilton (West)

Withdrawn
27/09/1957
23/11/1957
25/12/1965
27/01/1968
06/03/1976
09/03/1976
09/03/1976
    D3387   08317 27/09/1957 65A
65G
65B
65A
64B
40A
62B
BG
W
Eastfield (New)
Yoker
St Rollox (Balornock)
Eastfield
Haymarket
Lincoln
Dundee West
Hull Botanic Gardens
Withdrawn
27/09/1957
12/04/1958
27/09/1958
25/12/1965
30/11/1968
04/01/1969
21/04/1973
09/11/1974
31/10/1982
31/10/1982
    D3388   08318 04/10/1957 65A
62B
66C

W
Eastfield (New)
Dundee West
Hamilton (West)

Withdrawn
04/10/1957
30/11/1968
28/10/1972
04/09/1976
03/10/1976
03/10/1976
    D3389   08319 11/10/1957 65A
62C
HN
W
Eastfield (New)
Dunfermline Upper
Hamilton (West)
Withdrawn
11/10/1957
30/11/1968
29/12/1973
25/04/1983
25/04/1983
    D3390   08320 16/10/1957 65A
65B
65A
16C
91M
16A
W
Eastfield (New)
St Rollox (Balornock)
Eastfield
Derby
To London Midland Region
Toton
Withdrawn
16/10/1957
24/03/1962
29/09/1962
17/02/1968
24/02/1968
23/03/1968
19/12/1982
19/12/1982
    D3391   08321 18/10/1957 65A
W
Eastfield (New)
Withdrawn
18/10/1957
01/06/1984
01/06/1984
    D3392   08322 18/10/1957 65A
BR
W
Eastfield (New)
Bristol Bath Road
Withdrawn
18/10/1957
22/03/1975
18/09/1983
18/09/1983
    D3393   08323 25/10/1957 65A
EJ
91S
EH
W
Eastfield (New)
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
To Southern Region
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
25/10/1957
14/06/1975
12/07/1975
31/07/1975
11/07/1981
11/07/1981
    D3394   08324 29/10/1957 65A
65E
91E
34E
31B
W
Eastfield (New)
Kipps
To Eastern Region
New England
March
Withdrawn
29/10/1957
21/12/1957
31/08/1968
31/08/1968
26/10/1968
23/12/1984
23/12/1984
    D3395   08325 01/11/1957 65A
65E
GD
91E
W
Eastfield (New)
Kipps
Gateshead
To Eastern Region
Withdrawn
01/11/1957
21/12/1957
12/07/1975
26/07/1975
08/07/1984
08/07/1984
    D3396   08326 08/11/1957 65A
67A
65A
W
Eastfield (New)
Corkerhill
Eastfield
Withdrawn
08/11/1957
27/04/1968
01/04/1972
01/11/1983
01/11/1983
    D3397   08327 08/11/1957 88B
88M
86A
86B
87E
2F
91M
W
Cardiff East Dock (New)
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff Canton
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Landore
Bescot
To London Midland Region
Withdrawn
08/11/1957
03/11/1962
29/11/1964
28/08/1966
31/05/1967
02/03/1968
18/03/1968
28/02/1983
28/02/1983
    D3398   08328 15/11/1957 88B
88M
86A
8C
8J
W
Cardiff East Dock (New)
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff Canton
Speke Junction
Allerton
Withdrawn
15/11/1957
03/11/1962
29/11/1964
21/10/1967
11/05/1968
31/12/1981
31/12/1981
    D3399   08329 15/11/1957 88B
88M
86A
8C
8J
CD
W
Cardiff East Dock (New)
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff Canton
Speke Junction
Allerton
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
15/11/1957
03/11/1962
29/11/1964
28/10/1967
11/05/1968
15/12/1973
24/06/1984
24/06/1984
    D3400   08330 23/11/1957 88B
88M
86A
16A
W
Cardiff East Dock (New)
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff Canton
Toton (on loan)
Withdrawn
23/11/1957
03/11/1962
29/11/1964
25/11/1967
02/12/1984
02/12/1984
    D3401   08331 23/11/1957 88B
88M
87C
87E
91N
51L
41E
91E
SB
DR
W
Cardiff East Dock (New)
Cardiff Cathays
Danygraig
Landore
To North Eastern Region
Thornaby
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
To Eastern Region
Shirebrook
Doncaster
Withdrawn
23/11/1957
03/11/1962
29/06/1963
13/04/1964
18/03/1968
30/03/1968
29/06/1968
20/07/1968
10/05/1975
31/10/1979
14/03/1988
14/03/1988
    D3402   08332 29/11/1957 88B
88M
86A
16A
W
Cardiff East Dock (New)
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff Canton
Toton (on loan)
Withdrawn
29/11/1957
03/11/1962
29/11/1964
25/11/1967
16/09/1984
16/09/1984
    D3403   08333 29/11/1957 88B
82A
88M
87A
87B
86A
87E
16C
91M
16B
16C
W
Cardiff East Dock (New)
Bristol Bath Road
Cardiff Cathays
Neath (Court Sart)
Margam
Cardiff Canton
Landore
Derby
To London Midland Region
Colwick
Derby
Withdrawn
29/11/1957
14/07/1962
06/04/1963
27/07/1963
13/04/1964
15/01/1967
18/03/1968
20/07/1968
27/07/1968
27/07/1968
18/04/1970
19/12/1982
19/12/1982
    D3404   08334 06/12/1957 88B
88M
86A
16C
16A
91M
W
Cardiff East Dock (New)
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff Canton
Derby
Toton
To London Midland Region
Withdrawn
06/12/1957
03/11/1962
29/11/1964
15/06/1968
22/06/1968
27/07/1968
03/09/1987
03/09/1987
    D3405   08335 13/12/1957 88B
88M
86A
82A
51L
30A
91E
41A
W
Cardiff East Dock (New)
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff Canton
Bristol Bath Road
Thornaby
Stratford
To Eastern Region
Tinsley
Withdrawn
13/12/1957
03/11/1962
29/11/1964
18/03/1968
27/04/1968
29/06/1968
20/07/1968
07/09/1968
16/01/1987
16/01/1987
    D3406   08336 19/12/1957 88B
88C
88B
81A
81D
81A
91N
51L
YK
W
Cardiff East Dock (New)
Barry
Cardiff East Dock
Old Oak Common
Reading (W.R.)
Old Oak Common
To North Eastern Region
Thornaby
York (North)
Withdrawn
19/12/1957
29/11/1958
27/12/1958
27/02/1960
13/08/1960
22/04/1961
18/03/1968
30/03/1968
09/05/1976
05/04/1981
05/04/1981
    D3407   08337 27/12/1957 88B
88M
86A
16C
91M
16B
9A
8F
W
Cardiff East Dock (New)
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff Canton
Derby
To London Midland Region
Colwick
Longsight
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
27/12/1957
03/11/1962
29/11/1964
20/07/1968
27/07/1968
27/07/1968
18/04/1970
13/11/1971
06/02/1987
06/02/1987
    D3408   08338 01/01/1958 65E
65B
65A
AY
WS
W
Kipps (New)
St Rollox (Balornock)
Eastfield
Ayr
Worcester
Withdrawn
01/01/1958
15/02/1958
25/12/1965
23/03/1974
05/04/1975
15/07/1985
15/07/1985
    D3409   08339 08/01/1958 65E
65K
65F
65A
67A
34E
91E
31B
W
Kipps (New)
Polmont
Grangemouth
Eastfield
Corkerhill
New England
To Eastern Region
March
Withdrawn
08/01/1958
08/09/1962
25/01/1964
29/01/1966
25/03/1967
31/08/1968
31/08/1968
26/10/1968
07/10/1984
07/10/1984
    D3410   08340 16/01/1958 65C
65A
10D
8F
W
Parkhead (New)
Eastfield
Lostock Hall
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
16/01/1958
24/11/1962
05/11/1966
06/05/1972
16/08/1981
16/08/1981
    D3411   08341 22/01/1958 65C
65G
65E
66A
62A
63A
62A
63A
62B
62C
W
Parkhead (New)
Yoker
Kipps
Polmadie
Thornton Junction
Perth South
Thornton Junction
Perth South
Dundee West
Dunfermline Townhill
Withdrawn
22/01/1958
12/04/1958
16/06/1962
30/05/1964
31/08/1968
28/12/1968
01/03/1969
28/06/1969
01/08/1970
01/07/1972
01/11/1983
01/11/1983
    D3412   08342 24/01/1958 65G
65E
66A
12A
12C
10D
8F
W
Yoker (New)
Kipps
Polmadie
Carlisle Kingmoor
Barrow in Furness
Lostock Hall
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
24/01/1958
16/06/1962
30/05/1964
05/11/1966
26/11/1966
16/11/1968
06/05/1972
04/07/1982
04/07/1982
    D3413   08343 31/01/1958 65G
65D
65B
67B
67C
W
Yoker (New)
Dawsholm
St Rollox (Balornock)
Hurlford
Ayr
Withdrawn
31/01/1958
14/02/1959
25/01/1964
25/07/1964
31/12/1966
01/11/1983
01/11/1983
    D3414   08344 07/02/1958 65G
65D
65B
67B
67C
W
Yoker (New)
Dawsholm
St Rollox (Balornock)
Hurlford
Ayr
Withdrawn
07/02/1958
14/02/1959
25/01/1964
25/07/1964
27/02/1965
01/05/1984
01/05/1984
    D3415   08345 14/02/1958 65G
65D
65B
67B
67C
W
Yoker (New)
Dawsholm
St Rollox (Balornock)
Hurlford
Ayr
Withdrawn
14/02/1958
14/02/1959
25/01/1964
25/07/1964
31/12/1966
01/11/1983
01/11/1983
    D3416   08346 21/02/1958 65B
65D
64F
65E
W
St Rollox (Balornock) (New)
Dawsholm
Bathgate
Kipps
Withdrawn
21/02/1958
12/04/1958
02/08/1958
27/09/1958
01/03/1984
01/03/1984
    D3417   08347 28/02/1958 65B
65A
65B
ED
W
St Rollox (Balornock) (New)
Eastfield
St Rollox (Balornock)
Eastfield
Withdrawn
28/02/1958
25/12/1965
01/08/1970
29/06/1974
01/11/1983
01/11/1983
    D3418   08348 12/03/1958 65B
65A
66A
65A
W
St Rollox (Balornock) (New)
Eastfield
Polmadie
Eastfield
Withdrawn
12/03/1958
12/04/1958
21/08/1971
01/04/1972
09/07/1982
09/07/1982
    D3419   08349 16/11/1957 88B
88C
88B
88M
86A
W
Cardiff East Dock (New)
Barry
Cardiff East Dock
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff Canton
Withdrawn
16/11/1957
29/11/1958
27/12/1958
03/11/1962
29/11/1964
31/07/1983
31/07/1983
    D3420   08350 07/12/1957 88B
88M
86A
W
Cardiff East Dock (New)
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff Canton
Withdrawn
07/12/1957
03/11/1962
29/11/1964
17/01/1984
17/01/1984
    D3421   08351 20/12/1957 88B
88M
86A
W
Cardiff East Dock (New)
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff Canton
Withdrawn
20/12/1957
03/11/1962
29/11/1964
17/01/1984
17/01/1984
    D3422   08352 31/12/1957 88B
88M
86A
W
Cardiff East Dock (New)
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff Canton
Withdrawn
31/12/1957
03/11/1962
29/11/1964
10/07/1983
10/07/1983
    D3423   08353 18/01/1958 88B
88M
86A
W
Cardiff East Dock (New)
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff Canton
Withdrawn
18/01/1958
03/11/1962
29/11/1964
05/07/1981
05/07/1981
    D3424   08354 05/02/1958 88B
88C
88B
88M
86A
W
Cardiff East Dock (New)
Barry
Cardiff East Dock
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff Canton
Withdrawn
05/02/1958
29/11/1958
27/12/1958
03/11/1962
29/11/1964
10/07/1986
10/07/1986
    D3425   08355 20/02/1958 88B
88M
86A
16C
16B
91M
8J
8H
8F
W
Cardiff East Dock (New)
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff Canton
Derby
Colwick
To London Midland Region
Allerton
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
20/02/1958
03/11/1962
29/11/1964
20/07/1968
27/07/1968
27/07/1968
18/04/1970
09/05/1970
08/07/1972
09/05/1983
09/05/1983
    D3426   08356 26/03/1958 88B
88C
88B
88M
86A
16C
16B
91M
16C
SY
BS
W
Cardiff East Dock (New)
Barry
Cardiff East Dock
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff Canton
Derby
Colwick
To London Midland Region
Derby
Saltley
Bescot
Withdrawn
26/03/1958
29/11/1958
27/12/1958
03/11/1962
29/11/1964
20/07/1968
27/07/1968
27/07/1968
18/04/1970
24/11/1973
12/01/1974
01/11/1982
01/11/1982
    D3427   08357 10/03/1958 88B
88M
86A
40B
W
Cardiff East Dock (New)
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff Canton
Immingham
Withdrawn
10/03/1958
03/11/1962
29/11/1964
10/08/1968
04/09/1977
04/09/1977
    D3428   08358 21/03/1958 88B
88M
86A
40B
W
Cardiff East Dock (New)
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff Canton
Immingham
Withdrawn
21/03/1958
03/11/1962
29/11/1964
10/08/1968
06/10/1977
06/10/1977
    D3429   08359 28/03/1958 82B
82B
87C
87A
87B
W
St Philips Marsh (New)
St Philips Marsh
Danygraig
Neath (Court Sart)
Margam
Withdrawn
28/03/1958
19/04/1958
30/01/1960
27/01/1962
13/04/1964
22/01/1984
22/01/1984
    D3430   08360 08/04/1958 82B
87C
87A
87B
W
St Philips Marsh (New)
Danygraig
Neath (Court Sart)
Margam
Withdrawn
08/04/1958
30/01/1960
27/01/1962
13/04/1964
24/01/1983
24/01/1983
    D3431   08361 17/04/1958 84B
82B
87C
87A
87B
CF
W
Oxley (New)
St Philips Marsh
Danygraig
Neath (Court Sart)
Margam
Cardiff Canton
Withdrawn
17/04/1958
19/04/1958
30/01/1960
27/01/1962
13/04/1964
04/10/1975
23/02/1988
23/02/1988
    D3432   08362 22/04/1958 87B
87A
87B
86A
87B
W
Duffryn Yard (New)
Neath (Court Sart)
Margam
Cardiff Canton
Margam
Withdrawn
22/04/1958
27/01/1962
13/04/1964
13/06/1965
15/01/1967
28/03/1982
28/03/1982
    D3433   08363 30/04/1958 87B
87A
87B
86B
W
Duffryn Yard (New)
Neath (Court Sart)
Margam
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Withdrawn
30/04/1958
27/01/1962
13/04/1964
13/01/1973
01/08/1982
01/08/1982
    D3434   08364 08/05/1958 87B
87A
87B
86A
OC
W
Duffryn Yard (New)
Neath (Court Sart)
Margam
Cardiff Canton
Old Oak Common
Withdrawn
08/05/1958
27/01/1962
13/04/1964
17/03/1973
10/01/1976
21/01/1983
21/01/1983
    D3435   08365 24/05/1958 87B
87B
87A
87B
W
Duffryn Yard (New)
Duffryn Yard
Neath (Court Sart)
Margam
Withdrawn
24/05/1958
14/06/1958
27/01/1962
13/04/1964
07/09/1980
07/09/1980
    D3436   08366 24/05/1958 87B
87B
87A
87B
W
Duffryn Yard (New)
Duffryn Yard
Neath (Court Sart)
Margam
Withdrawn
24/05/1958
14/06/1958
27/01/1962
13/04/1964
08/12/1980
08/12/1980
    D3437   08367 16/06/1958 87B
87A
87B
W
Duffryn Yard (New)
Neath (Court Sart)
Margam
Withdrawn
16/06/1958
27/01/1962
13/04/1964
12/09/1988
12/09/1988
    D3438   08368 18/06/1958 87B
87A
87B
W
Duffryn Yard (New)
Neath (Court Sart)
Margam
Withdrawn
18/06/1958
27/01/1962
13/04/1964
08/12/1980
08/12/1980
    D3454   08369 27/05/1957 56G
55B
55A
W
Bradford Hammerton Street (New)
Stourton
Holbeck (MR)
Withdrawn
27/05/1957
20/07/1957
09/09/1967
31/03/1985
31/03/1985
    D3455   08370 23/05/1957 56G
52E
52B
52A
52E
W
Bradford Hammerton Street (New)
Percy Main
Heaton
Gateshead
Percy Main
Withdrawn
23/05/1957
19/07/1958
13/12/1958
20/06/1959
14/08/1965
04/03/1984
04/03/1984
    D3456   08371 31/05/1957 56G
51A
56G
56B
W
Bradford Hammerton Street (New)
Darlington
Bradford Hammerton Street
Healey Mills
Withdrawn
31/05/1957
20/06/1959
03/08/1963
08/10/1966
16/10/1983
16/10/1983
    D3457   08372 06/06/1957 55B
56G
55F
56G
56B
W
Stourton (New)
Bradford Hammerton Street
Manningham
Bradford Hammerton Street
Healey Mills
Withdrawn
06/06/1957
20/07/1957
18/07/1959
18/07/1964
08/10/1966
02/12/1984
02/12/1984
    D3458   08373 12/06/1957 55D
55C
36A
TE
W
Royston (New)
Healey Mills
Doncaster
Thornaby
Withdrawn
12/06/1957
02/10/1971
11/12/1971
20/11/1976
26/05/1985
26/05/1985
    D3459   08374 17/06/1957 73C
70B
75C
70B
75C
HG
W
Hither Green (New)
Feltham
Norwood Junction
Feltham
Selhurst
Hither Green
Withdrawn
17/06/1957
05/10/1960
02/07/1962
17/12/1962
22/07/1970
28/01/1974
06/12/1982
06/12/1982
    D3460   08375 21/06/1957 73C
73C
75C
70B
75C
HG
W
Hither Green (New)
Hither Green
Norwood Junction
Feltham
Selhurst
Hither Green
Withdrawn
21/06/1957
23/08/1961
05/03/1962
17/12/1962
14/06/1968
28/01/1974
08/11/1991
08/11/1991
    D3461   08376 24/06/1957 73C
75C
W
Hither Green (New)
Norwood Junction
Withdrawn
24/06/1957
08/10/1957
17/07/1983
17/07/1983
    D3462   08377 27/06/1957 73C
75C
5A
8F
BR
BZ
W
Hither Green (New)
Norwood Junction
Crewe Diesel
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Bristol Bath Road
St Blazey
Withdrawn
27/06/1957
01/05/1962
07/12/1968
13/05/1972
22/06/1974
22/02/1975
26/06/1983
26/06/1983
    D3463   08378 01/07/1957 73C
75C
HG
W
Hither Green (New)
Norwood Junction
Hither Green
Withdrawn
01/07/1957
30/07/1962
28/01/1974
11/07/1981
11/07/1981
    D3464   08379 05/07/1957 73C
75C
W
Hither Green (New)
Norwood Junction
Withdrawn
05/07/1957
08/10/1957
27/12/1980
27/12/1980
    D3465   08380 09/07/1957 73C
75C
73C
73E
73C
73FSub
W
Hither Green (New)
Norwood Junction
Hither Green
Faversham
Hither Green
Ashford Chart Leacon
Withdrawn
09/07/1957
08/10/1957
01/05/1962
24/06/1963
09/12/1963
09/07/1967
01/08/1982
01/08/1982
    D3466   08381 10/07/1957 73C
73C
73FSub
W
Hither Green (New)
Hither Green
Ashford Chart Leacon
Withdrawn
10/07/1957
05/03/1962
09/07/1967
19/12/1982
19/12/1982
    D3467   08382 07/08/1957 73C
73C
5A
91M
W
Hither Green (New)
Hither Green
Crewe Diesel
To London Midland Region
Withdrawn
07/08/1957
01/05/1962
12/11/1966
14/11/1966
08/03/1985
08/03/1985
    D3468   08383 12/08/1957 73C
73FSub
W
Hither Green (New)
Ashford Chart Leacon
Withdrawn
12/08/1957
09/07/1967
17/03/1985
17/03/1985
    D3469   08384 19/08/1957 74A
75C
W
Ashford (New)
Norwood Junction
Withdrawn
19/08/1957
10/06/1960
19/01/1986
19/01/1986
    D3470   08385 26/08/1957 74A
73C
W
Ashford (New)
Hither Green
Withdrawn
26/08/1957
24/02/1958
12/09/1988
12/09/1988
    D3471   08386 28/08/1957 73C
73E
73FSub
73C
91M
5A
41A
W
Hither Green (New)
Faversham
Ashford Chart Leacon
Hither Green
To London Midland Region
Crewe Diesel
Tinsley
Withdrawn
28/08/1957
24/06/1963
27/01/1964
10/01/1966
30/09/1968
12/10/1968
05/08/1972
06/01/1987
06/01/1987
    D3472   08387 30/08/1957 73C
70D
73C
70D
W
Hither Green (New)
Eastleigh
Hither Green
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
30/08/1957
09/07/1967
30/09/1971
29/10/1971
28/05/1982
28/05/1982
    D3503   08388 14/04/1958 82B
82A
82A
91N
51L
YK
W
St Philips Marsh (New)
Bristol Bath Road
Bristol Bath Road
To North Eastern Region
Thornaby
York (North)
Withdrawn
14/04/1958
04/11/1961
29/11/1964
18/03/1968
30/03/1968
09/05/1976
20/07/2001
20/07/2001
    D3504   08389 17/04/1958 82B
82A
82A
82C
51L
51A
TE
St Philips Marsh (New)
Bristol Bath Road
Bristol Bath Road
Swindon
Thornaby
Darlington
Thornaby
17/04/1958
04/11/1961
29/11/1964
28/08/1966
25/05/1968
17/05/1969
12/05/1973
    D3505   08390 18/04/1958 82B
82A
82A
16C
16A
91M
CD
CD
W
St Philips Marsh (New)
Bristol Bath Road
Bristol Bath Road
Derby
Toton
To London Midland Region
Crewe Diesel
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
18/04/1958
04/11/1961
29/11/1964
15/06/1968
22/06/1968
27/07/1968
27/09/1975
31/10/1979
19/03/1993
19/03/1993
    D3506   08391 18/04/1958 82B
82A
82A
40B
FH
W
St Philips Marsh (New)
Bristol Bath Road
Bristol Bath Road
Immingham
Frodingham
Withdrawn
18/04/1958
04/11/1961
29/11/1964
10/08/1968
09/11/1974
04/08/1985
04/08/1985
    D3507   08392 25/04/1958 82B
82A
82A
40B
36C
W
St Philips Marsh (New)
Bristol Bath Road
Bristol Bath Road
Immingham
Frodingham
Withdrawn
25/04/1958
04/11/1961
29/11/1964
17/08/1968
19/02/1972
01/12/1984
01/12/1984
    D3508   08393 25/04/1958 82B
82A
82A
86A
40B
MR
St Philips Marsh (New)
Bristol Bath Road
Bristol Bath Road
Cardiff Canton
Immingham
March
25/04/1958
04/11/1961
29/11/1964
15/01/1967
10/08/1968
30/11/1979
    D3509   08394 02/05/1958 83D
83F
83E
83F
84B

83A
82A
83A
82A
83A
LA
W
Laira (New)
Truro
St Blazey
Truro
St Blazey

Newton Abbot
Bristol Bath Road
Newton Abbot
Bristol Bath Road
Newton Abbot
Laira
Withdrawn
02/05/1958
24/01/1959
03/12/1960
25/02/1961
07/11/1965
01/11/1966
06/12/1969
03/07/1971
16/10/1971
13/05/1972
12/08/1972
28/09/1974
20/11/1987
20/11/1987
    D3510   08395 02/05/1958 83D
83F
86A

6D
5A
2E
W
Laira (New)
Truro
Cardiff Canton

Shrewsbury
Crewe Diesel
Saltley
Withdrawn
02/05/1958
06/09/1958
08/11/1964
30/09/1967
12/10/1968
19/06/1971
15/04/1972
27/07/1988
27/07/1988
    D3511   08396 09/05/1958 83D
83A
82D
86A
81A
16A
91M
2E
12A
W
Laira (New)
Newton Abbot
Westbury
Cardiff Canton
Old Oak Common
Toton
To London Midland Region
Saltley
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
09/05/1958
06/09/1958
27/01/1962
21/02/1965
07/03/1965
03/02/1968
18/03/1968
17/05/1969
24/04/1971
13/03/1986
13/03/1986
    D3512   08397 09/05/1958 83D
83C
81A
81C
85A
36A
36C
Laira (New)
Exeter
Old Oak Common
Southall
Worcester
Doncaster
Frodingham
09/05/1958
06/09/1958
26/03/1960
25/03/1961
19/06/1966
24/08/1968
15/01/1972
    D3513   08398 16/05/1958 83D
83A
82A
82C
W
Laira (New)
Newton Abbot
Bristol Bath Road
Swindon
Withdrawn
16/05/1958
06/09/1958
14/08/1971
12/08/1972
15/07/1985
15/07/1985
    D3514   08399 16/05/1958 83D
83G
16C
16A
91M
W
Laira (New)
Penzance
Derby
Toton
To London Midland Region
Withdrawn
16/05/1958
06/09/1958
15/06/1968
22/06/1968
27/07/1968
13/11/1992
13/11/1992
    D3515   08400 23/05/1958 83D
83D
83A
83A
85A
86B
87E
86A
W
Laira (New)
Laira
Newton Abbot
Newton Abbot
Worcester
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Landore
Cardiff Canton
Withdrawn
23/05/1958
14/06/1958
06/09/1958
15/01/1966
19/06/1966
15/01/1967
31/03/1967
03/05/1969
21/12/1987
21/12/1987
    D3516   08401 23/05/1958 83D
83D
83E
83D
83D
83C
82A
36A
Laira (New)
Laira
St Blazey
Laira
Exmouth Junction
Westbury
Bristol Bath Road
Doncaster
23/05/1958
14/06/1958
27/01/1962
01/06/1963
22/06/1964
07/11/1965
15/01/1967
10/08/1968
    D3517   08402 23/05/1958 83D
83D
83A
83C
83D
83D
84B
82A
BZ
W
Laira (New)
Laira
Newton Abbot
Exeter
Exmouth Junction
Exmouth Junction
St Blazey
Bristol Bath Road
St Blazey
Withdrawn
23/05/1958
14/06/1958
06/09/1958
01/06/1963
02/11/1963
22/06/1964
06/12/1969
04/04/1970
22/02/1975
30/09/2008
30/09/2008
    D3518   08403 30/05/1958 83D
83C
84E
84F
81D
1A
81A
14A
W
Laira (New)
Exeter
Tyseley
Stourbridge Junction
Reading (W.R.)
Willesden
Old Oak Common
Cricklewood East
Withdrawn
30/05/1958
06/09/1958
27/02/1960
14/07/1962
12/01/1963
09/05/1970
21/05/1970
26/06/1971
18/10/1981
18/10/1981
    D3519   08404 30/05/1958 83A
83C
83D
83A
36A
36C
W
Newton Abbot (New)
Exeter
Exmouth Junction
Newton Abbot
Doncaster
Frodingham
Withdrawn
30/05/1958
01/06/1963
02/11/1963
31/05/1967
24/08/1968
08/01/1972
27/07/1978
27/07/1978
    D3520   08405 06/06/1958 83A
83D
88M
87A
87B
40B
Newton Abbot (New)
Laira
Cardiff Cathays
Neath (Court Sart)
Margam
Immingham
06/06/1958
06/09/1958
01/06/1963
27/07/1963
13/04/1964
29/03/1969
    D3521   08406 06/06/1958 83A
83C
83D
84A
85A
31B
W
Newton Abbot (New)
Exeter
Exmouth Junction
Laira
Worcester
March
Withdrawn
06/06/1958
06/09/1958
02/11/1963
15/01/1966
09/11/1968
29/03/1969
20/04/1988
20/04/1988
    D3522   08407 06/06/1958 83A
83D
83C
83D
83B
83F
83A
31B
W
Newton Abbot (New)
Laira
Exeter
Laira
Taunton
Barnstaple Junction
Newton Abbot
March
Withdrawn
06/06/1958
06/09/1958
01/11/1958
01/06/1963
04/05/1964
20/07/1964
31/05/1967
26/04/1969
01/02/1993
01/02/1993
    D3523   08408 13/06/1958 83A
83D
86A
87B
86A
30A
91E
W
Newton Abbot (New)
Laira
Cardiff Canton
Margam
Cardiff Canton
Stratford
To Eastern Region
Withdrawn
13/06/1958
06/09/1958
08/11/1964
18/03/1968
27/07/1968
15/02/1969
15/03/1969
29/04/1988
29/04/1988
    D3524   08409 13/06/1958 83A
83D
83E
84A
91E
30A
W
Newton Abbot (New)
Laira
St Blazey
Laira
To Eastern Region
Stratford
Withdrawn
13/06/1958
06/09/1958
01/06/1963
25/01/1969
15/03/1969
15/03/1969
15/06/1986
15/06/1986
    D3525   08410 20/06/1958 83A
83D
83A
Newton Abbot (New)
Laira
Newton Abbot
20/06/1958
06/09/1958
03/07/1971
    D3526   08411 20/06/1958 83F
83D
84C
84B
82A
W
Truro (New)
Laira
Truro
St Blazey
Bristol Bath Road
Withdrawn
20/06/1958
06/09/1958
19/09/1965
07/11/1965
08/01/1972
28/02/2007
28/02/2007
    D3527   08412 20/06/1958 83F
88B
88C
88B
88M
86A
81C
86A
86A
31B
W
Truro (New)
Cardiff East Dock
Barry
Cardiff East Dock
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff Canton
Southall
Cardiff Canton
Cardiff Canton
March
Withdrawn
20/06/1958
09/08/1958
29/11/1958
27/12/1958
03/11/1962
29/11/1964
19/09/1965
01/05/1966
09/11/1968
07/12/1968
24/11/1985
24/11/1985
    D3528   08413 27/06/1958 66B
66C
65F
64B
31B
W
Motherwell (New)
Hamilton (West)
Grangemouth
Haymarket
March
Withdrawn
27/06/1958
16/03/1963
31/08/1968
28/12/1968
04/01/1969
30/06/2004
30/06/2004
    D3529   08414 27/06/1958 66C
66A
66C
65F
BR
AF
W
Hamilton (West) (New)
Polmadie
Hamilton (West)
Grangemouth
Bristol Bath Road
Ashford Chart Leacon
Withdrawn
27/06/1958
26/09/1959
07/09/1963
31/08/1968
17/05/1975
03/10/1976
28/02/2007
28/02/2007
    D3530   08415 04/07/1958 65G
65E
10D
12A
W
Yoker (New)
Kipps
Lostock Hall
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
04/07/1958
27/09/1958
05/11/1966
18/09/1971
30/09/1996
30/09/1996
    D3531   08416 04/07/1958 65G
65E
10D
12A
CD
W
Yoker (New)
Kipps
Lostock Hall
Carlisle Kingmoor
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
04/07/1958
27/09/1958
05/11/1966
18/09/1971
15/12/1973
14/02/1992
14/02/1992
    D3532   08417 04/07/1958 68D
65D
65A
62C
64B
36A
30A
Beattock (New)
Dawsholm
Eastfield
Dunfermline Upper
Haymarket
Doncaster
Stratford
04/07/1958
27/09/1958
24/11/1962
27/01/1968
30/11/1968
04/01/1969
08/01/1972
    D3533   08418 10/07/1958 65I
65E
65F
65J
65F
65A
66C
66C
66A
66A
67C
64B
40A
91E
Balloch (New)
Kipps
Grangemouth
Stirling
Grangemouth
Eastfield
Hamilton (West)
Hamilton (West)
Polmadie
Polmadie
Ayr
Haymarket
Lincoln
To Eastern Region
10/07/1958
27/09/1958
02/11/1963
25/01/1964
30/05/1964
26/11/1966
26/11/1966
29/06/1968
29/06/1968
27/07/1968
26/10/1968
28/12/1968
01/02/1969
01/03/1969
    D3534   08419 11/07/1958 65I
67C
12A

W
Balloch (New)
Ayr
Carlisle Kingmoor

Withdrawn
11/07/1958
13/04/1963
08/06/1968
24/07/1988
23/04/1993
23/04/1993
    D3535   08420 11/07/1958 63B
63A
60B
63A
62B
64B
36A
W
Stirling (New)
Perth South
Aviemore
Perth South
Dundee West
Haymarket
Doncaster
Withdrawn
11/07/1958
22/11/1958
14/07/1962
24/11/1962
29/04/1967
28/12/1968
04/01/1969
12/09/1988
12/09/1988
    D3536   08421 08/08/1958 63B
65A
ML
Stirling (New)
Eastfield
Motherwell
08/08/1958
26/11/1966
31/10/1979
    D3537   08422 08/08/1958 63B
65F
64B
36A
91E
30A
W
Stirling (New)
Grangemouth
Haymarket
Doncaster
To Eastern Region
Stratford
Withdrawn
08/08/1958
26/11/1966
28/12/1968
01/02/1969
01/03/1969
08/01/1972
09/12/1985
09/12/1985
    D3538   08423 15/08/1958 63B
65F
2F
8F
W
Stirling (New)
Grangemouth
Bescot
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
15/08/1958
26/11/1966
18/10/1969
02/10/1971
24/11/1988
24/11/1988
    D3539   08424 15/08/1958 63B
65F
61B
DE
W
Stirling (New)
Grangemouth
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Dundee West
Withdrawn
15/08/1958
26/11/1966
01/01/1972
29/12/1973
10/06/1985
10/06/1985
    D3540   08425 22/08/1958 63B
62C
62B
62C
62C
W
Stirling (New)
Dunfermline Upper
Dundee Tay Bridge
Dunfermline Townhill
Dunfermline Townhill
Withdrawn
22/08/1958
22/10/1960
29/05/1965
26/02/1972
01/04/1972
09/09/1985
09/09/1985
    D3541   08426 22/08/1958 63A
62B
62B
W
Perth South (New)
Dundee West
Dundee West
Withdrawn
22/08/1958
01/08/1970
27/01/1973
02/07/1976
02/07/1976
    D3542   08427 29/08/1958 63A
64B
31B
91E
W
Perth South (New)
Haymarket
March
To Eastern Region
Withdrawn
29/08/1958
28/12/1968
01/02/1969
01/03/1969
14/11/1986
14/11/1986
    D3543   08428 29/08/1958 63A
62B
Perth South (New)
Dundee West
29/08/1958
01/08/1970
    D3544   08429 05/09/1958 63A
64B
36A
40A
41J
W
Perth South (New)
Haymarket
Doncaster
Lincoln
Shirebrook
Withdrawn
05/09/1958
01/03/1969
14/06/1969
24/10/1970
31/03/1973
01/10/1983
01/10/1983
    D3545   08430 05/09/1958 63A
62B
65A
65A
AY
W
Perth South (New)
Dundee West
Eastfield
Eastfield
Ayr
Withdrawn
05/09/1958
01/08/1970
01/04/1972
28/10/1972
29/12/1973
18/12/1985
18/12/1985
    D3546   08431 12/09/1958 61B
61A
64H
16C
91M
8C
8J
W
Aberdeen Ferryhill (New)
Kittybrewster
Leith Central
Derby
To London Midland Region
Speke Junction
Allerton
Withdrawn
12/09/1958
01/07/1961
29/01/1966
19/08/1967
26/08/1967
09/09/1967
11/05/1968
04/07/1985
04/07/1985
    D3547   08432 19/09/1958 61B
61A
64A
64H
65A
62A
62A
64H
55A
55F
W
Aberdeen Ferryhill (New)
Kittybrewster
St Margarets
Leith Central
Eastfield
Thornton Junction
Thornton Junction
Leith Central
Holbeck (MR)
Bradford Hammerton Street
Withdrawn
19/09/1958
01/07/1961
30/04/1966
25/02/1967
28/10/1967
29/03/1969
31/05/1969
29/11/1969
28/02/1970
16/01/1971
16/10/1983
16/10/1983
    D3548   08433 26/09/1958 61B
61A
64A
64H
60A
64H
64B
AY
W
Aberdeen Ferryhill (New)
Kittybrewster
St Margarets
Leith Central
Inverness
Leith Central
Haymarket
Ayr
Withdrawn
26/09/1958
01/07/1961
30/04/1966
25/02/1967
01/06/1968
28/02/1970
27/05/1972
27/04/1974
17/03/1986
17/03/1986
    D3549   08434 26/09/1958 61B
61A
61B
62A
91E
36C
40B
W
Aberdeen Ferryhill (New)
Kittybrewster
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Thornton Junction
To Eastern Region
Frodingham
Immingham
Withdrawn
26/09/1958
01/07/1961
30/09/1967
31/08/1968
29/03/1969
29/03/1969
12/04/1969
10/02/1992
10/02/1992
    D3550   08435 03/10/1958 61B
61A
61B
62B
64B
61B
36A
BG
W
Aberdeen Ferryhill (New)
Kittybrewster
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Dundee West
Haymarket
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Doncaster
Hull Botanic Gardens
Withdrawn
03/10/1958
01/07/1961
30/09/1967
28/06/1969
07/08/1971
21/08/1971
26/02/1972
11/07/1976
30/11/1980
30/11/1980
    D3551   08436 03/10/1958 61B
61A
61B
60A
36A
40B
W
Aberdeen Ferryhill (New)
Kittybrewster
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Inverness
Doncaster
Immingham
Withdrawn
03/10/1958
01/07/1961
30/09/1967
01/03/1969
26/02/1972
06/05/1972
10/01/1992
10/01/1992
    D3552   08437 10/10/1958 61A
61B
66C
W
Kittybrewster (New)
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Hamilton (West)
Withdrawn
10/10/1958
30/09/1967
31/01/1970
01/12/1984
01/12/1984
    D3553   08438 17/10/1958 61A
61B
31B
W
Kittybrewster (New)
Aberdeen Ferryhill
March
Withdrawn
17/10/1958
30/09/1967
26/02/1972
23/03/1986
23/03/1986
    D3554   08439 24/10/1958 64F
64B
64H
65A
66C
66A
62A
36A
40B
W
Bathgate (New)
Haymarket
Leith Central
Eastfield
Hamilton (West)
Polmadie
Thornton Junction
Doncaster
Immingham
Withdrawn
24/10/1958
24/09/1966
25/11/1967
30/12/1967
27/01/1968
29/06/1968
31/08/1968
14/06/1969
01/05/1971
17/10/1988
17/10/1988
    D3555   08440 24/10/1958 64F
64B
60A
31B
30A
W
Bathgate (New)
Haymarket
Inverness
March
Stratford
Withdrawn
24/10/1958
24/09/1966
28/06/1969
26/02/1972
11/03/1972
03/05/1990
03/05/1990
    D3556   08441 30/10/1958 64F
64E
65F
Bathgate (New)
Polmont
Grangemouth
30/10/1958
20/12/1958
25/01/1964
    D3557   08442 03/11/1958 64F
64E
65F
Bathgate (New)
Polmont
Grangemouth
03/11/1958
20/12/1958
25/01/1964
    D3558   08443 07/11/1958 64E
64A
62B
64B
61B
ED
W
Polmont (New)
St Margarets
Dundee Tay Bridge
Haymarket
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Eastfield
Withdrawn
07/11/1958
29/08/1959
30/01/1965
07/08/1971
21/08/1971
31/12/1976
07/07/1985
07/07/1985
    D3559   08444 07/11/1958 64E
65F
64B
36A
W
Polmont (New)
Grangemouth
Haymarket
Doncaster
Withdrawn
07/11/1958
25/01/1964
01/03/1969
14/06/1969
02/11/1986
02/11/1986
    D3560   08445 14/11/1958 64B
64C
64F
64B
62C
62A
63A
62B
62C
W
Haymarket (New)
Dalry Road
Bathgate
Haymarket
Dunfermline Upper
Thornton Junction
Perth South
Dundee West
Dunfermline Townhill
Withdrawn
14/11/1958
12/03/1960
30/10/1965
24/09/1966
29/06/1968
01/03/1969
27/09/1969
01/08/1970
01/08/1970
20/07/2001
20/07/2001
    D3561   08446 21/11/1958 64B
64C
64A
64H
65A
67C
W
Haymarket (New)
Dalry Road
St Margarets
Leith Central
Eastfield
Ayr
Withdrawn
21/11/1958
12/03/1960
30/10/1965
25/02/1967
25/11/1967
27/01/1968
02/12/1985
02/12/1985
    D3562   08447 28/11/1958 65C
65A
41A

W
Parkhead (New)
Eastfield
Tinsley

Withdrawn
28/11/1958
24/11/1962
05/03/1966
24/07/1988
11/11/1994
11/11/1994
    D3563   08448 28/11/1958 67C
24C
Ayr (New)
Lostock Hall
28/11/1958
18/05/1963
    D3564   08449 28/11/1958 67C
W
Ayr (New)
Withdrawn
28/11/1958
31/01/2003
31/01/2003
    D3565   08450 05/12/1958 12A
12A
W
Carlisle Kingmoor (New)
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
05/12/1958
20/01/1968
02/05/1986
02/05/1986
    D3566   08451 05/12/1958 12A
10A
12C
12A
Carlisle Kingmoor (New)
Carnforth
Barrow in Furness
Carlisle Kingmoor
05/12/1958
14/01/1967
10/08/1968
12/10/1968
    D3567   08452 12/12/1958 12A
W
Carlisle Kingmoor (New)
Withdrawn
12/12/1958
10/06/1985
10/06/1985
    D3568   08453 12/12/1958 17B
16C
12A
HO
W
Burton (New)
Derby
Carlisle Kingmoor
Holbeck (MR)
Withdrawn
12/12/1958
18/07/1964
19/07/1969
03/08/1974
05/10/1980
05/10/1980
    D3569   08454 19/12/1958 17B
16C
Burton (New)
Derby
19/12/1958
04/11/1967
    D3570   08455 24/12/1958 17B
16C
W
Burton (New)
Derby
Withdrawn
24/12/1958
04/11/1967
01/09/1985
01/09/1985
    D3571   08456 03/01/1959 17B
16C
W
Burton (New)
Derby
Withdrawn
03/01/1959
26/09/1964
29/04/1988
29/04/1988
    D3572   08457 03/01/1959 17B
14B
1E
W
Burton (New)
Cricklewood West
Bletchley
Withdrawn
03/01/1959
14/10/1967
02/09/1972
01/09/1985
01/09/1985
    D3573   08458 12/07/1958 14D
14A
W
Neasden (New)
Cricklewood East
Withdrawn
12/07/1958
07/11/1959
16/08/1988
16/08/1988
    D3574   08459 01/08/1958 18A
41B
41A
41A
W
Toton (New)
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
Withdrawn
01/08/1958
11/10/1958
16/09/1961
26/04/1964
30/10/1988
30/10/1988
    D3575   08460 13/08/1958 18A
41B
41A
41A
Toton (New)
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
13/08/1958
11/10/1958
16/09/1961
26/04/1964
    D3576   08461 20/08/1958 8A
18A
21A
W
Edge Hill (New)
Toton
Saltley
Withdrawn
20/08/1958
01/11/1958
19/11/1960
23/02/1988
23/02/1988
    D3577   08462 28/08/1958 5B
18A
21A
16A
16C
Crewe South (New)
Toton
Saltley
Toton
Derby
28/08/1958
01/11/1958
19/11/1960
09/12/1967
29/03/1969
    D3578   08463 22/09/1958 8A
8C
8A
8J
W
Edge Hill (New)
Speke Junction
Edge Hill
Allerton
Withdrawn
22/09/1958
29/01/1966
28/05/1966
11/05/1968
16/03/1989
16/03/1989
    D3579   08464 25/09/1958 24K
8A
8J
W
Preston (New)
Edge Hill
Allerton
Withdrawn
25/09/1958
18/10/1958
11/05/1968
01/09/1985
01/09/1985
    D3580   08465 01/10/1958 24K
11B
12A
10D
12A
W
Preston (New)
Workington
Carlisle Kingmoor
Lostock Hall
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
01/10/1958
25/10/1958
15/04/1967
09/09/1967
15/08/1970
09/08/1985
09/08/1985
    D3581   08466 07/10/1958 24K
24K
24C
12A
BS
Preston (New)
Preston
Lostock Hall
Carlisle Kingmoor
Bescot
07/10/1958
25/10/1958
16/09/1961
10/10/1970
10/07/1976
    D3582   08467 16/10/1958 21A
18A
21A
W
Saltley (New)
Toton
Saltley
Withdrawn
16/10/1958
15/08/1959
10/10/1959
29/11/1981
29/11/1981
    D3583   08468 03/11/1958 21A
5B
5A
SP
W
Saltley (New)
Crewe South
Crewe Diesel
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
03/11/1958
28/02/1959
25/11/1967
01/05/1988
23/11/1988
23/11/1988
    D3584   08469 07/11/1958 21A
5B
9B
5B
5A
6J
5A
W
Saltley (New)
Crewe South
Stockport Edgeley
Crewe South
Crewe Diesel
Holyhead
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
07/11/1958
28/02/1959
23/07/1960
10/09/1960
25/11/1967
16/12/1967
04/10/1969
01/09/1985
01/09/1985
    D3585   08470 07/11/1958 17B
5A
W
Burton (New)
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
07/11/1958
08/11/1969
23/03/1986
23/03/1986
    D3586   08471 13/11/1958 17B
15A
W
Burton (New)
Leicester Midland
Withdrawn
13/11/1958
04/11/1967
09/09/1985
09/09/1985
    D3587   08472 20/11/1958 17B
17A
15A
Burton (New)
Derby
Leicester Midland
20/11/1958
24/08/1963
29/03/1969
    D3588   08473 28/11/1958 26A
9A
NH
CD
W
Newton Heath (New)
Longsight
Newton Heath
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
28/11/1958
06/07/1968
12/05/1973
05/04/1975
17/03/1986
17/03/1986
    D3589   08474 02/12/1958 26A
9A
NH
BS
W
Newton Heath (New)
Longsight
Newton Heath
Bescot
Withdrawn
02/12/1958
06/07/1968
12/05/1973
24/07/1976
07/09/1986
07/09/1986
    D3590   08475 10/12/1958 26A
9A
NH
W
Newton Heath (New)
Longsight
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
10/12/1958
06/07/1968
12/05/1973
09/03/1987
09/03/1987
    D3591   08476 17/12/1958 26A
9A
66A
65A
67C
W
Newton Heath (New)
Longsight
Polmadie
Eastfield
Ayr
Withdrawn
17/12/1958
06/07/1968
27/11/1971
01/04/1972
30/12/1972
09/09/1985
09/09/1985
    D3592   08477 03/01/1959 26A
9A
NH
W
Newton Heath (New)
Longsight
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
03/01/1959
06/07/1968
12/05/1973
07/12/1986
07/12/1986
    D3593   08478 20/08/1958 83E
88B
88C
88B
88M
87F
87E
86B
BR
W
St Blazey (New)
Cardiff East Dock
Barry
Cardiff East Dock
Cardiff Cathays
Llanelly
Landore
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Bristol Bath Road
Withdrawn
20/08/1958
01/11/1958
29/11/1958
27/12/1958
03/11/1962
02/11/1963
04/05/1964
16/10/1971
17/05/1975
27/04/1988
27/04/1988
    D3594   08479 01/09/1958 83E
88B
88M
86A
87A
86B
BR
NA
W
St Blazey (New)
Cardiff East Dock
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff Canton
Landore
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Bristol Bath Road
Newton Abbot
Withdrawn
01/09/1958
01/11/1958
03/11/1962
29/11/1964
03/07/1971
16/10/1971
12/07/1975
04/10/1975
08/11/1991
08/11/1991
    D3595   08480 12/09/1958 83E
88B
88M
86A
St Blazey (New)
Cardiff East Dock
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff Canton
12/09/1958
01/11/1958
03/11/1962
29/11/1964
    D3596   08481 19/09/1958 83G
88B
88M
87F
87E
87B
86B
W
Penzance (New)
Cardiff East Dock
Cardiff Cathays
Llanelly
Landore
Margam
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Withdrawn
19/09/1958
01/11/1958
03/11/1962
02/11/1963
04/05/1964
27/07/1968
06/12/1969
31/08/2005
31/08/2005
    D3597   08482 26/09/1958 83G
81A
30A
Penzance (New)
Old Oak Common
Stratford
26/09/1958
01/11/1958
09/11/1968
    D3598   08483 03/10/1958 83C
81A
81C
81A
EJ
Exeter (New)
Old Oak Common
Southall
Old Oak Common
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
03/10/1958
01/11/1958
21/05/1960
18/06/1960
11/12/1976
    D3599   08484 10/10/1958 81A
LE
Old Oak Common (New)
Landore
10/10/1958
11/12/1976
    D3600   08485 20/10/1958 81A
82C

KD
Old Oak Common (New)
Swindon

Carlisle Kingmoor
20/10/1958
30/12/1972
18/04/1988
12/05/1988
    D3601   08486 24/10/1958 81A
85B
W
Old Oak Common (New)
Gloucester Horton Road
Withdrawn
24/10/1958
30/12/1972
27/11/1986
27/11/1986
    D3602   08487 29/10/1958 81A
86B
W
Old Oak Common (New)
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Withdrawn
29/10/1958
30/12/1972
23/02/1988
23/02/1988
    D3603   08488 31/10/1958 81A
88B
88M
86A
LA
W
Old Oak Common (New)
Cardiff East Dock
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff Canton
Laira
Withdrawn
31/10/1958
27/12/1958
03/11/1962
29/11/1964
29/06/1974
16/02/1986
16/02/1986
    D3604   08489 07/11/1958 81A
81D
81A
86A
LA
W
Old Oak Common (New)
Reading (W.R.)
Old Oak Common
Cardiff Canton
Laira
Withdrawn
07/11/1958
31/10/1959
30/01/1960
09/11/1968
29/06/1974
30/09/2008
30/09/2008
    D3605   08490 14/11/1958 81A
88B
88M
87A
87B
87E
81A

8J
8J
8H
W
Old Oak Common (New)
Cardiff East Dock
Cardiff Cathays
Neath (Court Sart)
Margam
Landore
Old Oak Common

Allerton
Allerton
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Withdrawn
14/11/1958
16/05/1959
03/11/1962
02/11/1963
13/04/1964
18/03/1968
03/05/1969
24/01/1970
21/02/1970
07/03/1970
28/03/1970
18/12/1985
18/12/1985
    D3606   08491 19/11/1958 81A
88B
88M
87A
87E
86A
W
Old Oak Common (New)
Cardiff East Dock
Cardiff Cathays
Neath (Court Sart)
Landore
Cardiff Canton
Withdrawn
19/11/1958
27/12/1958
03/11/1962
02/11/1963
18/03/1968
13/05/1972
29/09/1985
29/09/1985
    D3607   08492 26/11/1958 81A
88B
88M
86A
82C
Old Oak Common (New)
Cardiff East Dock
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff Canton
Swindon
26/11/1958
27/12/1958
03/11/1962
29/11/1964
14/06/1969
    D3608   08493 28/02/1958 30A
31A
W
Stratford (New)
Cambridge
Withdrawn
28/02/1958
15/09/1962
30/06/2008
30/06/2008
    D3609   08494 01/03/1958 30A
W
Stratford (New)
Withdrawn
01/03/1958
16/08/1988
16/08/1988
    D3610   08495 08/03/1958 30A
Stratford (New)
08/03/1958
08/08/1976
    D3611   08496 12/03/1958 31A
W
Cambridge (New)
Withdrawn
12/03/1958
14/06/1990
14/06/1990
    D3652   08497 19/03/1958 55B
55C
55A
W
Stourton (New)
Farnley Junction
Holbeck (MR)
Withdrawn
19/03/1958
19/07/1958
03/12/1966
06/10/1985
06/10/1985
    D3653   08498 22/03/1958 55B
55C
55A
W
Stourton (New)
Farnley Junction
Holbeck (MR)
Withdrawn
22/03/1958
19/07/1958
03/12/1966
07/01/1994
07/01/1994
    D3654   08499 29/03/1958 55B
55A
YK
W
Stourton (New)
Holbeck (MR)
York (North)
Withdrawn
29/03/1958
09/09/1967
13/05/1988
01/06/2004
01/06/2004
    D3655   08500 18/04/1958 55B
55A
Stourton (New)
Holbeck (MR)
18/04/1958
09/09/1967
    D3656   08501 29/04/1958 55B
55F
55C
55A
W
Stourton (New)
Manningham
Farnley Junction
Holbeck (MR)
Withdrawn
29/04/1958
19/07/1958
31/10/1964
03/12/1966
15/07/1985
15/07/1985
    D3657   08502 06/05/1958 55B
55F
55H
51L
W
Stourton (New)
Manningham
Neville Hill
Thornaby
Withdrawn
06/05/1958
19/07/1958
14/11/1964
14/08/1971
30/10/1988
30/10/1988
    D3658   08503 15/05/1958 55B
55F
55C
55A
W
Stourton (New)
Manningham
Farnley Junction
Holbeck (MR)
Withdrawn
15/05/1958
19/07/1958
31/10/1964
03/12/1966
20/09/1988
20/09/1988
    D3659   08504 24/05/1958 41A
41B
41A
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
Withdrawn
24/05/1958
02/05/1964
09/10/1965
30/10/1988
30/10/1988
    D3660   08505 31/05/1958 41A
41B
41A
61B
60A
ED
GM
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Inverness
Eastfield
Grangemouth
Withdrawn
31/05/1958
02/05/1964
09/10/1965
04/05/1968
30/11/1968
29/03/1975
24/05/1975
22/02/1981
22/02/1981
    D3661   08506 06/06/1958 41A
41B
41A
34G
34D
31B
31A
DN
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
Finsbury Park
Hitchin (GNR)
March
Cambridge
Darlington
Withdrawn
06/06/1958
02/05/1964
09/10/1965
06/11/1965
11/12/1965
28/12/1968
25/10/1969
15/08/1976
28/02/2007
28/02/2007
    D3662   08507 20/06/1958 41A
41B
41A
41A
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
Withdrawn
20/06/1958
16/08/1958
16/09/1961
26/04/1964
13/08/1993
13/08/1993
    D3663   08508 20/06/1958 41A
41B
41A
41E
36A
36C
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Doncaster
Frodingham
Withdrawn
20/06/1958
02/05/1964
09/10/1965
01/01/1966
30/11/1968
20/02/1971
01/10/1991
01/10/1991
    D3664   08509 11/07/1958 41A
41B
41A
41E
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Withdrawn
11/07/1958
02/05/1964
09/10/1965
06/07/1968
30/09/2008
30/09/2008
    D3672   08510 20/05/1958 51A
51C
51L
W
Darlington (New)
West Hartlepool
Thornaby
Withdrawn
20/05/1958
27/02/1960
07/10/1967
30/09/2008
30/09/2008
    D3673   08511 21/05/1958 52E
52C
52B
52B
52E
Percy Main (New)
Blaydon
Heaton
Heaton
Percy Main
21/05/1958
13/12/1958
19/09/1959
10/12/1960
08/06/1963
    D3674   08512 28/05/1958 52E
52C
52E
52A
Percy Main (New)
Blaydon
Percy Main
Gateshead
28/05/1958
13/12/1958
08/06/1963
14/08/1965
    D3675   08513 05/06/1958 53C
53E
50B
50C
W
Hull Springhead (New)
Goole
Hull Dairycoates
Hull Botanic Gardens
Withdrawn
05/06/1958
29/11/1958
10/12/1960
26/09/1970
22/03/1978
22/03/1978
    D3676   08514 12/06/1958 53C
53E
50B
50C
Hull Springhead (New)
Goole
Hull Dairycoates
Hull Botanic Gardens
12/06/1958
29/11/1958
10/12/1960
26/09/1970
    D3677   08515 18/06/1958 51A
52A
61B
64H
W
Darlington (New)
Gateshead
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Leith Central
Withdrawn
18/06/1958
18/07/1970
09/10/1971
09/10/1971
20/01/1992
20/01/1992
    D3678   08516 11/08/1958 52E
52C
52E
Percy Main (New)
Blaydon
Percy Main
11/08/1958
13/12/1958
08/06/1963
    D3679   08517 15/08/1958 52E
52F
52E
HM
W
Percy Main (New)
Blyth (North)
Percy Main
Healey Mills
Withdrawn
15/08/1958
13/12/1958
08/06/1963
21/03/1976
20/07/2001
20/07/2001
    D3680   08518 19/07/1958 30A
30F
30E
30A
W
Stratford (New)
Parkeston Quay
Colchester
Stratford
Withdrawn
19/07/1958
11/10/1958
07/01/1967
28/09/1968
22/06/1986
22/06/1986
    D3681   08519 31/07/1958 30A Stratford (New) 31/07/1958
    D3682   08520 13/08/1958 30A
W
Stratford (New)
Withdrawn
13/08/1958
12/01/1986
12/01/1986
    D3683   08521 27/08/1958 30A
W
Stratford (New)
Withdrawn
27/08/1958
22/06/1993
22/06/1993
    D3684   08522 02/09/1958 30A
30F
30E
30A
W
Stratford (New)
Parkeston Quay
Colchester
Stratford
Withdrawn
02/09/1958
30/01/1965
07/01/1967
17/06/1972
04/08/1985
04/08/1985
    D3685   08523 06/09/1958 41A
41B
41A
41J
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
Shirebrook
06/09/1958
02/05/1964
09/10/1965
06/07/1968
    D3686   08524 18/09/1958 41A
9G
9A
9D
9A
NH
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Gorton
Longsight
Newton Heath
Longsight
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
18/09/1958
05/05/1962
12/06/1965
12/11/1966
06/07/1968
12/05/1973
06/01/1986
06/01/1986
    D3687   08525 24/02/1959 34B
34A
34G
34D
51L
55B
Hornsey (New)
Kings Cross
Finsbury Park
Hitchin (GNR)
Thornaby
York (North)
24/02/1959
28/03/1959
14/01/1961
03/03/1962
09/08/1969
25/09/1971
    D3688   08526 27/02/1959 34B
34A
34C
34D
34G
W
Hornsey (New)
Kings Cross
Hatfield
Hitchin (GNR)
Finsbury Park
Withdrawn
27/02/1959
07/03/1959
16/07/1960
07/01/1961
13/11/1971
28/02/2007
28/02/2007
    D3689   08527 04/03/1959 34A
34C
34D
30A
Kings Cross (New)
Hatfield
Hitchin (GNR)
Stratford
04/03/1959
02/04/1960
07/01/1961
04/12/1971
    D3690   08528 09/03/1959 34B
34C
34D
34G
Hornsey (New)
Hatfield
Hitchin (GNR)
Finsbury Park
09/03/1959
05/03/1960
07/01/1961
08/05/1971
    D3691   08529 12/03/1959 34B
34G
34D
34G
W
Hornsey (New)
Finsbury Park
Hitchin (GNR)
Finsbury Park
Withdrawn
12/03/1959
30/04/1960
07/01/1961
08/05/1971
30/06/2005
30/06/2005
    D3692   08530 19/03/1959 34B
34G
30E
Hornsey (New)
Finsbury Park
Colchester
19/03/1959
30/04/1960
21/10/1967
    D3693   08531 01/04/1959 34B
34G
30E
30A
Hornsey (New)
Finsbury Park
Colchester
Stratford
01/04/1959
30/04/1960
21/10/1967
16/01/1971
    D3694   08532 09/04/1959 41A
9G
9A
8J
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Gorton
Longsight
Allerton
Withdrawn
09/04/1959
05/05/1962
12/06/1965
05/08/1972
23/04/1993
23/04/1993
    D3695   08533 28/04/1959 41A
9G
9A
NH
WN
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Gorton
Longsight
Newton Heath
Willesden
Withdrawn
28/04/1959
02/06/1962
12/06/1965
12/05/1973
04/08/1973
16/10/1992
16/10/1992
    D3696   08534 28/04/1959 41A
16D
16A
16E
16F
16A
9A
8F
SP
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Annesley
Nottingham
Kirkby in Ashfield
Burton
Toton
Longsight
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
28/04/1959
12/05/1962
04/08/1962
19/03/1966
14/10/1967
28/02/1970
08/05/1971
24/02/1973
04/09/1988
31/08/2005
31/08/2005
  D4502 D3697 13002   01/05/1959 41A
41F
41C
41A
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Mexborough
Wath
Tinsley
01/05/1959
08/08/1959
07/03/1964
10/07/1965
  D4500 D3698 13003   07/05/1959 41A
41B
41A
41A
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
07/05/1959
15/04/1961
16/09/1961
26/04/1964
    D3699   08535 07/05/1959 41A
9G
9D
9A
1E
WN
BY
CW
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Gorton
Newton Heath
Longsight
Bletchley
Willesden
Bletchley
Cricklewood East
Withdrawn
07/05/1959
23/06/1962
12/06/1965
02/07/1966
08/01/1972
26/05/1973
11/05/1974
13/07/1974
01/10/2000
01/10/2000
    D3700   08536 13/05/1959 41A
9G
9A
14A
1A
5A
1A
2E
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Gorton
Longsight
Cricklewood East
Willesden
Crewe Diesel
Willesden
Saltley
13/05/1959
02/06/1962
12/06/1965
06/03/1971
02/12/1972
23/12/1972
23/12/1972
27/01/1973
    D3701   08537 22/05/1959 41A
41J
IM
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Langwith Junction
Immingham
Withdrawn
22/05/1959
15/12/1962
11/10/1975
25/05/1990
25/05/1990
    D3702   08538 27/05/1959 41A
41B
41A
41J
TI
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
Shirebrook
Tinsley
27/05/1959
02/05/1964
09/10/1965
10/07/1971
24/11/1973
    D3703   08539 03/06/1959 41A
41B
41A
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
Withdrawn
03/06/1959
02/05/1964
19/12/1964
31/03/1992
31/03/1992
    D3704   08540 03/06/1959 34B
34G
34D
55H
YK
Hornsey (New)
Finsbury Park
Hitchin (GNR)
Neville Hill
York (North)
03/06/1959
30/04/1960
08/03/1969
14/08/1971
25/01/1976
    D3705   08541 08/06/1959 34B
34G
55A
30A
W
Hornsey (New)
Finsbury Park
Holbeck (MR)
Stratford
Withdrawn
08/06/1959
30/04/1960
09/08/1969
29/11/1969
31/08/2005
31/08/2005
    D3706   08542 15/06/1959 34B
34G
30A
W
Hornsey (New)
Finsbury Park
Stratford
Withdrawn
15/06/1959
30/04/1960
04/09/1971
31/08/2005
31/08/2005
    D3707   08543 23/06/1959 40B
41A
41B
41A
Immingham (New)
Sheffield Darnall
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
23/06/1959
26/09/1959
02/05/1964
21/11/1964
    D3708   08544 30/06/1959 40B
34D
34G
W
Immingham (New)
Hitchin (GNR)
Finsbury Park
Withdrawn
30/06/1959
29/04/1961
04/11/1972
17/07/1992
17/07/1992
    D3709   08545 10/07/1959 40B
34D
34G
34D
34G
W
Immingham (New)
Hitchin (GNR)
Finsbury Park
Hitchin (GNR)
Finsbury Park
Withdrawn
10/07/1959
29/04/1961
08/03/1969
08/05/1971
22/05/1971
28/09/1980
28/09/1980
    D3710   08546 06/08/1959 34E
34B
34G
30A
W
New England (New)
Hornsey
Finsbury Park
Stratford
Withdrawn
06/08/1959
19/09/1959
30/04/1960
30/09/1967
28/07/1985
28/07/1985
    D3711   08547 14/08/1959 34E
34B
34G
30A
W
New England (New)
Hornsey
Finsbury Park
Stratford
Withdrawn
14/08/1959
19/09/1959
30/04/1960
15/10/1966
20/12/1981
20/12/1981
    D3712   08548 21/08/1959 34B
34G
34D
DR
HS
W
Hornsey (New)
Finsbury Park
Hitchin (GNR)
Doncaster
Bradford Hammerton Street
Withdrawn
21/08/1959
30/04/1960
08/05/1971
11/01/1975
27/09/1975
19/12/1982
19/12/1982
    D3713   08549 03/09/1959 34B
34G
34D
W
Hornsey (New)
Finsbury Park
Hitchin (GNR)
Withdrawn
03/09/1959
30/04/1960
22/05/1971
24/11/1985
24/11/1985
    D3714   08550 17/09/1959 41F
36A
34A
34G
HI
W
Mexborough (New)
Doncaster
Kings Cross
Finsbury Park
Hitchin (GNR)
Withdrawn
17/09/1959
26/09/1959
28/11/1959
14/01/1961
13/12/1975
06/03/1983
06/03/1983
    D3715   08551 17/09/1959 41F
36A
34A
34G
W
Mexborough (New)
Doncaster
Kings Cross
Finsbury Park
Withdrawn
17/09/1959
26/09/1959
28/11/1959
14/01/1961
31/10/1982
31/10/1982
    D3716   08552 28/09/1959 36A
34A
34G
30A
W
Doncaster (New)
Kings Cross
Finsbury Park
Stratford
Withdrawn
28/09/1959
28/11/1959
14/01/1961
02/12/1972
15/08/1982
15/08/1982
    D3717   08553 13/10/1959 36A
34A
34G
W
Doncaster (New)
Kings Cross
Finsbury Park
Withdrawn
13/10/1959
28/11/1959
14/01/1961
31/05/1981
31/05/1981
    D3718   08554 20/10/1959 36A
34A
34G
30A
W
Doncaster (New)
Kings Cross
Finsbury Park
Stratford
Withdrawn
20/10/1959
28/11/1959
14/01/1961
08/05/1971
15/08/1982
15/08/1982
    D3722   08555 23/10/1959 34A
34G
W
Kings Cross (New)
Finsbury Park
Withdrawn
23/10/1959
14/01/1961
15/08/1982
15/08/1982
    D3723   08556 30/10/1959 34A
34G
SU
W
Kings Cross (New)
Finsbury Park
Selhurst
Withdrawn
30/10/1959
14/01/1961
31/03/1979
03/07/1990
03/07/1990
    D3724   08557 13/11/1959 34A
34G
34D
W
Kings Cross (New)
Finsbury Park
Hitchin (GNR)
Withdrawn
13/11/1959
14/01/1961
04/11/1972
19/12/1982
19/12/1982
    D3725   08558 26/11/1959 34A
34G
W
Kings Cross (New)
Finsbury Park
Withdrawn
26/11/1959
14/01/1961
26/01/1986
26/01/1986
    D3726   08559 18/12/1959 41A
41F
41C
50A
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Mexborough
Wath
York (North)
Withdrawn
18/12/1959
25/02/1961
07/03/1964
02/12/1967
20/12/1981
20/12/1981
    D3727   08560 22/12/1959 41A
41B
41A
41A
40A
41A
41J
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Sheffield Darnall
Tinsley
Lincoln
Tinsley
Shirebrook
Withdrawn
22/12/1959
15/04/1961
16/09/1961
26/04/1964
13/04/1968
11/05/1968
18/05/1968
31/05/1981
31/05/1981
    D3728   08561 24/01/1959 64A
64H
65A
66A
67A
65A
St Margarets (New)
Leith Central
Eastfield
Polmadie
Corkerhill
Eastfield
24/01/1959
25/02/1967
31/05/1969
21/08/1971
01/04/1972
01/04/1972
    D3729   08562 24/01/1959 64A
64H
52A
W
St Margarets (New)
Leith Central
Gateshead
Withdrawn
24/01/1959
25/02/1967
28/02/1970
31/01/1994
31/01/1994
    D3730   08563 27/01/1959 64A
64H
64B
66C
W
St Margarets (New)
Leith Central
Haymarket
Hamilton (West)
Withdrawn
27/01/1959
25/02/1967
27/05/1972
24/02/1973
25/04/1982
25/04/1982
    D3731   08564 04/02/1959 64A
64H
64B
W
St Margarets (New)
Leith Central
Haymarket
Withdrawn
04/02/1959
25/02/1967
27/05/1972
02/12/1985
02/12/1985
    D3732   08565 26/02/1959 64A
64C
64A
64H
64B
W
St Margarets (New)
Dalry Road
St Margarets
Leith Central
Haymarket
Withdrawn
26/02/1959
03/06/1961
16/02/1963
25/02/1967
27/05/1972
23/07/1993
23/07/1993
    D3733   08566 02/04/1959 64A
64C
64A
64H
62A
67A
65A
W
St Margarets (New)
Dalry Road
St Margarets
Leith Central
Thornton Junction
Corkerhill
Eastfield
Withdrawn
02/04/1959
03/06/1961
16/02/1963
25/02/1967
24/02/1968
29/11/1969
01/04/1972
19/10/1975
19/10/1975
    D3734   08567 17/04/1959 64A
64C
62B
64H
62A
62C
36A
50C
St Margarets (New)
Dalry Road
Dundee Tay Bridge
Leith Central
Thornton Junction
Dunfermline Townhill
Doncaster
Hull Botanic Gardens
17/04/1959
16/02/1963
30/10/1965
30/12/1967
24/02/1968
01/08/1970
26/02/1972
17/06/1972
    D3735   08568 24/04/1959 64A
60E
St Margarets (New)
Forres
24/04/1959
06/06/1959
    D3736   08569 01/05/1959 64B
64A
12B
12A
9A
NH
Haymarket (New)
St Margarets
Carlisle Upperby
Carlisle Kingmoor
Longsight
Newton Heath
01/05/1959
04/06/1960
15/10/1966
04/03/1967
07/10/1972
23/08/1975
    D3737   08570 08/05/1959 64C
63A
62A
62C
W
Dalry Road (New)
Perth South
Thornton Junction
Dunfermline Townhill
Withdrawn
08/05/1959
30/10/1965
25/11/1967
01/08/1970
18/01/1992
18/01/1992
    D3738   08571 05/06/1959 64C
64B
64H
64B
GM
HA
Dalry Road (New)
Haymarket
Leith Central
Haymarket
Grangemouth
Haymarket
05/06/1959
12/03/1960
28/02/1970
27/05/1972
03/11/1973
26/01/1974
    D3739   08572 27/05/1959 64C
64B
W
Dalry Road (New)
Haymarket
Withdrawn
27/05/1959
12/03/1960
22/02/1981
22/02/1981
    D3740   08573 05/06/1959 64C
64A
12B
12A
8F
KM
DY
Dalry Road (New)
St Margarets
Carlisle Upperby
Carlisle Kingmoor
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Carlisle Kingmoor
Derby
05/06/1959
04/07/1959
15/10/1966
04/03/1967
13/01/1973
09/06/1973
18/05/1974
    D3741   08574 05/06/1959 64C
64A
12B
12A
EJ
W
Dalry Road (New)
St Margarets
Carlisle Upperby
Carlisle Kingmoor
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Withdrawn
05/06/1959
04/06/1960
15/10/1966
04/03/1967
22/03/1975
01/03/1981
01/03/1981
    D3742   08575 13/06/1959 64C
64A
64C
64B
Dalry Road (New)
St Margarets
Dalry Road
Haymarket
13/06/1959
29/08/1959
16/02/1963
30/10/1965
    D3743   08576 20/06/1959 86B
86A
DG
87E
86A
LA
BZ
W
Newport Pill (New)
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Danygraig
Landore
Cardiff Canton
Laira
St Blazey
Withdrawn
20/06/1959
05/09/1959
17/06/1961
13/04/1964
14/11/1970
22/06/1974
10/08/1974
30/04/2006
30/04/2006
    D3744   08577 20/06/1959 86B
86A
DG
87E
86A
87A
Newport Pill (New)
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Danygraig
Landore
Cardiff Canton
Landore
20/06/1959
05/09/1959
17/06/1961
13/04/1964
14/11/1970
14/11/1970
    D3745   08578 26/06/1959 86B
86A
87A
87B
87A
Newport Pill (New)
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Neath (Court Sart)
Margam
Landore
26/06/1959
05/09/1959
19/05/1962
13/04/1964
22/08/1970
    D3746   08579 02/07/1959 86B
86A
87A
87B
86A
EJ
W
Newport Pill (New)
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Neath (Court Sart)
Margam
Cardiff Canton
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Withdrawn
02/07/1959
05/09/1959
19/05/1962
13/04/1964
11/03/1972
21/12/1974
07/11/1988
07/11/1988
    D3747   08580 04/07/1959 86B
86A
CED
88M
Newport Pill (New)
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Cardiff East Dock
Cardiff Cathays
04/07/1959
05/09/1959
31/12/1960
03/11/1962
    D3748   08581 29/07/1959 86B
86A
84E
84G
86A
88M
Newport Pill (New)
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Tyseley
Shrewsbury
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Cardiff Cathays
29/07/1959
05/09/1959
18/06/1960
16/07/1960
09/09/1961
09/02/1963
    D3749   08582 04/08/1959 86B
86A
CED
88M
86B
W
Newport Pill (New)
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Cardiff East Dock
Cardiff Cathays
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Withdrawn
04/08/1959
03/10/1959
31/12/1960
03/11/1962
02/12/1972
30/09/2008
30/09/2008
    D3750   08583 10/08/1959 87C
82B
82A
82A
82C
W
Danygraig (New)
St Philips Marsh
Bristol Bath Road
Bristol Bath Road
Swindon
Withdrawn
10/08/1959
03/10/1959
04/11/1961
29/11/1964
13/01/1973
23/07/1993
23/07/1993
    D3751   08584 18/08/1959 87C
82B
82A
82A
LA
NA
W
Danygraig (New)
St Philips Marsh
Bristol Bath Road
Bristol Bath Road
Laira
Newton Abbot
Withdrawn
18/08/1959
26/12/1959
04/11/1961
29/11/1964
08/03/1975
22/03/1975
23/08/1991
23/08/1991
    D3752   08585 22/08/1959 87C
84B
2F
Danygraig (New)
Oxley
Bescot
22/08/1959
03/10/1959
22/04/1967
    D3753   08586 07/09/1959 87C
81C
86A
MG
EJ

W
Danygraig (New)
Southall
Cardiff Canton
Margam
Ebbw Junction (Newport)

Withdrawn
07/09/1959
23/04/1960
09/11/1968
04/10/1975
30/11/1979
24/07/1988
01/03/1996
01/03/1996
    D3754   08587 14/09/1959 87C
81C
81A
81C
81A
81D
82A
86B
W
Danygraig (New)
Southall
Old Oak Common
Southall
Old Oak Common
Reading (W.R.)
Bristol Bath Road
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Withdrawn
14/09/1959
23/04/1960
16/07/1960
13/08/1960
15/01/1967
29/05/1970
03/07/1971
03/07/1971
30/09/2008
30/09/2008
    D3755   08588 22/09/1959 87C
84B
2F
Danygraig (New)
Oxley
Bescot
22/09/1959
27/02/1960
22/04/1967
    D3756   08589 05/10/1959 87C
81B
81C
81A
86A
W
Danygraig (New)
Slough
Southall
Old Oak Common
Cardiff Canton
Withdrawn
05/10/1959
21/05/1960
16/07/1960
28/03/1965
29/05/1970
24/11/1992
24/11/1992
    D3757   08590 05/10/1959 87C
84B
2F
W
Danygraig (New)
Oxley
Bescot
Withdrawn
05/10/1959
27/02/1960
22/04/1967
27/09/1993
27/09/1993
    D3758   08591 21/10/1959 87C
81A
DG
87E
W
Danygraig (New)
Old Oak Common
Danygraig
Landore
Withdrawn
21/10/1959
27/02/1960
17/06/1961
13/04/1964
26/02/1993
26/02/1993
    D3759   08592 27/10/1959 87C
81A
81C
86A
Danygraig (New)
Old Oak Common
Southall
Cardiff Canton
27/10/1959
27/02/1960
12/08/1961
01/05/1966
    D3760   08593 12/11/1959 87C
81A
DG
87E
86A
Danygraig (New)
Old Oak Common
Danygraig
Landore
Cardiff Canton
12/11/1959
27/02/1960
17/06/1961
13/04/1964
03/03/1973
    D3761   08594 13/11/1959 87C
81A
81C
81A
81F
CF
W
Danygraig (New)
Old Oak Common
Southall
Old Oak Common
Oxford
Cardiff Canton
Withdrawn
13/11/1959
30/01/1960
27/02/1960
25/01/1969
14/11/1970
11/08/1973
20/07/2001
20/07/2001
    D3762   08595 25/11/1959 87C
81A
81C
81A
81C
81A
86B
W
Danygraig (New)
Old Oak Common
Southall
Old Oak Common
Southall
Old Oak Common
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Withdrawn
25/11/1959
30/01/1960
27/02/1960
13/06/1965
11/07/1965
25/01/1969
02/01/1971
23/07/1993
23/07/1993
    D3763   08596 18/04/1959 24K
5B
5A
OX
RG
OC
W
Preston (New)
Crewe South
Crewe Diesel
Oxford
Reading (W.R.)
Old Oak Common
Withdrawn
18/04/1959
30/05/1959
25/11/1967
12/01/1974
12/10/1974
07/08/1976
12/03/1977
12/03/1977
    D3764   08597 25/04/1959 6A
9A
6A
5A
2E
Chester (MR) (New)
Longsight
Chester (MR)
Crewe Diesel
Saltley
25/04/1959
29/08/1959
29/08/1959
08/05/1971
03/02/1973
    D3765   08598 02/05/1959 9A
NH
DY
W
Longsight (New)
Newton Heath
Derby
Withdrawn
02/05/1959
12/05/1973
08/05/1976
10/11/1986
10/11/1986
    D3766   08599 09/05/1959 9A
17A
9A
5A
9A
W
Longsight (New)
Derby
Longsight
Crewe Diesel
Longsight
Withdrawn
09/05/1959
30/05/1959
05/09/1959
23/12/1972
23/12/1972
31/12/2007
31/12/2007
    D3767   08600 16/05/1959 9A
17A
9A
NH
WN

W
W
Longsight (New)
Derby
Longsight
Newton Heath
Willesden

Withdrawn
Withdrawn
16/05/1959
30/05/1959
05/09/1959
12/05/1973
12/01/1974
12/07/1975
03/1979
30/07/1999
30/07/1999
    D3768   08601 16/05/1959 9A
17A
9A
12A
W
Longsight (New)
Derby
Longsight
Carlisle Kingmoor
Withdrawn
16/05/1959
30/05/1959
05/09/1959
08/05/1971
31/05/2004
31/05/2004
    D3769   08602 30/05/1959 9A
17A
9A
9B
9A
W
Longsight (New)
Derby
Longsight
Stockport Edgeley
Longsight
Withdrawn
30/05/1959
30/05/1959
12/09/1959
17/07/1965
26/02/1966
30/03/1986
30/03/1986
    D3770   08603 30/05/1959 9A
9B
9A
1A
14A
W
Longsight (New)
Stockport Edgeley
Longsight
Willesden
Cricklewood East
Withdrawn
30/05/1959
05/12/1964
26/02/1966
08/05/1971
24/06/1972
31/01/1994
31/01/1994
    D3771   08604 13/06/1959 9A
9B
9A
W
Longsight (New)
Stockport Edgeley
Longsight
Withdrawn
13/06/1959
11/07/1959
01/05/1965
16/07/1993
16/07/1993
    D3772   08605 13/06/1959 9B
9D
9A
NH
DY
Stockport Edgeley (New)
Newton Heath
Longsight
Newton Heath
Derby
13/06/1959
20/11/1965
06/07/1968
05/04/1975
14/06/1975
    D3773   08606 27/06/1959 9B
17B
17A
18A
17A
17B
14A
W
Stockport Edgeley (New)
Burton
Derby
Toton
Derby
Burton
Cricklewood East
Withdrawn
27/06/1959
29/08/1959
29/08/1959
19/09/1959
10/10/1959
23/01/1960
26/01/1963
29/02/1988
29/02/1988
    D3774   08607 04/07/1959 17B
17C
17A
17C
21D
2E
36A
W
Burton (New)
Rowsley
Derby
Rowsley
Aston
Saltley
Doncaster
Withdrawn
04/07/1959
29/08/1959
29/08/1959
23/01/1960
05/11/1960
16/10/1965
16/10/1971
31/01/2003
31/01/2003
    D3775   08608 11/07/1959 17C
17A
17C
21D
2E
36A
TE
W
Rowsley (New)
Derby
Rowsley
Aston
Saltley
Doncaster
Thornaby
Withdrawn
11/07/1959
29/08/1959
23/01/1960
26/11/1960
16/10/1965
16/10/1971
20/11/1976
07/11/1988
07/11/1988
    D3776   08609 11/07/1959 17C
15B
17A
15B
15A
15A
15B
15A
W
Rowsley (New)
Kettering
Derby
Kettering
Wellingborough
Leicester Midland
Wellingborough
Leicester Midland
Withdrawn
11/07/1959
29/08/1959
29/08/1959
02/01/1960
09/07/1960
03/04/1965
04/11/1967
29/03/1969
08/11/1993
08/11/1993
    D3777   08610 25/07/1959 15B
15A
15A
16F
16A
W
Kettering (New)
Wellingborough
Leicester Midland
Burton
Toton
Withdrawn
25/07/1959
09/07/1960
03/04/1965
13/11/1965
17/05/1969
26/06/1998
26/06/1998
    D3778   08611 08/08/1959 15B
15A
15A
16F
9A
8J
9A
Kettering (New)
Wellingborough
Leicester Midland
Burton
Longsight
Allerton
Longsight
08/08/1959
09/07/1960
03/04/1965
15/01/1966
30/04/1966
12/07/1969
29/11/1969
    D3779   08612 15/08/1959 15B
26C
26A
9A
16C
W
Kettering (New)
Bolton
Newton Heath
Longsight
Derby
Withdrawn
15/08/1959
29/08/1959
12/12/1959
17/06/1967
08/05/1971
21/09/1990
21/09/1990
    D3780   08613 22/08/1959 24D
21F
2F
W
Lower Darwen (New)
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Bescot
Withdrawn
22/08/1959
12/11/1960
22/04/1967
01/12/1993
01/12/1993
    D3781   08614 29/08/1959 24D
21F
2F
W
Lower Darwen (New)
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Bescot
Withdrawn
29/08/1959
12/11/1960
22/04/1967
05/02/1993
05/02/1993
    D3782   08615 05/09/1959 24B
10D
8F
W
Rose Grove (New)
Lostock Hall
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
05/09/1959
27/03/1965
14/11/1970
01/12/1993
01/12/1993
    D3783   08616 05/09/1959 24B
10D
9A
10D
8F
Rose Grove (New)
Lostock Hall
Longsight
Lostock Hall
Springs Branch (Wigan)
05/09/1959
27/03/1965
21/03/1970
01/08/1970
08/01/1972
    D3784   08617 12/09/1959 26A
9A
12A
12C
8F
TO
R
Newton Heath (New)
Longsight
Carlisle Kingmoor
Barrow in Furness
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Toton
Reinstated
12/09/1959
06/07/1968
09/10/1971
08/01/1972
26/02/1972
07/09/1974
04/1984
    D3785   08618 19/09/1959 26A
15C
15E
15A
15B
15A
W
Newton Heath (New)
Leicester Midland
Leicester (G.C.)
Leicester Midland
Wellingborough
Leicester Midland
Withdrawn
19/09/1959
26/09/1959
19/03/1960
11/07/1964
16/04/1966
29/03/1969
14/09/1990
14/09/1990
    D3786   08619 26/09/1959 15C
W
Leicester Midland (New)
Withdrawn
26/09/1959
22/06/1998
22/06/1998
    D3787   08620 26/09/1959 15C
60A
Leicester Midland (New)
Inverness
26/09/1959
30/10/1971
    D3788   08621 10/10/1959 15C
16A
ED
W
Leicester Midland (New)
Toton
Eastfield
Withdrawn
10/10/1959
15/07/1972
11/05/1974
20/06/1988
20/06/1988
    D3789   08622 17/10/1959 15C
16F
16A
DY
R
ML
Leicester Midland (New)
Burton
Toton
Derby
Reinstated
Motherwell
17/10/1959
09/03/1968
09/10/1971
25/01/1975
04/1984
04/09/1988
    D3790   08623 24/10/1959 15C
16B
16F
Leicester Midland (New)
Colwick
Burton
24/10/1959
27/07/1968
18/04/1970
    D3791   08624 24/10/1959 15C
8F
Leicester Midland (New)
Springs Branch (Wigan)
24/10/1959
10/12/1966
    D3792   08625 31/10/1959 18C
16A
16C
W
Hasland (New)
Toton
Derby
Withdrawn
31/10/1959
24/10/1964
21/11/1964
31/01/2004
31/01/2004
    D3793   08626 31/10/1959 8D
8C
8J
8F
9A
NH
W
Widnes (New)
Speke Junction
Allerton
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Longsight
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
31/10/1959
18/04/1964
11/05/1968
15/01/1972
14/04/1973
12/05/1973
27/04/1988
27/04/1988
    D3794   08627 07/11/1959 8D
8C
8J
BY
WN
SF
W
Widnes (New)
Speke Junction
Allerton
Bletchley
Willesden
Stratford
Withdrawn
07/11/1959
18/04/1964
11/05/1968
12/01/1974
26/01/1974
01/11/1975
31/01/1994
31/01/1994
    D3795   08628 21/11/1959 8B
1A
1E
1A
1E
14A
1A
8J
W
Warrington Dallam (New)
Willesden
Bletchley
Willesden
Bletchley
Cricklewood East
Willesden
Allerton
Withdrawn
21/11/1959
31/03/1962
23/10/1965
19/03/1966
31/05/1969
23/05/1970
24/04/1971
11/03/1972
31/08/2005
31/08/2005
    D3796   08629 21/11/1959 8B
1A
1E
Warrington Dallam (New)
Willesden
Bletchley
21/11/1959
03/03/1962
22/06/1963
    D3797   08630 28/11/1959 8B
1A
1F
1E
82A
Warrington Dallam (New)
Willesden
Rugby
Bletchley
Bristol Bath Road
28/11/1959
23/12/1961
28/08/1965
11/01/1969
08/07/1972
14/04/1973
    D3798   08631 05/12/1959 5D
2E
5D
5B
5A
W
Stoke (New)
Northampton
Stoke
Crewe South
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
05/12/1959
26/12/1959
23/01/1960
28/01/1961
25/11/1967
11/12/1992
11/12/1992
    D3799   08632 05/12/1959 5D
2E
5D
5B
5A
41A
51L
Stoke (New)
Northampton
Stoke
Crewe South
Crewe Diesel
Tinsley
Thornaby
05/12/1959
26/12/1959
23/01/1960
28/01/1961
25/11/1967
27/05/1972
10/06/1972
    D3800   08633 12/12/1959 5D
24J
5D
5A
5D
5A
Stoke (New)
Lancaster Green Ayre
Stoke
Crewe Diesel
Stoke
Crewe Diesel
12/12/1959
02/01/1960
13/06/1960
05/02/1966
12/02/1966
25/11/1967
    D3801   08634 19/12/1959 5D
5B
5A
EJ
W
Stoke (New)
Crewe South
Crewe Diesel
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Withdrawn
19/12/1959
04/12/1965
25/11/1967
22/03/1975
01/02/1993
01/02/1993
    D3802   08635 26/12/1959 5D
5B
5D
5A
2G
6A
6J
CD
SY
W
Stoke (New)
Crewe South
Stoke
Crewe Diesel
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Chester (MR)
Holyhead
Cricklewood East
Saltley
Withdrawn
26/12/1959
28/01/1961
12/06/1965
05/02/1966
02/04/1966
23/04/1966
05/02/1972
24/11/1973
30/11/1979
28/02/2007
28/02/2007
    D3803   08636 05/12/1958 82B
82C
82B
82A
82A
W
St Philips Marsh (New)
Swindon
St Philips Marsh
Bristol Bath Road
Bristol Bath Road
Withdrawn
05/12/1958
18/04/1959
26/03/1960
04/11/1961
29/11/1964
27/07/1980
27/07/1980
    D3804   08637 11/12/1958 82B
82C
81C
81F
81A
87E
W
St Philips Marsh (New)
Swindon
Southall
Oxford
Old Oak Common
Landore
Withdrawn
11/12/1958
18/04/1959
22/02/1964
13/04/1964
28/03/1965
09/11/1968
09/08/1991
09/08/1991
    D3805   08638 18/12/1958 82B
82A
82A
WS
W
St Philips Marsh (New)
Bristol Bath Road
Bristol Bath Road
Worcester
Withdrawn
18/12/1958
04/11/1961
29/11/1964
27/04/1974
11/12/1992
11/12/1992
    D3806   08639 23/12/1958 82B
82A
82A
86B
W
St Philips Marsh (New)
Bristol Bath Road
Bristol Bath Road
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Withdrawn
23/12/1958
04/11/1961
29/11/1964
16/10/1971
30/10/1988
30/10/1988
    D3807   08640 29/12/1958 82B
86A
86B
86A
86B
86A
88M
86A
86B
82A
81D
OX
RG
W
St Philips Marsh (New)
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Newport Pill
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Newport Pill
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff Canton
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Bristol Bath Road
Reading (W.R.)
Oxford
Reading (W.R.)
Withdrawn
29/12/1958
21/02/1959
21/03/1959
08/1959
09/1959
18/06/1960
09/03/1963
29/11/1964
14/11/1970
22/05/1971
03/07/1971
17/11/1973
12/10/1974
14/11/1988
14/11/1988
    D3808   08641 16/01/1959 82B
86A
86B
86A
88M
87F
86B
83A
St Philips Marsh (New)
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Newport Pill
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Cardiff Cathays
Llanelly
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Newton Abbot
16/01/1959
21/02/1959
21/03/1959
18/06/1960
09/03/1963
22/06/1964
04/04/1970
22/05/1971
    D3809   08642 23/01/1959 82B
86A
86B
86A
88M
86A
86B
81D
70D
75C
W
St Philips Marsh (New)
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Newport Pill
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff Canton
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Reading (W.R.)
Eastleigh
Selhurst
Withdrawn
23/01/1959
21/02/1959
21/03/1959
18/06/1960
01/06/1963
29/11/1964
15/01/1967
01/01/1971
01/01/1971
25/02/1971
31/05/2006
31/05/2006
    D3810   08643 30/01/1959 86B
86A
82A
LA
NA
LA
PZ
W
Newport Pill (New)
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Bristol Bath Road
Laira
Newton Abbot
Laira
Penzance
Withdrawn
30/01/1959
18/06/1960
11/03/1972
10/11/1973
07/12/1974
28/12/1974
01/05/1976
2001
2001
    D3811   08644 04/02/1959 86B
86A
82A
Newport Pill (New)
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Bristol Bath Road
04/02/1959
18/06/1960
08/01/1972
    D3812   08645 13/02/1959 86B
86A
87F
86B
87B
Newport Pill (New)
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Llanelly
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Margam
13/02/1959
18/06/1960
22/06/1964
15/01/1967
08/01/1972
    D3813   08646 20/02/1959 86B
86A
87F
86B
83A
Newport Pill (New)
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Llanelly
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Newton Abbot
20/02/1959
18/06/1960
22/06/1964
15/01/1967
16/10/1971
    D3814   08647 26/02/1959 86B
86A
87B
86B
BS
91M
SY
W
Newport Pill (New)
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Margam
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Bescot
To London Midland Region
Saltley
Withdrawn
26/02/1959
18/06/1960
22/06/1964
15/01/1967
08/02/1975
08/02/1975
03/05/1975
02/04/1997
02/04/1997
    D3815   08648 04/03/1959 86B
86A
82A
70D
73C
SU
Newport Pill (New)
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Bristol Bath Road
Eastleigh
Hither Green
Selhurst
04/03/1959
18/06/1960
01/01/1971
01/01/1971
13/01/1971
28/01/1974
    D3816   08649 10/03/1959 86B
86A
87E
86B
BR
Newport Pill (New)
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Landore
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Bristol Bath Road
10/03/1959
18/06/1960
13/04/1964
04/05/1964
14/07/1973
    D3817   08650 18/03/1959 86B
86A
86A
86B
86A
86B
W
Newport Pill (New)
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Cardiff Canton
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Cardiff Canton
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Withdrawn
18/03/1959
31/10/1959
01/05/1966
15/01/1967
27/12/1969
24/01/1970
01/08/1989
01/08/1989
    D3818   08651 20/03/1959 86B
86A
87B
Newport Pill (New)
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Margam
20/03/1959
18/06/1960
11/03/1972
    D3819   08652 26/03/1959 86B
86A
86A
86B
86A
86B
86A
86B
W
Newport Pill (New)
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Cardiff Canton
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Cardiff Canton
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Cardiff Canton
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Withdrawn
26/03/1959
18/06/1960
27/12/1964
15/01/1966
30/10/1966
27/12/1969
24/01/1970
11/11/1972
20/06/1992
20/06/1992
    D3820   08653 02/04/1959 86B
86A
70D
73C
Newport Pill (New)
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Eastleigh
Hither Green
02/04/1959
05/09/1959
01/01/1971
13/01/1971
    D3821   08654 08/04/1959 86B
86A
86A
86B
W
Newport Pill (New)
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Cardiff Canton
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Withdrawn
08/04/1959
18/06/1960
15/01/1966
01/05/1966
25/10/1991
25/10/1991
    D3822   08655 15/04/1959 86B
86A
86A
81D
70D
75C
W
Newport Pill (New)
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Cardiff Canton
Reading (W.R.)
Eastleigh
Selhurst
Withdrawn
15/04/1959
05/09/1959
25/01/1969
01/01/1971
01/01/1971
25/02/1971
31/08/2005
31/08/2005
    D3823   08656 24/04/1959 86B
86A
88L
88M
88M
86A
87E
OC
W
Newport Pill (New)
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Cardiff East Dock
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff Canton
Landore
Old Oak Common
Withdrawn
24/04/1959
05/09/1959
19/05/1962
03/11/1962
13/04/1964
29/11/1964
18/03/1968
11/12/1976
05/02/1993
05/02/1993
    D3824   08657 30/04/1959 86B
87C
86A
87A
87B
86B
W
Newport Pill (New)
Danygraig
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Neath (Court Sart)
Margam
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Withdrawn
30/04/1959
13/06/1959
05/09/1959
19/05/1962
13/04/1964
08/01/1972
22/11/1991
22/11/1991
    D3825   08658 05/05/1959 87C
87F
87E
W
Danygraig (New)
Llanelly
Landore
Withdrawn
05/05/1959
27/07/1963
04/05/1964
05/02/1993
05/02/1993
    D3826   08659 13/05/1959 87C
87E
10A
W
Danygraig (New)
Landore
Carnforth
Withdrawn
13/05/1959
13/04/1964
05/11/1966
24/06/1991
24/06/1991
    D3827   08660 19/05/1959 87C
87E
CF
W
Danygraig (New)
Landore
Cardiff Canton
Withdrawn
19/05/1959
13/04/1964
12/06/1988
08/11/1991
08/11/1991
    D3828   08661 22/05/1959 87C
87E
W
Danygraig (New)
Landore
Withdrawn
22/05/1959
13/04/1964
31/01/2003
31/01/2003
    D3829   08662 29/05/1959 87C
87F
87E
Danygraig (New)
Llanelly
Landore
29/05/1959
27/07/1963
04/05/1964
    D3830   08663 05/06/1959 87C
87E
CF
BZ
Danygraig (New)
Landore
Cardiff Canton
St Blazey
05/06/1959
13/04/1964
12/06/1988
04/09/1988
    D3831   08664 12/06/1959 87C
81D
CF
Danygraig (New)
Reading (W.R.)
Cardiff Canton
12/06/1959
21/05/1960
07/08/1976
    D3832   08665 01/01/1960 6B
6A
8H
8F
8H
W
Mold Junction (New)
Chester (MR)
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Withdrawn
01/01/1960
23/04/1966
10/10/1970
09/10/1971
28/10/1972
30/09/2008
30/09/2008
    D3833   08666 01/01/1960 6B
6A
8H
BY
W
Mold Junction (New)
Chester (MR)
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Bletchley
Withdrawn
01/01/1960
23/04/1966
08/05/1971
17/11/1973
16/01/1995
16/01/1995
    D3834   08667 02/01/1960 8B
1A
14A
SF
WN
BY
W
Warrington Dallam (New)
Willesden
Cricklewood East
Stratford
Willesden
Bletchley
Withdrawn
02/01/1960
07/04/1962
12/06/1971
01/12/1973
29/12/1973
24/08/1974
11/11/1992
11/11/1992
    D3835   08668 02/01/1960 8B
1A
82A
W
Warrington Dallam (New)
Willesden
Bristol Bath Road
Withdrawn
02/01/1960
10/03/1962
22/07/1972
02/04/1997
02/04/1997
    D3836   08669 02/01/1960 8F
8C
8A
8J
W
Springs Branch (Wigan) (New)
Speke Junction
Edge Hill
Allerton
Withdrawn
02/01/1960
09/01/1965
29/01/1966
11/05/1968
23/05/1989
23/05/1989
    D3837   08670 02/01/1960 8F
8C
8J
W
Springs Branch (Wigan) (New)
Speke Junction
Allerton
Withdrawn
02/01/1960
09/01/1965
11/05/1968
30/09/2008
30/09/2008
    D3838   08671 02/01/1960 24L
21D
2E
30A
GD
W
Carnforth (New)
Aston
Saltley
Stratford
Gateshead
Withdrawn
02/01/1960
05/11/1960
16/10/1965
20/05/1972
13/12/1975
07/11/1988
07/11/1988
    D3839   08672 02/01/1960 24L
21E
2F
W
Carnforth (New)
Monument Lane
Bescot
Withdrawn
02/01/1960
05/11/1960
22/04/1967
21/09/1992
21/09/1992
    D3840   08673 16/01/1960 24L
21E
2F
W
Carnforth (New)
Monument Lane
Bescot
Withdrawn
16/01/1960
05/11/1960
22/04/1967
16/01/1995
16/01/1995
    D3841   08674 06/02/1960 24L
24L
21B
21E
2F
W
Carnforth (New)
Carnforth
Bescot
Monument Lane
Bescot
Withdrawn
06/02/1960
20/02/1960
05/11/1960
26/11/1960
22/04/1967
05/07/1981
05/07/1981
    D3842   08675 27/06/1959 26F
26A
9A
NH
W
Patricroft (New)
Newton Heath
Longsight
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
27/06/1959
12/12/1959
06/07/1968
12/05/1973
31/08/2005
31/08/2005
    D3843   08676 04/07/1959 26F
26A
9A
NH
Patricroft (New)
Newton Heath
Longsight
Newton Heath
04/07/1959
12/12/1959
06/07/1968
12/05/1973
    D3844   08677 11/07/1959 26F
26A
9A
NH
W
Patricroft (New)
Newton Heath
Longsight
Newton Heath
Withdrawn
11/07/1959
12/12/1959
06/07/1968
12/05/1973
10/06/1993
10/06/1993
    D3845   08678 01/08/1959 26F
26A
9A
NH
LA
OC
W
Patricroft (New)
Newton Heath
Longsight
Newton Heath
Laira
Old Oak Common
Withdrawn
01/08/1959
12/12/1959
06/07/1968
12/05/1973
12/01/1974
21/09/1974
30/10/1988
30/10/1988
    D3846   08679 08/08/1959 26F
24K
24C
8F
AN
W
Patricroft (New)
Preston
Lostock Hall
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Allerton
Withdrawn
08/08/1959
05/09/1959
16/09/1961
06/05/1972
22/06/1974
19/06/1976
19/06/1976
    D3847   08680 15/08/1959 9E
1B
1A
W
Trafford Park (LMS) (New)
Camden
Willesden
Withdrawn
15/08/1959
10/10/1959
03/01/1966
06/07/1992
06/07/1992
    D3848   08681 22/08/1959 9E
1B
1A
W
Trafford Park (LMS) (New)
Camden
Willesden
Withdrawn
22/08/1959
10/10/1959
03/01/1966
29/10/1985
29/10/1985
    D3849   08682 29/08/1959 9E
1B
1A
Trafford Park (LMS) (New)
Camden
Willesden
29/08/1959
10/10/1959
03/01/1966
    D3850   08683 05/09/1959 9E
1B
1A
14B
1E
1A
Trafford Park (LMS) (New)
Camden
Willesden
Cricklewood West
Bletchley
Willesden
05/09/1959
03/10/1959
03/01/1966
18/11/1967
23/05/1970
16/09/1972
    D3851   08684 12/09/1959 9E
8B
6A
8B
1A
CW
BY
W
Trafford Park (LMS) (New)
Warrington Dallam
Chester (MR)
Warrington Dallam
Willesden
Cricklewood East
Bletchley
Withdrawn
12/09/1959
03/10/1959
12/11/1960
03/12/1960
25/05/1963
16/03/1974
13/07/1974
07/12/1986
07/12/1986
    D3852   08685 19/09/1959 9F
9A
1E
16A
Heaton Mersey (New)
Longsight
Bletchley
Toton
19/09/1959
18/09/1965
09/03/1968
22/06/1968
    D3853   08686 26/09/1959 9F
9A
W
Heaton Mersey (New)
Longsight
Withdrawn
26/09/1959
18/09/1965
22/11/1991
22/11/1991
    D3854   08687 03/10/1959 9F
9A
Heaton Mersey (New)
Longsight
03/10/1959
18/09/1965
    D3855   08688 10/10/1959 27F
8C
8J
W
Brunswick (New)
Speke Junction
Allerton
Withdrawn
10/10/1959
16/09/1961
11/05/1968
01/03/1991
01/03/1991
    D3856   08689 17/10/1959 27F
8C
8J
Brunswick (New)
Speke Junction
Allerton
17/10/1959
16/09/1961
11/05/1968
    D3857   08690 24/10/1959 27F
8C
8J
Brunswick (New)
Speke Junction
Allerton
24/10/1959
16/09/1961
11/05/1968
24/07/1988
    D3858   08691 31/10/1959 27E
8C
8A
8J
8F
8H
8F
Walton on the Hill (New)
Speke Junction
Edge Hill
Allerton
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Springs Branch (Wigan)
31/10/1959
14/12/1963
04/09/1965
11/05/1968
10/01/1970
14/11/1970
09/10/1971
    D3859   08692 07/11/1959 16D
16A
1F
1E
LR
W
Annesley (New)
Nottingham
Rugby
Bletchley
Leicester Midland
Withdrawn
07/11/1959
08/10/1960
05/03/1966
11/01/1969
11/01/1975
31/01/1994
31/01/1994
    D3860   08693 14/11/1959 16D
16A
9A
9D
9A
65A
W
Annesley (New)
Nottingham
Longsight
Newton Heath
Longsight
Eastfield
Withdrawn
14/11/1959
08/10/1960
05/03/1966
29/10/1966
06/07/1968
05/08/1972
16/06/2000
16/06/2000
    D3861   08694 21/11/1959 17A
2F
16D
16A
5A
W
Derby (New)
Woodford Halse
Annesley
Nottingham
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
21/11/1959
19/03/1960
16/04/1960
08/10/1960
10/12/1966
30/09/2008
30/09/2008
    D3862   08695 28/11/1959 17A
15E
15A
W
Derby (New)
Coalville
Leicester Midland
Withdrawn
28/11/1959
13/02/1965
20/02/1965
28/02/2007
28/02/2007
    D3863   08696 05/12/1959 17A
16D
15A
15B
15A
Derby (New)
Nottingham
Leicester Midland
Wellingborough
Leicester Midland
05/12/1959
16/10/1965
06/11/1965
16/04/1966
29/03/1969
    D3864   08697 19/12/1959 17A
2E
15A
2E
15A
Derby (New)
Saltley
Leicester Midland
Saltley
Leicester Midland
19/12/1959
17/05/1969
06/09/1969
18/12/1971
01/01/1972
    D3865   08698 19/12/1959 17A
21A
30A
Derby (New)
Saltley
Stratford
19/12/1959
19/11/1960
20/05/1972
    D3866   08699 14/01/1960 5D
5A
2G
6J
5A
15A
W
Stoke (New)
Crewe Diesel
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Holyhead
Crewe Diesel
Leicester Midland
Withdrawn
14/01/1960
05/02/1966
02/04/1966
23/04/1966
16/12/1967
20/09/1969
22/10/1993
22/10/1993
    D3867   08700 20/01/1960 24J
21C
2F
2G
2F
W
Lancaster Green Ayre (New)
Bushbury
Bescot
Ryecroft (Walsall)
Bescot
Withdrawn
20/01/1960
05/11/1960
17/04/1965
16/04/1966
22/04/1967
29/06/2001
29/06/2001
    D3868   08701 05/02/1960 26A
9A
5A
Newton Heath (New)
Longsight
Crewe Diesel
05/02/1960
06/07/1968
10/05/1969
    D3869   08702 12/02/1960 14A
WN
CD
BY
W
Cricklewood East (New)
Willesden
Cricklewood East
Bletchley
Withdrawn
12/02/1960
16/06/1973
04/08/1973
13/07/1974
28/02/2004
28/02/2004
    D3870   08703 17/02/1960 5D
8C
8J
5A
LO
NH
TO
AN
BS
Stoke (New)
Speke Junction
Allerton
Crewe Diesel
Longsight
Newton Heath
Toton
Allerton
Bescot
17/02/1960
27/02/1960
11/05/1968
19/10/1968
28/09/1974
12/10/1974
09/11/1974
19/06/1976
31/10/1979
    D3871   08704 29/02/1960 24J
21C
2F
2B
2F
LR
W
Lancaster Green Ayre (New)
Bushbury
Bescot
Oxley
Bescot
Leicester Midland
Withdrawn
29/02/1960
05/11/1960
27/06/1964
19/02/1966
22/04/1967
25/05/1974
05/11/1990
05/11/1990
    D3872   08705 12/03/1960 50A
W
York (North) (New)
Withdrawn
12/03/1960
07/01/1994
07/01/1994
    D3873   08706 19/03/1960 51L
56G
56B
Thornaby (New)
Bradford Hammerton Street
Healey Mills
19/03/1960
22/06/1963
08/10/1966
    D3874   08707 19/03/1960 50A
W
York (North) (New)
Withdrawn
19/03/1960
23/07/1993
23/07/1993
    D3875   08708 26/03/1960 51L
52A
52E
W
Thornaby (New)
Gateshead
Percy Main
Withdrawn
26/03/1960
09/10/1965
06/11/1965
09/10/1992
09/10/1992
    D3876   08709 01/04/1960 51L
55E
5D
55C
36A
34G
Thornaby (New)
Normanton
Stoke
Healey Mills
Doncaster
Finsbury Park
01/04/1960
04/12/1965
02/12/1967
02/10/1971
11/12/1971
08/01/1972
    D3877   08710 21/04/1960 64A
64C
64B
61B
W
St Margarets (New)
Dalry Road
Haymarket
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Withdrawn
21/04/1960
04/06/1960
30/10/1965
01/01/1972
25/01/1993
25/01/1993
    D3878   08711 28/04/1960 64A
64H
64B
St Margarets (New)
Leith Central
Haymarket
28/04/1960
25/02/1967
26/08/1967
    D3879   08712 28/04/1960 64A
64F
64B
GM
W
St Margarets (New)
Bathgate
Haymarket
Grangemouth
Withdrawn
28/04/1960
29/01/1966
24/09/1966
26/01/1974
11/12/1992
11/12/1992
    D3880   08713 29/04/1960 64A
64H
W
31B
W
St Margarets (New)
Leith Central
Withdrawn
March
Withdrawn
29/04/1960
25/02/1967
02/1972
26/02/1972
26/06/1998
26/06/1998
    D3881   08714 04/05/1960 64A
64H
64B
St Margarets (New)
Leith Central
Haymarket
04/05/1960
25/02/1967
27/05/1972
    D3882   08715 04/05/1960 64A
64H
66A
31B
30E
W
St Margarets (New)
Leith Central
Polmadie
March
Colchester
Withdrawn
04/05/1960
25/02/1967
29/05/1971
29/01/1972
05/02/1972
30/09/2008
30/09/2008
    D3883   08716 18/05/1960 64A
64H
31B
31A
W
St Margarets (New)
Leith Central
March
Cambridge
Withdrawn
18/05/1960
25/02/1967
29/01/1972
14/10/1972
30/11/1988
30/11/1988
    D3884   08717 19/05/1960 64A
64H
64B
St Margarets (New)
Leith Central
Haymarket
19/05/1960
25/02/1967
27/05/1972
    D3885     23/05/1960 64A
64H
W
St Margarets (New)
Leith Central
Withdrawn
23/05/1960
25/02/1967
04/02/1972
04/02/1972
    D3886   08718 25/05/1960 64A
64H
63A
66A
65A
FW
St Margarets (New)
Leith Central
Perth South
Polmadie
Eastfield
Fort William
25/05/1960
25/02/1967
30/03/1968
31/08/1968
31/08/1968
29/06/1974
    D3887   08719 31/05/1960 64A
64H
63A
60A
66A
65A
W
St Margarets (New)
Leith Central
Perth South
Inverness
Polmadie
Eastfield
Withdrawn
31/05/1960
25/02/1967
30/03/1968
27/04/1968
01/06/1968
31/08/1968
22/11/1991
22/11/1991
    D3888   08720 10/06/1960 64A
64H
64B
W
St Margarets (New)
Leith Central
Haymarket
Withdrawn
10/06/1960
25/02/1967
27/05/1972
28/02/2007
28/02/2007
    D3889   08721 15/06/1960 64A
64H
64B
65A
St Margarets (New)
Leith Central
Haymarket
Eastfield
15/06/1960
25/02/1967
27/05/1972
05/08/1972
    D3890   08722 22/06/1960 64A
64H
64B
W
St Margarets (New)
Leith Central
Haymarket
Withdrawn
22/06/1960
25/02/1967
27/05/1972
12/03/1987
12/03/1987
    D3891   08723 27/06/1960 64A
64H
62A
62C
66C
St Margarets (New)
Leith Central
Thornton Junction
Dunfermline Townhill
Hamilton (West)
27/06/1960
25/02/1967
28/12/1968
01/08/1970
25/11/1972
    D3892   08724 01/07/1960 64A
64H
62A
62C
64H
31B
30A
St Margarets (New)
Leith Central
Thornton Junction
Dunfermline Townhill
Leith Central
March
Stratford
01/07/1960
25/02/1967
31/08/1968
01/08/1970
28/11/1970
29/01/1972
05/02/1972
    D3893   08725 22/07/1960 64G
64A
64A
64F
64H
62B
W
Hawick (New)
St Margarets
St Margarets
Bathgate
Leith Central
Dundee West
Withdrawn
22/07/1960
27/08/1960
14/01/1961
30/10/1965
24/09/1966
30/03/1968
14/08/1992
14/08/1992
    D3894   08726 27/07/1960 65C
65A
W
Parkhead (New)
Eastfield
Withdrawn
27/07/1960
19/11/1960
26/01/1987
26/01/1987
    D3895   08727 03/08/1960 65C
65A
W
Parkhead (New)
Eastfield
Withdrawn
03/08/1960
19/11/1960
03/03/1993
03/03/1993
    D3896   08728 12/08/1960 65C
65A
60B
60A
W
Parkhead (New)
Eastfield
Aviemore
Inverness
Withdrawn
12/08/1960
19/11/1960
24/03/1962
24/02/1968
12/10/1987
12/10/1987
    D3897   08729 17/08/1960 67C
65A
10D
41A
W
Ayr (New)
Eastfield
Lostock Hall
Tinsley
Withdrawn
17/08/1960
19/11/1960
05/11/1966
06/05/1972
22/02/1990
22/02/1990
    D3898   08730 23/08/1960 65C
65B
65A
67A
67C
Parkhead (New)
St Rollox (Balornock)
Eastfield
Corkerhill
Ayr
23/08/1960
19/11/1960
26/11/1966
27/01/1968
26/12/1970
    D3899   08731 01/09/1960 65C
65B
65A
Parkhead (New)
St Rollox (Balornock)
Eastfield
01/09/1960
19/11/1960
26/11/1966
    D3900   08732 08/09/1960 65C
65B
65A
HN
Parkhead (New)
St Rollox (Balornock)
Eastfield
Hamilton (West)
08/09/1960
19/11/1960
26/11/1966
15/11/1975
    D3901   08733 15/09/1960 65C
65B
65A
D10
W
Parkhead (New)
St Rollox (Balornock)
Eastfield
Preston Division
Withdrawn
15/09/1960
19/11/1960
26/11/1966
17/06/1968
23/07/1993
23/07/1993
    D3902   08734 20/09/1960 65E
65F
64H
64H
64B
Kipps (New)
Grangemouth
Leith Central
Leith Central
Haymarket
20/09/1960
19/11/1960
27/12/1969
28/03/1970
27/05/1972
    D3903   08735 24/09/1960 65E
65D
65B
65A
66C
66A
67C
HN
Kipps (New)
Dawsholm
St Rollox (Balornock)
Eastfield
Hamilton (West)
Polmadie
Ayr
Hamilton (West)
24/09/1960
19/11/1960
30/12/1961
26/11/1966
26/08/1967
29/06/1968
28/12/1968
29/05/1976
    D3904   08736 24/09/1960 65E
65B
65A
63A
62B
W
Kipps (New)
St Rollox (Balornock)
Eastfield
Perth South
Dundee West
Withdrawn
24/09/1960
19/11/1960
26/11/1966
01/03/1969
01/08/1970
12/10/1987
12/10/1987
    D3905   08737 08/10/1960 66A
2A
5A
Polmadie (New)
Tyseley
Crewe Diesel
08/10/1960
23/10/1971
15/07/1972
    D3906   08738 14/10/1960 66A
66E
66C
66A
67A
65A
Polmadie (New)
Carstairs
Hamilton (West)
Polmadie
Corkerhill
Eastfield
14/10/1960
31/12/1966
29/04/1967
29/06/1968
26/12/1970
01/04/1972
    D3907   08739 18/10/1960 66A
65A
9A
91M
5A
W
Polmadie (New)
Eastfield
Longsight
To London Midland Region
Crewe Diesel
Withdrawn
18/10/1960
01/04/1972
17/06/1972
01/07/1972
04/11/1972
30/09/2005
30/09/2005
    D3908   08740 20/10/1960 66A
65A
91M
2A
SY
W
Polmadie (New)
Eastfield
To London Midland Region
Tyseley
Saltley
Withdrawn
20/10/1960
01/04/1972
01/07/1972
01/07/1972
09/02/1974
31/08/2005
31/08/2005
    D3909   08741 27/10/1960 66A
65A
8J
91M
9A
TO
W
Polmadie (New)
Eastfield
Allerton
To London Midland Region
Longsight
Toton
Withdrawn
27/10/1960
01/04/1972
15/04/1972
29/04/1972
02/09/1972
30/06/1973
16/04/1991
16/04/1991
    D3910   08742 01/11/1960 66A
66C
67C
91M
Polmadie (New)
Hamilton (West)
Ayr
To London Midland Region
01/11/1960
26/08/1967
27/04/1968
29/04/1972
    D3911   08743 09/11/1960 66A
52A
91E
40B
W
Polmadie (New)
Gateshead
To Eastern Region
Immingham
Withdrawn
09/11/1960
30/10/1971
30/10/1971
26/08/1972
03/03/1993
03/03/1993
    D3912   08744 18/11/1960 66A
65A
10D
91M
8F
W
Polmadie (New)
Eastfield
Lostock Hall
To London Midland Region
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
18/11/1960
01/04/1972
15/04/1972
29/04/1972
06/05/1972
31/03/1992
31/03/1992
    D3913   08745 22/11/1960 66A
51L
36A
CR
DR
Polmadie (New)
Thornaby
Doncaster
Colchester
Doncaster
22/11/1960
25/05/1968
10/04/1971
11/01/1975
31/05/1975
    D3914   08746 26/11/1960 66A
67C
2F
91M
6J
W
Polmadie (New)
Ayr
Bescot
To London Midland Region
Holyhead
Withdrawn
26/11/1960
30/12/1967
15/04/1972
29/04/1972
07/10/1972
31/08/2003
31/08/2003
    D3915   08747 02/12/1960 66A
52A
51L
52A
W
Polmadie (New)
Gateshead
Thornaby
Gateshead
Withdrawn
02/12/1960
22/06/1968
20/07/1968
07/09/1968
11/07/1990
11/07/1990
    D3916   08748 10/12/1960 66A
55C
55H
W
Polmadie (New)
Healey Mills
Neville Hill
Withdrawn
10/12/1960
25/05/1968
07/12/1968
21/01/1994
21/01/1994
    D3917   08749 12/12/1960 66A
51L
41A
Polmadie (New)
Thornaby
Tinsley
12/12/1960
22/01/1972
01/07/1972
    D3918   08750 20/12/1960 66D
66A
91E
41A
30A
30E
Greenock Ladyburn (New)
Polmadie
To Eastern Region
Tinsley
Stratford
Colchester
20/12/1960
11/03/1961
27/04/1968
04/05/1968
20/07/1968
28/09/1968
    D3919   08751 28/12/1960 66D
66A
91E
52A
40B
W
Greenock Ladyburn (New)
Polmadie
To Eastern Region
Gateshead
Immingham
Withdrawn
28/12/1960
11/03/1961
30/10/1971
30/10/1971
26/08/1972
28/02/2004
28/02/2004
    D3920   08752 30/12/1960 66D
66A
41A
30A
Greenock Ladyburn (New)
Polmadie
Tinsley
Stratford
30/12/1960
24/02/1968
18/05/1968
07/09/1968
    D3921   08753 31/12/1960 66D
66A
67C
62B
64B
65A
W
Greenock Ladyburn (New)
Polmadie
Ayr
Dundee West
Haymarket
Eastfield
Withdrawn
31/12/1960
24/02/1968
26/12/1970
27/11/1971
01/04/1972
30/12/1972
26/03/1993
26/03/1993
    D3922   08754 12/01/1961 67A
64H
66A
65A
Corkerhill (New)
Leith Central
Polmadie
Eastfield
12/01/1961
27/04/1968
27/12/1969
01/04/1972
    D3923   08755 20/01/1961 67A
66A
65A
HA
W
Corkerhill (New)
Polmadie
Eastfield
Haymarket
Withdrawn
20/01/1961
29/05/1971
01/04/1972
04/09/1976
10/09/1993
10/09/1993
    D3924   08756 27/01/1961 67A
67C
70D
73C
91W
BR
Corkerhill (New)
Ayr
Eastleigh
Hither Green
To Western Region / GWR
Bristol Bath Road
27/01/1961
31/05/1969
01/01/1971
30/09/1971
31/01/1976
21/02/1976
    D3925   08757 01/02/1961 67A
9A
2F
TO
Corkerhill (New)
Longsight
Bescot
Toton
01/02/1961
30/10/1971
22/01/1972
21/08/1976
    D3926   08758 08/02/1961 67A
67D
67E
67C
52A
SF
W
Corkerhill (New)
Ardrossan
Dumfries
Ayr
Gateshead
Stratford
Withdrawn
08/02/1961
26/08/1961
28/03/1964
26/11/1966
25/05/1968
13/12/1975
30/06/2005
30/06/2005
    D3927   08759 16/02/1961 67D
67C
9A
91M
NH
KM
Ardrossan (New)
Ayr
Longsight
To London Midland Region
Newton Heath
Carlisle Kingmoor
16/02/1961
25/07/1964
06/11/1971
27/11/1971
12/05/1973
03/11/1973
    D3928   08760 22/02/1961 67D
67C
70D
73C

R
W
Ardrossan (New)
Ayr
Eastleigh
Hither Green

Reinstated
Withdrawn
22/02/1961
27/02/1965
01/01/1971
29/10/1971
12/06/1988
26/07/1988
14/02/1992
14/02/1992
    D3929   08761 01/03/1961 67D
67C
62B
63A
61B
62B
W
Ardrossan (New)
Ayr
Dundee West
Perth South
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Dundee West
Withdrawn
01/03/1961
27/02/1965
27/03/1971
27/03/1971
29/04/1972
28/10/1972
20/03/1992
20/03/1992
    D3930   08762 06/03/1961 61A
61B
65F
DE
Kittybrewster (New)
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Grangemouth
Dundee West
06/03/1961
30/09/1967
29/05/1971
19/05/1973
    D3931   08763 10/03/1961 61A
61B
64B
W
Kittybrewster (New)
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Haymarket
Withdrawn
10/03/1961
30/09/1967
29/01/1972
06/10/1989
06/10/1989
    D3932   08764 17/03/1961 61A
61B
62B
61B
62B
61B
ED
AB
W
Kittybrewster (New)
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Dundee West
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Dundee West
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Eastfield
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Withdrawn
17/03/1961
30/09/1967
01/01/1972
26/02/1972
28/10/1972
21/04/1973
03/11/1973
01/12/1973
06/05/1988
06/05/1988
    D3933   08765 23/03/1961 61A
61B
15A
2F
Kittybrewster (New)
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Leicester Midland
Bescot
23/03/1961
30/09/1967
23/10/1971
29/04/1972
    D3934   08766 28/03/1961 61A
61B
52A
91E
55A
Kittybrewster (New)
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Gateshead
To Eastern Region
Holbeck (MR)
28/03/1961
30/09/1967
09/10/1971
30/10/1971
16/09/1972
    D3935   08767 06/04/1961 61A
61B
91E
51L
30A
30E
W
Kittybrewster (New)
Aberdeen Ferryhill
To Eastern Region
Thornaby
Stratford
Colchester
Withdrawn
06/04/1961
30/09/1967
30/10/1971
30/10/1971
20/05/1972
17/06/1972
31/01/1994
31/01/1994
    D3936   08768 13/04/1961 61A
61B
41C
81A
81A
1A
BY
CW

W
Kittybrewster (New)
Aberdeen Ferryhill
Wath
Old Oak Common
Old Oak Common
Willesden
Bletchley
Cricklewood East

Withdrawn
13/04/1961
30/09/1967
18/05/1968
09/11/1968
25/01/1969
13/06/1970
20/10/1973
13/07/1974
24/07/1988
31/08/2005
31/08/2005
    D3937   08769 04/03/1960 55D
55B
W
Royston (New)
York (North)
Withdrawn
04/03/1960
02/10/1971
23/05/1989
23/05/1989
&n